Konovalova et al v. Cessna Aircraft Company et al
New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:07-cv-10389-SAS
docket://gov.uscourts.nysd.1-07-cv-10389 (What is this?)

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
This docket can only tell you so much. Get the rest.
Access comprehensive profiles on judges, firms, lawyers, and more with PlainSite Pro and Pro Se.
No Logo Daniil Savkin Nikolaevich, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by cbiz.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Eugene O'Neill, Jr. +1 212 695 5670 +1 212 244 1212 eoneill@cbiz.com
No Logo Marina Konovalova, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by cbiz.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Eugene O'Neill, Jr. +1 212 695 5670 +1 212 244 1212 eoneill@cbiz.com
No Logo Mikhail Konovalova, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by cbiz.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Eugene O'Neill, Jr. +1 212 695 5670 +1 212 244 1212 eoneill@cbiz.com
No Logo Nadezhda Sidirova Vasilievna, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by cbiz.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Eugene O'Neill, Jr. +1 212 695 5670 +1 212 244 1212 eoneill@cbiz.com
No Logo Vera Aglyamovna Baldaeva, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by cbiz.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Eugene O'Neill, Jr. +1 212 695 5670 +1 212 244 1212 eoneill@cbiz.com
v.
No Logo Cessna Aircraft Company,, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Robert Stanley Murphy +1 516 739 3395 +1 516 742 5278 rsm@mcmurphylaw.com
Goodrich Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Mendes & Mount

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Paul E. Moran +1 212 261 8295 +1 212 261 8772 paul.moran@mendes.com
Office Foley Square
Filed 11/16/2007
Jury Demand Both
Demand $75000
Nature of Suit 315 - Airplane Product Liability
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Transfer/Remand - Transfer to Another District
County XX Out of U.S.
Terminated 7/8/2008
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, ECF
  Entries (17) Calendar Events Related (0) Tools Right End
Blank -- Filed: 7/8/2008, Entered: 7/8/2008 MDL Transfer Out
MDL TRANSFER OUT: Mailed certified copy of docket entries and transfer order along with letter of acknowledgment to the United States District Court - District of Kansas. Mailed via Federal Express AIRBILL # 8655 7112 4793 on 7/8/8. (laq)
PDF 12 Filed: 6/9/2008, Entered: 7/8/2008 MDL Conditional Transfer Out Order
CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER OUT ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL...transferring this action from the U.S.D.C. - S.D.N.Y to the United States District Court - District of Kansas. (Signed by MDL Panel on 5/14/08) (laq) (laq).
PDF 11 Filed: 5/9/2008, Entered: 5/9/2008 Answer to Complaint
ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Goodrich Corporation.(Moran, Paul)
PDF 10 Filed: 5/9/2008, Entered: 5/9/2008 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Goodrich Corporation.(Moran, Paul)
Blank -- Filed: 5/5/2008, Entered: 5/5/2008 Note to Attorney Regarding the Filing of Letters -
***NOTE TO ATTORNEY THAT THE ATTEMPTED FILING OF Document No. [9] HAS BEEN REJECTED. Note to Attorney Robert Murphy : THE CLERK'S OFFICE DOES NOT ACCEPT LETTERS FOR FILING, either through ECF or otherwise, except where the judge has ordered that a particular letter be docketed. Letters may be sent directly to a judge. (jar)
PDF 9 Filed: 5/3/2008, Entered: 5/3/2008, Terminated: 5/3/2008 Motion to Reassign Case
FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING FOR NON-ECF DOCUMENT - PROPOSED MOTION to Reassign Case (LETTER). Document filed by Cessna Aircraft Company.(Murphy, Robert) Modified on 5/5/2008 (jar).
PDF 8 Filed: 5/1/2008, Entered: 5/1/2008 Answer to Complaint
ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Cessna Aircraft Company.(Murphy, Robert)
PDF 7 Filed: 5/1/2008, Entered: 5/1/2008 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Textron, Inc. as Corporate Parent. Document filed by Cessna Aircraft Company.(Murphy, Robert)
PDF 6 Filed: 3/25/2008, Entered: 3/25/2008 Affidavit of Service Complaints
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Service was accepted by Elia Dragone. Document filed by Mikhail Konovalova(individually), Mikhail Konovalova(as a personal representative of the Estate of Irina N. Konovalova, deseased), Marina Konovalova. (O'Neill, Eugene)
PDF 5 Filed: 3/25/2008, Entered: 3/25/2008 Affidavit of Service Complaints
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Service was accepted by elia dragone. Document filed by Mikhail Konovalova(individually), Mikhail Konovalova(as a personal representative of the Estate of Irina N. Konovalova, deseased), Marina Konovalova. (O'Neill, Eugene)
PDF 4 Filed: 3/25/2008, Entered: 3/25/2008 Affidavit of Service Complaints
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Goodrich Corporation served on 2/28/2008, answer due 3/19/2008; Cessna Aircraft Company served on 2/29/2008, answer due 3/20/2008. Service was accepted by Nikki Chappel. Document filed by Mikhail Konovalova(individually); Mikhail Konovalova(as a personal representative of the Estate of Irina N. Konovalova, deseased); Marina Konovalova. (O'Neill, Eugene)
PDF 3 Filed: 1/3/2008, Entered: 1/3/2008 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from Jerome L. Skinner dated 1/3/08 re: Counsel for plaintiff's request that the scheduled 1/8/08 initial conference be cancelled or postponed. ENDORSEMENT: Conference adjourned to 3/7/08 at 4:30 p.m. at which time the parties shall update the Court as to the status of this matter. SO ORDERED. (Initial Conference set for 3/7/2008 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 15C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin. Status Report due by 3/7/2008.) (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 1/3/08) (db)
PDF 2 Filed: 12/5/2007, Entered: 12/6/2007 Order for Initial Pretrial ConferenceCourt Filing
ORDER FOR INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 1/8/2008 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 15C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 12/4/07) (tro)
Blank 1 Filed: 11/16/2007, Entered: 11/26/2007 Complaint
COMPLAINT against Goodrich Corporation, Cessna Aircraft Company. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 633157)Document filed by Mikhail Konovalova(individually), Mikhail Konovalova(as a personal representative of the Estate of Irina N. Konovalova, deseased), Marina Konovalova, Daniil Savkin Nikolaevich, Vera Aglyamovna Baldaeva(individually), Vera Aglyamovna Baldaeva(as personal representative of the estate of Nadezhda Lvovna Balsaeva, deseased), Nadezhda Sidirova Vasilievna(individually), Nadezhda Sidirova Vasilievna(as a personal representative of the estate of Vasily Viktovovich Sidirov, deseased).(mbe)
Blank -- Filed: 11/16/2007, Entered: 11/26/2007 Case Designated ECF.
Case Designated ECF. (mbe)
Blank -- Filed: 11/16/2007, Entered: 11/26/2007 Case Designation
Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis is so designated. (mbe)
Blank -- Filed: 11/16/2007, Entered: 11/26/2007 Summons Issued
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Goodrich Corporation, Cessna Aircraft Company. (mbe)

Statistics

This case has been viewed 60 times.

No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Need Password Help?