Great American Life Insurance Company v. Eric Carl Kreis et al
California Central District Court, Case No. 2:13-cv-07481
District Judge Philip S. Gutierrez, presiding
docket://gov.uscourts.cacd.2-13-cv-07481 (What is this?)

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
This docket can only tell you so much. Get the rest.
Access comprehensive profiles on judges, firms, lawyers, and more with PlainSite Pro and Pro Se.
No Logo Great American Life Insurance Company, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Locke Lord Bissell & Liddell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Lilian Mazian Khanjian +1 213 485 1500 +1 213 341 6789 lkhanjian@lockelord.com
Mitchell James Popham +1 213 485 1500 +1 213 485 1200 mpopham@lockelord.com
v.
No Logo Does, Defendant
No Logo Eric Carl Kreis, Defendant
No Logo Peter Zambouros, Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1335
Nature of Suit 110 Insurance
  Entries (14) Calendar Events Related (0) Tools Right End
PACER 14 Filed: 12/27/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez, re Stipulation to Dismiss Case, 13 : This action is herewith dismissed with prejudice by way of the stipulation of the parties submitted pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure Rule 41 (a) (1). (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (bm) (Entered: 12/30/2013)
PACER 13 Filed: 12/23/2013, Entered: None
STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure Rule 41(a)(1) filed by Plaintiff Great American Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Stipulation For Dismissal With Prejudice)(Khanjian, Lilian) (Entered: 12/23/2013)
PACER 12 Filed: 12/2/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of Settlement filed by Plaintiff Great American Life Insurance Company. (Popham, Mitchell) (Entered: 12/02/2013)
PACER 11 Filed: 11/5/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: re: Dismissal for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Interpleader Plaintiff Great American Life Insurance Company ("GALIC")...The Court orders GALIC to show cause in writing no later than December 5, 2013 why this action should not be dismissed without prejudice for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Failure to respond by the above date will result in the Court dismissing this action. The Court further orders GALIC to promptly serve this minute order on any defendant who has been served with the complaint, or who is served before the date specified above. (PLEASE REVIEW DOCUMENT FOR FULL AND COMPLETE DETAILS) (Response to Order to Show Cause due by 12/5/2013.) (lw) (Entered: 11/06/2013)
PACER 10 Filed: 11/5/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting Stipulation Continuing Response Deadline, 9 , by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: For the defendant ERIC CARL KREIS the present response deadline is November 1, 2013 and for the defendant PETER ZAMBOUROS, as executor of the ESTATE OF POLLY KESSEN it is November 4, 2013. This Stipulation is entered into due to the fact the claimants to the funds which are the subject of this interpleader action are actively trying to negotiate a resolution to the claims which could make further prosecution of the case unnecessary. Therefore, the parties mutually agree upon a new response deadline of November 27, 2013 as to each defendant. IT IS SO ORDERED. (lw) (Entered: 11/06/2013)
PACER 9 Filed: 11/1/2013, Entered: None
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Eric Carl Kreis answer now due 11/27/2013; Peter Zambouros answer now due 11/27/2013, re Complaint - (Discovery), 1 filed by Plaintiff Great American Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Khanjian, Lilian) (Entered: 11/01/2013)
PACER 8 Filed: 10/24/2013, Entered: None
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Great American Life Insurance Company, upon Defendant Peter Zambouros served on 10/14/2013, answer due 11/4/2013. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Peter Zambouros (Executor of The Estate of Polly Kessen) in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons NOT returned. (Khanjian, Lilian) (Entered: 10/24/2013)
PACER 7 Filed: 10/16/2013, Entered: None
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Great American Life Insurance Company, upon Defendant Eric Carl Kreis served on 10/11/2013, answer due 11/1/2013. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Arthur H. Weed, Esq. (attorney authorized to accept service) in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service by mail and by also mailing a copy. Original Summons NOT returned. (Khanjian, Lilian) (Entered: 10/16/2013)
PACER 6 Filed: 10/10/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (ji) (Entered: 10/10/2013)
PACER 5 Filed: 10/9/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 10/09/2013)
PACER 4 Filed: 10/9/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff Great American Life Insurance Company. Related Case(s): Not Indicated. (et) (mg). (Entered: 10/09/2013)
PACER 3 Filed: 10/9/2013, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE AS TO Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Great American Life Insurance Company, identifying Other Affiliate Great American Financial Resources Inc for Great American Life Insurance Company. (et) (mg). (Entered: 10/09/2013)
PACER 2 Filed: 10/9/2013, Entered: None
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 as to Defendants Eric Carl Kreis, Peter Zambouros. (et) (Entered: 10/09/2013)
PDF 1 Filed: 10/9/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
COMPLAINT against Defendants Eric Carl Kreis, Peter Zambouros, Does 1 through 10 Inclusive. Case assigned to Judge Philip S. Gutierrez for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (Filing fee $ 400 PAID.) Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiff Great American Life Insurance Company. (et) (mg). (Entered: 10/09/2013)

Statistics

This case has been viewed 13 times.

No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Need Password Help?