Gabriel Nainoa -v- Food 4 Less
Superior Court of California, County of San Bernardino, Case No. BCIBS04483

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Judges don't know as much about themselves as we do.
Access comprehensive profiles on judges, firms, lawyers, and more with PlainSite Pro and Pro Se.
No Logo Gabriel Nainoa, Plaintiff
No Logo Food4Less, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Lewis D'amato Brisbois & Bisgaard Lp +1 213 250 1800
No Logo Food4Less, Cross-Complainant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Lewis D'amato Brisbois & Bisgaard Lp +1 213 250 1800
No Logo Gabriel Nainoa, Cross-Defendant
Complaint 1 0001 Cmp
Complaint 1 Filing Date 6/23/1999
Complaint 1 Status Dismissed W/predjudice 07/26/2000
Complaint 2 0002 Cc
Complaint 2 Filing Date 10/14/1999
Complaint 2 Status Dismissed W/predjudice 07/26/2000
  Entries (47) Calendar Events Related (6) Tools Right End
Blank 47 Filed: 7/31/2000, Entered: 7/31/2000
Notice Of Order Filed By Food 4 Less.
Blank 46 Filed: 7/26/2000, Entered: 7/26/2000
Stage At Disposition: Other Dismissals And Transfers
Blank 45 Filed: 7/26/2000, Entered: 7/26/2000
Dismissal With Prejudice As To Entire Action Filed
Blank 44 Filed: 7/26/2000, Entered: 7/26/2000
Dismissal Filed As To Gabriel Nainoa, With Prejudice
Blank 43 Filed: 7/17/2000, Entered: 7/17/2000
Dismissal Filed As To Food 4 Less, W/o Prejudice
Blank 42 Filed: 7/17/2000, Entered: 7/17/2000
Stage At Disposition: Other Dismissals And Transfers
Blank 41 Filed: 4/27/2000, Entered: 4/27/2000
Update Party Address For Gabriel Nainoa.
Blank 40 Filed: 4/27/2000, Entered: 4/27/2000
Order On Motion To Withdraw As Atty Of Record * Filed
Blank 39 Filed: 4/26/2000, Entered: 4/26/2000
Order Granting Deft And Xcmplt Mtn For Terminating Sanctions Against Plaintiff And X-deft Filed
Blank 38 Filed: 4/6/2000, Entered: 4/6/2000
Notice Of Ruling Filed By Food 4 Less.
Blank 37
Minutes: Minutes Kirtland L Mahlum Presiding. Clerk: Carol Mauk Reporter: Cathy Albritton Parties Not Present: Gabriel Nainoa, Food 4 Less Special Appearance By Valerie Coutts For James Terrell. Attorney Dennis Baranowksi Present For Defendant/respondent. - Motion Submitted On Points And Authorities. Food 4 Less's Motion Strike Complaint & Answer Of G. Nainoa Is Granted. For Disobeying Court Order. - Minute Order End
Blank 36
Minutes: Minutes Kirtland L Mahlum Presiding. Clerk: Carol Mauk Reporter: Cathy Albritton Parties Not Present: Gabriel Nainoa, Food 4 Less Special Appearance By Valerie Coutts For James Terrell. Attorney Dennis Baranowski Present For Defendant/respondent. - Proceedings: Off-calendar. Reason: Complaint & Answer To Cross Complaint Dismessed. - Minute Order End
Blank 35 Filed: 4/4/2000, Entered: 4/4/2000
Fee Payment
Blank 34 Filed: 4/4/2000, Entered: 4/4/2000
Proof Of Service Of Motion To W/draw By Mail On 04/04/00 As To Gabriel Naino, Filed.
Blank 33 Filed: 3/24/2000, Entered: 3/24/2000
Notice Of Ruling On Case Management Conference Filed.
Blank 32
Minutes: Minutes John P Vanderfeer Presiding. Clerk: Carol Mauk Notice To Be Given By Mr Baranowski Of Hrg. Cont To 040400 0900 B3 Cmc W/mtn Mr Terrell To Give Ntc To Pla Of Ruling/if Poss Action - Complete
Blank 31 Filed: 3/3/2000, Entered: 3/3/2000
Case Management Conference Questionnaire Filed By Food 4 Less.
Blank 30 Filed: 3/3/2000, Entered: 3/3/2000
Motion Re: To Strike Complaint & Answer Terminating Sanctions Filed By Defendant Food 4 Less.
Blank 29 Filed: 2/24/2000, Entered: 2/24/2000
Decl. Concerning Proof Due Diligence Is Returned By Court For The Following Reason(s): Due Diligence Required At Least 3 Attempts At 3 Different Hour.
Blank 28 Filed: 2/24/2000, Entered: 2/24/2000
Order Compelling Pltf To Provide Responses & For Sanctions Filed
Blank 27 Filed: 2/9/2000, Entered: 2/9/2000
Notice Of Ruling On Mtn To Compel Disc Responses & Req. Sanctions Filed.
Blank 26
Minutes: Minutes John P Vanderfeer Presiding. Clerk: Carol Mauk Notice Waived. Cont To 032000 0830 B2 Cmc Action - Complete
Blank 25
Minutes: Minutes Previously Heard & Ruled On By Dept. B3 Cnsl Did Not Receive Notice Of Ruling Court Makes The Following Modification As To Datesonly :discovery To Be Provided By 030100 & Sanctions Payable By Plaintiff $550 To Be Paid By 030100 Mr Baranowski To Submit Order Action - Complete
Blank 24
Minutes: Minutes John P Vanderfeer Presiding. Clerk: Carol Mauk Notice Waived. Cont To 032000 0830 B2 Cmc Frthr Ordsr As Attchd Action - Complete
Blank 23 Filed: 1/11/2000, Entered: 1/11/2000
Vacate L&m Hearing Scheduled For 01/11/00 At 09:00 In Department B3.
Blank 22 Filed: 1/11/2000, Entered: 1/11/2000
Vacate Lm91 Hearing Scheduled For 02/08/00 At 08:30 In Department B2.
Blank 21
Minutes: Minutes Kirtland L Mahlum Presiding. Clerk: Deeann Altmann All Docs/interrogs/discovery To Be Provided To Food 4 Less By 020100 Sanctions Are Awarded In The Amount Of $550 By The Plaintiff To Food 4 Less By 020100 Action - Complete
Blank 20
Minutes: Minutes John P Vanderfeer Presiding. Clerk: Carol Mauk Vacate Motion Set 011000 B3 Cont To 020800 0830 B2 Cmc Reset Mtn To Compel On 020800 0830 B2 Both Matters To Be Hrd At The Time Of Mtn To W/drw Current Hearing Continued To 02/08/00 At 08:30 In Department B2. Action - Complete
Blank 19 Filed: 1/6/2000, Entered: 1/6/2000
Motion Re: For Permission To W/draw As Atty Record Filed By Plaintiff Gabriel Nainoa.
Blank 18 Filed: 12/30/1999, Entered: 12/30/1999
Reply To Opposition To Motion To Compel Written Discovery Filed.
Blank 17 Filed: 12/29/1999, Entered: 12/29/1999
Opposition To Motion To/for Compel Responses Filed By Gabriel Nainoa
Blank 16 Filed: 12/21/1999, Entered: 12/21/1999
Case Management Conference Questionnaire Filed By Food 4 Less.
Blank 15 Filed: 12/1/1999, Entered: 12/1/1999
Motion Re: Compel Written Disc & Sanctions From Pltf & Xdeft Filed By Defendant Food 4 Less.
Blank 14 Filed: 11/15/1999, Entered: 11/15/1999
Answer Filed By Gabriel Nainoa; Party Represented By James S Terrell.
Blank 13 Filed: 10/14/1999, Entered: 10/14/1999
No Summons Issued
Blank 12 Filed: 10/14/1999, Entered: 10/14/1999
Cross-complaint Filed On Complaint (unlimited) Filed 06/23/1999 Of Gabriel Nainoa By Food 4 Less
Blank 11 Filed: 10/14/1999, Entered: 10/14/1999
Answer Filed By Food 4 Less; Party Represented By Lewis D'amato Brisbois & Bisgaard.
Blank 10
Minutes: Minutes John P Vanderfeer Presiding. Clerk: Shirley-jean Thomas Off-calendar. Reason: Proof Of Service Filed Action - Complete
Blank 9 Filed: 8/26/1999, Entered: 8/26/1999
Proof Of Service Of Summons And Complaint * Served On 08/25/99 As To Food 4 Less ( Sb)
Blank 8 Filed: 8/26/1999, Entered: 8/26/1999
Vacate Oscsv Hearing Scheduled For 08/27/99 At 08:30 In Department B2.
Blank 7 Filed: 8/25/1999, Entered: 8/25/1999
Original Summons Returned And Filed.
Blank 6 Filed: 8/25/1999, Entered: 8/25/1999
Issued 2nd Summons
Blank 5 Filed: 8/9/1999, Entered: 8/9/1999
Vacate Oscsv Hearing Scheduled For 08/27/99 At 08:30 In Department B1.
Blank 4 Filed: 8/9/1999, Entered: 8/9/1999
Vacate Cmc Hearing Scheduled For 01/10/00 At 08:30 In Department B1.
Blank 3 Filed: 6/30/1999, Entered: 6/30/1999
Summons Issued On Complaint (unlimited) Filed 06/23/1999 Of Gabriel Nainoa
Blank 2 Filed: 6/23/1999, Entered: 6/23/1999
Complaint And Party Information Entered
Blank 1 Filed: 6/23/1999, Entered: 6/23/1999
Case Assigned For All Purposes To Department B1

Statistics

This case has been viewed 12 times.

No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Need Password Help?