Ames v. Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company et al

Federal Civil Lawsuit Iowa Southern District Court, Case No. 4:11-cv-00359
District Judge Robert W. Pratt, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
District Judge Robert W. Pratt
Last Updated September 7, 2016 at 11:47 AM EDT (8.6 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Angela Ames, Plaintiff

Represented by FIEDLER LAW FIRM PLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paige Ellen Fiedler +1 515 254 1999 +1 515 254 9923 paige@employmentlawiowa.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Whitney C. Judkins +1 515 254 1999 +1 515 254 9923 whitney@employmentlawiowa.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Emily Elizabeth McCarty +1 515 254 1999 +2549 254 254 9923 emily@employmentlawiowa.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brooke C Timmer +1 515 254 1999 +1 515 254 9923 brooke@employmentlawiowa.com
v.
No Logo Karla Neel, Defendant
No Logo Nationwide Advantage Mortgage Company, Defendant
No Logo Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Defendant

Represented by Gonzalez Saggio & Harlan, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Julie Tomka Bittner +1 515 453 8509 +1 515 267 1408 julie_bittner@gshllp.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kerrie M Murphy +1 515 453 8509 +1 515 267 1408 kerrie_murphy@gshllp.com

Represented by NAVAL AIR WARFARE CENTER, AIRCRAFT DIV

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Laurie Jo Wiedenhoff +1 515 473 3146 LWiedenhoff@cwgins.com
No Logo Sara Sagers, Defendant
Attributes
Citation Unknown
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
Timeline
  Entries (112) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 1/20/2015, Entered: None Notice of Supreme Court Filing
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 10/3/2014, Entered: None Notice of Supreme Court Filing
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 3/14/2014, Entered: None
ORDER of USCA advising the judgment of the district court in this cause is Affirmed as to 105 Notice of Appeal filed by Angela Ames. (Attachments: # 1 Opinion, # 2 Judgment) (vr) (Entered: 03/14/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 1/24/2013, Entered: None
Documents Sent re 105 Notice of Appeal : CD for entry 44-2 (don, ) (Entered: 01/24/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 11/27/2012, Entered: None
USCA Scheduling Order as to 105 Notice of Appeal filed by Angela Ames. (vr) (Entered: 11/27/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 11/27/2012, Entered: None
USCA Case Number 12-3780 for 105 Notice of Appeal filed by Angela Ames. (vr) (Entered: 11/27/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 11/21/2012, Entered: None
NOTIFICATION OF APPEAL and NOA Supplement by District Court Clerk to USCA re 105 Notice of Appeal filed on 11/14/2012. (vr) (Entered: 11/21/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 11/14/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE OF APPEAL by Angela Ames. Fee paid in the amount of $455 receipt number 0863-1885875. (McCarty, Emily) (Entered: 11/14/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 10/23/2012, Entered: None
JUDGMENT in favor of Nationwide Advantage Mortgage Company, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Karla Neel against Angela Ames. Signed by Clerk Marjorie Krahn on 10/22/2012. (dv, ) (Main Document 104 replaced on 11/2/2012) (dv, ). (Entered: 10/23/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 103 Filed: 10/16/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER finding as moot 44 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 46 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 69 Motion for Hearing/Oral Argument; finding as moot 72 Motion to Strike ; finding as moot 75 Motion to Strike ; finding as moot 85 Motion to Continue; finding as moot 87 Motion in Limine; finding as moot 31 Motion. Signed by Senior Judge Robert W. Pratt on 10/16/2012. (mlm, ) (Entered: 10/16/2012)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 10/12/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
STIPULATED PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ross A. Walters on 10/12/2012. (kln) (Entered: 10/12/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 10/12/2012, Entered: None
Errata DEFENDANTS RESISTANCE TO PLAINTIFFS MOTIONS IN LIMINE (AND REQUEST FOR ORAL ARGUMENT) re 91 Response to Motion filed by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Karla Neel, Nationwide Advantage Mortgage Company. (Attachments: # 1 Ex. A)(Murphy, Kerrie) (Entered: 10/12/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 10/12/2012, Entered: None
TRIAL BRIEF by Nationwide Advantage Mortgage Company, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Karla Neel. (Murphy, Kerrie) (Entered: 10/12/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 10/12/2012, Entered: None
Proposed Jury Instructions by Nationwide Advantage Mortgage Company, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Karla Neel. (Murphy, Kerrie) (Entered: 10/12/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 10/12/2012, Entered: None
TRIAL BRIEF by Angela Ames. (Attachments: # 1 Attachments)(Fiedler, Paige) (Entered: 10/12/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 10/12/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE by Nationwide Advantage Mortgage Company, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Karla Neel DEFENDANTS PRELIMINARY JURY INSTRUCTIONS (Murphy, Kerrie) (Entered: 10/12/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 96 Filed: 10/12/2012, Entered: None
Sealed Document Motions in Limine by Nationwide Advantage Mortgage Company, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company. (Murphy, Kerrie) (Entered: 10/12/2012)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 10/12/2012, Entered: None
Proposed Voir Dire by Nationwide Advantage Mortgage Company, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Karla Neel. (Murphy, Kerrie) (Entered: 10/12/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 10/12/2012, Entered: None
Proposed Voir Dire by Angela Ames. (Fiedler, Paige) (Entered: 10/12/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 10/12/2012, Entered: None
Proposed Jury Instructions by Angela Ames. (Fiedler, Paige) (Entered: 10/12/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 10/12/2012, Entered: None
Errata re 91 Response to Motion filed by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Karla Neel, Nationwide Advantage Mortgage Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Murphy, Kerrie) (Entered: 10/12/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 10/12/2012, Entered: None
RESPONSE to Motion re 87 MOTION in Limine filed by Nationwide Advantage Mortgage Company, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Karla Neel. Replies due by 10/22/2012.(Murphy, Kerrie) (Entered: 10/12/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 10/12/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
TEXT ORDER: ORDER granting 86 defendants' motion for leave to file motions in limine under seal. Defendants may file their motions as sealed motions. Entered by Magistrate Judge Ross A. Walters on 10/12/2012.(kln) (Entered: 10/12/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 10/11/2012, Entered: None
REPLY re 85 MOTION to Continue THE TRIAL AND REQUEST FOR EXPEDITED RULING filed by Nationwide Advantage Mortgage Company, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Karla Neel.(Murphy, Kerrie) (Entered: 10/11/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 10/11/2012, Entered: None
RESPONSE to Motion re 85 MOTION to Continue THE TRIAL AND REQUEST FOR EXPEDITED RULING filed by Angela Ames. Replies due by 10/22/2012.(Fiedler, Paige) (Entered: 10/11/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 10/11/2012, Entered: None
MOTION in Limine by Angela Ames. Responses due by 10/29/2012 (McCarty, Emily) (Entered: 10/11/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 10/11/2012, Entered: None
MOTION for Leave to File under Seal EXPEDITED RELIEF REQUESTED by Nationwide Advantage Mortgage Company, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Karla Neel.Motions referred to Ross A. Walters. Responses due by 10/29/2012 (Murphy, Kerrie) (Entered: 10/11/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 10/11/2012, Entered: None
MOTION to Continue THE TRIAL AND REQUEST FOR EXPEDITED RULING by Nationwide Advantage Mortgage Company, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Karla Neel.Motions referred to Ross A. Walters. Responses due by 10/29/2012 (Murphy, Kerrie) (Entered: 10/11/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 10/10/2012, Entered: None
CAMERAS PILOT PROJECT: NOTIFICATION REGARDING VIDEO RECORDING - Parties should complete Form E, Party Response Regarding Video Recording, and return it to the Clerk's Office no later than 7 (seven) days before the scheduled hearing. Do NOT file Form E in CM/ECF. E-mail Form E to IASD_casemanagers@iasd.uscourts.gov. Notification and Party Response Forms Regarding Video Recording sent to Parties. (sc) (Entered: 10/10/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 10/2/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance by Paige Ellen Fiedler on behalf of Angela Ames (Fiedler, Paige) (Entered: 10/02/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 10/2/2012, Entered: None
RESPONSE to Motion re 72 MOTION to Strike Supplemental Appendix in Support of Her Resistance to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Angela Ames. Replies due by 10/12/2012.(McCarty, Emily) (Entered: 10/02/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 81 Filed: 9/18/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER denying 38 defendants' Motion to exclude testimony of plaintiff's expert Karin Beschen. See order for particulars. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ross A. Walters on 9/18/2012. (kln) (Entered: 09/18/2012)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 9/18/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 33 plaintiff's Motion to Compel. See ruling for particulars. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ross A. Walters on 9/18/2012. (kln) (Entered: 09/18/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 9/18/2012, Entered: None
REPLY to Resistance to Motion to Strike Expert Reports from the Court's Consideration in Summary Judgment and Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Supplemental Appendix in Support of Her Resistance to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment re 72 MOTION to Strike filed by Nationwide Advantage Mortgage Company, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Karla Neel.(Bittner, Julie) (Entered: 09/18/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 9/17/2012, Entered: None
RESPONSE to Motion re 72 MOTION to Strike filed by Angela Ames. Replies due by 9/27/2012.(McCarty, Emily) (Entered: 09/17/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 9/17/2012, Entered: None
REPLY - Supplemental Appendix in Support of Resistance to re 46 Amended MOTION for Summary Judgment AND REQUEST FOR ORAL ARGUMENT filed by Angela Ames.(McCarty, Emily) (Entered: 09/17/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 9/6/2012, Entered: None
RESPONSE to Motion re 75 MOTION to Strike Section II of Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Statement of Additional Material Facts filed by Nationwide Advantage Mortgage Company, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Karla Neel. Replies due by 9/17/2012.(Bittner, Julie) (Entered: 09/06/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 9/6/2012, Entered: None
MOTION to Strike Section II of Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Statement of Additional Material Facts by Angela Ames.Motions referred to Ross A. Walters. Responses due by 9/24/2012 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(McCarty, Emily) (Entered: 09/06/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 8/31/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
TEXT ORDER: ORDER granting 70 defendants' motion for leave to file overlength reply brief. The case manager shall detach the brief attached to the motion and link it to defendants' reply 71 as a brief in support of reply. Entered by Magistrate Judge Ross A. Walters on 8/31/2012. (kln) (Entered: 08/31/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 73 Filed: 8/30/2012, Entered: None
Sealed Document re 44 Reply to Response, Supplemental Appendix (Confidential) by Nationwide Advantage Mortgage Company, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company. (Murphy, Kerrie) Modified on 9/7/2012 (sk, ). (Entered: 08/30/2012)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 8/30/2012, Entered: None
MOTION to Strike by Nationwide Advantage Mortgage Company, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Karla Neel.Motions referred to Ross A. Walters. Responses due by 9/17/2012 (Attachments: # 1 Brief)(Murphy, Kerrie) (Entered: 08/30/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 8/30/2012, Entered: None
REPLY Response to Plaintiff's Statement of Additional Material Facts re 44 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Nationwide Advantage Mortgage Company, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Karla Neel. (Attachments: # 1 PUBLIC Supp Appndx)(Murphy, Kerrie) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/5/2012: # 2 Brief in Support) (gk, ). (Entered: 08/30/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 8/30/2012, Entered: None
MOTION to file overlength brief (Reply Brief in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment) by Nationwide Advantage Mortgage Company, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Karla Neel.Motions referred to Ross A. Walters. Responses due by 9/17/2012 (Attachments: # 1 Reply Brief)(Murphy, Kerrie) (Entered: 08/30/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 8/30/2012, Entered: None
MOTION for Hearing/Oral Argument by Angela Ames.Motions referred to Ross A. Walters. Responses due by 9/17/2012 (Timmer, Brooke) (Entered: 08/30/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 8/30/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
TEXT ORDER: ORDER granting 67 defendants' Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal. Defendants may file a Public Supplemental Appendix and may file under seal a Confidential Supplemental Appendix both in support of their reply brief in support of the Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ross A. Walters on 8/30/2012. (nsr) (Entered: 08/30/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 8/30/2012, Entered: None
MOTION for Leave to File under Seal (Expedited Relief Requested) by Nationwide Advantage Mortgage Company, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Karla Neel.Motions referred to Ross A. Walters. Responses due by 9/17/2012 (Murphy, Kerrie) (Entered: 08/30/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 8/27/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ross A. Walters: Motion Hearing held on 8/27/2012 re 33 MOTION to Compel filed by Angela Ames, 38 MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Plaintiff's Expert Karin Beschen and Request for Oral Argument filed by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Karla Neel, Nationwide Advantage Mortgage Company. (Court Reporter Christine Bierley.) (kln) (Entered: 08/27/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 8/23/2012, Entered: None
Brief in support by Angela Ames re 62 Response to Motion. (sc) (Entered: 08/23/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 8/21/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
TEXT ORDER: ORDER granting 63 plaintiff's motion for overlength brief in resistance to defendants' motion for summary judgment. The case manager shall detach the brief and file it separately, linking it to plaintiff's resistance 62 as a supporting brief. Entered by Magistrate Judge Ross A. Walters on 8/21/2012. (kln) (Entered: 08/21/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 8/20/2012, Entered: None
MOTION to file overlength brief by Angela Ames.Motions referred to Ross A. Walters. Responses due by 9/7/2012 (Attachments: # 1 Brief in Support)(McCarty, Emily) (Entered: 08/20/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 8/20/2012, Entered: None
RESPONSE to Motion re 46 Amended MOTION for Summary Judgment AND REQUEST FOR ORAL ARGUMENT filed by Angela Ames. Replies due by 8/30/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Response to Defendants' Statement of Facts, # 2 Statement of Additional Material Facts, # 3 Appendix)(McCarty, Emily) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/22/2012: # 4 Brief in Support) (sk, ). (Entered: 08/20/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 8/15/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
TEXT ORDER: ORDER SETTING HEARING ON MOTIONS. On Monday, August 27, 2012, at 2:00 p.m. at the U.S. Courthouse in Des Moines, Iowa, the undersigned will hold a hearing on plaintiff's Motion to Compel 33 and defendants' Motion to Exclude Testimony of Plaintiff's Expert Karin Beschen 38 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Ross A. Walters on 8/15/2012. (nsr) (Entered: 08/15/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 8/15/2012, Entered: None
REPLY re 38 MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Plaintiff's Expert Karin Beschen and Request for Oral Argument filed by Nationwide Advantage Mortgage Company, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Karla Neel. (gk, ) (Entered: 08/15/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 8/14/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
TEXT ORDER: For good cause shown, plaintiff's motion for extension of time is granted 56 . Plaintiff may have to and including Monday, August 20, 2012, to respond to defendants' motion for summary judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ross A. Walters on 8/14/2012. (nsr) (Entered: 08/14/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 8/14/2012, Entered: None
REPLY to Defendants' Resistance to re 56 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Angela Ames.(Timmer, Brooke) (Entered: 08/14/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 8/13/2012, Entered: None
RESPONSE to Motion re 56 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (EXPEDITED RULING REQUESTED) filed by Nationwide Advantage Mortgage Company, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Karla Neel. Replies due by 8/23/2012.(Murphy, Kerrie) (Entered: 08/13/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 8/13/2012, Entered: None
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment by Angela Ames.Motions referred to Ross A. Walters. Responses due by 8/30/2012 (McCarty, Emily) (Entered: 08/13/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 8/13/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
TEXT ORDER: ORDER granting 54 defendants' motion to file an overlength reply brief. The Case Manager shall detach and separately file defendants' reply brief, linking it to the motion to exclude testimony 38 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Ross A. Walters on 8/13/2012. (nsr) (Entered: 08/13/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 8/13/2012, Entered: None
MOTION to file overlength brief by Nationwide Advantage Mortgage Company, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Karla Neel.Motions referred to Ross A. Walters. Responses due by 8/30/2012 (Attachments: # 1 Reply Brief)(Murphy, Kerrie) (Entered: 08/13/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 8/2/2012, Entered: None
RESPONSE to Motion re 38 MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Plaintiff's Expert Karin Beschen and Request for Oral Argument filed by Angela Ames. Replies due by 8/13/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Brief in Support)(McCarty, Emily) (Entered: 08/02/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 8/1/2012, Entered: None
REPLY Brief re 33 MOTION to Compel filed by Angela Ames. (sc) (Entered: 08/01/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 7/26/2012, Entered: None
REPLY to Plaintiff's Resistance re 31 MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Plaintiff's Experts and Request for Oral Argument filed by Nationwide Advantage Mortgage Company, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Karla Neel.(Murphy, Kerrie) (Entered: 07/26/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 7/25/2012, Entered: None
Brief in support re 46 Amended MOTION for Summary Judgment AND REQUEST FOR ORAL ARGUMENT, 44 MOTION for Summary Judgment. (sc) (Main Document 50 replaced on 8/1/2012) (sc, ). (Entered: 07/26/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 7/25/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
TEXT ORDER: ORDER granting 43 defendants' motion for leave to file overlength brief, as supplemented 48 . The case manager shall detach the brief and link it to defendants' motion for summary judgment 44 as a brief in support of motion 44 46 . Entered by Magistrate Judge Ross A. Walters on 7/25/2012. (kln) (Entered: 07/25/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 7/24/2012, Entered: None
Supplemental MOTION to file overlength brief by Nationwide Advantage Mortgage Company, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Karla Neel.Motions referred to Ross A. Walters. Responses due by 8/10/2012 (Murphy, Kerrie) (Entered: 07/24/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 7/24/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
TEXT ORDER: ORDER concerning 43 defendants' motion for leave to file an overlength brief. The Court has before it defendants' motion for overlength brief which only states they require more than twenty pages "to adequately argue and support the issues raised in their Motion for Summary Judgment" but offers no other explanation why more than twenty pages is required. By 7/31/2012 counsel should supplement their motion to explain why they need more than twenty pages to brief their motion. Entered by Magistrate Judge Ross A. Walters on 7/24/2012.(kln) (Entered: 07/24/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 7/24/2012, Entered: None
Amended MOTION for Summary Judgment AND REQUEST FOR ORAL ARGUMENT by Nationwide Advantage Mortgage Company, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Karla Neel. Responses due by 8/17/2012 (Murphy, Kerrie) (Entered: 07/24/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 45 Filed: 7/23/2012, Entered: None
Sealed Document re 44 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Confidential Appendix) by Nationwide Advantage Mortgage Company, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company. (Murphy, Kerrie) (Entered: 07/23/2012)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 7/23/2012, Entered: None
MOTION for Summary Judgment by Nationwide Advantage Mortgage Company, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Karla Neel. Responses due by 8/16/2012 (Attachments: # 1 Statement, # 2 Appendix (Public))(Murphy, Kerrie) (Entered: 07/23/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 7/23/2012, Entered: None
MOTION to file overlength brief by Nationwide Advantage Mortgage Company, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Karla Neel.Motions referred to Ross A. Walters. Responses due by 8/9/2012 (Attachments: # 1 Brief in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment)(Murphy, Kerrie) (Entered: 07/23/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 7/23/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
TEXT ORDER: ORDER granting 41 plaintiff's Motion to file overlength brief. The case manager shall detach and separately file the brief attached to the motion, linking it to plaintiff's motion to compel 33 as a reply. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ross A. Walters on 7/23/2012. (kln) (Entered: 07/23/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 7/23/2012, Entered: None
MOTION to file overlength brief in Support of Her Motion to Compel by Angela Ames.Motions referred to Ross A. Walters. Responses due by 8/9/2012 (Attachments: # 1 Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Compel)(McCarty, Emily) (Entered: 07/23/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 7/20/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
TEXT ORDER: ORDER granting 39 defendants' motion for leave to file documents under seal. The Confidential Appendix may be filed as a sealed document. Entered by Magistrate Judge Ross A. Walters on 7/20/2012. (kln) (Entered: 07/20/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 7/20/2012, Entered: None
MOTION for Leave to File under Seal (Expedited Relief Requested) by Nationwide Advantage Mortgage Company, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Karla Neel.Motions referred to Ross A. Walters. Responses due by 8/6/2012 (Murphy, Kerrie) (Entered: 07/20/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 7/17/2012, Entered: None
MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Plaintiff's Expert Karin Beschen and Request for Oral Argument by Nationwide Advantage Mortgage Company, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Karla Neel.Motions referred to Ross A. Walters. Responses due by 8/3/2012 (Attachments: # 1 Brief in Support, # 2 Ex. A - Designation, # 3 Ex. B - Answers, # 4 Ex. C - Responses, # 5 Ex. D - Disclosures)(Murphy, Kerrie) (Entered: 07/17/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 7/16/2012, Entered: None
RESPONSE to Motion re 31 MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Plaintiff's Experts and Request for Oral Argument filed by Angela Ames. Replies due by 7/26/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Brief in Support, # 2 Exhibit 1)(McCarty, Emily) (Entered: 07/16/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 7/13/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
TEXT ORDER: ORDER granting 34 plaintiff's unresisted motion for extension of time. Plaintiff shall have to and including Monday, July 16, 2012, to file a response to the "Motion to Exclude Testimony of Plaintiff's Experts" 31 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Ross A. Walters on 7/13/2012. (nsr) (Entered: 07/13/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 7/13/2012, Entered: None
RESPONSE to Motion re 33 MOTION to Compel filed by Nationwide Advantage Mortgage Company, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Karla Neel. Replies due by 7/23/2012.(Bittner, Julie) (Entered: 07/13/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 7/13/2012, Entered: None
Unresisted MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendants' Motion to Exclude Testimony of Plaintiff's Experts by Angela Ames.Motions referred to Ross A. Walters. Responses due by 7/30/2012 (McCarty, Emily) (Entered: 07/13/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 6/29/2012, Entered: None
MOTION to Compel by Angela Ames.Motions referred to Ross A. Walters. Responses due by 7/16/2012 (Attachments: # 1 Brief in Support, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6)(McCarty, Emily) (Entered: 06/29/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 6/26/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
TEXT ORDER: ORDER granting 30 defendants' Motion for Leave to File an over length brief. The case manager shall detach and file the brief attached to the motion, linking it to defendant's motion to exclude testimony of plaintiff's experts 31 as a brief in support of the motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ross A. Walters on 6/26/2012. (kln) (Entered: 06/26/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 6/26/2012, Entered: None
MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Plaintiff's Experts and Request for Oral Argument by Nationwide Advantage Mortgage Company, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Karla Neel.Motions referred to Ross A. Walters. Responses due by 7/13/2012 (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Julie Bittner, # 2 Affdvt Ex. A - Ames Depo, # 3 Affdvt Ex. B - Cramer Rpt, # 4 Affdvt Ex. C - Cramer Depo, # 5 Affdvt Ex. D - Tinker Rpt, # 6 Affdvt Ex. E - Tinker Depo, # 7 Affdvt Ex. F - DOL Info Request, # 8 Affdvt Ex. G - USBC Ltr, # 9 Affdvt Ex. H - FAQ Break Time, # 10 Affdvt Ex. I - Fact Sheet Break Time)(Bittner, Julie) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/27/2012: # 11 Brief in Support) (sc, ). (Entered: 06/26/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 6/26/2012, Entered: None
MOTION for Leave to File to File an Overlength Brief by Nationwide Advantage Mortgage Company, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Karla Neel.Motions referred to Ross A. Walters. Responses due by 7/13/2012 (Attachments: # 1 Brief in Support)(Bittner, Julie) (Entered: 06/26/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 6/15/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
TEXT ORDER: ORDER granting 28 joint motion to allow certain discovery to occur after the discovery deadline. The parties may take the depositions described in the motion according to their agreed schedule. The dispositive motion deadline is extended to 7/23/2012. No further extensions of the dispositive motion deadline will be granted. Entered by Magistrate Judge Ross A. Walters on 6/15/2012. (kln) Modified on 6/15/2012 to correct disposition motion deadline date (kln). (Entered: 06/15/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 6/14/2012, Entered: None
Joint MOTION Allow Certain Discovery to Occur After the Discovery Deadline by Nationwide Advantage Mortgage Company, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Karla Neel.Motions referred to Ross A. Walters. Responses due by 7/2/2012 (Bittner, Julie) (Entered: 06/14/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 5/4/2012, Entered: None
ANSWER to 25 Amended Complaint by Karla Neel.(Bittner, Julie) (Entered: 05/04/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/4/2012, Entered: None
ANSWER to 25 Amended Complaint by Nationwide Advantage Mortgage Company, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company.(Bittner, Julie) (Entered: 05/04/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 25 Filed: 4/30/2012, Entered: None
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Nationwide Advantage Mortgage Company, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Karla Neel., filed by Angela Ames. (sk, ) (Entered: 04/30/2012)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/27/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
TEXT ORDER: ORDER granting 23 plaintiff's motion to amend complaint (unresisted). The case manager shall detach and separately file the Amended Complaint and Jury Demand attached to the motion. Entered by Magistrate Judge Ross A. Walters on 4/27/2012. (kln) (Entered: 04/27/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/27/2012, Entered: None
Unresisted MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint and Jury Demand by Angela Ames.Motions referred to Ross A. Walters. Responses due by 5/14/2012 (Attachments: # 1 Amended Complaint and Jury Demand)(McCarty, Emily) (Entered: 04/27/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/3/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
TEXT ORDER: ORDER granting 21 joint motion to extend expert designation deadlines. Defendants shall make their expert witness disclosures pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(2) by 5/14/2012. Plaintiff shall make her rebuttal expert witness disclosures pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(2) by 5/29/2012 (5/28/2012 falls on a holiday). All other deadlines including final pretrial and trial remain set as previously ordered. Entered by Magistrate Judge Ross A. Walters on 4/3/2012.(kln) (Entered: 04/03/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/3/2012, Entered: None
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time For Scheduling Order/R16 Deadlines of defendants experts, plaintiff rebuttal experts by Angela Ames, Nationwide Advantage Mortgage Company, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Karla Neel.Motions referred to Ross A. Walters. Responses due by 4/20/2012 (Murphy, Kerrie) (Entered: 04/03/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/2/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
TEXT ORDER: ORDER granting in part 19 joint motion to stay proceedings on defendants' motion to compel 18 . The motion will be terminated without prejudice to renewal should Court action be necessary at some future time. If so, counsel should file a renewed motion with updated information on the subject. Entered by Magistrate Judge Ross A. Walters on 4/2/2012. (kln) (Entered: 04/02/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/2/2012, Entered: None
Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings on Defendants' Motion to Compel by Angela Ames.Motions referred to Ross A. Walters. Responses due by 4/19/2012 (McCarty, Emily) (Entered: 04/02/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/14/2012, Entered: None
MOTION to Compel Plaintiff's Discovery by Nationwide Advantage Mortgage Company, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Karla Neel.Motions referred to Ross A. Walters. Responses due by 4/2/2012 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Murphy, Kerrie) (Entered: 03/14/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/9/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
TEXT ORDER: ORDER granting 16 second joint motion to extend expert deadlines. Plaintiff's expert witness disclosures in compliance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(2) shall be made by 3/9/2012. Defendants' expert witness disclosures in compliance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(2) shall be made by 4/13/2012. Plaintiff's rebuttal expert witness disclosures in compliance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(2) shall be made by 5/4/2012. All other deadlines including the jury trial and final pretrial conference remain set as previously ordered. Entered by Magistrate Judge Ross A. Walters on 2/9/2012.(kln) (Entered: 02/09/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/8/2012, Entered: None
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time For Scheduling Order/R16 Deadlines of plaintiff expert, defendant expert, plaintiff rebuttal by Angela Ames.Motions referred to Ross A. Walters. Responses due by 2/27/2012 (Judkins, Whitney) (Entered: 02/08/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/6/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance by Emily E. McCarty on behalf of Angela Ames (McCarty, Emily) (Entered: 02/06/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/6/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 13 joint Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ross A. Walters on 1/6/2012. (kln) (Entered: 01/06/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/6/2012, Entered: None
Unresisted MOTION for Protective Order by Nationwide Advantage Mortgage Company, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Karla Neel.Motions referred to Ross A. Walters. Responses due by 1/23/2012 (Attachments: # 1 Joint Stipulated Protective Order)(Bittner, Julie) (Entered: 01/06/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/6/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
TEXT ORDER: ORDER granting 11 joint motion to extend expert deadlines. Plaintiff's expert witness disclosures pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(2) shall be made by 2/8/2012. Defendant's expert witness disclosures pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(2) shall be made by 3/14/2012. Plaintiff's rebuttal expert witness disclosures pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(2) shall be made by 4/4/2012. All other deadlines, including the trial and final pretrial conference, remain set as previously ordered. Entered by Magistrate Judge Ross A. Walters on 1/6/2012. (kln) (Entered: 01/06/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/5/2012, Entered: None
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Expert Witness Deadlines by Angela Ames.Motions referred to Ross A. Walters. Responses due by 1/23/2012 (Judkins, Whitney) (Entered: 01/05/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/18/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
TEXT ORDER: ORDER granting 9 joint motion to extend discovery and dispositive motion deadlines. The discovery deadline is extended to 6/15/2012. The dispositive motion deadline is extended to 7/16/2012. The latter is at the outermost limit to which it may be extended under the local rules therefore no further extensions will be granted. All other deadlines remain set as previously ordered. Entered by Magistrate Judge Ross A. Walters on 11/18/2011. (Entered: 11/18/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/18/2011, Entered: None
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time For Scheduling Order/R16 Deadlines of Discovery, Dispositive Motion by Nationwide Advantage Mortgage Company, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Karla Neel.Motions referred to Ross A. Walters. Responses due by 12/5/2011 (Bittner, Julie) (Entered: 11/18/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/18/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER adopting 7 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN: Motions to Add Parties due by 11/7/2011. Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 12/7/2011. Plaintiff's Expert Witness disclosures due by 1/9/2012. Defendants' Expert Witness disclosures due by 2/13/2012. Plaintiff's Rebuttal Witness disclosures due by 3/5/2012. Discovery closes 5/15/2012. Dispositive Motion Deadline 6/15/2012. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/12/2012 at 11:00 AM in Des Moines Courthouse before Magistrate Judge Ross A. Walters. Jury Trial set for Tuesday, 11/13/2012, at 9:00 AM in Des Moines - Room 265 - 2nd Floor before Chief Judge Robert W. Pratt. This is the second case set for trial during this period. Estimated length of trial - 5 days. See order for other particulars. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ross A. Walters on 10/18/2011. (nsr) (Entered: 10/18/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/13/2011, Entered: None
PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN. (Timmer, Brooke) (Entered: 10/13/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/30/2011, Entered: None
ANSWER to Complaint by Karla Neel.(Bittner, Julie) (Entered: 08/30/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/30/2011, Entered: None
ANSWER to Complaint by Nationwide Advantage Mortgage Company, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company.(Bittner, Julie) (Entered: 08/30/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/30/2011, Entered: None
STIPULATION Joint Stipulated Dismissal of Sara Sagers as a Named Party by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company. (Bittner, Julie) (Entered: 08/30/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/17/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
TEXT ORDER: ORDER granting 2 defendants' motion for extension of time to file a responsive pleading. Defendants shall have to and including 8/30/2011 to move or plead in response to the complaint. Entered by Magistrate Judge Ross A. Walters on 8/17/2011. (kln) (Entered: 08/17/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/16/2011, Entered: None
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading by Nationwide Advantage Mortgage Company, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Karla Neel, Sara Sagers.Motions referred to Ross A. Walters. Responses due by 9/2/2011 (Bittner, Julie) (Entered: 08/16/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/9/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Nationwide Advantage Mortgage Company, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Sara Sagers, Karla Neel from Polk County, case number CL122520. Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 350., filed by Nationwide Advantage Mortgage Company, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Sara Sagers, Karla Neel. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 11/7/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-Petitions)(Bittner, Julie) (Entered: 08/09/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 1,482 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?