USA v. Minuto, et al
Florida Southern District Court, Case No. 0:00-cr-06088-UU
docket://gov.uscourts.flsd.0-00-cr-06088-UU (What is this?)

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
This docket can only tell you so much. Get the rest.
Access comprehensive profiles on judges, firms, lawyers, and more with PlainSite Pro and Pro Se.
United States of America, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Michael John Dittoe +1 202 307 3804 +3567 356 356 7230 michael.dittoe2@usdoj.gov
J. Brian McCormick +1 954 356 7255 +3567 356 356 7230 brian.mccormick@usdoj.gov
Elizabeth Ruf Stein +1 305 961 9313 +1 305 530 7195 elizabeth.stein@usdoj.gov
Office Ft. Lauderdale
Filed 4/4/2000
County Broward
Terminated 11/30/2001
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 1
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1962-7440.F
Offense Level 4
181962-7440.F RACKETEERING - GAMBLING
Count 2
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1956-7481.F
Offense Level 4
181956-7481.F MONEY LAUNDERING-RACKETEERING
Count 5
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 894.F
Offense Level 4
18894.F COLLECTION OF CREDIT BY EXTORTION
Count 7
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1955.F
Offense Level 4
181955.F ILLEGAL GAMBLING
Def Custody Status Released
Flags REF_PTRL, STB
  Entries (94) Calendar Events Related (0) Tools Right End
PDF 412 Filed: 3/6/2003, Entered: 3/7/2003 Acknowledgment of Receipt
ACKNOWLEDGMENT of receipt as to Joseph Minuto of: PROB 22 package by: District of New Jersey ; Date: 2/25/03 ; Other Court Case # cr 03-75 (tb, Deputy Clerk)
PDF 411 Filed: 2/21/2003, Entered: 2/21/2003 Transfer Out/ProbationerCourt Filing
TRANSFER OF JURISDICTION of Probation/Supervised Release as to Joseph Minuto . Transmitted Transfer of Jurisdiction form, with certified copies of indictment, judgment and docket sheet to District of New Jersey. Effective Date: 1/29/03 ( Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro-Benages on 7/26/02) [EOD Date: 2/21/03] (tb, Deputy Clerk)
Blank 397 Filed: 4/30/2002, Entered: 5/2/2002 Sealed Document
SEALED DOCUMENT (Former Deputy Clerk)
Blank 396 Filed: 4/30/2002, Entered: 5/2/2002 Sealed Document
SEALED DOCUMENT (Former Deputy Clerk)
Blank 395 Filed: 4/30/2002, Entered: 5/2/2002 Sealed Document
SEALED DOCUMENT (Former Deputy Clerk)
Blank 392 Filed: 3/29/2002, Entered: 3/29/2002 Sealed Document
SEALED DOCUMENT (Former Deputy Clerk)
Blank 391 Filed: 2/27/2002, Entered: 3/5/2002 Sealed Document
SEALED DOCUMENT (Former Deputy Clerk)
Blank 390 Filed: 2/27/2002, Entered: 3/5/2002 Sealed Document
SEALED DOCUMENT (Former Deputy Clerk)
PDF 387 Filed: 2/8/2002, Entered: 2/12/2002 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER as to Joseph Minuto granting [386-1] motion to extend time to voluntary surrender date as to Joseph Minuto (3) ( Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro-Benages on 2/8/02) [EOD Date: 2/12/02] CCAP (tb, Deputy Clerk)
PDF 386 Filed: 2/7/2002, Entered: 2/8/2002, Terminated: 2/8/2002 Motion for Extension of Time to File
UNOPPOSED MOTION by Joseph Minuto to extend time to voluntary surrender date (tb, Deputy Clerk)
Blank 384 Filed: 1/23/2002, Entered: 1/24/2002 Sealed Document
SEALED DOCUMENT (Former Deputy Clerk)
Blank 383 Filed: 1/18/2002, Entered: 1/22/2002 Sealed Document
SEALED DOCUMENT (Former Deputy Clerk)
Blank 382 Filed: 1/16/2002, Entered: 1/18/2002 Sealed Document
SEALED DOCUMENT (Former Deputy Clerk)
Blank 381 Filed: 1/16/2002, Entered: 1/18/2002 Sealed Document
SEALED DOCUMENT (Former Deputy Clerk)
PDF 378 Filed: 1/14/2002, Entered: 1/15/2002 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER as to Joseph Minuto granting [377-1] motion to extend time to extend date of voluntary surrender as to Joseph Minuto (3) ( Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro-Benages on 1/14/02) [EOD Date: 1/15/02] CCAP (tb, Deputy Clerk)
PDF 377 Filed: 1/9/2002, Entered: 1/10/2002, Terminated: 1/14/2002 Motion for Extension of Time to File
UNOPPOSED MOTION by Joseph Minuto to extend time to extend date of voluntary surrender (tb, Deputy Clerk)
PDF 374 Filed: 12/26/2001, Entered: 12/27/2001 Order Adopting Report and RecommendationsCourt Filing
ORDER adopting as to Joseph Minuto granting [363-1] motion to amend [354-1] judgment order ;the Court recommends direct designation to Newark, New Jersey's Comprehensive Sanction Center ( Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro-Benages on 12/19/01) [EOD Date: 12/27/01] CCAP (tb, Deputy Clerk)
PDF 371 Filed: 12/12/2001, Entered: 12/13/2001 Response to Motion
RESPONSE by USA as to Joseph Minuto re emergency unopposed motion to amend judgment (tb, Deputy Clerk)
PDF 363 Filed: 12/5/2001, Entered: 12/6/2001, Terminated: 12/26/2001 Motion to Amend/Correct
EMERGENCY UNOPPOSED MOTION by Joseph Minuto to amend [354-1] judgment order (tb, Deputy Clerk)
PDF 356 Filed: 11/30/2001, Entered: 12/3/2001 Minutes - MiscellaneousCourt Filing
Minutes of sentencing held on 11/30/01 before Judge Ursula Ungaro-Benages as to Joseph Minuto ; Court Reporter Name or Tape #: William Romanishin (dg, Deputy Clerk)
PDF 354 Filed: 11/30/2001, Entered: 12/3/2001 JudgmentCourt Filing
JUDGMENT as to Joseph Minuto (3) count(s) 7. Imprisoned for term of 1 YEAR & 1 DAY and 3 years of supervised release; Assessment $100; Fine $20,000 , Joseph Minuto (3) count(s) 1, 2 , 5 . Dismissed ( Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro-Benages on 11/30/01) [EOD Date: 12/3/01] CCAP (dg, Deputy Clerk)
Blank -- Filed: 11/30/2001, Entered: 12/3/2001 Sentencing
Sentencing held Joseph Minuto (3) count(s) 7 (dg, Deputy Clerk)
Blank 351 Filed: 11/28/2001, Entered: 11/30/2001 Sealed Document
SEALED DOCUMENT with attachments (Former Deputy Clerk)
PDF 338 Filed: 8/28/2001, Entered: 8/29/2001 Minutes - MiscellaneousCourt Filing
Minutes of pending motions held on 8/21/01 before Judge Ursula Ungaro-Benages as to Marco Minuto, Nicolo Mariani, Joseph Minuto, Marcello Grasso, Alex Torrente, Chris Greco, Julio Perez, Angel Hernandez, Jorge Ravelo ; Court Reporter Name or Tape #: William Romanishin (tb, Deputy Clerk)
Blank 324 Filed: 8/27/2001, Entered: 8/27/2001 Sealed Document
SEALED DOCUMENT - TRANSCRIPT (Former Deputy Clerk)
PDF 328 Filed: 8/24/2001, Entered: 8/27/2001 Notice of HearingCourt Filing
NOTICE of Hearing as to Joseph Minuto : setting Sentencing for 1:30 11/30/01 for Joseph Minuto before Judge Ursula Ungaro-Benages (tb, Deputy Clerk)
PACER 326 Filed: 8/24/2001, Entered: 8/27/2001 Plea Agreement
Plea Agreement as to Joseph Minuto (tb, Deputy Clerk)
PDF 323 Filed: 8/23/2001, Entered: 8/24/2001 Minutes - MiscellaneousCourt Filing
Minutes of continuation of hearing held on 8/22/01 before Judge Ursula Ungaro-Benages as to Marco Minuto, Nicolo Mariani, Joseph Minuto ; Court Reporter Name or Tape #: William Romanishin (tb, Deputy Clerk)
PDF 322 Filed: 8/23/2001, Entered: 8/24/2001 Minutes - MiscellaneousCourt Filing
Minutes of continuation of motion hearing held on 8/23/01 before Judge Ursula Ungaro-Benages as to Marco Minuto, Nicolo Mariani, Joseph Minuto ; Court Reporter Name or Tape #: William Romanishin (tb, Deputy Clerk)
PDF 319 Filed: 8/23/2001, Entered: 8/24/2001 Minutes - MiscellaneousCourt Filing
Minutes of change of plea held on 8/23/01 before Judge Ursula Ungaro-Benages as to Joseph Minuto ; Court Reporter Name or Tape #: William Romanshin (tb, Deputy Clerk)
Blank -- Filed: 8/23/2001, Entered: 8/24/2001 Change of Plea Hearing
Change of Plea Hearing as to Joseph Minuto held (tb, Deputy Clerk)
Blank -- Filed: 8/23/2001, Entered: 8/24/2001 Plea Entered
PLEA entered by Joseph Minuto . Court accepts plea. GUILTY: Joseph Minuto (3) count(s) 7 (tb, Deputy Clerk)
Blank 318 Filed: 8/22/2001, Entered: 8/24/2001 Sealed Document
SEALED DOCUMENT (Former Deputy Clerk)
Blank 313 Filed: 8/21/2001, Entered: 8/22/2001 Sealed Document
SEALED DOCUMENT (Former Deputy Clerk)
Blank 312 Filed: 8/21/2001, Entered: 8/22/2001 Sealed Document
SEALED DOCUMENT (Former Deputy Clerk)
Blank 311 Filed: 8/21/2001, Entered: 8/22/2001 Sealed Document
SEALED DOCUMENT (Former Deputy Clerk)
Blank 310 Filed: 8/20/2001, Entered: 8/22/2001 Sealed Document
SEALED DOCUMENT (Former Deputy Clerk)
Blank 309 Filed: 8/20/2001, Entered: 8/22/2001 Sealed Document
SEALED DOCUMENT (Former Deputy Clerk)
Blank 305 Filed: 8/17/2001, Entered: 8/21/2001 Sealed Document
SEALED DOCUMENT with attachments (Former Deputy Clerk)
Blank 304 Filed: 8/17/2001, Entered: 8/21/2001 Sealed Document
SEALED DOCUMENT (Former Deputy Clerk)
PDF 288 Filed: 8/9/2001, Entered: 8/10/2001 Minutes - MiscellaneousCourt Filing
Minutes of status conference held on 8/9/01 before Judge Ursula Ungaro-Benages as to All Defendants ; Court Reporter Name or Tape #: William Romanishin (dg, Deputy Clerk)
Blank 287 Filed: 8/9/2001, Entered: 8/10/2001 Sealed Document
SEALED DOCUMENT (Former Deputy Clerk)
Blank 286 Filed: 8/9/2001, Entered: 8/10/2001 Sealed Document
SEALED DOCUMENT (Former Deputy Clerk)
Blank 285 Filed: 8/9/2001, Entered: 8/10/2001 Sealed Document
SEALED DOCUMENT (Former Deputy Clerk)
Blank -- Filed: 8/9/2001, Entered: 8/10/2001 Status Conference
Status conference as to Marco Minuto, Nicolo Mariani, Joseph Minuto, Marcello Grasso, Alex Torrente, Chris Greco, Julio Perez, Angel Hernandez, Jorge Ravelo held (dg, Deputy Clerk)
Blank 272 Filed: 7/30/2001, Entered: 8/1/2001 Sealed Document
SEALED DOCUMENT (Former Deputy Clerk)
PDF 246 Filed: 7/3/2001, Entered: 7/5/2001 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER as to Joseph Minuto granting [233-1] motion to Adopt Motion of Other Defendant as to Joseph Minuto (3) ( Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro-Benages on 7/1/01) [EOD Date: 7/5/01] CCAP (Former Deputy Clerk)
PDF 245 Filed: 7/3/2001, Entered: 7/5/2001 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER as to Joseph Minuto granting [238-1] motion to Adopt Motion of Other Defendant [218-1] motion to dismiss count 5, [218-2] motion for Bill of Particulars, [218-3] motion for Bill of Particulars as to count six as to Joseph Minuto (3) (Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro-Benages on 7/1/01) [EOD Date: 7/5/01] CCAP (Former Deputy Clerk)
Blank -- Filed: 7/3/2001, Entered: 7/5/2001 Utility - Miscellaneous
Motion(s) joined by Joseph Minuto : joinder in [218-1] motion to dismiss count 5, joinder in [218-2] motion for Bill of Particulars, joinder in [218-3] motion for Bill of Particulars as to count six (Former Deputy Clerk)
PDF 238 Filed: 6/13/2001, Entered: 6/14/2001, Terminated: 7/3/2001 Motion for Joinder
MOTION by Joseph Minuto to Adopt Motion of Other Defendant [218-1] motion to dismiss count 5, [218-2] motion for Bill of Particulars, [218-3] motion for Bill of Particulars as to count six (tb, Deputy Clerk)
PDF 233 Filed: 6/11/2001, Entered: 6/12/2001, Terminated: 7/3/2001 Motion for Joinder
MOTION by Joseph Minuto to Adopt Motion of Other Defendant (tb, Deputy Clerk)
Blank 261 Filed: 6/6/2001, Entered: 7/19/2001 Sealed Document
SEALED DOCUMENT (yc, Deputy Clerk)
Blank 226 Filed: 6/6/2001, Entered: 6/7/2001 Sealed Document
SEALED DOCUMENT (Former Deputy Clerk)
PDF 225 Filed: 6/6/2001, Entered: 6/7/2001 Order
ORDER as to Joseph Minuto granting [200-1] motion to modify the conditions of bond as to Joseph Minuto (3), granting [200-2] motion expand the scope of permitted travel to include the States of New York , New Jersey and Florida as to Joseph Minuto (3) ( Signed by Magistrate Stephen T. Brown on 6/5/01) CCAP [EOD Date: 6/7/01] CCAP (tb, Deputy Clerk)
Blank 222 Filed: 6/4/2001, Entered: 6/5/2001 Sealed Document
SEALED DOCUMENT (Former Deputy Clerk)
Blank 221 Filed: 6/4/2001, Entered: 6/5/2001 Sealed Document
SEALED DOCUMENT (Former Deputy Clerk)
PDF 213 Filed: 6/4/2001, Entered: 6/5/2001 Order Referring Case to Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
ORDER REFERRING CASE Magistrate Judge Stephen T. Brown ( Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro-Benages on 6/4/01) CCAP [EOD Date: 6/5/01] (tb, Deputy Clerk)
PDF 200 Filed: 5/23/2001, Entered: 5/24/2001, Terminated: 6/6/2001 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
UNOPPOSED MOTION by Joseph Minuto to modify the conditions of bond , and expand the scope of permitted travel to include the States of New York , New Jersey and Florida (tb, Deputy Clerk)
PDF 187 Filed: 4/11/2001, Entered: 4/12/2001 Waiver of Speedy Trial
WAIVER of Speedy Trial by Joseph Minuto (tb, Deputy Clerk)
Blank 183 Filed: 4/2/2001, Entered: 4/2/2001 Sealed Document
SEALED DOCUMENT (Former Deputy Clerk)
PDF 185 Filed: 3/30/2001, Entered: 4/2/2001 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER as to Marco Minuto, Nicolo Mariani, Joseph Minuto, Marcello Grasso, Alex Torrente, Chris Greco, Julio Perez, Angel Hernandez, Jorge Ravelo reset calendar call for 1:00 8/22/01 for Marco Minuto, for Nicolo Mariani, for Joseph Minuto, for Marcello Grasso, for Alex Torrente, for Chris Greco, for Julio Perez, for Angel Hernandez, for Jorge Ravelo before Judge Ursula Ungaro-Benages , reset Jury trial for 9:00 8/27/01 for Marco Minuto, for Nicolo Mariani, for Joseph Minuto, for Marcello Grasso, for Alex Torrente, for Chris Greco, for Julio Perez, for Angel Hernandez, for Jorge Ravelo before Judge Ursula Ungaro-Benages , to Continue in Interest of Justice ( Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro-Benages on 3/28/01) CCAP [EOD Date: 4/2/01] CCAP (tb, Deputy Clerk)
Blank 178 Filed: 3/15/2001, Entered: 3/19/2001 Sealed Document
SEALED DOCUMENT (Former Deputy Clerk)
Blank 177 Filed: 3/15/2001, Entered: 3/19/2001 Sealed Document
SEALED DOCUMENT (Former Deputy Clerk)
PDF 174 Filed: 3/9/2001, Entered: 3/12/2001 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER as to Marco Minuto, Nicolo Mariani, Joseph Minuto, Marcello Grasso, Alex Torrente, Chris Greco, Julio Perez, Angel Hernandez, Jorge Ravelo granting [169-1] motion to continue calendar call as to Marco Minuto (1) reset Jury trial for 9:00 3/26/01 for Marco Minuto, for Nicolo Mariani, for Joseph Minuto, for Marcello Grasso, for Alex Torrente, for Chris Greco, for Julio Perez, for Angel Hernandez, for Jorge Ravelo before Judge Ursula Ungaro-Benages , reset calendar call for 1:00 3/21/01 for Marco Minuto, for Nicolo Mariani, for Joseph Minuto, for Marcello Grasso, for Alex Torrente, for Chris Greco, for Julio Perez, for Angel Hernandez, for Jorge Ravelo before Judge Ursula Ungaro-Benages , to Continue in Interest of Justice ( Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro-Benages on 3/6/01) CCAP [EOD Date: 3/12/01] CCAP (tb, Deputy Clerk)
Blank 155 Filed: 12/15/2000, Entered: 12/19/2000 Sealed Document
SEALED DOCUMENT (Former Deputy Clerk)
Blank 154 Filed: 12/15/2000, Entered: 12/19/2000 Sealed Document
SEALED DOCUMENT (Former Deputy Clerk)
PDF 151 Filed: 11/6/2000, Entered: 11/7/2000 Certification
Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure and by Joseph Minuto (tb, Deputy Clerk)
PDF 130 Filed: 8/3/2000, Entered: 8/4/2000 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER as to Joseph Minuto granting [129-1] motion to Modify Conditions of Release of bond to reduce required in person reporting to PTS as to Joseph Minuto (3) ( Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro-Benages on 8/3/00) CCAP [EOD Date: 8/4/00] CCAP (tb, Deputy Clerk)
PDF 129 Filed: 8/2/2000, Entered: 8/3/2000, Terminated: 8/3/2000 Motion to Modify Conditions of Release
MOTION by Joseph Minuto to Modify Conditions of Release of bond to reduce required in person reporting to PTS (tb, Deputy Clerk)
PDF 125 Filed: 7/20/2000, Entered: 7/21/2000 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
MOTION by Joseph Minuto for Jeffrey S. Weiner, Esq. to withdraw as attorney (Former Deputy Clerk)
PDF 119 Filed: 7/14/2000, Entered: 7/17/2000 Order Referring Case to Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
ORDER REFERRING CASE Magistrate Judge Brown ( Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro-Benages on 7/11/00) CCAP [EOD Date: 7/17/00] (dg, Deputy Clerk)
PDF 113 Filed: 7/10/2000, Entered: 7/11/2000 Motion for Bond
UNOPPOSED MOTION by Joseph Minuto to modify conditions of Bond to permit vacation travel (tb, Deputy Clerk)
PDF 98 Filed: 6/23/2000, Entered: 6/23/2000 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER as to Marco Minuto, Nicolo Mariani, Joseph Minuto, Marcello Grasso, Alex Torrente, Chris Greco, Julio Perez, Angel Hernandez, Jorge Ravelo set Jury trial for 9:00 2/26/01 for Marco Minuto, for Nicolo Mariani, for Joseph Minuto, for Marcello Grasso, for Alex Torrente, for Chris Greco, for Julio Perez, for Angel Hernandez, for Jorge Ravelo before Judge Ursula Ungaro-Benages , set calendar call for 1:00 2/21/01 for Marco Minuto, for Nicolo Mariani, for Joseph Minuto, for Marcello Grasso, for Alex Torrente, for Chris Greco, for Julio Perez, for Angel Hernandez, for Jorge Ravelo before Judge Ursula Ungaro-Benages , to Continue in Interest of Justice ( Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro-Benages on 6/16/00) CCAP [EOD Date: 6/23/00] CCAP (Former Deputy Clerk)
PDF 95 Filed: 6/13/2000, Entered: 6/14/2000 Response to Standing Discovery Order
SECOND RESPONSE to Standing Discovery Order by USA as to Marco Minuto, Nicolo Mariani, Joseph Minuto, Marcello Grasso, Alex Torrente, Chris Greco, Julio Perez, Angel Hernandez, Jorge Ravelo (tb, Deputy Clerk)
PDF 93 Filed: 6/12/2000, Entered: 6/14/2000 Warrant Returned Executed
Arrest WARRANT Returned Executed as to Joseph Minuto on 5/3/00 (tb, Deputy Clerk)
PDF 82 Filed: 6/6/2000, Entered: 6/7/2000 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER as to Joseph Minuto granting [62-1] motion for William J. Hunt to appear pro hac vice as to Joseph Minuto (3) ( Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro-Benages on 6/5/00) CCAP [EOD Date: 6/7/00] CCAP (tb, Deputy Clerk)
PDF 86 Filed: 6/1/2000, Entered: 6/7/2000 Bond
APPEARANCE BOND entered by Joseph Minuto in Amount $ 100,000 CSB Approved by Magistrate Stephen T. Brown . Surrender passports/travel documents; Report to PTS as follows 2x weekly by phone, 2x weekly in person: Additional conditions: travel permitted to SDFL for matters involving this case w/prior notice to PTS for m (tb, Deputy Clerk)
PDF 76 Filed: 6/1/2000, Entered: 6/2/2000 Standing Discovery Order
STANDING DISCOVERY ORDER as to Marco Minuto, Joseph Minuto, Chris Greco all motions concerning matters not covered by this order must be filed within 28 days of this order ( Signed by Magistrate Stephen T. Brown on 5/31/00) Tape # 00D-50-30 CCAP (tb, Deputy Clerk)
PDF 75 Filed: 6/1/2000, Entered: 6/2/2000 Notice of Temporary Attorney Appearance - Defendan
NOTICE of Temporary Appearance for Joseph Minuto by Attorney William Hunt (tb, Deputy Clerk)
PDF 70 Filed: 6/1/2000, Entered: 6/2/2000 Arraignment Information Sheet
ARRAIGNMENT INFORMATION SHEET for Joseph Minuto (3) count(s) 1, 2, 5, 7 NOT GUILTY PLEA ENTERED as to all counts. Court accepts plea. (tb, Deputy Clerk)
PDF 66 Filed: 6/1/2000, Entered: 6/2/2000 Order on Initial Appearance
ORDER on Initial Appearance as to Joseph Minuto Bond set to 100K CSB for Joseph Minuto., surrender all passports and travel documents to the PTS , report to PTS 2x weekly by telephone, 2x times a week in person, travel permitted to SDFL for matters involving this case w/prior notice to PTS ( Signed by Magistrate Stephen T. Brown on 5/31/00) Tape # 00D-50-30 CCAP (tb, Deputy Clerk)
Blank -- Filed: 6/1/2000, Entered: 6/2/2000 Plea Entered
PLEA entered by Joseph Minuto . Court accepts plea. NOT GUILTY: Joseph Minuto (3) count(s) 1, 2, 5, 7 (tb, Deputy Clerk)
PDF 62 Filed: 5/30/2000, Entered: 5/30/2000, Terminated: 6/6/2000 Filing Fee Received
Clerk's receipt. Number: 822791 in the amount of $ 75.00 for attorney admission by Joseph Minuto (tb, Deputy Clerk)
PDF 62 Filed: 5/30/2000, Entered: 5/30/2000, Terminated: 6/6/2000 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Limited Appearance)
MOTION by Joseph Minuto for William J. Hunt to appear pro hac vice (tb, Deputy Clerk)
PDF 63 Filed: 5/26/2000, Entered: 5/31/2000 Rule 5(c)(3)/Rule 40 Documents Received
Rule 40 Documents as to Marco Minuto, Joseph Minuto, Chris Greco received from District of New Jersey-Newark ,They're out on bond (tb, Deputy Clerk)
PDF 61 Filed: 5/24/2000, Entered: 5/24/2000 Response to Standing Discovery Order
RESPONSE to Standing Discovery Order by USA as to Marco Minuto, Nicolo Mariani, Joseph Minuto, Marcello Grasso, Alex Torrente, Chris Greco, Julio Perez, Angel Hernandez, Jorge Ravelo (tb, Deputy Clerk)
PDF 60 Filed: 5/24/2000, Entered: 5/24/2000 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER as to Marco Minuto, Nicolo Mariani, Joseph Minuto, Marcello Grasso, Alex Torrente, Chris Greco, Julio Perez, Angel Hernandez, Jorge Ravelo set calendar call for 1:00 6/14/00 for Marco Minuto, for Nicolo Mariani, for Joseph Minuto, for Marcello Grasso, for Alex Torrente, for Chris Greco, for Julio Perez, for Angel Hernandez, for Jorge Ravelo before Judge Ursula Ungaro-Benages , set Jury trial for 9:00 6/19/00 for Marco Minuto, for Nicolo Mariani, for Joseph Minuto, for Marcello Grasso, for Alex Torrente, for Chris Greco, for Julio Perez, for Angel Hernandez, for Jorge Ravelo before Judge Ursula Ungaro-Benages ( Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro-Benages on 5/23/00) CCAP [EOD Date: 5/24/00] CCAP (tb, Deputy Clerk)
Blank -- Filed: 5/3/2000, Entered: 5/31/2000 Arrest - Other District
ARREST of Marco Minuto, Joseph Minuto, Chris Greco in New Jersey-Newark (tb, Deputy Clerk)
PDF 19 Filed: 5/2/2000, Entered: 5/9/2000 Order
ORDER as to Marco Minuto, Nicolo Mariani, Joseph Minuto, Marcello Grasso, Alex Torrente, Chris Greco, Julio Perez, Angel Hernandez, Jorge Ravelo to Unseal ( Signed by Magistrate Barry L. Garber on 5/2/00) CCAP [EOD Date: 5/9/00] CCAP (Former Deputy Clerk)
Blank -- Filed: 5/2/2000, Entered: 5/5/2000 Indictment Unsealed
Indictment unsealed as to Marco Minuto, Nicolo Mariani, Joseph Minuto, Marcello Grasso, Alex Torrente, Chris Greco, Julio Perez, Angel Hernandez, Jorge Ravelo (tb, Deputy Clerk)
PDF 3 Filed: 4/4/2000, Entered: 4/5/2000 Indictment (Sealed)
SEALED INDICTMENT as to Marco Minuto (1) count(s) 1, 2, 3-4, 5, 6, 7, Nicolo Mariani (2) count(s) 1, 3-4, 5, 6, 7, Joseph Minuto (3) count(s) 1, 2, 5, 7, Marcello Grasso (4) count(s) 1, 2, 3-4, 5, 6, 7, 9, Alex Torrente (5) count(s) 1, 7, 8, 9, Chris Greco (6) count(s) 1, 2, 7, Julio Perez (7) count(s) 1, 8, 9, Angel Hernandez (8) count(s) 1, 8, Jorge Ravelo (9) count(s) 1, 8 (Criminal Category 4) (dd, Deputy Clerk)
PDF 2 Filed: 4/4/2000, Entered: 4/5/2000 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER as to Marco Minuto, Nicolo Mariani, Joseph Minuto, Marcello Grasso, Alex Torrente, Chris Greco, Julio Perez, Angel Hernandez, Jorge Ravelo granting [1-1] motion to seal indictment as to Marco Minuto (1), Nicolo Mariani (2), Joseph Minuto (3), Marcello Grasso (4), Alex Torrente (5), Chris Greco (6), Julio Perez (7), Angel Hernandez (8), Jorge Ravelo (9) ( Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow on 4/4/00) CCAP [EOD Date: 4/5/00] CCAP (dd, Deputy Clerk)
PDF 1 Filed: 4/4/2000, Entered: 4/5/2000, Terminated: 4/4/2000 Motion to Seal
MOTION by USA as to Marco Minuto, Nicolo Mariani, Joseph Minuto, Marcello Grasso, Alex Torrente, Chris Greco, Julio Perez, Angel Hernandez, Jorge Ravelo to seal indictment until arrest of first defendant. (dd, Deputy Clerk)
Blank -- Filed: 4/4/2000, Entered: 4/5/2000 Magistrate Judge Selection
Magistrate identification: Magistrate Judge Stephen T. Brown (dd, Deputy Clerk)

Statistics

This case has been viewed 356 times.

No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Need Password Help?