USA v. BURKE, et al
New Jersey District Court, Case No. 2:02-cr-00315-JCL
docket://gov.uscourts.njd.2-02-cr-00315 (What is this?)

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Judges don't know as much about themselves as we do.
Access comprehensive profiles on judges, firms, lawyers, and more with PlainSite Pro and Pro Se.
Office Newark
Filed 4/24/2002
County Bergen
Terminated 9/9/2003
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 1
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 371.F
Offense Level 4
1837 CONSPIRACY TO DEFRAUD THE UNITED STATES(dof-1993-1997)
Count 2
Citation Section 12 U.S.C. § 17092.F
Offense Level 4
121709-2 & 182 EQUITY SKIMMING(dof-1993-1999)
Count 3-4
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1341.F
Offense Level 4
181341 & 2 FRAUDS AND SWINDLES(dof-11/97-2/98)
Def Custody Status Released
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (56) Calendar Events Related (0) Tools Right End
PACER 50 Filed: 1/7/2005, Entered: 12/9/2005 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER as to TIMOTHY W. BURKE re Bond filed by TIMOTHY W. BURKE,, [7] Order Setting Conditions of Release . Signed by Judge Bissell on 1/6/05. (jn, )
PACER 49 Filed: 1/6/2005, Entered: 11/28/2005 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER FOR RETURN OF DEPOSIT OF BAIL.ORDERED that the sum of Five Thousand Dollars ($5,000.00) be paid to WALTER B. BURKE, 168 Birmingham St., Bridgeport, CT 06606. . Signed by Judge John W. Bissell on 1/6/05. (dj, )
PACER 48 Filed: 4/19/2004, Entered: 4/19/2004 TranscriptCourt Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to RENEE A. WILMOT held on 7/21 & 12/9/03 before Judge Hon. J.C. Lifland. Court Reporter: Lynne Johnson. (jn, )
Blank 46 Filed: 12/9/2003, Entered: 12/12/2003 JudgmentCourt Filing
JUDGMENT RENEE A. WILMOT (3) count(s) 1s of Superseding Information. Probation w/super. 3yrs. , Spec. conditions: 1. deft. confined to her residence for a period of 4mos., etc. 2. deft. refrain from the illegal possession and/or use of drugs, etc. 3. deft. to fully cooperate w/IRS, etc. Spec. Assessment $25.00 payable immediately. RENEE A. WILMOT (3) count(s) 1, 2 , 3 -4 of Indictment are DISMISSED. (signed by Judge John C. Lifland ) party RENEE A. WILMOT (it)
Blank 45 Filed: 12/9/2003, Entered: 12/12/2003 Minutes - MiscellaneousCourt Filing
Minutes of 12/9/03 before Judge John C. Lifland as to RENEE A. WILMOT, Sentencing held. RENEE A. WILMOT (3) count(s) 1s of Information (Court Reporter/ESR: LJ) (it)
Blank 47 Filed: 12/8/2003, Entered: 1/12/2004 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER FOR RETURN OF DEPOSIT OF BAIL as to PAUL M. LIGAS . Signed by Judge John W. Bissell on 12/8/03. (it, )
Blank 44 Filed: 11/25/2003, Entered: 12/4/2003 CJA 20 - Authorization to PayCourt Filing
CJA 20 Authorization to pay KENNETH W. KAYSER for defendant PAUL M. LIGAS , Amount: $ 10,214.59 Voucher # 031118000011 ( Signed by Judge John C. Lifland ) (it)
Blank 43 Filed: 9/10/2003, Entered: 9/11/2003 JudgmentCourt Filing
JUDGMENT TIMOTHY W. BURKE (1) count(s) 1 of Indictment. Impr. 60mos. Supervised Release 3yrs. Spec. Conditions: 1. deft. refrain from the use of alcohol, etc. 2. deft. provide the Prob. Office w/full disclosure of his financial records, etc. 3. deft. refrain from all gambling activities, etc. 4. deft. refrain from employment in the real estate business or mortgage industry. 5. deft. is prohibited from incurring any new credit charges, etc. Fine $10,000.00 due immediately, etc. Spec. Assessment $100 due immediately. Court recommends tha deft. participate in the BOP Inmate Financial Responsibility Program & that he be housed near his family in Connecticut. Deft. to surrender for service of sentence on Jan. 5, 2004. TIMOTHY W. BURKE (1) count(s) 2, 3 -4 Dismissed. (signed by Judge John C. Lifland ) party TIMOTHY W. BURKE (it)
Blank 41 Filed: 9/10/2003, Entered: 9/11/2003 JudgmentCourt Filing
JUDGMENT PAUL M. LIGAS (2) count(s) 1 of Indictment. Impr. 57mos. Supervised Release 2yrs. , Spec. Assessment $100 due immediately. PAUL M. LIGAS (2) count(s) 2, 3 -4 Dismissed. Voluntary surrender on November 3, 2003 at the designated institution. (signed by Judge John C. Lifland ) party PAUL M. LIGAS (it)
Blank 42 Filed: 9/9/2003, Entered: 9/11/2003 Minutes - MiscellaneousCourt Filing
Minutes of 9/9/03 before Judge John C. Lifland as to TIMOTHY W. BURKE, Sentencing held. TIMOTHY W. BURKE (1) count(s) 1 of Indictment (Court Reporter/ESR: LJ) (it)
Blank 40 Filed: 9/9/2003, Entered: 9/11/2003 Minutes - MiscellaneousCourt Filing
Minutes of 9/9/03 before Judge John C. Lifland as to PAUL M. LIGAS, Sentencing held. PAUL M. LIGAS (2) count(s) 1 of Indictment (Court Reporter/ESR: LJ) (it)
Blank 39 Filed: 8/28/2003, Entered: 9/3/2003 Description not availableCourt Filing
ORDER as to TIMOTHY W. BURKE, Modifying Conditions of Bail Release ( Signed by Judge John C. Lifland ) (it)
Blank 38 Filed: 8/15/2003, Entered: 8/19/2003 CJA 21 - Authorization to PayCourt Filing
CJA 21 as to PAUL M. LIGAS Authorization to Pay Nicholas A. Dotoli $ 2,398.78 for Expert Services Voucher # 030730000058 ( Signed by Judge John C. Lifland ) (it)
Blank -- Filed: 7/31/2003, Entered: 7/31/2003 Miscellaneous Document
CJA 21 Voucher # 030730000058 fowarded to the 3rd Circuit for approval. (it)
Blank 37 Filed: 7/21/2003, Entered: 7/25/2003 Plea Agreement
Plea Agreement as to RENEE A. WILMOT (jn)
Blank 36 Filed: 7/21/2003, Entered: 7/25/2003 Plea Application of Guilty
Application for permission to enter Plea of guilty by RENEE A. WILMOT. (jn)
Blank 35 Filed: 7/21/2003, Entered: 7/25/2003 Minutes - MiscellaneousCourt Filing
Minutes of 7/21/03 before Judge John C. Lifland as to RENEE A. WILMOT, Retraction of Plea hearing held. Rule 11 and Plea Agreement forms filed. , Guilty: RENEE A. WILMOT (3) count(s) 1s Terminated motions [23-1] motion 1. to sever deft. Renee A. Wilmot from the trial of his co-defts. as to RENEE A. WILMOT (3) , set Sentencing for 9:30 10/31/03 for RENEE A. WILMOT , Order to continue Bail. (Court Reporter/ESR: Lynn Johnson) (jn)
Blank 34 Filed: 7/21/2003, Entered: 7/25/2003 Information - Misdemeanor
SUPERSEDING INFORMATION as to RENEE A. WILMOT (3) count(s) 1s (jn)
Blank 33 Filed: 4/8/2003, Entered: 4/16/2003 Description not availableCourt Filing
CONSENT ORDER TO RELEASE LIEN OF JUDGMENT AGAINST THE REAL PROPERTY OF LESLEY LIGAS, SURETY, JUDGMENT RG-038613-0000 as to PAUL M. LIGAS ( Signed by Judge John C. Lifland ) (it)
Blank 32 Filed: 4/8/2003, Entered: 4/16/2003 Description not availableCourt Filing
ORDER as to RENEE A. WILMOT, to Continue in Interests of Justice Time Excluded from 4/15/03 to 0/15/03 ( Signed by Judge John C. Lifland ) (it)
Blank 31 Filed: 3/21/2003, Entered: 3/24/2003 Plea Agreement
Plea Agreement as to PAUL M. LIGAS. (jn)
Blank 30 Filed: 3/21/2003, Entered: 3/24/2003 Plea Application of Guilty
Application for permission to enter Plea of guilty by PAUL M. LIGAS. (jn)
Blank 29 Filed: 3/21/2003, Entered: 3/24/2003 Minutes - MiscellaneousCourt Filing
Minutes of 3/21/03 before Judge John C. Lifland as to PAUL M. LIGAS, Retraction of Plea hearing held. Rule 11 and Plea Agreement forms filed. , Guilty: PAUL M. LIGAS (2) count(s) 1 Terminated motions [22-1] motion 1. to sever deft. Ligas & granting a separate trial from his co-deft. T. Burke as to PAUL M. LIGAS (2) , set Sentencing for 12:00 6/26/03 for PAUL M. LIGAS , Order to continue Bail. (Court Reporter/ESR: Lynn Johnson) (jn)
Blank 28 Filed: 3/21/2003, Entered: 3/24/2003 Plea Agreement
Plea Agreement as to TIMOTHY W. BURKE (jn)
Blank 27 Filed: 3/21/2003, Entered: 3/24/2003 Plea Application of Guilty
Application for permission to enter Plea of guilty by TIMOTHY W. BURKE (jn)
Blank 26 Filed: 3/21/2003, Entered: 3/24/2003 Minutes - MiscellaneousCourt Filing
Minutes of 3/21/03 before Judge John C. Lifland as to TIMOTHY W. BURKE, Retraction of Plea hearing held. Rule 11 and Plea Agreement forms filed. , Guilty: TIMOTHY W. BURKE (1) count(s) 1 of indictment. , set Sentencing for 10:00 6/26/03 for TIMOTHY W. BURKE , Order to continue Bail for TIMOTHY W. BURKE. (Court Reporter/ESR: Lynn Johnson) (jn)
Blank 25 Filed: 2/21/2003, Entered: 3/4/2003 CJA 21 - AppointmentCourt Filing
CJA 21 as to PAUL M. LIGAS : Appointment of a vendor through Kenneth W. Kayser, Esq as Expert. ( Signed by Judge John C. ) (it)
Blank 24 Filed: 2/21/2003, Entered: 3/4/2003 Description not availableCourt Filing
ORDER AUTHORIZING PAYMENT FOR DUPLICATING SERVICES UNDER THE CJA/CERTIFICATION OF COUNSEL as to PAUL M. LIGAS ( Signed by Judge John C. Lifland ) (it)
Blank 23 Filed: 2/11/2003, Entered: 2/21/2003 Motion to Sever Defendant
Notice of MOTION/Certificate of Service by RENEE A. WILMOT 1. to sever deft. Renee A. Wilmot from the trial of his co-defts. Motion Hearing set for 9:30 3/10/03 as to: RENEE WILMOT, re: (23-1) (PO subm) (it)
Blank 22 Filed: 2/10/2003, Entered: 2/11/2003 Motion to Sever Defendant
Notice of MOTION/Certification of Service by PAUL M. LIGAS 1. to sever deft. Ligas & granting a separate trial from his co-deft. T. Burke Motion Hearing set for 9:00 3/10/03 as to: PAUL LIGAS, re: (22-1) (Letter Memorandum and PO subm) (it)
Blank 21 Filed: 11/20/2002, Entered: 11/26/2002 Description not availableCourt Filing
ORDER as to PAUL M. LIGAS, Modifying Conditions of Release by allowing the defendant , to Travel to New York, Pennsylvania, Connecticut and perhaps Delaware in connection with employment. ( Signed by Judge John C. Lifland ) (jn)
Blank 20 Filed: 11/6/2002, Entered: 11/14/2002 Description not availableCourt Filing
ORDER as to TIMOTHY W. BURKE, PAUL M. LIGAS, RENEE A. WILMOT, COMPLEX CASE, to Continue in Interests of Justice Time Excluded from 11/13/02 to 4/15/03 , set motion filing deadline for 2/3/03; govt's opposition due 2/24/03; hrg. date for motion on 3/10/03 , set Trial with jury for 3/25/03 for TIMOTHY W. BURKE, for PAUL M. LIGAS, for RENEE A. WILMOT ( Signed by Judge John C. Lifland ) (it)
Blank 19 Filed: 8/29/2002, Entered: 8/29/2002 Description not availableCourt Filing
ORDER as to TIMOTHY W. BURKE, Modifying Conditions of Release by allowing the defendant , to Travel to and from New Hampshire from 8/6/02 through 8/9/02 to attend a family wedding. ( Signed by Judge John C. Lifland ) (jn)
Blank 18 Filed: 8/5/2002, Entered: 8/12/2002 Description not availableCourt Filing
ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT from Judge Wolin to Judge Lifland as to TIMOTHY W. BURKE, PAUL M. LIGAS, RENEE A. WILMOT ( Signed by Chief Judge John W. Bissell ) (it)
Blank -- Filed: 8/5/2002, Entered: 8/12/2002 Case Assigned/Reassigned
CASE reassigned to Judge John C. Lifland (it)
Blank 17 Filed: 7/8/2002, Entered: 7/16/2002 Description not availableCourt Filing
ORDER as to TIMOTHY W. BURKE, PAUL M. LIGAS, RENEE A. WILMOT, to Continue in Interests of Justice Time Excluded from 6/17/02 to 11/13/02 , set motion filing deadline for 9/6/02; govt's response 9/27/02; motion argument on 10/15/02 at 10 a.m. for TIMOTHY W. BURKE, for PAUL M. LIGAS, for RENEE A. WILMOT , set Trial with jury for 11/13/02 for TIMOTHY W. BURKE, for PAUL M. LIGAS, for RENEE A. WILMOT ( Signed by Judge Alfred M. Wolin ) (it)
Blank 16 Filed: 7/2/2002, Entered: 7/16/2002 Description not availableCourt Filing
ORDER granting counsel for deft. payment of services pursuant to the CJA and Plan of Implementation of the U.S.D.C., etc. as to PAUL M. LIGAS ( Signed by Judge Alfred M. Wolin ) (it)
Blank 15 Filed: 7/2/2002, Entered: 7/16/2002 Miscellaneous Document
CERTIFICATION OF COUNSEL of Kenneth W. Kayser on behalf of PAUL M. LIGAS Re: request for investigative services paid by U.S. under CJA 18 USCS 3006A, etc. (it)
Blank 14 Filed: 6/17/2002, Entered: 6/19/2002 Minutes - MiscellaneousCourt Filing
Minutes of 6/17/02 before Judge Alfred M. Wolin as to TIMOTHY W. BURKE, PAUL M. LIGAS, RENEE A. WILMOT, Case Management Status conference held. The parties indicated to the court that this matter should be designated a complex matter. The parties to prepare order. (Court Reporter/ESR: JK) (it)
Blank 13 Filed: 6/4/2002, Entered: 6/5/2002 Warrant Returned Executed
ARREST WARRANT Returned Executed as to PAUL M. LIGAS on 5/22/02 (it)
Blank 12 Filed: 6/4/2002, Entered: 6/5/2002 Warrant Returned Executed
ARREST WARRANT Returned Executed as to RENEE A. WILMOT on 5/22/02 (it)
Blank 11 Filed: 6/4/2002, Entered: 6/5/2002 Warrant Returned Executed
ARREST WARRANT Returned Executed as to TIMOTHY W. BURKE on 5/22/02 (it)
Blank 10 Filed: 5/30/2002, Entered: 6/3/2002 Description not availableCourt Filing
Petition & ORDER as to RENEE A. WILMOT, for an additional Condition of Pretrial Release ( Signed by Judge Alfred M. Wolin ) (it)
Blank 9 Filed: 5/22/2002, Entered: 5/23/2002 Order Setting Conditions of ReleaseCourt Filing
ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to RENEE A. WILMOT ( Signed by Judge Alfred M. Wolin ) (jn)
Blank 8 Filed: 5/22/2002, Entered: 5/23/2002 Order Setting Conditions of ReleaseCourt Filing
ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to PAUL M. LIGAS ( Signed by Judge Alfred M. Wolin ) (jn)
Blank 7 Filed: 5/22/2002, Entered: 5/23/2002 Order Setting Conditions of ReleaseCourt Filing
ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to TIMOTHY W. BURKE ( Signed by Judge Alfred M. Wolin ) (jn)
Blank 6 Filed: 5/22/2002, Entered: 5/23/2002 CJA 20 - Appointment Court Filing
CJA 20 as to PAUL M. LIGAS : Appointment of Attorney KENNETH W. KAYSER Voucher # N/A ( Signed by Judge Alfred M. Wolin ) (jn)
Blank 5 Filed: 5/22/2002, Entered: 5/23/2002 Financial Affidavit - CJA23
CJA 23 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT by PAUL M. LIGAS (jn)
Blank 4 Filed: 5/22/2002, Entered: 5/23/2002 Order for Discovery and InspectionCourt Filing
Order for Discovery and Inspection. ( signed by Judge Alfred M. Wolin ) (jn)
Blank 3 Filed: 5/22/2002, Entered: 5/23/2002 Minutes - MiscellaneousCourt Filing
Minutes of 5/22/02 before Judge Alfred M. Wolin as to TIMOTHY W. BURKE, PAUL M. LIGAS, RENEE A. WILMOT, Arraignment Held. Defendant(s) pleads Not Guilty to indictment. Order for discovery and inspection filed setting the following dates. Motion Filing set for 6/7/02 for TIMOTHY W. BURKE, for PAUL M. LIGAS, for RENEE A. WILMOT ; Trial with jury set for 7/23/02 for TIMOTHY W. BURKE, for PAUL M. LIGAS, for RENEE A. WILMOT ; Responses to Motions due 6/24/02 Motion Return Date 7/8/02 , Bond set to $50,000.00 w/10% for TIMOTHY W. BURKE; Bond set to $50,000.00 W/10% for PAUL M. LIGAS; Bond set to $50,000.00 PR Bond for RENEE A. WILMOT. , Order for appointment of CJA counsel Kenneth W. Kayser for defendant Ligas. Orders of release filed and Appearance Bond for deft. Wilmont fld. (Court Reporter/ESR: Jacqueline Kashmer) (jn)
Blank -- Filed: 5/22/2002, Entered: 5/23/2002 Bond
BAIL/BOND executed by TIMOTHY W. BURKE, PAUL M. LIGAS, RENEE A. WILMOT in Amount $ 50,000.00 Receipt # 308234 & 308231 & 308232 for Burke & Ligas. (jn)
Blank 2 Filed: 5/16/2002, Entered: 5/16/2002 Notice of Allocation and AssignmentCourt Filing
NOTICE OF ALLOCATION AND ASSIGNMENT arraignment to be set up between parties in Courtroom 4B Newark ( before Judge Alfred M. Wolin ) (mh)
Blank 1 Filed: 4/24/2002, Entered: 4/29/2002 Indictment
INDICTMENT as to TIMOTHY W. BURKE (1) count(s) 1, 2, 3-4, PAUL M. LIGAS (2) count(s) 1, 2, 3-4, RENEE A. WILMOT (3) count(s) 1, 2, 3-4 (mh)
Blank -- Filed: 4/24/2002, Entered: 4/29/2002 Warrant Issued
Arrest WARRANT issued as to RENEE A. WILMOT (mh)
Blank -- Filed: 4/24/2002, Entered: 4/29/2002 Warrant Issued
Arrest WARRANT issued as to PAUL M. LIGAS (mh)
Blank -- Filed: 4/24/2002, Entered: 4/29/2002 Warrant Issued
Arrest WARRANT issued as to TIMOTHY W. BURKE (mh)

Statistics

This case has been viewed 213 times.

No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Need Password Help?