Reebok International Limited v. Paul R. Ingrisano
USPTO Trademark Trial and Appeal Board, Case No. 91214008-OPP

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
The right information can save you thousands of dollars.
Access comprehensive profiles on judges, firms, lawyers, and more with PlainSite Pro and Pro Se.
No Logo Reebok International, Ltd., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Angelo Notaro +1 845 359 7700 anotaro@notaromichalos.com
v.
No Logo Paul R. Ingrisano, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Angelo Notaro +1 845 359 7700 anotaro@notaromichalos.com
Type Opposition
Interlocutory Attorney ELIZABETH ADUNN
Date in Location 16-DEC-13
Status Code 2
Location Code 845
  Entries (11) Calendar Events Related (2) Tools Right End
PDF 11 Filed: 5/14/2014, Entered: None T
Bd Decision: Dismissed
PDF 10 Filed: 3/27/2014, Entered: None T
Paper Received At Ttab
PDF 9 Filed: 3/24/2014, Entered: None W
Extension Of Time Granted
PDF 8 Filed: 3/24/2014, Entered: None T
Stip For Ext
PDF 7 Filed: 2/27/2014, Entered: None W
Extension Of Time Granted
PDF 6 Filed: 2/24/2014, Entered: None T
Stip For Ext
PDF 5 Filed: 1/22/2014, Entered: None W
Extension Of Time Granted
PDF 4 Filed: 1/22/2014, Entered: None T
Stip For Ext
Blank 3 Filed: 12/16/2013, Entered: None T
Pending, Instituted
PDF 2 Filed: 12/16/2013, Entered: None T
Notice And Trial Dates Sent; Answer Due:
PDF 1 Filed: 12/14/2013, Entered: None N
Filed And Fee

Statistics

This case has been viewed 2,155 times.

No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Need Password Help?