Diaz-Acosta, et al v. Poncebank, Inc.
Puerto Rico District Court, Case No. 3:97-cv-02110-JAF
docket://gov.uscourts.prd.3-97-cv-02110 (What is this?)

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Judges don't know as much about themselves as we do.
Access comprehensive profiles on judges, firms, lawyers, and more with PlainSite Pro and Pro Se.
No Logo All Plaintiffs, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Walter Martinez-Morillo +1 787 767 5770 +1 787 753 6734
No Logo Aristides Irizarry-Plaza, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Walter Martinez-Morillo +1 787 767 5770 +1 787 753 6734

Toggle Switch Represented by ALDARONDO GIRALD LAW OFFICES

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Godwin Aldarondo-Girald +1 787 766 2876 +1 787 751 9832 aldarondo@prw.net
No Logo Conjugal partnership Champana-Quijano, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Walter Martinez-Morillo +1 787 767 5770 +1 787 753 6734

Toggle Switch Represented by ALDARONDO GIRALD LAW OFFICES

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Godwin Aldarondo-Girald +1 787 766 2876 +1 787 751 9832 aldarondo@prw.net
No Logo Conjugal partnership Irizarry-Diaz, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Walter Martinez-Morillo +1 787 767 5770 +1 787 753 6734

Toggle Switch Represented by ALDARONDO GIRALD LAW OFFICES

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Godwin Aldarondo-Girald +1 787 766 2876 +1 787 751 9832 aldarondo@prw.net
No Logo Conjugal Partnership Rivera-Velez, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Walter Martinez-Morillo +1 787 767 5770 +1 787 753 6734

Toggle Switch Represented by ALDARONDO GIRALD LAW OFFICES

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Godwin Aldarondo-Girald +1 787 766 2876 +1 787 751 9832 aldarondo@prw.net
No Logo Conjugal partnership Seda-Rivera, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Walter Martinez-Morillo +1 787 767 5770 +1 787 753 6734

Toggle Switch Represented by ALDARONDO GIRALD LAW OFFICES

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Godwin Aldarondo-Girald +1 787 766 2876 +1 787 751 9832 aldarondo@prw.net
No Logo Hector J. Seda-Irigoyen, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Walter Martinez-Morillo +1 787 767 5770 +1 787 753 6734

Toggle Switch Represented by ALDARONDO GIRALD LAW OFFICES

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Godwin Aldarondo-Girald +1 787 766 2876 +1 787 751 9832 aldarondo@prw.net
No Logo Juan Ramon Rivera-Vazquez, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Walter Martinez-Morillo +1 787 767 5770 +1 787 753 6734

Toggle Switch Represented by ALDARONDO GIRALD LAW OFFICES

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Godwin Aldarondo-Girald +1 787 766 2876 +1 787 751 9832 aldarondo@prw.net
No Logo Luz Rivera-Martinez, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Walter Martinez-Morillo +1 787 767 5770 +1 787 753 6734

Toggle Switch Represented by ALDARONDO GIRALD LAW OFFICES

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Godwin Aldarondo-Girald +1 787 766 2876 +1 787 751 9832 aldarondo@prw.net
No Logo Maria M. Diaz-Acosta, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Walter Martinez-Morillo +1 787 767 5770 +1 787 753 6734

Toggle Switch Represented by ALDARONDO GIRALD LAW OFFICES

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Godwin Aldarondo-Girald +1 787 766 2876 +1 787 751 9832 aldarondo@prw.net
No Logo Maria Nilda Quijano-De-Champana, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Walter Martinez-Morillo +1 787 767 5770 +1 787 753 6734

Toggle Switch Represented by ALDARONDO GIRALD LAW OFFICES

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Godwin Aldarondo-Girald +1 787 766 2876 +1 787 751 9832 aldarondo@prw.net
No Logo Raymond Champana, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Walter Martinez-Morillo +1 787 767 5770 +1 787 753 6734

Toggle Switch Represented by ALDARONDO GIRALD LAW OFFICES

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Godwin Aldarondo-Girald +1 787 766 2876 +1 787 751 9832 aldarondo@prw.net
No Logo Ruth Velez-Maldonado, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Walter Martinez-Morillo +1 787 767 5770 +1 787 753 6734

Toggle Switch Represented by ALDARONDO GIRALD LAW OFFICES

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Godwin Aldarondo-Girald +1 787 766 2876 +1 787 751 9832 aldarondo@prw.net
v.
No Logo Poncebank, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by McConnell Valdes

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
James D. Noel III +1 787 250 5673 +1 787 759 2760 jdn@mcvpr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by PUBLIC INTREST ENVIRONMENTAL LAW

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Maria T. Juan-Urrutia +1 787 758 3000 +1 787 250 1111 mtjuan@prtc.net
Office San Juan
Filed 7/17/1997
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $6000000
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 2000 Job Discrimination (Age)
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Ponce
Terminated 8/31/1998
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, FRC
  Entries (56) Calendar Events Related (0) Tools Right End
Blank -- Filed: 9/25/2000, Entered: 9/25/2000 Set FRC Flag
CASE REFERRED TO FEDERAL RECORDS CENTER. ACC.021 - 021-00-0457 Box 10 (yr)
Blank -- Filed: 9/20/2000, Entered: 9/20/2000 Set FRC Flag
CASE REFERRED TO FEDERAL RECORD CENTER. (yr)
Blank 37 Filed: 8/31/1998, Entered: 9/2/1998 JudgmentCourt Filing
JUDGMENT dismissing action with prejudice. Each party will bear its own costs, expenses, and atty's fees. ( signed by Judge Jose A. Fuste ) (su)
Blank 36 Filed: 8/31/1998, Entered: 9/1/1998 Stipulation
STIPULATION req that case be dismissed w/prejudice, without imposition of costs or atty's feesby Poncebank, Inc., Sec of Labor of PR . (su)
Blank -- Filed: 8/31/1998, Entered: 9/2/1998 Terminated Case
Case closed (su)
Blank 35 Filed: 8/28/1998, Entered: 9/1/1998 Motion to Continue
MOTION by Poncebank, Inc. to set aside JT in view of settlement (su)
Blank 34 Filed: 8/20/1998, Entered: 8/24/1998 none
Informative Motion by Poncebank, Inc. re: req disposition of unopposed motions for sum/jgm. (su)
Blank 33 Filed: 8/19/1998, Entered: 8/24/1998 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER granting [32-1] pre-trial order, set Jury Trial for 9:30 9/1/98 before Judge Jose A. Fuste . Court strongly recommends that the case be settled, etc as stated herein. ( signed by Judge Jose A. Fuste ) (su)
Blank 32 Filed: 8/14/1998, Entered: 8/18/1998, Terminated: 8/19/1998 Proposed Pretrial Order
Proposed pre-trial order received from Poncebank, Inc., All Plaintiffs (su)
Blank -- Filed: 8/14/1998, Entered: 8/24/1998 none
Pretrial Conference held before Judge Jose A. Fuste (su)
Blank 31 Filed: 8/10/1998, Entered: 8/11/1998 Motion to Amend/Correct
MOTION by Poncebank, Inc. to Amend [30-1] opinion order Response due 8/24/98 . (su)
Blank 30 Filed: 7/31/1998, Entered: 8/3/1998 Opinion and OrderCourt Filing
OPINION AND ORDER granting deft's motion for sum/jgm for the Article 1802 claims. Granting deft's motion to dismiss the Law No. 100 cause of action on behalf of the conjugal partnerships. Denying deft's motion for sum/jgm regarding the Title VII, ADEA, Law No. 100 (on behalf of the employee/plffs), Article 1802 claims. This disposes of dkt # 7,11,15,22 & 23. ( signed by Judge Jose A. Fuste ) (su)
Blank 29 Filed: 7/30/1998, Entered: 7/31/1998 Motion for Summary Judgment
MOTION with Memorandum in Support by Poncebank, Inc. for Summary Judgment of Ruth Velez Maldonado's claims (with attachments) (mr)
Blank 28 Filed: 7/30/1998, Entered: 7/31/1998 Motion for Summary Judgment
MOTION with Memorandum in Support by Poncebank, Inc. for Summary Judgment of Maria M. Diaz' and Maria N. Quijano's claims (with attachments) (mr)
Blank 27 Filed: 7/30/1998, Entered: 7/31/1998 Motion for Summary Judgment
MOTION with Memorandum in Support by Poncebank, Inc. for Summary Judgment of Luz Rivera Martinez' claims (with attachments) (mr) Modified on 07/31/1998
Blank 26 Filed: 7/30/1998, Entered: 7/31/1998 Motion requesting Order
MOTION by Poncebank, Inc. to request margin order in subpoena duces tecum (mr)
Blank 25 Filed: 7/20/1998, Entered: 7/21/1998 Motion for Leave to File Spanish language document
MOTION by Poncebank, Inc. to Accept Spanish Language Documents in support of deft's motion to dismiss claims of spouses (su)
Blank 24 Filed: 7/20/1998, Entered: 7/21/1998 Motion to Dismiss
MOTION by Poncebank, Inc. to Dismiss with prejudice Velez' sex discrimination claim (su)
Blank 23 Filed: 7/7/1998, Entered: 7/9/1998 Reply to Response to Motion
REPLY by All Plaintiffs to response to [11-1] motion for Summary Judgment by Poncebank, Inc. (su)
Blank 22 Filed: 7/7/1998, Entered: 7/9/1998 Reply to Response to Motion
REPLY by Poncebank, Inc. to response to [7-1] motion to Dismiss by Poncebank, Inc. (su)
Blank -- Filed: 7/7/1998, Entered: 7/9/1998 Order
ENDORSED ORDER granting [21-1] motion to Quash Subpoena ( signed by Judge Jose A. Fuste ) (su)
Blank -- Filed: 7/7/1998, Entered: 7/9/1998 Order
ENDORSED ORDER granting [20-1] motion for Leave to File SUR-REPLY to mot to dismiss ( signed by Judge Jose A. Fuste ) (su)
Blank -- Filed: 7/7/1998, Entered: 7/9/1998 Order
ENDORSED ORDER granting [19-1] motion for Leave to File REPLY to plff's opp to deft's mot to dismiss ( signed by Judge Jose A. Fuste ) (su)
Blank -- Filed: 7/7/1998, Entered: 7/9/1998 Order
ENDORSED ORDER mooting [16-1] joint motion to convert PTC into a SC ( signed by Judge Jose A. Fuste ) (su)
Blank -- Filed: 7/7/1998, Entered: 7/9/1998 Order
ENDORSED ORDER [15-1] opposition response Noted. ( signed by Judge Jose A. Fuste ) (su)
Blank -- Filed: 7/7/1998, Entered: 7/9/1998 Order
ENDORSED ORDER [14-1] motion information Noted. ( signed by Judge Jose A. Fuste ) (su)
Blank -- Filed: 7/7/1998, Entered: 7/9/1998 Order
ENDORSED ORDER denying [13-1] motion information. See dkt #14 & #15 ( signed by Judge Jose A. Fuste ) (su)
Blank -- Filed: 7/7/1998, Entered: 7/9/1998 Order
ENDORSED ORDER [12-1] motion to Correct certain issues of deft's reply reg continuacne of PTC Noted. ( signed by Judge Jose A. Fuste ) (su)
Blank 21 Filed: 7/1/1998, Entered: 7/2/1998 Motion to Quash
MOTION by Sec of Labor of PR to Quash Subpoena (su)
Blank 20 Filed: 4/22/1998, Entered: 4/23/1998 Motion for Leave to File Document
MOTION by All Plaintiffs for Leave to File SUR-REPLY to mot to dismiss w/SUR-REPLY tendered (su)
Blank 19 Filed: 3/12/1998, Entered: 3/17/1998 Motion for Leave to File Document
MOTION by Poncebank, Inc. for Leave to File REPLY to plff's opp to deft's mot to dismiss (su)
Blank 18 Filed: 3/12/1998, Entered: 3/17/1998 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER granting [17-1] motion for Reconsideration of [11-0] order and granting [17-2] motion to Clarify Margin Order dkt #11, set Dispositive Motion Filing deadline to 7/31/98 , and set Pretrial Conference for 1:30 8/14/98 before Judge Jose A. Fuste ( signed by Judge Jose A. Fuste ) (su)
Blank 17 Filed: 3/10/1998, Entered: 3/12/1998, Terminated: 3/12/1998 Motion for Reconsideration
URGENT MOTION by Poncebank, Inc. for Reconsideration of [11-0] order granting until 3/11/98 to file its docs in support of sum/jgm , or to Clarify Margin Order dkt #11 (su)
Blank -- Filed: 3/10/1998, Entered: 3/11/1998 Order
ENDORSED ORDER granting [11-2] motion to Extend Time for 30 days to file brief in support, memorandum due 3/11/98 for Poncebank, Inc. ( signed by Judge Jose A. Fuste ) (su)
Blank -- Filed: 3/10/1998, Entered: 3/11/1998 Order
ENDORSED ORDER [10-1] motion response. Noted. See dkt #9 ( signed by Judge Jose A. Fuste ) (su)
Blank -- Filed: 3/10/1998, Entered: 3/11/1998 Order
ENDORSED ORDER granting [9-1] motion to Continue PTC, granting [9-2] motion to Extend discovery for 90 daysTime, reset Discovery deadline to 6/30/98 , set Pretrial Conference for 1:30 7/14/98 before Judge Jose A. Fuste ( signed by Judge Jose A. Fuste ) (su)
Blank -- Filed: 3/10/1998, Entered: 3/11/1998 Order
ENDORSED ORDER mooting [8-1] opposition response ( signed by Judge Jose A. Fuste ) (su)
Blank -- Filed: 3/10/1998, Entered: 3/11/1998 Order
ENDORSED ORDER mooting [6-1] motion to Extend Time for 45 days to to answer interrogatorires ( signed by Judge Jose A. Fuste ) (su)
Blank 16 Filed: 3/9/1998, Entered: 3/10/1998 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
JOINT MOTION by Poncebank, Inc., All Plaintiffs to convert PTC into a SC (su)
Blank 15 Filed: 3/5/1998, Entered: 3/6/1998 none
RESPONSE by All Plaintiffs in opposition to [7-1] motion to Dismiss by Poncebank, Inc. (su)
Blank 14 Filed: 3/5/1998, Entered: 3/6/1998 none
Informative Motion by All Plaintiffs re: late filing of opp to mot to dismiss. (su)
Blank 13 Filed: 2/26/1998, Entered: 3/5/1998 none
Informative Motion by Poncebank, Inc. re: to consider motion to dismiss has not opposed by plffs. (su)
Blank 12 Filed: 2/23/1998, Entered: 2/26/1998 Motion to Amend/Correct
MOTION by All Plaintiffs to Correct certain issues of deft's reply reg continuacne of PTC (su)
Blank 11 Filed: 2/9/1998, Entered: 2/10/1998 Motion for Summary Judgment
MOTION by Poncebank, Inc. for Summary Judgment , and to Extend Time for 30 days to file brief in support (su)
Blank 10 Filed: 2/3/1998, Entered: 2/4/1998 Response to Motion
RESPONSE by Poncebank, Inc. to [9-1] motion to Continue PTC by All Plaintiffs, [9-2] motion to Extend discovery for 90 daysTime by All Plaintiffs (su)
Blank 9 Filed: 1/26/1998, Entered: 1/27/1998 Motion to Continue
MOTION by All Plaintiffs to Continue PTC , and to Extend discovery for 90 daysTime (su)
Blank 8 Filed: 10/23/1997, Entered: 10/30/1997 none
RESPONSE by Poncebank, Inc. in opposition to [6-1] motion to Extend Time for 45 days to to answer interrogatorires by All Plaintiffs (su)
Blank 7 Filed: 10/10/1997, Entered: 10/17/1997 Motion to Dismiss
MOTION with Memorandum in Support by Poncebank, Inc. to Dismiss . Response due 10/23/97 . (su)
Blank 6 Filed: 10/9/1997, Entered: 10/10/1997 Motion for extension of time
MOTION by All Plaintiffs to Extend Time for 45 days to to answer interrogatorires (su)
Blank 5 Filed: 9/10/1997, Entered: 9/15/1997 Answer to Complaint
ANSWER to Complaint by Poncebank, Inc. (Attorney James D. Noel), (su)
Blank 4 Filed: 9/3/1997, Entered: 9/4/1997 Scheduling Order/Case Management OrderCourt Filing
INITIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER setting Joining of parties,amending of pleadings by 10/16/97 ; Discovery cutoff 1/7/98 ; Dispositive Motion Filing deadline on 2/9/98 ; Pretrial Conference for 5:00 3/12/98 ; ( signed by Judge Jose A. Fuste ) (su)
Blank -- Filed: 9/3/1997, Entered: 9/4/1997 Order
ENDORSED ORDER granting [3-1] motion to Extend Time until 9/11/97 to answer complaint, reset Answer deadline to 9/11/97 for Poncebank, Inc. ( signed by Judge Jose A. Fuste ) (su)
Blank 3 Filed: 8/11/1997, Entered: 8/14/1997 Motion for extension of time
MOTION by Poncebank, Inc. to Extend Time until 9/11/97 to answer complaint (su)
Blank 2 Filed: 7/24/1997, Entered: 7/31/1997 Summons Returned Executed
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Poncebank, Inc. thru Ginnette Torres on 7/23/97 Answer due on 8/12/97 for Poncebank, Inc. (su)
Blank 1 Filed: 7/17/1997, Entered: 7/18/1997 Complaint
COMPLAINT Filing Fee $ 150.00 Receipt # 87421 (xi)
Blank -- Filed: 7/17/1997, Entered: 7/18/1997 Summons Issued
SUMMONS issued for Poncebank, Inc. (xi)

Statistics

This case has been viewed 41 times.

No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Need Password Help?