MacNaughton v. McDonald's Corp, et al
Delaware District Court, Case No. 1:95-cv-00214-SLR
District Judge Sue L. Robinson, presiding
docket://gov.uscourts.ded.1-95-cv-00214 (What is this?)

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Judges don't know as much about themselves as we do.
Access comprehensive profiles on judges, firms, lawyers, and more with PlainSite Pro and Pro Se.
No Logo Anthony Meoli, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Tybout, Redfearn & Pell

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
B. Wilson Redfearn +1 302 658 6901 bwredfearn@trplaw.com
No Logo Jack Lyte of Rehobeth, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Tybout, Redfearn & Pell

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
B. Wilson Redfearn +1 302 658 6901 bwredfearn@trplaw.com
McDonald's Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Tybout, Redfearn & Pell

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
B. Wilson Redfearn +1 302 658 6901 bwredfearn@trplaw.com
Office Wilmington
Filed 4/5/1995
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 365 - Personal Injury: Prod. Liability
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County XX US, Outside State
Terminated 2/22/1996
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (73) Calendar Events Related (0) Tools Right End
Blank -- Filed: 2/22/1996, Entered: 2/22/1996
Case closed (pr)
Blank -- Filed: 2/22/1996, Entered: 2/22/1996
So Ordered granting [59-1] dismiss/dismissal stipulation ( signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson ) Notice to all parties. (pr)
Blank 59 Filed: 2/21/1996, Entered: 2/21/1996, Terminated: 2/22/1996 Stipulation of Dismissal
STIPULATION of dismissal with prejudice - costs to be paid by plaintiff (pr)
Blank 58 Filed: 2/1/1996, Entered: 2/2/1996 Certificate of Service
NOTICE OF SERVICE by McDonald's Corp, Anthony Meoli, Jack Lyte of Rehob - re defendants' requests for admissions (pr)
Blank 57 Filed: 1/16/1996, Entered: 1/17/1996 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER, mediation scheduled for 2/1/96 at 10:00am ( signed by Judge Mary P. Trostle ) copies to: cnsl (lf)
Blank 56 Filed: 12/27/1995, Entered: 12/28/1995 LetterCourt Filing
Letter dated 12/15/95 from Alexander Pires, Esq. to Judge Robinson; Re: request an extension to complete fact discovery (lf)
Blank 55 Filed: 12/7/1995, Entered: 12/12/1995 Transcript
TRANSCRIPT filed for dates of 12/5/95 at 3:00pm; Rtpr: L. Dibbs (lf)
Blank 54 Filed: 12/5/1995, Entered: 12/5/1995
Letter from Alexander J. Pires, Jr., Esq. to Hon. Sue L. Robinson providing background of discovery dispute to be discussed at teleconference. (pr)
Blank 53 Filed: 12/5/1995, Entered: 12/5/1995
Letter from B. Wilson Redfearn, Esq. to Hon. Sue L. Robinson re 12/5/95 teleconference and enclosing copy of letter to Mr. Pires which sets out position of McDonald's responding to the discovery dispute. (pr)
Blank -- Filed: 12/4/1995, Entered: 12/5/1995 SO ORDERED
So Ordered granting [52-1] stipulation ( signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson ) Notice to all parties. (lf)
Blank 52 Filed: 12/1/1995, Entered: 12/4/1995 Terminated:
STIPULATED AMENDMENT TO AMENDED COMPLAINT AND ANSWER (lf)
Blank 51 Filed: 11/29/1995, Entered: 12/1/1995 Subpoena
Subpoena for Mr. Stephen Meyers (lf)
Blank -- Filed: 11/29/1995, Entered: 11/29/1995
Settlement conference set on 10:00 2/1/96 (lf)
Blank -- Filed: 11/29/1995, Entered: 11/29/1995
Tele-conference set at 8:30 1/12/96 (lf)
Blank 50 Filed: 11/28/1995, Entered: 11/29/1995 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER, telecnf. scheduled for 1.12.96 at 9:30am; settlement cnf. scheduled for 2.1.96 at 10:00am; see order for details ( signed by Judge Mary P. Trostle ) copies to: cnsl (lf)
Blank -- Filed: 11/17/1995, Entered: 11/20/1995 SO ORDERED
So Ordered [47-1] proposed order ( signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson ) Notice to all parties. (lf)
Blank 49 Filed: 11/15/1995, Entered: 11/17/1995 Notice to Take Deposition
NOTICE by McDonald's Corp, Anthony Meoli, Jack Lyte of Rehob to take deposition of Arnold Fainman, Todd McCann, Steve Meyers on 11/30/95 starting at 10:00am (lf)
Blank 48 Filed: 11/14/1995, Entered: 11/17/1995 Subpoena
Subpoena for Records keeper for Washington Hospital Center for 11/15/95 at 10:00am (lf)
Blank 47 Filed: 11/11/1995, Entered: 11/17/1995 Proposed Order
Proposed Protective Order filed by McDonald's Corp (lf)
Blank 46 Filed: 11/11/1995, Entered: 11/17/1995 LetterCourt Filing
Letter dated 11/10/95 from B. Wilson Redfearn, Esq. to Judge Robinson; Re: filing proposed protective order (lf)
Blank 45 Filed: 11/8/1995, Entered: 11/13/1995 Certificate of Service
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by McDonald's Corp, Anthony Meoli, Jack Lyte of Rehob.; Re: response to pltf's 1st set of interrogs directed to McDOnald's Corp (lf)
Blank 44 Filed: 11/8/1995, Entered: 11/13/1995 Certificate of Service
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by McDonald's Corp, Anthony Meoli, Jack Lyte of Rehob.; Re: Response to pltf's interrogs (lf)
Blank 43 Filed: 11/8/1995, Entered: 11/13/1995 Certificate of Service
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by McDonald's Corp, Anthony Meoli, Jack Lyte of Rehob.; Re: Response to pltf's rqst for admission (lf)
Blank 42 Filed: 11/8/1995, Entered: 11/13/1995 Certificate of Service
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by McDonald's Corp, Anthony Meoli, Jack Lyte of Rehob.; Re: answers to pltf's 2nd set of interrogs (lf)
Blank 41 Filed: 11/8/1995, Entered: 11/13/1995 Certificate of Service
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by McDonald's Corp, Anthony Meoli, Jack Lyte of Rehob.; Re: response to pltf's rqst for production (lf)
Blank 40 Filed: 11/3/1995, Entered: 11/6/1995 Notice to Take Deposition
NOTICE by Bryce R. MacNaughton to take deposition of Nikki Scott on 11/9/95 at 2:30pm (lf)
Blank 39 Filed: 11/3/1995, Entered: 11/6/1995 Letter
Letter dated 10/31/95 from Alexander Pires, Jr., esq. to Clerk; Re: filing of notice of deposition (lf)
Blank 38 Filed: 11/2/1995, Entered: 11/3/1995 Notice to Take Deposition
NOTICE by McDonald's Corp, Anthony Meoli, Jack Lyte of Rehob to take deposition of Records Keeper for Washington Hospital Center on 11/15/95 at 10:00am (lf)
Blank 37 Filed: 10/31/1995, Entered: 11/1/1995 Subpoena
Subpoena for Records Keeper for Beebe Hospital (lf)
Blank 36 Filed: 10/31/1995, Entered: 11/1/1995 Notice to Take Deposition
NOTICE of continuing deposition by Anthony Meoli, Jack Lyte of Rehob of Bryce MacNaughton on 11/9/95 at 1:00pm (lf)
Blank 35 Filed: 10/13/1995, Entered: 10/16/1995 Certificate of Service
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by McDonald's Corp, Anthony Meoli, Jack Lyte of Rehoboth; Re: rqst for admissions (lf)
Blank 34 Filed: 10/11/1995, Entered: 10/12/1995 Subpoena
Subpoena for Pat Ewing; for 10/20/95 at 4:30pm; exec, on 9/30/95 (lf)
Blank 33 Filed: 10/4/1995, Entered: 10/6/1995 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER, telecnf. scheduled for 11/27/95 at 5:00pm ( signed by Judge Mary P. Trostle ) copies to: cnsl (lf)
Blank 32 Filed: 9/29/1995, Entered: 9/29/1995, Terminated: 9/29/1995 Stipulation
STIPULATION with proposed order extending time; re: discovery (lf)
Blank -- Filed: 9/29/1995, Entered: 9/29/1995
So Ordered granting [32-1] stipulation ( signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson ) Notice to all parties. (lf)
Blank 31 Filed: 9/25/1995, Entered: 9/26/1995 Notice to Take Deposition
NOTICE by McDonald's Corp, Anthony Meoli, Jack Lyte of Rehob to take deposition of Pat Ewing on 10/20/95 at 4:30pm (lf)
Blank 30 Filed: 9/21/1995, Entered: 9/22/1995 Certificate of Service
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bryce R. MacNaughton; Re: Second set of interrogs to defts (lf)
Blank 29 Filed: 9/21/1995, Entered: 9/22/1995 Certificate of Service
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bryce R. MacNaughton; Re: Pltf's response to defts' rqst for production (lf)
Blank 28 Filed: 9/21/1995, Entered: 9/22/1995 Certificate of Service
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bryce R. MacNaughton; Re: Pltf's response to defts' interrogs (lf)
Blank 27 Filed: 9/21/1995, Entered: 9/22/1995 Letter
Letter dated 9/19/95 from Alexander Pires, Jr., Esq. to Clerk; Re: Filing of notices of service (lf)
Blank 26 Filed: 9/19/1995, Entered: 9/20/1995 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER, telecnf. scheduled for 10/3/95 at 10:00am ( signed by Judge Mary P. Trostle ) copies to: cnsl (lf)
Blank -- Filed: 9/18/1995, Entered: 9/18/1995
Deadline updated; set Scheduling Order Deadlines: joining of parties, amended pleadings on 2/1/96 Discovery deadline on 3/30/96 Deadline for filing dispositive motions by 3/30/96 Pretrial conference by 10:00 5/31/96 Jury Trial Date Deadline 9:30 6/10/96 (lf)
Blank -- Filed: 9/15/1995, Entered: 9/18/1995 SO ORDERED
So Ordered [22-1] proposed order ( signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson ) Notice to all parties. (lf)
Blank 25 Filed: 9/13/1995, Entered: 9/15/1995 Certificate of Service
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bryce R. MacNaughton; Re: Production of documents and 1st set of request for admissions (lf)
Blank 24 Filed: 9/13/1995, Entered: 9/15/1995 Certificate of Service
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bryce R. MacNaughton; Re: interrogs (lf)
Blank 23 Filed: 9/12/1995, Entered: 9/13/1995 Subpoena
Subpoena for Record keeper for Traffix for 10/9/95 at 10:00am (lf)
Blank 18 Filed: 9/11/1995, Entered: 9/11/1995, Terminated: 9/11/1995 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
MOTION by Bryce R. MacNaughton with Proposed Order for Alexander Pires, Jr., Esq. to Appear Pro Hac Vice (lf)
Blank -- Filed: 9/11/1995, Entered: 9/11/1995
So Ordered granting [18-1] motion for Alexander Pires, Jr., Esq. to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson ) Notice to all parties. (lf)
Blank 22 Filed: 9/8/1995, Entered: 9/13/1995 Proposed Order
Revised Proposed scheduling Order filed by Bryce R. MacNaughton, McDonald's Corp, Anthony Meoli, Jack Lyte of Rehob (lf)
Blank 21 Filed: 9/8/1995, Entered: 9/13/1995 LetterCourt Filing
Letter dated 9/8/95 from B. Wilson Redfearn, Esq. to Judge Robinson; Re; Filing of revised proposed scheduling order (lf)
Blank 20 Filed: 9/7/1995, Entered: 9/13/1995 Proposed Order
Proposed Scheduling Order filed by Bryce R. MacNaughton, McDonald's Corp, Anthony Meoli, Jack Lyte of Rehob (lf)
Blank 19 Filed: 9/7/1995, Entered: 9/13/1995 LetterCourt Filing
Letter dated 9/7/95 from Wilson Redfearn, Esq to Judge Robinson; Re: filing of draft of proposed scheduling order for courts review (lf)
Blank 17 Filed: 9/6/1995, Entered: 9/11/1995 Subpoena
Subpoena for Record Keeper for Jani-King (lf)
Blank 16 Filed: 9/6/1995, Entered: 9/11/1995 Subpoena
Subpoena for Record Keeper for WJLA (lf)
Blank 15 Filed: 9/1/1995, Entered: 9/5/1995 Notice to Take Deposition
RENOTICE by McDonald's Corp, Anthony Meoli, Jack Lyte of Rehob to take deposition of Bryce MacNaughton, Leo Miller and Barbara Poretsky on 10/20/95 (lf)
Blank 14 Filed: 8/29/1995, Entered: 8/30/1995 LetterCourt Filing
Letter dated 8/28/95 from B. Wilson Redfearn, Esq. to Judge RObinson; Re: confirming rescheduling of scheduling cnf. (lf)
Blank 13 Filed: 8/25/1995, Entered: 8/29/1995 Notice to Take Deposition
NOTICE by McDonald's Corp, Anthony Meoli, Jack Lyte of Rehob to take deposition of Records Keeper for Jani-King on 10/9/95 (lf)
Blank 12 Filed: 8/25/1995, Entered: 8/29/1995 Notice to Take Deposition
NOTICE by McDonald's Corp, Anthony Meoli, Jack Lyte of Rehob to take deposition of Records Keeper for WJLA on 10/9/95 (lf)
Blank 11 Filed: 8/25/1995, Entered: 8/29/1995 Notice to Take Deposition
NOTICE by McDonald's Corp, Anthony Meoli, Jack Lyte of Rehob to take deposition of Bryce MacNaughton and Leo Miller on 10/9/95 (lf)
Blank -- Filed: 8/25/1995, Entered: 8/29/1995 Scheduling Conference
Scheduling conference set on 5:00 9/7/95 (lf)
Blank 10 Filed: 8/17/1995, Entered: 8/22/1995 Certificate of Service
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by McDonald's Corp, Anthony Meoli, Jack Lyte of Rehob; Re: Request for production (lf)
Blank 9 Filed: 8/9/1995, Entered: 8/9/1995 Court Filing
ORDER, scheduling cnf. scheduled for 9/5/95 at 5:00pm ( signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson ) copies to: cnsl (lf)
Blank -- Filed: 8/9/1995, Entered: 8/9/1995
Scheduling conference set on 5:00 9/5/95 (lf)
Blank 8 Filed: 7/26/1995, Entered: 7/27/1995 Certificate of Service
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by McDonald's Corp, Anthony Meoli, Jack Lyte of Rehob; Re: Request for production (lf)
Blank 7 Filed: 7/26/1995, Entered: 7/27/1995 Certificate of Service
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by McDonald's Corp, Anthony Meoli, Jack Lyte of Rehob; Re: Interrogs (lf)
Blank 6 Filed: 7/26/1995, Entered: 7/27/1995 Notice (Other)
NOTICE of Defts' response to Mandatory Discovery by McDonald's Corp, Anthony Meoli, Jack Lyte of Rehob (lf)
Blank 5 Filed: 7/26/1995, Entered: 7/27/1995 Answer to Amended Complaint
ANSWER by McDonald's Corp, Anthony Meoli, Jack Lyte of Rehob (Attorney B. Wilson Redfearn) to amended complaint (lf)
Blank 4 Filed: 7/18/1995, Entered: 7/19/1995 Amended Complaint
AMENDED COMPLAINT by Bryce R. MacNaughton , (Answer due 5/1/95 ) amending [1-1] complaint against Jack Lyte of Rehobeth,Inc. (lf)
Blank 3 Filed: 4/13/1995, Entered: 4/13/1995
RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to McDonald's Corp, Anthony Meoli 4/11/95 Answer due on 5/1/95 for Anthony Meoli (lf)
Blank 2 Filed: 4/12/1995, Entered: 4/12/1995 Court Filing
CASE assigned to Judge Sue L. Robinson . Notice to all parties. (lg)
Blank 1 Filed: 4/5/1995, Entered: 4/6/1995 Complaint
COMPLAINT filed; FILING FEE $ 120.00 RECEIPT # 108304 (nj)
Blank -- Filed: 4/5/1995, Entered: 4/6/1995 Summons Issued
SUMMONS(ES) issued for McDonald's Corp, Anthony Meoli (nj)
Blank -- Filed: 4/5/1995, Entered: 4/6/1995 Jury Demand
DEMAND for jury trial by Bryce R. MacNaughton (nj)

Statistics

This case has been viewed 83 times.

No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Need Password Help?