Salamacha v. UCHC-CMHC, GU
Connecticut District Court, Case No. 3:02-cv-01900-WWE
District Judge Warren W. Eginton, presiding
docket://gov.uscourts.ctd.3-02-cv-01900 (What is this?)

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
The right information can save you thousands of dollars.
Access comprehensive profiles on judges, firms, lawyers, and more with PlainSite Pro and Pro Se.
No Logo Jane M. Salamacha, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo UCHC-CMHC, GU, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by State of Connecticut

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Jane D. Comerford +1 860 808 5210 +1 860 808 5385 jane.comerford@po.state.ct.us
Office New Haven
Filed 10/25/2002
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause No cause code entered
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Judgment - Motion Before Trial
County Fairfield
Terminated 5/11/2004
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, PROSE
  Entries (16) Calendar Events Related (0) Tools Right End
PDF 11 Filed: 5/11/2004, Entered: 5/13/2004 JudgmentCourt Filing
JUDGMENT in favor of defendant against plaintiff. Signed by Judge Clerk on 5/11/04. (Cody, C.)
PDF 10 Filed: 5/7/2004, Entered: 5/11/2004 Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of JurisdictionCourt Filing
ORDER granting [7] Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 5/7/04. (Cody, C.)
PDF 9 Filed: 3/15/2004, Entered: 3/16/2004 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER of Notice to Pro Se Litigant, Set/Reset Deadlines as to Dismissal due by 4/15/2004. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 3/11/04. (Depino, F.)
Blank -- Filed: 3/15/2004, Entered: 3/16/2004 Set Motion and Rcmd Ruling Deadlines/Hearings
Set/Reset Deadlines as to [7] MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Responses due by 4/12/2004 (Depino, F.)
PDF 8 Filed: 2/5/2004, Entered: 2/5/2004 Memorandum in Support of Motion
Memorandum in Support re [7] MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction and Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by UCHC-CMHC, GU. (Simpson, T.)
PDF 7 Filed: 2/5/2004, Entered: 2/5/2004, Terminated: 5/7/2004 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
MOTION to Dismiss Complaint for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction and Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by UCHC-CMHC, GU.Responses due by 2/26/2004 (Simpson, T.)
PDF 6 Filed: 2/5/2004, Entered: 2/5/2004 Notice of Appearance
NOTICE of Appearance by Jane D. Comerford on behalf of UCHC-CMHC, GU (Simpson, T.)
PDF 5 Filed: 1/13/2004, Entered: 1/16/2004 Notice
NOTICE re: L.R.41(a), response due 2/2/04 . Signed by Clerk on 1/13/04. (Cody, C.)
Blank 4 Filed: 9/24/2003, Entered: 9/24/2003 Summons Returned Executed
MARSHAL'S return of service on summons & complaint executed as to UCHC-CMHC, GU on 7/11/03 (Fazekas, J.)
Blank -- Filed: 6/27/2003, Entered: 6/27/2003 Summons Issued
NOTICE of Lawsuit and Request for Waiver of Service for Summons issued and handed US Marshal with USM285 forms for service in accordance with [3-1] order (Barrille, J.)
Blank -- Filed: 10/29/2002, Entered: 10/29/2002 Notice (Other)
US Marshal 285 forms and instructions, Notice of Lawsuit, Waiver of Service of Summons returned to plaintiff for completion (Sanders, C.)
Blank 3 Filed: 10/25/2002, Entered: 10/29/2002 Scheduling Order
ORDER on Pretrial Deadlines handed to counsel Discovery cutoff 4/26/03 ; Dispositive Motions due 5/26/03 Amended Pleadings due 12/25/02 Motions to Dismiss due 1/25/03 (Sanders, C.)
Blank 2 Filed: 10/25/2002, Entered: 10/29/2002 Complaint
COMPLAINT (Sanders, C.)
Blank -- Filed: 10/25/2002, Entered: 10/29/2002 ICMS - converted docket entry
Misc. Case # 3:02mc365 transferred to civil docket. Case assigned to Judge Warren W. Eginton (Sanders, C.)
Blank -- Filed: 10/25/2002, Entered: 10/29/2002 Order
ENDORSEMENT granting [1-1] motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis ( signed by Mag. Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons ) (Sanders, C.)
Blank 1 Filed: 10/22/2002, Entered: 10/22/2002, Terminated: 10/25/2002 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis
MOTION by Jane M. Salamacha to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (Sanders, C.)

Statistics

This case has been viewed 185 times.

No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Need Password Help?