Bain v. The City of New York et al
New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:07-cv-08021-VM
docket://gov.uscourts.nysd.1-07-cv-08021-VM (What is this?)

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Judges don't know as much about themselves as we do.
Access comprehensive profiles on judges, firms, lawyers, and more with PlainSite Pro and Pro Se.
No Logo Stephen Bain, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Joseph Thomas Mullen +1 212 766 1177
v.
No Logo Daniel P.O. McDade, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lewis Johs Avallone Aviles, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Edward George Lukoski +1 631 369 7600 +1 631 369 7680 eglukoski@lewisjohs.com
No Logo John Does, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lewis Johs Avallone Aviles, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Edward George Lukoski +1 631 369 7600 +1 631 369 7680 eglukoski@lewisjohs.com
No Logo Long Island Rail Road, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lewis Johs Avallone Aviles, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Edward George Lukoski +1 631 369 7600 +1 631 369 7680 eglukoski@lewisjohs.com
No Logo Long Island Railroad Police Department, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lewis Johs Avallone Aviles, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Edward George Lukoski +1 631 369 7600 +1 631 369 7680 eglukoski@lewisjohs.com
No Logo Metropolitan Transportation Authority, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lewis Johs Avallone Aviles, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Edward George Lukoski +1 631 369 7600 +1 631 369 7680 eglukoski@lewisjohs.com
No Logo Metropolitan Transportation Authority Police Department, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lewis Johs Avallone Aviles, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Edward George Lukoski +1 631 369 7600 +1 631 369 7680 eglukoski@lewisjohs.com
No Logo Robert Aronson, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lewis Johs Avallone Aviles, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Edward George Lukoski +1 631 369 7600 +1 631 369 7680 eglukoski@lewisjohs.com
City of New York, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Caroline Ling-Yu Chen +1 212 788 1106 +1 212 788 0367 cchen@law.nyc.gov
No Logo The New York City Police Department, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Caroline Ling-Yu Chen +1 212 788 1106 +1 212 788 0367 cchen@law.nyc.gov
Office Foley Square
Filed 9/12/2007
Jury Demand Defendant
Demand
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331 Federal Question
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition
County XX Out of State
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag ECF
  Entries (19) Calendar Events Related (0) Tools Right End
PDF 14 Filed: 8/26/2008, Entered: 8/26/2008 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Paul Ehrlich dated 8/21/08 re: Counsel for Plaintiff requests that the Court extend the time to conduct fact discovery approximately 30 days, from 9/5/08. Additionally, to the extent that Your Honor's Sept. 5th, 2008 deadline applied to all discovery, including expert exchanges, counsel respectfully requests an extension of 45 days, from said date, to complete expert exchanges. ENDORSEMENT: Request GRANTED. The time for completion of all discovery in this action is extended to 10/20/08. No further extension will be considered. The next status conference shall be on 10/24/08 at 3:45 pm. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 8/25/08) (tro)
Blank -- Filed: 8/1/2008, Entered: 8/7/2008 Status Conference
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Victor Marrero: Status Conference held on 8/1/2008. Next Conference set for 9/5/2008 at 11:45 AM before Judge Victor Marrero, by which time all discovery, including depositions, should be complete. (tro)
PDF 13 Filed: 6/18/2008, Entered: 6/18/2008 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Thomas M. DeSimone dated 6/18/08 re: counsel requests that the Conference be adjourned to Friday 8/1/08, and that correspondingly all of the dates set forth in the Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order be moved back accordingly. ENDORSEMENT: Requests Granted. The Case Management Plan for this action is amended so as to extend the time for Status Conference to 8/1/2008 at 10:15 AM. Any other related deadline affected by this extension shall be similarly modified. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 6/18/08) (pl)
PDF 12 Filed: 4/4/2008, Entered: 4/4/2008 Request for Production of Documents
REQUEST for Production of Documents.Document filed by Long Island Railroad Police Department, Robert Aronson, Daniel P.O. McDade, John Does, Metropolitan Transportation Authority, Metropolitan Transportation Authority Police Department, Long Island Railroad. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit F)(Lukoski, Edward)
PDF 11 Filed: 4/3/2008, Entered: 4/3/2008 Answer/Response to Interrogatories
RESPONSE to Interrogatories.Document filed by Long Island Railroad Police Department, Robert Aronson, Daniel P.O. McDade, John Does, Metropolitan Transportation Authority, Metropolitan Transportation Authority Police Department, Long Island Railroad.(Lukoski, Edward)
PDF 10 Filed: 3/27/2008, Entered: 3/27/2008 Answer/Response to Interrogatories
RESPONSE to Interrogatories.Document filed by Long Island Railroad Police Department, Robert Aronson, Daniel P.O. McDade, John Does, Metropolitan Transportation Authority, Metropolitan Transportation Authority Police Department, Long Island Railroad.(Lukoski, Edward)
PDF 9 Filed: 3/27/2008, Entered: 3/27/2008 Response to Discovery
RESPONSE to Discovery Request.Document filed by Long Island Railroad Police Department, Robert Aronson, Daniel P.O. McDade, John Does, Metropolitan Transportation Authority, Metropolitan Transportation Authority Police Department, Long Island Railroad.(Lukoski, Edward)
PDF 8 Filed: 2/19/2008, Entered: 2/19/2008 Case Management PlanCourt Filing
CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN: The case is to be tried to a jury. Amended Pleadings due by 4/30/2008. Joinder of Parties due by 4/30/2008. Fact Discovery due by 6/16/2008. Case Management Conference set for 6/20/2008 at 10:15 AM before Judge Victor Marrero. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 2/15/08) (cd)
Blank -- Filed: 2/15/2008, Entered: 2/26/2008 Pretrial Conference - Interim
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Victor Marrero: Pretrial Conference held on 2/15/2008. The City will inform the Court by 2/25 as to whether it agrees to proceed before a Magistrate Judge. Next conference scheduled for June 20 th at 10:15 a.m. (jmi)
PDF 7 Filed: 2/8/2008, Entered: 2/8/2008 Interrogatories
INTERROGATORIES to Plaintiff.Document filed by Long Island Railroad Police Department, Robert Aronson, Daniel P.O. McDade, John Does, Metropolitan Transportation Authority, Metropolitan Transportation Authority Police Department, Long Island Railroad.(Lukoski, Edward)
PDF 6 Filed: 2/7/2008, Entered: 2/7/2008 Request for Production of Documents
REQUEST for Production of Documents.Document filed by Long Island Railroad Police Department, Robert Aronson, Daniel P.O. McDade, John Does, Metropolitan Transportation Authority, Metropolitan Transportation Authority Police Department, Long Island Railroad.(Lukoski, Edward)
PDF 5 Filed: 1/31/2008, Entered: 1/31/2008 Rule 26 Disclosure
RULE 26 DISCLOSURE.Document filed by Long Island Railroad Police Department, Robert Aronson, Daniel P.O. McDade, John Does, Metropolitan Transportation Authority, Metropolitan Transportation Authority Police Department, Long Island Railroad.(Lukoski, Edward)
PDF 4 Filed: 1/17/2008, Entered: 1/17/2008 Order for Initial Pretrial ConferenceCourt Filing
NOTICE OF INITIAL ONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 2/15/2008 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 20B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Victor Marrero. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 1/17/08) (tro)
PDF 3 Filed: 11/7/2007, Entered: 11/7/2007 Answer to Complaint
ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Long Island Railroad Police Department, Robert Aronson, Daniel P.O. McDade, John Does, Metropolitan Transportation Authority, Metropolitan Transportation Authority Police Department, Long Island Railroad.(Lukoski, Edward)
PDF 2 Filed: 10/9/2007, Entered: 10/9/2007 Answer to Complaint
ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by The City of New York, The New York City Police Department.(Chen, Caroline)
Blank 1 Filed: 9/12/2007, Entered: 9/14/2007 Complaint
COMPLAINT against Long Island Railroad Police Department, Robert Aronson, Daniel P.O. McDade, John Does, The City of New York, The New York City Police Department, Metropolitan Transportation Authority, Metropolitan Transportation Authority Police Department, Long Island Railroad. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 626866)Document filed by Stephen Bain.(laq)
Blank -- Filed: 9/12/2007, Entered: 9/14/2007 Case Designated ECF.
Case Designated ECF. (laq)
Blank -- Filed: 9/12/2007, Entered: 9/14/2007 Case Designation
Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman is so designated. (laq)
Blank -- Filed: 9/12/2007, Entered: 9/14/2007 Summons Issued
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Long Island Railroad Police Department, Robert Aronson, Daniel P.O. McDade, John Does, The City of New York, The New York City Police Department, Metropolitan Transportation Authority, Metropolitan Transportation Authority Police Department, Long Island Railroad. (laq)

Statistics

This case has been viewed 61 times.

No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Need Password Help?