ALS Scan, Inc. v. Cloudflare, Inc. et al

Federal Civil Lawsuit California Central District Court, Case No. 2:16-cv-05051-GW-AFM
District Judge George H. Wu, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
District Judge George H. Wu
Last Updated March 1, 2021 at 2:07 PM EST (4.1 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo ALS Scan, Inc., Plaintiff

Represented by Spillane Trial Group PLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jay Matheson Spillane +1 818 205 1100 +1 888 590 1683 Jspillane@spillaneplc.com
a Maryland corporation Jay Matheson Spillane +1 818 205 1100 +1 888 590 1683 Jspillane@spillaneplc.com
v.
Cloudflare, Inc. Cloudflare, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a Delaware corporation Carolyn M Homer +1 650 801 5000 +1 650 801 5100 carolynhomer@quinnemanuel.com
a Delaware corporation Rachel M. Kassabian +1 650 801 5000 +1 650 801 5100 rachelkassabian@quinnemanuel.com
No Logo DOES, Defendant
No Logo Dolphin Media Ltd., Defendant
No Logo Duodecad IT Services Luxembourg SARL, Defendant
No Logo Gerardus Van Ginneken, Defendant

Represented by Bostwick Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
an individual
TERMINATED: 08/18/2016

doing business asJuicy Jay
TERMINATED: 08/18/2016 Gary L Bostwick +1 310 979 6059 +1 310 424 5975 gbostwick@B1Law.com

Represented by Gardner Cornell, P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
an individual
TERMINATED: 08/18/2016

doing business asJuicy Jay
TERMINATED: 08/18/2016 Corey D Silverstein +1 248 290 0655 +1 248 645 1222 corey@silversteinlegal.com
an individual
TERMINATED: 08/18/2016

doing business asJuicy Jay
TERMINATED: 08/18/2016 Kevin S Toll +1 248 290 0655 +1 248 645 1222 kevin@silversteinlegal.com

Represented by Walters Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
an individual
TERMINATED: 08/18/2016

doing business asJuicy Jay
TERMINATED: 08/18/2016 LAWRENCE G WALTERS +1 407 975 9150 +1 407 774 6151 larry@firstamendment.com
No Logo Hebergement OVH Inc., Defendant
No Logo Hivelocity Ventures Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Ovh Sas, Defendant
No Logo Steadfast Networks LLC, Defendant
No Logo Tiger Media, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Bostwick Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a Saskatchewan provincial corporation Gary L Bostwick +1 310 979 6059 +1 310 424 5975 gbostwick@B1Law.com

Represented by Law Offices of Corey D Silverstein PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a Saskatchewan provincial corporation Corey D Silverstein +1 248 290 0655 +1 248 645 1222 corey@silversteinlegal.com
a Saskatchewan provincial corporation Kevin S Toll +1 248 290 0655 +1 248 645 1222 kevin@silversteinlegal.com

Represented by Walters Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a Saskatchewan provincial corporation LAWRENCE G WALTERS +1 407 975 9150 +1 407 774 6151 larry@firstamendment.com
Attributes
Citation Section 17 U.S.C. § 501
Nature of Suit 820 - Property Rights: Copyright
Timeline
  Entries (535) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End

Since this appears to be a very large docket, we will only show 500 entries at at time.

Page 1 Page 2

Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 572 Filed: 3/1/2021, Entered: None Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 571 Filed: 1/19/2021, Entered: None Supplement (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 570 Filed: 12/22/2020, Entered: None Motion Hearing
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 568 Filed: 12/7/2020, Entered: None Supplement (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 567 Filed: 11/16/2020, Entered: None Supplement (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 566 Filed: 10/15/2020, Entered: None Supplement
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 565 Filed: 9/29/2020, Entered: None USCA Memorandum
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 564 Filed: 9/18/2020, Entered: None Telephone Conference
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 563 Filed: 9/16/2020, Entered: None USCA Mandate
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 562 Filed: 9/16/2020, Entered: None USCA Mandate
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 561 Filed: 9/16/2020, Entered: None Status Report
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 560 Filed: 8/10/2020, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 544 Filed: 7/31/2018, Entered: None Attorney Fees
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 543 Filed: 7/17/2018, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 542 Filed: 7/9/2018, Entered: None Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 541 Filed: 6/21/2018, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 539 Filed: 6/12/2018, Entered: None Bill of Costs (CV-59) - Issued
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 538 Filed: 6/11/2018, Entered: None Reconsideration
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 537 Filed: 6/4/2018, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 535 Filed: 6/1/2018, Entered: None Motion Hearing
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 531 Filed: 5/15/2018, Entered: None Memorandum in Support of Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 530 Filed: 5/15/2018, Entered: None Attorney Fees
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 528 Filed: 5/11/2018, Entered: None Clerk to Tax Costs (CV-59)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 523 Filed: 5/1/2018, Entered: None Amended Minutes
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 522 Filed: 5/1/2018, Entered: None Reconsideration
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 521 Filed: 5/1/2018, Entered: None Pretrial Conference - Interim
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 520 Filed: 4/30/2018, Entered: None Judgment
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 519 Filed: 4/30/2018, Entered: None Motion Hearing
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 518 Filed: 4/30/2018, Entered: None Leave to File Document Under Seal
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 516 Filed: 4/30/2018, Entered: None Pretrial Conference - Interim
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 512 Filed: 4/29/2018, Entered: None Statement
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 508 Filed: 4/27/2018, Entered: None Leave to File Document Under Seal
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 500 Filed: 4/25/2018, Entered: None Amended Minutes
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 496 Filed: 4/24/2018, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 495 Filed: 4/24/2018, Entered: None Leave to File Document Under Seal
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 494 Filed: 4/24/2018, Entered: None Pretrial Conference - Interim
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 493 Filed: 4/24/2018, Entered: None Statement
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 492 Filed: 4/23/2018, Entered: None Statement
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 489 Filed: 4/23/2018, Entered: None Leave to File Document Under Seal
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 487 Filed: 4/22/2018, Entered: None Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 485 Filed: 4/20/2018, Entered: None Pretrial Conference - Interim
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 482 Filed: 4/19/2018, Entered: None In Limine - Exclude
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 481 Filed: 4/19/2018, Entered: None Supplement (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 478 Filed: 4/13/2018, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 477 Filed: 4/13/2018, Entered: None Leave to File Document Under Seal
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 475 Filed: 4/13/2018, Entered: None Motion Hearing
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 474 Filed: 4/12/2018, Entered: None Leave to File Document Under Seal
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 466 Filed: 4/9/2018, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 464 Filed: 4/9/2018, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 462 Filed: 4/9/2018, Entered: None Statement
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 458 Filed: 4/7/2018, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 456 Filed: 4/6/2018, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 455 Filed: 4/6/2018, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 454 Filed: 4/6/2018, Entered: None In Limine - Exclude
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 452 Filed: 4/5/2018, Entered: None Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 451 Filed: 4/5/2018, Entered: None Leave to File Document Under Seal
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 449 Filed: 4/3/2018, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 448 Filed: 4/2/2018, Entered: None Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 447 Filed: 4/2/2018, Entered: None Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 446 Filed: 4/2/2018, Entered: None Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 444 Filed: 4/2/2018, Entered: None Leave to File Document Under Seal
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 443 Filed: 4/2/2018, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 442 Filed: 3/30/2018, Entered: None Amend/Correct
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 439 Filed: 3/28/2018, Entered: None Leave to File Document Under Seal
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 438 Filed: 3/28/2018, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 436 Filed: 3/28/2018, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 434 Filed: 3/27/2018, Entered: None Shorten Time for Hearing
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 433 Filed: 3/26/2018, Entered: None Leave to File Document Under Seal
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 269 Filed: 9/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SUPPLEMENT to MOTION for Protective Order for Deposition of Cloudflare CEO 265 filed by Defendant Cloudflare, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration (Supplemental) of Rachel Kassabian, # 2 Declaration (Supplemental) of Matthew Prince)(Kassabian, Rachel) (Entered: 09/26/2017)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 7/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SUPPLEMENT Supplemental Memorandum Regarding Publication filed by Defendant Cloudflare, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Rachel Kassabian with Supporting Exhibits)(Kassabian, Rachel) (Entered: 07/07/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 6/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No. 1 by Judge George H. Wu. Case ordered to Magistrate Judge for Settlement Conference. (cr) (Entered: 06/26/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 205 Filed: 6/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
MINUTES OF Motion Hearing held before Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon: The Court orders the declaration of Nolan Schoichet in Support of defenant's Motion to Compel, Attachment #3 to defendants Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel 186 filed UNDER SEAL. Counsel argue. The motion is submitted. Court Recorder: Recorded on Courtsmart. (ib) (Entered: 06/23/2017)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 6/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE Attorney Daniel L. Rogna to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Steadfast Networks LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-20011894) 199 on behalf of Steadfast Networks, LLC., designating Paul D. Supnik as local counsel, by Judge George H. Wu. (cr) (Entered: 06/15/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 6/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
MINUTES OF DEFENDANTS' JOINT MOTION TO CONTINUE PRETRIAL AND TRIAL DATES 189 by Telephone held before Judge George H. Wu. Court and counsel confer off the record re above-entitled motion. The motion is TAKEN UNDER SUBMISSION. Court to issue ruling. Court Reporter: None Present. (lom) (Entered: 06/12/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 6/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
APPLICATION to file document containing ALS confidential information under seal filed by Defendant Cloudflare, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Redacted Document Public Version of Supplemental Kassabian Declaration)(Homer, Carolyn) (Entered: 06/06/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 6/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MEMORANDUM in Support of MOTION to Compel Productions and Responses re: RFPs 7, 8, 9, 10, 11, 15, 20, 21, 30 and Interrogatories 6, 7, 9, 10 186 filed by Defendant Cloudflare, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Supplemental Kassabian Declaration in support of Cloudflare's Motion to Compel, # 2 Proposed Order)(Kassabian, Rachel) (Entered: 06/06/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 6/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Continue Pretrial and Trial Dates from a trial start date of 10/3/2017 to a trial state date of 2/13/2018 Re: Scheduling Conference,, 154 filed by Defendants Cloudflare, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 6/8/2017 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in support of Continuance, # 2 Declaration of Rachel Kassabian, # 3 Declaration of Shahrokh Sheik, # 4 Declaration of John Ambrogi, # 5 Proposed Order) (Kassabian, Rachel) (Entered: 06/02/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 6/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
MINUTES OF CLOUDFLARE, INC.'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT REGARDING EXTRATERRITORIALITY 121 granting in part and denying in part 121 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Hearing held before Judge George H. Wu: Court hears further argument. The Court's Final Ruling is attached hereto. Based on the Court's Ruling, and for reasons stated on the record, Defendant's motion is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. The Court DENIES Cloudflare's Motion as to the following thirteen sites: imgchili.com, slimpics.com, bestofsexpics.com, greenpics.com, imgspot.org, imgsen.se, imgspice.com, stooorage.com, img.yt, vipergirls.to, fboom.me, imgflash.net, and imgtrex.com. The Court GRANTS Defendant's Motion as to pornwire.net. Court Reporter: Katie Thibodeaux. (bm) (Entered: 06/02/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 5/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
MINUTES OF CLOUDFLARE, INC.'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT REGARDING EXTRATERRITORIALITY 121 held before Judge George H. Wu: The Court's Ruling is circulated and attached hereto. Court hears argument. For reasons stated on the record, Defendant's motion is continued to June 1, 2017 at 8:30 a.m. Court Reporter: Katie Thibodeaux. (cr) (Entered: 05/26/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 181 Filed: 5/4/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
MINUTES OF CLOUDFLARE, INC.'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT REGARDING EXTRATERRITORIALITY 121 ; DOLPHIN MEDIA, LTD.'S MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION 93 Hearing held before Judge George H. Wu. Court hears further argument as to Defendant Cloudflare, Inc.'s motion for partial summary judgment. For reasons stated on the record, Defendants motion is continued to May 18, 2017 at 8:30 a.m. Counsel will contact the clerk by May 16 whether the appearance on May 18 will be required. Argument is held as to Defendant Dolphin's motion to dismiss. Based on the Tentative Rulings issued on February 27, 2017 and April 13, 2017, Defendant Dolphin's motion is GRANTED for lack of personal jurisdiction. Court Reporter: Katie Thibodeaux. (mrgo) (Entered: 05/05/2017)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 4/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
REQUEST FOR EVIDENTIARY RULING re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Extraterritoriality 121 as to ALS Scan's Offer of Proof in Opposition filed by Defendant Cloudflare, Inc.. (Kassabian, Rachel) (Entered: 04/27/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 4/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Extraterritoriality 121 following ALS Scan's Offer of Proof filed by Defendant Cloudflare, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration (Supplemental) of Trey Guinn, # 2 Declaration of Nolan Schoichet, # 3 Declaration (Supplemental) of Rachel Kassabian, # 4 Proposed Order (Revised))(Kassabian, Rachel) (Entered: 04/27/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 165 Filed: 4/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
MINUTES OF CLOUDFLARE, INC.'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARYJUDGMENT REGARDING EXTRATERRITORIALITY 121 ;STATUS CONFERENCE held before Judge George H. Wu re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Extraterritoriality 121 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Notice of Motion 93 . Responses due by 4/20/2017 Replies due by 4/27/2017. Motion set for hearing on 5/4/2017 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. Court Reporter: Sandra MacNeil. (mrgo) (Entered: 04/14/2017)
LREF
Blank 159 Filed: 3/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
MINUTES OF CLOUDFLARE, INC.'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT REGARDING EXTRATERRITORIALITY Hearing held before Judge George H. Wu re: Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 121 . Parties will contact the court clerk by noon on March 30, 2017 whether a telephonic hearing at 3:00 p.m. will be necessary to resolve the deposition issue. The Court sets a status conference for April 13, 2017 at 8:30 a.m. Parties will file a joint status report regarding the status of discovery and the offer of proof as to the territoriality/extraterritoriality issue by noon on April 11, 2017. The above-entitled motion is continued to April 13, 2017 at 8:30 a.m. Court Reporter: Katie Thibodeaux. (mrgo) (Entered: 03/31/2017)
LREF
Blank 154 Filed: 3/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
MINUTES OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held before Judge George H. Wu. Court and counsel confer. Court sets the following: Service of Third Am. Complaint March 20, 2017; Steadfast Response 20 days after service of 3AC; Mediation Cutoff June 23, 2017; Post-Mediation Status Conference June 26, 2017 at 8:30 a.m.; Discovery Cutoff June 30, 2017; Expert discovery cutoff July 25, 2017; Motion hearing cutoff August 24, 2017; Pretrial conference September 21, 2017 at 8:30 a.m.; Jury trial (six day estimate) October 3, 2017 at 9:00 a.m. Court Reporter: Katie Thibodeaux. (lom) (Entered: 03/28/2017)
LREF
Blank 150 Filed: 3/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) re Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Defendant Hivelocity Ventures Corporation to Serve Further Responses to Production Requests and to Produce Documents (Filed March 2, 2017; ECF No. 118) by Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. On the Court's own motion, the hearing on Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Defendant Hivelocity Ventures Corporation to Serve Further Responses to Production Requests and to Produce Documents, noticed for March 28, 2017, is vacated. The matter is taken under submission on the basis of the papers timely filed. Local Rule 7-15. re 118 Motion to Compel. (sbou) (Entered: 03/22/2017)
LREF
Blank 149 Filed: 3/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
MINUTES OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held before Judge George H. Wu. Counsel are not present. Parties are ordered to appear on March 27, 2017 at 8:30 a.m., and show cause why sanctions should not be imposed for failure to appear at today's hearing. The Scheduling Conference is continued to March 27, 2017 at 8:30 a.m. Court Reporter: Marea Woolrich. (mrgo) (Entered: 03/21/2017)
LREF
Blank 147 Filed: 3/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge George H. Wu re: Declaration (Motion related), 139 , MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion, 138 , Declaration (Motion related), 140 . The Court is now in receipt of Plaintiff's Offer of Proof. See Docket Nos. 138-140. The Offer of Proof delineates several specific contacts that Dolphin maintains with the United States, which Plaintiff contends are sufficient to establish nationwide jurisdiction. See Docket No. 138 at 3:12-16, 5:24-6:26. Because these contacts raise the possibility that nationwide jurisdiction exists, the Court orders Dolphin to submit a response by March 30, 2017. (mrgo) (Entered: 03/17/2017)
LREF
Blank 141 Filed: 3/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
MINUTES OF Scheduling Conference held before Judge George H. Wu. Court and counsel confer re scheduling. For reasons stated on the record, the scheduling conference is continued to March 27, 2017 at 8:30 a.m. Parties will file a joint scheduling report by noon on March 16, 2017. Court Reporter: Katie Thibodeaux. (jy) (Entered: 03/14/2017)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 127 Filed: 3/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER GRANTING CLOUDFLARE, INC.'S APPLICATION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL by Judge George H. Wu re: 124 APPLICATION to Seal Document. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: The Application to File Documents Under Seal is hereby GRANTED, and the following documents are ORDERED filed under seal: (see document for list). (mrgo) (Entered: 03/06/2017)
LREF
Blank 117 Filed: 2/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
MINUTES OF DEFENDANT DOLPHIN MEDIA LIMITED'S MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION, FOR IMPROPER VENUE, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE FORUM NON CONVENIENS 93 ; SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held before Judge George H. Wu. Scheduling Conference continued to 3/13/2017 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. Parties will file a joint status report by noon on March 8, 2017. Court Reporter: Katie Thibodeaux. (mrgo) (Entered: 02/28/2017)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 2/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
MINUTES OF DEFENDANT STEADFAST NETWORKS LLC'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Hearing held before Judge George H. Wu re: 89 MOTION to Dismiss. Defendant Steadfast's motion is GRANTED WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. Scheduling Conference set for 2/27/2017 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. Court Reporter: Katie Thibodeaux. (mrgo) (Entered: 02/17/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 107 Filed: 2/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
DECLARATION of Jay M. Spillane in opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Notice of Motion 93 filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15)(Spillane, Jay) (Entered: 02/06/2017)
LREF
Blank 106 Filed: 2/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
DECLARATION of Eric Penn in opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Notice of Motion 93 filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Spillane, Jay) (Entered: 02/06/2017)
LREF
Blank 105 Filed: 2/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Opposition in opposition to re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Notice of Motion 93 filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.. (Spillane, Jay) (Entered: 02/06/2017)
LREF
Blank 76 Filed: 12/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER ON STIPULATION TO VACATE DEFAULT AND SET DATE TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Judge George H. Wu, re Stipulation to Set Aside Default, 75 . IT IS ORDERED that the default entered against defendant STEADFAST NETWORKS, LLC on December 5, 2016 be vacated; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that STEADFAST NETWORKS, LLC shall have until January 6, 2017 to file and serve its response to the Second Amended Complaint herein; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that STEADFAST NETWORKS, LLC shall not contest jurisdiction or venue in its response to the Second Amended Complaint. (mrgo) (Entered: 12/12/2016)
LREF
Blank 74 Filed: 12/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
RECEIPT FOR FOREIGN SERVICE from U. S. Post Office for documents Re: ( Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 7 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 ) mailed to Ouh Sas at 2 Rue Kellerman, 59100 Roubaix, France and and Dolphin Media Ltd at Suite 801, 8/F, Singga Commercial Centre, 144-151 Connaught Road West, Hong Kong on 12/2/16. (mrgo) (Entered: 12/06/2016)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 11/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
MINUTES OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held before Judge George H. Wu: Discovery cut-off 4/3/2017. Motions due by 6/1/2017. Last date to conduct settlement conference is 3/24/2017. Pretrial Conference set for 6/29/2017 at 08:30 AM. Jury Trial set for 7/11/2017 at 09:00 AM. Please refer to the Court's order for specifics. Court Reporter: Katie Thibodeaux. (cr) (Entered: 11/29/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 60 Filed: 10/24/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
AMENDED MINUTES held before Judge George H. Wu re: 59 . CORRECT RULING ATTACHED. (jag) (Entered: 10/25/2016)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 10/24/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
MINUTES OF CLOUDFLARE, INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO RULE 12(B)(6) 49 held before Judge George H. Wu: Court hears oral argument. The Tentative circulated and attached hereto, is adopted as the Court's Final Ruling. Defendant Cloudflare's motion is GRANTED WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. Plaintiff will have until November 11, 2016 to file a Second Amended Complaint. Defendants will have three weeks from November 11 to respond. The scheduling conference remains on calendar for November 28, 2016 at 8:30 a.m. Parties will file a joint Rule 26(f) report by noon on November 21, 2016. Court Reporter: Katie Thibodeaux. (cr) (Entered: 10/25/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 55 Filed: 10/10/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) 49 filed by Defendant Cloudflare, Inc.. (Kassabian, Rachel) (Entered: 10/10/2016)
LREF
Blank 40 Filed: 9/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR CLOUDFLARE'S RESPONSE TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Judge George H. Wu: CloudFlare shall have until September 26, 2016 to file a response to ALS Scan's First Amended Complaint. (cr) (Entered: 09/07/2016)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 8/12/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER RE STIPULATION BETWEEN PLAINTIFF ALS SCAN, INC. AND DEFENDANTS TIGER MEDIA, INC. AND GERARDUS VAN GINNEKEN RE JURISDICTION, DISMISSAL AND CERTAIN MOTIONS by Judge George H. Wu, re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Against Tiger Media Motion 9 , and Stipulation for Hearing 25 . (Amended Pleadings due by 8/26/2016., Motions to Dismiss shall be filed by 9/5/2016.) (Motion for Preliminary Injunction continued to 10/3/2016 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu.) (mrgo) (Entered: 08/15/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 8/10/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER by Judge George H. Wu: granting 18 , 21 Non-Resident Attorney Lawrence G. Walters APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of defendant TIGER MEDIA, INC. & GERARDUS VAN GINNEKEN, designating Gary L. Bostwick as local counsel. (mrgo) (Entered: 08/11/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 431 Filed: 3/23/2018, Entered: 3/23/2018 Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Exclude Evidence (Motions in Limine Nos. 1-19) [412]. The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lom)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 430 Filed: 3/23/2018, Entered: 3/23/2018 Leave to File Document Under Seal
APPLICATION to file document Expert Report of Jeffrey Kinrich under seal filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Spillane, Jay)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 429 Filed: 3/22/2018, Entered: 3/22/2018 Declaration (Motion related)
DECLARATION of Andrew P. Bridges in Support of MOTION IN LIMINE to Exclude Expert Testimony of Dr. Shahram Ghandeharizadeh Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 37 [426], MOTION IN LIMINE (#6) to Exclude Evidence of ALS's Copyrighted Works Other than Registered Works Identified in ALS's Infringement Contentions [422], MOTION IN LIMINE to Exclude Expert Testimony of Barbara Luna Pursuant to Federal Rule of Evidence 702 and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 37 [428] filed by Defendant Cloudflare, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4, # (5) Exhibit 5, # (6) Exhibit 6, # (7) Exhibit 7, # (8) Exhibit 8, # (9) Exhibit 9)(Bridges, Andrew)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 428 Filed: 3/22/2018, Entered: 3/22/2018 Motion in LimineCourt Filing
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE to Exclude Expert Testimony of Barbara Luna Pursuant to Federal Rule of Evidence 702 and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 37 filed by Defendant Cloudflare, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 4/12/2018 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Bridges, Andrew)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 427 Filed: 3/22/2018, Entered: 3/22/2018 Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law
MEMORANDUM of CONTENTIONS of FACT and LAW filed by Defendant Cloudflare, Inc.. (Bridges, Andrew)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 426 Filed: 3/22/2018, Entered: 3/22/2018 Motion in LimineCourt Filing
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE to Exclude Expert Testimony of Dr. Shahram Ghandeharizadeh Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 37 filed by Defendant Cloudflare, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 4/12/2018 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Bridges, Andrew)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 425 Filed: 3/22/2018, Entered: 3/22/2018 Motion in LimineCourt Filing
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#9) to Exclude Evidence Regarding "Standard Technical Measures" Within the Meaning of Section 512(i) filed by Defendant Cloudflare, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 4/12/2018 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Bridges, Andrew)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 424 Filed: 3/22/2018, Entered: 3/22/2018 Motion in LimineCourt Filing
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#8) to Exclude Evidence Relating to Challenges in Reporting or Combatting Claimed Infringement filed by Defendant Cloudflare, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 4/12/2018 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Bridges, Andrew)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 423 Filed: 3/22/2018, Entered: 3/22/2018 Motion in LimineCourt Filing
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#7) to Exclude Non Compliant Notifications of Claimed infringement as Evidence of Knowledge filed by Defendant Cloudflare, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 4/12/2018 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Bridges, Andrew)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 422 Filed: 3/22/2018, Entered: 3/22/2018 Motion in LimineCourt Filing
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#6) to Exclude Evidence of ALS's Copyrighted Works Other than Registered Works Identified in ALS's Infringement Contentions filed by Defendant Cloudflare, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 4/12/2018 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Bridges, Andrew)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 421 Filed: 3/22/2018, Entered: 3/22/2018 Motion in LimineCourt Filing
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#5) to Exclude Notifications of Claimed Infringement as Evidence of Infringement filed by Defendant Cloudflare, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 4/12/2018 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Bridges, Andrew)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 420 Filed: 3/22/2018, Entered: 3/22/2018 Motion in Limine
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 419 Filed: 3/22/2018, Entered: 3/22/2018 Motion in LimineCourt Filing
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#3) to Exclude Evidence of Non-Copyright Disputes or Other Litigation Where Cloudflare Was Not a Named Party filed by Defendant Cloudflare, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 4/12/2018 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Bridges, Andrew)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 418 Filed: 3/22/2018, Entered: 3/22/2018 Motion in LimineCourt Filing
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#2) to Exclude Evidence Relating to Provision or Termination of Services to Hate Groups filed by Defendant Cloudflare, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 4/12/2018 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Bridges, Andrew)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 417 Filed: 3/22/2018, Entered: 3/22/2018 Motion in LimineCourt Filing
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Exclude Improper Opinion Testimony from Witnesses that ALS Did Not Disclose as Experts filed by Defendant Cloudflare, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 4/12/2018 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Bridges, Andrew)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 416 Filed: 3/22/2018, Entered: 3/22/2018 Motion to excludeCourt Filing
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Exclude Expert Report and Testimony of Dr. Ghandeharizadeh filed by Defendant Steadfast Networks LLC. Motion set for hearing on 4/12/2018 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum in support of Daubert Motion, # (2) Declaration of John L. Ambrogi, # (3) Exhibit A to Ambrogi Decl., # (4) Proposed Order) (O'Brien, Colin)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 415 Filed: 3/22/2018, Entered: 3/22/2018 Motion in LimineCourt Filing
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE Nos. 1-10 to Exclude Certain Evidence and Arguments filed by Defendant Steadfast Networks LLC. Motion set for hearing on 4/12/2018 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum in support of Motion in Limine Nos. 1-10, # (2) Proposed Order)(O'Brien, Colin)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document 414 Filed: 3/22/2018, Entered: 3/22/2018 Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law
MEMORANDUM of CONTENTIONS of FACT and LAW filed by Defendant Steadfast Networks LLC. (O'Brien, Colin)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 413 Filed: 3/22/2018, Entered: 3/22/2018 Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law
MEMORANDUM of CONTENTIONS of FACT and LAW filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.. (Spillane, Jay)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 412 Filed: 3/22/2018, Entered: 3/22/2018 Motion to excludeCourt Filing
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Exclude Evidence (Motions in Limine Nos. 1-19) filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 4/12/2018 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum Memorandum in Support, # (2) Declaration Spillane Declaration) (Spillane, Jay)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 411 Filed: 3/22/2018, Entered: 3/22/2018 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Crystal Ada Kelechi Nwaneri counsel for Defendant Cloudflare, Inc.. Adding Crystal Nwaneri as counsel of record for Cloudflare, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Cloudflare, Inc.. (Attorney Crystal Ada Kelechi Nwaneri added to party Cloudflare, Inc.(pty:dft))(Nwaneri, Crystal)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 410 Filed: 3/20/2018, Entered: 3/20/2018 Brief (non-motion) (non-appeal)
Supplemental BRIEF filed by Defendant Steadfast Networks LLC. regarding Applicability of Ventura Content to Motions for Summary Judgment regarding Text Only Scheduling Notice, [406]. (O'Brien, Colin)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 409 Filed: 3/20/2018, Entered: 3/20/2018 Statement (Motion related)
STATEMENT of Brief on Ventura Content v. Motherless NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Claims and Defenses re Defendant Steadfast Networks LLC [296], NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to PLAINTIFF ALS SCAN, INC. RE: DMCA [338], NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to PLAINTIFF ALS SCAN, INC.'S COUNTS II, III, & VI [343] filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.. (Spillane, Jay)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 408 Filed: 3/16/2018, Entered: 3/16/2018 Notice of Filing Transcript
NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 3/12/18 re Transcript [407] THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Preston, Phyllis) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 407 Filed: 3/16/2018, Entered: 3/16/2018 Transcript (CV)
TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 3/12/18. Court Reporter: Phyllis Preston, email: stenojag@aol.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 4/6/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/16/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/14/2018. (Preston, Phyllis)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 406 Filed: 3/16/2018, Entered: 3/16/2018 Text Only Scheduling NoticeCourt Filing
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge George H. Wu: Plaintiff ALS Scan and Defendant Steadfast are to submit three page briefs by Tuesday, March 20, 2018, on the applicability of the Ninth Circuit's recent decision in Ventura Content, Ltd. v. Motherless, Inc., Nos. 13-56332, 13-56970, 2018 U.S. App. LEXIS 6307 (9th Cir. Mar. 14, 2018) to Steadfast's pending Motions For Summary Judgment. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jre) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 405 Filed: 3/13/2018, Entered: 3/13/2018 Order on motion for summary judgmentCourt Filing
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) - RULING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT CLOUDFLARE INC. [324]; and DEFENDANT CLOUDFLARE, INC.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT [347] by Judge George H. Wu. The Court would DENY Cloudflare's Motion for Summary Judgment in its entirety. The Court would DENY in part and GRANT in part Plaintiff's MSJ. The Court would GRANT Plaintiff's MSJ with respect to one legal question and find that Cloudflare's CDN Network, to the extent it can be shown to have caused cache copies of infringing images to be created, stored, and served to end users, "materially assists" in acts of infringement. See supra n.18. The Court makes no conclusions of fact, one way or another, as to whether any specific infringing images were created as cache copies. (See document for details) (mrgo)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 404 Filed: 3/12/2018, Entered: 3/13/2018 Order on motion for summary judgmentCourt Filing
MINUTES OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT CLOUDFLARE INC. [324]; DEFENDANT CLOUDFLARE, INC.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT [347] Hearing held before Judge George H. Wu. For reasons stated on the record, the above-entitled motions are TAKEN UNDER SUBMISSION. Court to issue ruling. Court Reporter: Phyllis Preston. (mrgo)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 403 Filed: 3/12/2018, Entered: 3/12/2018 Transcript Order Form (G-120)
TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendant Cloudflare Cloudflare, Inc. for Court Reporter. Court will contact Dorothy Walls-Stewart at dwalls-stewart@fenwick.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Wakefield, Jedediah)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 402 Filed: 3/9/2018, Entered: 3/9/2018 Text Only Scheduling NoticeCourt Filing
TEXT ONLY ENTRY - IN CHAMBERS: by Judge George H. Wu: The Court, on its own motion, CONTINUES DEFENDANT STEADFAST NETWORKS, LLCS MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AGAINST PLAINTIFF ALS SCAN, INC. RE: DMCA [338], and DEFENDANT STEADFAST NETWORKS, LLCS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT [343], previously scheduled for 03/12/2018 to 3/26/2018 at 08:30 AM. PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT CLOUDFLARE INC. [324], and DEFENDANT CLOUDFLARE, INC.S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT [347], will REMAIN SET for 03/12/2018 at 8:30 a.m.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 401 Filed: 2/26/2018, Entered: 2/26/2018 Response in Support of Motion
RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Third Amended Complaint against Cloudflare Inc.[324] Response to Genuine Statement filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.. (Spillane, Jay)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 400 Filed: 2/26/2018, Entered: 2/26/2018 Reply (Motion related)
REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Third Amended Complaint against Cloudflare Inc.[324] filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.. (Spillane, Jay)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 399 Filed: 2/26/2018, Entered: 2/26/2018 Motion for HearingCourt Filing
REQUEST for Hearing Evidentiary Ruling, re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to PLAINTIFF ALS SCAN, INC.'S COUNTS II, III, & VI [343], filed by Defendant Steadfast Networks LLC. Request set for hearing on 3/12/2018 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (O'Brien, Colin)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 398 Filed: 2/26/2018, Entered: 2/26/2018 Sealed document
SEALED DOCUMENT [Unredacted Version of Cloudflare's Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment] re Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal, [386], MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion[376] filed by Defendant Cloudflare, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Unredacted Version of Declaration of Justin Paine in Support of Cloudflare, Inc.'s Opposition to ALS Scan, Inc.'s Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, # (2) Unredacted Version of Exhibit 25 to Declaration of Justin Paine, # (3) Unredacted Version of Declaration of Andrew P. Bridges in Support of Cloudflare, Inc.'s Opposition to ALS Scan, Inc.'s Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, # (4) Unredacted Version of Exhibit 2 to the Declaration of Andrew P. Bridges, # (5) Unredacted Version of Exhibit 5 to the Declaration of Andrew P. Bridges, # (6) Unredacted Version of Exhibit 6 to the Declaration of Andrew P. Bridges, # (7) Unredacted Version of Exhibit 12 to the Declaration of Andrew P. Bridges)(Bridges, Andrew)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 397 Filed: 2/26/2018, Entered: 2/26/2018 Response
RESPONSE filed by Defendant Steadfast Networks LLCto Objection/Opposition (Motion related)[369] Plaintiff Request for Evidentiary Ruling (O'Brien, Colin)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 396 Filed: 2/26/2018, Entered: 2/26/2018 Response
RESPONSE filed by Defendant Steadfast Networks LLCto Statement (Motion related)[368] of Uncontroverted Facts (O'Brien, Colin)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 395 Filed: 2/26/2018, Entered: 2/26/2018 Reply (Motion related)
REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to PLAINTIFF ALS SCAN, INC.'S COUNTS II, III, & VI [343] filed by Defendant Steadfast Networks LLC. (O'Brien, Colin)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 394 Filed: 2/26/2018, Entered: 2/26/2018 Motion for HearingCourt Filing
REQUEST for Hearing Evidentiary Ruling, re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to PLAINTIFF ALS SCAN, INC. RE: DMCA [338], filed by Defendant Steadfast Networks LLC. Request set for hearing on 3/12/2018 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (O'Brien, Colin)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 393 Filed: 2/26/2018, Entered: 2/26/2018 Response
RESPONSE filed by Defendant Steadfast Networks LLCto Objection/Opposition (Motion related)[367] Plaintiff Request for Evidentiary Ruling (O'Brien, Colin)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 392 Filed: 2/26/2018, Entered: 2/26/2018 Response
RESPONSE filed by Defendant Steadfast Networks LLCto Statement (Motion related)[366] of Uncontroverted Facts (O'Brien, Colin)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 391 Filed: 2/26/2018, Entered: 2/26/2018 Reply (Motion related)
REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to PLAINTIFF ALS SCAN, INC. RE: DMCA [338] filed by Defendant Steadfast Networks LLC. (O'Brien, Colin)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 390 Filed: 2/26/2018, Entered: 2/26/2018 Motion Related Document
REQUEST FOR EVIDENTIARY RULING re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment [347] [Request for Evidentiary Ruling on Specified Objections in Reply to ALS Scan, Inc.'s Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment] filed by Defendant Cloudflare, Inc.. (Bridges, Andrew)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 389 Filed: 2/26/2018, Entered: 2/26/2018 Motion Related Document
RESPONSE TO ALS SCAN, INC.'S STATEMENT OF GENUINE DISPUTES IN OPPOSITION TO CLOUDFLARE, INC.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment [347] filed by Defendant Cloudflare, Inc.. (Bridges, Andrew)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 388 Filed: 2/26/2018, Entered: 2/26/2018 Declaration (Motion related)
DECLARATION of Andrew P. Bridges in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment [347] [Declaration of Andrew P. Bridges in Support of Cloudflare, Inc.'s Reply in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment] filed by Defendant Cloudflare, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4, # (5) Exhibit 5, # (6) Exhibit 6, # (7) Exhibit 7, # (8) Exhibit 8, # (9) Exhibit 9, # (10) Exhibit 10, # (11) Exhibit 11, # (12) Exhibit 12)(Bridges, Andrew)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 387 Filed: 2/26/2018, Entered: 2/26/2018 Reply (Motion related)
REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment [347] filed by Defendant Cloudflare, Inc.. (Bridges, Andrew)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 386 Filed: 2/21/2018, Entered: 2/21/2018 Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under SealCourt Filing
ORDER GRANTING CLOUDFLARE'S APPLICATION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL IN CONNECTION WITH ITS OPPOSITION TO ALS SCAN, INC.'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge George H. Wu re: [379] APPLICATION to Seal Document. (See document for list) (mrgo)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 385 Filed: 2/16/2018, Entered: 2/16/2018 Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Cloudflare, Inc., re APPLICATION to file document in Connection with Cloudflare's Opposition to ALS Scan, Inc.'s Motion for Partial Summary Judgment under seal[379] served on February 16, 2018. (Nercessian, Armen)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 384 Filed: 2/16/2018, Entered: 2/16/2018 Declaration (Motion related)
DECLARATION of Andrew P. Bridges in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Third Amended Complaint against Cloudflare Inc.[324] filed by Defendant Cloudflare, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2 [Filed Under Seal], # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4, # (5) Exhibit 5 [Redacted Version], # (6) Exhibit 6 [Filed Under Seal], # (7) Exhibit 7, # (8) Exhibit 8, # (9) Exhibit 9, # (10) Exhibit 10, # (11) Exhibit 11, # (12) Exhibit 12 [Filed Under Seal], # (13) Exhibit 13, # (14) Exhibit 14, # (15) Exhibit 15, # (16) Exhibit 16, # (17) Exhibit 17, # (18) Exhibit 18, # (19) Exhibit 19, # (20) Exhibit 20, # (21) Exhibit 21, # (22) Exhibit 22, # (23) Exhibit 23, # (24) Exhibit 24, # (25) Exhibit 25, # (26) Exhibit 26, # (27) Exhibit 27, # (28) Exhibit 28, # (29) Exhibit 29, # (30) Exhibit 30)(Bridges, Andrew)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 383 Filed: 2/16/2018, Entered: 2/16/2018 Declaration (Motion related)
DECLARATION of Justin Paine in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Third Amended Complaint against Cloudflare Inc.[324] filed by Defendant Cloudflare, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4, # (5) Exhibit 5, # (6) Exhibit 6, # (7) Exhibit 7, # (8) Exhibit 8, # (9) Exhibit 9, # (10) Exhibit 10, # (11) Exhibit 11, # (12) Exhibit 12, # (13) Exhibit 13, # (14) Exhibit 14, # (15) Exhibit 15, # (16) Exhibit 16, # (17) Exhibit 17, # (18) Exhibit 18, # (19) Exhibit 19, # (20) Exhibit 20, # (21) Exhibit 21, # (22) Exhibit 22, # (23) Exhibit 23, # (24) Exhibit 24, # (25) Exhibit 25 [Filed Under Seal], # (26) Exhibit 26, # (27) Exhibit 27)(Bridges, Andrew)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 382 Filed: 2/16/2018, Entered: 2/16/2018 Declaration (Motion related)
DECLARATION of Nick Sullivan in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Third Amended Complaint against Cloudflare Inc.[324] filed by Defendant Cloudflare, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Bridges, Andrew)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 381 Filed: 2/16/2018, Entered: 2/16/2018 Declaration (Motion related)
DECLARATION of Albert Lee Guinn III in Opposition NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Third Amended Complaint against Cloudflare Inc.[324] filed by Defendant Cloudflare, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit F, # (7) Exhibit G, # (8) Exhibit H)(Bridges, Andrew)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 380 Filed: 2/16/2018, Entered: 2/16/2018 Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration
SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document in Connection with Cloudflare's Opposition to ALS Scan, Inc.'s Motion for Partial Summary Judgment under seal[379] filed by Defendant Cloudflare, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Unredacted Document [Cloudflare's Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment], # (2) Unredacted Document [Declaration of Justin Paine in Support of Cloudflare's Opposition to ALS Scan, Inc.'s Motion for Partial Summary Judgment], # (3) Unredacted Document [Exhibit 25 to the Declaration of Justin Paine], # (4) Unredacted Document [Declaration of Andrew P. Bridges in Support of Cloudflare's Opposition to ALS Scan, Inc.'s Motion for Partial Summary Judgment], # (5) Unredacted Document [Exhibit 2 to the Declaration of Andrew P. Bridges], # (6) Unredacted Document [Exhibit 5 to the Declaration of Andrew P. Bridges], # (7) Unredacted Document [Exhibit 6 to the Declaration of Andrew P. Bridges], # (8) Unredacted Document [Exhibit 12 to the Declaration of Andrew P. Bridges])(Bridges, Andrew)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 379 Filed: 2/16/2018, Entered: 2/16/2018, Terminated: 2/21/2018 Leave to File Document Under Seal
APPLICATION to file document in Connection with Cloudflare's Opposition to ALS Scan, Inc.'s Motion for Partial Summary Judgment under seal filed by Defendant Cloudflare, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order Granting Cloudflare's Application to File Documents Under Seal, # (2) Redacted Document [Cloudflare's Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment], # (3) Redacted Document [Declaration of Andrew P. Bridges in Support Support of Cloudflares Opposition to ALS Scan, Inc.'s Motion for Partial Summary Judgment], # (4) Redacted Document Exhibit 5 to the Declaration of Andrew P. Bridges, # (5) Redacted Document [Declaration of Justin Paine in Support Support of Cloudflare's Opposition to ALS Scan, Inc.'s Motion for Partial Summary Judgment])(Bridges, Andrew)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 378 Filed: 2/16/2018, Entered: 2/16/2018 Statement (Motion related)
STATEMENT of Genuine Disputes in Response to Plaintiff's Statement of Uncontroverted Facts and Conclusions of Law in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Third Amended Complaint against Cloudflare Inc.[324] filed by Defendant Cloudflare, Inc.. (Bridges, Andrew)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 377 Filed: 2/16/2018, Entered: 2/16/2018 Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
Objection in Opposition to re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Third Amended Complaint against Cloudflare Inc.[324] [Cloudflare, Inc.'s Request for Evidentiary Ruling on Specified Objections in Opposition to ALS's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment] filed by Defendant Cloudflare, Inc.. (Bridges, Andrew)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 376 Filed: 2/16/2018, Entered: 2/16/2018 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion
MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Third Amended Complaint against Cloudflare Inc.[324] [Public Redacted Version] filed by Defendant Cloudflare, Inc.. (Bridges, Andrew)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 375 Filed: 2/16/2018, Entered: 2/16/2018 Declaration (Motion related)
DECLARATION of Shahram Ghandeharizadeh in opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment [347] filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D)(Spillane, Jay)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 374 Filed: 2/16/2018, Entered: 2/16/2018 Declaration (Motion related)
DECLARATION of Eric Penn in opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment [347] filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4, # (5) Exhibit 5, # (6) Exhibit 6, # (7) Exhibit 7, # (8) Exhibit 8, # (9) Exhibit 9, # (10) Exhibit 10)(Spillane, Jay)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 373 Filed: 2/16/2018, Entered: 2/16/2018 Declaration (Motion related)
DECLARATION of Jay M. Spillane in opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment [347] filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4, # (5) Exhibit 5, # (6) Exhibit 6, # (7) Exhibit 7, # (8) Exhibit 8, # (9) Exhibit 9, # (10) Exhibit 10, # (11) Exhibit 11, # (12) Exhibit 12, # (13) Exhibit 13, # (14) Exhibit 14, # (15) Exhibit 15, # (16) Exhibit 16, # (17) Exhibit 17, # (18) Exhibit 18, # (19) Exhibit 19)(Spillane, Jay)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 372 Filed: 2/16/2018, Entered: 2/16/2018 Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
Request for Evidentiary Ruling in opposition to re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment [347] filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.. (Spillane, Jay)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 371 Filed: 2/16/2018, Entered: 2/16/2018 Statement (Motion related)
STATEMENT of Genuine Issues in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment [347] filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.. (Spillane, Jay)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 370 Filed: 2/16/2018, Entered: 2/16/2018 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion
MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment [347] filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.. (Spillane, Jay)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 369 Filed: 2/16/2018, Entered: 2/16/2018 Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
Request for Evidentiary Ruling in opposition to re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to PLAINTIFF ALS SCAN, INC.'S COUNTS II, III, & VI [343] filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.. (Spillane, Jay)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 368 Filed: 2/16/2018, Entered: 2/16/2018 Statement (Motion related)
STATEMENT of Genuine Issues in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to PLAINTIFF ALS SCAN, INC.'S COUNTS II, III, & VI [343] filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.. (Spillane, Jay)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 367 Filed: 2/16/2018, Entered: 2/16/2018 Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
Request for Evidentiary Ruling in opposition to re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to PLAINTIFF ALS SCAN, INC. RE: DMCA [338] filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.. (Spillane, Jay)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 366 Filed: 2/16/2018, Entered: 2/16/2018 Statement (Motion related)
STATEMENT of Genuine Issues in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to PLAINTIFF ALS SCAN, INC. RE: DMCA [338] filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.. (Spillane, Jay)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 365 Filed: 2/16/2018, Entered: 2/16/2018 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion
MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to PLAINTIFF ALS SCAN, INC. RE: DMCA [338], NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to PLAINTIFF ALS SCAN, INC.'S COUNTS II, III, & VI [343] filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.. (Spillane, Jay)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 364 Filed: 2/12/2018, Entered: 2/12/2018 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER ON JOINT STIPULATION REGARDING OPPOSITION AND REPLY DEADLINES FOR ALL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTIONS by Judge George H. Wu, re Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply [363]. (Responses due by 2/16/2018, Replies due by 2/26/2018.) (mrgo)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 363 Filed: 2/8/2018, Entered: 2/8/2018 Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Opposition and Reply to Summary Judgment and Partial Summary Judgment Motions filed by Defendant Steadfast Networks LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(O'Brien, Colin)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 362 Filed: 2/7/2018, Entered: 2/7/2018 Transcript Order Form (G-120)
TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendant Cloudflare, Inc. for Court Reporter. Court will contact Marti Guidoux at mguidoux@fenwick.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Nercessian, Armen)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 361 Filed: 2/6/2018, Entered: 2/6/2018 Transcript Order Form (G-120)
TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Attorney Steadfast Networks LLC for Court Reporter. Court will contact Susan Pippin at spippin@partridgepartnerspc.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Ambrogi, John)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 360 Filed: 2/5/2018, Entered: 2/6/2018 Order on Motion for Partial Summary JudgmentCourt Filing
MINUTES OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT STEADFAST NETWORKS, LLC [296] Hearing held before Judge George H. Wu. The Tentative circulated and attached hereto, is adopted as the Court's Final Ruling. Plaintiff's Motion is DENIED. Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment [324], and Defendant Cloudflare, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment [347], set for March 5, 2018, are continued to March 12, 2018 at 8:30 a.m. Counsel may stipulate to the briefing schedule. Court Reporter: Katie Thibodeaux. (mrgo)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 359 Filed: 2/5/2018, Entered: 2/5/2018 Sealed document
SEALED DOCUMENT [Unredacted Version of Cloudflare, Inc.'s Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment] re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment [347], Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal[357] filed by Defendant Cloudflare, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Unredacted Version of Declaration of Andrew P. Bridges in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, # (2) Unredacted Version of Exhibit 2 to the Declaration of Andrew P. Bridges, # (3) Unredacted Version of Exhibit 5 to the Declaration of Andrew P. Bridges, # (4) Unredacted Version of Exhibit 6 to the Declaration of Andrew P. Bridges, # (5) Unredacted Version of Exhibit 12 to the Declaration of Andrew P. Bridges, # (6) Unredacted version of Declaration of Justin Paine in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, # (7) Unredacted Version of Exhibit 25 to the Declaration of Justin Paine)(Bridges, Andrew)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 358 Filed: 2/5/2018, Entered: 2/5/2018 Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under SealCourt Filing
ORDER RE APPLICATION TO FILE EXHIBIT UNDER SEAL IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT CLOUDFLARE INC. by Judge George H. Wu re: [334] APPLICATION to Seal Document. (mrgo)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 357 Filed: 2/5/2018, Entered: 2/5/2018 Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under SealCourt Filing
ORDER GRANTING CLOUDFLARE, INC.'S APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Judge George H. Wu re: [349] APPLICATION to Seal Document. (mrgo)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 356 Filed: 2/2/2018, Entered: 2/2/2018 Motion Related Document
NOTICE OF NEW AUTHORITY - BMG V. COX (4TH CIR. 2/1/18) re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Claims and Defenses re Defendant Steadfast Networks LLC [296] filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.. (Spillane, Jay)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 355 Filed: 2/2/2018, Entered: 2/2/2018 Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Cloudflare, Inc., re APPLICATION to file document in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment under seal[349] served on February 2, 2018. (Nercessian, Armen)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 354 Filed: 2/1/2018, Entered: 2/2/2018 Declaration (Motion related)
DECLARATION of Andrew P. Bridges in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment [347] filed by Defendant Cloudflare, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Supplement 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4, # (5) Exhibit 5, # (6) Exhibit 6, # (7) Exhibit 7, # (8) Exhibit 8, # (9) Exhibit 9, # (10) Exhibit 10, # (11) Exhibit 11, # (12) Exhibit 12, # (13) Exhibit 13, # (14) Exhibit 14, # (15) Exhibit 15, # (16) Exhibit 16, # (17) Exhibit 17, # (18) Exhibit 18, # (19) Exhibit 19, # (20) Exhibit 20, # (21) Exhibit 21, # (22) Exhibit 22, # (23) Exhibit 23, # (24) Exhibit 24, # (25) Exhibit 25, # (26) Exhibit 26, # (27) Exhibit 27, # (28) Exhibit 28, # (29) Exhibit 29, # (30) Exhibit 30)(Bridges, Andrew)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 353 Filed: 2/1/2018, Entered: 2/1/2018 Declaration (Motion related)
DECLARATION of Justin Paine in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment [347] filed by Defendant Cloudflare, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Declaration 4, # (5) Exhibit 5, # (6) Exhibit 6, # (7) Exhibit 7, # (8) Exhibit 8, # (9) Exhibit 9, # (10) Exhibit 10, # (11) Exhibit 11, # (12) Exhibit 12, # (13) Exhibit 13, # (14) Exhibit 14, # (15) Exhibit 15, # (16) Exhibit 16, # (17) Exhibit 17, # (18) Exhibit 18, # (19) Exhibit 19, # (20) Exhibit 20, # (21) Exhibit 21, # (22) Exhibit 22, # (23) Declaration 23, # (24) Exhibit 24, # (25) Exhibit 25)(Bridges, Andrew)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 352 Filed: 2/1/2018, Entered: 2/1/2018 Declaration (Motion related)
DECLARATION of Nick Sullivan in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment [347] filed by Defendant Cloudflare, Inc.. (Bridges, Andrew)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 351 Filed: 2/1/2018, Entered: 2/1/2018 Declaration (Motion related)
DECLARATION of Albert Lee Guinn III in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment [347] filed by Defendant Cloudflare, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit F, # (7) Declaration G, # (8) Exhibit H)(Bridges, Andrew)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 350 Filed: 2/1/2018, Entered: 2/1/2018 Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration
SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment under seal[349] filed by Defendant Cloudflare, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Justin Paine in Support of Application to Seal, # (2) Unredacted Document [Confidential Memorandum in Support of Summary Judgment], # (3) Unredacted Document [Confidential Decl of Andrew Bridges in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment], # (4) Exhibit 2 to the Decl of Andrew Bridges, # (5) Exhibit 5 to the Decl of Andrew Bridges, # (6) Exhibit 6 to the Decl of Andrew Bridges, # (7) Exhibit 12 to the Decl of Andrew Bridges, # (8) Unredacted Document [Decl of Justin Paine in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment], # (9) Exhibit 25 to Decl of Justin Paine)(Bridges, Andrew)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 349 Filed: 2/1/2018, Entered: 2/1/2018, Terminated: 2/5/2018 Leave to File Document Under Seal
APPLICATION to file document in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment under seal filed by Defendant Cloudflare, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Redacted Document [Memorandum in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment], # (3) Redacted Document [Decl of Andrew Bridges in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment], # (4) Redacted Document [Exhibit 5 to Decl of Andrew Bridges], # (5) Redacted Document [Decl of Justin Paine in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment])(Bridges, Andrew)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 348 Filed: 2/1/2018, Entered: 2/1/2018 Notice of Lodging
NOTICE OF LODGING filed re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment [347] (Attachments: # (1) Statement of Uncontroverted Facts and Conclusions of Law, # (2) Proposed Judgment)(Bridges, Andrew)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 347 Filed: 2/1/2018, Entered: 2/1/2018, Terminated: 3/13/2018 Motion for Summary JudgmentCourt Filing
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Cloudflare, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 3/5/2018 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum in Support of Cloudflare's Motion for Summary Judgment [Redacted Public Version]) (Bridges, Andrew)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 346 Filed: 2/1/2018, Entered: 2/1/2018 Declaration (Motion related)
DECLARATION of Karl Zimmerman in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to PLAINTIFF ALS SCAN, INC.'S COUNTS II, III, & VI [343] filed by Defendant Steadfast Networks LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C)(O'Brien, Colin)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 345 Filed: 2/1/2018, Entered: 2/1/2018 Declaration (Motion related)
DECLARATION of John L. Ambrogi in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to PLAINTIFF ALS SCAN, INC.'S COUNTS II, III, & VI [343] filed by Defendant Steadfast Networks LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit F, # (7) Exhibit G, # (8) Exhibit H, # (9) Exhibit I)(O'Brien, Colin)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 344 Filed: 2/1/2018, Entered: 2/1/2018 memorandum in support of motion
MEMORANDUM in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to PLAINTIFF ALS SCAN, INC.'S COUNTS II, III, & VI [343] filed by Defendant Steadfast Networks LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Supplement Statement of Uncontroverted Facts)(O'Brien, Colin)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 343 Filed: 2/1/2018, Entered: 2/1/2018 Motion for Summary JudgmentCourt Filing
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to PLAINTIFF ALS SCAN, INC.'S COUNTS II, III, & VI filed by Defendant Steadfast Networks LLC. Motion set for hearing on 3/12/2018 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order) (O'Brien, Colin)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 342 Filed: 2/1/2018, Entered: 2/1/2018 Declaration (Motion related)
DECLARATION of Karl Zimmerman in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to PLAINTIFF ALS SCAN, INC. RE: DMCA [338] filed by Defendant Steadfast Networks LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C)(O'Brien, Colin)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 341 Filed: 2/1/2018, Entered: 2/1/2018 Declaration (Motion related)
DECLARATION of Kevin Stange in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to PLAINTIFF ALS SCAN, INC. RE: DMCA [338] filed by Defendant Steadfast Networks LLC. (O'Brien, Colin)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 340 Filed: 2/1/2018, Entered: 2/1/2018 Declaration (Motion related)
DECLARATION of John L. Ambrogi in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to PLAINTIFF ALS SCAN, INC. RE: DMCA [338] filed by Defendant Steadfast Networks LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit F, # (7) Exhibit G, # (8) Exhibit H)(O'Brien, Colin)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 339 Filed: 2/1/2018, Entered: 2/1/2018 memorandum in support of motion
MEMORANDUM in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to PLAINTIFF ALS SCAN, INC. RE: DMCA [338] filed by Defendant Steadfast Networks LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Supplement State of Uncontroverted Facts)(O'Brien, Colin)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 338 Filed: 2/1/2018, Entered: 2/1/2018 Motion for partial summary judgmentCourt Filing
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to PLAINTIFF ALS SCAN, INC. RE: DMCA filed by Defendant Steadfast Networks LLC. Motion set for hearing on 3/12/2018 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order) (O'Brien, Colin)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 337 Filed: 2/1/2018, Entered: 2/1/2018 Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: APPLICATION to file document Spillane Decl. Ex. A Doc 327-1 under seal[334], Exhibit to Motion[335]. The following error(s) was/were found: Title page is missing. Other error(s) with document(s): Please refer to L.R. 79 for the proper e-filing procedure. Or go to our Court's website at www.cacd.uscourts.gov, go to the E-Filing tab, click on Sealed Documents. There should be 2 docket entries made: 1) Application (as main document), Proposed order (as 1st attachment), & Redacted Document (as 2nd attachment); 2) Sealed Declaration in Support (as main document) & Unredacted Document (as 1st attachment). Title page is missing on doc. no. 335. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (mrgo)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 336 Filed: 2/1/2018, Entered: 2/1/2018 Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Exhibit to Motion[330], Exhibit to Motion[331]. The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notices > Manual Filing. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (mrgo)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 335 Filed: 1/31/2018, Entered: 1/31/2018 Exhibit
EXHIBIT B to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Third Amended Complaint against Cloudflare Inc.[324] Easton Decl. Doc. 329 Ex. B filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.. (Spillane, Jay)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 334 Filed: 1/31/2018, Entered: 1/31/2018, Terminated: 2/5/2018 Leave to File Document Under Seal
APPLICATION to file document Spillane Decl. Ex. A Doc 327-1 under seal filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Spillane, Jay)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 333 Filed: 1/31/2018, Entered: 1/31/2018 Sealed document
SEALED DOCUMENT Reply to Additional Statement of Facts re Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal[332] filed by Defendant Steadfast Networks LLC.(O'Brien, Colin)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 332 Filed: 1/31/2018, Entered: 1/31/2018 Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under SealCourt Filing
ORDER GRANTING STEADFAST NETWORKS LLC'S APPLICATION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL by Judge George H. Wu re: [321] APPLICATION to Seal Document. (mrgo)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 331 Filed: 1/30/2018, Entered: 1/30/2018 Exhibit
EXHIBIT Penn Exs. - Manual Filing to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Third Amended Complaint against Cloudflare Inc.[324] filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.. (Spillane, Jay)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 330 Filed: 1/30/2018, Entered: 1/30/2018 Exhibit
EXHIBIT Easton Exs. - Manual Filing to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Third Amended Complaint against Cloudflare Inc.[324] filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.. (Spillane, Jay)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 329 Filed: 1/30/2018, Entered: 1/30/2018 Declaration (Motion related)
DECLARATION of Steve Easton in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Third Amended Complaint against Cloudflare Inc.[324] filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Spillane, Jay)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 328 Filed: 1/30/2018, Entered: 1/30/2018 Declaration (Motion related)
DECLARATION of Eric Penn in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Third Amended Complaint against Cloudflare Inc.[324] filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.. (Spillane, Jay)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 327 Filed: 1/30/2018, Entered: 1/30/2018 Declaration (Motion related)
DECLARATION of Jay M. Spillane in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Third Amended Complaint against Cloudflare Inc.[324] filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit F, # (7) Exhibit G, # (8) Exhibit H, # (9) Exhibit I, # (10) Exhibit J, # (11) Exhibit K, # (12) Exhibit L, # (13) Exhibit M, # (14) Exhibit N, # (15) Exhibit O)(Spillane, Jay)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 326 Filed: 1/30/2018, Entered: 1/30/2018 Declaration (Motion related)
DECLARATION of Sarah Walsh in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Third Amended Complaint against Cloudflare Inc.[324] filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.. (Spillane, Jay)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 325 Filed: 1/30/2018, Entered: 1/30/2018 memorandum in support of motion
MEMORANDUM in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Third Amended Complaint against Cloudflare Inc.[324] filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.. (Spillane, Jay)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 324 Filed: 1/30/2018, Entered: 1/30/2018, Terminated: 3/13/2018 Motion for partial summary judgmentCourt Filing
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Third Amended Complaint against Cloudflare Inc. filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 3/5/2018 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order Separate Statement, # (2) Proposed Order) (Spillane, Jay)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 323 Filed: 1/29/2018, Entered: 1/29/2018 Text Only Scheduling NoticeCourt Filing
TEXT ONLY ENTRY - IN CHAMBERS: by Judge George H. Wu: The Court, on its own motion, CONTINUES PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT STEADFAST NETWORKS, LLC [296] previously scheduled for 02/01/2018 to 2/5/2018 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 322 Filed: 1/26/2018, Entered: 1/26/2018 Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration
SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Reply to Additional Statement of Facts under seal[321] filed by Defendant Steadfast Networks LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Colin O'Brien, # (2) Unredacted Document)(O'Brien, Colin)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 321 Filed: 1/26/2018, Entered: 1/26/2018, Terminated: 1/31/2018 Leave to File Document Under Seal
APPLICATION to file document Reply to Additional Statement of Facts under seal filed by Defendant Steadfast Networks LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Colin O'Brien, # (2) Redacted Document, # (3) Proposed Order)(O'Brien, Colin)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 320 Filed: 1/19/2018, Entered: 1/19/2018 Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
Objections in support of re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Claims and Defenses re Defendant Steadfast Networks LLC [296] Steadfast's Statement of Genuine Issues filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.. (Spillane, Jay)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 319 Filed: 1/19/2018, Entered: 1/19/2018 Response in Support of Motion
RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Claims and Defenses re Defendant Steadfast Networks LLC [296] Steadfast's Statement of Genuine Issues filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.. (Spillane, Jay)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 318 Filed: 1/18/2018, Entered: 1/18/2018, Terminated: 1/18/2018 Sealed Motion (Generic sealed motion type event)
SEALED APPLICATION re Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal[317] filed by Defendant Steadfast Networks LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B)(O'Brien, Colin)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 317 Filed: 1/18/2018, Entered: 1/18/2018 Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under SealCourt Filing
ORDER GRANTING STEADFAST NETWORKS LLC'S APPLICATION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL by Judge George H. Wu re: granting [315] APPLICATION to Seal Document. (See document for details) (mrgo)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 316 Filed: 1/16/2018, Entered: 1/16/2018 Sealed document
SEALED DOCUMENT re APPLICATION to file document under seal[315], Telephone Conference,,, Set/Reset Motion Hearing and R&R Deadlines,, [313] filed by Defendant Steadfast Networks LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Colin O'Brien, # (2) Exhibit A, # (3) Exhibit B)(O'Brien, Colin)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 315 Filed: 1/16/2018, Entered: 1/16/2018, Terminated: 1/18/2018 Leave to File Document Under Seal
APPLICATION to file document under seal filed by Defendant Steadfast Networks LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Colin O'Brien, # (2) Exhibit A, # (3) Exhibit B, # (4) Proposed Order)(O'Brien, Colin)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 314 Filed: 1/11/2018, Entered: 1/16/2018 Amended MinutesCourt Filing
AMENDED MINUTES held before Judge George H. Wu re: Telephone Conference, [313]. Defendant Steadfast's Motion for Summary Judgment [296], set for January 18, 2018, is continued to February 1, 2018 at 8:30 a.m. Defendant Steadfast's amended opposition to Plaintiff's motion for summary judgement will be amended to reflect the paragraphs (starting at No. 44) that will be in the Defendant Steadfast Network's statement of additional undisputed facts by January 16, 2018. Only the citations will be amended and nothing further. Plaintiff ALS is to file an amended reply to Defendant's amended opposition and additional facts by close of business January 19, 2018. (mrgo)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 313 Filed: 1/11/2018, Entered: 1/12/2018 Telephone ConferenceCourt Filing
MINUTES OF Telephone Conference held before Judge George H. Wu:Court and counsel confer. The Court will allow any motion for summary judgment to be filed as long as the requirements of Local Rule 6 are met. Defendant Steadfasts Motion for Summary Judgment [296], set for January 18, 2018, is continued to February 1, 2018 at 8:30 a.m. Defendant Steadfasts amended opposition to Plaintiffs statement of undisputed facts will be filed by January 16, 2018. Plaintiff ALS is to file an amended reply to Defendants amended opposition and additional facts by close of business January 19, 2018. Court Reporter: Katie Thibodeaux. (lc)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 312 Filed: 1/10/2018, Entered: 1/10/2018 Order on Motion for HearingCourt Filing
ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT CLOUDFLARE, INC. AND STEADFAST NETWORKS, LLC'S JOINTREQUEST FOR A TELEPHONE CONFERENCE REGARDING SUMMARY JUDGMENT SCHEDULING [311] by Judge George H. Wu: The Court GRANTS the request and ORDERS the parties to participate in a telephone conference on January 11, 2018 at 11:00 a.m. Counsel for Defendant Cloudflare, Inc., will provide and email the court clerk and other counsel in this matter with a call-in number for the hearing at 11:00 a.m. (cr)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 311 Filed: 1/9/2018, Entered: 1/9/2018, Terminated: 1/10/2018 Motion for HearingCourt Filing
Joint REQUEST for Hearing By Telephone Conference Regarding Summary Judgment Scheduling On Behalf of Defendants Cloudflare, Inc. and Steadfast Networks LLC filed by Defendant Cloudflare, Inc.. Request set for hearing on 1/11/2018 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Andrew P. Bridges In Support of Defendants Cloudflare, Inc. and Steadfast Networks LLC's Request for Telephone Conference Regarding Summary Judgment Scheduling, # (2) Proposed Order Granting Defendants Cloudflare, Inc. and Steadfast Networks LLC's Request for Telephone Conference Regarding Summary Judgment Scheduling) (Bridges, Andrew)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 310 Filed: 12/27/2017, Entered: 12/27/2017 Text Only Scheduling NoticeCourt Filing
TEXT ENTRY ONLY: [IN CHAMBERS] ORDER by Judge George H. Wu. The Court, on its own motion hereby continues the motion for partial summary judgment as to claims and defenses (Doc. No.[296]) from January 1, 2018 at 8:30 a.m. to January 18, 2018 at 8:30 a.m. Parties are ORDERED to appear on new date and time specified herein. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ab) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 309 Filed: 12/21/2017, Entered: 12/21/2017 Declaration (Motion related)
DECLARATION of Eric Penn in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Claims and Defenses re Defendant Steadfast Networks LLC [296] filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.. (Spillane, Jay)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 308 Filed: 12/21/2017, Entered: 12/21/2017 Reply (Motion related)
REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Claims and Defenses re Defendant Steadfast Networks LLC [296] filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.. (Spillane, Jay)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 307 Filed: 12/19/2017, Entered: 12/19/2017 Sealed document
SEALED DOCUMENT MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT re Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal[306] filed by Defendant Steadfast Networks LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration John Ambrogi Declaration with Exhibit A)(O'Brien, Colin)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 306 Filed: 12/18/2017, Entered: 12/18/2017 Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under SealCourt Filing
ORDER GRANTING STEADFAST NETWORKS LLC'S APPLICATION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL by Judge George H. Wu: Granting [304] APPLICATION to Seal Document. Please refer to the Court's order for details. (cr)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 305 Filed: 12/14/2017, Entered: 12/14/2017 Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration
SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document under seal[304] filed by Defendant Steadfast Networks LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Unredacted Document Defendant's Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, # (2) Unredacted Document Declaration of John Ambrogi with Exhibit A)(Ambrogi, John)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 304 Filed: 12/14/2017, Entered: 12/14/2017, Terminated: 12/18/2017 Leave to File Document Under Seal
APPLICATION to file document under seal filed by Defendant Steadfast Networks LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Redacted Document Defendant's Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, # (3) Redacted Document Declaration of John Ambrogi, # (4) Redacted Document Exhibit A to Declaration of John Ambrogi)(Ambrogi, John)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 303 Filed: 12/14/2017, Entered: 12/14/2017 response in opposition to motion
OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Claims and Defenses re Defendant Steadfast Networks LLC [296] filed by Defendant Steadfast Networks LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix Statement of Genuine Issues of Fact, # (2) Declaration of Kevin Stange, # (3) Declaration of Karl Zimmerman, # (4) Declaration of John Ambrogi, # (5) Exhibit A to Declaration of John Ambrogi, # (6) Exhibit B to Declaration of John Ambrogi, # (7) Exhibit C to Declaration of John Ambrogi, # (8) Exhibit D to Declaration of John Ambrogi, # (9) Exhibit E to Declaration of John Ambrogi, # (10) Exhibit F to Declaration of John Ambrogi, # (11) Exhibit G to Declaration of John Ambrogi, # (12) Exhibit H to Declaration of John Ambrogi, # (13) Exhibit I to Declaration of John Ambrogi, # (14) Exhibit J to Declaration of John Ambrogi, # (15) Exhibit K to Declaration of John Ambrogi, # (16) Exhibit L to Declaration of John Ambrogi, # (17) Exhibit M to Declaration of John Ambrogi, # (18) Exhibit N to Declaration of John Ambrogi, # (19) Exhibit O to Declaration of John Ambrogi, # (20) Exhibit P to Declaration of John Ambrogi, # (21) Exhibit Q to Declaration of John Ambrogi, # (22) Exhibit R to Declaration of John Ambrogi, # (23) Exhibit S to Declaration of John Ambrogi, # (24) Exhibit T to Declaration of John Ambrogi, # (25) Exhibit U to Declaration of John Ambrogi)(Ambrogi, John)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 302 Filed: 12/1/2017, Entered: 12/1/2017 Declaration (Motion related)
DECLARATION of Sarah Walsh in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Claims and Defenses re Defendant Steadfast Networks LLC [296] filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.. (Spillane, Jay)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 301 Filed: 12/1/2017, Entered: 12/1/2017 Declaration (Motion related)
DECLARATION of Jay M. Spillane in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Claims and Defenses re Defendant Steadfast Networks LLC [296] filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4, # (5) Exhibit 5, # (6) Exhibit 6)(Spillane, Jay)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 300 Filed: 12/1/2017, Entered: 12/1/2017 Declaration (Motion related)
DECLARATION of Eric Penn in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Claims and Defenses re Defendant Steadfast Networks LLC [296] filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4, # (5) Exhibit 5, # (6) Exhibit 6, # (7) Exhibit 7, # (8) Exhibit 8, # (9) Exhibit 9, # (10) Exhibit 10, # (11) Exhibit 11, # (12) Exhibit 12, # (13) Exhibit 13, # (14) Exhibit 14, # (15) Exhibit 15, # (16) Exhibit 16, # (17) Exhibit 17, # (18) Exhibit 18, # (19) Exhibit 19, # (20) Exhibit 20, # (21) Exhibit 21, # (22) Exhibit 22)(Spillane, Jay)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 299 Filed: 12/1/2017, Entered: 12/1/2017 Declaration (Motion related)
DECLARATION of Steve Easton in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Claims and Defenses re Defendant Steadfast Networks LLC [296] filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Notice of Manual Filing)(Spillane, Jay)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 298 Filed: 12/1/2017, Entered: 12/1/2017 Motion Related Document
NOTICE OF LODGING OF DEPOSITION OF KARL ZIMMERMAN re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Claims and Defenses re Defendant Steadfast Networks LLC [296] filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.. (Spillane, Jay)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 297 Filed: 12/1/2017, Entered: 12/1/2017 memorandum in support of motion
MEMORANDUM in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Claims and Defenses re Defendant Steadfast Networks LLC [296] filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.. (Spillane, Jay)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 296 Filed: 12/1/2017, Entered: 12/1/2017, Terminated: 2/5/2018 Motion for partial summary judgmentCourt Filing
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Claims and Defenses re Defendant Steadfast Networks LLC filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 1/4/2018 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order Order, # (2) Proposed Order Separate Statement) (Spillane, Jay)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 295 Filed: 11/14/2017, Entered: 11/14/2017 Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance[294], Notice of Appearance[292], Notice of Appearance[293]. The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal G123. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 294 Filed: 11/10/2017, Entered: 11/10/2017 Notice of Appearance
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Sapna S Mehta on behalf of Defendant Cloudflare, Inc. (Attorney Sapna S Mehta added to party Cloudflare, Inc.(pty:dft))(Mehta, Sapna)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 293 Filed: 11/10/2017, Entered: 11/10/2017 Notice of Appearance
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Armen Nercess Nercessian on behalf of Defendant Cloudflare, Inc. (Attorney Armen Nercess Nercessian added to party Cloudflare, Inc.(pty:dft))(Nercessian, Armen)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 292 Filed: 11/10/2017, Entered: 11/10/2017 Notice of Appearance
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Jedediah Wakefield on behalf of Defendant Cloudflare, Inc. (Attorney Jedediah Wakefield added to party Cloudflare, Inc.(pty:dft))(Wakefield, Jedediah)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 291 Filed: 11/10/2017, Entered: 11/10/2017 Notice of Appearance
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Andrew P Bridges on behalf of Defendant Cloudflare, Inc. (Attorney Andrew P Bridges added to party Cloudflare, Inc.(pty:dft))(Bridges, Andrew)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 290 Filed: 11/6/2017, Entered: 11/6/2017, Terminated: 11/6/2017 Request to Substitute or Withdraw Attorney (G-01)
ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY Andrew Bridges in place of attorneys Rachel Herrick Kassabian, Caroyln H. Homer, Mark Thomas Gray, filed by Defendant Cloudflare, Inc. GRANTED. (cr) Modified on 11/6/2017 (cr).
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 289 Filed: 11/2/2017, Entered: 11/2/2017, Terminated: 11/6/2017 Request to Substitute or Withdraw Attorney (G-01)
REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY Andrew P. Bridges of Fenwick & West LLP in place of attorney Rachel H. Kassabian of Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan LLP filed by Defendant Cloudflare, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order) (Kassabian, Rachel)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 288 Filed: 11/1/2017, Entered: 11/1/2017 Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under SealCourt Filing
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon GRANTING [282] Defendant Cloudflare's APPLICATION to File Exhibits P and Q Under Seal in Connection with Its' Second Supplemental Kassabian Declaration. (ib)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 287 Filed: 10/31/2017, Entered: 11/1/2017 Notice of Filing Transcript
NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 10/20/2017 re Transcript [286] THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (at) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 286 Filed: 10/31/2017, Entered: 11/1/2017 Transcript (CV)
TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 10/20/2017. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Exceptional Reporting Services, Inc., phone number (361) 949-2988. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 11/21/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/1/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/29/2018. (at)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 285 Filed: 10/26/2017, Entered: 10/26/2017 Order on motion to compelCourt Filing
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon granting in part and denying in part [245] Defendant's Motion to Compel. The discovery required by this order shall be provided by ALS no later than 11/6/17. (See document for details). (ib)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 284 Filed: 10/24/2017, Entered: 10/24/2017 Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Cloudflare, Inc., re Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration, [283] Exhibits P and Q (containing provisionally designated confidential ALS deposition testimony) to the Second Supplemental Kassabian Declaration in Support of Cloudflare's Motion to Compel served on 10/24/2017. (Homer, Carolyn)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 283 Filed: 10/24/2017, Entered: 10/24/2017 Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration
SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Exhibits P and Q, containing provisionally designated confidential ALS deposition testimony to the Second Supplemental Kassabian Declaration in Support of Cloudflare's Motion to Compel under seal[282] filed by Defendant Cloudflare, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Rachel Kassabian - Containing Exhibits P and Q)(Homer, Carolyn)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 282 Filed: 10/24/2017, Entered: 10/24/2017, Terminated: 11/1/2017 Leave to File Document Under Seal
APPLICATION to file document Exhibits P and Q, containing provisionally designated confidential ALS deposition testimony to the Second Supplemental Kassabian Declaration in Support of Cloudflare's Motion to Compel under seal filed by Defendant Cloudflare, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Rachel Kassabian - Omitting Exhibits P and Q, # (2) Proposed Order regarding confidentiality designations for Exhibits P and Q)(Homer, Carolyn)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 281 Filed: 10/24/2017, Entered: 10/24/2017 Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
Opposition re: MOTION to Compel Discovery [245] Supplemental Spillane Declaration filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.. (Spillane, Jay)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 280 Filed: 10/23/2017, Entered: 10/23/2017 Transcript Order Form (G-120)
TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendant Cloudflare, Inc. for Court Smart (CS). Court will contact Karen Beck at karenbeck@quinnemanuel.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court recorder. (Kassabian, Rachel)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 279 Filed: 10/20/2017, Entered: 10/23/2017 Telephone ConferenceCourt Filing
MINUTES OF Telephone Conference re discovery matters held before Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon: Rulings by the Court and agreements by the parties were placed on the record. Recorded on Courtsmart. (ib)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 10/19/2017, Entered: 10/19/2017 Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding heldCourt Filing
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon: Telephone Conference set for 10/20/2017 at 11:00AM before Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (See document for call-in information.) (ib)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 277 Filed: 10/18/2017, Entered: 10/18/2017 Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
Opposition re: MOTION to Compel Discovery [245] (Second Cloudflare Brief) filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.. (Spillane, Jay)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 276 Filed: 10/18/2017, Entered: 10/18/2017 Notice of Lodging
NOTICE OF LODGING filed with Proposed Order re MOTION to Compel Discovery [245] (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order regarding Cloudflare's Pending Motion to Compel (Dkt. 245))(Kassabian, Rachel)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 275 Filed: 10/16/2017, Entered: 10/16/2017 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney John Lewis Holcomb, Jr counsel for Defendant Hivelocity Ventures Corporation. John L. Holcomb, Jr. will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Hivelocity Ventures Corporation. (Holcomb, John)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 274 Filed: 10/16/2017, Entered: 10/16/2017 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Shahrokh Sheik counsel for Defendant Hivelocity Ventures Corporation. Tammy Wu will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Hivelocity Ventures Corporation. (Sheik, Shahrokh)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 273 Filed: 10/16/2017, Entered: 10/16/2017 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Shahrokh Sheik counsel for Defendant Hivelocity Ventures Corporation. Shahrokh Sheik will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Hivelocity Ventures Corporation. (Sheik, Shahrokh)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 10/6/2017, Entered: 10/6/2017 Order on Motion for protective orderCourt Filing
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon granting in part and denying in part [265] Defendant's Motion for Protective Order precluding the deposition of its CEO Matthew Prince. (See document for details). (ib)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 271 Filed: 10/5/2017, Entered: 10/5/2017 Supplement (Motion related)
SUPPLEMENT to MOTION to Compel Discovery [245] following 9/12/2017 hearing [257] and further meet-and-confer efforts filed by Defendant Cloudflare, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration (Supplemental) of Rachel Kassabian with Exhibits)(Kassabian, Rachel)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 270 Filed: 10/5/2017, Entered: 10/5/2017 Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding heldCourt Filing
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon: On the Court's own motion, the hearing noticed for 10/10/17 on plaintiff's Motion for Protective Order [265], is VACATED. No appearances are necessary. The matter is submitted. (ib)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 9/26/2017, Entered: 9/26/2017 Supplement (Motion related)
SUPPLEMENT to MOTION for Protective Order for Deposition of Cloudflare CEO [265] filed by Defendant Cloudflare, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration (Supplemental) of Rachel Kassabian, # (2) Declaration (Supplemental) of Matthew Prince)(Kassabian, Rachel)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 268 Filed: 9/20/2017, Entered: 9/21/2017 Notice of Filing Transcript
NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 9/12/17 10:36 a.m. re Transcript [267] THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ha) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 9/20/2017, Entered: 9/21/2017 Transcript (CV)
TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 9/12/17 10:36 a.m.. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: EXCEPTIONAL REPORTING SERVICES, INC, phone number (361) 949-2988. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 10/11/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/23/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/19/2017. (ha)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 266 Filed: 9/19/2017, Entered: 9/20/2017 Order on Motion to dismiss partyCourt Filing
ORDER GRANTING REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT HIVELOCITY VENTURES CORPORATION by Judge George H. Wu: Granting [264] REQUEST to Dismiss Defendant Hivelocity Ventures Corporation. Terminating Hivelocity Ventures Corporation (a Florida corporation). Please refer to the Court's order for additional information. (cr)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265 Filed: 9/19/2017, Entered: 9/19/2017, Terminated: 10/6/2017 Motion for Protective OrderCourt Filing
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Protective Order for Deposition of Cloudflare CEO filed by Defendant Cloudflare, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 10/10/2017 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum -Joint Stipulation on Cloudflare's Motion for Protective Order, # (2) Declaration of Rachel Kassabian ISO Cloudflare's Motion, # (3) Declaration of Matthew Prince ISO Cloudflare's Motion, # (4) Declaration of Jay Spillane in Opposition to Cloudflare's Motion, # (5) Exhibit s A-H to the Spillane Declaration, # (6) Proposed Order)(Kassabian, Rachel)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 264 Filed: 9/18/2017, Entered: 9/18/2017, Terminated: 9/19/2017 Motion to dismiss party
REQUEST to Dismiss Defendant Hivelocity Ventures Corporation filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order) (Spillane, Jay)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263 Filed: 9/15/2017, Entered: 9/15/2017 Notice of Filing Transcript
NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 9/7/17 0:55 am; 6/1/17 8:47 am; 5/25/17 9:29 am re Transcript [260], [262], [261] THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Thibodeaux, Katie) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 262 Filed: 9/15/2017, Entered: 9/15/2017 Transcript (CV)
TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 5/25/17 9:29 am. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Katie Thibodeaux, CSR, RPR, CRR, phone number www.katiethibodeaux.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 10/6/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/16/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/14/2017. (Thibodeaux, Katie)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 9/15/2017, Entered: 9/15/2017 Transcript (CV)
TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 6/1/17 8:47 am. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Katie Thibodeaux, CSR, RPR, CRR, phone number www.katiethibodeaux.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 10/6/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/16/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/14/2017. (Thibodeaux, Katie)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 260 Filed: 9/15/2017, Entered: 9/15/2017 Transcript (CV)
TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 9/7/17 8:55 am. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Katie Thibodeaux, CSR, RPR, CRR, phone number www.katiethibodeaux.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 10/6/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/16/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/14/2017. (Thibodeaux, Katie)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 259 Filed: 9/12/2017, Entered: 9/12/2017 Transcript Order Form (G-120)
TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendant Cloudflare, Inc. for Court Smart (CS). Court will contact Cheryl Morones at cherylmorones@quinnemanuel.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court recorder. (Gray, Mark)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 9/12/2017, Entered: 9/12/2017 Transcript Order Form (G-120)
TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendant Cloudflare, Inc. for Court Reporter. Court will contact Cheryl Morones at cherylmorones@quinnemanuel.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Gray, Mark)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 257 Filed: 9/12/2017, Entered: 9/12/2017 Motion HearingCourt Filing
MINUTES OF Defendant, Cloudflare Inc.'s Motion to Compel Discovery [ECF # 245] held before Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. Case called and appearances made. The Court and counsel discuss defendant Cloudflare's motion to compel discovery. Rulings and agreements of the parties are put on the record regarding certain issues. Other issues are reserved, pending further discussions between the parties. If the parties are unable to resolve the remaining issues, defendant Cloudflare may file a brief updating the Court on these issues, and plaintiff may then file a response within seven days. Court Recorder: CS 09/12/2017. (sbou)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 256 Filed: 9/8/2017, Entered: 9/11/2017 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER CONTINUING PRETRIAL AND TRIAL DATES by Judge George H. Wu: Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/12/2018 at 08:30 AM; Jury Trial set for 4/24/2017 at 09:00 AM. Please refer to the Court's order for additional information. (cr)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 9/8/2017, Entered: 9/8/2017 Notice of Lodging
NOTICE OF LODGING filed with proposed order on Joint Stipulation to continue trial dates following the Court's order on Defendants' Motion to Continue re Response By Court to Notice of Deficiencies (G-112B) - optional html form, [254] (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Kassabian, Rachel)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 9/8/2017, Entered: 9/8/2017 Response By Court to Notice of Deficiencies (G-112B) - optional html formCourt Filing
RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: Stipulation to Continue [251]by Judge George H. Wu. The document is accepted as filed. Counsel shall lodge a Proposed Order to the Joint Stipulation on or before noon on September 11, 2017. (cr)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 9/8/2017, Entered: 9/8/2017 Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Stipulation to Continue [251]. The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (cr)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 9/8/2017, Entered: 9/8/2017 Stipulation to Continue
Joint STIPULATION to Continue Trial from January 9, 2018 to April 24, 2018 filed by Defendant Cloudflare, Inc..(Kassabian, Rachel)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 252 Filed: 9/7/2017, Entered: 9/8/2017 Order on Motion to continueCourt Filing
MINUTES OF DEFENDANTS' JOINT MOTION TO CONTINUE PRETRIAL AND TRIAL DATES [239] held before Judge George H. Wu: Court and counsel confer. The Tentative circulated and attached hereto, is adopted as the Courts Final Ruling. Defendants' motion is GRANTED. Parties will confer and file an updated proposed scheduling order by noon on September 11, 2017. The Post-Mediation Status Conference set for September 11, 2017 is TAKEN OFF-CALENDAR. Settlement is not reached. Court Reporter: Katie Thibodeaux. (cr)
LREF
Blank 250 Filed: 9/1/2017, Entered: 9/1/2017 Reply (Motion related)
REPLY in support of Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Continue Pretrial and Trial Dates from a trial start date of 1/9/2018 to a trial start date of 4/10/2018[239] filed by Defendant Cloudflare, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration (Supplemental) of Rachel Kassabian, # (2) Declaration (Supplemental) of John Ambrogi)(Kassabian, Rachel)
LREF
Blank 249 Filed: 8/31/2017, Entered: 8/31/2017 Telephone ConferenceCourt Filing
MINUTES OF Telephone Conference held before Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon: Telephone conference re deposition schedule held. Recorded on Courtsmart. (ib)
LREF
Blank 248 Filed: 8/29/2017, Entered: 8/29/2017 Supplement (Motion related)
SUPPLEMENT to MOTION to Compel Discovery [245] pursuant to L.R. 37-2.3 filed by Defendant Cloudflare, Inc.. (Kassabian, Rachel)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 8/29/2017, Entered: 8/29/2017 Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding heldCourt Filing
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon: A Telephone Conference re discovery is set for 8/31/2017 at 10:00AM before Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (See attached for call-in information). (ib)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 8/29/2017, Entered: 8/29/2017 Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
Opposition re: Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Continue Pretrial and Trial Dates from a trial start date of 1/9/2018 to a trial start date of 4/10/2018[239] filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Sarah Walsh, # (2) Declaration of Jay M. Spillane)(Spillane, Jay)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 8/22/2017, Entered: 8/22/2017, Terminated: 10/26/2017 Motion to CompelCourt Filing
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by Defendant Cloudflare, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 9/12/2017 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum Joint Stipulation on Cloudflare's Motion to Compel, # (2) Declaration of Rachel Kassabian with Exhibits, # (3) Declaration of Nolan Schoichet with Exhibits, # (4) Declaration of Jay Spillane, # (5) Exhibit 1 to Spillane Declaration, # (6) Exhibit 2 to Spillane Declaration, # (7) Exhibit 3 to Spillane Declaration, # (8) Exhibit 4 to Spillane Declaration, # (9) Exhibit 5 to Spillane Declaration)(Kassabian, Rachel)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 8/22/2017, Entered: 8/22/2017 Order on Motion to Shorten Time for HearingCourt Filing
MINUTES IN CHAMBERS - COURT ORDER by Judge George H. Wu. Defendant's Motion to Continue Pretrial and Trial Dates is set for hearing on September 7, 2017 at 8:30 a.m. Any Opposition will be due by noon on August 29, 2017 and Reply will be filed by noon on September 1, 2017. Defendants' Ex Parte Application filed on August 24, 2017 [241] is deemed MOOT. (lom)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 8/22/2017, Entered: 8/22/2017 Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
Opposition re: EX PARTE APPLICATION to Shorten Time for Hearing on re Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Continue Pretrial and Trial Dates from a trial start date of 1/9/2018 to a trial start date of 4/10/2018[239] to 8/24/2017 [241] filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.. (Spillane, Jay)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 8/21/2017, Entered: 8/22/2017 settlement conferenceCourt Filing
MINUTES OF Settlement Conference held before Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon: Settlement is reached between plaintiff and defendant Hivelocity. (See document for further details). Recorded on Courtsmart (Partially Under Seal). (ib)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 8/21/2017, Entered: 8/21/2017, Terminated: 8/22/2017 Motion to Shorten Time for Hearing
EX PARTE APPLICATION to Shorten Time for Hearing on re Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Continue Pretrial and Trial Dates from a trial start date of 1/9/2018 to a trial start date of 4/10/2018[239] to 8/24/2017 filed by Defendant Cloudflare, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum, # (2) Declaration of John Ambrogi, # (3) Proposed Order) (Kassabian, Rachel)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 8/21/2017, Entered: 8/21/2017 Text Only Scheduling NoticeCourt Filing
TEXT ONLY ENTRY - IN CHAMBERS: by Judge George H. Wu: Counsel for Defendants' failed to comply with Local Rule 6. For that reason, DEFENDANTS MOTION TO CONTINUE PRETRIAL AND TRIAL DATES [239] previously scheduled for 08/24/2017 is CONTINUED to 9/18/2017 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 8/19/2017, Entered: 8/19/2017, Terminated: 9/7/2017 Motion to ContinueCourt Filing
Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Continue Pretrial and Trial Dates from a trial start date of 1/9/2018 to a trial start date of 4/10/2018 filed by Defendant Cloudflare, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 8/24/2017 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum in Support of Continuance, # (2) Declaration of Rachel Kassabian, # (3) Declaration of John Ambrogi, # (4) Proposed Order) (Kassabian, Rachel)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 8/16/2017, Entered: 8/16/2017 Order on Ex Parte Application for Protective OrderCourt Filing
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon granting in part and denying in part [230] Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for Protective Order re Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition Notices. (See document for details). (ib)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 8/16/2017, Entered: 8/16/2017 Reply (Motion related)
REPLY in support of EX PARTE APPLICATION for Protective Order for re 30(b)(6) Deposition Notices [230] filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3)(Spillane, Jay)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 8/15/2017, Entered: 8/15/2017 response in opposition to motion
OPPOSITION to EX PARTE APPLICATION for Protective Order for re 30(b)(6) Deposition Notices [230] filed by Defendant Hivelocity Ventures Corporation. (Sheik, Shahrokh)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 8/15/2017, Entered: 8/15/2017 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion
MEMORANDUM in Opposition to EX PARTE APPLICATION for Protective Order for re 30(b)(6) Deposition Notices [230] filed by Defendant Cloudflare, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Rachel Kassabian)(Kassabian, Rachel)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 8/15/2017, Entered: 8/15/2017 Declaration (Motion related)
DECLARATION of John L. Ambrogi In Opposition to EX PARTE APPLICATION for Protective Order for re 30(b)(6) Deposition Notices [230] filed by Defendant Steadfast Networks LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3)(Ambrogi, John)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 8/15/2017, Entered: 8/15/2017 response in opposition to motion
OPPOSITION to EX PARTE APPLICATION for Protective Order for re 30(b)(6) Deposition Notices [230] filed by Defendant Steadfast Networks LLC. (Ambrogi, John)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 8/15/2017, Entered: 8/15/2017 Declaration (Motion related)
DECLARATION of Jay M. Spillane in support of EX PARTE APPLICATION for Protective Order for re 30(b)(6) Deposition Notices [230] Supplemental filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 10)(Spillane, Jay)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 8/14/2017, Entered: 8/14/2017 Declaration (Motion related)
DECLARATION of Jay M. Spillane in support of EX PARTE APPLICATION for Protective Order for re 30(b)(6) Deposition Notices [230] filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4, # (5) Exhibit 5, # (6) Exhibit 6, # (7) Exhibit 7, # (8) Exhibit 8, # (9) Exhibit 9)(Spillane, Jay)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 8/14/2017, Entered: 8/14/2017, Terminated: 8/16/2017 Ex Parte Application for Protective Order
EX PARTE APPLICATION for Protective Order for re 30(b)(6) Deposition Notices filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Spillane, Jay)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 8/11/2017, Entered: 8/11/2017 statement
STATEMENT Election of Statutory Damages filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc. re: Amended Complaint/Petition, [148]. (Spillane, Jay)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 8/1/2017, Entered: 8/1/2017 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER RE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. by Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon: Settlement Conference set for 8/21/2017 at 10:00AM before Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (See document for details). (ib)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 7/24/2017, Entered: 7/24/2017 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER ON JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND CERTAIN CUTOFF DATES AND CONTINUE THE POST-MEDIATION CONFERENCE [220] by Judge George H. Wu. The Court hereby ORDERS: 1. The mediation cutoff shall be extended to September 5, 2017. 2. The post-mediation status conference will take place on September 11, 2017 at 8:30 a.m. 3. The fact discovery cutoff will be extended to September 15, 2017. Any party who makes their witnesses available for deposition in September will stipulate to a two week review and signature period on deposition transcripts. 4. The expert disclosure/report deadline will be continued to September 15, 2017. 5. The rebuttal expert disclosure/report deadline will be October 6, 2017, notwithstanding the provisions of FRCP R26. 6. No other dates in the case are affected by this order. 7. This order is without prejudice to the rights of any party to make or oppose a motion to continue any other dates in the Court's scheduling order. (lom)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 7/21/2017, Entered: 7/21/2017 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
ORDER by Judge George H. Wu: granting [223] Non-Resident Attorney John P. Flynn APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc., designating Jay M. Spillane as local counsel. (mrgo)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 7/21/2017, Entered: 7/21/2017 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
ORDER by Judge George H. Wu: granting [224] Non-Resident Attorney Kevin D. Neal APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc., designating Jay M. Spillane as local counsel. (mrgo)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 7/19/2017, Entered: 7/19/2017, Terminated: 7/21/2017 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
Corrected APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Kevin D. Neal to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $325.00 Previously Paid on 7/19/2017, Receipt No. 0973-20207912) filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order) (Spillane, Jay)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 7/19/2017, Entered: 7/19/2017, Terminated: 7/21/2017 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
Corrected APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney John P. Flynn to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $325.00 Previously Paid on 7/19/2017, Receipt No. 0973-20207869) filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order) (Spillane, Jay)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 7/19/2017, Entered: 7/19/2017, Terminated: 7/21/2017 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Kevin D. Neal to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-20207912) filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order) (Spillane, Jay)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 7/19/2017, Entered: 7/19/2017, Terminated: 7/21/2017 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney John P. Flynn to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-20207869) filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order) (Spillane, Jay)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 220 Filed: 7/18/2017, Entered: 7/18/2017 Stipulation to Continue
First STIPULATION to Continue Certain Cutoff Dates Re: Order on Motion to Continue[200] filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Spillane, Jay)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 7/17/2017, Entered: 7/17/2017 Order on Motion to continueCourt Filing
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon granting in part [217] plaintiff's EX PARTE APPLICATION for an extension of time to comply with the portion of the Courts Order [210] re Interrogatory No. 9. Plaintiff shall produce the updated spreadsheets as required by 7/21/17. This does not change or extend any dates previously set by the District Judge. Cloudflare's request for attorney's fees is denied. (ib)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 7/15/2017, Entered: 7/15/2017 Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
OPPOSITION re: First EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue time to Comply with 6/28 Order Interrogatory No. 9 from July 14, 2017 to July 24, 2017 Re: Order on Motion to Continue[200][217] filed by Defendant Cloudflare, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Carolyn Homer)(Kassabian, Rachel)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 7/14/2017, Entered: 7/14/2017, Terminated: 7/17/2017 Motion to Continue
First EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue time to Comply with 6/28 Order Interrogatory No. 9 from July 14, 2017 to July 24, 2017 Re: Order on Motion to Continue[200] filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order) (Spillane, Jay)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 7/14/2017, Entered: 7/14/2017 statement
STATEMENT Verification per Court Order filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc. re: Order on Motion to Compel, [210]. (Spillane, Jay)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 7/13/2017, Entered: 7/13/2017 Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding heldCourt Filing
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon re further granting of Defendant's MOTION to Compel [186]. (See document for details). (ib)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 7/10/2017, Entered: 7/14/2017 Notice of Filing Transcript
NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 6/20/17, 10:00 a.m. re Transcript [214] THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ls) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 7/10/2017, Entered: 7/14/2017 Transcript (CV)
TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 6/20/17, 10:00 a.m.. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: EXCEPTIONAL REPORTING SERVICES, INC., phone number (361) 949-2988. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 7/31/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/10/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/10/2017. (ls)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 7/7/2017, Entered: 7/7/2017 Supplement (Motion related)
SUPPLEMENT Supplemental Memorandum Regarding Publication filed by Defendant Cloudflare, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Rachel Kassabian with Supporting Exhibits)(Kassabian, Rachel)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 7/7/2017, Entered: 7/7/2017 Supplement (Motion related)
SUPPLEMENT to MOTION to Compel Productions and Responses re: RFPs 7, 8, 9, 10, 11, 15, 20, 21, 30 and Interrogatories 6, 7, 9, 10 [186] (Publication) filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D)(Spillane, Jay)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 6/28/2017, Entered: 6/28/2017 Order on motion to compelCourt Filing
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon granting in part [186] Defendant's Motion to Compel Discovery. (See document for details). ALS shall serve the amended interrogatory answers required by this order, shall produce the responsive documents required by this order, and shall provide the verifications required by this order by 7/14/17. (ib)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 6/28/2017, Entered: 6/28/2017 Response By Court to Notice of Deficiencies (G-112B) - optional html form
RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: Notice of Association of Counsel[207] by Clerk of Court. The document is stricken. Out of District counsel shall file the appropriate Application to Appear in a Specific Case as a Pro Hac Vice and pay the applicable court fees. (mrgo)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 6/27/2017, Entered: 6/27/2017 Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Association of Counsel[207]. The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s) are specified below In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (ak)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 6/26/2017, Entered: 6/26/2017 Notice of Association of Counsel
[DOCUMENT ORDERED STRICKEN PER DOC. NO. 209] NOTICE of Association of Counsel associating attorney John P. Flynn, Kevin D. Neal on behalf of Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.. Filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc. (Spillane, Jay) Modified on 6/28/2017 (mrgo).
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 6/23/2017, Entered: 6/26/2017 Order/Referral to ADR (No 1) (Judge) (ADR-12)Court Filing
ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No. 1 by Judge George H. Wu. Case ordered to Magistrate Judge for Settlement Conference. (cr)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 6/22/2017, Entered: 6/22/2017 Request for ADR Procedure No. 1 - (ADR-1)
REQUEST for ADR Procedure No. 1 filed. Parties request to Appear Before Magistrate for settlement proceedings. Filed by Defendant Steadfast Networks LLC.(O'Brien, Colin)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 205 Filed: 6/20/2017, Entered: 6/23/2017 Motion HearingCourt Filing
MINUTES OF Motion Hearing held before Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon: The Court orders the declaration of Nolan Schoichet in Support of defenant's Motion to Compel, Attachment #3 to defendants Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel [186] filed UNDER SEAL. Counsel argue. The motion is submitted. Court Recorder: Recorded on Courtsmart. (ib)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 6/20/2017, Entered: 6/20/2017 Notice of Lodging
NOTICE OF LODGING filed with revised proposed order following hearing re MOTION to Compel Productions and Responses re: RFPs 7, 8, 9, 10, 11, 15, 20, 21, 30 and Interrogatories 6, 7, 9, 10 [186] (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order (Revised))(Kassabian, Rachel)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 6/20/2017, Entered: 6/20/2017 Transcript Order Form (G-120)
TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendant Cloudflare, Inc. for Court Smart (CS). Court will contact Karen Beck at karenbeck@quinnemanuel.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court recorder. (Kassabian, Rachel)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 6/14/2017, Entered: 6/15/2017 Order Granting Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)Court Filing
ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE Attorney Daniel L. Rogna to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Steadfast Networks LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-20011894) [199] on behalf of Steadfast Networks, LLC., designating Paul D. Supnik as local counsel, by Judge George H. Wu. (cr)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 6/14/2017, Entered: 6/14/2017 Order on Motion to continueCourt Filing
ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS JOINT MOTION TO CONTINUE PRETRIAL AND TRIAL DATES [189] by Judge George H. Wu: Please refer to the Court's order for specifics. (cr)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 6/13/2017, Entered: 6/13/2017, Terminated: 6/14/2017 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Daniel L. Rogna to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Steadfast Networks LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-20011894) filed by defendant Steadfast Networks LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order) (Supnik, Paul)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 6/7/2017, Entered: 6/12/2017 Order on Motion to continueCourt Filing
MINUTES OF DEFENDANTS' JOINT MOTION TO CONTINUE PRETRIAL AND TRIAL DATES [189] by Telephone held before Judge George H. Wu. Court and counsel confer off the record re above-entitled motion. The motion is TAKEN UNDER SUBMISSION. Court to issue ruling. Court Reporter: None Present. (lom)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 6/7/2017, Entered: 6/7/2017 Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under SealCourt Filing
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon granting [194] APPLICATION File Information Under Seal. (NOTE: CHANGES HAVE BEEN MADE TO THE PROPOSED ORDER) (See document for details). (ib)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 6/7/2017, Entered: 6/7/2017 Notice of Lodging
NOTICE OF LODGING filed with proposed order re APPLICATION to file document containing ALS confidential information under seal[194] (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Homer, Carolyn)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 195 Filed: 6/6/2017, Entered: 6/7/2017 Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration
SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document containing ALS confidential information under seal[194] filed by Defendant Cloudflare, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Unredacted Document Sealed Version of Supplemental Kassabian Declaration and Exhibit A, # (2) Proof of Service)(Homer, Carolyn)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 6/6/2017, Entered: 6/6/2017, Terminated: 6/7/2017 Leave to File Document Under Seal
APPLICATION to file document containing ALS confidential information under seal filed by Defendant Cloudflare, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Redacted Document Public Version of Supplemental Kassabian Declaration)(Homer, Carolyn)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 6/6/2017, Entered: 6/6/2017 memorandum in support of motion
MEMORANDUM in Support of MOTION to Compel Productions and Responses re: RFPs 7, 8, 9, 10, 11, 15, 20, 21, 30 and Interrogatories 6, 7, 9, 10 [186] filed by Defendant Cloudflare, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Supplemental Kassabian Declaration in support of Cloudflare's Motion to Compel, # (2) Proposed Order)(Kassabian, Rachel)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 6/6/2017, Entered: 6/6/2017 Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
Opposition in opposition to re: MOTION to Compel Productions and Responses re: RFPs 7, 8, 9, 10, 11, 15, 20, 21, 30 and Interrogatories 6, 7, 9, 10 [186] filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D)(Spillane, Jay)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 6/6/2017, Entered: 6/6/2017 Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
Partial Opposition in opposition to re: Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Continue Pretrial and Trial Dates from a trial start date of 10/3/2017 to a trial state date of 2/13/2018 Re: Scheduling Conference,, [154][189] filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.. (Spillane, Jay)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 6/5/2017, Entered: 6/5/2017 Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Continue Pretrial and Trial Dates from a trial start date of 10/3/2017 to a trial state date of 2/13/2018 Re: Scheduling Conference,, [154][189]. The following error(s) was found: Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or not timely. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (mrgo)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 6/2/2017, Entered: 6/2/2017, Terminated: 6/14/2017 Motion to ContinueCourt Filing
Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Continue Pretrial and Trial Dates from a trial start date of 10/3/2017 to a trial state date of 2/13/2018 Re: Scheduling Conference,, [154] filed by Defendants Cloudflare, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 6/8/2017 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum in support of Continuance, # (2) Declaration of Rachel Kassabian, # (3) Declaration of Shahrokh Sheik, # (4) Declaration of John Ambrogi, # (5) Proposed Order) (Kassabian, Rachel)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 6/1/2017, Entered: 6/2/2017 Order on Motion for Partial Summary JudgmentCourt Filing
MINUTES OF CLOUDFLARE, INC.'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT REGARDING EXTRATERRITORIALITY [121] granting in part and denying in part [121] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Hearing held before Judge George H. Wu: Court hears further argument. The Court's Final Ruling is attached hereto. Based on the Court's Ruling, and for reasons stated on the record, Defendant's motion is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. The Court DENIES Cloudflare's Motion as to the following thirteen sites: imgchili.com, slimpics.com, bestofsexpics.com, greenpics.com, imgspot.org, imgsen.se, imgspice.com, stooorage.com, img.yt, vipergirls.to, fboom.me, imgflash.net, and imgtrex.com. The Court GRANTS Defendant's Motion as to pornwire.net. Court Reporter: Katie Thibodeaux. (bm)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 6/1/2017, Entered: 6/1/2017 Transcript Order Form (G-120)
TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendant Cloudflare, Inc. for Court Reporter. Court will contact Karen Beck at karenbeck@quinnemanuel.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Kassabian, Rachel)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 186 Filed: 5/26/2017, Entered: 5/26/2017, Terminated: 6/28/2017 Motion to CompelCourt Filing
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Productions and Responses re: RFPs 7, 8, 9, 10, 11, 15, 20, 21, 30 and Interrogatories 6, 7, 9, 10 filed by Defendant Cloudflare, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 6/20/2017 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (Attachments: # (1) Joint Stipulation, # (2) Kassabian Declaration, # (3) Schoichet Declaration (SEALED BY THE COURT), # (4) Spillane Declaration, # (5) Operative Scheduling Order (Dkt. 154))(Kassabian, Rachel) Modified on 6/16/2017 (ib).
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 5/25/2017, Entered: 5/26/2017 Motion HearingCourt Filing
MINUTES OF CLOUDFLARE, INC.'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT REGARDING EXTRATERRITORIALITY [121] held before Judge George H. Wu: The Court's Ruling is circulated and attached hereto. Court hears argument. For reasons stated on the record, Defendant's motion is continued to June 1, 2017 at 8:30 a.m. Court Reporter: Katie Thibodeaux. (cr)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 184 Filed: 5/25/2017, Entered: 5/25/2017 Transcript Order Form (G-120)
TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendant Cloudflare, Inc. for Court Reporter. Court will contact Carolyn Homer at carolynhomer@quinnemanuel.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Kassabian, Rachel)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 5/17/2017, Entered: 5/17/2017 Generic Text Only EntryCourt Filing
Effective May 24, 2017, Judge MacKinnon will be located at the Edward R. Roybal Federal Building, COURTROOM 840 on the 8th floor, located at 255 East Temple Street, Los Angeles, California 90012. All Court appearances shall be made in Courtroom 840 of the Roybal Federal Building, and all mandatory chambers copies shall be hand delivered to the judge's mail box located outside the Clerk's Office on the 12th floor of the Roybal Federal Building. The location for filing civil documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing and for viewing case files and other records services remains at the United States Courthouse, 312 North Spring Street, Room G-8, Los Angeles, California 90012. The location for filing criminal documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing remains at the Roybal Federal Building, 255 East Temple Street, Room 178, Los Angeles, California 90012. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rrp) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 5/8/2017, Entered: 5/8/2017 Text Only Scheduling NoticeCourt Filing
TEXT ONLY ENTRY - IN CHAMBERS: by Judge George H. Wu: Pursuant to the request of Plaintiff's counsel, CLOUDFLARE, INC.S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT REGARDING EXTRATERRITORIALITY [121] previously scheduled for 05/18/2017 is CONTINUED to 5/25/2017 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 5/4/2017, Entered: 5/5/2017 Order on motion to dismiss/lack of jurisdictionCourt Filing
MINUTES OF CLOUDFLARE, INC.'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT REGARDING EXTRATERRITORIALITY [121]; DOLPHIN MEDIA, LTD.'S MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION [93] Hearing held before Judge George H. Wu. Court hears further argument as to Defendant Cloudflare, Inc.'s motion for partial summary judgment. For reasons stated on the record, Defendants motion is continued to May 18, 2017 at 8:30 a.m. Counsel will contact the clerk by May 16 whether the appearance on May 18 will be required. Argument is held as to Defendant Dolphin's motion to dismiss. Based on the Tentative Rulings issued on February 27, 2017 and April 13, 2017, Defendant Dolphin's motion is GRANTED for lack of personal jurisdiction. Court Reporter: Katie Thibodeaux. (mrgo)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 180 Filed: 5/4/2017, Entered: 5/4/2017 Transcript Order Form (G-120)
TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendant Cloudflare, Inc. for Court Reporter. Court will contact Karen Beck at karenbeck@quinnemanuel.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Kassabian, Rachel)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 5/3/2017, Entered: 5/3/2017 response in opposition to motion
OPPOSITION to Plaintiff ALS Scan's Motion to Strike [178] filed by Defendant Cloudflare, Inc.. (Kassabian, Rachel)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 5/1/2017, Entered: 5/1/2017 Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
Motion to Strike New Arguments in opposition to re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Extraterritoriality [121] filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.. (Spillane, Jay)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 177 Filed: 4/30/2017, Entered: 4/30/2017 Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Motion Related Document, [175]. The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. The correct event is: Civil Events - select - Motion and Related Filings - select Applications/Ex Parte Applications/Motions/ Petitions/Requests - select - Requests - select - Ruling - follow the docketing prompts. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (shb)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 4/28/2017, Entered: 4/28/2017 Response in Support of Motion
RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Extraterritoriality [121] regarding Plaintiff's Supplemental Statement of Genuine Issues of Material Fact in Connection with Plaintiff's Offer of Proof (Dkt. 172) filed by Defendant Cloudflare, Inc.. (Kassabian, Rachel)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 4/27/2017, Entered: 4/27/2017 Motion Related Document
REQUEST FOR EVIDENTIARY RULING re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Extraterritoriality [121] as to ALS Scan's Offer of Proof in Opposition filed by Defendant Cloudflare, Inc.. (Kassabian, Rachel)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 4/27/2017, Entered: 4/27/2017 Reply (Motion related)
REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Extraterritoriality [121] following ALS Scan's Offer of Proof filed by Defendant Cloudflare, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration (Supplemental) of Trey Guinn, # (2) Declaration of Nolan Schoichet, # (3) Declaration (Supplemental) of Rachel Kassabian, # (4) Proposed Order (Revised))(Kassabian, Rachel)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 4/20/2017, Entered: 4/20/2017 Statement (Motion related)
STATEMENT of Demand to Lodge Guinn Deposition NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Extraterritoriality [121] (Offer of Proof) filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.. (Spillane, Jay)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 4/20/2017, Entered: 4/20/2017 Statement (Motion related)
STATEMENT of Separate Statement of Genuine Disputes NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Extraterritoriality [121] (Offer of Proof) filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.. (Spillane, Jay)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 4/20/2017, Entered: 4/20/2017 Declaration (Motion related)
DECLARATION of Jay M. Spillane in opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Extraterritoriality [121] (Offer of Proof) filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4, # (5) Exhibit 5, # (6) Exhibit 6, # (7) Exhibit 7, # (8) Exhibit 8, # (9) Exhibit 9, # (10) Exhibit 10, # (11) Exhibit 11)(Spillane, Jay)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 4/20/2017, Entered: 4/20/2017 Declaration (Motion related)
DECLARATION of Eric Penn in opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Extraterritoriality [121] (Offer of Proof) filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4, # (5) Exhibit 5, # (6) Exhibit 6, # (7) Exhibit 7, # (8) Exhibit 8, # (9) Exhibit 9, # (10) Exhibit 10, # (11) Exhibit 11, # (12) Exhibit 12, # (13) Exhibit 13, # (14) Exhibit 14, # (15) Exhibit 15, # (16) Exhibit 16, # (17) Exhibit 17, # (18) Exhibit 18, # (19) Exhibit 19, # (20) Exhibit 20, # (21) Exhibit 21, # (22) Exhibit 22)(Spillane, Jay)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 4/20/2017, Entered: 4/20/2017 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion
MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Extraterritoriality [121] (Offer of Proof) filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.. (Spillane, Jay)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 4/19/2017, Entered: 4/19/2017 Notice of Filing Transcript
NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings APRIL 13, 2017, 9:00 a.m. re Transcript [167] THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (MacNeil, Sandra) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 4/19/2017, Entered: 4/19/2017 Transcript (CV)
TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on APRIL 13, 2017, 9:00 a.m. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: SANDRA MACNEIL, phone number 213-894-5949; MACNEILSANDY@GMAIL.COM. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 5/10/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/22/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/18/2017. (MacNeil, Sandra)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 166 Filed: 4/14/2017, Entered: 4/14/2017 Transcript Order Form (G-120)
TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendant Cloudflare, Inc. for Court Reporter. Court will contact Karen Beck at karenbeck@quinnemanuel.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Kassabian, Rachel)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 4/13/2017, Entered: 4/14/2017 Status Conference - optional html formCourt Filing
MINUTES OF CLOUDFLARE, INC.'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARYJUDGMENT REGARDING EXTRATERRITORIALITY [121];STATUS CONFERENCE held before Judge George H. Wu re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Extraterritoriality [121], NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Notice of Motion[93]. Responses due by 4/20/2017 Replies due by 4/27/2017. Motion set for hearing on 5/4/2017 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. Court Reporter: Sandra MacNeil. (mrgo)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 4/11/2017, Entered: 4/11/2017 Report
JOINT STATUS REPORT of Cloudflare Motion (4/13/17 hearing) filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.. (Spillane, Jay)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 163 Filed: 4/10/2017, Entered: 4/10/2017 Answer
ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition, [148] with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Steadfast Networks LLC.(O'Brien, Colin)
LREF
Blank 162 Filed: 4/4/2017, Entered: 4/4/2017 Answer
ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition, [148] with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Cloudflare, Inc..(Kassabian, Rachel)
LREF
Blank 161 Filed: 4/4/2017, Entered: 4/4/2017 Answer
ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition, [148] JURY DEMAND. filed by Defendant Hivelocity Ventures Corporation.(Wu, Tammy)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 3/31/2017, Entered: 3/31/2017 (TERMED) Text Only Scheduling NoticeCourt Filing
TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS): by Judge George H. Wu: Counsel has advised the clerk that the deposition issue has been resolved. For that reason, the Court VACATES the status conference set for March 31 at 3:00 p.m. [159] THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 3/30/2017, Entered: 3/31/2017 Motion HearingCourt Filing
MINUTES OF CLOUDFLARE, INC.'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT REGARDING EXTRATERRITORIALITY Hearing held before Judge George H. Wu re: Motion for Partial Summary Judgment [121]. Parties will contact the court clerk by noon on March 30, 2017 whether a telephonic hearing at 3:00 p.m. will be necessary to resolve the deposition issue. The Court sets a status conference for April 13, 2017 at 8:30 a.m. Parties will file a joint status report regarding the status of discovery and the offer of proof as to the territoriality/extraterritoriality issue by noon on April 11, 2017. The above-entitled motion is continued to April 13, 2017 at 8:30 a.m. Court Reporter: Katie Thibodeaux. (mrgo)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 3/30/2017, Entered: 3/30/2017 Reply (Motion related)
REPLY In Support of Supplemental NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Notice of Motion[93] Supplemental re: 4(k)(2) Nationwide Jurisdiction filed by Defendant Dolphin Media Ltd.. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Tomas Mazal, # (2) Evidentiary Objections)(Kernan, Stephen)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 3/30/2017, Entered: 3/30/2017 Transcript Order Form (G-120)
TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendant Cloudflare, Inc. for Court Reporter. Court will contact Karen Beck at karenbeck@quinnemanuel.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Kassabian, Rachel)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 3/29/2017, Entered: 3/29/2017 Order on motion to compelCourt Filing
ORDER WITHDRAWING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL [118] WITHOUT PREJUDICE by Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. Re Stipulation [155]. (ib)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 3/28/2017, Entered: 3/28/2017 Stipulation to Withdraw Motion/Application/Request/Ex Parte Application
STIPULATION to Withdraw Motion MOTION to Compel Supplemental Responses to RFPs and Production of Documents against Defendant Hivelocity[118] filed by DEFENDANT Hivelocity Ventures Corporation. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Holcomb, John)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 3/27/2017, Entered: 3/28/2017 Scheduling Conference - optional html formCourt Filing
MINUTES OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held before Judge George H. Wu. Court and counsel confer. Court sets the following: Service of Third Am. Complaint March 20, 2017; Steadfast Response 20 days after service of 3AC; Mediation Cutoff June 23, 2017; Post-Mediation Status Conference June 26, 2017 at 8:30 a.m.; Discovery Cutoff June 30, 2017; Expert discovery cutoff July 25, 2017; Motion hearing cutoff August 24, 2017; Pretrial conference September 21, 2017 at 8:30 a.m.; Jury trial (six day estimate) October 3, 2017 at 9:00 a.m. Court Reporter: Katie Thibodeaux. (lom)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 153 Filed: 3/22/2017, Entered: 3/22/2017 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Shahrokh Sheik counsel for Defendant Hivelocity Ventures Corporation. Adding Shahrokh Sheik as counsel of record for Hivelocity Ventures Corporation for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Hivelocity Ventures Corporation. (Attorney Shahrokh Sheik added to party Hivelocity Ventures Corporation(pty:dft))(Sheik, Shahrokh)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 3/22/2017, Entered: 3/22/2017 (TERMED) Text Only Scheduling NoticeCourt Filing
TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS): by Judge George H. Wu: Based on the Minutes of the Scheduling Conference [141], the Order to Show Cause issed on March 20, 2017 [149] is DISCHARGED. The Scheduling Conference remains set for March 27, 2017 at 8:30 a.m. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 3/22/2017, Entered: 3/22/2017 Declaration (Motion related)
DECLARATION of SHAHROKH SHEIK IN RESPONSE TO MOTION to Compel Supplemental Responses to RFPs and Production of Documents against Defendant Hivelocity[118] Declaration filed by Defendant Hivelocity Ventures Corporation. (Holcomb, John)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 3/21/2017, Entered: 3/22/2017 Order on motion to compelCourt Filing
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) re Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Defendant Hivelocity Ventures Corporation to Serve Further Responses to Production Requests and to Produce Documents (Filed March 2, 2017; ECF No. 118) by Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. On the Court's own motion, the hearing on Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Defendant Hivelocity Ventures Corporation to Serve Further Responses to Production Requests and to Produce Documents, noticed for March 28, 2017, is vacated. The matter is taken under submission on the basis of the papers timely filed. Local Rule 7-15. re [118] Motion to Compel. (sbou)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 3/20/2017, Entered: 3/21/2017 Scheduling Conference - optional html formCourt Filing
MINUTES OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held before Judge George H. Wu. Counsel are not present. Parties are ordered to appear on March 27, 2017 at 8:30 a.m., and show cause why sanctions should not be imposed for failure to appear at today's hearing. The Scheduling Conference is continued to March 27, 2017 at 8:30 a.m. Court Reporter: Marea Woolrich. (mrgo)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 148 Filed: 3/20/2017, Entered: 3/20/2017 Amended Complaint/Petition
THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT against DEFENDANTS Cloudflare, Inc., DOES, Dolphin Media Ltd., Hivelocity Ventures Corporation, Steadfast Networks LLC amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)[1], filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2)(Spillane, Jay)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 3/16/2017, Entered: 3/17/2017 Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding heldCourt Filing
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge George H. Wu re: Declaration (Motion related), [139], MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion, [138], Declaration (Motion related), [140]. The Court is now in receipt of Plaintiff's Offer of Proof. See Docket Nos. 138-140. The Offer of Proof delineates several specific contacts that Dolphin maintains with the United States, which Plaintiff contends are sufficient to establish nationwide jurisdiction. See Docket No. 138 at 3:12-16, 5:24-6:26. Because these contacts raise the possibility that nationwide jurisdiction exists, the Court orders Dolphin to submit a response by March 30, 2017. (mrgo)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 3/16/2017, Entered: 3/16/2017 Motion Related Document
Request for Evidentiary Ruling on Specified Objections re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Extraterritoriality [121] filed by Defendant Cloudflare, Inc.. (Kassabian, Rachel)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 3/16/2017, Entered: 3/16/2017 Response in Support of Motion
RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Extraterritoriality [121] regarding Plaintiffs' Statement of Genuine Issues of Material Fact (Dkt. 131) filed by Defendant Cloudflare, Inc.. (Kassabian, Rachel)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 3/16/2017, Entered: 3/16/2017 Reply (Motion related)
REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Extraterritoriality [121] filed by Defendant Cloudflare, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Rachel Kassabian ISO Partial Summary Judgment, # (2) Declaration of Kenneth Carter ISO Partial Summary Judgment)(Kassabian, Rachel)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 3/16/2017, Entered: 3/16/2017 Status report
STATUS REPORT filed by Defendant Cloudflare, Inc.. (Kassabian, Rachel)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 3/15/2017, Entered: 3/15/2017 (TERMED) Text Only Scheduling NoticeCourt Filing
TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS): by Judge George H. Wu; The Court has received Plaintiff's Request to Continue Hearing on Motion by Defendant Cloudflare, Inc.'s for Partial Summary Judgment [132]. The request is DENIED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 3/13/2017, Entered: 3/14/2017 Scheduling Conference - optional html formCourt Filing
MINUTES OF Scheduling Conference held before Judge George H. Wu. Court and counsel confer re scheduling. For reasons stated on the record, the scheduling conference is continued to March 27, 2017 at 8:30 a.m. Parties will file a joint scheduling report by noon on March 16, 2017. Court Reporter: Katie Thibodeaux. (jy)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 3/13/2017, Entered: 3/13/2017 Declaration (Motion related)
DECLARATION of Jay M. Spillane in opposition to Supplemental NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Certificate and Notice of Interested Parties[95] Supplemental re Nationwide Jurisdiction filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit F, # (7) Exhibit G, # (8) Exhibit H, # (9) Exhibit I, # (10) Exhibit J)(Spillane, Jay)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 3/13/2017, Entered: 3/13/2017 Declaration (Motion related)
DECLARATION of Eric Penn in opposition to Supplemental NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Certificate and Notice of Interested Parties[95] Supplemental re Nationwide Jurisdiction filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4, # (5) Exhibit 5, # (6) Exhibit 6, # (7) Exhibit 7)(Spillane, Jay)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 3/13/2017, Entered: 3/13/2017 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion
MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Supplemental NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Certificate and Notice of Interested Parties[95] Supplemental re Nationwide Jurisdiction filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.. (Spillane, Jay)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 3/13/2017, Entered: 3/13/2017 Transcript Order Form (G-120)
TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendant Cloudflare, Inc. for Court Reporter. Court will contact Karen Beck at karenbeck@quinnemanuel.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Kassabian, Rachel)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 3/10/2017, Entered: 3/10/2017 statement
STATEMENT Plaintiff's Statement re 03 13 17 Scheduling Conference filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc. re: Status Report[129]. (Spillane, Jay)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 3/10/2017, Entered: 3/10/2017 statement
STATEMENT of Defendants Regarding Scheduling Conference re: Status Report[129]. (Kassabian, Rachel)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 3/9/2017, Entered: 3/9/2017 Declaration (Motion related)
DECLARATION of Eric Penn in opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Extraterritoriality [121] filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4, # (5) Exhibit 5, # (6) Exhibit 6, # (7) Exhibit 7, # (8) Exhibit 8, # (9) Exhibit 9, # (10) Exhibit 10, # (11) Exhibit 11, # (12) Exhibit 12, # (13) Exhibit 13, # (14) Exhibit 14, # (15) Exhibit 15)(Spillane, Jay)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 3/9/2017, Entered: 3/9/2017 Declaration (Motion related)
DECLARATION of Jay M. Spillane in opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Extraterritoriality [121] filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit F, # (7) Exhibit G, # (8) Exhibit H, # (9) Exhibit I, # (10) Exhibit J, # (11) Exhibit K, # (12) Exhibit L)(Spillane, Jay)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 3/9/2017, Entered: 3/9/2017 Motion Related Document
REQUEST TO CONTINUE FRCP R 56(d) re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Extraterritoriality [121] filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.. (Spillane, Jay)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 3/9/2017, Entered: 3/9/2017 Statement (Motion related)
STATEMENT of Genuine Issues in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Extraterritoriality [121] filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.. (Spillane, Jay)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 3/9/2017, Entered: 3/9/2017 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion
MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Extraterritoriality [121] filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.. (Spillane, Jay)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 3/8/2017, Entered: 3/8/2017 Status report
STATUS REPORT filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.. (Spillane, Jay)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 128 Filed: 3/7/2017, Entered: 3/7/2017 Sealed document
SEALED DOCUMENT Declaration of Trey Guinn, Exhibits G-U re Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal, [127], NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Extraterritoriality [121] filed by Defendant Cloudflare, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Proof of Service)(Homer, Carolyn)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 127 Filed: 3/3/2017, Entered: 3/6/2017 Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under SealCourt Filing
ORDER GRANTING CLOUDFLARE, INC.'S APPLICATION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL by Judge George H. Wu re: [124] APPLICATION to Seal Document. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: The Application to File Documents Under Seal is hereby GRANTED, and the following documents are ORDERED filed under seal: (see document for list). (mrgo)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 3/3/2017, Entered: 3/3/2017 OrderCourt Filing
STANDING ORDER RE SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTIONS by Judge George H. Wu: You are instructed to read and to follow the requirements in Fed. R. Civ. P. 56 andCentral District of California Local Rules 56-1 through 56-3. (cr)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 125 Filed: 3/2/2017, Entered: 3/2/2017 Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration
SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Guinn Declaration, Exhibits G-U under seal[124] filed by Defendant Cloudflare, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Unredacted Document Guinn Declaration with Sealed Exhibits G-U, # (2) Proof of Service)(Homer, Carolyn)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 3/2/2017, Entered: 3/2/2017, Terminated: 3/3/2017 Leave to File Document Under Seal
APPLICATION to file document Guinn Declaration, Exhibits G-U under seal filed by Defendant Cloudflare, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Justin Paine in Support of Application to Seal, # (2) Redacted Document Public Version of Declaration of Trey Guinn, # (3) Proposed Order)(Homer, Carolyn)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 3/2/2017, Entered: 3/2/2017 Notice of Lodging
NOTICE OF LODGING filed re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Extraterritoriality [121] (Attachments: # (1) Separate Statement of Uncontroverted Facts and Conclusions of Law)(Kassabian, Rachel)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 3/2/2017, Entered: 3/2/2017 memorandum in support of motion
MEMORANDUM in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Extraterritoriality [121] filed by Defendant Cloudflare, Inc.. (Kassabian, Rachel)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 3/2/2017, Entered: 3/2/2017, Terminated: 6/1/2017 Motion for partial summary judgmentCourt Filing
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Extraterritoriality filed by Defendant Cloudflare, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 3/30/2017 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order) (Kassabian, Rachel)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 3/2/2017, Entered: 3/2/2017 Declaration (Motion related)
DECLARATION of Jay M. Spillane in support of MOTION to Compel Supplemental Responses to RFPs and Production of Documents against Defendant Hivelocity[118] filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3)(Spillane, Jay)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 3/2/2017, Entered: 3/2/2017 statement
STATEMENT Separate Statement in Support of Motion to Compel filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc. re: MOTION to Compel Supplemental Responses to RFPs and Production of Documents against Defendant Hivelocity[118]. (Spillane, Jay)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 3/2/2017, Entered: 3/2/2017, Terminated: 3/29/2017 Motion to CompelCourt Filing
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Supplemental Responses to RFPs and Production of Documents against Defendant Hivelocity filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 3/28/2017 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (Spillane, Jay)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 116 Filed: 2/28/2017, Entered: 2/28/2017 Notice of Appearance
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Mark Thomas Gray on behalf of Defendant Cloudflare, Inc. (Attorney Mark Thomas Gray added to party Cloudflare, Inc.(pty:dft))(Gray, Mark)
LREF
Blank 115 Filed: 2/28/2017, Entered: 2/28/2017 Transcript Order Form (G-120)
TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendant Cloudflare, Inc. for Court Reporter. Court will contact Karen Beck at karenbeck@quinnemanuel.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Kassabian, Rachel)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 2/27/2017, Entered: 2/28/2017 Order on motion to dismiss/lack of jurisdictionCourt Filing
MINUTES OF DEFENDANT DOLPHIN MEDIA LIMITED'S MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION, FOR IMPROPER VENUE, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE FORUM NON CONVENIENS [93]; SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held before Judge George H. Wu. Scheduling Conference continued to 3/13/2017 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. Parties will file a joint status report by noon on March 8, 2017. Court Reporter: Katie Thibodeaux. (mrgo)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 2/23/2017, Entered: 2/23/2017 Report
SUPPLEMENTAL REPORT of DEFENDANTS JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT filed by Defendant Steadfast Networks LLC. (O'Brien, Colin)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 2/23/2017, Entered: 2/23/2017, Terminated: 2/23/2017 Motion to dismiss party
REQUEST to Dismiss Defendants Hebergement OVH Inc., OVH SAS filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.. (Spillane, Jay)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 112 Filed: 2/17/2017, Entered: 2/17/2017 Transcript Order Form (G-120)
TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendant Cloudflare, Inc. for Court Reporter. Court will contact Karen Beck at karenbeck@quinnemanuel.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Kassabian, Rachel)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 2/16/2017, Entered: 2/17/2017 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
MINUTES OF DEFENDANT STEADFAST NETWORKS LLC'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Hearing held before Judge George H. Wu re: [89] MOTION to Dismiss. Defendant Steadfast's motion is GRANTED WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. Scheduling Conference set for 2/27/2017 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. Court Reporter: Katie Thibodeaux. (mrgo)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 2/13/2017, Entered: 2/13/2017 Reply (Motion related)
REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Notice of Motion[93] filed by Defendant Dolphin Media Ltd.. (Attachments: # (1) Objections, # (2) Declaration of Tomas Mazal)(Kernan, Stephen)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 2/13/2017, Entered: 2/13/2017 Declaration
DECLARATION of Justin Paine re Sealed Document, [108] Declaration in Support of Sealing Cloudflare Customer and Business Records filed by Defendant Cloudflare, Inc.. (Kassabian, Rachel)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 108 Filed: 2/9/2017, Entered: 2/9/2017 Sealed document
SEALED DOCUMENT Spillane Declaration with Cloudflare Account Information re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Notice of Motion[93], Protective Order[104] filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1)(Spillane, Jay)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 2/6/2017, Entered: 2/6/2017 Declaration (Motion related)
DECLARATION of Jay M. Spillane in opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Notice of Motion[93] filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4, # (5) Exhibit 5, # (6) Exhibit 6, # (7) Exhibit 7, # (8) Exhibit 8, # (9) Exhibit 9, # (10) Exhibit 10, # (11) Exhibit 11, # (12) Exhibit 12, # (13) Exhibit 13, # (14) Exhibit 14, # (15) Exhibit 15)(Spillane, Jay)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 2/6/2017, Entered: 2/6/2017 Declaration (Motion related)
DECLARATION of Eric Penn in opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Notice of Motion[93] filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2)(Spillane, Jay)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 2/6/2017, Entered: 2/6/2017 Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
Opposition in opposition to re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Notice of Motion[93] filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.. (Spillane, Jay)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 2/3/2017, Entered: 2/3/2017 protective orderCourt Filing
PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon re Stipulation for Protective Order[103] (ib)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 103 Filed: 2/2/2017, Entered: 2/2/2017 Stipulation for Protective Order
STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc..(Spillane, Jay)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 2/1/2017, Entered: 2/1/2017 Reply (Motion related)
REPLY support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim [89] filed by Defendant Steadfast Networks LLC. (O'Brien, Colin)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 101 Filed: 1/30/2017, Entered: 1/30/2017 Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Stipulation for Protective Order[98]. The following error(s) was found: Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (mrgo)
LREF
Blank 100 Filed: 1/30/2017, Entered: 1/30/2017 Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Supplemental NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Certificate and Notice of Interested Parties[95]. The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. The correct event is: Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (mrgo)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 1/27/2017, Entered: 1/27/2017 Text Only Bounced Notice of Electronic Filing E-mail
Notice of Electronic Filing re Notice of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) [94], Supplemental NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Certificate and Notice of Interested Parties[95], MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion [96], Request for Judicial Notice[97], Stipulation for Protective Order[98] e-mailed to Ryan Evan Carreon at rcarreon@kermanlaw.net bounced due to typo in email address. Primary e-mail address corrected. Notice of Electronic Filing resent addressed to rcarreon@kernanlaw.net. Pursuant to Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ir) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 1/26/2017, Entered: 1/26/2017 Stipulation for Protective Order
STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc..(Spillane, Jay)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 1/26/2017, Entered: 1/26/2017 Request For Judicial Notice
REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim [89] filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.. (Spillane, Jay)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 1/26/2017, Entered: 1/26/2017 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion
MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim [89] filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.. (Spillane, Jay)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 1/24/2017, Entered: 1/24/2017, Terminated: 1/24/2017 Motion to DismissCourt Filing
Supplemental NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Certificate and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Dolphin Media Ltd.. Motion set for hearing on 2/27/2017 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Kernan, Stephen)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 94 Filed: 1/23/2017, Entered: 1/24/2017 Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Notice of Motion[93]. The following error(s) was found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (mrgo)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 1/19/2017, Entered: 1/19/2017, Terminated: 5/4/2017 Motion to DismissCourt Filing
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Notice of Motion filed by Defendant Dolphin Media Ltd.. Motion set for hearing on 2/27/2017 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum of Points and Authorities, # (2) Declaration of Tomas Mazal, # (3) Request For Judicial Notice, # (4) Exhibit A in support of Request For Judicial Notice, # (5) Exhibit B in support of Request For Judicial Notice, # (6) Exhibit C in support of Request For Judicial Notice, # (7) Exhibit D in support of Request For Judicial Notice, # (8) Exhibit E in support of Request For Judicial Notice, # (9) Proposed Order) (Attorney Stephen M Kernan added to party Dolphin Media Ltd.(pty:dft)) (Kernan, Stephen)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 92 Filed: 1/16/2017, Entered: 1/16/2017 waiver of service executed
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.. Waiver of Service signed by OVH SAS. (Spillane, Jay)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 1/11/2017, Entered: 1/11/2017 (TERMED) Text Only Scheduling NoticeCourt Filing
TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS): by Judge George H. Wu: The Court, on its own motion, CONTINUES DEFENDANT STEADFAST NETWORKS LLCS MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM [89] previously scheduled for 02/09/2017 to 2/16/2017 at 08:30 AM.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 1/5/2017, Entered: 1/5/2017 memorandum in support of motion
MEMORANDUM in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim [89] filed by Defendant Steadfast Networks LLC. (O'Brien, Colin)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 1/5/2017, Entered: 1/5/2017, Terminated: 2/16/2017 Motion to DismissCourt Filing
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim filed by defendant Steadfast Networks LLC. Motion set for hearing on 2/9/2017 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order Granting Defendant Steadfast Networks LLCs Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Second Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim) (O'Brien, Colin)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 88 Filed: 1/5/2017, Entered: 1/5/2017 Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Notice and CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Steadfast Networks LLC, identifying None. (O'Brien, Colin)
LREF
Blank 87 Filed: 12/27/2016, Entered: 12/27/2016 Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
RETURN RECEIPT Executed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc., upon Defendant OVH SAS served on 12/7/2016, answer due 12/28/2016. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon OVH SAS and signed by (signature illegible) by foreign service. (mrgo)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 12/22/2016, Entered: 12/22/2016 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
ORDER by Judge George H. Wu: granting [82] Non-Resident Attorney Colin T.J. O'Brien APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of defendant Steadfast Networks, LLC, designating Paul D. Supnik as local counsel. (mrgo)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 12/22/2016, Entered: 12/22/2016 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
ORDER by Judge George H. Wu: granting [83] Non-Resident Attorney John L. Ambrogi APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of defendant Steadfast Networks, LLC, designating Paul D. Supnik as local counsel. (mrgo)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 84 Filed: 12/20/2016, Entered: 12/20/2016 Notice of Lodging
NOTICE OF LODGING filed December 20, 2016 re Second APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Colin T.J. O'Brien to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Steadfast Networks LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $325 Previously Paid on 12/19/2016, Receipt No. 0973-19077880)[82] (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Supnik, Paul)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 12/20/2016, Entered: 12/20/2016, Terminated: 12/22/2016 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
Second APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney John L. Ambrogi to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Steadfast Networks LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $325 Previously Paid on 12/19/2016, Receipt No. 0973-19078034) filed by defendant Steadfast Networks LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order) (Supnik, Paul)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 12/20/2016, Entered: 12/20/2016, Terminated: 12/22/2016 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
Second APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Colin T.J. O'Brien to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Steadfast Networks LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $325 Previously Paid on 12/19/2016, Receipt No. 0973-19077880) filed by defendant Steadfast Networks LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order) (Supnik, Paul)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 81 Filed: 12/20/2016, Entered: 12/20/2016 Notice of Deficiency in Electronically filed Pro Hac Vice Application (G-112C) - optional html form
NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Colin T.J. O'Brien to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Steadfast Networks LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-19077880)[78], APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney John L. Ambrogi to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Steadfast Networks LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-19078034)[79], Amended APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Colin T.J. O'Brien to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Steadfast Networks LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $325 Previously Paid on 12/19/2016, Receipt No. 0973-19077880)[80]. The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(a) Application not complete: state and/or federal courts to which the applicant has been admitted are not listed. (lom)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 12/19/2016, Entered: 12/19/2016, Terminated: 12/22/2016 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
Amended APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Colin T.J. O'Brien to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Steadfast Networks LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $325 Previously Paid on 12/19/2016, Receipt No. 0973-19077880) filed by defendant Steadfast Networks LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order) (Supnik, Paul)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 12/19/2016, Entered: 12/19/2016, Terminated: 12/22/2016 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney John L. Ambrogi to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Steadfast Networks LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-19078034) filed by defendant Steadfast Networks LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order) (Supnik, Paul)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 12/19/2016, Entered: 12/19/2016, Terminated: 12/22/2016 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Colin T.J. O'Brien to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Steadfast Networks LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-19077880) filed by defendant Steadfast Networks LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order) (Supnik, Paul)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 77 Filed: 12/14/2016, Entered: 12/14/2016 Answer
ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition, [64] with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Hivelocity Ventures Corporation.(Attorney Tammy X Wu added to party Hivelocity Ventures Corporation(pty:dft))(Wu, Tammy)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 12/9/2016, Entered: 12/12/2016 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER ON STIPULATION TO VACATE DEFAULT AND SET DATE TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Judge George H. Wu, re Stipulation to Set Aside Default, [75]. IT IS ORDERED that the default entered against defendant STEADFAST NETWORKS, LLC on December 5, 2016 be vacated; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that STEADFAST NETWORKS, LLC shall have until January 6, 2017 to file and serve its response to the Second Amended Complaint herein; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that STEADFAST NETWORKS, LLC shall not contest jurisdiction or venue in its response to the Second Amended Complaint. (mrgo)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 75 Filed: 12/8/2016, Entered: 12/8/2016 Stipulation to Set Aside Default
STIPULATION to Set Aside Default as to Steadfast Networks, LLC filed by defendant Steadfast Networks LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order vacating default and setting date to respond to complaint)(Attorney Paul D Supnik added to party Steadfast Networks LLC(pty:dft))(Supnik, Paul)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 12/5/2016, Entered: 12/5/2016 Clerks Entry of Default (CV-37) - optional html form
DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to Steadfast Networks LLC, a Delaware limited liability company. (mrgo)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 12/5/2016, Entered: 12/5/2016, Terminated: 12/5/2016 Motion for Clerk to Enter Default
Second REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Steadfast Networks LLC filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.. (Spillane, Jay)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 71 Filed: 12/5/2016, Entered: 12/5/2016 Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc., upon Defendant Steadfast Networks LLC served on 9/9/2016, answer due 10/11/2016. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Sean D. Auton, agent for service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by method of service not specified.Original Summons NOT returned. (Spillane, Jay)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 12/2/2016, Entered: 12/6/2016 Receipt for Foreign Service (CV-75)
RECEIPT FOR FOREIGN SERVICE from U. S. Post Office for documents Re: ( Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)[7], Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)[1] ) mailed to Ouh Sas at 2 Rue Kellerman, 59100 Roubaix, France and and Dolphin Media Ltd at Suite 801, 8/F, Singga Commercial Centre, 144-151 Connaught Road West, Hong Kong on 12/2/16. (mrgo)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 70 Filed: 12/2/2016, Entered: 12/2/2016 Answer
ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition, [64] with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Cloudflare, Inc..(Kassabian, Rachel)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 11/28/2016, Entered: 11/29/2016 Scheduling Conference - optional html formCourt Filing
MINUTES OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held before Judge George H. Wu: Discovery cut-off 4/3/2017. Motions due by 6/1/2017. Last date to conduct settlement conference is 3/24/2017. Pretrial Conference set for 6/29/2017 at 08:30 AM. Jury Trial set for 7/11/2017 at 09:00 AM. Please refer to the Court's order for specifics. Court Reporter: Katie Thibodeaux. (cr)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 68 Filed: 11/28/2016, Entered: 11/28/2016 Transcript Order Form (G-120)
TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendant Cloudflare, Inc. for Court Reporter. Court will contact Karen Beck at karenbeck@quinnemanuel.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Kassabian, Rachel)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 11/21/2016, Entered: 11/21/2016 Status report
STATUS REPORT (JOINT) filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.. (Spillane, Jay)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 66 Filed: 11/21/2016, Entered: 11/21/2016 Deficiency - Default /Default Judgment (CV-52b) - optional html form
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY Re: The Clerk cannot enter the requested relief as: Proof of Service is lacking required information. Requesting party shall file a new Request/Application with noted deficiencies corrected in order to have default reconsidered. Proof of service doc. no. [61] is defective as to 3.a. and 3.b. (mrgo)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 11/18/2016, Entered: 11/18/2016, Terminated: 11/21/2016 Motion for Clerk to Enter Default
REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Steadfast Networks LLC filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.. (Spillane, Jay)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 64 Filed: 11/11/2016, Entered: 11/11/2016 Amended Complaint/Petition
SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against DEFENDANTS Cloudflare, Inc., DOES, Dolphin Media Ltd., Hebergement OVH Inc., Hivelocity Ventures Corporation, OVH SAS, Steadfast Networks LLC amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)[1], filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2)(Spillane, Jay)
LREF
Blank 63 Filed: 11/11/2016, Entered: 11/11/2016 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Party(ies) (Pursuant to FRCP 41a(1))
NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc. pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Tiger Media, Inc., Gerardus Van Ginneken. (Spillane, Jay)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 11/8/2016, Entered: 11/8/2016 Generic Text Only EntryCourt Filing
NOTICE TO PARTIES by District Judge George H. Wu. Effective November 14, 2016, Judge Wu will be located at the 1st Street Courthouse, COURTROOM 9D on the 9th floor, located at 350 W. 1st Street, Los Angeles, California 90012. All Court appearances shall be made in Courtroom 9D of the 1st Street Courthouse, and all mandatory chambers copies shall be hand delivered to the judge's mail box outside the Clerk's Office on the 4th floor of the 1st Street Courthouse. The location for filing civil documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing and for viewing case files and other records services remains at the United States Courthouse, 312 North Spring Street, Room G-8, Los Angeles, California 90012. The location for filing criminal documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing remains at Edward R. Roybal Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse, 255 East Temple Street, Room 178, Los Angeles, California 90012. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rrp) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 61 Filed: 10/28/2016, Entered: 10/28/2016 Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc., upon Defendant Steadfast Networks LLC served on 9/19/2016, answer due 10/11/2016. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Sean D. Auton, agent for service in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Spillane, Jay)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 10/24/2016, Entered: 10/25/2016 Amended MinutesCourt Filing
AMENDED MINUTES held before Judge George H. Wu re: [59]. CORRECT RULING ATTACHED. (jag)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 10/24/2016, Entered: 10/25/2016 Order on Motion to dismiss caseCourt Filing
MINUTES OF CLOUDFLARE, INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO RULE 12(B)(6) [49] held before Judge George H. Wu: Court hears oral argument. The Tentative circulated and attached hereto, is adopted as the Court's Final Ruling. Defendant Cloudflare's motion is GRANTED WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. Plaintiff will have until November 11, 2016 to file a Second Amended Complaint. Defendants will have three weeks from November 11 to respond. The scheduling conference remains on calendar for November 28, 2016 at 8:30 a.m. Parties will file a joint Rule 26(f) report by noon on November 21, 2016. Court Reporter: Katie Thibodeaux. (cr)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 10/20/2016, Entered: 10/20/2016 Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding heldCourt Filing
(IN CHAMBERS) COURT ORDER by Judge George H. Wu: On the Court's own motion, a Scheduling Conference is set for November 28, 2016, at 8:30 a.m. Counsel are reminded of their obligations to disclose information, confer on a discovery plan, and report to the Court, as required by F.R.C.P. 26 and the Local Rules of this Court. Trial counsel are ordered to be present. A Joint 26(f) Report shall be filed with the Court not later than November 14, 2016. See Local Rule 26-1. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to give notice of the scheduling conference to all parties that have appeared in this action, and is directed to give notice of the scheduling conference immediately to each party that makes an initial appearance in the action after this date. (cr)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 57 Filed: 10/19/2016, Entered: 10/19/2016 Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) [56]. The following error(s) was found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (cr)
LREF
Blank 56 Filed: 10/18/2016, Entered: 10/18/2016 Answer
ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition[33] with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Hivelocity Ventures Corporation.(Holcomb, John)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 10/10/2016, Entered: 10/10/2016 Reply (Motion related)
REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6)[49] filed by Defendant Cloudflare, Inc.. (Kassabian, Rachel)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 10/4/2016, Entered: 10/4/2016 Stipulation Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Hivelocity Ventures Corporation answer now due 10/18/2016, re Amended Complaint/Petition[33] filed by Defendant Hivelocity Ventures Corporation. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Attorney John Lewis Holcomb, Jr added to party Hivelocity Ventures Corporation(pty:dft))(Holcomb, John)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document 53 Filed: 10/3/2016, Entered: 10/4/2016 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
MINUTES OF MOTION BY PLAINTIFF ALS SCAN, INC. FOR A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AGAINST DEFENDANT TIGER MEDIA, INC. [9]; DEFENDANT TIGER MEDIA INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM [35] Hearing held before Judge George H. Wu. Based on the Tentative, and for reasons stated on the record, Defendant Tiger's motion is GRANTED WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. Plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunctive relief is MOOT. Court Reporter: Katie Thibodeaux. (mrgo)
LREF
Blank 52 Filed: 10/3/2016, Entered: 10/3/2016 Declaration (Motion related)
DECLARATION of Jay M. Spillane in opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6)[49] filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit F)(Spillane, Jay)
LREF
Blank 51 Filed: 10/3/2016, Entered: 10/3/2016 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion
MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6)[49] filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.. (Spillane, Jay)
LREF
Blank 50 Filed: 9/26/2016, Entered: 9/26/2016 memorandum in support of motion
MEMORANDUM in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6)[49] filed by Defendant Cloudflare, Inc.. (Kassabian, Rachel)
LREF
Blank 49 Filed: 9/26/2016, Entered: 9/26/2016, Terminated: 10/24/2016 Motion to DismissCourt Filing
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) filed by Defendant Cloudflare, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 10/24/2016 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order) (Kassabian, Rachel)
LREF
Blank 48 Filed: 9/26/2016, Entered: 9/26/2016 Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Cloudflare, Inc., (Kassabian, Rachel)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 9/23/2016, Entered: 9/23/2016 Objection
OBJECTIONS to Declaration (Motion related), [45] filed by Defendant Tiger Media, Inc.. (Toll, Kevin)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 9/19/2016, Entered: 9/19/2016 Reply (Motion related)
REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim on which Relief can be Granted[35] filed by Defendant Tiger Media, Inc.. (Toll, Kevin)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 9/19/2016, Entered: 9/19/2016 Declaration (Motion related)
DECLARATION of Eric Penn reply in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Against Tiger Media . Motion[9] filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 31, # (2) Exhibit 32, # (3) Exhibit 33)(Spillane, Jay)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 9/19/2016, Entered: 9/19/2016 Reply (Motion related)
REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Against Tiger Media . Motion[9] filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.. (Spillane, Jay)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 9/12/2016, Entered: 9/12/2016 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion
MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim on which Relief can be Granted[35] filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.. (Spillane, Jay)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 9/12/2016, Entered: 9/12/2016 Objection
OBJECTIONS to Declaration (Motion related),, [13], Declaration (Motion related),,, [12], Declaration (Motion related)[11] filed by Defendant Tiger Media, Inc.. (Toll, Kevin)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 9/12/2016, Entered: 9/12/2016 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion
MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Against Tiger Media . Motion[9] filed by Defendant Tiger Media, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Gerardus Van Ginneken)(Toll, Kevin)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 9/6/2016, Entered: 9/7/2016 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR CLOUDFLARE'S RESPONSE TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Judge George H. Wu: CloudFlare shall have until September 26, 2016 to file a response to ALS Scan's First Amended Complaint. (cr)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 39 Filed: 9/5/2016, Entered: 9/5/2016 Stipulation Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Cloudflare, Inc. answer now due 9/26/2016, re Amended Complaint/Petition[33] filed by Defendant Cloudflare, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Kassabian, Rachel)
LREF
Blank 38 Filed: 9/5/2016, Entered: 9/5/2016 Notice of Appearance
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Carolyn M Homer on behalf of Defendant Cloudflare, Inc. (Attorney Carolyn M Homer added to party Cloudflare, Inc.(pty:dft))(Homer, Carolyn)
LREF
Blank 37 Filed: 9/5/2016, Entered: 9/5/2016 Notice of Appearance
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Rachel H Kassabian on behalf of Defendant Cloudflare, Inc. (Attorney Rachel H Kassabian added to party Cloudflare, Inc.(pty:dft))(Kassabian, Rachel)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 9/5/2016, Entered: 9/5/2016 memorandum in support of motion
MEMORANDUM in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim on which Relief can be Granted[35] filed by Defendant Tiger Media, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - JuicyAds Terms of Service)(Toll, Kevin)
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 1,878 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?