Ayers v. Barnhart
Delaware District Court, Case No. 1:05-cv-00129-SLR
District Judge Sue L. Robinson, presiding
docket://gov.uscourts.ded.1-05-cv-00129 (What is this?)

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
The right information can save you thousands of dollars.
Access comprehensive profiles on judges, firms, lawyers, and more with PlainSite Pro and Pro Se.
No Logo Paulette A. Ayers, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Grady & Hampton

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
John S. Grady +1 302 678 1265 +1 302 678 3544 jgrady@gradyhampton.com
v.
No Logo Jo Anne B. Barnhart, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
David F. Chermol +1 215 597 4184 davidchermol@hotmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Small Business Administration

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Joyce M.J. Gordon +1 215 597 2054 joyce.gordon@ssa.gov
Office Wilmington
Filed 3/4/2005
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 864 - Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Other
County Sussex
Terminated 10/16/2006
Origin 4
Reopened 10/3/2006
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, PaperDocuments
  Entries (30) Calendar Events Related (0) Tools Right End
Need legal research help? Let us know!
Blank -- Filed: 10/16/2006, Entered: 10/16/2006
CASE CLOSED (rld, )
Blank -- Filed: 10/16/2006, Entered: 10/16/2006
SO ORDERED, re [22] Stipulation for defendant to pay plaintiff's counsel, John S. Grady, the sum of $3,000.00 in attorney fees; filed by Jo Anne B. Barnhart. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 10/13/06. (rld, )
PACER 22 Filed: 10/6/2006, Entered: 10/6/2006
STIPULATION for Payment of Attorney Fees by Jo Anne B. Barnhart. (Gordon, Joyce)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 21 Filed: 10/3/2006, Entered: 10/3/2006, Terminated: 10/16/2006 Motion for Attorney Fees
MOTION for Attorney Fees - filed by Paulette A. Ayers. (Attachments: # (1) # (2) # (3))(Grady, John)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 20 Filed: 9/29/2006, Entered: 9/29/2006 Court Filing
ORDER denying [13] Motion for Summary Judgment, denying [17] Motion for Summary Judgment; case is remanded to deft. for further consideration . Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 9/29/06. (rld, )
Request RequestSpace
PACER 19 Filed: 9/29/2006, Entered: 9/29/2006 Court Filing
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 9/29/06. (rld, )
Request RequestSpace
Blank -- Filed: 9/29/2006, Entered: 9/29/2006
CASE CLOSED (rld, )
PACER 18 Filed: 12/22/2005, Entered: 12/22/2005
REPLY BRIEF re [13] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Paulette A. Ayers. (Attachments: # (1))(Grady, John)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 17 Filed: 12/1/2005, Entered: 12/1/2005, Terminated: 9/29/2006 Motion for Summary Judgment
First MOTION for Summary Judgment - filed by Jo Anne B. Barnhart. (Gordon, Joyce) Additional attachment(s) added on 12/1/2005 (fmt, ).
Request RequestSpace
Blank -- Filed: 12/1/2005, Entered: 12/1/2005
CORRECTING ENTRY: the initial attachment to D.I. 17 did not contain the electronic signature of counsel; the incorrect attachment has been deleted and the signed one is now attached (fmt, )
Blank -- Filed: 10/27/2005, Entered: 10/27/2005
SO ORDERED, re [16] First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Motion filed by Jo Anne B. Barnhart,, Set Briefing Schedule: Answering Brief due 12/2/2005. Reply brief due twenty days following the filing of the answering brief. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 10/26/05. (rld, )
PACER 16 Filed: 10/26/2005, Entered: 10/26/2005, Terminated: 10/27/2005 Motion for Extension of Time to File
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Motion - filed by Jo Anne B. Barnhart. (Chermol, David)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 15 Filed: 10/12/2005, Entered: 10/12/2005
DEFICIENCY NOTICE by the Court issued to John S. Grady, Esq. re [13] MOTION for Summary Judgment, [14] Opening Brief in Support; courtesy copies not received (fmt, )
Request RequestSpace
PACER 14 Filed: 9/29/2005, Entered: 9/29/2005
OPENING BRIEF in Support re [13] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Paulette A. Ayers.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 10/14/2005. (Grady, John) Additional attachment(s) added on 9/29/2005 (fmt, ).
Request RequestSpace
PACER 13 Filed: 9/29/2005, Entered: 9/29/2005, Terminated: 9/29/2006 Motion for Summary Judgment
MOTION for Summary Judgment - filed by Paulette A. Ayers. (Grady, John) Additional attachment(s) added on 9/29/2005 (fmt, ).
Request RequestSpace
Blank -- Filed: 9/29/2005, Entered: 9/29/2005
CORRECTING ENTRY: The certificate of service for the Motion for Summary Judgment and Opening Brief that was filed as a separate docket item has been attached to D.I. Nos. 13 and 14 and deleted as D.I. 15 (fmt, ) Modified on 9/29/2005 (fmt, ).
PACER 12 Filed: 8/1/2005, Entered: 8/1/2005 Court Filing
ORDER setting briefing schedule for summary jgm. motions:Opening Brief due 10/3/2005.Answering Brief due 11/3/2005.Reply Brief due 11/17/2005. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 8/1/05. (rld, )
Request RequestSpace
Blank 11 Filed: 7/26/2005, Entered: 7/28/2005 Transcript
TRANSCRIPT of the entire proceedings relating to this case (Transcript on file in Clerk's Office) (fmt, )
PACER 10 Filed: 7/26/2005, Entered: 7/26/2005
NOTICE of filing the following document(s) in paper format: Transcript. Original document(s) on file in Clerk's Office. Notice filed by David F. Chermol on behalf of Jo Anne B. Barnhart (Chermol, David)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 9 Filed: 7/15/2005, Entered: 7/15/2005
ANSWER to Complaint by Jo Anne B. Barnhart.(Chermol, David)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 8 Filed: 5/19/2005, Entered: 5/19/2005
Return of Service Executed Jo Anne B. Barnhart (United States Attorney) served on 5/17/2005, answer due 7/18/2005. (fmt, )
Request RequestSpace
PACER 7 Filed: 5/3/2005, Entered: 5/3/2005
USM 285 Returned Executed As to Attorney General of the U.S. Dept. of Justice; Washington, DC on 5/2/05 (fmt, )
Request RequestSpace
PACER 6 Filed: 5/3/2005, Entered: 5/3/2005
USM 285 Returned Executed Jo Anne B. Barnhart (Secretary of Health & Human Services, Washington, DC) served on 4/30/2005, answer due 6/30/2005. (fmt, )
Request RequestSpace
Blank -- Filed: 4/21/2005, Entered: 4/21/2005
Remark: Exit to USMS for service: USM 285 forms for United States Atty, Atty General of the U.S. Dept. of Justice and Secretary of Health and Human Services with copies of the complaint, the Order signed 4/13/05 and Mag. Consent form (fmt, )
PACER 5 Filed: 4/18/2005, Entered: 4/20/2005 Letter
Letter to Clerk from J. Grady, Esq. enclosing 3 forms 285 and 3 copies of the complaint.(fmt, )
Request RequestSpace
PACER 4 Filed: 4/14/2005, Entered: 4/14/2005 Court Filing
ORDER, the application to proceed without prepayment of fees is GRANTED; plaintiff shall return to Clerk original USM 285 form(s) for the deft., the United States Atty for the District of DE, and the Atty General of the United States.; pltf. must also provide the Court with three copies of the complaint (D.I. 2) for service; Upon receipt, the U.S. Marshal shall serve process as directed by plaintiff. (Copy to cnsl). Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 4/13/05. (fmt, ) (Entered: 04/14/2005)
Request RequestSpace
Blank -- Filed: 3/16/2005, Entered: 3/16/2005
Case assigned to Judge Sue L. Robinson. Please include the initials of the Judge (SLR) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb, )
PACER 3 Filed: 3/4/2005, Entered: 3/7/2005 Letter
Letter to Clerk from John S. Grady regarding Enclosed is IFP, Civil Cover sheet and Complaint to file. (els, )
Request RequestSpace
PACER 2 Filed: 3/4/2005, Entered: 3/7/2005 Complaint
COMPLAINT filed against Jo Anne B. Barnhart - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. - filed by Paulette A. Ayers.(els, )
Request RequestSpace
PACER 1 Filed: 3/4/2005, Entered: 3/7/2005 Terminated:
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis w/Proposed Order to Proceed in Forma Pauperis - filed by Paulette A. Ayers. (els, )
Request RequestSpace

Statistics

This case has been viewed 53 times.

No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Need Password Help?