UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. TEDARDS et al
District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:05-cv-00991-DAR
District Judge Deborah A. Robinson, presiding
docket://gov.uscourts.dcd.1-05-cv-00991 (What is this?)

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
This docket can only tell you so much. Get the rest.
Access comprehensive profiles on judges, firms, lawyers, and more with PlainSite Pro and Pro Se.
United States of America, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Paul A. Mussenden +1 202 305 4740 +1 202 514 8780 Paul.Mussenden@usdoj.gov
Megan Mary Weis +1 202 514 5134 megan.Weis@usdoj.gov
No Logo WILLIAM P. TEDARDS, JR., Counter-Claimant
No Logo YVONNE TEDARDS, Counter-Claimant
v.
No Logo WILLIAM P. TEDARDS, JR., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of William P Tedards , Jr

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
William P Tedards, Jr. +1 202 797 9135 +1 202 797 9139 skeener@tedards.net
No Logo YVONNE TEDARDS, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of William P Tedards , Jr

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
William P Tedards, Jr. +1 202 797 9135 +1 202 797 9139 skeener@tedards.net
United States of America, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Paul A. Mussenden +1 202 305 4740 +1 202 514 8780 Paul.Mussenden@usdoj.gov
Megan Mary Weis +1 202 514 5134 megan.Weis@usdoj.gov
Office Washington, DC
Filed 5/17/2005
Jury Demand Defendant
Demand $44000
Nature of Suit 230 - Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1345 Property Ejectment
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Plaintiff
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County 11001
Terminated 9/11/2008
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CASREF, CLOSED, MEDIATION, STAYED, TYPE-E
  Entries (101) Calendar Events Related (0) Tools Right End
PDF 58 Filed: 9/10/2008, Entered: 9/10/2008 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by all parties (Weis, Megan)
Blank -- Filed: 9/10/2008, Entered: 9/10/2008 Order
MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson on 9/10/08: [58] Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice APPROVED. Case dismissed with prejudice. (lcdar1)
PDF 57 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: 9/8/2008, Terminated: 9/10/2008 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
MOTION update pretrial statement re [46] Pretrial Statement by WILLIAM P. TEDARDS, JR (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order Order)(Tedards, William)
Blank -- Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: 9/8/2008 Notice of QC
ENTERED IN ERROR.....NOTICE re [56] Notice (Other); emailed to skeener@tedards.net, cc'd 6 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Document title does not match docketed event, 2. Please refile document, 3. Refile document using the event Motion and select appropriate relief. (td, ) Modified on 9/8/2008 (td, ).
PDF 56 Filed: 9/5/2008, Entered: 9/5/2008 Notice (Other)
NOTICE TEDARDS' VERIFIED MOTION TO COMPEL THE GOVERNMENT TO UPDATE AND FINALIZE ITS WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LISTS by WILLIAM P. TEDARDS, JR (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order ORDER [proposed])(Tedards, William)
PDF 55 Filed: 9/4/2008, Entered: 9/4/2008 Notice (Other)
NOTICE FINANCIAL DAMAGE SPECIFICATION OF DEFENDANTS WILLIAM AND YVONNE TEDARDS by WILLIAM P. TEDARDS, JR (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit EXH 1 - TEDARDS REPORT ON REPAIRS, # (2) Exhibit EXH 2 - TEDARDS REPORT ON UNJUST ENRICHMENT, # (3) Exhibit EXH 3 - TEDARDS REPORT ON DAMAGE TO PERSONAL PROPERTY AND OTHER OFFSETS, # (4) Exhibit EXH 4 - TEDARDS REPORT ON RESTORATION CHARGES)(Tedards, William)
Blank -- Filed: 9/4/2008, Entered: 9/4/2008 Notice of Corrected Docket Entry
NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Docket Entry [54] Notice (Other) was entered in error and has been refiled with exhibits as Docket Entry [55]. (nmw, )
PDF 54 Filed: 9/3/2008, Entered: 9/3/2008 Notice (Other)
ENTERED IN ERROR.....NOTICE FINANCIAL DAMAGE SPECIFICATION OF DEFENDANTS WILLIAM AND YVONNE TEDARDS by WILLIAM P. TEDARDS, JR (Tedards, William) Modified on 9/4/2008 (nmw, ).
PDF 53 Filed: 9/3/2008, Entered: 9/3/2008 Pretrial OrderCourt Filing
FINAL PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson on 9/3/08. (EW)
PDF 52 Filed: 9/3/2008, Entered: 9/3/2008 Pretrial OrderCourt Filing
ENTERED IN ERROR.....FINAL PRETRIAL ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson on 9/3/08. (EW) Modified on 9/3/2008 (EW, ).
PDF 51 Filed: 8/27/2008, Entered: 8/27/2008, Terminated: 9/10/2008 Motion to Amend/Correct
MOTION to Amend/Correct [1] Complaint by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1- Proposed First Amended Complaint, # (2) Text of Proposed Order)(Weis, Megan)
Blank -- Filed: 8/22/2008, Entered: 8/22/2008 Pretrial Conference - Final
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson: Final Pretrial Conference held on 8/22/2008; Pretrial order stated orally on the record. (Court Reporter Pro-Typist.) (EW)
Blank -- Filed: 8/21/2008, Entered: 8/21/2008 Order on Motion to Strike
MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson on 8/21/08 GRANTING Consent Motion to Strike Demand for Jury Trial and DENYING Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Bifurcate Defendants' Counterclaim and Hear Evidence of that Claim First. (EW)
Blank -- Filed: 8/21/2008, Entered: 8/21/2008 Order
MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson on 8/21/08: Plaintiff's objection (See Notice filed as Document No. 48) is hereby OVERRULED. (lcdar1)
PDF 50 Filed: 8/20/2008, Entered: 8/20/2008, Terminated: 8/21/2008 Motion to Strike
Consent MOTION to Strike Demand for Jury Trial and Planitiff's Unopposed Motion to Bifurcate Defendants' Counterclaim and Hear Evidence of that Claim First by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Weis, Megan)
PDF 49 Filed: 8/20/2008, Entered: 8/20/2008 Response to Document
RESPONSE re [48] Notice (Other) of the Government filed by WILLIAM P. TEDARDS, JR, YVONNE TEDARDS. (Tedards, William)
PDF 48 Filed: 8/19/2008, Entered: 8/19/2008 Notice (Other)
NOTICE by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA re Order on Motion to Continue,, (Weis, Megan)
PDF 47 Filed: 8/18/2008, Entered: 8/19/2008 Pretrial Statement
PRETRIAL STATEMENT by WILLIAM P. TEDARDS, JR, YVONNE TEDARDS. (td, )
PDF 46 Filed: 8/18/2008, Entered: 8/18/2008 Pretrial Statement
PRETRIAL STATEMENT by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Weis, Megan)
Blank -- Filed: 8/15/2008, Entered: 8/15/2008 Order on Motion to Continue
MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson on 8/15/08: granting in part [45] Joint Motion to Continue Pretrial Conference and for Extension of Time to File the Pretrial Statement. The deadline for the filing of the pretrial statement is extended to Monday, August 18, 2008; Unless counsel for Plaintiff and Defendants are all available on Friday, August 22, 2008 at 2:00 pm, Counsel for Plaintiff shall make arrangements for another Assistant United States Attorney to stand in for him at the Pretrial Conference on Wednesday, August 20, 2008. (lcdar1)
PDF 45 Filed: 8/11/2008, Entered: 8/11/2008, Terminated: 8/15/2008 Motion to Continue
Joint MOTION to Continue Pretrial Conference and for Extension of Time to File the Pretrial Statement by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Weis, Megan)
PDF 44 Filed: 8/6/2008, Entered: 8/6/2008 Notice of Appearance
NOTICE of Appearance by Megan Mary Weis on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Weis, Megan)
PDF 43 Filed: 3/11/2008, Entered: 3/11/2008 Consent to Proceed before US Magistrate Judge for Court Filing
Consent to Proceed before US Magistrate Judge for All Purposes by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, WILLIAM P. TEDARDS, JR, YVONNE TEDARDS. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on 3/11/08. (lm)
Blank -- Filed: 3/11/2008, Entered: 3/11/2008 Order on Motion to Reopen Case
MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson on 3/11/08 denying as moot [36] Motion to Reopen Case and [39] Motion for Leave to File. (EW)
Blank -- Filed: 3/11/2008, Entered: 3/11/2008 Status Conference
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson: Telephone Status Conference held on 3/11/2008; Dispositive Motions due by 5/8/2008; Response to Dispositive Motions due by 5/16/2008; Reply to Dispositive Motions due by 5/23/2008; Pretrial Statement due by 8/11/2008; Pretrial Conference set for 8/20/2008 09:30 AM in Courtroom 4 before Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson; Jury Trial set for Monday, 9/15/2008 @ 09:30 AM in Courtroom 4 before Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson. (EW)
Blank -- Filed: 2/6/2008, Entered: 2/6/2008 Status Conference
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson: Status Conference held on 2/6/2008. Status Conference set for 3/11/2008 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 4 before Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson. (lcdar1)
Blank -- Filed: 1/8/2008, Entered: 1/8/2008 Set/Reset Hearings
Set Hearing: Status Conference set for Wednesday, 2/6/2008 @ 02:00 PM in Courtroom 4-2nd Floor, E. Barrett Prettyman Building before Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson. (EBW)
PDF 42 Filed: 12/12/2007, Entered: 12/12/2007 Reply to opposition to Motion
REPLY to opposition to motion re [36] MOTION to Reopen Case and Reinstate Complaint filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Mussenden, Paul)
Blank -- Filed: 12/12/2007, Entered: 12/12/2007 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Resp
MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson on 12/12/07 granting [41] Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply to [36] MOTION to Reopen Case; Repliy due by 12/12/2007. (EW)
PDF 41 Filed: 12/11/2007, Entered: 12/11/2007, Terminated: 12/12/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [36] MOTION to Reopen Case and Reinstate Complaint by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Mussenden, Paul)
Blank -- Filed: 12/4/2007, Entered: 12/4/2007 Set/Reset Deadlines
Set/Reset Deadline: Plaintiff shall file reply to Defendants' opposition no later than Tuesday, December 11, 2007. (lcdar1)
PDF 40 Filed: 10/31/2007, Entered: 10/31/2007 Errata
ERRATA of Declaration of Yvonne Tedards and Change of Email Address re {37} Memorandum in opposition and [38] SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM by WILLIAM P. TEDARDS, JR, YVONNE TEDARDS. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Yvonne Tedards)(Tedards, William) Modified on 11/1/2007 (lc, ).
PDF 39 Filed: 10/31/2007, Entered: 10/31/2007, Terminated: 3/11/2008 Motion for Leave to File
MOTION for Leave to File Settlement Papers Under Seal by WILLIAM P. TEDARDS, JR, YVONNE TEDARDS (Tedards, William)
PDF 38 Filed: 10/29/2007, Entered: 10/29/2007 Supplemental Memorandum
SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to Opposition to [36] Motion to Reopen Case filed by WILLIAM P. TEDARDS, JR, YVONNE TEDARDS. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Yvonne Tedards)(Tedards, William) Modified on 10/30/2007 (td, ).
PDF 37 Filed: 10/26/2007, Entered: 10/26/2007 Memorandum in Opposition
Memorandum in opposition to re [36] MOTION to Reopen Case and Reinstate Complaint filed by WILLIAM P. TEDARDS, JR, YVONNE TEDARDS. (Tedards, William)
PDF 36 Filed: 10/25/2007, Entered: 10/25/2007, Terminated: 3/11/2008 Motion to Reopen Case
MOTION to Reopen Case and Reinstate Complaint by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 7-26-07 Agreement in Principle)(Mussenden, Paul)
Blank -- Filed: 9/26/2007, Entered: 9/26/2007 Order
MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson on 9/26/07; This action is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, the parties having reached an agreement with respect to all essential terms of a settlement. Said dismissal without prejudice shall become a dismissal with prejudice in 30 days, or upon the filing of a stipulation of dismissal, whichever is sooner. (EW)
Blank -- Filed: 9/26/2007, Entered: 9/26/2007 Telephone Conference
Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson : Telephone Conference held on 9/26/2007. (EW)
PDF 35 Filed: 9/25/2007, Entered: 9/25/2007 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson. Judge John Garrett Penn no longer assigned to the case. (gt, )
Blank -- Filed: 9/20/2007, Entered: 9/20/2007 Order
MINUTE ORDER: Per order of the Calendar Committee, the above-captioned case is assigned to Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on 9/20/2007. (KF)
Blank -- Filed: 9/10/2007, Entered: 9/10/2007 Set/Reset Hearings
Set Hearing: Telephone Conference set for Wednesday, 9/26/2007 @ 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson. (EW)
PDF 34 Filed: 8/3/2007, Entered: 8/3/2007 Order Referring Case to Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge for status hearing and cancelling status hearing set for August 9, 2007. See Order for further details. Signed by Judge John Garrett Penn on August 3, 2007. (lcpenn2)
Blank -- Filed: 8/3/2007, Entered: 8/6/2007 Case Referred to Magistrate Judge
CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson for status conference. (jeb, )
PDF 33 Filed: 6/26/2007, Entered: 6/26/2007 Order Referring Case to MediationCourt Filing
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. See Order for details. Signed by Judge John Garrett Penn on June 26, 2007.(lcpenn2)
Blank -- Filed: 6/26/2007, Entered: 6/26/2007 Set/Reset Hearings
Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference reset to 8/9/2007 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 15 before Judge John Garrett Penn. (cp, )
Blank -- Filed: 6/26/2007, Entered: 6/26/2007 Order
Minute ORDER rescheduling the July 3, 2007 status hearing for August 9, 2007 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 15. This case is hereby stayed until August 7, 2007. Signed by Judge John Garrett Penn on June 26, 2007.(lcpenn2)
Blank -- Filed: 6/15/2007, Entered: 6/15/2007 Set/Reset Hearings
Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference reset for 7/3/2007 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 15 before Judge John Garrett Penn. (cp, )
Blank -- Filed: 6/15/2007, Entered: 6/15/2007 Order
Minute ORDER rescheduling the status hearing set for June 20, 2007 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 15 to July 3, 2007 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 15. Signed by Judge John Garrett Penn on June 15, 2007. (lcpenn2)
Blank -- Filed: 5/22/2007, Entered: 5/22/2007 Set/Reset Hearings
Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 6/20/2007 10:30 AM in Courtroom 15 before Judge John Garrett Penn. (adc)
Blank -- Filed: 5/21/2007, Entered: 5/21/2007 Order
Minute ORDER rescheduling the status hearing set for May 23, 2007 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 15 to June 20, 2007 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 15. Signed by Judge John Garrett Penn on May 21, 2007.(lcpenn2)
Blank -- Filed: 4/27/2007, Entered: 4/27/2007 Set/Reset Hearings
Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 5/23/2007 10:30 AM in Courtroom 15 before Judge John Garrett Penn. (adc)
Blank -- Filed: 4/25/2007, Entered: 4/25/2007 Order
Minute ORDER scheduling a status hearing for May 23, 2007 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 15. Signed by Judge John Garrett Penn on April 25, 2007. (lcpenn2).
PDF 32 Filed: 4/24/2007, Entered: 4/24/2007 Memorandum & OpinionCourt Filing
MEMORANDUM OPINION re Motion for summary judgment [25]. See for details. Signed by Judge John Garrett Penn on April 24, 2007. (lcpenn2).
Blank -- Filed: 4/17/2007, Entered: 4/17/2007 Order
Minute ORDER cancelling the status hearing scheduled for April 25, 2007. The Court will reschedule the status hearing at a later date. Also, a Memorandum Opinion explaining the Court's Order denying the Motion for summary judgment is forthcoming. Signed by Judge John Garrett Penn on April 17, 2007. (lcpenn2)
PDF 31 Filed: 3/30/2007, Entered: 3/30/2007 Order on Motion for Summary JudgmentCourt Filing
ORDER denying [25] Motion for Summary Judgment. See Order for details and date of status hearing. Signed by Judge John Garrett Penn on March 30, 2007.(lcpenn2)
Blank -- Filed: 3/30/2007, Entered: 3/30/2007 Set/Reset Hearings
Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 4/25/2007 10:00 AM in Courtroom 15 before Judge John Garrett Penn. (adc)
Blank -- Filed: 8/23/2006, Entered: 8/23/2006 Set/Reset Deadlines
Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants Response to motion for summary judgment due by 8/15/2006. (rje)
Blank -- Filed: 8/23/2006, Entered: 8/23/2006 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
Minute ORDER nunc pro tunc granting [26] Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment One Day Later. Defendants' may file their Opposition to plaintiff's Motion for summary judgment on August 15, 2006. Signed by Judge John Garrett Penn on August 23, 2006.(lcpenn2)
PDF 30 Filed: 8/17/2006, Entered: 8/17/2006 Large Additional Attachment(s)
ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT by WILLIAM P. TEDARDS, JR [26] Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for SJ One Day Later filed by WILLIAM P. TEDARDS, JR.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 4 - 02-05-03 OFM letter# (2) Exhibit 01-08-03 WPT MM to Miller# (3) Exhibit 01-08-03 rev'd 10-07-02 WPT MM to Miller# (4) Exhibit 01-09-04 WPT MM to Miller# (5) Exhibit 01-14-04 WPT L to Miller# (6) Exhibit 01-14-04 2003 Tedards repair-replacement costs# (7) Exhibit 08-31-04 WPT L to Massey# (8) Exhibit 10-07-02 WPT MM to Miller# (9) Exhibit 11-30-04 WPT L to DOJ Wainstein# (10) Exhibit 11-30-04 2003 Tedards repair-replacement cost, REVISED# (11) Exhibit 02-09-05 WPT L to DOJ Wainstein)(Tedards, William) Modified on 8/17/2006 (lc, ).
PDF 29 Filed: 8/17/2006, Entered: 8/17/2006 Large Additional Attachment(s)
ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT by WILLIAM P. TEDARDS, JR [26] Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for SJ One Day Later filed by WILLIAM P. TEDARDS, JR.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 3b - 104 Pictures, 3410 Garfield St)(Tedards, William)
Blank -- Filed: 8/16/2006, Entered: 8/16/2006 Notice of Corrected Docket Entry
NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRIES: re [28] MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Defendants' Opposition to Plsintiff's Motion for SJ One Day Later, and [27] MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for SJ One Day Later were entered in error as the filings are not motions but attachments to the motion filed under docket number 26. Counsel was instructed to refile said pleadings as additional attachments. (tg, )
PDF 28 Filed: 8/15/2006, Entered: 8/15/2006, Terminated: 8/16/2006 Motion for Extension of Time to File
ENTERED IN ERROR.....MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Defendants' Opposition to Plsintiff's Motion for SJ One Day Later by WILLIAM P. TEDARDS, JR. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit EXH 4 - 02/05/03 letter from OFM to WPT# (2) Exhibit 01/08/03 Tedards MM to Miller# (3) Exhibit 01/08/03, revised 10/07/02 repair list fo Miller# (4) Exhibit 01/09/04 Tedards MM to Miller re preliminary list of 2003 expenses# (5) Exhibit 01/14/04 Tedards letter to Miller re 2003 expenses# (6) Exhibit 01/14/04 2003 Tedards repair-replacement costs# (7) Exhibit 08/31/04 Tedards letter to Massey# (8) Exhibit 10/07/02 Tedards MM to Miller# (9) Exhibit 11/30/04 Tedards letter to DOJ Wainstein# (10) Exhibit 11/30/04 Tedards 2003 repair-replacement costs, revised# (11) Exhibit 02/09/05 Tedards letter to DOJ Wainstein)(Tedards, William) Modified on 8/16/2006 (tg, ).
PDF 27 Filed: 8/15/2006, Entered: 8/15/2006, Terminated: 8/16/2006 Motion for Extension of Time to File
ENTERED IN ERROR.....MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for SJ One Day Later by WILLIAM P. TEDARDS, JR. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit EXH 3b - pictures #1-103, 3410 Garfield Street)(Tedards, William) Modified on 8/16/2006 (tg, ).
PDF 26 Filed: 8/15/2006, Entered: 8/15/2006, Terminated: 8/23/2006 Motion for Extension of Time to File
Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for SJ One Day Later by WILLIAM P. TEDARDS, JR. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Declaration of William P. Tedards# (2) Text of Proposed Order proposed Order# (3) Defendants Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for SJ# (4) Memorandum of P&A# (5) # (6) Exhibit EXH 1 - 08/14/06 Declaration of William Tedards# (7) Exhibit EXH 2 - 04/25/06 Declaration of William Tedards# (8) Exhibit EXH 3a - pictures #1-51, 3410 Garfield St)(Tedards, William)
PDF 25 Filed: 7/14/2006, Entered: 7/14/2006, Terminated: 3/30/2007 Motion for Summary Judgment
MOTION for Summary Judgment by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1# (2) Exhibit # (3) Exhibit # (4) Exhibit # (5) Exhibit # (6) Exhibit # (7) Exhibit # (8) Exhibit # (9) Exhibit # (10) Exhibit # (11) Exhibit # (12) Exhibit # (13) Exhibit # (14) Exhibit # (15) Text of Proposed Order)(Mussenden, Paul)
Blank -- Filed: 7/7/2006, Entered: 7/7/2006 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
Minute ORDER granting [24] Motion for Extension of Time to File Dispositive Motion. Plaintiff shall file its dispositive Motion on or before July 14, 2006. Signed by Judge John Garrett Penn on July 7, 2006.(lcpenn2)
PDF 24 Filed: 7/6/2006, Entered: 7/6/2006, Terminated: 7/7/2006 Motion for Extension of Time to File
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Dispositive Motion by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Mussenden, Paul)
Blank -- Filed: 6/20/2006, Entered: 6/20/2006 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
Minute ORDER granting [23] Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff shall file its dispositive Motion on or before July 7, 2006. Signed by Judge John Garrett Penn on June 20, 2006. (lcpenn2)
PDF 23 Filed: 6/19/2006, Entered: 6/19/2006, Terminated: 6/20/2006 Motion for Extension of Time to File
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Dispositive Motion by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # (1))(Mussenden, Paul)
Blank -- Filed: 5/8/2006, Entered: 5/8/2006 Set Deadlines
Minute Order granting Plaintiff's Consent Motion for Enlargement of Time [22]. Plaintiff shall file its dispositive Motion on or before June 20, 2006.(lcpenn2)
PDF 22 Filed: 5/5/2006, Entered: 5/5/2006, Terminated: 5/8/2006 Motion for Extension of Time to
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to file Dispositive Motion by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Mussenden, Paul)
PDF 21 Filed: 3/1/2006, Entered: 3/1/2006 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
ORDER granting Joint Motion to Modify the Scheduling Order [20]. See Order for details. Signed by Judge John Garrett Penn on March 1, 2006.(lcpenn2)
PDF 20 Filed: 2/24/2006, Entered: 2/24/2006, Terminated: 3/1/2006 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
MOTION (JOINT) to Modify the Scheduling Order by WILLIAM P. TEDARDS, JR, YVONNE TEDARDS, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, WILLIAM P. TEDARDS, JR, YVONNE TEDARDS. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Mussenden, Paul)
PDF 19 Filed: 11/8/2005, Entered: 11/8/2005 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER adopting joint schedule of parties for discovery. See Order for details. Signed by Judge John Garrett Penn on November 8, 2005. (lcpenn2)
Blank -- Filed: 11/8/2005, Entered: 11/8/2005 Set/Reset Deadlines
Set/Reset Deadlines: Discovery due by 2/28/2006. Dispositive Motions due by 3/20/2006. Response to Dispositive Motions due by 4/20/2006. Reply to Dispositive Motions due by 5/9/2006. (jwb)
PDF 18 Filed: 11/2/2005, Entered: 11/2/2005, Terminated: 11/2/2005 Motion for Extension of Time to File
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Status Report by WILLIAM P. TEDARDS, JR, YVONNE TEDARDS, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, WILLIAM P. TEDARDS, JR, YVONNE TEDARDS. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Mussenden, Paul)
Blank -- Filed: 11/2/2005, Entered: 11/2/2005 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
MINUTE ORDER granting Motion for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report. Signed by Judge John Garrett Penn on November 2, 2005.(lcpenn2, )
Blank -- Filed: 11/1/2005, Entered: 11/1/2005 Notice of Corrected Docket Entry
NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document No. 16 was entered in error and counsel was instructed to refile said pleading as a Motion. (rje, )
PDF 17 Filed: 10/31/2005, Entered: 10/31/2005 Status Report
STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report Regarding Settlement and Further Proceedings by WILLIAM P. TEDARDS, JR, YVONNE TEDARDS, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, WILLIAM P. TEDARDS, JR, YVONNE TEDARDS. (Mussenden, Paul)
PDF 16 Filed: 10/31/2005, Entered: 10/31/2005 Errata
ENTERED IN ERROR......ERRATA Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Submit Status Report by WILLIAM P. TEDARDS, JR, YVONNE TEDARDS, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, WILLIAM P. TEDARDS, JR, YVONNE TEDARDS. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Mussenden, Paul) Modified on 11/1/2005 (rje, ).
Blank -- Filed: 10/31/2005, Entered: 10/31/2005 Notice of Corrected Docket Entry
NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document No. 15 was entered in error as the complete filing was not received and counsel was instructed to refile said pleading. (rje )
PDF 15 Filed: 10/28/2005, Entered: 10/28/2005, Terminated: 10/31/2005 Motion for Extension of Time to File
ENTERED IN ERROR.....Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Status Report by WILLIAM P. TEDARDS, JR, YVONNE TEDARDS, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, WILLIAM P. TEDARDS, JR, YVONNE TEDARDS. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Mussenden, Paul) Modified on 10/31/2005 (rje, ).
PDF 14 Filed: 10/24/2005, Entered: 10/24/2005 Answer to Counterclaim
ANSWER to Counterclaim by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA.(Mussenden, Paul)
PDF 13 Filed: 9/14/2005, Entered: 9/14/2005 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
ORDER granting [12] Plaintiff's Consent Motion for Enlargement of Time. Plaintiff shall file a response to defendants' counterclaim on or before October 24, 2005. Signed by John Garrett Penn on September 14, 2005.(lcjgp3)
Blank -- Filed: 9/8/2005, Entered: 9/8/2005 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Set Deadlines/Hearings: Status Report due by 10/21/2005. Status Conference set for 11/8/2005 10:00 AM in Courtroom 15 before Judge John Garrett Penn. (jwb)
PDF 12 Filed: 9/7/2005, Entered: 9/7/2005, Terminated: 9/14/2005 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re [6] Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # (1))(Mussenden, Paul)
PDF 11 Filed: 9/7/2005, Entered: 9/7/2005 Notice (Other)
NOTICE OF ENTRY AND WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCES by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Mussenden, Paul)
PDF 10 Filed: 9/7/2005, Entered: 9/7/2005 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER setting a status hearing for November 8, 2005 at 10:00 A.M. in Courtroom 15. The parties shall submit a joint report to the Court on or before October 21, 2005 detailing the status of their negotiations and the possibility of settlement. Signed by Judge John Garrett Penn on September 7, 2005. (lcjgp3)
PDF 9 Filed: 8/10/2005, Entered: 8/10/2005 Status Report
STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, WILLIAM P. TEDARDS, JR, YVONNE TEDARDS. (Sonfield, Brian)
PDF 8 Filed: 7/20/2005, Entered: 7/20/2005 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER staying discovery pending the outcome of ongoing settlement negotiations. The parties shall submit a joint report on or before August 12, 2005 detailing the status of negotiations. A status hearing shall be held on September 7, 2005 at 10:00 A.M. Signed by Judge John Garrett Penn on July 20, 2005. (lcjgp3)
Blank -- Filed: 7/19/2005, Entered: 7/19/2005 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Set Deadlines/Hearings: Status Report due by 8/12/2005. Status Conference set for 9/7/2005 10:00 AM in Courtroom 15 before Judge John G. Penn. (jwb)
Blank -- Filed: 7/19/2005, Entered: 7/19/2005 Scheduling Conference
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John Garrett Penn : Scheduling Conference held on 7/19/2005. Parties to file status report by 8/12/2005. Status Conference set for 9/7/2005 at 10 A.M. (Court Reporter Bryan Wayne.) (jwb)
PDF 7 Filed: 7/11/2005, Entered: 7/11/2005 Meet and Confer Statement
MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Tedards, William)
PDF 6 Filed: 7/11/2005, Entered: 7/11/2005 Answer to Complaint
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against all plaintiffs by WILLIAM P. TEDARDS, JR, YVONNE TEDARDS.(Tedards, William)
PDF 5 Filed: 7/5/2005, Entered: 7/5/2005 Summons Returned Executed
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. WILLIAM P. TEDARDS, JR served on 5/31/2005, answer due 6/20/2005 (Sonfield, Brian)
PDF 4 Filed: 7/5/2005, Entered: 7/5/2005 Summons Returned Executed
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. YVONNE TEDARDS served on 5/31/2005, answer due 6/20/2005 (Sonfield, Brian)
PDF 3 Filed: 6/24/2005, Entered: 6/24/2005 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER for Initial Scheduling Hearing. An initial scheduling conference shall be held on July 19, 2005 at 9:30 A.M. in Courtroom 15. The Joint Statement shall be filed on or before July 12, 2005. Signed by Judge John Garrett Penn on June 24, 2005. (lcjgp3)
Blank -- Filed: 6/24/2005, Entered: 6/24/2005 Set/Reset Hearings
Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 7/19/2005 09:30 AM in Courtroom 15 before Judge John G. Penn. (jwb)
PDF 2 Filed: 6/20/2005, Entered: 6/20/2005 Answer to Complaint
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by WILLIAM P. TEDARDS, JR, YVONNE TEDARDS.(Tedards, William)
PDF 1 Filed: 5/17/2005, Entered: 5/18/2005 Complaint
COMPLAINT against WILLIAM P. TEDARDS, JR, YVONNE TEDARDS (Filing fee $ 0.00) filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B# (3) Exhibit C)(rje, )
Blank -- Filed: 5/17/2005, Entered: 5/18/2005 Summons Issued
Summons (2) Issued as to WILLIAM P. TEDARDS, JR, YVONNE TEDARDS. (rje, )

Statistics

This case has been viewed 112 times.

No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Need Password Help?