Goutier v. Montgomery County
Maryland District Court, Case No. 1:96-cv-02996-FNS
docket://gov.uscourts.mdd.1-96-cv-02996 (What is this?)

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
This docket can only tell you so much. Get the rest.
Access comprehensive profiles on judges, firms, lawyers, and more with PlainSite Pro and Pro Se.
No Logo Emmanuel F. Goutier, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Montgomery County Government, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lynott Lynott and Parsons PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
James L Parsons, Jr. +1 301 424 5100 +1 301 279 0346 jparsons@LLPlawfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Montgomery County Attorney

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Joann Robertson +1 240 777 6700 +1 240 777 6706 joann.robertson@montgomerycountymd.gov
Office Baltimore
Filed 9/23/1996
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $10000000
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331 Federal Question
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Other
County Carroll
Terminated 11/19/1996
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (13) Calendar Events Related (0) Tools Right End
Blank 11 Filed: 11/19/1996, Entered: 11/19/1996 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER dated 11/19/96, granting [7-1] motion of defendant to Dismiss; and that this complaint is DISMISSED, for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted. ( signed by Judge Frederic N. Smalkin ) (c/m & microfilmed 11/19/96) (slf, Deputy Clerk)
Blank 10 Filed: 11/19/1996, Entered: 11/19/1996 Memorandum OpinionCourt Filing
MEMORANDUM OPINION ( signed by Judge Frederic N. Smalkin ) (slf, Deputy Clerk)
Blank -- Filed: 11/19/1996, Entered: 11/19/1996 Terminated Case
Case closed (slf, Deputy Clerk)
Blank 9 Filed: 11/18/1996, Entered: 11/18/1996, Terminated: 11/19/1996 Response
RESPONSE by Emmanuel F. Goutier to [7-1] motion to Dismiss by Montgomery County (c/s) (slf, Deputy Clerk)
Blank 8 Filed: 11/18/1996, Entered: 11/18/1996 Rule
Rule 12/56 letter mailed to plaintiff. (slf, Deputy Clerk)
Blank 7 Filed: 11/18/1996, Entered: 11/18/1996, Terminated: 11/19/1996 Motion to Dismiss
MOTION with memorandum in support by Montgomery County to Dismiss (c/s) (slf, Deputy Clerk)
Blank 6 Filed: 10/21/1996, Entered: 10/21/1996 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER dated 10/21/96 granting [5-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to complaint is extended to 11/18/96. ( signed by Judge Frederic N. Smalkin ) (c/m Chambers) (slf, Deputy Clerk)
Blank 5 Filed: 10/21/1996, Entered: 10/21/1996, Terminated: 10/21/1996 Motion for Extension of Time to File
MOTION by Montgomery County to Extend Time to respond to complaint (c/s) (slf, Deputy Clerk)
Blank 4 Filed: 10/11/1996, Entered: 10/11/1996 Summons Returned Executed
RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to Montgomery County 10/7/96 Answer due on 10/27/96 for Montgomery County (slf, Deputy Clerk)
Blank 3 Filed: 10/3/1996, Entered: 10/4/1996 Local Rule
Local Rule 103.3 of plaintiff. (slf, Deputy Clerk)
Blank 2 Filed: 9/24/1996, Entered: 9/26/1996 Summons Issued
SUMMONS(ES) issued for Montgomery County (slf, Deputy Clerk)
Blank 1 Filed: 9/23/1996, Entered: 9/26/1996 Jury Demand
DEMAND for jury trial by Emmanuel F. Goutier (slf, Deputy Clerk)
Blank 1 Filed: 9/23/1996, Entered: 9/26/1996 Complaint
COMPLAINT filed; FILING FEE $ 120.00 RECEIPT # 135193 (slf, Deputy Clerk)

Statistics

This case has been viewed 57 times.

No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Need Password Help?