LURENSKY v. KELLIHER
District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:08-cv-01199-HHK
District Judge Henry H. Kennedy, presiding
docket://gov.uscourts.dcd.1-08-cv-01199 (What is this?)

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
This docket can only tell you so much. Get the rest.
Access comprehensive profiles on judges, firms, lawyers, and more with PlainSite Pro and Pro Se.
No Logo MARCIA A. LURENSKY, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo JOSEPH T. KELLIHER, Defendant
Office Washington, DC
Filed 7/14/2008
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County 11001
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags PROSE-NP, TYPE-H
  Entries (7) Calendar Events Related (0) Tools Right End
PDF 6 Filed: 7/28/2008, Entered: 7/29/2008 Summons Returned Executed as to Attorney General
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on Attorney General. Date of Service Upon Attorney General 07/22/2008. (tr)
PDF 5 Filed: 7/28/2008, Entered: 7/29/2008 Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney for DC
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the US Attorney served on 7/25/2008, answer due 9/23/2008 (tr)
PDF 4 Filed: 7/28/2008, Entered: 7/29/2008 Summons Returned Executed
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. JOSEPH T. KELLIHER served on 7/21/2008, answer due 8/11/2008 (tr)
Blank 3 Filed: 7/14/2008, Entered: 7/17/2008 Complaint
COMPLAINT against JOSEPH T. KELLIHER ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 4616013681) filed by MARCIA A. LURENSKY.(tr) (FILED UNDER SEAL)
PDF 2 Filed: 7/14/2008, Entered: 7/17/2008 Order on Motion to SealCourt Filing
ORDER granting [1] Motion for Leave to File Complaint Under Seal. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 07/14/2008. (tr)
PACER 1 Filed: 7/14/2008, Entered: 7/17/2008, Terminated: 7/14/2008 Motion to Seal
MOTION for Leave to File Complaint Under Seal by MARCIA A. LURENSKY (tr)
Blank -- Filed: 7/14/2008, Entered: 7/17/2008 Summons Issued as to AUSA
SUMMONS Issued(3) as to JOSEPH T. KELLIHER, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (tr)

Statistics

This case has been viewed 100 times.

No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Need Password Help?