USA v. Lee, et al
Virginia Eastern District Court, Case No. 1:00-cr-00362-GBL
docket://gov.uscourts.vaed.1-00-cr-00362 (What is this?)

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
This docket can only tell you so much. Get the rest.
Access comprehensive profiles on judges, firms, lawyers, and more with PlainSite Pro and Pro Se.
No Logo CHARLES JACOBS, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Chester L. Banks +1 703 878 2265

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Frank Salvato

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Frank Salvato +1 703 548 5000 +1 703 739 0179 frank@salvatolaw.com
Office Alexandria
Filed 10/4/2000
County Alexandria City
Terminated
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 1
Citation Section 21 U.S.C. § 846=ND.F
Offense Level 4
(21846=ND.F) 21846 Conspiracy to distribute 5 kilograms or more of cocaine and 1 kilogram or more of heroin (Ct.1 05.23.00) FORFEITURE
Count 2
Citation Section 21 U.S.C. § 952=NI.F
Offense Level 4
(21952=NI.F) 21952 and 960 Conspiracy to import 5 kilograms or more of cocaine (Sch.II) and 1 kilogram or more of heroin (Sch.I) (Ct.2 05.23.00) FORFEITURE
Count 3
Citation Section 21 U.S.C. § 841A=ND.F
Offense Level 4
(21841A=ND.F) 21841(a)(1) and 182 Distribution of 500 grams or more of cocaine (Sch.II) (Ct.3 05.23.00) FORFEITURE
Count 1s
Citation Section 21 U.S.C. § 846=ND.F
Offense Level 4
[21846=ND.F] 21846 Conspiracy to Possess with Intent to Distribute and to Distribute five kilograms or more of Cocaine (Sch. II) and one kilogram or more of Heroin (Sch. I) (November 2000) FORFEITURE
Count 2s
Citation Section 21 U.S.C. § 963=NI.F
Offense Level 4
[21963=NI.F] 21963 Conspiracy to Import five kilograms or more of Cocaine (Sch. II) and one kilogram or more of Heroin (Sch. I) (November 2000) FORFEITURE
Count 3s
Citation Section 21 U.S.C. § 841A=ND.F
Offense Level 4
[21841A=ND.F] 21841(a)(1) & 182 Distribution of 500 grams or more of Cocaine (Sch. II) (5.23.00) FORFEITURE
Def Custody Status Custody This Court
  Entries (183) Calendar Events Related (0) Tools Right End
Blank 246 Filed: 12/27/2007, Entered: 1/7/2008 USCA Order
ORDER of USCA (copy) as to Charles Jacobs re [241] Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment, Upon consideration of the motion to dismiss this appeal pursuant to rule 42(b) of the FRofAP, and there appearing no opposition, the court grants the motion. (nmck, )
Blank -- Filed: 12/27/2007, Entered: 1/7/2008 USCA Case Number
USCA Case Number 07-5093 4th Cir. for [241] Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment filed by USA. (nmck, )
Blank 241 Filed: 11/15/2007, Entered: 11/16/2007 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment
NOTICE OF APPEAL by USA as to Charles Jacobs re [235] Judgment dated 10/23/07. Counts 1s, 2s, 3s. Copy sent to USCA and to parties. (nmck, )
Blank 236 Filed: 11/8/2007, Entered: 11/9/2007 TranscriptCourt Filing
TRANSCRIPT of (Sentencing) Proceedings as to Charles Jacobs held on 10/19/2007 before Judge Gerald Bruce Lee. Court Reporter: Renecia A. Smith-Wilson. (rban, )
Blank 235 Filed: 10/23/2007, Entered: 10/31/2007 OrderCourt Filing
(JUDGMENT) ORDER on Re-sentence as to Charles Jacobs that deft is committed to the custody of the BOP to serve 240 months on Counts 1,2,3 (councurrent) w/5 years SR each count consecutive (15 Years). All other terms/conditions of the original sentence remain.. Signed by Judge Gerald Bruce Lee on 10/23/07. (jsol, )
Blank -- Filed: 10/19/2007, Entered: 10/22/2007 Sentencing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Gerald Bruce Lee :Re-Sentencing held on 10/19/2007 for Charles Jacobs (3), Count(s) 1s, 2s, 3s - 240 months as to Counts 1s,2s,3s - concurrent w/5 years SR as to Counts 1s,2s,3s - consecutive and SA of $100 each count. All special terms/conditions remain. Remanded. (Court Reporter Wilson.) (jsol, )
Blank 234 Filed: 10/9/2007, Entered: 10/10/2007 OrderCourt Filing
ORDERED that this matter is continued from 10/5/07 until 10/19/07 at 9AM for re-sentencing as to Charles Jacobs. Signed by Judge Gerald Bruce Lee on 10/9/2007. (rban, )
Blank 233 Filed: 9/27/2007, Entered: 9/28/2007 Motion to Continue
MOTION to Continue by Charles Jacobs. (jlan)
Blank -- Filed: 9/24/2007, Entered: 9/24/2007 Set/Reset Hearings
Set/Reset Hearings as to Charles Jacobs: Sentencing set for 10/19/2007 at 09:00 AM before District Judge Gerald Bruce Lee. (jsol, )
Blank -- Filed: 8/14/2007, Entered: 8/14/2007 Set/Reset Hearings
Reset Hearing as to Charles Jacobs: Sentencing set for 10/5/2007 at 09:00 AM before District Judge Gerald Bruce Lee. (rban, )
Blank 224 Filed: 8/13/2007, Entered: 8/14/2007 OrderCourt Filing
ORDERED that the US Motion to Continue [218] is GRANTED. The Sentencing hearing is CONTINUED to 10/5/07 at 9AM as to Charles Jacobs. Signed by Judge Gerald Bruce Lee on 8/13/2007. (rban, )
Blank 219 Filed: 7/19/2007, Entered: 7/19/2007 Response to Motion
RESPONSE to Motion [218] to Continue by Charles Jacobs. (agil)
Blank -- Filed: 7/18/2007, Entered: 7/19/2007 Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
Terminate Re-Sentencing Deadline as to Charles Jacobs (stas)
Blank -- Filed: 7/18/2007, Entered: 7/19/2007 Remark
Per GBL Chambers re-sentencing set for 7/20/2007 for Charles Jacobs has been continued to a date to be determined. (stas)
Blank 218 Filed: 7/17/2007, Entered: 7/18/2007, Terminated: 8/13/2007 Motion to Continue
MOTION to Continue Re-Sentencing of Defendant by USA as to Charles Jacobs. (rban, )
Blank -- Filed: 7/2/2007, Entered: 7/2/2007 Set/Reset Hearings
Set/Reset Hearings as to Charles Jacobs: Re- Sentencing set for 7/20/2007 at 09:00 AM before District Judge Gerald Bruce Lee. (jsol, )
Blank 210 Filed: 6/14/2007, Entered: 6/15/2007 OrderCourt Filing
ORDERED that sentencing is continued until 7/13/07 at 9am as to Charles Jacobs. Signed by Judge Gerald Bruce Lee on 6/14/07. (rban, )
Blank -- Filed: 6/14/2007, Entered: 6/14/2007 Set/Reset Hearings
Reset Hearings as to Charles Jacobs: Sentencing set for 7/13/2007 at 09:00 AM before District Judge Gerald Bruce Lee. (clar, )
Blank 209 Filed: 6/8/2007, Entered: 6/11/2007 Position on Sentencing
Position with Respect to Re-Sentencing by USA as to Charles Jacobs. (rban, )
Blank 208 Filed: 5/14/2007, Entered: 5/14/2007 Sentencing Memorandum
Brief on Behalf of Charles A. Jacobs for Resentencing. (rban, )
Blank -- Filed: 4/16/2007, Entered: 4/16/2007 Set/Reset Hearings
Set/Reset Hearings as to Charles Jacobs: Sentencing set for 6/15/2007 09:00 AM before District Judge Gerald Bruce Lee. (jsol, )
Blank -- Filed: 4/10/2007, Entered: 4/10/2007 Set/Reset Hearings
Set/Reset Hearings as to Charles Jacobs: Sentencing set for 5/18/2007 09:00 AM before District Judge Gerald Bruce Lee. (jsol, )
Blank -- Filed: 3/13/2007, Entered: 3/13/2007 Set/Reset Hearings
Set/Reset Hearings as to Charles Jacobs: Re-Sentencing set for 4/20/2007 09:00 AM before District Judge Gerald Bruce Lee. (jsol, )
Blank 207 Filed: 2/22/2007, Entered: 2/22/2007 CJA 20 - Appointment
CJA 20 as to Charles Jacobs: Appointment of Attorney Chester L. Banks for Charles Jacobs for resentencing. (agil)
Blank 206 Filed: 2/21/2007, Entered: 2/21/2007, Terminated: 2/21/2007 USCA Judgment
JUDGMENT of USCA (certified copy) as to Charles Jacobs, In accordance with the written opinion of this court filed this day, the court Affirms in part, Vacates and Remands in part the judgment of the District Court. This case is Remanded to the District Court for further proceedings consitent with the Court's opinion. (the court vacates his sentence and is Remanded for resentencing consistent wth Booker and Hughes) A certified copy of this judgment will be provided to the district court upon issuance of the mandate. The judgment will take effect upon issuance of the mandte. (Mandate issued) (nmck, )
Blank -- Filed: 2/21/2007, Entered: 2/21/2007 Appeal Record Returned
Appeal Record Returned as to Charles Jacobs: in 14 Volumes. (nmck, )
Blank -- Filed: 2/13/2007, Entered: 2/14/2007 Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel
SO ORDERED Granting [205] Motion to Appoint Counsel for Resentencing as to Charles Jacobs (3). Signed by Judge Gerald Bruce Lee on 2/13/07. (agil)
Blank 205 Filed: 2/7/2007, Entered: 2/8/2007 Motion to Appoint Counsel
Unopposed MOTION for Appointment of Counsel by Charles Jacobs. (agil)
Blank 204 Filed: 1/30/2007, Entered: 1/31/2007 USCA Mandate
Opinion of USCA (Copy) decided 1/29/07 as to Charles Jacobs, Affirmed in part, Vacated and Remanded in part. (nmck, )
Blank -- Filed: 7/24/2006, Entered: 7/24/2006 Remark
Gvts Exhibits 4-3, 9-2B, 12-2 & dfts 7,8 returned by US Atty. (agil )
Blank 203 Filed: 7/19/2006, Entered: 7/21/2006 Exhibits(s)
Gvts Exhibits 4-3, 9-2B, 12-2 & dfts 7,8 released to US Atty per Order of 7/19/06. (agil)
Blank 202 Filed: 7/19/2006, Entered: 7/20/2006 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER that the Clerk of Court shall temporarily release the afore exhibits to the USAtty for the Eastern District of VA; that US Atty shall expeditiously return the exhibits to the Clerk of Court as to Charles Jacobs. Signed by Judge Gerald Bruce Lee on 7/19/06. c/s (agil)
Blank -- Filed: 2/4/2006, Entered: 2/4/2006 Set/Reset Deadlines
Reset Deadlines as to Nestah Jefferson Lee, Victor Thompson, Charles Jacobs, Marlon Constantine, Dewayne Andre Nunes, Roy, Gregory Ravalier: Exhibit return 6/30/2006. (agil)
Blank -- Filed: 6/24/2005, Entered: 6/24/2005, Terminated: 2/21/2007 Initial Paper Record Transmitted to 4CCA
Certified and Transmitted Record on Appeal as to Charles Jacobs to US Court of Appeals re [172] Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment, [173] Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment in 14 volumes (Volumes 1,2,3 are pleadings and Volumes 4 through 14 are transcripts) (nmck, )
Blank 200 Filed: 6/17/2005, Entered: 6/21/2005 Order for Forfeiture of PropertyCourt Filing
AMENDED ORDER of FORFEITURE as to Charles Jacobs re: the Virgin Island property. See order for details. Signed by Judge Gerald Bruce Lee on 6/17/2005. c/s: 6/21/05 (agil)
Blank -- Filed: 6/6/2005, Entered: 6/6/2005 Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
Terminate Deadlines and Hearings as to Nestah Jefferson Lee, Victor Thompson, Charles Jacobs, Marlon Constantine, Dewayne Andre Nunes, Roy, Gregory Ravalier: (agil)
Blank -- Filed: 6/6/2005, Entered: 6/6/2005 Set/Reset Deadlines
Set/Reset Deadlines as to Nestah Jefferson Lee, Victor Thompson, Charles Jacobs, Marlon Constantine, Dewayne Andre Nunes, Roy, Gregory Ravalier: Exhibit Return deadline 12/1/2005. (agil)
Blank 199 Filed: 5/16/2005, Entered: 5/17/2005 Docket Annotation
PROOF OF PUBLICATION by USA as to Charles Jacobs (agil)
Blank 198 Filed: 5/4/2005, Entered: 5/11/2005 Memorandum
Memorandum in Support of [189] Petition for Hearing to Adjudicate Validity of Interest in Property filed by Iris Jacobs. (agil)
Blank 197 Filed: 4/28/2005, Entered: 4/29/2005 Transcript
TRANSCRIPT filed in case as to Charles Jacobs for the date of 6/24/04 (8 of 8) (agil)
Blank 196 Filed: 4/28/2005, Entered: 4/29/2005 Transcript
TRANSCRIPT filed in case as to Charles Jacobs for the date of 6/23/04 (7 of 8) (agil) Modified on 04/29/2005
Blank 195 Filed: 4/28/2005, Entered: 4/29/2005 Transcript
TRANSCRIPT filed in case as to Charles Jacobs for the date of 6/22/04 (6 of 8) (agil) Modified on 04/29/2005
Blank 194 Filed: 4/28/2005, Entered: 4/29/2005 Transcript
TRANSCRIPT filed in case as to Charles Jacobs for the date of 6/21/04 (5 of 8) (agil)
Blank 193 Filed: 4/28/2005, Entered: 4/29/2005 Transcript
TRANSCRIPT filed in case as to Charles Jacobs for the date of 6/17/04 (4 of 8) (agil) Modified on 04/29/2005
Blank 192 Filed: 4/28/2005, Entered: 4/29/2005 Transcript
TRANSCRIPT filed in case as to Charles Jacobs for the date of 6/16/04 (agil)
Blank 191 Filed: 4/28/2005, Entered: 4/29/2005 Transcript
TRANSCRIPT filed in case as to Charles Jacobs for the date of 6/15/04 (2 of 8) (agil)
Blank 190 Filed: 4/28/2005, Entered: 4/29/2005 Transcript
TRANSCRIPT filed in case as to Charles Jacobs for the date of 6/14/04 (1 of 8) (agil)
Blank 189 Filed: 4/28/2005, Entered: 4/28/2005 Miscellaneous Document
Petition by Iris Jacobs for hearing to adjudicate validity of interest in property (jcup)
Blank 188 Filed: 4/15/2005, Entered: 4/18/2005 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER granting [187-1] motion by Iris Jacobs for extension of time for filing petition pursuant 21 USC 853(n) as to Charles Jacobs (3) ( Signed by Judge Gerald B. Lee ) Copies Mailed: Yes (kjon)
Blank 187 Filed: 4/13/2005, Entered: 4/14/2005, Terminated: 4/15/2005 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
MOTION as to Charles Jacobs by Iris Jacobs for extension of time for filing petition pursuant to 21 USC 853(n) (kjon)
Blank 186 Filed: 4/1/2005, Entered: 4/1/2005, Terminated: 2/21/2007 USCA Order
USCA Order as to Charles Jacobs the Mr. Connell is retained counsel (agil)
Blank 185 Filed: 3/24/2005, Entered: 3/24/2005, Terminated: 2/21/2007 USCA Order
USCA Order as to Charles Jacobs, the court appoints James G. Connell, III of Fairfax, VA as counsel for the appellant pursuant to the provisions of the CJA. (mcke)
Blank 184 Filed: 3/17/2005, Entered: 3/17/2005 Miscellaneous Document
Proof of Publication as to defendant Charles Jacobs filed by US (jcup)
Blank -- Filed: 3/17/2005, Entered: 3/17/2005 Suspense Deadline
Return of Exhibits set 6/1/05 (jcup)
Blank 183 Filed: 2/25/2005, Entered: 2/25/2005 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER as to Charles Jacobs granting [168-2] motion by USA for writ of entry (See Order for detail) ( Signed by Judge Gerald B. Lee ) Copies Mailed: y (jsol)
Blank 182 Filed: 2/25/2005, Entered: 2/25/2005 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER Directing Forfeiture of Substitute Assets as to Charles Jacobs (See Order for detail) ( Signed by Judge Gerald B. Lee ) Copies Mailed: y (jsol)
Blank -- Filed: 2/25/2005, Entered: 2/25/2005 Motion Hearing
Motion hearing held as to Charles Jacobs re: [168-1] motion for forfeiture of substitute assets, [168-2] motion by USA for writ of entry before Judge Gerald B. Lee ( Wilson.) USA appeared through: Karen Taylor. Dft(s) appeared through: No appearance. Orders ent and filed in open court as submitted. (jsol)
Blank 181 Filed: 2/24/2005, Entered: 2/25/2005 USCA Order
USCA Order as to Charles Jacobs the court reporter, Renecia Wilson, has filed a motion for an extension of time to file the transcript without the imposition of sanctions. The court extends the time for filing the transcript, without sanctions, to 3/24/05. A 10 percent fee reduction will apply if the transcript is not filed by that date, and a 20 percent fee reduction will apply if the transcript is not filed by 4/25/05. (mcke)
Blank 180 Filed: 2/1/2005, Entered: 2/3/2005 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER granting [171-1] motion by Charles Jacobs for Appointment of New Counsel for Appeal as to Charles Jacobs (3) ( Signed by Judge Gerald B. Lee ) Copies Mailed: yes (jcup)
Blank -- Filed: 1/10/2005, Entered: 1/10/2005 Suspense Deadline
Return of Exhibits set 4/1/05 (kjon)
Blank 179 Filed: 1/5/2005, Entered: 1/5/2005 Notice of HearingCourt Filing
NOTICE of Hearing as to Charles Jacobs :, Motion Hearing Deadline before Judge Gerald B. Lee set for 9:00 2/25/05 for Charles Jacobs for [168-1] motion for forfeiture of substitute assets, set for 9:00 2/25/05 for Charles Jacobs for [168-2] motion by USA for writ of entry (jcup)
Blank 178 Filed: 12/22/2004, Entered: 12/23/2004 Affidavit
Submission of AFFIDAVIT by USA to Support Motion for Forfeiture of Substitute Assets and for Writ of Entry as to Charles Jacobs (agil)
Blank -- Filed: 12/20/2004, Entered: 12/20/2004, Terminated: 2/21/2007 USCA Case Number
USCA Case Number as to Charles Jacobs Re: [172-1] appeal USCA Number: 04-5075 Case Manager: Merlene Smith-Taylor (jcup)
Blank -- Filed: 12/16/2004, Entered: 12/17/2004 Miscellaneous Document
Matter to be heard re: forfeiture of property - cancelled due to death in family of deft counsel. To be reset. (jsol)
Blank -- Filed: 12/13/2004, Entered: 12/13/2004 Miscellaneous Document
Certified Copy of Judgment and updated docket sheet forwarded to the Court of Appeals as to Charles Jacobs. (jcup)
Blank 177 Filed: 12/8/2004, Entered: 12/9/2004 Letter
Letter MOTION by Charles Jacobs for a free copy of court transcript and excerpts of his court case (jcup)
Blank 174 Filed: 11/30/2004, Entered: 12/2/2004 JudgmentCourt Filing
JUDGMENT Charles Jacobs (3) count(s) 1s, 2s , 3s . Life as to each of Counts 1,2,3 - concurrent w/5 years SR and $100 SA each couont (total $300). Remanded. ( Signed by Judge Gerald B. Lee ) Copies Mailed: y (jsol)
Blank 173 Filed: 11/29/2004, Entered: 12/1/2004 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment
NOTICE OF APPEAL by Charles Jacobs; transmitted to the Court of Appeals (3) count(s) 1s, 2s, 3s Fee paid $255.00 Receipt # 100 176741 (jcup)
Blank 172 Filed: 11/29/2004, Entered: 12/1/2004 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment
NOTICE OF APPEAL of Judgment Order; transmitted to the Court of Appeals by Charles Jacobs (3) count(s) 1s, 2s, 3s (jcup) Modified on 12/01/2004
Blank 171 Filed: 11/29/2004, Entered: 11/30/2004, Terminated: 2/1/2005 Motion to Appoint Counsel
MOTION by Charles Jacobs for Appointment of New Counsel for Appeal (jcup)
Blank 169 Filed: 11/19/2004, Entered: 11/23/2004 Notice of HearingCourt Filing
NOTICE of Hearing as to Charles Jacobs :, Motion Hearing Deadline before Judge Gerald B. Lee set for 10:00 12/16/04 for Charles Jacobs for [168-1] motion for forfeiture of substitute assets, set for 10:00 12/16/04 for Charles Jacobs for [168-2] motion by USA for writ of entry (jcup)
Blank 168 Filed: 11/19/2004, Entered: 11/23/2004 Motion for Forfeiture of Property
MOTION by USA as to Charles Jacobs for forfeiture of substitute assets , and by USA for writ of entry (jcup)
Blank -- Filed: 11/19/2004, Entered: 11/22/2004 Set/Reset Deadlines
Hearing Deadline as to Charles Jacobs set 12/16/04 before Judge Gerald B. Lee (jsol)
Blank -- Filed: 11/19/2004, Entered: 11/22/2004 Set/Reset Hearings
Sentencing before Judge Gerald B. Lee held ( Wilson.) USA appeared through: Mike Rich. Dft(s) appeared through: Frank Salvato/Steven Brusch. Charles Jacobs (3) count(s) 1s, 2s, 3s motion to con't sentencing re: Blakeley - argued and denied. Deft objection to PSIR re: 1) role in offense; 2) quantity 3) obstruction of justice - argued and overruled. The Court noted right of deft to file writtene NOA w/i 10 days of today. Deft is committed to the custody of the BOP to serve a term of life as to each of Counts 1,2,3 - concurrent, w/5 years SR as to each count, concurrent w/sc: 1) DATT 2) no contact w/do-conspirators 3) provide financial access 4) file all tax returns. SA of $300 (totao) w/no fine/costs assessed. Deft remanded. Forfeiture order to enter. The Court gives an alternative sentence re: Blakeley - 220 months as to each of Counts 1,2,3 - concurrent. US motion to substitute assets is to be filed and noticed for 12/16/04 @ 10 AM. Deft has 10 days after filing to respond. (jsol)
Blank 167 Filed: 11/18/2004, Entered: 11/19/2004 Response/Reply - Miscellaneous
RESPONSE by USA to [164-1] objections to the presentence report by Charles Jacobs (jcup)
Blank 164 Filed: 11/17/2004, Entered: 11/17/2004 Objection to Presentence Investigation Report
OBJECTIONS by Charles Jacobs to Presentence Investigation Report (jcup)
Blank 163 Filed: 11/17/2004, Entered: 11/17/2004 Position on Sentencing
POSITION with Respect to Presentence Report by USA as to Charles Jacobs (jcup)
Blank 162 Filed: 11/16/2004, Entered: 11/16/2004 Response in Opposition
RESPONSE by USA as to Charles Jacobs in opposition to [161-1] motion by Charles Jacobs to Continue Sentencing Hearing (jcup)
Blank 161 Filed: 11/15/2004, Entered: 11/16/2004 Motion to Continue
MOTION by Charles Jacobs to Continue Sentencing Hearing (jcup)
Blank -- Filed: 10/4/2004, Entered: 10/4/2004 Suspense Deadline
Return of Exhibits set 1/20/05 (kjon)
Blank -- Filed: 10/4/2004, Entered: 10/4/2004 Suspense Deadline
Return of Exhibits set 1/20/04 (kjon)
Blank -- Filed: 9/14/2004, Entered: 9/14/2004 Set/Reset Hearings
Sentencing before Judge Gerald B. Lee set for 9:00 11/19/04 for Charles Jacobs , Charles Jacobs (3) count(s) 1s, 2s, 3s (jsol)
Blank -- Filed: 9/8/2004, Entered: 9/8/2004 Set/Reset Hearings
Sentencing before Judge Gerald B. Lee set for 9:00 10/22/04 for Charles Jacobs , Charles Jacobs (3) count(s) 1s, 2s, 3s (jsol)
Blank 151 Filed: 7/21/2004, Entered: 7/22/2004 Transcript
TRANSCRIPT filed in case as to Charles Jacobs for dates of 06/21/04 (clerk)
Blank 150 Filed: 7/21/2004, Entered: 7/22/2004 Transcript
TRANSCRIPT filed in case as to Charles Jacobs for dates of 06/17/04 (clerk)
Blank 149 Filed: 7/19/2004, Entered: 7/21/2004 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER for a preliminary order of forfeiture **see order for details** ( Signed by Judge Gerald B. Lee ) Copies Mailed: y (clerk)
Blank 148 Filed: 7/15/2004, Entered: 7/15/2004, Terminated: 7/19/2004 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
MOTION by USA as to Charles Jacobs by USA for a preliminary order of forfeiture with supporting suggestions (clerk)
Blank 147 Filed: 6/24/2004, Entered: 6/24/2004 Jury Verdict on Forfeiture
SPECIAL VERDICT FORM on Forfeiture as to Charles Jacobs (see Special Verdict Form for details) (dper)
Blank -- Filed: 6/24/2004, Entered: 6/24/2004 Miscellaneous Document
Admitted exhibits (1 large white 3-ring binder) to Records Clerk. (dper)
Blank -- Filed: 6/24/2004, Entered: 6/24/2004 Set/Reset Hearings
Sentencing before Judge Gerald B. Lee set for 9:00 9/17/04 for Charles Jacobs (3) counts 1s, 2s, 3s (dper)
Blank -- Filed: 6/24/2004, Entered: 6/24/2004 Jury Trial
Jury trial continued as to Charles Jacobs before Judge Gerald B. Lee (r: R. Wilson) Appearances of counsel and parties as previous. Jury appeared as previous and cont'd to deliberate as to forfeiture issue and retuned to the courtroom with a verdict (see Special Verdict Form). Jury polled. Special Verdict Form filed in open court. Jury excused. Sentencing set for 9/17/04 @ 9:00 a.m. Deft remanded. (dper)
Blank 146 Filed: 6/23/2004, Entered: 6/23/2004 Jury Verdict
JURY VERDICT as to Charles Jacobs. Guilty: counts 1s, 2s, 3s. (dper)
Blank -- Filed: 6/23/2004, Entered: 6/23/2004 Jury Trial
Jury trial proceedings as to Charles Jacobs before Judge Gerald B. Lee set at 11:30 6/24/04 (dper)
Blank -- Filed: 6/23/2004, Entered: 6/23/2004 Jury Trial
Jury trial continued as to Charles Jacobs before Judge Gerald B. Lee (r: R. Wilson) Counsel and parties appeared as previous. Jury appeared as previous and cont'd to deliberate. Jury returned w/verdict of Guilty as to Counts 1, 2, & 3. Jury polled. Jury verdict filed in open court. Deft re-news R. 29 motion - denied. Jury excused to return later to hear evidence as to forfeiture issue. The Court modified instruction as to forfeiture - no objection by counsel. Jury appeared as previous. Jury instruction re: forfeiture. Govt adduced evidence and rests. Deft adduced no evidence. Arguments heard. Jury retired to deliberate w/Special Verdict Form. Jury excused to return on 6/24/04 @ 11:30 a.m. (Courtroom 700) Court adjourned. Deft remanded. (dper)
Blank 145 Filed: 6/22/2004, Entered: 6/22/2004 Transcript
TRANSCRIPT filed in case as to Charles Jacobs for dates of 06/15/04 (clerk)
Blank 144 Filed: 6/22/2004, Entered: 6/22/2004 Proposed Jury Instructions
Proposed Jury Instructions re: Forfeiture - by USA as to Charles Jacobs (jsol)
Blank -- Filed: 6/22/2004, Entered: 6/22/2004 Jury Trial
Jury trial proceedings as to Charles Jacobs before Judge Gerald B. Lee set at 9:00 6/23/04 (dper)
Blank -- Filed: 6/22/2004, Entered: 6/22/2004 Jury Trial
Jury trial proceedings continued as to Charles Jacobs before Judge Gerald B. Lee held. Appearances as previous. Jury appeared as previous. Jury charged. Closing arguments. Jury retired to deliberate. Out of presence of jury, deft moved for mistrial and motion for cautionary instruction - argued - denied. Jury excused to return on 06/23/04 @ 9:00 a.m. Court adjourned. (dper)
Blank -- Filed: 6/22/2004, Entered: 6/22/2004 Set/Reset Deadlines
Deadline updated as to Charles Jacobs set Jury Trial for 9:00 6/23/04 before Judge Gerald B. Lee. (dper)
Blank -- Filed: 6/21/2004, Entered: 6/21/2004 Jury Trial
Jury trial proceedings as to Charles Jacobs before Judge Gerald B. Lee set at 2:00 6/22/04 for Charles Jacobs (jsol)
Blank -- Filed: 6/21/2004, Entered: 6/21/2004 Jury Trial
Jury trial proceedings as to Charles Jacobs before Judge Gerald B. Lee held ( Wilson.) USA appeared through: As previous. Dft(s) appeared through: As previous. Deft cont to adduce evidence w/direct exam of deft, cross exam and admission of 2 exhibits. US offerd no rebuttal. The jury left the courtroom. Rule 29 motion of deft renewed, argued and denied. Jury instruction conference. The jury returned to the courtroom and were excused to return 6/22/04 @ 2 PM for charge and closing. Agreed by counsel that Juror #24 will be excused and the alternate will deliberate. Court adjourned and the deft is remanded. (jsol)
Blank 143 Filed: 6/18/2004, Entered: 6/21/2004 Proposed Jury Instructions
Proposed Jury Instructions by Charles Jacobs - Burden of Proof and Reasonable Douobt w/citations (jsol)
Blank 142 Filed: 6/18/2004, Entered: 6/21/2004 Proposed Jury Instructions
Proposed Jury Instructions by Charles Jacobs - Burden of Proof and Reasonable Doubt - w/o citations. (jsol)
Blank 141 Filed: 6/18/2004, Entered: 6/21/2004 Proposed Jury Instructions
Proposed Jury Instructions by USA as to Charles Jacobs - Nos 1 & 2 - w/citations (jsol)
Blank 140 Filed: 6/18/2004, Entered: 6/21/2004 Proposed Jury Instructions
Proposed Jury Instructions by USA as to Charles Jacobs - Nos 1 and 2 w/o citations (jsol)
Blank 139 Filed: 6/18/2004, Entered: 6/21/2004 Response in Opposition
OBJECTION by plaintiff USA to [127-1] instructions jury by Charles Jacobs (jsol)
Blank 138 Filed: 6/18/2004, Entered: 6/21/2004 Proposed Jury Instructions
Proposed Jury Instructions by USA as to Charles Jacobs - w/o citations (jsol)
Blank 137 Filed: 6/18/2004, Entered: 6/21/2004 Proposed Jury Instructions
Proposed Jury Instructions by USA as to Charles Jacobs - w/citations (jsol)
Blank 136 Filed: 6/17/2004, Entered: 6/17/2004 Trial - Miscellaneous
Stipulation of Fact - Arlington Cocaine - filed in open court by US and deft. (jsol)
Blank 135 Filed: 6/17/2004, Entered: 6/17/2004 Trial - Miscellaneous
Stipulation of Fact - Telephpnes - filed in open court by US and deft. (jsol)
Blank 134 Filed: 6/17/2004, Entered: 6/17/2004 Trial - Miscellaneous
Stipulation of Fact - St. Thomas Cocaine - filed in open court by deft and US (jsol)
Blank 133 Filed: 6/17/2004, Entered: 6/17/2004 Trial - Miscellaneous
Stipulation of Fact - St. Thomas Heroin - filed by US and deft in open court (jsol)
Blank -- Filed: 6/17/2004, Entered: 6/17/2004 Jury Trial
Jury trial proceedings as to Charles Jacobs before Judge Gerald B. Lee set at 2:00 6/21/04 (jsol)
Blank -- Filed: 6/17/2004, Entered: 6/17/2004 Jury Trial
Jury trial proceedings as to Charles Jacobs before Judge Gerald B. Lee held ( Wilson.) USA appeared through: As previous. Dft(s) appeared through: As previous. Evidence cont w/cross exam of Mr Viscorrondo and 2 additional witnesses. Four (4) stipulations were read into the record and submitted re: St Thomas hroin; St Thomas Cocaine, Telephones (exhibit 8-3 and 8-4) and re: Arlington Cocaine. US rests w/ admission of exhibit 9-17 and that the Court takes judicial notice of the maps (US exhibits 9-16A and 9-16B. Rule 29 motion of deft is deferred and will be heard at the end of the day. Deft adduced evidence. The jury was excused to return 6/21/04 @ 2 PM. Deft's Rule 29 motion to dismiss argued and denied. Court adjourned and deft remanded. (jsol)
Blank 132 Filed: 6/16/2004, Entered: 6/16/2004 Proposed Jury Instructions
Proposed Jury Instructions by USA as to Charles Jacobs w/o cites. (jsol)
Blank 131 Filed: 6/16/2004, Entered: 6/16/2004 Proposed Jury Instructions
Proposed Jury Instructions by USA as to Charles Jacobs w/cites (jsol)
Blank 130 Filed: 6/16/2004, Entered: 6/16/2004, Terminated: 11/30/2004 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
MOTION by USA as to Charles Jacobs to Proceed Under Rule 611(c) of FR Evidence (jsol)
Blank 129 Filed: 6/16/2004, Entered: 6/16/2004 Response in Opposition
MEMORANDUM by Charles Jacobs in opposition to [118-1] motion by USA to preclude the admission into evidence of exhibits filed out of time (jsol)
Blank 128 Filed: 6/16/2004, Entered: 6/16/2004 Exhibit List
Exhibit list by Charles Jacobs (jsol)
Blank -- Filed: 6/16/2004, Entered: 6/16/2004 Jury Trial
Jury trial proceedings as to Charles Jacobs before Judge Gerald B. Lee set at 10:00 6/17/04 for Charles Jacobs (jsol)
Blank -- Filed: 6/16/2004, Entered: 6/16/2004 Jury Trial
Jury trial proceedings as to Charles Jacobs before Judge Gerald B. Lee held ( Wilson.) USA appeared through: As previous. Dft(s) appeared through: As previous. US cont to adduce evidence w/direct exam of Nestah Lee. US exhibit 4-2 is the passport of Mr Lee. Color photocopies were substituted for the original and the original passport was returned to Mr Lee in open court. All exhibits retrieved by US on 6/15/04 were returned to the exhibit book. US cont to adduce evidence. Jury was excused at 4:30 to return 6/17/04 @ 10 AM. Discussion re: posture of the case. Government exhibit 9-17 is admitted. After argument, US exhibits 5-2 and 5-3 are admitted in entirety. Court adjourned. Deft remanded. (jsol)
Blank 127 Filed: 6/15/2004, Entered: 6/15/2004 Proposed Jury Instructions
Proposed Jury Instructions by Charles Jacobs (jsol)
Blank 119 Filed: 6/15/2004, Entered: 6/15/2004 Witness List
Witness list by Charles Jacobs (jsol)
Blank 118 Filed: 6/15/2004, Entered: 6/15/2004, Terminated: 11/30/2004 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
MOTION by USA as to Charles Jacobs by USA to preclude the admission into evidence of exhibits filed out of time (clerk)
Blank -- Filed: 6/15/2004, Entered: 6/15/2004 Miscellaneous Document
Exhibits of USA as to Charles Jacobs retrieved for photocopy - 3-1A to 3-1G and 4-2. Will return exhibits 6/16/04 for further trial. (jsol)
Blank -- Filed: 6/15/2004, Entered: 6/15/2004 Jury Trial
Jury trial proceedings as to Charles Jacobs before Judge Gerald B. Lee set at 10:00 6/16/04 for Charles Jacobs (jsol)
Blank -- Filed: 6/15/2004, Entered: 6/15/2004 Jury Trial
Jury trial proceedings as to Charles Jacobs before Judge Gerald B. Lee held ( Wilson.) USA appeared through: as previous. Dft(s) appeared through: as previous. US cont to adduce evidence w/3 witnesses and cross exam. Jury excused to return 6/16/04 @ 10 AM. Discussion re: efforts to locate Ms Annabelle James and possible testimony - subpoena to be faxed to Ms James probation office for her appearance. Court adjourned. (jsol)
Blank 117 Filed: 6/14/2004, Entered: 6/14/2004, Terminated: 6/14/2004 Motion to Compel
MOTION by Charles Jacobs to Compel Productiion of Brady/Giglio Material (jsol)
Blank 116 Filed: 6/14/2004, Entered: 6/14/2004 Voir Dire Questions
PROPOSED Additional Voir Dire Questions by Charles Jacobs to Prospective Jurors. (jsol)
Blank 115 Filed: 6/14/2004, Entered: 6/14/2004 Witness List
Witness list by USA as to Charles Jacobs (jsol)
Blank -- Filed: 6/14/2004, Entered: 6/14/2004 Jury Trial
Jury trial proceedings as to Charles Jacobs before Judge Gerald B. Lee set at 10:00 6/15/04 for Charles Jacobs (jsol)
Blank -- Filed: 6/14/2004, Entered: 6/14/2004 Jury Trial
Jury trial proceedings as to Charles Jacobs before Judge Gerald B. Lee held ( Wilson.) USA appeared through: Mike Rich/Larry Leiser. Dft(s) appeared through: Steven Brusch/Frank Salvato. Motions in limine: 1) US motion re: opening statements - granted; 2) deft motion r: witnesses - Aubaine - denied in part and Lee - denied 3) deft motion re: definition of reasonable doubt - granted in part and denied in part 4) deft motion re: Brady/Giglio - denied as moot 5) deft motion to limit scope - resolved. The jury appeared as summoned, were sworn on voir dire and 13 jurors were sworn to try the issue. Rule on witnesses: Preliminary instructions: Opening statements. US adduced evidence w/1 witness and cross exam. The jury was excused to return 6/15/04 # 10 AM. Deft motion re: Mr. Gunn argued and denied. Deft remanded. (jsol)
Blank -- Filed: 6/14/2004, Entered: 6/14/2004 Voir Dire Begun
Voir dire begun as to Charles Jacobs (3) count(s) 1s, 2s, 3s Terminated motions: [117-1] motion to Compel Productiion of Brady/Giglio Material as to Charles Jacobs (3), [101-1] motion by USA in limine restricting counsedl for the deft from commenting in opening argument as to Victor Thompson (2), [77-1] motion by USA to revoke bond and to enter an detention order as to Charles Jacobs (3) (jsol)
Blank 113 Filed: 6/8/2004, Entered: 6/9/2004 Miscellaneous Document
TRIAL EXHIBIT CUSTODY FORM filed by USA (clerk)
Blank 112 Filed: 6/8/2004, Entered: 6/9/2004 Exhibit List
ADDENDUM to Exhibit list by USA as to Charles Jacobs, Gregory Ravalier (clerk)
Blank 107 Filed: 6/7/2004, Entered: 6/8/2004 Notice (Other)
NOTICE of intent to use certain evidence by USA as to Charles Jacobs, Gregory Ravalier (clerk)
Blank 106 Filed: 6/7/2004, Entered: 6/8/2004 Miscellaneous Document
TRIAL EXHIBIT CUSTODY FORM filed by USA (clerk)
Blank 105 Filed: 6/7/2004, Entered: 6/8/2004 Exhibit List
Exhibit list by USA as to Charles Jacobs, Gregory Ravalier (clerk)
Blank 104 Filed: 6/7/2004, Entered: 6/7/2004 Proposed Jury Instructions
Proposed Jury Instructions by USA as to Charles Jacobs, Dewayne Andre Nunes, Gregory Ravalier (clerk)
Blank 99 Filed: 6/2/2004, Entered: 6/2/2004 Notice (Other)
NOTICE to use expert witness (Katherine T. Churchill) by USA (clerk)
Blank 98 Filed: 6/2/2004, Entered: 6/2/2004 Notice (Other)
NOTICE to use expert witness (Sharmon S. Dyson) by USA (clerk)
Blank 95 Filed: 5/24/2004, Entered: 5/24/2004 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER OF TEMP DETENTION as to Charles Jacobs Detention Hearing set for 2:00 5/25/04 for Charles Jacobs ( Signed by Mag Judge Thomas R. Jones Jr. ) (dana)
Blank 94 Filed: 5/21/2004, Entered: 5/24/2004 Warrant Returned
WARRANT Returned Executed as to Charles Jacobs on 5/18/04 (dana)
Blank -- Filed: 5/21/2004, Entered: 5/24/2004 Minutes - Miscellaneous
Minute entry as to Charles Jacobs : ( before Mag Judge Thomas R. Jones Jr. )( FTR) USA Appeared through: Liser Dft(s) appeared through: w/o atty. Deft arrested and brought before the court, gov'ts motion for detention granted. Case cont to 5/25/04 at 2:00 pm for DH before TCB. Deft remanded (dana)
Blank 92 Filed: 5/17/2004, Entered: 5/18/2004 CJA 20 - Appointment
CJA 20 as to Charles Jacobs Appointment of Attorney Frank Salvato () (clerk)
Blank 91 Filed: 5/13/2004, Entered: 5/17/2004 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER granting [83-1] motion by Charles Jacobs for David B. Smith to Withdraw as Attorney (Terminated attorney David Benjamin Smith for Charles Jacobs (3) ( Signed by Judge Gerald B. Lee ) Copies Mailed: y (clerk)
Blank 87 Filed: 5/13/2004, Entered: 5/13/2004 Miscellaneous Document
Demand for Notice of Alibi filed by plaintiff USA (clerk)
Blank 83 Filed: 5/10/2004, Entered: 5/10/2004, Terminated: 5/13/2004 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
MOTION by Charles Jacobs by Charles Jacobs for David B. Smith to Withdraw as Attorney (clerk)
Blank 82 Filed: 5/6/2004, Entered: 5/6/2004 Response/Reply - Miscellaneous
RESPONSE by USA to the motion of David B. Smith to withdraw as cnsl for Charles Jacobs (clerk)
Blank 79 Filed: 5/3/2004, Entered: 5/3/2004 Notice (Other)
NOTICE of intent to use certain evidence by USA as to Charles Jacobs, Dewayne Andre Nunes, Gregory Ravalier by USA for Disclosure of 404(b) Evidence (clerk)
Blank 90 Filed: 4/30/2004, Entered: 5/17/2004 CJA 20 - Appointment
CJA 20 as to Charles Jacobs Appointment of Attorney David Benjamin Smith () (clerk)
Blank 89 Filed: 4/30/2004, Entered: 5/14/2004 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER as to Charles Jacobs for reasons stated in open court on 4/30/04, David Smith, Esquire is appointed local counsel for deft. ( Signed by Judge Gerald B. Lee Copies Mailed: y (jsol)
Blank -- Filed: 4/30/2004, Entered: 4/30/2004 Minutes - Miscellaneous
Minute entry as to Charles Jacobs : ( before Judge Gerald B. Lee )( Wilson.) USA Appeared through: Larry Leiser. Dft(s) appeared through: David Smith. Matter set for hearing on US Motion to Revoke Bond. Deft appeared not. US moved to cont - granted - motion to be renoticed. Deft counsel moved to be appointed as US has frozen assets - the Court finds deft indigent and grants the motion effective this date. Order to follow. (jsol)
Blank 78 Filed: 4/23/2004, Entered: 4/26/2004 Notice of HearingCourt Filing
NOTICE of Hearing as to Charles Jacobs, USA :, Motion Hearing Deadline before Judge Gerald B. Lee set for 9:00 4/30/04 for Charles Jacobs for [77-1] motion by USA to revoke bond and to enter an detention order (clerk)
Blank 77 Filed: 4/23/2004, Entered: 4/26/2004 Motion to Revoke
MOTION by USA as to Charles Jacobs by USA to revoke bond and to enter an detention order (clerk)
Blank 76 Filed: 4/15/2004, Entered: 4/16/2004 Miscellaneous Document
Documents filed by plaintiff USA as to Andre Dwayne Nunes, Information with respect to prior conviction (clerk)
Blank 75 Filed: 4/15/2004, Entered: 4/16/2004 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER as to Charles Jacobs granting [72-1] motion by USA for post-indictment restraining order as to Charles Jacobs (3) **see order for details** ( Signed by Judge Gerald B. Lee ) Copies Mailed: y (clerk)
Blank 72 Filed: 4/15/2004, Entered: 4/15/2004, Terminated: 4/15/2004 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
EX PARTE MOTION by USA as to Charles Jacobs by USA for restraining order (clerk)
Blank 71 Filed: 4/15/2004, Entered: 4/15/2004 Summons Returned Unexecuted
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Charles Jacobs (clerk)
Blank 74 Filed: 4/14/2004, Entered: 4/15/2004 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER as to Charles Jacobs, Dewayne Andre Nunes setting out schedule as follows: Jury trial set for 6/14/04, Motion hearing on 5/14/04 w/motions filed by 5/4/04 and US responses due 5/11/04. ( Signed by Judge Gerald B. Lee ) Copies Mailed: y (jsol)
Blank 73 Filed: 4/14/2004, Entered: 4/15/2004 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER as to Charles Jacobs, for discovery and inspection ( Signed by Judge Gerald B. Lee ) Copies Mailed: y (jsol)
Blank -- Filed: 4/14/2004, Entered: 4/15/2004 Set/Reset Hearings
Arraignment as to Charles Jacobs, Dewayne Andre Nunes before Judge Gerald B. Lee held on Superseding Indictment. Deft WFA, PNG and demanded trial by jury. Motion Hearing set for 9:00 5/14/04 w/ Motion Filings due 5/4/04 for Charles Jacobs, for Dewayne Andre Nunes ; Government's Response to Motions due 5/11/04 ; Jury Trial set for 10:00 6/14/04 for Charles Jacobs, for Dewayne Andre Nunes ; ( Wilson.) USA appeared through: Larry Leiser. Dft(s) appeared through: David Smith/Steven Brush w/Mr Jacobs and Lana Manitta was in for Michael Arif for Mr. Nunes. Mr Nunes is remanded and Mr. Jacobs is cont on bond. Discover Order ent and filed as to Mr. Jacobs. Order ent after arr w/dates/schedule. (jsol)
Blank -- Filed: 4/14/2004, Entered: 4/15/2004 Minutes - Miscellaneous
Minute entry as to Charles Jacobs, Dewayne Andre Nunes : ( before Judge Gerald B. Lee )( Wilson.) USA Appeared through: Larry Leiser. Dft(s) appeared through: David Smith/Steven Brush w/Mr. Jacobs and Lana Manitta in for Michael Arif w/Mr. Nunes. Came on for arraignment. Mr. Smith moved to be excused from all motion/trial proceedings - denied. Mr Smith made oral motion to be couort appointed - told to file written motion and notice if approbirate after Mr Jacobs submits a financial affidavit. Trial date set for 6/14/04 @ 10 AM. Current trial date of 5/10/04 is moot. Discover Order ent and filed as to Mr. Jacobs. Mr Jacobs cont on bond and Mr Nunes remanded. (jsol)
Blank -- Filed: 4/13/2004, Entered: 4/13/2004 Set/Reset Hearings
Arraignment before Judge Gerald B. Lee set for 11:15 4/14/04 for Victor Thompson, for Marlon Constantine, for Roy, for Gregory Ravalier (jcup)
Blank -- Filed: 4/8/2004, Entered: 4/8/2004 Summons Issued
SUMMONS(ES) issued for Charles Jacobs for arraignment on 4/14/04 at 11:15 a.m. (ctat)
Blank 70 Filed: 4/7/2004, Entered: 4/8/2004 Indictment
SUPERSEDING INDICTMENT as to Gregory Ravalier (7) count(s) 2 , Victor Thompson (2) count(s) 1ss, 2ss, 3ss, Charles Jacobs (3) count(s) 1s, 2s, 3s, Marlon Constantine (4) count(s) 1s, 2s, 3s, Dewayne Andre Nunes (5) count(s) 1s, 2s, 3s, Roy (6) count(s) 1s, 2s, 3s (ctat)
Blank -- Filed: 4/7/2004, Entered: 4/8/2004 Set/Reset Hearings
Arraignment before Judge Gerald B. Lee set for 11:15 a.m. on 4/14/04 for Charles Jacobs, for Dewayne Andre Nunes (ctat)
Blank -- Filed: 4/7/2004, Entered: 4/8/2004 Dismissal of Counts on Defendant/Other Motion
DISMISSAL of Count(s) per filing of Superseding Indictment as to Victor Thompson, Charles Jacobs, Marlon Constantine, Andre Nunes, Roy Counts Dismissed: Victor Thompson (2) count(s) 1s, 2s, 3s, Charles Jacobs (3) count(s) 1, 2, 3, Marlon Constantine (4) count(s) 1, 2, 3, Dewayne Andre Nunes (5) count(s) 1, 2, 3, Roy (6) count(s) 1, 2, 3 (ctat)
Blank 46 Filed: 1/22/2004, Entered: 1/22/2004 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER as to Charles Jacobs for reasons stated, deft oral motion to remove electronic monitoring as a pretrial condition is granted. ( Signed by Judge Gerald B. Lee Copies Mailed: y and given to PO, PTS and USMS (jsol)
Blank 45 Filed: 1/22/2004, Entered: 1/22/2004 Waiver of Speedy Trial
WAIVER of Speedy Trial by Charles Jacobs (jsol)
Blank 44 Filed: 1/22/2004, Entered: 1/22/2004 Miscellaneous Document
CONSENT by Charles Jacobs, USA pursuant to Rule 49 of the FRCrP. (jsol)
Blank 43 Filed: 1/22/2004, Entered: 1/22/2004 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
NOTICE of Appearance for Charles Jacobs by Attorney David B. Smith (clerk)
Blank -- Filed: 1/22/2004, Entered: 1/22/2004 Oral Order
ORAL ORDER as to Nestah Jefferson Lee, Victor Thompson, Charles Jacobs, Marlon Constantine, Dewayne Andre Nunes, Roy granting [0-0] oral motion by plaintiff to Unseal Indictment as to Nestah Jefferson Lee (1), Victor Thompson (2), Charles Jacobs (3), Marlon Constantine (4), Dewayne Andre Nunes (5), Roy (6) ( Entered by Judge Gerald B. Lee ) (jsol)
Blank -- Filed: 1/22/2004, Entered: 1/22/2004, Terminated: 1/22/2004 Oral Order
ORAL MOTION in open court by USA as to Nestah Jefferson Lee, Victor Thompson, Charles Jacobs, Marlon Constantine, Dewayne Andre Nunes, Roy by plaintiff to Unseal Indictment (jsol)
Blank -- Filed: 1/22/2004, Entered: 1/22/2004 Initial Appearance
Initial appearance as to Charles Jacobs before Judge Gerald B. Lee held ( Wilson.) USA appeared through: Larry Leiser. Dft(s) appeared through: David Smith/Steven Brush. (Defendant informed of rights.) (jsol)
Blank -- Filed: 1/22/2004, Entered: 1/22/2004 Set/Reset Hearings
Arraignment as to Charles Jacobs before Judge Gerald B. Lee held. Deft WFA, PNG and demanded trial by jury. Deft waived speedy trial orally in open court and Waiver filed. US made oral motin to unseal the case - granted on oral order. Hard copy of motion and order to follow. Motion Hearing set for 9:00 4/2/04 w/ Motion Filings due 3/8/04 and Government's Response to Motions due 3/22/04; Jury Trial set for 10:00 5/10/04; ( Wilson.) USA appeared through: Larry Leiser. Dft(s) appeared through: David Smith/Steven Brush. Deft cont on present bond w/modification re: elec. monitoring which is removed. Order to follow. (jsol)
Blank -- Filed: 1/16/2004, Entered: 1/16/2004 Set/Reset Hearings
Arraignment as to Charles Jacobs before Judge Gerald B. Lee set for 10:00 1/22/04 (jsol)
Blank -- Filed: 1/14/2004, Entered: 1/14/2004 Case Assigned/Reassigned
CASE assigned to Judge Gerald B. Lee (ctat)
Blank 42 Filed: 11/25/2003, Entered: 11/26/2003 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER granting [41-1] motion by plaintiff to Seal [40-1] superseding indictment (Signed by Magistrate Judge Liam O'Grady ) (clerk)
Blank 41 Filed: 11/25/2003, Entered: 11/26/2003, Terminated: 11/25/2003 Motion to Seal
MOTION by USA by plaintiff to Seal [40-1] superseding indictment (clerk)
Blank 40 Filed: 11/25/2003, Entered: 11/26/2003 Indictment
SUPERSEDING INDICTMENT as to Charles Jacobs (3) count(s) 1, 2, 3, Marlon Constantine (4) count(s) 1, 2, 3, Dewayne Andre Nunes (5) count(s) 1, 2, 3, Roy (6) count(s) 1, 2, 3 , Victor Thompson (2) count(s) 1s, 2s, 3s (clerk)
Blank -- Filed: 11/25/2003, Entered: 11/26/2003 Warrant Issued
Arrest WARRANT issued as to Victor Thompson, Charles Jacobs, Marlon Constantine, Dewayne Andre Nunes, Roy (clerk)
Blank 25 Filed: 12/21/2000, Entered: 12/21/2000 Response/Reply - Miscellaneous
RESPONSE by USA to Defendant's Pre-Trial Motions as to Nestah Jefferson Lee (clerk)

Statistics

This case has been viewed 106 times.

No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Need Password Help?