U.S. - EEOC v. GFB Enterprises LLC
Florida Southern District Court, Case No. 1:01-cv-04035
District Judge Jose E. Martinez, presiding
docket://gov.uscourts.flsd.1-01-cv-04035 (What is this?)

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
The right information can save you thousands of dollars.
Access comprehensive profiles on judges, firms, lawyers, and more with PlainSite Pro and Pro Se.
United States Equal Employment Opportunity Commission, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Equal Employment Opportunity Commission

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Kenneth Lawrence Gillespie +1 305 530 6010 +5364 536 536 4494 kenneth.gillespie@eeoc.gov
Maria Teresa Rodriguez +1 305 530 6010 +5364 536 536 4494
No Logo G.F.B. Enterprises, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Akerman Senterfitt LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
James Scott Bramnick +1 305 982 5505 +1 305 349 4759 james.bramnick@akerman.com
Carmen Sirkin Johnson +1 305 982 5577 +1 305 349 4801 carmen.johnson@jmfamily.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Epstein Becker & Green, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Christi Ann Pierce +1 404 923 9000 +9239 923 923 9099

Toggle Switch Represented by Goldsmith & Atlas, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Glen Reid Goldsmith +1 305 670 5500 +1 305 670 5596 ggoldsmith@goldsmithpa.com

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Steven D. Grimberg +1 202 514 5892 +1 202 514 0961 Steven.D.Grimberg@usdoj.gov
No Logo Avraham Mardo, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Robert E. Weisberg +1 305 666 6095 +1 305 666 6296 robert.weisberg@eeoc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by City of Miami Beach

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Kimberly Anne McCoy +1 305 673 7002 kimberlymccoy@miamibeachfl.gov
No Logo Felix Quevedo, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Robert E. Weisberg +1 305 666 6095 +1 305 666 6296 robert.weisberg@eeoc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by City of Miami Beach

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Kimberly Anne McCoy +1 305 673 7002 kimberlymccoy@miamibeachfl.gov
No Logo Humfredo Perez, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Robert E. Weisberg +1 305 666 6095 +1 305 666 6296 robert.weisberg@eeoc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by City of Miami Beach

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Kimberly Anne McCoy +1 305 673 7002 kimberlymccoy@miamibeachfl.gov
No Logo Jesus Molina, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Robert E. Weisberg +1 305 666 6095 +1 305 666 6296 robert.weisberg@eeoc.gov
No Logo Susan Weinberg, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Robert E. Weisberg +1 305 666 6095 +1 305 666 6296 robert.weisberg@eeoc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by City of Miami Beach

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Kimberly Anne McCoy +1 305 673 7002 kimberlymccoy@miamibeachfl.gov
No Logo G.F.B. Enterprises, LLC, Intervenor-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Akerman Senterfitt LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
James Scott Bramnick +1 305 982 5505 +1 305 349 4759 james.bramnick@akerman.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Goldsmith & Atlas, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Glen Reid Goldsmith +1 305 670 5500 +1 305 670 5596 ggoldsmith@goldsmithpa.com
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 2000
Nature of Suit 442 Civil Rights: Jobs
  Entries (67) Calendar Events Related (0) Tools Right End
Need legal research help? Let us know!
PACER 67 Filed: 4/4/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER/CONSENT DECREE (Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 04/04/03) [EOD Date: 4/7/03] (ra, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/07/2003)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 66 Filed: 4/3/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
FINAL ORDER of Dismissal with Prejudice Pursuant to the Court's Approval of the Consent Decree. granting [64-1] dismiss/dismissal stipulation. This case is CLOSED. All pending motions are DENIED AS MOOT. Each party to bear its own attorney's fees and costs. ( Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 04/01/03) [EOD Date: 4/4/03] (nt, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/04/2003)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 65 Filed: 3/31/2003, Entered: None
NOTICE of filing atached Consent Decree by U.S. - EEOC (original in the chamber) (ra, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/01/2003)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 64 Filed: 3/31/2003, Entered: None, Terminated: 4/3/2003
STIPULATION for dismissal with prejudice pursuant to the Court's approval of the Consent Dedree by U.S. - EEOC, GFB Enterprises LLC (ra, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/01/2003)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 63 Filed: 3/31/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting [62-1] motion to extend time to file stipulation of settlement denying [60-1] joint motion for a one week extension of deadline in Court's order of settlement ( Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 03/28/03) [EOD Date: 4/1/03] (ra, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/01/2003)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 62 Filed: 3/27/2003, Entered: None, Terminated: 3/31/2003
UNOPPOSED MOTION by GFB Enterprises LLC to extend time to file stipulation of settlement (ra, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/28/2003)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 61 Filed: 3/20/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER mooting [48-1] motion to compel better interrogatory answers ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert L. Dube on 03/19/03) [EOD Date: 3/21/03] (ra, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/21/2003)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 60 Filed: 3/20/2003, Entered: None
JOINT MOTION by U.S. - EEOC, GFB Enterprises LLC for a one week extension of deadline in Court's order of settlement (ra, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/21/2003)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 59 Filed: 3/7/2003, Entered: None
FINAL report of Mediator. Disposition: Settled (ra, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 03/12/2003 (Entered: 03/12/2003)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 58 Filed: 3/5/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER ON NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT, parties shall file a stipulation of settlement, a proposed order of dismissal or final judgment, and any other documents to conclude this actionwithin fifteen (15) days from the date of this order (Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 03/05/03) [EOD Date: 3/6/03] (ra, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/06/2003)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 57 Filed: 2/26/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting [48-1] motion to compel better interrogatory answers set status conference for 10:00 3/17/03 before Magistrate Judge Robert L. Dube ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert L. Dube on 2/26/03) [EOD Date: 2/27/03] (tb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/27/2003)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 56 Filed: 2/25/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER SCHEDULING MEDIATION before Mediator: Leslie Langbein for 03/04/03 at 9:00 ( Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 02/13/03) [EOD Date: 2/26/03] (ra, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/26/2003)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 55 Filed: 2/24/2003, Entered: None
REPLY by U.S. - EEOC in support of their [48-1] motion to compel better interrogatory answers (ra, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/25/2003)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 54 Filed: 2/14/2003, Entered: None
RESPONSE by GFB Enterprises LLC to [48-1] motion to compel better interrogatory answers (ra, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/18/2003)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 53 Filed: 2/11/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting [52-1] motion to extend time to respond to plaintiff motion to compel better interrogatory answer ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert L. Dube on 02/11/03) [EOD Date: 2/12/03] (ra, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/12/2003)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 52 Filed: 2/7/2003, Entered: None, Terminated: 2/11/2003
UNOPPOSED MOTION by GFB Enterprises LLC to extend time to respond to plaintiff motion to compel better interrogatory answer (ra, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/10/2003)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 51 Filed: 1/24/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting [50-1] motion to extend time to respond to motion to compel better interrogatory answers Response to motion reset to 2/7/03 for [48-1] motion to compel better interrogatory answers ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert L. Dube on 01/24/03) [EOD Date: 1/27/03] (ra, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/27/2003)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 50 Filed: 1/21/2003, Entered: None, Terminated: 1/24/2003
UNOPPOSED MOTION by GFB Enterprises LLC to extend time to respond to motion to compel better interrogatory answers (ra, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/22/2003)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 49 Filed: 1/7/2003, Entered: None
NOTICE of Unavailability by GFB Enterprises LLC for dates of: 1/23/03 - 2/3/03 and 3/27/03 - 4/7/03 (ct, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/08/2003)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 48 Filed: 1/6/2003, Entered: None, Terminated: 2/26/2003
MOTION with memorandum in support by U.S. - EEOC to compel better interrogatory answers (ra, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/07/2003)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 47 Filed: 12/17/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting in pat [46-1] joint motion for 120-day discovery extension and pretrial deadlines Set Jury trial for 10/6/03 before Judge Jose E. Martinez , Reset calendar call for 1:30 10/2/03 before Judge Jose E. Martinez (Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 12/17/02) [EOD Date: 12/18/02] (ra, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/18/2002)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 46 Filed: 12/6/2002, Entered: None, Terminated: 12/17/2002
JOINT MOTION with memorandum in support by U.S. - EEOC, Jesus Molina, Humfredo Perez, Felix Quevedo, Avraham Mardo, Susan Weinberg for 120-day discovery extension and pretrial deadlines (ra, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/09/2002)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 45 Filed: 10/4/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER reassigning case to Magistrate Judge Dube ( Signed by Judge Patricia A. Seitz on 10/4/02) [EOD Date: 10/7/02] (dg, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/07/2002)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 44 Filed: 9/25/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT transferring case to the calendar of Judge Jose E. Martinez for all further proceedings (Signed by Judge Patricia A. Seitz on 9/23/02) [EOD Date: 9/26/02] (ra, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/26/2002)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 43 Filed: 6/20/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER denying [34-1] motion to dismiss amended complaint ( Signed by Judge Patricia A. Seitz on 6/20/02) [EOD Date: 6/21/02] (dg, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/21/2002)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 42 Filed: 4/26/2002, Entered: None
REPLY by GFB Enterprises LLC in support of [34-1] motion to dismiss amended complaint (dg, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/29/2002)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 41 Filed: 4/22/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting [40-1] motion to extend time to file reply in support of partial motion to dismiss Reply to Response to Motion reset to 4/26/02 for [34-1] motion to dismiss amended complaint ( Signed by Judge Patricia A. Seitz on 4/19/02) [EOD Date: 4/23/02] (dg, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/23/2002)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 40 Filed: 4/19/2002, Entered: None, Terminated: 4/22/2002
MOTION by GFB Enterprises LLC to extend time to file reply in support of partial motion to dismiss (dg, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/22/2002)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 39 Filed: 4/16/2002, Entered: None
NOTICE of selection of Leslie W. Langbein as Mediator by Jesus Molina, Humfredo Perez, Felix Quevedo, Avraham Mardo, Susan Weinberg (dg, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/17/2002)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 38 Filed: 4/11/2002, Entered: None
RESPONSE by U.S. - EEOC to [34-1] motion to dismiss amended complaint (dg, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/12/2002)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 37 Filed: 4/1/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER REFERRING all discovery and all motions for attorneys' fees and costs to Magistrate Judge Bandstra (Signed by Judge Patricia A. Seitz on 4/1/02) CCAP [EOD Date: 4/2/02] (dg, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/02/2002)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 36 Filed: 4/1/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER Providing Parties With Instructions For Jury Trial (Signed by Judge Patricia A. Seitz on 4/1/02) [EOD Date: 4/2/02] (dg, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/02/2002)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 35 Filed: 4/1/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER referring case to mediation. 15 days to appoint mediator ( Signed by Judge Patricia A. Seitz on 4/1/02) [EOD Date: 4/2/02] (dg, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/02/2002)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 34 Filed: 3/29/2002, Entered: None, Terminated: 6/20/2002
PARTIAL MOTION with memorandum in support by GFB Enterprises LLC to dismiss amended complaint (dg, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/01/2002)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 33 Filed: 3/29/2002, Entered: None
PARTIAL ANSWER and affirmative defenses by GFB Enterprises LLC to amended complaint (dg, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 04/01/2002 (Entered: 04/01/2002)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 32 Filed: 3/11/2002, Entered: None
AMENDED COMPLAINT by U.S. - EEOC , (Answer due 3/21/02 for GFB Enterprises LLC ) amending [30-1] amended complaint (dg, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/13/2002)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 31 Filed: 3/11/2002, Entered: None
CORRECTED NOTICE of filing amended complaint by U.S. - EEOC (dg, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/13/2002)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 30 Filed: 3/11/2002, Entered: None
AMENDED COMPLAINT by U.S. - EEOC , (Answer due 3/21/02 for GFB Enterprises LLC ) amending [1-1] complaint (dg, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/13/2002)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 29 Filed: 3/11/2002, Entered: None
NOTICE of filing amended complaint by U.S. - EEOC (dg, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/13/2002)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 28 Filed: 3/4/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting [19-1] motion for more definite statement, granting [19-2] motion to strike request for relief, plaintiff shall file an amended complaint that complies with all pleading requirements no later than 3/11/02 ( Signed by Judge Patricia A. Seitz on 3/1/02) [EOD Date: 3/5/02] (cj, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/05/2002)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 27 Filed: 2/28/2002, Entered: None
PARTIES Scheduling Report of Scheduling Meeting by U.S. - EEOC, GFB Enterprises LLC, Jesus Molina, Humfredo Perez, Felix Quevedo, Avraham Mardo, Susan Weinberg, Jesus Molina, Humfredo Perez, Felix Quevedo, Avraham Mardo, Susan Weinberg, GFB Enterprises LLC 2/28/02 (cj, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/01/2002)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 26 Filed: 1/30/2002, Entered: None
Answer and affirmative defenses by GFB Enterprises LLC (cj, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/31/2002)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 25 Filed: 1/28/2002, Entered: None
REPLY by GFB Enterprises LLC to response to [19-1] motion for more definite statement, [19-2] motion to strike request for relief (wc, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/29/2002)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 24 Filed: 1/28/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting [23-1] joint motion to extend time to convene Scheduling Conference and file Joint Scheduling Report reset Scheduling meeting report due for 2/28/02 ( Signed by Judge Patricia A. Seitz on 1/28/02) [EOD Date: 1/29/02] (wc, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/29/2002)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 23 Filed: 1/25/2002, Entered: None, Terminated: 1/28/2002
JOINT MOTION by U.S. - EEOC, GFB Enterprises LLC to extend time to convene Scheduling Conference and file Joint Scheduling Report (wc, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/28/2002)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 22 Filed: 1/17/2002, Entered: None
RESPONSE by U.S. - EEOC in opposition to [19-1] motion for more definite statement (tb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/18/2002)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 21 Filed: 1/15/2002, Entered: None
DEMAND for jury trial by Jesus Molina, Humfredo Perez, Felix Quevedo, Avraham Mardo, Susan Weinberg (wc, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/16/2002)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 20 Filed: 1/16/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting [4-1] motion to intervene as plaintiffs in this action by Jesus Molina, Humfredo Perez, Felix Quevedo, Avraham Mardo, Susan Weinberg ( Signed by Judge Patricia A. Seitz on 1/15/02) [EOD Date: 1/16/02] (wc, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/16/2002)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 19 Filed: 12/31/2001, Entered: None, Terminated: 3/4/2002
MOTION with memorandum in support by GFB Enterprises LLC for more definite statement , and to strike request for relief (dg, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/02/2002)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 18 Filed: 12/31/2001, Entered: None
NOTICE of firm name change by GFB Enterprises LLC (dg, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/02/2002)
Request RequestSpace
Need legal research help? Let us know!
PACER 17 Filed: 12/21/2001, Entered: None
REPLY by Jesus Molina, Humfredo Perez, Felix Quevedo, Avraham Mardo, Susan Weinberg in support of their [4-1] motion to intervene as plaintiffs in this action by Jesus Molina, Humfredo Perez, Felix Quevedo, Avraham Mardo, Susan (ra, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/26/2001)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 16 Filed: 12/19/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER requiring counsel to meet and file joint scheduling report and proposed order ( Signed by Judge Patricia A. Seitz on 12/19/01) [EOD Date: 12/20/01] (tb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/20/2001)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 15 Filed: 12/13/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting [13-1] motion to extend time 10 days within which to file and serve their reply to their motion to intervene ( Signed by Judge Patricia A. Seitz on 12/12/01) [EOD Date: 12/14/01] (tb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/14/2001)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 14 Filed: 12/11/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER of Magistrate Judge Reassignment ( Signed by Judge Patricia A. Seitz on 12/10/01) [EOD Date: 12/12/01] (tb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/12/2001)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 13 Filed: 12/11/2001, Entered: None, Terminated: 12/13/2001
UNOPPOSED MOTION by Jesus Molina, Humfredo Perez, Felix Quevedo, Avraham Mardo, Susan Weinberg to extend time 10 days within which to file and serve their reply to their motion to intervene (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/12/2001)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 12 Filed: 12/10/2001, Entered: None
NOTICE of Substitution/Reassignment of Attorney. Terminated attorney Kenneth Lawrence Gillespie for U.S. - EEOC Added Maria Teresa Rodriguez (dg, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/11/2001)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 11 Filed: 12/4/2001, Entered: None
NOTICE of attorney appearance for GFB Enterprises LLC by Glen Reid Goldsmith (hd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/05/2001)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 10 Filed: 12/3/2001, Entered: None
RESPONSE by GFB Enterprises LLC to [4-1] motion to intervene as plaintiffs in this action by Jesus Molina, Humfredo Perez, Felix Quevedo, Avraham Mardo, Susan Weinberg (dg, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/04/2001)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 9 Filed: 11/26/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting [7-1] motion to extend time for response to motion to intervene ( Signed by Judge Patricia A. Seitz on 11/26/01) [EOD Date: 11/27/01] (tb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/27/2001)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 8 Filed: 11/19/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
CLERK'S ORDER of Reassignment. Case reassigned to Judge Patricia A. Seitz (wc, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/20/2001)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 7 Filed: 11/1/2001, Entered: None, Terminated: 11/26/2001
UNOPPOSED MOTION by GFB Enterprises LLC to extend time for response to motion to intervene (hd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/15/2001)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 6 Filed: 11/13/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER OF RECUSAL ( Signed by Judge Alan S. Gold on 11/13/01) [EOD Date: 11/14/01] (hd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/14/2001)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 5 Filed: 11/8/2001, Entered: None
Notice of Filing Waiver of service executed by GFB Enterprises LLC (Attorney )10/30/01 Answer due by 12/31/01 for GFB Enterprises LLC (attached) (wc, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/13/2001)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 4 Filed: 11/2/2001, Entered: None, Terminated: 1/16/2002
MOTION with memorandum in support to intervene as plaintiffs in this action by Jesus Molina, Humfredo Perez, Felix Quevedo, Avraham Mardo, Susan Weinberg (intervenors' complaint in pod 2) (hd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/05/2001)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 3 Filed: 10/9/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER requiring compliance with Local Rule 16.1 of the United States District Court for the Southern District of Florida ( Signed by Judge Alan S. Gold on 10/5/01) [EOD Date: 10/9/01] (hd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/09/2001)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 2 Filed: 9/28/2001, Entered: None
SUMMONS(ES) issued for GFB Enterprises LLC by servin Corporation Service Company, registered agent (hd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/01/2001)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 1 Filed: 9/28/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
COMPLAINT filed re: civil rights/race; filing fee waived; A-7; Magistrate Judge Andrea M. Simonton (hd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/01/2001)
Request RequestSpace

Statistics

This case has been viewed 68 times.

No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Need Password Help?