First Intercontinental Bank v. Center Financial Corporation
Georgia Northern District Court, Case No. 1:08-cv-01323
District Judge J. Owen Forrester, presiding
docket://gov.uscourts.gand.1-08-cv-01323 (What is this?)

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Judges don't know as much about themselves as we do.
Access comprehensive profiles on judges, firms, lawyers, and more with PlainSite Pro and Pro Se.
No Logo First Intercontinental Bank, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Samuel Wade Malone +1 404 817 6157
Jeffrey L. Mapen +1 404 817 6157
No Logo Center Financial Corporation, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Troutman Sanders, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Thomas B. Bosch +1 404 885 3591 +1 404 962 6727 tom.bosch@troutmansanders.com
J. Timothy Mast +1 404 885 3312 +1 404 962 6796 tim.mast@troutmansanders.com
v.
No Logo Center Financial Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Troutman Sanders, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Thomas B. Bosch +1 404 885 3591 +1 404 962 6727 tom.bosch@troutmansanders.com
J. Timothy Mast +1 404 885 3312 +1 404 962 6796 tim.mast@troutmansanders.com
No Logo First Intercontinental Bank, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Samuel Wade Malone +1 404 817 6157
Jeffrey L. Mapen +1 404 817 6157
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 190 Contract: Other
  Entries (44) Calendar Events Related (0) Tools Right End
PACER 44 Filed: 12/19/2008, Entered: None
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Center Financial Corporation. (Sacha, Natalie) (Entered: 12/19/2008)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 43 Filed: 11/25/2008, Entered: None
RESPONSE in Opposition re 16 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by First Intercontinental Bank, First Intercontinental Bank. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Material Facts Response to Center's Statement of Material Facts and FICB's Statement of Material Facts in Dispute, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Affidavit of Dong Won Shin (Part 1), # 5 Affidavit of Dong Won Shin (Part 2), # 6 Affidavit of J. Brennan Ryan)(Mapen, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/25/2008)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 42 Filed: 11/25/2008, Entered: None
Supplemental MOTION to Continue with Brief In Support by First Intercontinental Bank, First Intercontinental Bank. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Shin Affidavit - Part 1), # 2 Exhibit A (Shin Affidavit - Part 2), # 3 Exhibit B (Malone Affidavit), # 4 Exhibit C (Kim Affidavit - Part 1), # 5 Exhibit C (Kim Affidavit - Part 2), # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F)(Mapen, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/25/2008)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 41 Filed: 11/13/2008, Entered: None
Proposed Consent Order Extending Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment by First Intercontinental Bank. (Mapen, Jeffrey) Modified on 11/14/2008 to edit docket text (bse). (Entered: 11/13/2008)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 40 Filed: 10/29/2008, Entered: None
PROPOSED CONSENT ORDER extending time for Plaintiff to respond to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment re: 16 MOTION for Summary Judgment. (Mapen, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/29/2008)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 39 Filed: 10/15/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER denying Plaintiff's 32 Motion for Reconsideration of the court's July 24, 2008 Order. Signed by Judge J. Owen Forrester on 10/15/08. (bse) (Entered: 10/17/2008)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 38 Filed: 9/18/2008, Entered: None
NOTICE to Take Deposition of Eric Gronroos filed by First Intercontinental Bank (Mapen, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/18/2008)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 37 Filed: 9/18/2008, Entered: None
NOTICE to Take Deposition of Lonny Robinson filed by First Intercontinental Bank (Mapen, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/18/2008)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 36 Filed: 9/18/2008, Entered: None
NOTICE to Take Deposition of Jae Whan Yoo filed by First Intercontinental Bank (Mapen, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/18/2008)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 35 Filed: 9/5/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on July 24, 2008, before Judge J. Owen Forrester. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lois D. Phillips, Telephone number (404) 215-1317. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/26/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/6/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/4/2008. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Trancripts) (fem) (Entered: 09/05/2008)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 34 Filed: 8/29/2008, Entered: None
REPLY to Response to Motion re 32 MOTION for Reconsideration of the Court's July 24, 2008 Order filed by First Intercontinental Bank. (Mapen, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/29/2008)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 33 Filed: 8/13/2008, Entered: None
RESPONSE in Opposition re 32 MOTION for Reconsideration of the Court's July 24, 2008 Order filed by Center Financial Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Bosch, Thomas) (Entered: 08/13/2008)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 32 Filed: 8/5/2008, Entered: None
MOTION for Reconsideration of the Court's July 24, 2008 Order with Brief In Support by First Intercontinental Bank. (Mapen, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/05/2008)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 31 Filed: 7/24/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge J. Owen Forrester: Status Conference held on 7/24/2008, denying 7 Motion for Leave to File; granting in part and denying in part 18 Motion to Stay; granting in part and denying in part 22 Motion to Compel ; granting 23 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages; granting in part and denying in part 27 Motion to Continue; granting 28 CONSENT ORDER extending time for Plaintiff to respond to Defendant's 16 MOTION for Summary Judgment, response due 30 days from the date of the Plaintiff's last deposition. The transcript of this proceeding serves as the Order of the Court. (Court Reporter Lois Phillips.)(tcc) (Entered: 07/24/2008)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 30 Filed: 7/23/2008, Entered: None
REPLY BRIEF re 18 MOTION to Stay Discovery in Support filed by Center Financial Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Bosch, Thomas) (Entered: 07/23/2008)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 29 Filed: 7/23/2008, Entered: None
NOTICE OF REQUIREMENT TO FILE ELECTRONICALLY pursuant to Standing Order 04-01 as to S. Wade Malone regarding 28 Proposed Consent Order. (dfb) (Entered: 07/23/2008)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 28 Filed: 7/22/2008, Entered: None
PROPOSED CONSENT ORDER extending time for Plaintiff to respond to Defendant's 16 MOTION for Summary Judgment. (dfb) (Entered: 07/23/2008)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 27 Filed: 7/22/2008, Entered: None
MOTION to Continue to Permit Plaintiff to Conduct Discovery Prior to the Court's Ruling on Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment with Brief In Support by First Intercontinental Bank. (Attachments: # 1 Brief, # 2 Affidavit of Sang Bae Kim, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2)(Mapen, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/22/2008)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 26 Filed: 7/18/2008, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Center Financial Corporation's Supplemental Objections and Responses to First Intercontinental Bank's First Interrogatories by Center Financial Corporation.(Sacha, Natalie) (Entered: 07/18/2008)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 25 Filed: 7/18/2008, Entered: None
RESPONSE re 18 MOTION to Stay Discovery filed by First Intercontinental Bank. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9)(Mapen, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/18/2008)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 24 Filed: 7/16/2008, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Center Financial Corporation's First Requests for Production of Documents to First Intercontinental Bank by Center Financial Corporation.(Sacha, Natalie) (Entered: 07/16/2008)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 23 Filed: 7/15/2008, Entered: None
MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by First Intercontinental Bank. (Mapen, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/15/2008)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 22 Filed: 7/15/2008, Entered: None Motion to Compel
MOTION to Compel Responses and Production of Documents with Brief In Support by First Intercontinental Bank. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Jeffrey L. Mapen, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D)(Mapen, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/15/2008)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 21 Filed: 7/7/2008, Entered: None
MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Discovery Requests, Nunc Pro Tunc with Brief In Support by Center Financial Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Brief in Support of Motion for Extension of Time, Nunc Pro Tunc, # 2 Exhibit A to Brief, # 3 Exhibit B to Brief, # 4 Exhibit C to Brief, # 5 Exhibit D to Brief, # 6 Exhibit E to Brief, # 7 Text of Proposed Order)(Bosch, Thomas) (Entered: 07/07/2008)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 20 Filed: 6/30/2008, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Objections and Responses to First Requests for Production of Documents by Center Financial Corporation.(Bosch, Thomas) (Entered: 06/30/2008)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 19 Filed: 6/30/2008, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Objections to First Interrogatories by Center Financial Corporation.(Bosch, Thomas) (Entered: 06/30/2008)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 18 Filed: 6/30/2008, Entered: None
MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending Ruling on 16 Motion for Summary Judgment with Brief In Support by Center Financial Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Brief In Support of Motion to Stay)(Bosch, Thomas) Modified on 7/3/2008 to create document relationship (hfm). (Entered: 06/30/2008)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 17 Filed: 6/30/2008, Entered: None
Statement of Material Facts re 16 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Center Financial Corporation. (Bosch, Thomas) (Entered: 06/30/2008)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 16 Filed: 6/30/2008, Entered: None Motion for Summary Judgment
MOTION for Summary Judgment with Brief In Support by Center Financial Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Brief In Support, # 2 Exhibit A to Brief, # 3 Exhibit A1 to Brief, # 4 Exhibit A2 to Brief, # 5 Exhibit B to Brief)(Bosch, Thomas) --Please refer to http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain the Notice to Respond to Summary Judgment Motion form contained on the Court's website.-- (Entered: 06/30/2008)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 15 Filed: 5/28/2008, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Initial Disclosures by Center Financial Corporation.(Mast, J.) (Entered: 05/28/2008)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 14 Filed: 5/28/2008, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Plaintiff's First Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents to Defendant by First Intercontinental Bank.(Mapen, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/28/2008)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 13 Filed: 5/28/2008, Entered: None
Joint PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by First Intercontinental Bank, Center Financial Corporation. (Mapen, Jeffrey) Modified on 5/29/2008 to include all filers (hfm). (Entered: 05/28/2008)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 12 Filed: 5/28/2008, Entered: None
Certificate of Interested Persons by First Intercontinental Bank. (Mapen, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/28/2008)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 11 Filed: 5/28/2008, Entered: None
Initial Disclosures by First Intercontinental Bank.(Mapen, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/28/2008)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 10 Filed: 5/21/2008, Entered: None
ANSWER to 8 Counterclaim by First Intercontinental Bank.(Mapen, Jeffrey) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 05/21/2008)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 9 Filed: 5/5/2008, Entered: None
REVISED CASE INSTRUCTIONS. (tcc) (Entered: 05/05/2008)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 8 Filed: 4/28/2008, Entered: None
---DOCUMENT placed UNDER SEAL pending a ruling by the Court--- ANSWER to 1 COMPLAINT and COUNTERCLAIM against First Intercontinental Bank by Center Financial Corporation. Discovery ends on 9/25/2008. (dfb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E) (dfb) Modified on 9/30/2008. (dfb) (Entered: 04/29/2008)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 7 Filed: 4/28/2008, Entered: None
MOTION for Leave to File Documents under Seal by Center Financial Corporation. (Attachment: # 1 Proposed Order)(dfb) (Entered: 04/29/2008)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 6 Filed: 4/29/2008, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance by Natalie Diamond Sacha on behalf of Center Financial Corporation (Sacha, Natalie) (Entered: 04/29/2008)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 5 Filed: 4/29/2008, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas B. Bosch on behalf of Center Financial Corporation (Bosch, Thomas) (Entered: 04/29/2008)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 4 Filed: 4/29/2008, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance by J. Timothy Mast on behalf of Center Financial Corporation (Mast, J.) (Entered: 04/29/2008)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 3 Filed: 4/28/2008, Entered: None
Certificate of Interested Persons by Center Financial Corporation. (Mast, J.) (Entered: 04/28/2008)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 2 Filed: 4/28/2008, Entered: None
NOTICE by Center Financial Corporation of Manual Filing (Mast, J.) (Entered: 04/28/2008)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 1 Filed: 4/4/2008, Entered: None
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed and summon(s) issued, filed by First Intercontinental Bank. Consent form to proceed before U.S. Magistrate and pretrial instructions provided. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 576110.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1: Part 1, # 2 Exhibit 1: Part 2, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Summons, # 10 Civil Cover Sheet)(alc) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 04/07/2008)
Request RequestSpace

Statistics

This case has been viewed 69 times.

No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Need Password Help?