DELHUR INDUSTRIES, INC. v. USA
United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:08-cv-00541-TCW
District Judge Thomas C. Wheeler, presiding
docket://gov.uscourts.cofc.1-08-cv-00541 (What is this?)

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Judges don't know as much about themselves as we do.
Access comprehensive profiles on judges, firms, lawyers, and more with PlainSite Pro and Pro Se.
No Logo Delhur Industries, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Sussman Shank, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Jason W. Alexander +1 503 227 1111 +1 503 248 0130 jason@sussmanshank.com
Office COFC
Filed 7/25/2008
Jury Demand None
Demand $1981000
Nature of Suit 100 -
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County None
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag ECF
  Entries (6) Calendar Events Related (0) Tools Right End
PDF 6 Filed: 9/17/2008, Entered: 9/17/2008
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until 11/7/2008 to File Answer re [1] Complaint,, filed by USA.Response due by 10/6/2008.(Dempsey, Jane)
PDF 5 Filed: 8/7/2008, Entered: 8/7/2008
NOTICE of Appearance by Jane C. Dempsey for USA. (Dempsey, Jane)
PDF 4 Filed: 7/25/2008, Entered: 7/28/2008 Notice of Designation of Electronic Case
NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (dw1)
PDF 3 Filed: 7/25/2008, Entered: 7/28/2008 Notice of AssignmentCourt Filing
NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (dw1)
Blank 2 Filed: 7/25/2008, Entered: 7/28/2008 Disclosure Statement - Rule 7.1
Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement filed by DELHUR INDUSTRIES, INC.. Service: 7/25/08.(dw1)
PDF 1 Filed: 7/25/2008, Entered: 7/28/2008 Complaint
COMPLAINT against USA (TRN) (Filing fee $250, Receipt number 068407) (Five copies to Department of Justice) filed by DELHUR INDUSTRIES, INC.. Answer due by 9/23/2008. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(dw1)

Statistics

This case has been viewed 87 times.

No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Need Password Help?