Esrey et al v. Bratton
Vermont District Court, Case No. 2:05-cv-00229-wks
docket://gov.uscourts.vtd.2-05-cv-00229 (What is this?)

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
This docket can only tell you so much. Get the rest.
Access comprehensive profiles on judges, firms, lawyers, and more with PlainSite Pro and Pro Se.
No Logo R. Lee Harris, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Michael R. Kainen

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Gary R. Kupferer +1 802 773 9109 kupferer@sover.net
No Logo Robert E. Esrey, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Michael R. Kainen

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Gary R. Kupferer +1 802 773 9109 kupferer@sover.net
No Logo Robert N. Rousey, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Michael R. Kainen

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Gary R. Kupferer +1 802 773 9109 kupferer@sover.net
No Logo Valley View Financial Group Trust Company, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Michael R. Kainen

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Gary R. Kupferer +1 802 773 9109 kupferer@sover.net
No Logo Marshall E. Bratton, Jr., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ryan Smith & Carbine Ltd.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Mark F. Werle +1 802 786 1000 +1 802 786 1100 mfw@rsclaw.com
v.
No Logo Marshall E. Bratton, Jr., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ryan Smith & Carbine Ltd.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Mark F. Werle +1 802 786 1000 +1 802 786 1100 mfw@rsclaw.com
No Logo R. Lee Harris, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Michael R. Kainen

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Gary R. Kupferer +1 802 773 9109 kupferer@sover.net
No Logo Robert E. Esrey, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Michael R. Kainen

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Gary R. Kupferer +1 802 773 9109 kupferer@sover.net
No Logo Robert N. Rousey, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Michael R. Kainen

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Gary R. Kupferer +1 802 773 9109 kupferer@sover.net
No Logo Valley View Financial Group Trust Company, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Michael R. Kainen

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Gary R. Kupferer +1 802 773 9109 kupferer@sover.net
Office Burlington
Filed 8/23/2005
Jury Demand Both
Demand
Nature of Suit 190 - Contract: Other
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1340 Recovery of Erroneous Refund
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County XX US, Outside State
Terminated 7/17/2007
Origin 2
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case 523-8-05 Rdcv[Rutland County Superior Court]
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, ENE3, ENEN
  Entries (43) Calendar Events Related (0) Tools Right End
PDF 40 Filed: 7/17/2007, Entered: 7/18/2007 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
STIPULATION AND ORDER to Dismiss With Prejudice. Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 07/16/2007. (law)
Blank -- Filed: 7/13/2007, Entered: 7/13/2007 Notice (Other)
RECEIVED STIPULATION to Dismiss with prejudice. (wjf)
PDF 39 Filed: 3/16/2007, Entered: 3/16/2007 Discovery Certificate - Disclosure of Experts
DISCOVERY CERTIFICATE - Expert Witness Disclosure by Marshall E. Bratton, Jr.(law)
PDF 38 Filed: 2/21/2007, Entered: 2/21/2007 Stipulated Discovery Schedule / OrderCourt Filing
STIPULATED AMENDED DISCOVERY SCHEDULE/ORDER: granting [36] Stipulated Motion to Extend Discovery Schedule. Discovery due by 5/31/2007. Motions due by 7/31/2007. Ready for Trial by 8/15/2007. Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 2/21/2007. (law)
PDF 37 Filed: 2/20/2007, Entered: 2/20/2007 Report of ENE
REPORT of Early Neutral Evaluation: no settlement.(law)
PDF 36 Filed: 2/12/2007, Entered: 2/12/2007, Terminated: 2/21/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
STIPULATED MOTION to Extend Discovery Schedule by Marshall E. Bratton, Jr, Robert E. Esrey, R. Lee Harris, Robert N. Rousey, Valley View Financial Group Trust Company. (Attachments: # (1) proposed Stipulated Amended Discovery Schedule/Order)(law)
PDF 35 Filed: 10/30/2006, Entered: 10/30/2006 Letter
LETTER to counsel re: ENE (response due by 11/13/2006). (law, )
PDF 34 Filed: 9/20/2006, Entered: 9/20/2006 Discovery Certificate - Answer to Interrogatories
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Responses to Interrogatory and Requests to Produce by Marshall E. Bratton, Jr.(law)
PDF 33 Filed: 7/20/2006, Entered: 7/21/2006 Discovery Certificate - Response to Request for Ad
DISCOVERY CERTIFICATE - Response to Request for Admissions, Response to Requests to Produce, Response to Interrogatories by Marshall E. Bratton, Jr.(jse)
PDF 32 Filed: 7/11/2006, Entered: 7/11/2006 ENE Evaluator Assigned
Carl D. Gum assigned as ENE Evaluator. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 6/6/2007.(law)
Blank 31 Filed: 7/10/2006, Entered: 7/10/2006 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
ORDER granting as unopposed [28] Stipulated Motion to select netrual evaluator. Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 07/10/06. (This is a text only Order.) (eae)
PDF 30 Filed: 6/26/2006, Entered: 6/26/2006 Stipulated Discovery Schedule / OrderCourt Filing
STIPULATED DISCOVERY SCHEDULE/ORDER granting [29] MOTION to Extend Discovery Schedule. Discovery due by 12/1/2006. Motions due by 11/15/2006. Ready for Trial by 12/1/2006. Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 26th day of June, 2006. (law)
PDF 29 Filed: 6/23/2006, Entered: 6/23/2006, Terminated: 6/26/2006 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
STIPULATED MOTION to Extend Discovery Schedule by Marshall E. Bratton, Jr, Robert E. Esrey, R. Lee Harris, Robert N. Rousey, Valley View Financial Group Trust Company. (Attachments: # (1) proposed Stipulated Discovery Schedule/Order)(law)
PDF 28 Filed: 6/2/2006, Entered: 6/5/2006, Terminated: 7/10/2006 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
STIPULATED MOTION to Select Neutral Evaluator by Marshall E. Bratton, Jr, Robert E. Esrey, R. Lee Harris, Robert N. Rousey, Valley View Financial Group Trust Company. (law)
PDF 27 Filed: 5/5/2006, Entered: 5/5/2006 Discovery Certificate - Interrogatories and Reques
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Interrogatory and Request to Produce by Robert E. Esrey, R. Lee Harris, Robert N. Rousey, Valley View Financial Group Trust Company.(law)
PDF 26 Filed: 5/3/2006, Entered: 5/5/2006 Discovery Certificate - Interrogatories and Reques
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Interrogatories, Request to Produce and Requests for Admission by Marshall E. Bratton, Jr.(law)
PDF 25 Filed: 4/19/2006, Entered: 4/19/2006 Discovery Certificate - Initial Disclosures
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Rule 26 Disclosures by Robert E. Esrey, R. Lee Harris, Robert N. Rousey, Valley View Financial Group Trust Company.(law)
PDF 24 Filed: 4/17/2006, Entered: 4/18/2006 Discovery Certificate - Initial Disclosures
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Initial Disclosures by Marshall E. Bratton, Jr.(law)
PDF 23 Filed: 3/20/2006, Entered: 3/20/2006 Stipulated Discovery Schedule / OrderCourt Filing
STIPULATED DISCOVERY SCHEDULE/ORDER; Discovery due by 10/15/2006. Motions due by 10/1/2006. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 6/30/2006 at 10:00 AM. Ready for Trial by 10/15/2006. Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 3/17/06. (law)
PDF 22 Filed: 3/17/2006, Entered: 3/17/2006 ENE Evaluator Assigned
ENE Evaluator Arthur J O'Dea assigned. (Attachments: # (1) proposed Stipulated Discovery Schedule/Order)(law)
Blank -- Filed: 3/16/2006, Entered: 3/16/2006 Remark
RECEIVED Proposed Stipulated Discovery Schedule/Order. (wjf, )
PDF 21 Filed: 2/16/2006, Entered: 2/16/2006 Amended Answer to Complaint
FIRST AMENDED ANSWER WITH COUNTERCLAIM amending [11] Answer to Complaint with Jury Demand, Counterclaim by Marshall E. Bratton, Jr. (law)
Blank 20 Filed: 2/15/2006, Entered: 2/15/2006 Motion HearingCourt Filing
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge William K. Sessions III: Motion Hearing held on 2/15/2006. G. Kupferer & T. Budd present for pltfs; M. Werle present for dft. Statements by counsel. Court makes findings; there is federal question jurisdiction. ORDERED: [10] MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by pltfs DENIED, [13] MOTION to Amend/Correct [11] Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim filed by Marshall E. Bratton, Jr. GRANTED. Proposed discovery schedule to be submitted. (Court Reporter Nichols.) (jam, )
PDF 19 Filed: 1/26/2006, Entered: 1/27/2006 Notice of Hearing on Motion
NOTICE of Hearing on Motion [13] MOTION to Amend/Correct [11] Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim, [10] MOTION to Remand to State Court: Motion Hearing set for 2/15/2006 01:30 PM in Burlington Courtroom 542 before William K. Sessions III. Cy parties(jam, )
Blank 18 Filed: 1/23/2006, Entered: 1/23/2006 Order on Motion to Extend TimeCourt Filing
ORDER granting [17] Motion to Extend Time For Filing of Discovery Schedule and Selection of A Neutral Evaluator. Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 1/23/06. (This is a text only Order.) (eae)
PDF 17 Filed: 11/28/2005, Entered: 12/1/2005, Terminated: 1/23/2006 Motion to Extend Time
STIPULATED MOTION to Extend Time for Filing of Discovery Schedule and Selection of a Neutral Evaluator by Robert E. Esrey, R. Lee Harris, Robert N. Rousey. (law)
PDF 16 Filed: 11/17/2005, Entered: 11/17/2005 ENE Potential Evaluators Letter Sent
ENE LETTER re: Potential Evaluators sent; responses due by 12/2/2005. (law)
PDF 15 Filed: 10/26/2005, Entered: 10/26/2005 Reply to Response to Motion
REPLY MEMORANDUM to opposition to [10] MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Robert E. Esrey, R. Lee Harris, Robert N. Rousey, Valley View Financial Group Trust Company. (law)
PDF 14 Filed: 10/26/2005, Entered: 10/26/2005 Answer to Counterclaim
ANSWER to Counterclaim by Robert E. Esrey, R. Lee Harris, Robert N. Rousey, Valley View Financial Group Trust Company.(law)
PDF 13 Filed: 10/20/2005, Entered: 10/20/2005, Terminated: 2/15/2006 Motion to Amend/Correct
MOTION to Amend [11] Answer with Counterclaim by Marshall E. Bratton, Jr.. Responses due by 11/3/2005. Note: 3 additional days will be allowed for mailing in accordance with L.R. 6.1. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B# (3) proposed First Amended Answer with Counterclaim)(law)
PDF 12 Filed: 10/6/2005, Entered: 10/7/2005 Response to Motion
MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION to [10] MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Marshall E. Bratton, Jr. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B)(law)
PDF 11 Filed: 9/30/2005, Entered: 10/3/2005 Answer to Complaint
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against Robert E. Esrey, R. Lee Harris, Robert N. Rousey, Valley View Financial Group Trust Company filed by Marshall E. Bratton, Jr..(law)
PDF 10 Filed: 9/21/2005, Entered: 9/21/2005, Terminated: 2/15/2006 Motion to Remand to State Court
MOTION to Remand to State Court by Robert E. Esrey, R. Lee Harris, Robert N. Rousey, Valley View Financial Group Trust Company. Responses due by 10/5/2005. Note: 3 additional days will be allowed for mailing in accordance with L.R. 6.1. (law)
Blank 9 Filed: 9/12/2005, Entered: 9/12/2005 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
ORDER granting [3] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 09/12/05. (This is a text only Order.) (eae)
Blank -- Filed: 9/12/2005, Entered: 9/13/2005 Set Deadlines/Hearings
Set Deadlines/Hearings: Marshall E. Bratton, Jr answer due 9/30/2005 pursuant to [9] order. (law)
PDF 8 Filed: 8/25/2005, Entered: 8/25/2005 Notice (Other)
NOTICE by Marshall E. Bratton, Jr of Removal. (originally filed 08/23/2005 in state court) (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(law)
PDF 7 Filed: 8/25/2005, Entered: 8/25/2005 Summons (re: complaint) Returned Executed
AFFIDAVIT OF PERSONAL SERVICE OUTSIDE OF THE STATE. Marshall E. Bratton, Jr served on 7/29/2005, answer due 8/18/2005. (originally filed 08/05/2005 in state court) (law)
PDF 6 Filed: 8/25/2005, Entered: 8/25/2005 Complaint
COMPLAINT against Marshall E. Bratton, Jr filed by Robert E. Esrey, R. Lee Harris, Robert N. Rousey, Valley View Financial Group Trust Company. (originally filed 08/10/2005 in state court)(law)
PDF 5 Filed: 8/25/2005, Entered: 8/25/2005 File Received from State Court
RECEIVED FILE and certified copy of docket sheet from State Court.. (law)
PDF 4 Filed: 8/23/2005, Entered: 8/23/2005 Memorandum in Support
MEMORANDUM by Marshall E. Bratton, Jr. in support of [3] MOTION for to Enlarge Time to Answer Complaint. (law)
PDF 3 Filed: 8/23/2005, Entered: 8/23/2005, Terminated: 9/12/2005 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
MOTION to Enlarge Time to Answer Complaint by Marshall E. Bratton, Jr. Responses due by 9/7/2005. Note: 3 additional days will be allowed for mailing in accordance with L.R. 6.1. (law)
PDF 2 Filed: 8/23/2005, Entered: 8/23/2005 Letter
LETTER requesting original file & certified docket sheet from Rutland County Superior Court. (law)
PDF 1 Filed: 8/23/2005, Entered: 8/23/2005 Notice of Removal
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Marshall E. Bratton, Jr. from Rutland County Superior Court, case number 523-8-05 Rdcv. ( Filing fee $ 250) (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A (State Court Pleadings)# (2) Civil Cover Sheet)(law)

Statistics

This case has been viewed 77 times.

No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Need Password Help?