USA v. Ahuna
Hawaii District Court, Case No. 1:04-cr-00011-KSC
docket://gov.uscourts.hid.1-04-cr-00011 (What is this?)

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
This docket can only tell you so much. Get the rest.
Access comprehensive profiles on judges, firms, lawyers, and more with PlainSite Pro and Pro Se.
United States of America, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Hiep P. Pham +5412 541 541 2850

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Gabriel Colwell +5412 541 541 2850 +5412 541 541 2958 Keirsten.kennedy@usdoj.gov
Clare E. Connors +5412 541 541 2850 clare.connors@usdoj.gov
Loretta A. Sheehan +5412 541 541 2850 loretta.sheehan@usdoj.gov
Office Hawaii
Filed 1/8/2004
County Honolulu
Terminated 7/18/2005
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 1
Citation Section 21 U.S.C. § 844A=CP.M
Offense Level 3
21844 CONTROLLED SUBSTANCE - POSSESSION, METHAMPHETAMINE, HMR, 8/24/03
Def Custody Status Custody This Court
Flag TERMED
  Entries (37) Calendar Events Related (0) Tools Right End
PDF 34 Filed: 12/12/2006, Entered: 12/13/2006 Judgment Returned Executed
Judgment Returned Executed as to Shanena C. Ahuna on 11/29/06. (afc)
PDF 33 Filed: 11/1/2006, Entered: 11/2/2006 Judgment - Revocation of Probation or Supervised RCourt Filing
JUDGMENT (Revocation of Probation or Supervised Release) as to Shaena C. Ahuna . Signed by Judge LESLIE E KOBAYASHI on 11/01/06. (afc)
Blank -- Filed: 11/1/2006, Entered: 11/2/2006 Court's Certificate of Service
COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of [33] Judgment - Revocation of Probation or Supervised Release has been served upon counsel of record who, as Registered Participants of CM/ECF, received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (afc)
PDF 32 Filed: 10/23/2006, Entered: 10/30/2006 Revocation of Probation - Final Hearing
EP: Order to Show Cause as to Why Probation Should Not Be Revoked - Defendant present in custody. Defendant indicated her true and correct nameis Shaena Ahuna. Court finds that the Defendant has violated the conditions of her probation. Probation revoked. SENTENCE: Imprisonment: 6 Months. Supervised Release: None. Defendant remanded to the custody of the US Marshal. (FTR-Ctrm 7; TIME: 10:35-10:48) (JUDGE LESLIE E KOBAYASHI )(afc)
PDF 31 Filed: 10/20/2006, Entered: 10/20/2006 Warrant Returned Executed
Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 10/19/06. in case as to Shanena C. Ahuna. (emt, )
Blank 30 Filed: 10/20/2006, Entered: 10/20/2006 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
EO : Order to Show Cause as to Why Probation Should Not Be Revoked set for 10/23/2006 at 10:30 AM before JUDGE LESLIE E KOBAYASHI. (JUDGE LESLIE E KOBAYASHI )(wnn, )
PDF 28 Filed: 10/19/2006, Entered: 10/19/2006 Prob 12C-Request for Course of ActionCourt Filing
PROBATION FORM 12C-Request for Course of Action as to Shanena C. Ahuna . Signed by Judge LESLIE E KOBAYASHI on 10/18/2006. (gab, ) Modified on 10/20/2006 Unsealed, warrant returned executed on 10/20/06, deft arrrested on 10/19/06 (emt, ).
Blank -- Filed: 10/19/2006, Entered: 10/20/2006 Arrest
Arrest of Shanena C. Ahuna, 10/19/06 (emt, )
Blank 27 Filed: 12/28/2005, Entered: 1/1/2006 Amended JudgmentCourt Filing
Request for Modifying the Conditions or Term of Supervision with Consent of the Offender - by Judge KEVIN S.C. CHANG - As to Shanena C. Ahuna: Conditions of Supervision modified as follows: GENERAL CONDITION: That the defendant shall refrain from any unlawful use of a controlled substance. Shall submit to one drug test within 15 days of the commencement of supervision and at least two periodic drug tests thereafter but no more than 8 valid durg test per month during the term of supervision. SPECIAL CONDITION 2: That the defendant participate in a mental health treatment at the discretion and direction of the U.S. Probation Office. SPECIAL CONDITION 3: That the defendant shall comply with all plans and recommendations of Child Welfare Services, at the discretion and direction of the Probation Office.(afc)
Blank 26 Filed: 10/20/2005, Entered: 10/20/2005 Judgment Returned Executed
JUDGMENT and Commitment returned executed on 10/5/05 as to Shanena C. Ahuna (1) count(s) 1 to FDC-Honolulu (afc)
PDF 25 Filed: 8/11/2005, Entered: 8/12/2005 Judgment Court Filing
JUDGMENT and Commitment as to Shanena C. Ahuna by Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (cc: all counsel) (gab) Additional attachment(s) added on 8/11/2006 (tbf, ).
Blank 24 Filed: 8/9/2005, Entered: 8/11/2005 Minutes - MiscellaneousCourt Filing
EO: MINUTES: Defendant was sentenced on 7-14-05. The special assessment was not addressed. $25.00 is now assessed. Michael Weight to notify the defendant. signed by Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren [23-2] amended sentence Shanena C. Ahuna (1) count(s) 1.: 08/09/2005 - The special assessment $25.00 as to Shanena C. Ahuna (bbb)
PDF 22 Filed: 7/18/2005, Entered: 7/19/2005 Judgment Court Filing
JUDGMENT and Commitment as to Shanena C. Ahuna by Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (cc: all counsel) (eps) Additional attachment(s) added on 7/25/2006 (bbb, ).
Blank 23 Filed: 7/14/2005, Entered: 7/19/2005 Minutes - MiscellaneousCourt Filing
EP: MINUTES: Further Order to Show Cause Why Probation Should Not be Revoked - deft present in custody. PO Lisa Jicha present. Court finds that the defendant violated the terms of Probation. Probation is revoked. The Deferred Acceptance of Guilty Plea is revoked; amended sentence Shanena C. Ahuna (1) count(s) 1. Sentence: Imprisonment 6 months Supervised Release 12 months Conditions of Supervised Release: That the defendant shall abide by the standard conditions of supervision. That the defendant not commit any crimes, federal, state, or local (mandatory condition). That the defendant not possess illegal controlled substances (mandatory condition) That the defendant shall refrain from any unlawful use of a controlled substance. The defendant shall submit to one drug test within 15 days from release from imprisonment and at least two drug tests thereafter, as directed by the Probation Office (mandatory condition). That the defendant shall not possess a firearm, ammunition, destructive device, or any other dangerous weapon. That the defendant participate in a substance abuse program, which may include drug and alcohol testing, at the discretion and direction of the Probation Office. The defendant is to refrain from the possession and/or use of alcohol while participating in substance abuse treatment. Deft advised of right to appeal. MITTIMUS FORTHWITH. as to Shanena C. Ahuna [17-1] ; Shanena C. Ahuna present, Loretta Sheehan for Clare Connors; Shanlyn Park ( Ct Rptr: C6 10:13-10:21) by Judge Barry M Kurren (eps)
Blank 21 Filed: 7/1/2005, Entered: 7/3/2005 Minutes - MiscellaneousCourt Filing
EP: MINUTES: Order to Show Cause Why Probation Should Not Be Revoked - defendant present, in custody. Defendant is ready to admit to the 3 violations. Court requests to look into residential treatment options before making a final determination. Further Order to Show Cause Why Probation Should Not Be Revoked set 7/14/05 at 10:30am before Judge Kurren. Defendant is remanded to the custody of the USMS. [17-1] Violation of Supervised Release Hearing Held - Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren as to Shanena C. Ahuna ; Shanena C. Ahuna, USA Clare Connors; AFPD Shanlyn Park; USPO Lisa Jicha present (Ct Rptr: FTR-C6; Time: 1:43:55-2:00:08) by Judge Barry M. Kurren (afc)
Blank 20 Filed: 7/1/2005, Entered: 7/3/2005 Warrant Returned Executed
ARREST Warrant returned executed as to Shanena C. Ahuna on 6/28/05 (afc)
Blank -- Filed: 7/1/2005, Entered: 7/3/2005 Arrest
ARREST of defendant Shanena C. Ahuna on 6/28/05 (afc)
Blank 19 Filed: 6/29/2005, Entered: 6/30/2005 Notice of Hearing Court Filing
NOTICE of hearing setting hearing on [17-1] CR04-11, USA v. Shanena Ahuna - Order to Show Cause as to Why Probation Should Not Be Revoked set 7/1/05 at 1:30pm before Judge Kurren. SAUSA: Capt. Matthew Watters; AFPD: Shanlyn Park - by Shari Afuso, CRM (afc)
Blank 18 Filed: 6/15/2005, Entered: 6/15/2005 Warrant Issued Court Filing
ARREST Warrant issued for Shanena C. Ahuna bail set for NO BAIL by Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang (bbb)
Blank 17 Filed: 6/15/2005, Entered: 6/15/2005, Terminated: 7/14/2005 Miscellaneous DocumentCourt Filing
PETITION for Revocation of Probation; BW ordered, for Shanena C. Ahuna by Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang (bbb)
Blank 16 Filed: 8/25/2004, Entered: 8/27/2004 Summons Returned Executed
PS executed on 8/24/04 as to Shanena C. Ahuna (afc)
PDF 15 Filed: 8/24/2004, Entered: 8/25/2004 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER OF PROBATION under 18 USC 3607 by Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren as to Shanena Ahuna (cc: all counsel) (afc) Additional attachment(s) added on 9/13/2006 (tbf, ).
Blank 14 Filed: 8/24/2004, Entered: 8/25/2004 Minutes - MiscellaneousCourt Filing
EP: MINUTES: Non Jury Trial and Order to Show Cause Why Bail should not Be Revoked-Defendant not in Custody. Motion to Withdraw Not Guilty Plea and to Plead Anew- Court questions the Defendant. Defendant enters a DAG Plea pursuant to 18 U.S.C. 3607. [11-1] Sentencing Shanena C. Ahuna (1) count(s) 1. Sentence - Probation - 12 Months. 1.That the defendant shall abide by the standard conditions of supervision. 2.That the defendant not commit any crimes, federal, state, or local (mandatory condition). 3.That the defendant not possess illegal controlled substances (mandatory condition) 4.That the defendant shall refrain from any unlawful use of a controlled substance. The defendant shall submit to one drug test within 15 days of commencement of supervision and at least two drug tests thereafter, as directed by the Probation Office (mandatory condition). 5.That the defendant shall not possess a firearm, ammunition, destructive device, or any other dangerous weapon. 6.That the defendant participate in a substance abuse program, which may include drug testing at the discretion and direction of the Probation Office. 7.That the defendant be placed at Women's Way when a bedspace is available and defendant is to reside with her sister and grandmother until bedspace is available. Court hereby Waives the Fine. Special Assessment-$25.00. Order to Show Cause why Bail should not be Revoked is hereby withdrawn [11-1]. case terminated ; Shanena C. Ahuna, USA Attorney Hiep P. Pham; AFPD Shanlyn A.S. Park present (Ct Rptr: FTR C6 CD-10 9:54:28; by Judge Barry M. Kurren (afc)
Blank 12 Filed: 8/23/2004, Entered: 8/23/2004 Summons Issued Court Filing
PS issued as to Shanena C. Ahuna; osc hearing set for 9:00 8/24/04 for Shanena C. Ahuna before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (afc)
Blank 13 Filed: 8/19/2004, Entered: 8/25/2004 Notice of Hearing
NOTICE of hearing setting hearing onsetting hearing on OSC Why Bail Should Not be Revoked as to Shanena Ahuna is set for 8-24-04 @ 9 a.m., BMK. AUSA: Hiep Pham Deft's counsel: Shanlyn Park PTS: Carolyn Miyashiro/Carolyn Hall [11-1] (bbb)
Blank 11 Filed: 8/19/2004, Entered: 8/23/2004 Miscellaneous DocumentCourt Filing
PETITION for Action on Conditions of Pretrial Release Summons ordered, for Shanena C. Ahuna by Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (afc)
Blank 10 Filed: 4/28/2004, Entered: 4/29/2004 Description not availableCourt Filing
ORDER Setting Conditions of Release for Shanena C. Ahuna ($2,000.00 unsecured bond posted) by Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang (afc)
Blank 9 Filed: 4/28/2004, Entered: 4/29/2004 Detention - MiscellaneousCourt Filing
APPEARANCE BOND ($2,000.00 Unsecured) posted by Shanena C. Ahuna signed by Judge Kevin S.C. Chang (afc)
Blank 8 Filed: 4/28/2004, Entered: 4/29/2004 Financial Affidavit - CJA23
FINANCIAL Affidavit as to Shanena C. Ahuna (afc)
Blank 7 Filed: 4/28/2004, Entered: 4/29/2004 Minutes - MiscellaneousCourt Filing
EP: MINUTES: Initial Appearance and A&P to the Information - defendant present, in custody. Defendant sworn to the financial affidavit and request for court appointed attorney is granted. Ms. Faymonville and the Office of the Federal Public Defender are appointed as counsel for defendant. Arraignment waived, plea of Not Guilty entered Non Jury Trial set 8/24/04 at 9:00am before Judge Kurren Defendant is allowed up to 2 weeks prior to 8/24/04 to inform the Court whether she wishes to proceed with a Jury Trial. Speedy trial is excluded from 5/11/04 through 8/24/04. Bail - Execute an unsecured bond in the amount of $2,000. (7b) Comply with pretrial services supervision, and abide by all conditions of release as directed by Pretrial Services. (7h1) Travel is restricted to State of Hawaii; inter-island travel must be approved in advance by Pretrial Services. (7u) Do not use or possess illicit drugs, and do not be in the presence of illicit drug use or drug users/traffickers. (7z) You are required to clear all warrants by: May 7, 2004. Other Conditions: Based upon the results of a post release interview, you may be required to submit to drug and/or alcohol detection testing, undergo a substance abuse assessment, and/or participate in any recommended treatment, as directed by Pretrial Services. You must contribute toward the costs of the substance abuse testing and treatment services, to the extent you are financially able to do so, as determined by Pretrial Services. Defendant shall not commit any offense in violation of federal, state, or local law while on release in this case. Defendant shall appear at all proceedings as required and shall surrender for service of any sentence imposed as directed. [INITIAL APPEARANCE of Shanena C. Ahuna ; dft Shanena C. Ahuna arraignment waived; plea of NOT entered; Attorney present ; trial set for 9:00 8/24/04 for Shanena C. Ahuna ; $2,000.00 Unsecured Bond set for Shanena C. Ahuna] Shanena C. Ahuna, USA Attorney Jimmy Chen, AFPD Loretta A. Faymonville present (Ct Rptr: C5 CD3; Time: 1:19-1:27:14) by Judge Kevin S.C. Chang (afc)
Blank 6 Filed: 4/28/2004, Entered: 4/29/2004 Warrant Returned Executed
ARREST Warrant returned executed as to Shanena C. Ahuna on 4/28/04 (afc)
Blank -- Filed: 4/28/2004, Entered: 4/29/2004 Arrest
ARREST of defendant Shanena C. Ahuna on 4/28/04 (afc)
Blank 5 Filed: 2/10/2004, Entered: 2/11/2004 Summons Returned Executed
PS executed on 1/12/04 as to Shanena C. Ahuna: RRR 01/13/2004 (bbb) Modified on 02/11/2004
Blank 4 Filed: 1/28/2004, Entered: 1/28/2004 Warrant Issued Court Filing
ARREST Warrant issued for Shanena C. Ahuna bail set for $200.00 Cash by Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang (afc)
Blank 3 Filed: 1/27/2004, Entered: 1/28/2004 Minutes - MiscellaneousCourt Filing
EP: MINUTES: Initial Appearance and A & P as to the Information - Defendant not present. BW ordered issued - Bail - $200.00 Cash. USA Attorney Brett T. Egusa present (Ct Rptr: FTR-C5-39:33; TIME: 9:34-9:35) by Judge Kevin S.C. Chang (afc)
Blank 2 Filed: 1/9/2004, Entered: 1/12/2004 Summons Issued Court Filing
PS issued as to Shanena C. Ahuna ; arraignment set for 9:00 1/27/04 for Shanena C. Ahuna before Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang (gs)
Blank 1 Filed: 1/8/2004, Entered: 1/12/2004 Miscellaneous Document
INFORMATION by USA Shanena C. Ahuna (1) count(s) 1 (gs)

Statistics

This case has been viewed 12 times.

No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Need Password Help?