Edward D. Jones & Co., L.P. v. Sam et al
Illinois Northern District Court, Case No. 1:08-cv-01097
District Judge Charles P. Kocoras, presiding
docket://gov.uscourts.ilnd.1-08-cv-01097 (What is this?)

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Judges don't know as much about themselves as we do.
Access comprehensive profiles on judges, firms, lawyers, and more with PlainSite Pro and Pro Se.
No Logo Edward D. Jones & Company, LP, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Duane Morris LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Robert P. Bramnik +1 312 499 0121 +1 312 277 2326 rpbramnik@duanemorris.com
Duane Morris +1 312 499 6700
Rachael George Pontikes +1 312 499 6700 +1 312 499 6701 rgpontikes@duanemorris.com
No Logo Karen K. Auksi-Sam, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Joseph A. Morris +1 312 606 0876 +1 312 606 0879 mdlrusuk@aol.com
No Logo Robert Sam, Jr., Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Joseph A. Morris +1 312 606 0876 +1 312 606 0879 mdlrusuk@aol.com
Office Chicago
Filed 2/22/2008
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutory Actions
Cause Section 9 U.S.C. § 9 Motion to Confirm Arbitration Loan
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Judgment - Award of Arbitrator
County Cook
Terminated 4/17/2008
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag TERMED
  Entries (20) Calendar Events Related (0) Tools Right End
PDF 21 Filed: 5/29/2008, Entered: 5/30/2008 Description not available
TRANSCRIPT of proceedings for the following dates: 3/4/2008; Before the Honorable Honorable Charles P. Kocoras. (Document Not Scanned). (jmp, )
PDF 20 Filed: 4/17/2008, Entered: 4/17/2008 entered judgment
ENTERED JUDGMENT on 4/17/2008.Mailed notice(sct, )
PDF 19 Filed: 4/17/2008, Entered: 4/17/2008 order on motion for miscellaneous reliefCourt Filing
MINUTE entry before Judge Honorable Charles P. Kocoras:Petitioner's application [1] to confirm an arbitration award entered on October 19, 2007, dismissing all claims against it and providing for payment of specified fees is granted. All matters in controversy having been resolved, final judgment is entered on the arbitration award in favor of the Petitioner before this Court, Edward D. Jones & Co. and against all Respondents, Robert Sam, Jr. and Karen K. Auksi-Sam, individually and on behalf of their Roth IRAs, SEP IRA, and North Star Basements, Inc. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (sct, )
PDF 18 Filed: 4/14/2008, Entered: 4/14/2008 terminate hearingsCourt Filing
MINUTE entry before Judge Honorable Charles P. Kocoras:Status and ruling on the application [1] by Petitioner Edward D. Jones & Co., L.P. to confirm arbitrators' award, set for 4/15/2008, is stricken. The Court will rule shortly by mail.Mailed notice (sct, )
PDF 17 Filed: 4/2/2008, Entered: 4/4/2008 Description not available
TRANSCRIPT of proceedings for the following dates: 3/20/2008; Before the Honorable Honorable William T. Hart. (jmp, )
PDF 16 Filed: 3/20/2008, Entered: 3/20/2008 order on motion to amend/correctCourt Filing
MINUTE entry before Judge Honorable Charles P. Kocoras:Motion hearing held on 3/20/2008. Respondents' motion [14] for leave to amend and supplement their answer to Petitioner's Application [1] to Confirm Arbitrators' Award, is granted. Said amended and supplemental answer is due 4/8/2008. Status hearing set for 4/15/2008 at 9:30 a.m. Mailed notice (sct, )
PDF 15 Filed: 3/11/2008, Entered: 3/11/2008 notice of motion
Notice of Filing and NOTICE of Motion by Joseph A. Morris for presentment of motion to amend/correct, motion for relief[14] before Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 3/20/2008 at 09:30 AM. (Morris, Joseph)
PDF 14 Filed: 3/11/2008, Entered: 3/11/2008, Terminated: 3/20/2008 motion to amend/correct
MOTION by Respondent Robert Sam, Jr to amend/correct answer to complaint[13] (Morris, Joseph)
PDF 13 Filed: 3/11/2008, Entered: 3/11/2008 answer to complaint
Respondents' ANSWER to Complaint (Application) of Petitioner to Confirm Arbitrators' Award by Robert Sam, Jr(Morris, Joseph)
PDF 12 Filed: 3/11/2008, Entered: 3/11/2008 attorney appearance
ATTORNEY Appearance for Respondent Karen K. Auksi-Sam by Joseph A. Morris by Charles H. Bjork (Morris, Joseph)
PDF 11 Filed: 3/11/2008, Entered: 3/11/2008 attorney appearance
ATTORNEY Appearance for Respondent Karen K. Auksi-Sam by Joseph A. Morris (Morris, Joseph)
PDF 10 Filed: 3/11/2008, Entered: 3/11/2008 attorney appearance
ATTORNEY Appearance for Respondent Robert Sam, Jr by Joseph A. Morris by Charles H. Bjork (Morris, Joseph)
PDF 9 Filed: 3/11/2008, Entered: 3/11/2008 attorney appearance
ATTORNEY Appearance for Respondent Robert Sam, Jr by Joseph A. Morris (Morris, Joseph)
PDF 8 Filed: 3/4/2008, Entered: 3/4/2008 terminate hearingsCourt Filing
MINUTE entry before Judge Charles P. Kocoras :Motion hearing held on 3/4/2008. Answer to Petitioners' Application [1] to Confirm Arbitrators' Award is due 3/11/2008. The Court will rule by mail. Status hearing set for 4/16/2008 is stricken. Mailed notice (sct, )
PDF 7 Filed: 2/26/2008, Entered: 2/26/2008 set/reset hearingsCourt Filing
MINUTE entry before Judge Charles P. Kocoras :Status hearing set for 4/16/2008 at 09:30 AM. At the initial hearing, parties to report on the following: 1. Possibility of settlement. 2. If no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary to prepare the case for resolution. Plaintiff is directed to advise all other parties of the Court's action herein. Lead counsel for each party is required to attend the initial hearing.Mailed notice (sct, )
PDF 6 Filed: 2/26/2008, Entered: 2/26/2008 notice of motion
NOTICE of Motion by Rachael George Pontikes for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief[1] before Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 3/4/2008 at 09:30 AM. (Pontikes, Rachael)
PDF 5 Filed: 2/26/2008, Entered: 2/26/2008 attorney appearance
ATTORNEY Appearance for Petitioner Edward D. Jones & Co., L.P. by Robert P. Bramnik (Bramnik, Robert)
PDF 3 Filed: 2/24/2008, Entered: 2/24/2008 attorney appearance
ATTORNEY Appearance for Petitioner Edward D. Jones & Co., L.P. by Rachael George Pontikes (Pontikes, Rachael)
PDF 2 Filed: 2/22/2008, Entered: 2/22/2008 civil cover sheet
CIVIL Cover Sheet. (jmp, )
PDF 1 Filed: 2/22/2008, Entered: 2/22/2008, Terminated: 4/17/2008 motion for miscellaneous relief
APPLICATION by Petitioner Edward D. Jones & Co., L.P. to confirm arbitrators' award (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A. # (2) Exhibit B. # (3) Exhibit C.) (jmp, )

Statistics

This case has been viewed 492 times.

No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Need Password Help?