USA v. Torres
Connecticut District Court, Case No. 3:01-cr-00029-PCD
docket://gov.uscourts.ctd.3-01-cr-00029 (What is this?)

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
The right information can save you thousands of dollars.
Access comprehensive profiles on judges, firms, lawyers, and more with PlainSite Pro and Pro Se.
United States of America, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Michael J. Gustafson +1 860 760 7960 +1 860 760 7979 mike.gustafson@usdoj.gov
Peter D. Markle +1 203 821 3700 Peter.Markle@usdoj.gov
Raymond F. Miller +1 203 821 3700 ray.miller2@usdoj.gov
Office New Haven
Filed 4/3/2001
County Hartford
Terminated 11/19/2001
Reopened
Magistrate Case
301-mj-00015
Citation
Offense Level
21841(a)(1) knowingly, intentionally and unlawfully conspire with others to possess with intent to distribute heroin [ 301-m -15 ]
Count 1
Citation Section 21 U.S.C. § 846=ND.F
Offense Level 4
21846=ND.F CONSPIRACY TO DISTRIBUTE NARCOTICS
Count 2
Citation Section 21 U.S.C. § 841A=ND.F
Offense Level 4
21841A=ND.F and 182 NARCOTICS - SELL, DISTRIBUTE, OR DISPENSE
Count 3
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 111.F
Offense Level 4
18111.F ASSAULTING/RESISTING/IMPEDING OFFICERS/EMPLOYEES
Def Custody Status Custody This Court
Flags CLOSED, DFM, PRIOR
  Entries (59) Calendar Events Related (0) Tools Right End
PACER 218 Filed: 8/4/2014, Entered: None Financial Affidavit - CJA23
PACER 216 Filed: 7/23/2014, Entered: None Order Revoking Supervised Release
PDF 193 Filed: 4/25/2005, Entered: 4/29/2005 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Court Filing
RULING denying [186] Motion to Amend/Correct Sentence as to Jose Torres (8); denying [190] Motion to Vacate (2255) as to Jose Torres (8). Signed by Judge Peter C. Dorsey on 4/25/05. (Jefferson, V.)
Blank 192 Filed: 11/29/2004, Entered: 11/30/2004 TranscriptCourt Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jose Torres held on 11/19/04 before Judge Peter C. Dorsey. Court Reporter: Bowles Reporting Service. (Villano, P.)
PDF 191 Filed: 11/9/2004, Entered: 11/10/2004 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Memorandum in Opposition by USA as to Jose Torres re [190] MOTION to Vacate under 28 U.S.C. 2255 ( Civil Action 3:04cv1658(PCD).) (Villano, P.)
PACER 190 Filed: 9/24/2004, Entered: 10/4/2004 Motion to Vacate (2255)
MOTION to Vacate under 28 U.S.C. 2255 ( Civil Action 3:04cv1658(PCD).) by Jose Torres. (Jefferson, V.)
PACER 189 Filed: 9/7/2004, Entered: 9/9/2004 Order on Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
ORDER granting [188] Motion for Extension of Time as to Jose Torres (8); granting [188] Motion Traverse Government Reply as to Jose Torres (8). Signed by Judge Peter C. Dorsey on 9/3/04. (Villano, P.)
PACER 188 Filed: 8/23/2004, Entered: 8/25/2004, Terminated: 9/7/2004 Motion for Extension of Time
MOTION for Extension of Time until 9/20/04 to Traverse Government Response, and MOTION Clarify Pleadings by Jose Torres. (Villano, P.)
PACER 187 Filed: 8/2/2004, Entered: 8/3/2004 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Memorandum in Opposition by USA as to Jose Torres re [186] Motion for Relief from Judgment (Attachments: # (1) Exhibits)(Jefferson, V.)
Blank -- Filed: 12/1/2003, Entered: 12/3/2003 Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testifica
Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum by Jose Torres With Order Thereon to appear 2/3/04 @ Manson Youth Institution, Cheshire @ 9:30. Original and Two True Attested Copies Handed USM for Service. Signed by Peter C. Dorsey. (Jefferson, V.)
Blank 186 Filed: 9/26/2003, Entered: 9/30/2003 Motion to Amend/Correct
MOTION by Jose Torres for Relief from [146-1] judgment order (Jefferson, V.)
Blank -- Filed: 11/8/2002, Entered: 12/11/2002 Payment
SPECIAL ASSESSMENT in the amount of $ 50.00 balance paid in full as to Jose Torres . Receipt # 252-03-021 BOP FCI Schuylkill. (Carfora, C.)
Blank -- Filed: 9/25/2002, Entered: 10/3/2002 CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay
CJA 20 as to Jose Torres Authorization to Pay David Wenc $ 3,309.22 Voucher # 020925000037-2 [8-1] CJA appointment. Final payment. ( Signed by Judge Peter C. Dorsey ) (Jefferson, V.)
Blank -- Filed: 9/25/2002, Entered: 10/3/2002 CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay
CJA 20 as to Jose Torres Authorization to Pay David Wenc $ 1,157.19 Voucher # 020925000037-1 [8-1] CJA appointment. Final payment. ( Signed by Judge Peter C. Dorsey ) (Jefferson, V.) Modified on 10/03/2002
Blank -- Filed: 9/5/2002, Entered: 11/6/2002 Payment
SPECIAL ASSESSMENT in the amount of $ 25.00 paid as to Jose Torres . Balance $ 50.00 Receipt # 252-02-121 BOP FCI Sch. (Carfora, C.)
Blank -- Filed: 6/6/2002, Entered: 8/16/2002 Payment
SPECIAL ASSESSMENT in the amount of $ 25.00 paid as to Jose Torres . Balance $75.00 Receipt # 252-02-091 BOP FCI Schuylkil. (Carfora, C.)
Blank 161 Filed: 12/26/2001, Entered: 12/27/2001 Attorney Appearance - USA
Appearance for USA by Attorney Raymond F. Miller (Jefferson, V.)
Blank 149 Filed: 11/27/2001, Entered: 11/27/2001 JudgmentCourt Filing
AMENDMENT TO JUDGMENT: Amended in part as follows: Court recommends to the Bureau of Prisons that if the defendant is to be placed in a low security facility, that he be placed at Fort Dix and if he is to be placed in a medium security facility, that he be placed at Fairton. In all other respects the Judgment & Order of Commitment entered 11/20/01 remains the same. ( Signed by Judge Peter C. Dorsey ) (Jefferson, V.)
Blank 146 Filed: 11/20/2001, Entered: 11/21/2001 JudgmentCourt Filing
JUDGMENT as to Jose Torres (8) count(s) 1, 2 , 3 . Imprisoned on count 1 for 120 months, supervised release for 5 years. Shall pay some or all of the costs of substance abuse and mental health treatments if deemed appropriate by USPO on a pro rated basis. Counts 2 & 3 dismissed on the motion of the United States. Special Assessment of $100.00 due immediately. ( Signed by Judge Peter C. Dorsey ) (Moore, P.)
Blank 147 Filed: 11/19/2001, Entered: 11/21/2001 Dismissal of Counts MotionCourt Filing
ORDER OF DISMISSAL of Count(s) as to Jose Torres Counts Dismissed: 2 & 3 ( Signed by Judge Peter C. Dorsey ) (Moore, P.)
Blank 145 Filed: 11/19/2001, Entered: 11/21/2001 Sentencing
Sentencing held Jose Torres (8) count(s) 1. Government's oral motion to dismiss remaining counts-GRANTED ( PCD) (Moore, P.)
Blank -- Filed: 11/19/2001, Entered: 11/21/2001 Dismissal of Counts Motion
DISMISSAL of Count(s) as to Jose Torres Terminated motions: [132-1] motion for Downward Departure as to Pedro Rodriguez (6) Counts Dismissed: Jose Torres (8) count(s) 2, 3 (Moore, P.)
Blank 143 Filed: 11/16/2001, Entered: 11/16/2001 Order
SENTENCING MEMORANDUM by Jose Torres (Jefferson, V.)
Blank 121 Filed: 8/31/2001, Entered: 8/31/2001 Plea Agreement
Plea Agreement Letter as to Jose Torres (Jefferson, V.)
Blank 120 Filed: 8/31/2001, Entered: 8/31/2001 Change of Plea Hearing
Change of Plea as to Jose Torres held Request to change plea entered earlier - GRANTED. ( PCD) (Jefferson, V.)
Blank -- Filed: 8/31/2001, Entered: 8/31/2001 Plea Entered
PLEA entered by Jose Torres . PLEA of GUILTY: Jose Torres (8) count(s) 1 (Terminated motions: ) Sentencing set for 10:00 11/19/01 for Jose Torres Court accepts plea. ( PCD) (Jefferson, V.)
Blank 96 Filed: 7/24/2001, Entered: 7/30/2001 USM Return Executed
MARSHAL'S RETURN of service on Arrest Warrant executed as to Jose Torres on 1/21/01 (Jefferson, V.)
Blank -- Filed: 7/9/2001, Entered: 7/11/2001 Order
ENDORSEMENT as to Jose Torres granting [88-1] waiver to Continue pursuant to 18:3161(h)(8) Time Excluded from 7/9/01 to 9/9/01 as to Jose Torres (8). Jury selection will be scheduled for end of August, beginning of September. ( Signed by Judge Peter C. Dorsey ) (Moore, P.)
Blank 88 Filed: 7/5/2001, Entered: 7/5/2001, Terminated: 7/9/2001 Waiver of Speedy Trial
WAIVER of Speedy Trial by Jose Torres to Continue pursuant to 18:3161(h)(8) (Jefferson, V.)
Blank -- Filed: 6/22/2001, Entered: 6/22/2001 Order
ENDORSEMENT as to Jose Torres granting [86-1] motion to continue Jury Selection reset Jury Selection for sometime in September for Jose Torres as to Jose Torres (8) ( Signed by Judge Peter Dorsey ) (Jefferson, V.)
Blank 86 Filed: 6/20/2001, Entered: 6/20/2001, Terminated: 6/22/2001 Motion to Continue
MOTION by Jose Torres to continue Jury Selection (Torday, B.)
Blank -- Filed: 6/4/2001, Entered: 6/5/2001 Order
ENDORSEMENT as to Jose Torres granting [77-1] waiver to Continue pursuant to 18:3161(h)(8) Time Excluded from 5/10/01 to 7/9/01 as to Jose Torres (8) ( Signed by Judge Peter C. Dorsey ) (Ruocco, M.)
Blank 77 Filed: 5/21/2001, Entered: 5/23/2001 Waiver of Speedy Trial
WAIVER of Speedy Trial by Jose Torres to Continue pursuant to 18:3161(h)(8) (Ruocco, M.)
Blank -- Filed: 5/9/2001, Entered: 5/9/2001 Order
ENDORSEMENT as to Jose Torres granting [72-1] motion to Postpone Jury Selection - reset Jury Selection for 9:00 a.m. on 7/9/01 for Jose Torres as to Jose Torres (8) ( Signed by Judge Peter C. Dorsey ) (Moore, P.)
Blank 72 Filed: 5/1/2001, Entered: 5/2/2001 Motion to Continue
MOTION by Jose Torres to Postpone Jury Selection until 7/9/01 (Jefferson, V.)
Blank -- Filed: 4/3/2001, Entered: 4/4/2001 Indictment Unsealed
Indictment unsealed as to Hector Torres-1, Jesus Arroyo-2, Ely Colon-3, Johnny Melendez-4, Pedro Rivera-5, Pedro Rodriguez-6, Carlos Roman-7, Jose Torres-8 (Jefferson, V.)
Blank -- Filed: 4/3/2001, Entered: 4/4/2001 ICMS - converted docket entry
Minute entry as to Hector Torres-1, Jesus Arroyo-2, Ely Colon-3, Johnny Melendez-4, Pedro Rivera-5, Pedro Rodriguez-6, Carlos Roman-7, Jose Torres-8 : Motion to Unseal Indictment by USA, GRANTED. (Jefferson, V.)
Blank -- Filed: 3/12/2001, Entered: 3/12/2001 Order
ENDORSEMENT as to Jose Torres granting [53-1] motion to Modify [38-1] Scheduling order: 14 days as to Jose Torres-8 (8) ( by Judge Peter C. Dorsey ) (Jefferson, V.)
Blank 53 Filed: 3/7/2001, Entered: 3/8/2001 Motion to Amend/Correct
MOTION by Jose Torres-8 to Modify [38-1] Scheduling order: 14 days (Jefferson, V.)
Blank 48 Filed: 2/12/2001, Entered: 2/26/2001 USM Return Executed
MARSHAL'S RETURN of service on Summons executed as to Jose Torres-8 on 1/31/01 (Jefferson, V.)
Blank 38 Filed: 2/7/2001, Entered: 2/12/2001 Sentencing Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
SCHEDULING ORDER as to Hector Torres (1), Jesus Arroyo (2) , Ely Colon (3), Johnny Melendez (4), Pedro Rivera (5), Pedro Rodriquez(6), Carlos Roman (7) Jose Torres (8) setting Substantive due by 2/28/01 Government Response due by 3/16/01 Jury Selection tentatively set for 9:00 a.m. 4/4/01 ( signed by Mag. Judge Joan G. Margolis ) (Moore, P.) Modified on 02/12/2001
Blank 33 Filed: 2/7/2001, Entered: 2/12/2001 Arraignment
Arraignment held as to Jose Torres (8) (JGM) (Moore, P.)
Blank -- Filed: 2/7/2001, Entered: 2/12/2001 Plea Entered
PLEA entered by Jose Torres(8) . Not Guilty: Jose Torres (8) count(s) cmp, 1, 2, 3 Court accepts plea. Defendant detained. ( JGM) (Moore, P.)
Blank 32 Filed: 2/2/2001, Entered: 2/7/2001 Order of DetentionCourt Filing
ORDER OF DETENTION as to Jose Torres-8 [4-1] motion for Pretrial Detention as to Jose Torres-8 (8) ( Signed by Mag. Judge Donna F. Martinez ) (Jefferson, V.)
Blank 31 Filed: 2/2/2001, Entered: 2/7/2001 Detention Hearing
Detention hearing held as to Jose Torres. Defendant detained. ( DFM) (Jefferson, V.)
Blank -- Filed: 1/31/2001, Entered: 1/31/2001 Summons Issued
SUMMONS(ES) issued for Hector Torres,Jesus Attoyo,Ely Colon,Pedro Rodriguez,Carlos Roman,Jose Torres to appear on 2/7/01 3:30 before JGM (Sunbury, B.)
Blank 13 Filed: 1/30/2001, Entered: 1/31/2001 Indictment (Sealed)
SEALED INDICTMENT returned in Hartford before TPS as to Hector Torres (1) count(s) 1, 2, 3, Jesus Arroyo (2) count(s) 1, Ely Colon (3) count(s) 1, Johnny Melendez (4) count(s) 1, Pedro Rivera (5) count(s) 1, 3, Pedro Rodriguez (6) count(s) 1, 2, Carlos Roman (7) count(s) 1, Jose Torres (8) count(s) 1, 2, 3 (Sunbury, B.)
Blank 8 Filed: 1/24/2001, Entered: 1/24/2001 CJA 20 - Appointment
CJA 20 as to David Wenc: Appointment of Attorney David J. Wenc (signed by clerk) [ 3:01-m -15 ] (Sunbury, B.)
Blank 7 Filed: 1/22/2001, Entered: 1/23/2001 USM Return Executed
MARSHAL'S RETURN of service on Warrant For Arrest executed as to Jose Torrres on 1/21/01 [ 3:01-m -15 ] (Sunbury, B.)
Blank 6 Filed: 1/22/2001, Entered: 1/23/2001 Sealed Document
Sealed document by Jose Torres (document filed separate from the case file) [ 3:01-m -15 ] (Sunbury, B.)
Blank 5 Filed: 1/22/2001, Entered: 1/23/2001 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
MOTION by USA as to Jose Torres for Waiver of Ten Day Notice [ 3:01-m -15 ] (Sunbury, B.)
Blank 4 Filed: 1/22/2001, Entered: 1/23/2001 Motion for Pretrial Detention
MOTION by USA as to Jose Torres for Pretrial Detention [ 3:01-m -15 ] (Sunbury, B.)
Blank 3 Filed: 1/22/2001, Entered: 1/23/2001 Initial Appearance
Initial presentment held as to Jose Torres Defendant informed of rights. Probable Cause Hearing set for: 2/1/01 10:00 Detention Hearing set for: 2/1/01 ( DFM) [ 3:01-m -15 ] (Sunbury, B.)
Blank -- Filed: 1/22/2001, Entered: 1/23/2001 Order
ENDORSEMENT as to Jose Torres granting [5-1] motion for Waiver of Ten Day Notice ( Signed by Mag. Judge Donna F. Martinez ) [ 3:01-m -15 ] (Sunbury, B.)
Blank -- Filed: 1/22/2001, Entered: 1/23/2001 Arrest
ARREST of Jose Torres [ 3:01-m -15 ] (Sunbury, B.)
Blank 2 Filed: 1/11/2001, Entered: 1/11/2001, Terminated: 1/11/2001 Sealed Motion
MOTION by USA as to Jose Torres SEALED MOTION to Seal this Motion,Complaint,Warrant (document filed separate from case file) [ 3:01-m -15 ] (Sunbury, B.)
Blank 1 Filed: 1/11/2001, Entered: 1/11/2001 Complaint (Sealed)
SEALED COMPLAINT as to Jose Torres with Affidavit [ 3:01-m -15 ] (Sunbury, B.) Modified on 01/11/2001
Blank -- Filed: 1/11/2001, Entered: 1/11/2001 Order
ENDORSEMENT as to Jose Torres granting [2-1] motion SEALED MOTION to Seal this Motion,Complaint,Warrant ( Signed by Mag. Judge Donna F. Martinez ) [ 3:01-m -15 ] (Sunbury, B.)
Blank -- Filed: 1/11/2001, Entered: 1/11/2001 Warrant Issued
Arrest WARRANT issued as to Jose Torres [ 3:01-m -15 ] (Sunbury, B.)

Statistics

This case has been viewed 64 times.

No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Need Password Help?