Arrington, et al v. Sarff
Illinois Central District Court, Case No. 1:03-cv-01263-HAB-JAG
District Judge Harold A. Baker, presiding
docket://gov.uscourts.ilcd.1-03-cv-01263-HAB (What is this?)

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
This docket can only tell you so much. Get the rest.
Access comprehensive profiles on judges, firms, lawyers, and more with PlainSite Pro and Pro Se.
No Logo Otis . Arrington, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Kathy Sarff, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by State of Illinois

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Eric J Rieckenberg +1 217 557 0261 +1 217 524 5091 erieckenberg@atg.state.il.us
Office Peoria
Filed 8/11/2003
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 555 - Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Judgment - Motion Before Trial
County Jefferson
Terminated 3/22/2006
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags 22, CLOSED, PRISONER, REFER
  Entries (58) Calendar Events Related (0) Tools Right End
Blank -- Filed: 1/22/2007, Entered: 1/29/2007 Prisoner Partial Filing Fee Received
Prisoner Partial Filing Fee received in the amount of $ 2.79; receipt number P18090 mailed to prisoner. (ML, ilcd)
Blank -- Filed: 6/26/2006, Entered: 6/27/2006 Prisoner Partial Filing Fee Received
Prisoner Partial Filing Fee received in the amount of $.32; receipt number P16287 mailed to prisoner. (ML, ilcd)
Blank -- Filed: 5/22/2006, Entered: 5/23/2006 Prisoner Partial Filing Fee Received
Prisoner Partial Filing Fee received in the amount of $ 2.70; receipt number P15973 mailed to prisoner. (ML, ilcd)
Blank -- Filed: 4/25/2006, Entered: 4/26/2006 Prisoner Partial Filing Fee Received
Prisoner Partial Filing Fee received in the amount of $ 3.00; receipt number P15718 mailed to prisoner. (ML, ilcd)
Blank -- Filed: 3/27/2006, Entered: 3/30/2006 Prisoner Partial Filing Fee Received
Prisoner Partial Filing Fee received in the amount of $ 2.99; receipt number P15420 mailed to prisoner. (ML, ilcd)
PDF 31 Filed: 3/22/2006, Entered: 3/22/2006 Judgment
JUDGMENT in a civil case in favor of defendant Kathy Sarff and against plaintiff Otis Arrington filed and entered. (ML, ilcd)
PDF 30 Filed: 3/22/2006, Entered: 3/22/2006 Order on Motion for Summary JudgmentCourt Filing
ORDER entered by Judge Harold A. Baker on 3/22/06 granting [23] Motion for Summary Judgment: IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED: (1) The defendant's motion for summary judgement is granted pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 56. [d/e 23] The Clerk of the Court is directed to enter judgment in favor of the defendant in accordance with this order. The parties are to bear their own costs. This case is terminated. (2) The agency having custody of the plaintiff is directed to remit the docketing fee of $150.00 from the plaintiff's prison trust fund account if such funds are available. If the plaintiff does not have $150.00 in his trust fund account, the agency must send 20 percent of the current balance, or the average balance during the past six months, whichever amount is higher; thereafter, the agency shall begin forwarding monthly payments from the plaintiff's trust fund account to the clerk of court eachtime the plaintiff's account exceeds $10.00 until the statutory fee of $150.00 is paid in its entirety. The filing fee collected shall not exceed the statutory filing fee of $150.00. (3) The plaintiff is responsible for ensuring the $150.00 filing fee is paid to the clerk of the court even though his case has been dismissed. Release from incarceration does not relieve the plaintiff of his obligation to pay the filing fee in full. The plaintiff must notify the clerk of the court of a change of address and phone number within seven days of such change. (4) The clerk is directed to mail a copy of this order to the plaintiff's place of confinement, to the attention of the Trust Fund Office. (cc: plaintiff/Correctional Center Trust Fund Office) (ML, ilcd)
PDF 29 Filed: 8/29/2005, Entered: 8/29/2005 Letter
Letter from pro se plaintiff inquiring as to the status of his case. (Copy of docket sheet sent to pro se plaintiff by clerk.) (ML, ilcd)
PDF 28 Filed: 5/19/2005, Entered: 5/19/2005 Notice of Change of Address
NOTICE of Change of Address by Otis Arrington, B01941 to Shawnee Correctional Center, 6665 State Route 146 East, Vienna, IL. 62995 (HK, ilcd)
PDF 27 Filed: 5/2/2005, Entered: 5/2/2005 Letter
Letter from pro se plaintiff requesting financial records of all payments made on his cases. (Copies of finance ledgers for case nos. 03-1263 and 99-1030 sent to pro se plaintiff by clerk) (ML, ilcd)
Blank -- Filed: 4/25/2005, Entered: 4/27/2005 Prisoner Partial Filing Fee Received
Prisoner Prepayment Fee received in the amount of $ 7.00; receipt number P12571. (KB, ilcd)
Blank -- Filed: 4/13/2005, Entered: 4/13/2005 Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
TEXT ORDER- The pretrial conference scheduled for April 20, 2005 is canceled and the writ is recalled. The deadline for filing a pretrial order is also canceled. The clerk is to notify the parties. A hearing and filing deadline will be rescheduled after consideration of the pending summary judgment motion. Entered by Judge Harold A. Baker on 4/13/05. (TD, ilcd)
Blank -- Filed: 3/28/2005, Entered: 3/30/2005 Filing Fee Received
Prisoner Filing fee paid:$25.90, receipt number P12329 (HK, ilcd)
PDF 26 Filed: 3/21/2005, Entered: 3/21/2005 Response to Motion
RESPONSE to Motion re [23] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Otis Arrington. (ML, ilcd)
PDF 25 Filed: 3/8/2005, Entered: 3/8/2005 Notice (Other)
Rule 56Sumjgm NOTICE re [23] MOTION for Summary Judgment sent to parties by clerk. (ML, ilcd)
PDF 24 Filed: 3/7/2005, Entered: 3/7/2005 Memorandum in Support of Motion
MEMORANDUM in Support re [23] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Kathy Sarff. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, B, & C)(Rieckenberg, Eric)
PDF 23 Filed: 3/7/2005, Entered: 3/7/2005, Terminated: 3/22/2006 Motion for Summary Judgment
MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendant Kathy Sarff. Responses due by 3/28/2005 (Rieckenberg, Eric)
Blank -- Filed: 2/28/2005, Entered: 3/2/2005 Prisoner Partial Filing Fee Received
Prisoner Prepayment Fee received in the amount of $ 17.60; receipt number P12093 mailed to prisoner. (ML, ilcd)
Blank -- Filed: 1/24/2005, Entered: 1/24/2005 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
TEXT ORDER: This cause is before the court for case management. Defendant Sarff's motion for extension of time to file an answer [17] is GRANTED. The Defendant has now filed an answer. The Defendants' motion to Substitute Attorney Kristen Markley with Attorney Eric Rieckenberg is GRANTED [20]. Atty Rieckenberg added & Markley termed for Dft. Motion to Extend the scheduling deadlines is also GRANTED [22]. The Final Pretrial Conf scheduled for 2/9/05 is CANCELED & the writ is recalled. The final pretrial order ddl of 2/7/5 is also CANCELED. The discovery period is now extended to 2/28/05. Any dispositive motions must be filed on or before 3/8/05. The Final Pretrial Conference is now rescheduled for 4/20/2005 at 01:30pm by Video Conferencing. Clerk directed to issue a writ for the parties participation in the video conferencing before Judge Harold A. Baker. Entered by Judge Harold A. Baker on 1/24/05. (HK, ilcd)
Blank -- Filed: 1/3/2005, Entered: 1/11/2005 Prisoner Partial Filing Fee Received
Prisoner Prepayment Fee received in the amount of $ 20.00; receipt number P11626 mailed to prisoner. (ML, ilcd)
PDF 22 Filed: 12/6/2004, Entered: 12/6/2004, Terminated: 1/24/2005 Motion for Extension of Time to File
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Dispositive Motion, MOTION to Reopen Discovery for Purpose of Taking Plaintiff's Deposition Only re [15] Order on Motion to Dismiss,,, Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines,, by Defendant Kathy Sarff. Responses due by 12/20/2004 Responses due by 12/20/2004 (Rieckenberg, Eric)
PDF 21 Filed: 12/6/2004, Entered: 12/6/2004 Notice of Appearance of Attorney
NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Eric J Rieckenberg on behalf of Kathy Sarff (Rieckenberg, Eric)
PDF 20 Filed: 12/6/2004, Entered: 12/6/2004, Terminated: 1/24/2005 Motion to Substitute Attorney
MOTION to Substitute Attorney, Kristen M. Markley to be replaced by Eric J. Rieckenberg, by Defendant Kathy Sarff. Responses due by 12/20/2004 (Rieckenberg, Eric)
Blank -- Filed: 11/24/2004, Entered: 11/29/2004 Prisoner Partial Filing Fee Received
Prisoner Prepayment Fee received in the amount of $ 19.40; receipt number P11348 mailed to prisoner. (ML, ilcd)
PDF 19 Filed: 10/29/2004, Entered: 10/29/2004 Letter
Letter from Otis Arrington dated 10/26/04 re:his monies in his trust fund account (HK, ilcd)
Blank -- Filed: 10/28/2004, Entered: 10/29/2004 Prisoner Partial Filing Fee Received
Prisoner payment fee received in the amount of $ 10.60; receipt number P11137. (KB, ilcd)
PDF 18 Filed: 10/15/2004, Entered: 10/15/2004 Answer to Complaint
ANSWER to Complaint by Defendant Kathy Sarff.(Markley, Kristen)
PDF 17 Filed: 10/5/2004, Entered: 10/5/2004, Terminated: 1/24/2005 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re [15] Order on Motion to Dismiss,,, Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines,, by Defendant Kathy Sarff. Responses due by 10/19/2004 (Markley, Kristen)
PDF 16 Filed: 9/21/2004, Entered: 9/21/2004 Writ Issued
VIDEO WRIT issued. (orig & 2 cc's to Warden Dixon Corr Center/copy Faxed to: IDOC Video Coordinator/Urbana Clerk's Office) (CL, ilcd)
PDF 15 Filed: 9/21/2004, Entered: 9/21/2004 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
ORDER granting in part and denying in part [8] Motion to Dismiss. All official capacity claims are dismissed. Discovery to be completed by 12/1/2004. Any dispositive motion due by 1/5/2005. A Pretrial Conference is set for Wed 2/9/2005 02:00 PM by video conference (court to initiate conference) before Judge Harold A. Baker. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 2/7/2005.Clerk directed to issue writ for the parties participation in the pretrial video conference on 2/9/04 at 2:00 p.m. Entered by Judge Harold A. Baker on 9/21/04. (cc: all counsel/pro se pla) (CL, ilcd)
Blank -- Filed: 8/25/2004, Entered: 8/26/2004 Prisoner Partial Filing Fee Received
Prisoner Prepayment Fee received in the amount of $ 2.36; receipt number P10626 mailed to prisoner. (ML, ilcd)
Blank 14 Filed: 8/11/2004, Entered: 8/11/2004 Notice of Change of Address
NOTICE of Change of Address by Otis. Arrington to Dixon Correctional Center as of 8/4/4 (HK, ilcd)
Blank 13 Filed: 7/21/2004, Entered: 7/21/2004 Letter
Letter from plaintiff requesting the status of his case - copy of docket sheet sent to pro se plaintiff by clerk (ML, ilcd)
Blank -- Filed: 7/21/2004, Entered: 7/23/2004 Prisoner Partial Filing Fee Received
Prisoner Prepayment Fee received in the amount of $ 2.10; receipt number P10345 mailed to prisoner. (ML, ilcd)
Blank -- Filed: 6/21/2004, Entered: 6/22/2004 Prisoner Partial Filing Fee Received
PRISONER PREPAYMENT of $ 2.43 received from plaintiff Otis Arrington. Receipt P10074 mailed. (ML, ilcd)
Blank -- Filed: 5/28/2004, Entered: 6/1/2004 Prisoner Partial Filing Fee Received
PRISONER PREPAYMENT of $ 3.00 received from plaintiff Otis . Arrington. Receipt P9892 mailed. (ML, ilcd)
Blank -- Filed: 4/19/2004, Entered: 4/20/2004 Prisoner Partial Filing Fee Received
PRISONER PREPAYMENT of $ 2.76 received from plaintiff Otis. Arrington. Receipt P9550 mailed. (ML, ilcd)
Blank -- Filed: 3/18/2004, Entered: 3/21/2004 Prisoner Partial Filing Fee Received
PRISONER PAYMENT of $1.97 received from plaintiff Otis . Arrington. Receipt P9329 mailed. (KB, ilcd)
Blank -- Filed: 3/1/2004, Entered: 3/2/2004 Prisoner Partial Filing Fee Received
PRISONER PREPAYMENT of $ 2.11 received from plaintiff Otis . Arrington. Receipt P9167 mailed. (S, ilcd)
Blank -- Filed: 1/20/2004, Entered: 1/22/2004 Prisoner Partial Filing Fee Received
PRISONER PREPAYMENT of $ 2.85 received from plaintiff Otis . Arrington. Receipt P8823 mailed. (ML, ilcd)
Blank -- Filed: 12/18/2003, Entered: 12/22/2003 Prisoner Partial Filing Fee Received
PRISONER PAYMENT of $ 3.00 received from plaintiff Otis . Arrington. Receipt P8581 mailed. (KB, ilcd)
Blank -- Filed: 12/15/2003, Entered: 12/15/2003 Minutes - Miscellaneous
MINUTE-ENTRY: by Judge Harold A. Baker. The Rule 16 Conference previously set at 2:30 pm on Friday, 1/9/04 is CANCELED. The clerk is to notify the parties. The hearing will be rescheduled after a decision on the pending motion to dismiss. The Court is denying the plaintiff's motion for appointment of counsel [11-1]. Appointment of counsel is not warranted in this case. Neither the legal issues raised in the complaint nor the evidence that might support the plaintiff's claims are so complex or intricate that a trained attorney is necessary. It should additionally be noted that the Court grants pro se litigants wide latitude in the handling of their lawsuits. Therefore, the plaintiff's motion for appointment of counsel is denied pursuant to Maclin v. Freake, 650 F.2d 885, 887-89 (7th Cir. 1981). See also Merritt v. Faulkner, 697 F.2d 761 763 (7th Cir. 1983) and Jackson v. County of McLean, 953 F.2d 1070, 1071 (7th Cir. 1992). (cc: all counsel/Arrington) (ML, ilcd)
Blank 12 Filed: 12/8/2003, Entered: 12/8/2003 Response to Motion
RESPONSE by plaintiff Otis Arrington to motion to dismiss plaintiff's complaint [8-1] (HK, ilcd)
Blank 11 Filed: 12/8/2003, Entered: 12/8/2003, Terminated: 12/15/2003 Motion to Appoint Counsel
MOTION by plaintiff Otis Arrington for appointment of counsel (HK, ilcd)
Blank -- Filed: 11/20/2003, Entered: 11/22/2003 Prisoner Partial Filing Fee Received
PRISONER PREPAYMENT of $ 3.00 received from plaintiff Otis . Arrington. Receipt P8356 mailed. (ML, ilcd)
Blank 10 Filed: 11/18/2003, Entered: 11/18/2003 Notice (Other)
Rule 56Dism NOTICE to pro se plaintiff re filing of dispositive motion and fourteen day response deadline, sent by clerk (ML, ilcd)
Blank 9 Filed: 11/17/2003, Entered: 11/18/2003 Memorandum in Support of Motion
MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT of motion to dismiss plaintiff's complaint [8-1] by defendant Kathy Sarff (ML, ilcd)
Blank 8 Filed: 11/17/2003, Entered: 11/18/2003, Terminated: 9/21/2004 Motion to Dismiss
MOTION by defendant Kathy Sarff to dismiss plaintiff's complaint (ML, ilcd)
Blank 7 Filed: 11/3/2003, Entered: 11/3/2003 Service - Miscellaneous
RETURN OF SERVICE executed upon defendant Kathy Sarff on 10/7/03 (ML, ilcd)
Blank -- Filed: 10/28/2003, Entered: 10/29/2003 Prisoner Partial Filing Fee Received
PRISONER PREPAYMENT of $ 2.85 received from plaintiff Otis . Arrington. Receipt P8153 mailed. (ML, ilcd)
Blank -- Filed: 9/22/2003, Entered: 9/23/2003 Prisoner Partial Filing Fee Received
PRISONER PREPAYMENT of $ 3.00 received from plaintiff Otis . Arrington. Receipt P7815 mailed. (ML, ilcd)
Blank 6 Filed: 9/3/2003, Entered: 9/3/2003 ComplaintCourt Filing
COMPLAINT (summons(es) issued) case referred to Mag. Judge John A. Gorman (ML, ilcd)
Blank 5 Filed: 9/3/2003, Entered: 9/3/2003 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
ORDER by Mag. Judge John A. Gorman: Plaintiff's motion to proceed without full prepayment of fees and costs, granted. USM to serve defendants. Dft to answer or respond to plaintiff's complaint within 60 days. Cause set for further scheduling procedures under FRCvP 16. at 2:30 pm on Friday, 1/9/04, by video conference before Judge Baker. Clerk to notify parties of their option to consent to disposition of case before a Magistrate Judge. (cc: pro se pltf/Correctional Center Trust Fund Office) (ML, ilcd)
Blank 4 Filed: 8/27/2003, Entered: 8/28/2003 Prisoner Partial Filing Fee Received
PRISONER PREPAYMENT of $ 6.27 received from plaintiff Otis Arrington. Receipt P7606 mailed. (ML, ilcd)
Blank 3 Filed: 8/21/2003, Entered: 8/21/2003 OrderCourt Filing
DEFICIENCY ORDER by Mag. Judge John A. Gorman. Pla must submit US Marshal form & summons form for the one Dft he sued within 21 days or by misc ddl of 9/12/03. Failure to do so will result in the case being dismissed without prejudice. (cc: all counsel) (HK, ilcd)
Blank 2 Filed: 8/21/2003, Entered: 8/21/2003 OrderCourt Filing
PREPAYMENT ORDER by Mag. Judge John A. Gorman Partial fee of $6.27 required by 9/18/03 for Otis Arrington or the case will be dismissed.(cc: Pla/finance/TF Office) (HK, ilcd)
Blank 1 Filed: 8/11/2003, Entered: 8/11/2003 Description not availableCourt Filing
PETITION to PROCEED IFP filed by plaintiff Otis C Arrington ; given to the judge for review (complaint received). Case referred to Mag. Judge John A. Gorman (SH, ilcd)
Blank -- Filed: 8/11/2003, Entered: 8/11/2003 Remark
Remark - Case assigned to Judge Mihm. Judge Mihm refers this case to Judge Harold A Baker for all pretrial proceedings. (SH, ilcd)

Statistics

This case has been viewed 78 times.

No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Need Password Help?