SCHARF, et al v. WOLF, et al
New Jersey District Court, Case No. 2:01-cv-05522-DRD
docket://gov.uscourts.njd.2-01-cv-05522 (What is this?)

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Judges don't know as much about themselves as we do.
Access comprehensive profiles on judges, firms, lawyers, and more with PlainSite Pro and Pro Se.
No Logo ADS INVESTMENTS CORP., Appellant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ravin Greenberg, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ALLAN M. HARRIS +1 973 226 1500 aharris@ravingreenberg.com
No Logo ARON D. SCHARF, Appellant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ravin Greenberg, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ALLAN M. HARRIS +1 973 226 1500 aharris@ravingreenberg.com
No Logo OAC JOINT VENTURE, Appellant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ravin Greenberg, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ALLAN M. HARRIS +1 973 226 1500 aharris@ravingreenberg.com
No Logo ALICE FINDLAY, Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by fahychoi.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
JOHN J. FAHY +1 201 438 0200

Toggle Switch Represented by kevinjcarlin.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
KEVIN J. CARLIN +1 609 581 5260 kcarlin@kevinjcarlin.com
No Logo BARRY ELLEN, Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by DIFRANCESCO, KUNZMAN, COLEY, YOSPIN, BERNSTEIN & BATEMAN, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PETER J. RUSSELL +1 908 757 7800
No Logo David Wolf, Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Hellring, Lindeman, Goldstein & Siegal, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Richard Honig +1 973 621 9020 rbhonig@hlgslaw.com
No Logo HAMILTON MCGREGOR INTERNATIONAL, INC., Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Gregory & Reed, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Steven John Reed +1 973 898 1400 sreed@gregoryreedlaw.com
No Logo JAN GOLDBERG, Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by a AGaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
BARRY S. GUAGLARDI +1 201 947 4100
No Logo MODERN MEDICAL MODALITIES CORPORATION, Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Norris, McLaughlin & Marcus, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Gary N. Marks +1 908 722 0700 gnmarks@nmmlaw.com
No Logo NGF INVESTMENT, Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by GALEX WOLF LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ANDREW R. WOLF +1 732 257 0550 +1 732 257 5654 awolf@galexwolf.com
No Logo OAK KNOLL MANAGEMENT CORP., Appellee
No Logo Office of the US Trustee, Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Donald F. MacMaster +1 973 645 3014 +1 973 645 5993 Donald.F.MacMaster@usdoj.gov
No Logo OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS, Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Wasserman, Jurista & Stolz

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Leonard C. Walczyk +1 973 467 2700 +1 973 467 8126 lwalczyk@wjslaw.com
No Logo OTTO VAN EILBERG, Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
FREDERICK C NORTON +1 973 347 6300
No Logo PLAN PROPONENT-PHOENIX/FINDLAY, Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Lampf, Lipkind, Prupis & Pettigrew, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Stephen E. Lampf +1 973 325 2100 lampf@llpplaw.com
No Logo PRIME CONTRACTING CORP., Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by millerandmiller.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ARTHUR H. MILLER +1 732 828 2234 amiller@millerandmiller.com
No Logo ROGER FINDLAY, Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by kevinjcarlin.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
KEVIN J. CARLIN +1 609 581 5260 kcarlin@kevinjcarlin.com
No Logo PRIME CONTRACTING CORP., Debtor
Office Newark
Filed 11/16/2001
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 422 - Bankruptcy Appeal 801
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 0158 Notice of Appeal re Bankruptcy Matter (BA
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Essex
Terminated 9/30/2002
Origin 3
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (13) Calendar Events Related (0) Tools Right End
Need legal research help? Let us know!
Blank 10 Filed: 9/30/2002, Entered: 9/30/2002 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER dismissing [1-1] bankruptcy appeal dismissing [7-1] bankruptcy appeal ( signed by Judge Dickinson R. Debevoise ) (NM) (bl)
Blank -- Filed: 9/30/2002, Entered: 9/30/2002 Terminated Case
Case closed (bl)
Blank 9 Filed: 1/18/2002, Entered: 1/24/2002 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER granting in part, denying in part [3-1] motion to dismiss appeal filed on 11/15/01 and 11/19/01 and the remaining appeal of the confirmation order will be heard on 2/11/02; appellants brief due 1/28/02; appellees' responding briefs due 2/4/02 and appellants reply briefs due 2/7/02. nm ( signed by Judge Dickinson R. Debevoise ) (bl)
Blank 8 Filed: 1/18/2002, Entered: 1/24/2002 OrderCourt Filing
OPINION ( signed by Judge Dickinson R. Debevoise ) (bl)
Blank 6 Filed: 1/14/2002, Entered: 1/15/2002 Minutes - MiscellaneousCourt Filing
Minute entry: Proceedings recorded by Ct-Reporter: M. Giordano; Minutes of: 1/14/02; The following actions were taken, [3-1] motion to dismiss appeal filed on 11/15/01 and 11/19/01 taken under advisement By Judge Dickinson R. Debevoise (bl)
Blank 5 Filed: 1/7/2002, Entered: 1/11/2002 Miscellaneous Document
DECLARATION of Aron Scharf on behalf of ARON D. SCHARF (bl)
Blank 4 Filed: 12/6/2001, Entered: 12/10/2001 Remark
Trustee's designation of additional items to be included in the record of appeal (nr)
Blank 3 Filed: 12/3/2001, Entered: 12/4/2001, Terminated: 1/18/2002 Motion to Dismiss
Notice of MOTION and motion to dismiss appeal filed on 11/15/01 and 11/19/01 by PRIME CONTRACTING, Motion set for 1/14/02 on [4-1] motion and cert. of service . (Brief/PO Subm) (bl) Modified on 12/05/2001
Blank 7 Filed: 11/16/2001, Entered: 1/18/2002 Bankruptcy Appeal
NOTICE of Appeal from Bankruptcy Court of Order Denying Motion To Disqualify Counsel Dated: 11.14.01 by HAMILTON MCGREGOR, RF MANAGEMENT CORP., NORTHERN NEW JERSEY MEDICAL MANAGEMENT CORP.,WAYNE P. MILLER, CARL GIDEON and GREGOTY MACCIA. (dr) Modified on 01/18/2002
Blank 2 Filed: 11/16/2001, Entered: 12/4/2001 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
NOTICE of Allocation and Assignment filed. Magistrate Judge SUSAN D WIGENTON (dr)
Blank 1 Filed: 11/16/2001, Entered: 12/4/2001 Bankruptcy Appeal
NOTICE of Appeal from Bankruptcy Court of Order (1) Denying these defts' motion to disqualify counsel and (2) The Court's order confirming the Phoenix/Findlay Plan of reorganization Dated: NOV 14, 2001 by ARON D. SCHARF, ADS INVESTMENTS CORP, OAC JOINT VENTURE (dr)
Blank -- Filed: 11/16/2001, Entered: 1/18/2002 Designation of Record on Appeal
DEFENDANTS'/APPELLANTS' DESIGNATED Record On Appeal and Statement Of Issues received. (dr)
Blank -- Filed: 11/16/2001, Entered: 12/4/2001 Designation of Record on Appeal
DESIGNATED record on appeal received. Appellant's brief due 12/19/01 for OAC JOINT VENTURE, for ADS INVESTMENTS CORP, for ARON D. SCHARF ; Appellee's brief due 1/3/02 for JAN GOLDBERG, for OAK KNOLL MANAGEMENT, for ALICE FINDLAY, for ALICE FINDLAY, for PRIME CONTRACTING, for ROGER FINDLAY, for MODERN MEDICAL MODAL, for OFFICE OF THE U.S., for NGF INVESTMENT, for HAMILTON MCGREGOR, for PLAN PROPONENT-PHOEN, for OFFICIAL COMMITTEE, for DAVID WOLF ; Appellant's reply brief due 1/13/02 for OAC JOINT VENTURE, for ADS INVESTMENTS CORP, for ARON D. SCHARF ; Hearing on bankruptcy appeal set for 1/28/02 ; (dr) Modified on 12/04/2001

Statistics

This case has been viewed 142 times.

No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Need Password Help?