Ochoa-Vasco v. USA
Puerto Rico District Court, Case No. 3:97-cv-01592-PG
docket://gov.uscourts.prd.3-97-cv-01592-PG (What is this?)

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
The right information can save you thousands of dollars.
Access comprehensive profiles on judges, firms, lawyers, and more with PlainSite Pro and Pro Se.
No Logo Jose Alberto Ochoa-Vasco, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Felix M. Roman-Carrasquillo

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Felix M. Roman-Carrasquillo +1 787 723 3970 +1 787 723 3971 romanlaw@tld.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Vega Pabon, Rodriguez Encarnacion & Lopez Covas

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Juan R. Acevedo-Cruz +1 787 751 2341 +1 787 751 2795 jracevedo@coqui.net
v.
United States of America, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Edwin O. Vazquez-Berrios +1 787 766 5656 +1 787 766 5398 edwin.vazquez@usdoj.gov
Office San Juan
Filed 4/22/1997
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 510 - Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 2255 Motion to Vacate / Correct Illegal Sentenc
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Judgment - Motion Before Trial
County XX US, Outside State
Terminated 8/27/1998
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case Cr.90-130 (PG)[USDC]
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, FRC
  Entries (26) Calendar Events Related (0) Tools Right End
Blank -- Filed: 4/28/2003, Entered: 4/28/2003 Set FRC Flag
CASE REFERRED TO FEDERAL RECORDS CENTER. ACC.021 - 02-0392 Box 19 (sr)
Blank 18 Filed: 8/27/1998, Entered: 8/27/1998 none
Minute entry: Closing this case for statistical purposes. (Clerk) (mr)
Blank -- Filed: 8/27/1998, Entered: 8/27/1998 Terminated Case
Case closed (mr)
Blank 17 Filed: 6/4/1998, Entered: 6/8/1998 Opinion and OrderCourt Filing
OPINION AND ORDER granting [1-1] motion to Vacate Sentence under 28 U.S.C. 2255 imposed in Criminal # 90-130 (PG) under ct. 21 of the indictment. ( signed by Judge Juan M. Perez-Gimenez ) (mr)
Blank -- Filed: 6/4/1998, Entered: 6/8/1998 Order
ENDORSED ORDER mooting [15-1] motion to Extend Time 4/8/98 to file objections to R & R ( signed by Judge Juan M. Perez-Gimenez ) (mr)
Blank 16 Filed: 4/15/1998, Entered: 4/16/1998 Objection to Report and Recommendation
OBJECTION by Jose Alberto Ochoa-Vasco to [12-1] report and recommendations (mr)
Blank -- Filed: 4/8/1998, Entered: 4/13/1998 Order
ENDORSED ORDER mooting [14-1] motion to Extend Time until 4/6/98 to file obj to mag's R&R ( signed by Judge Juan M. Perez-Gimenez ) (su)
Blank 15 Filed: 4/6/1998, Entered: 4/7/1998 Motion for extension of time
MOTION by Jose Alberto Ochoa-Vasco to Extend Time 4/8/98 to file objections to R & R w/attach. (re) Modified on 04/07/1998
Blank 14 Filed: 4/2/1998, Entered: 4/3/1998 Motion for extension of time
MOTION by Jose Alberto Ochoa-Vasco to Extend Time until 4/6/98 to file obj to mag's R&R (np)
Blank -- Filed: 3/12/1998, Entered: 3/13/1998 Order
ENDORSED ORDER granting [13-1] motion to Extend Time for a period of 20 days to file his objections to the R&R, Objections reset to 3/27/98 for [12-1] report and recommendations ( signed by Judge Juan M. Perez-Gimenez ) (mr)
Blank 13 Filed: 3/4/1998, Entered: 3/5/1998 Motion for extension of time
MOTION by Jose Alberto Ochoa-Vasco to Extend Time for a period of 20 days to file his objections to the R&R (mr)
Blank 12 Filed: 2/25/1998, Entered: 2/27/1998 OrderCourt Filing
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION to Judge Juan M. Perez-Gimenez that the petition be denied. Case no longer referred to Magistrate Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon. Objections to R and R due by 3/9/98 (mr)
Blank 11 Filed: 12/24/1997, Entered: 12/30/1997 none
Informative Motion by Jose Alberto Ochoa-Vasco re: atty's new address. (mr)
Blank 10 Filed: 11/10/1997, Entered: 11/13/1997 Motion for extension of time
MOTION by Jose Alberto Ochoa-Vasco to Extend Time for a period of 30 days to file a reply to the Govt's opposition to the 2255 motion (mr)
Blank -- Filed: 10/23/1997, Entered: 10/24/1997 Order
ENDORSED ORDER granting [9-1] motion to Extend Time for a period of 10 days to file a reply to the govt's opposition, set Reply to Response to Motion Filing deadline to 11/10/97 ( signed by Judge Juan M. Perez-Gimenez ) (mr)
Blank 9 Filed: 10/20/1997, Entered: 10/21/1997 Motion for extension of time
MOTION by Jose Alberto Ochoa-Vasco to Extend Time for a period of 10 days to file a reply to the govt's opposition (mr)
Blank 8 Filed: 9/30/1997, Entered: 10/2/1997 Response to Motion
RESPONSE by USA to [1-1] motion to Vacate Sentence under 28 U.S.C. 2255 imposed in Criminal # 90-130 (PG) by Jose Alberto Ochoa-Vasco (mr)
Blank -- Filed: 8/1/1997, Entered: 8/4/1997 Order
ENDORSED ORDER granting [7-1] motion to Extend Time until 9/30/97 to respond to pltf's 2255 motion, Response to Motion reset to 9/30/97 for [1-1] motion to Vacate Sentence under 28 U.S.C. 2255 imposed in Criminal # 90-130 (PG) ( signed by Magistrate Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon ) (mr)
Blank 7 Filed: 7/29/1997, Entered: 7/31/1997 Motion for extension of time
MOTION by USA to Extend Time until 9/30/97 to respond to pltf's 2255 motion (xi)
Blank -- Filed: 6/30/1997, Entered: 7/1/1997 Order
ENDORSED ORDER granting [6-1] motion to Extend Time until 7/31/97 to respond to petitioner's 2255 motion, Response to Motion reset to 7/31/97 for [1-1] motion to Vacate Sentence under 28 U.S.C. 2255 imposed in Criminal # 90-130 (PG) ( signed by Magistrate Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon ) (mr)
Blank 6 Filed: 6/24/1997, Entered: 6/27/1997 Motion for extension of time
MOTION by USA to Extend Time until 7/31/97 to respond to petitioner's 2255 motion (mr)
Blank 5 Filed: 5/21/1997, Entered: 5/22/1997 noneCourt Filing
Minute entry: Granting [4-1] motion to Stay transfer of inmate ( Magistrate Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon ) (mr)
Blank 4 Filed: 5/21/1997, Entered: 5/22/1997 Motion to Stay
URGENT MOTION by Jose Alberto Ochoa-Vasco to Stay transfer of inmate (mr)
Blank 3 Filed: 5/14/1997, Entered: 5/20/1997 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER for the Govt to respond to petitioner's 2255 on or before 6/30/97. The Clerk will locate and produce 90-130(PG) and deliver to the undersigned. set Motion Filing deadline to 6/30/97 ( signed by Magistrate Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon ) (mr)
Blank 2 Filed: 5/8/1997, Entered: 5/12/1997 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon for her consideration and resolution ( signed by Judge Juan M. Perez-Gimenez ) (mr)
Blank 1 Filed: 4/22/1997, Entered: 4/28/1997, Terminated: 6/4/1998 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
MOTION by Jose Alberto Ochoa-Vasco to Vacate Sentence under 28 U.S.C. 2255 imposed in Criminal # 90-130 (PG) w/Attachments (xi) Modified on 04/28/1997

Statistics

This case has been viewed 51 times.

No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Need Password Help?