Sun Life Assurance v. Conroy, et al
Rhode Island District Court, Case No. 1:05-cv-00172-S-DLM
District Judge William E Smith, presiding
docket://gov.uscourts.rid.1-05-cv-00172-S (What is this?)

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
This docket can only tell you so much. Get the rest.
Access comprehensive profiles on judges, firms, lawyers, and more with PlainSite Pro and Pro Se.
No Logo Sun Life Assurance Company Of Canada, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Richard F. Kirby +2725 272 272 5300 +3317 331 331 7454

Toggle Switch Represented by Kaye Scholer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Joan O. Vorster +1 508 791 8500 +1 508 791 8502 jovorster@mirickoconnell.com
v.
No Logo A. Michael Marino, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by The Lustigman Firm, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Stephen J. Angell +2760 276 276 0066 +2760 276 276 0022 sangell@angellfirm.com
No Logo Anthony J. Robbio, Jr., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by The Lustigman Firm, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Stephen J. Angell +2760 276 276 0066 +2760 276 276 0022 sangell@angellfirm.com
No Logo Carol Kimberly Griggs, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by zomolo.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Edward L. Gerstein +6352 635 635 2282 +6351 635 635 1612 elg@zomolo.com
No Logo Frederick Von Fredrek, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by The Lustigman Firm, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Stephen J. Angell +2760 276 276 0066 +2760 276 276 0022 sangell@angellfirm.com
No Logo H. Locke MacDonald, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Edward R. DiPippo +9433 943 943 3110 +9438 943 943 8189 erdlaw@cox.net
No Logo Ida Conroy, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by acohenlaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Avram N. Cohen +5211 521 521 1525 +5216 521 521 6969 avram@acohenlaw.com
No Logo Jeffrey Luiz, Defendant
No Logo paul Gonya, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by The Lustigman Firm, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Stephen J. Angell +2760 276 276 0066 +2760 276 276 0022 sangell@angellfirm.com
No Logo Paul S. Davenport, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by angellfirm.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Stephen J. Angell +2760 276 276 0066 +2760 276 276 0022 sangell@angellfirm.com
No Logo Robert R. Nadeau, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by The Lustigman Firm, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Stephen J. Angell +2760 276 276 0066 +2760 276 276 0022 sangell@angellfirm.com
Office Providence
Filed 4/25/2005
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 110 - Contract: Insurance
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Judgment - Judgment on Consent
County Providence
Terminated 5/31/2006
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (98) Calendar Events Related (0) Tools Right End
Blank 83 Filed: 6/9/2006, Entered: 6/9/2006 Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 1/6/06 before Judge Magistrate Judge David Martin. Court Reporter: Joseph Fontes. (Saucier, Martha)
PDF 82 Filed: 5/31/2006, Entered: 5/31/2006 Court Filing
CONSENT JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge William E Smith on 5/30/06. (faxed to counsel of record)(Mercurio, Alba-Sue)
PDF 81 Filed: 5/30/2006, Entered: 5/30/2006 Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT REQUEST for proceedings held on 1/6/06 before Magistrate Judge David Martin. Forwarded original tape, request and docket sheet to Joseph Fontes (Saucier, Martha)
PDF 80 Filed: 5/26/2006, Entered: 5/26/2006 Court Filing
ORDER granting [77] Motion for Disbursement of Funds . Signed by Magistrate Judge David L. Martin on 5/25/06. Forwarded to counsel (Saucier, Martha)
PDF 79 Filed: 5/26/2006, Entered: 5/26/2006 Court Filing
ORDER granting [78] Motion for Leave to File an Amendment to its Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings and Attorneys Fees . Signed by Magistrate Judge David L. Martin on 5/25/06. Forwarded to all counsel (Saucier, Martha)
Blank -- Filed: 5/25/2006, Entered: 5/25/2006
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge David L. Martin : Telephone Conference held on 5/25/2006. (Theall, Jeannine)
Blank -- Filed: 5/24/2006, Entered: 5/24/2006
[78] MOTION to Amend/Correct [62] MOTION for Attorney Fees MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings, [77] MOTION for Disbursement of Funds REFERRED to MJ Martin. (Mercurio, Alba-Sue)
PDF 78 Filed: 5/23/2006, Entered: 5/24/2006, Terminated: 5/26/2006 Terminated:
MOTION for Leave to File an Amendment to its [62] MOTION for Attorney Fees MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Sun Life Assurance co. of Canada. Responses due by 6/9/2006 (Baldinelli, Doreen) Additional attachment(s) added on 5/31/2006 (Baldinelli, Doreen).
PDF 77 Filed: 5/23/2006, Entered: 5/24/2006, Terminated: 5/26/2006 Terminated:
JOINT MOTION the Withdrawal and Disbursement of Funds from the Registry of Court WITH SUPPORTING MEMO by Sun Life Assurance co. of Canada, Carol Kimberly Griggs. Responses due by 6/9/2006 (Attachments: # (1) Order)(Baldinelli, Doreen)
PDF 76 Filed: 5/5/2006, Entered: 5/5/2006 Court Filing
ORDER granting [75] Motion for Extension of Time To Comply with Court's Notice of Conversion . Signed by Magistrate Judge David L. Martin on 5/5/06. Forwarded to counsel (Saucier, Martha)
PDF 75 Filed: 5/3/2006, Entered: 5/3/2006, Terminated: 5/5/2006 Motion for Extension of Time
JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time to Comply with the Court's Notice of Conversion, by Sun Life Assurance Co. of Canada, Carol Kimberly Griggs. Responses due by 5/22/2006 (Duhamel, John)
Blank -- Filed: 5/3/2006, Entered: 5/3/2006
[75] MOTION for Extension of Time to Comply with the Court's Notice of Conversion REFERRED to MJ Martin. (Mercurio, Alba-Sue)
PDF 74 Filed: 4/24/2006, Entered: 4/24/2006
DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of Defendant, Kimberly Griggs against Defendants, Anthony J. Robbio, Jr, Frederick Von Fredrek, Paul S. Davenport, Paul Gonya, Jeffrey Luiz, A. Michael Marino, and Robert R. Nadeau. Signed by Deputy Clerk: on 4/24/06. (faxed to counsel of record)(Mercurio, Alba-Sue)
PDF 73 Filed: 4/21/2006, Entered: 4/24/2006 Order Adopting Report and RecommendationsCourt Filing
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re [69] Report and Recommendations, GRANTING [67] Motion for Entry of Default filed by Carol Kimberly Griggs, . Signed by Judge William E Smith on 4/21/06. (faxed to counsel of record)(Mercurio, Alba-Sue)
PDF 72 Filed: 4/14/2006, Entered: 4/17/2006 Notice (Other)
NOTICE of Withdrawal of Attorney Richard Kirby, Esquire by Sun Life Assurance co. of Canada (Baldinelli, Doreen)
PDF 71 Filed: 4/3/2006, Entered: 4/3/2006 Court Filing
ORDER granting [70] Motion for Extension of Time to Comply with Court's Notice of Conversion up to and including 4/17/06 . Signed by Magistrate Judge David L. Martin on 4/3/06. Forwarded to all counsel of record (Saucier, Martha)
Blank -- Filed: 3/31/2006, Entered: 3/31/2006
[70] MOTION for Extension of Time for an Extension of Time to Comply with the Court's Notice of Conversion REFERRED to MJ Martin. (Mercurio, Alba-Sue)
PDF 70 Filed: 3/30/2006, Entered: 3/30/2006, Terminated: 4/3/2006 Motion for Extension of Time
JOINT MOTION for an Extension of Time by thirty (30)days from April 3, 2006 and April 17, 2006 to May 3, 2006 and May 17, 2006 to Comply with the Court's Notice of Conversion by Sun Life Assurance co. of Canada, Carol Kimberly Griggs. Responses due by 4/17/2006 (Baldinelli, Doreen)
PDF 69 Filed: 3/16/2006, Entered: 3/16/2006, Terminated: 4/21/2006 Report and RecommendationsCourt Filing
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re [67] MOTION for Entry of Default Judgment filed by Carol Kimberly Griggs, recommending that the motion be granted Objections to R&R due by 3/30/2006. Signed by Magistrate Judge David L. Martin on 3/16/05. Forwarded to all counsel of record(Saucier, Martha) Modified on 3/27/2006 (Saucier, Martha). Added Text
Blank -- Filed: 3/6/2006, Entered: 3/6/2006
[67] MOTION for Entry of DefaultJudgment REFERRED to MJ Martin. (Mercurio, Alba-Sue)
Blank -- Filed: 3/3/2006, Entered: 3/3/2006
Motion Forwarded to Chambers [67] MOTION for Entry of Default FORWARDED to Chambers of Judge Smith. (Mercurio, Alba-Sue)
PDF 68 Filed: 2/24/2006, Entered: 2/24/2006 Court Filing
NOTICE OF CONVERSION re [62] MOTION for Attorney Fees MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Sun Life Assurance co. of Canada will now be treated as a Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge David L. Martin on 2/24/06. Sent to counsel.(Theall, Jeannine)
Blank -- Filed: 2/22/2006, Entered: 2/22/2006
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge David L. Martin : Motion Hearing held on 2/22/2006 re [62] MOTION for Attorney Fees MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Sun Life Assurance co. of Canada,. Joan Vorster for plaintiff; Avram Cohen for defendant Conroy; Edward Gerstein for defendant Griggs; Edward Dipippo for defendant MacDonald. Attorneys argue motions; Court takes matter under advisement; Court to issue a report and recommendation (Saucier, Martha)
PDF 67 Filed: 2/14/2006, Entered: 2/15/2006 Terminated:
MOTION for Entry of Default Judgments WITH SUPPORTING MEMO by Carol Kimberly Griggs. Responses due by 3/3/2006 (Attachments: # (1) Letter dated June 28, 2005)(Baldinelli, Doreen)
PDF 66 Filed: 2/14/2006, Entered: 2/14/2006
REPLY to [64] Response in Opposition to Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings and for Attorneys' Fees; filed by Sun Life Assurance Co. of Canada. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1: Letters dated 2/11/05, 2/15/05)(Duhamel, John)
Blank -- Filed: 2/8/2006, Entered: 2/8/2006
Set/Reset Deadlines as to [62] MOTION for Attorney Fees MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings. Motion Hearing set for 2/22/2006 10:00 AM in Courtroom B before Magistrate Judge David L. Martin. (Saucier, Martha)
PDF 65 Filed: 2/1/2006, Entered: 2/2/2006 Stipulation
STIPULATION Concerning Distribution of Annuity Proceeds. Forwarded to all counsel of record (Saucier, Martha)
Blank -- Filed: 1/31/2006, Entered: 1/31/2006
[62] MOTION for Attorney Fees MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings REFERRED to MJ Martin. (Mercurio, Alba-Sue)
PDF 64 Filed: 1/27/2006, Entered: 1/27/2006
RESPONSE in Opposition re [62] MOTION for Attorney Fees MOTION for Judgment on the PleadingsWITH SUPPORTING MEMO, filed by Carol Kimberly Griggs (Baldinelli, Doreen)
Blank -- Filed: 1/27/2006, Entered: 1/27/2006
Motion Forwarded to Chambers [62] MOTION for Attorney Fees MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings FORWARDED to Chambers of Judge Smith. (Mercurio, Alba-Sue)
PDF 63 Filed: 1/13/2006, Entered: 1/18/2006 Affidavit
AFFIDAVIT of Joan Vorster, Esquire re [62] MOTION for Attorney Fees MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings. (Attachments: # (1) Services)(Baldinelli, Doreen)
PDF 62 Filed: 1/13/2006, Entered: 1/18/2006 Terminated:
MOTION for Attorney Fees, MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings WITH SUPPORTING MEMO by Sun Life Assurance co. of Canada. Responses due by 1/30/2006 Responses due by 1/30/2006 (Baldinelli, Doreen)
PDF 61 Filed: 1/12/2006, Entered: 1/12/2006 Court Filing
ORDER granting [21] Motion to Deposit Funds, denying [41] Motion to Vacate, denying [44] Motion to Vacate, denying [47] Motion to Vacate, denying [50] Motion to Vacate, denying [53] Motion to Vacate, denying [56] Motion to Vacate. Signed by Magistrate Judge David L. Martin on 1/12/06. Sent to counsel. (Theall, Jeannine)
Blank -- Filed: 1/6/2006, Entered: 1/6/2006
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge David L. Martin : Motion Hearing held on 1/6/2006 re [56] MOTION to Vacate [37] Clerk's Entry of Default filed by paul Gonya,, [47] MOTION to Vacate [33] Clerk's Entry of Default filed by Anthony J. Robbio, Jr., [21] MOTION to Deposit Funds filed by Sun Life Assurance co. of Canada,, [50] MOTION to Vacate [34] Clerk's Entry of Default filed by Robert R. Nadeau,, [44] MOTION to Vacate [32] Clerk's Entry of Default filed by Frederick Von Fredrek,, [41] MOTION to Vacate [31] Clerk's Entry of Default filed by Paul S. Davenport,, [53] MOTION to Vacate [35] Clerk's Entry of Default filed by A. Michael Marino,. Joan Vorster and Richard Kirby for plaintiff; Stephen Angell for defendants Marino, VonFredrick, Robbio, Nadeau, Gonya, Davenport; Avram Cohen for defendant Conroy, Edward DiPippo for defendant MacDonald; Edward Gerstein for defendant Griggs. Plaintiff argues motion to deposit proceeds into Court registry; Attorney Gerstein states objection to the motion to deposit proceeds; Attorney Angell and Attorney Gerstein argue motions to vacate default; Plaintiff has no objection to the motions to vacate. Court takes matter under advisement; Court to issue an order. (Saucier, Martha)
Blank -- Filed: 12/12/2005, Entered: 12/12/2005
Set/Reset Deadlines as to [53] MOTION to Vacate [35] Clerk's Entry of Default, [41] MOTION to Vacate [31] Clerk's Entry of Default, [47] MOTION to Vacate [33] Clerk's Entry of Default, [56] MOTION to Vacate [37] Clerk's Entry of Default, [44] MOTION to Vacate [32] Clerk's Entry of Default, [21] MOTION to Deposit Funds, [50] MOTION to Vacate [34] Clerk's Entry of Default. Motion Hearing set for 1/6/2006 10:00 AM in Courtroom B before Magistrate Judge David L. Martin. (Saucier, Martha)
Blank -- Filed: 12/8/2005, Entered: 12/8/2005
[56] MOTION to Vacate [37] Clerk's Entry of Default, [47] MOTION to Vacate [33] Clerk's Entry of Default, [21] MOTION to Deposit Funds, [50] MOTION to Vacate [34] Clerk's Entry of Default, [44] MOTION to Vacate [32] Clerk's Entry of Default, [41] MOTION to Vacate [31] Clerk's Entry of Default, [53] MOTION to Vacate [35] Clerk's Entry of Default REFERRED to MJ Martin. (Mercurio, Alba-Sue)
PDF 60 Filed: 12/5/2005, Entered: 12/5/2005 Court Filing
ORDER OF RECUSAL - Judge Mary M Lisi recused - Case reassigned to Judge William E Smith for all further proceedings- Signed by Judge Mary M Lisi on 12/5/05; faxed to counsel of record(Barletta, Barbara)
PDF 59 Filed: 12/2/2005, Entered: 12/2/2005
PLAINTIFF'S REPLY to deft Griggs' [39] Response to Motion to Deposit Proceeds ; filed by Sun Life Assurance Co. of Canada. (Duhamel, John)
PDF 58 Filed: 11/30/2005, Entered: 11/30/2005
RESPONSE in Opposition to [47] MOTION to Vacate [33] Clerk's Entry of Default, [50] MOTION to Vacate [34] Clerk's Entry of Default, [41] MOTION to Vacate [31] Clerk's Entry of Default, [56] MOTION to Vacate [37] Clerk's Entry of Default, [44] MOTION to Vacate [32] Clerk's Entry of Default, [53] MOTION to Vacate [35] Clerk's Entry of Default,with Supporting Memo filed by Carol Kimberly Griggs. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A: Affidavit of Alfred Factor, Esq.; # (2) Exhibit B: Letter dated 8/8/05 -- Joan Vorster to USDC-RI; # (3) Exhibit C: copy of Motion to Withdraw)(Duhamel, John)
PDF 57 Filed: 11/16/2005, Entered: 11/16/2005
ANSWER to Complaint by Paul Gonya.(Duhamel, John)
PDF 56 Filed: 11/16/2005, Entered: 11/16/2005, Terminated: 1/12/2006 Motion to Vacate
MOTION to Vacate [37] Clerk's Entry of Default, with Supporting Memo by Paul Gonya. Responses due by 11/30/2005 (Duhamel, John)
PDF 55 Filed: 11/16/2005, Entered: 11/16/2005
NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen J. Angell on behalf of Paul Gonya. (Duhamel, John)
PDF 54 Filed: 11/16/2005, Entered: 11/16/2005
ANSWER to Complaint by A. Michael Marino.(Duhamel, John)
PDF 53 Filed: 11/16/2005, Entered: 11/16/2005, Terminated: 1/12/2006 Motion to Vacate
MOTION to Vacate [35] Clerk's Entry of Default, with Supporting Memo by A. Michael Marino. Responses due by 11/30/2005 (Duhamel, John)
PDF 52 Filed: 11/16/2005, Entered: 11/16/2005
NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen J. Angell on behalf of A. Michael Marino. (Duhamel, John)
PDF 51 Filed: 11/16/2005, Entered: 11/16/2005
ANSWER to Complaint by Robert R. Nadeau.(Duhamel, John)
PDF 50 Filed: 11/16/2005, Entered: 11/16/2005, Terminated: 1/12/2006 Motion to Vacate
MOTION to Vacate [34] Clerk's Entry of Default, with Supporting Memo by Robert R. Nadeau. Responses due by 11/30/2005 (Duhamel, John)
PDF 49 Filed: 11/16/2005, Entered: 11/16/2005
NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen J. Angell on behalf of Robert R. Nadeau. (Duhamel, John)
PDF 48 Filed: 11/16/2005, Entered: 11/16/2005
ANSWER to Complaint by Anthony J. Robbio, Jr.(Duhamel, John)
PDF 47 Filed: 11/16/2005, Entered: 11/16/2005, Terminated: 1/12/2006 Motion to Vacate
MOTION to Vacate [33] Clerk's Entry of Default, with Supporting Memo by Anthony J. Robbio, Jr. Responses due by 11/30/2005 (Duhamel, John)
PDF 46 Filed: 11/16/2005, Entered: 11/16/2005
NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen J. Angell on behalf of Anthony J. Robbio, Jr. (Duhamel, John)
PDF 45 Filed: 11/16/2005, Entered: 11/16/2005
ANSWER to Complaint by Frederick Von Frederek.(Duhamel, John)
PDF 44 Filed: 11/16/2005, Entered: 11/16/2005, Terminated: 1/12/2006 Motion to Vacate
MOTION to Vacate [32] Clerk's Entry of Default, with Supporting Memo by Frederick Von Frederek. Responses due by 11/30/2005 (Duhamel, John)
PDF 43 Filed: 11/16/2005, Entered: 11/16/2005
NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen J. Angell on behalf of Frederick Von Frederek. (Duhamel, John)
PDF 42 Filed: 11/16/2005, Entered: 11/16/2005
ANSWER to Complaint by Paul S. Davenport.(Duhamel, John)
PDF 41 Filed: 11/16/2005, Entered: 11/16/2005, Terminated: 1/12/2006 Motion to Vacate
MOTION to Vacate [31] Clerk's Entry of Default, with Supporting Memo by Paul S. Davenport. Responses due by 11/30/2005 (Duhamel, John)
PDF 40 Filed: 11/16/2005, Entered: 11/16/2005
NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen J. Angell on behalf of Paul S. Davenport. (Duhamel, John)
Blank -- Filed: 11/7/2005, Entered: 11/7/2005
Motions Forwarded to Chambers: [21] MOTION to Deposit Funds (Barletta, Barbara)
PDF 39 Filed: 11/4/2005, Entered: 11/7/2005 Response to Motion
RESPONSE to Motion re [21] MOTION to Deposit Funds, with supporting Memo filed by Carol Kimberly Griggs. (Duhamel, John)
PDF 38 Filed: 11/1/2005, Entered: 11/1/2005 Court Filing
STIPULATION extending time to 11/4/05 to respond to [21] MOTION to Deposit Funds by Carol Kimberly Griggs - signed by Judge Mary M. Lisi on 11/1/05; forwarded to counsel of record (Barletta, Barbara)
PDF 37 Filed: 10/24/2005, Entered: 10/24/2005
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Paul Gonya -- forwarded to counsel (Duhamel, John)
PDF 36 Filed: 10/24/2005, Entered: 10/24/2005
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Jeffrey Luiz -- forwarded to counsel (Duhamel, John)
PDF 35 Filed: 10/24/2005, Entered: 10/24/2005
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to A. Michael Marino -- forwarded to counsel (Duhamel, John)
PDF 34 Filed: 10/24/2005, Entered: 10/24/2005
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Robert R. Nadeau -- forwarded to counsel (Duhamel, John)
PDF 33 Filed: 10/24/2005, Entered: 10/24/2005
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Anthony J. Robbio, Jr. -- forwarded to counsel (Duhamel, John)
PDF 32 Filed: 10/24/2005, Entered: 10/24/2005
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Frederick Von Fredrek -- forwarded to counsel (Duhamel, John)
PDF 31 Filed: 10/24/2005, Entered: 10/24/2005
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Paul S. Davenport -- forwarded to counsel (Duhamel, John)
PDF 30 Filed: 10/24/2005, Entered: 10/24/2005, Terminated: 10/24/2005 Motion for Entry of Default
MOTION for Entry of Default as to Paul Gonya, by Sun Life Assurance Co. of Canada. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit of Joan O. Vorster)(Duhamel, John)
PDF 29 Filed: 10/24/2005, Entered: 10/24/2005, Terminated: 10/24/2005 Motion for Entry of Default
MOTION for Entry of Default as to Jeffrey Luiz, by Sun Life Assurance Co. of Canada. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit of Joan O. Vorster)(Duhamel, John)
PDF 28 Filed: 10/24/2005, Entered: 10/24/2005, Terminated: 10/24/2005 Motion for Entry of Default
MOTION for Entry of Default as to A. Michael Marino, by Sun Life Assurance Co. of Canada. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit of Joan O. Vorster)(Duhamel, John)
PDF 27 Filed: 10/24/2005, Entered: 10/24/2005, Terminated: 10/24/2005 Motion for Entry of Default
MOTION for Entry of Default as to Robert R. Nadeau, by Sun Life Assurance Co. of Canada. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit of Joan O. Vorster)(Duhamel, John)
PDF 26 Filed: 10/24/2005, Entered: 10/24/2005, Terminated: 10/24/2005 Motion for Entry of Default
MOTION for Entry of Default as to Anthony J. Robbio, Jr., by Sun Life Assurance Co. of Canada. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit of Joan O. Vorster)(Duhamel, John)
PDF 25 Filed: 10/24/2005, Entered: 10/24/2005, Terminated: 10/24/2005 Motion for Entry of Default
MOTION for Entry of Default as to Frederick Von Fredrek by Sun Life Assurance Co. of Canada. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit of Joan O. Vorster)(Duhamel, John)
PDF 24 Filed: 10/24/2005, Entered: 10/24/2005, Terminated: 10/24/2005 Motion for Entry of Default
MOTION for Entry of Default as to Paul S. Davenport by Sun Life Assurance Co. of Canada. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit of Joan O. Vorster)(Duhamel, John)
PDF 23 Filed: 10/19/2005, Entered: 10/21/2005 StipulationCourt Filing
STIPULATION extending time to 10/28/05 for Carol Kennedy Griggs to reply to [21] MOTION to Deposit Funds - signed by Judge Mary M. Lisi on 10/19/05 - forwarded to counsel of record (Barletta, Barbara)
PDF 22 Filed: 10/18/2005, Entered: 10/18/2005 Court Filing
ORDER granting [20] Motion for Extension of Time to respond to [21] MOTION to Deposit Funds; Signed by Judge Mary M Lisi on 10/17/05 - forwarded to counsel of record (Barletta, Barbara)
PDF 21 Filed: 10/14/2005, Entered: 10/14/2005, Terminated: 1/12/2006 Motion to Deposit Funds
MOTION to Deposit Proceeds into Court,with attached Memo by Sun Life Assurance Co. of Canada. Responses due by 10/28/2005 (Duhamel, John)
PDF 20 Filed: 10/14/2005, Entered: 10/14/2005, Terminated: 10/18/2005 Motion for Extension of Time
MOTION for Extension of Time to file a response to Pltf's Motion to Deposit Proceeds into Court, by Carol Kimberly Griggs. Responses due by 10/28/2005 (Duhamel, John)
PDF 19 Filed: 10/13/2005, Entered: 10/13/2005 Court Filing
ORDER RETURNING DOCUMENT: Returned Document 10/13/05 as to Edward Gerstein, Esq... Signed by Magistrate Judge David L. Martin on 1013/05. (Attachments: # (1) Stipulation)(Saucier, Martha)
PDF 18 Filed: 9/6/2005, Entered: 9/7/2005 Notice (Other)
NOTICE of PENDENCY of Other Actions or Proceedings Pursuant to Local Rule 31, by Carol Kimberly Griggs (Duhamel, John)
PDF 17 Filed: 9/6/2005, Entered: 9/7/2005 Notice of Appearance
NOTICE of Appearance by Edward L. Gerstein on behalf of Carol Kimberly Griggs (Duhamel, John)
PDF 16 Filed: 9/6/2005, Entered: 9/7/2005 Answer to Complaint
ANSWER to Complaint by Carol Kimberly Griggs.(Duhamel, John)
PDF 15 Filed: 9/1/2005, Entered: 9/1/2005
ANSWER to Complaint by Ida Conroy.(Duhamel, John)
PDF 14 Filed: 9/1/2005, Entered: 9/1/2005
NOTICE of Appearance by Avram N. Cohen on behalf of Ida Conroy. (Duhamel, John)
PDF 13 Filed: 8/11/2005, Entered: 8/11/2005
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Sun Life Assurance co. of Canada. Robert R. Nadeau waiver sent on 5/11/2005, answer due 7/11/2005. (Duhamel, John)
PDF 12 Filed: 8/11/2005, Entered: 8/11/2005
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Sun Life Assurance co. of Canada. A. Michael Marino waiver sent on 5/27/2005, answer due 7/26/2005. (Duhamel, John)
PDF 11 Filed: 8/11/2005, Entered: 8/11/2005
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Sun Life Assurance co. of Canada. Jeffrey Luiz waiver sent on 5/11/2005, answer due 7/11/2005. (Duhamel, John)
PDF 10 Filed: 8/11/2005, Entered: 8/11/2005
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Sun Life Assurance co. of Canada. paul Gonya waiver sent on 5/11/2005, answer due 7/11/2005. (Duhamel, John)
PDF 9 Filed: 8/11/2005, Entered: 8/11/2005
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Sun Life Assurance co. of Canada. Paul S. Davenport waiver sent on 5/11/2005, answer due 7/11/2005. (Duhamel, John)
PDF 8 Filed: 8/11/2005, Entered: 8/11/2005
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Sun Life Assurance co. of Canada. Ida Conroy waiver sent on 5/27/2005, answer due 7/26/2005. (Duhamel, John)
PDF 7 Filed: 8/11/2005, Entered: 8/11/2005
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Sun Life Assurance co. of Canada. H. Locke MacDonald waiver sent on 5/11/2005, answer due 7/11/2005. (Duhamel, John)
PDF 6 Filed: 8/11/2005, Entered: 8/11/2005
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Sun Life Assurance co. of Canada. Anthony J. Robbio, Jr waiver sent on 5/11/2005, answer due 7/11/2005. (Duhamel, John)
PDF 5 Filed: 8/11/2005, Entered: 8/11/2005
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sun Life Assurance Co. of Canada. Frederick Von Fredrek served on 7/25/2005, answer due 8/15/2005. (Duhamel, John)
PDF 4 Filed: 8/11/2005, Entered: 8/11/2005
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sun Life Assurance Co. of Canada. Carol Kimberly Griggs served on 7/25/2005, answer due 8/15/2005. (Duhamel, John)
PDF 3 Filed: 6/29/2005, Entered: 6/29/2005
ANSWER to Complaint by H. Locke MacDonald.(Duhamel, John)
PDF 2 Filed: 6/29/2005, Entered: 6/29/2005
NOTICE of Appearance by Edward R. DiPippo on behalf of H. Locke MacDonald (Duhamel, John)
PDF 1 Filed: 4/25/2005, Entered: 4/25/2005
COMPLAINT filed; FILING FEE $ 250.00 RECEIPT # 60084 (McCabe, F)
Blank -- Filed: 4/25/2005, Entered: 4/25/2005
10 SUMMONS(ES) issued (McCabe, F)

Statistics

This case has been viewed 189 times.

No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Need Password Help?