USA v. Maragni, et al
Florida Southern District Court, Case No. 0:00-cr-06154-WPD
docket://gov.uscourts.flsd.0-00-cr-06154 (What is this?)

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
The right information can save you thousands of dollars.
Access comprehensive profiles on judges, firms, lawyers, and more with PlainSite Pro and Pro Se.
United States of America, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Paul Schwartz +1 954 356 7255 +3567 356 356 7230 paul.schwartz@usdoj.gov
Office Ft. Lauderdale
Filed 6/6/2000
County Broward
Terminated 4/20/2001
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 1
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1962-7440.F
Offense Level 4
181962-7440.F RACKETEERING - GAMBLING
Count 2
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1955.F
Offense Level 4
181955.F ILLEGAL GAMBLING
Count 3
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 892.F
Offense Level 4
18892.F EXTENSIONS OF CREDIT BY EXTORTION
Count 4
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 894.F
Offense Level 4
18894.F COLLECTION OF CREDIT BY EXTORTION
Count 5
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1956-7530.F
Offense Level 4
181956-7530.F MONEY LAUNDERING-GAMBLING/LOTTERY
Count 6
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 371.F
Offense Level 4
18371.F CONSPIRACY TO DEFRAUD THE UNITED STATES
Def Custody Status Released
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (176) Calendar Events Related (0) Tools Right End
PDF 696 Filed: 6/17/2002, Entered: 6/18/2002 OrderCourt Filing
FINAL JUDGMENT and ORDER as to Joseph Rotunno denying in all respects motion to vacate (Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 6/17/02) [EOD Date: 6/18/02] CCAP (ss, Deputy Clerk)
PDF 695 Filed: 6/14/2002, Entered: 6/18/2002 Exhibit and Witness List
Exhibit and Witness List as to Joseph Rotunno (ss, Deputy Clerk)
PDF 694 Filed: 6/14/2002, Entered: 6/18/2002 Minutes - MiscellaneousCourt Filing
Minutes of Continuation of 2255 held on 6/14/02 before Judge William P. Dimitrouleas as to Joseph Rotunno; Court Reporter Name or Tape #: Bob Ryckoff (ss, Deputy Clerk)
PDF 693 Filed: 6/14/2002, Entered: 6/17/2002 Minutes - MiscellaneousCourt Filing
Minutes of evidentiary hearing (continuation from 5/24/02) held on 6/14/02 before Judge William P. Dimitrouleas as to Joseph Rotunno; Court Reporter Name or Tape #: Bob Ryckoff (ss, Deputy Clerk)
Blank -- Filed: 6/14/2002, Entered: 6/18/2002 Evidentiary Hearing
Continuation of hearing on 2255 as to Joseph Rotunno held before Judge William P. Dimitrouleas (ss, Deputy Clerk)
Blank -- Filed: 6/14/2002, Entered: 6/17/2002 Evidentiary Hearing
Evidentiary Hearing as to Joseph Rotunno held before Judge William P. Dimitrouleas (ss, Deputy Clerk)
PDF 691 Filed: 6/10/2002, Entered: 6/11/2002 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER as to Joseph Rotunno granting [688-1] request for rescheduling; Reset evidentiary hearing on 2255 motion for 4:00 6/14/02 for Joseph Rotunno before Judge William P. Dimitrouleas (Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 6/10/02) [EOD Date: 6/11/02] CCAP (ss, Deputy Clerk)
PDF 688 Filed: 6/6/2002, Entered: 6/7/2002, Terminated: 6/10/2002 Notice (Other)
NOTICE of conflict and Request for rescheduling by Joseph Rotunno (ss, Deputy Clerk)
PDF 685 Filed: 5/24/2002, Entered: 5/28/2002 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER as to Joseph Rotunno granting stipulated motion for substitution of counsel and granting motion to withdraw: Benson Weintraub is substituted for Michael Smith (Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 5/24/02) [EOD Date: 5/28/02] CCAP (ss, Deputy Clerk)
PDF 684 Filed: 5/24/2002, Entered: 5/28/2002 Minutes - MiscellaneousCourt Filing
Minutes of Evidentiary Hearing on motion for 2255 held on 5/24/02 before Judge William P. Dimitrouleas as to Joseph Rotunno; Continuation of hearing 6/14/02 at 8:45; Court Reporter Name or Tape #: Carl Schanzleh (ss, Deputy Clerk)
Blank -- Filed: 5/24/2002, Entered: 5/28/2002 Evidentiary Hearing
Evidentiary Hearing on motion for 2255 as to Joseph Rotunno held before Judge William P. Dimitrouleas (ss, Deputy Clerk)
PDF 672 Filed: 5/17/2002, Entered: 5/20/2002 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER as to Joseph Rotunno motion to withdraw as appointed counsel defer ruling until 5/24/02 at 9:00 (Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 5/17//02) [EOD Date: 5/20/02] CCAP (ss, Deputy Clerk)
PDF 671 Filed: 5/15/2002, Entered: 5/16/2002 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER as to Joseph Rotunno deferred until the hearing set for 5/24/02 at 9:00, stipulated motion for substitution of counsel (Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 5/15/02) [EOD Date: 5/16/02] CCAP (ss, Deputy Clerk)
PDF 670 Filed: 5/15/2002, Entered: 5/16/2002 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER as to Joseph Rotunno denying without prejudice to renew on 5/24/02 at 9:00, agreed motion for continuance of evidentiary hearing (Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 5/15/02) [EOD Date: 5/16/02] CCAP (ss, Deputy Clerk)
PDF 669 Filed: 5/9/2002, Entered: 5/10/2002 Notice of Unavailability
NOTICE of potential conflict by Joseph Rotunno (ss, Deputy Clerk)
PDF 666 Filed: 5/2/2002, Entered: 5/3/2002 Notice (Other)
NOTICE of conflict by Joseph Rotunno (ss, Deputy Clerk)
PDF 665 Filed: 4/26/2002, Entered: 4/29/2002 Notice (Other)
NOTICE of potential scheduling conflict by USA as to Joseph Rotunno (ss, Deputy Clerk)
PDF 664 Filed: 4/24/2002, Entered: 4/25/2002 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER as to Joseph Rotunno denying motion to vacate; Set evidentiary hearing on the failure to take an appeal for 9:00 5/24/02 for Joseph Rotunno before Judge William P. Dimitrouleas; Appointing Michael Smith as counsel (Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 4/24/02) [EOD Date: 4/25/02] CCAP (ss, Deputy Clerk)
PDF 663 Filed: 4/12/2002, Entered: 4/19/2002 TranscriptCourt Filing
TRANSCRIPT filed as to Joseph Rotunno of Sentence held 4/20/01 before Judge William P. Dimitrouleas Volume #: I Pages: 1 through 12 (ss, Deputy Clerk)
PDF 662 Filed: 4/12/2002, Entered: 4/19/2002 TranscriptCourt Filing
TRANSCRIPT filed as to Joseph Rotunno of Plea of guilty held 10/12/00 before Judge William P. Dimitrouleas Volume #: I Pages: 1 through 40 (ss, Deputy Clerk)
PDF 661 Filed: 4/12/2002, Entered: 4/19/2002 TranscriptCourt Filing
TRANSCRIPT filed as to Joseph Rotunno of Hearing held 10/3/00 before Judge William P. Dimitrouleas Volume #: I Pages: 1 through 16 (ss, Deputy Clerk)
PDF 660 Filed: 4/8/2002, Entered: 4/9/2002 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER as to Joseph Rotunno stating that petitioner may file an amended petition with a proper oath or sign the attached verification by 4/22/02 (Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 4/8/02) [EOD Date: 4/9/02] CCAP (ss, Deputy Clerk)
PDF 659 Filed: 4/8/2002, Entered: 4/9/2002 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER as to Joseph Rotunno defer ruling for fifteen days on petitioner's motion to vacate (Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 4/8/02) [EOD Date: 4/9/02] CCAP (ss, Deputy Clerk)
PDF 658 Filed: 4/8/2002, Entered: 4/9/2002 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER as to Joseph Rotunno vacating reference to Magistrate (Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 4/8/02) [EOD Date: 4/9/02] CCAP (ss, Deputy Clerk)
PDF 621 Filed: 4/23/2001, Entered: 4/24/2001 JudgmentCourt Filing
JUDGMENT as to Joseph Rotunno (2) count(s) 6. Imprisonment 78 months; Supervised Release 36 months; Assessment $100.00; Fine $12,500.00; count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4, 5. Dismissed (Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 4/23/01) CCAP [EOD Date: 4/24/01] CCAP (ss, Deputy Clerk)
PDF 620 Filed: 4/20/2001, Entered: 4/23/2001 Minutes - MiscellaneousCourt Filing
Minutes of sentencing held on 4/20/01 before Judge William P. Dimitrouleas as to Joseph Rotunno ; Court Reporter Name or Tape #: Bob Ryckoff (dp, Deputy Clerk)
Blank -- Filed: 4/20/2001, Entered: 4/24/2001 Sentencing
Sentencing held Joseph Rotunno (2) count(s) 6 (ss, Deputy Clerk)
PDF 619 Filed: 4/19/2001, Entered: 4/20/2001 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER as to Joseph Rotunno denying [618-1] motion to allow self-surrender as to Joseph Rotunno (2) (Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 4/19/01) CCAP [EOD Date: 4/20/01] CCAP (ss, Deputy Clerk)
PDF 618 Filed: 4/18/2001, Entered: 4/19/2001, Terminated: 4/19/2001 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
MOTION by Joseph Rotunno to allow self-surrender (ss, Deputy Clerk)
PDF 617 Filed: 4/17/2001, Entered: 4/18/2001 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER as to Joseph Rotunno granting [616-1] motion to reschedule sentencing as to Joseph Rotunno (2) Resetting Sentencing for 4:30 4/20/01 for Joseph Rotunno before Judge William P. Dimitrouleas (Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 4/17/01) CCAP [EOD Date: 4/18/01] CCAP (ss, Deputy Clerk)
PDF 616 Filed: 4/16/2001, Entered: 4/17/2001, Terminated: 4/17/2001 Motion to Continue
MOTION by Joseph Rotunno to reschedule sentencing (ss, Deputy Clerk)
PDF 615 Filed: 3/23/2001, Entered: 3/26/2001 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER as to Joseph Rotunno granting [613-1] fifth motion to amend conditions of presentence release as to Joseph Rotunno (2) (Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 3/23/01) CCAP [EOD Date: 3/26/01] CCAP (ss, Deputy Clerk)
PDF 614 Filed: 3/23/2001, Entered: 3/23/2001, Terminated: 8/9/2002 Response to Motion
RESPONSE by USA as to Joseph Rotunno re [613-1] fifth motion to amend conditions of presentence release (ss, Deputy Clerk)
PDF 613 Filed: 3/21/2001, Entered: 3/22/2001, Terminated: 3/23/2001 Motion to Modify Conditions of Release
FIFTH MOTION by Joseph Rotunno to amend conditions of presentence release (ss, Deputy Clerk)
PDF 600 Filed: 2/20/2001, Entered: 2/21/2001 Response to Motion
RESPONSE by USA as to Joseph Rotunno re [590-1] motion to amend conditions of presentencing release (ss, Deputy Clerk)
PDF 595 Filed: 2/15/2001, Entered: 2/16/2001 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER as to Joseph Rotunno denying [590-1] fourth motion to modify his pretrial release (Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 2/15/01) CCAP [EOD Date: 2/16/01] CCAP (ss, Deputy Clerk)
PDF 594 Filed: 2/15/2001, Entered: 2/16/2001 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER as to Joseph Rotunno granting [591-1] renewed motion to continue sentencing as to Joseph Rotunno (2) Resetting Sentencing for 10:30 4/20/01 for Joseph Rotunno before Judge William P. Dimitrouleas (Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 2/15/01) CCAP [EOD Date: 2/16/01] CCAP (ss, Deputy Clerk)
PDF 591 Filed: 2/15/2001, Entered: 2/15/2001, Terminated: 2/15/2001 Motion to Continue
RENEWED MOTION by Joseph Rotunno to continue sentencing (ss, Deputy Clerk)
PDF 590 Filed: 2/15/2001, Entered: 2/15/2001, Terminated: 2/15/2001 Motion to Modify Conditions of Release
FOURTH MOTION by Joseph Rotunno to amend conditions of presentencing release (ss, Deputy Clerk)
Blank 589 Filed: 2/9/2001, Entered: 2/12/2001 Sealed Document
SEALED DOCUMENT (ss, Deputy Clerk)
Blank 588 Filed: 2/9/2001, Entered: 2/9/2001 Sealed Document
SEALED DOCUMENT (ss, Deputy Clerk)
Blank 587 Filed: 2/9/2001, Entered: 2/9/2001 Sealed Document
SEALED DOCUMENT (ss, Deputy Clerk)
PDF 586 Filed: 2/8/2001, Entered: 2/9/2001 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER as to Joseph Rotunno denying without prejudice [584-1] motion to continue sentencing as to Joseph Rotunno (2) (Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 2/8/01) CCAP [EOD Date: 2/9/01] CCAP (ss, Deputy Clerk)
PDF 585 Filed: 2/8/2001, Entered: 2/9/2001 Response to Motion
RESPONSE by USA as to Joseph Rotunno re [584-1] motion to continue sentencing (ss, Deputy Clerk)
PDF 584 Filed: 2/7/2001, Entered: 2/8/2001, Terminated: 2/8/2001 Motion to Continue
MOTION by Joseph Rotunno to continue sentencing (ss, Deputy Clerk)
PDF 538 Filed: 12/28/2000, Entered: 12/29/2000 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER as to Joseph Rotunno granting [537-1] motion to continue sentencing as to Joseph Rotunno (2) reset Sentencing for 10:45 3/9/01 for Joseph Rotunno before Judge William P. Dimitrouleas ( Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 12/28/00) CCAP [EOD Date: 12/29/00] CCAP (dp, Deputy Clerk)
PDF 537 Filed: 12/28/2000, Entered: 12/29/2000, Terminated: 12/28/2000 Motion to Continue
MOTION by Joseph Rotunno to continue sentencing (dp, Deputy Clerk)
PDF 495 Filed: 12/6/2000, Entered: 12/6/2000 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER as to Joseph Rotunno denying [489-1] motion to amend conditions of presentencing release as to Joseph Rotunno (2) (Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 12/6/00) CCAP [EOD Date: 12/6/00] CCAP (ss, Deputy Clerk)
PDF 493 Filed: 12/5/2000, Entered: 12/6/2000 Response in Opposition
RESPONSE by USA as to Joseph Rotunno in opposition to [489-1] third motion to amend conditions of presentencing release (ss, Deputy Clerk)
PDF 491 Filed: 12/1/2000, Entered: 12/4/2000 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER as to Joseph Rotunno [489-1] third motion to amend conditions of presentencing release defer ruling for five days (Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 12/1/00) CCAP [EOD Date: 12/4/00] CCAP (ss, Deputy Clerk)
PDF 489 Filed: 11/30/2000, Entered: 12/1/2000, Terminated: 12/6/2000 Motion to Modify Conditions of Release
THIRD MOTION by Joseph Rotunno to amend conditions of presentencing release (ss, Deputy Clerk)
PDF 484 Filed: 11/28/2000, Entered: 11/28/2000 Notice of HearingCourt Filing
NOTICE of Hearing as to Joseph Rotunno: Resetting Sentencing for 2:15 1/12/01 for Joseph Rotunno before Judge William P. Dimitrouleas (ss, Deputy Clerk)
PDF 478 Filed: 11/16/2000, Entered: 11/17/2000 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER as to Joseph Rotunno granting [475-1] second motion to amend conditions of presentencing release as to Joseph Rotunno (Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 11/16/00) CCAP [EOD Date: 11/17/00] CCAP (ss, Deputy Clerk)
PDF 475 Filed: 11/15/2000, Entered: 11/15/2000, Terminated: 11/16/2000 Motion to Modify Conditions of Release
SECOND MOTION by Joseph Rotunno to amend conditions of presentencing release (ss, Deputy Clerk)
PDF 470 Filed: 11/7/2000, Entered: 11/7/2000 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER as to Joseph Rotunno granting [466-1] motion to amend conditions of presentencing release as to Joseph Rotunno (2) (Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 11/7/00) CCAP [EOD Date: 11/7/00] CCAP (ss, Deputy Clerk)
PDF 468 Filed: 11/6/2000, Entered: 11/7/2000 Response to Motion
RESPONSE by USA as to Joseph Rotunno re [466-1] motion to amend conditions of presentencing release (ss, Deputy Clerk)
PDF 467 Filed: 11/6/2000, Entered: 11/6/2000 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER as to Joseph Rotunno [466-1] motion to amend conditions of presentencing release defer ruling for five days (Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 11/6/00) CCAP [EOD Date: 11/6/00] CCAP (ss, Deputy Clerk)
PDF 466 Filed: 11/3/2000, Entered: 11/6/2000, Terminated: 11/7/2000 Motion to Amend/Correct
MOTION by Joseph Rotunno to amend conditions of presentencing release (ss, Deputy Clerk)
Blank -- Filed: 10/20/2000, Entered: 4/24/2001 Plea Entered
PLEA entered by Joseph Rotunno. Court accepts plea. GUILTY: Joseph Rotunno (2) count(s) 6 (See DE #415-should have been count 6 not count 1 on minutes) (ss, Deputy Clerk)
PDF 421 Filed: 10/13/2000, Entered: 10/16/2000 Minutes - MiscellaneousCourt Filing
Minutes of Bond Hearing held on 10/12/00 before Judge William P. Dimitrouleas as to Joseph Rotunno; Court Reporter Name or Tape #: Bob Ryckoff (ss, Deputy Clerk)
PDF 420 Filed: 10/12/2000, Entered: 10/13/2000 BondCourt Filing
APPEARANCE BOND entered by Joseph Rotunno in Amount $100,000.00 Receipt # XM-17588 (Surety Information: Kevins Bail Bonds, Cynthia Gaynor, 540 SE 6th St., Ft. Laud., FL 33301) Approved by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas. Report to PTS as directed; Avoid victims/witnesses; No firearms/weapons; Additional conditions: The defendant is to remain under house arrest with electronic monitoring (at defendant's expense). Defendant is allowed to leave his residence for medical and legal appointments only (ss, Deputy Clerk)
PDF 419 Filed: 10/12/2000, Entered: 10/13/2000 BondCourt Filing
APPEARANCE BOND entered by Joseph Rotunno in Amount $1,000,000.00 Approved by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas. Report to PTS as directed; Avoid victims/witnesses; No firearms/weapons; Additional conditions: The defendant is to remain under house arrest with electronic monitoring (at defendant's expense). Defendant is allowed to leave his residence for medical and legal appointments only (ss, Deputy Clerk)
PDF 418 Filed: 10/12/2000, Entered: 10/13/2000 BondCourt Filing
APPEARANCE BOND entered by Joseph Rotunno in Amount $1,000,000.00 Approved by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas. Report to PTS as directed; Avoid victims/witnesses; No firearms/weapons; Additional conditions: The defendant is to remain under house arrest with electronic monitoring (at defendant's expense). Defendant is allowed to leave his residence for medical and legal appointments only (ss, Deputy Clerk)
PDF 417 Filed: 10/12/2000, Entered: 10/13/2000 Notice of HearingCourt Filing
NOTICE of Hearing as to Joseph Rotunno: Setting Sentencing for 11:30 1/5/01 for Joseph Rotunno before Judge William P. Dimitrouleas (ss, Deputy Clerk)
PACER 416 Filed: 10/12/2000, Entered: 10/13/2000 Plea Agreement
Plea Agreement as to Joseph Rotunno (ss, Deputy Clerk)
PDF 415 Filed: 10/12/2000, Entered: 10/13/2000 Minutes - MiscellaneousCourt Filing
Minutes of Change of Plea held on 10/12/00 before Judge William P. Dimitrouleas as to Joseph Rotunno; GUILTY: Joseph Rotunno (2) count(s) 1 ; Sentencing 1/5/01 at 11:30; Court Reporter Name or Tape #: Bob Ryckoff (ss, Deputy Clerk)
Blank -- Filed: 10/12/2000, Entered: 10/16/2000 Bond Hearing
Bond hearing as to Joseph Rotunno held (ss, Deputy Clerk)
Blank -- Filed: 10/12/2000, Entered: 10/13/2000 Change of Plea Hearing
Change of Plea Hearing as to Joseph Rotunno held (ss, Deputy Clerk)
PDF 398 Filed: 10/4/2000, Entered: 10/4/2000 Supplement
SUPPLEMENT by USA as to Joseph Rotunno to: [342-1] motion response (ss, Deputy Clerk)
PDF 396 Filed: 10/3/2000, Entered: 10/4/2000 Notice of Change of Address
NOTICE of Change of Address of Attorney by Joseph Rotunno (ss, Deputy Clerk)
PDF 393 Filed: 10/3/2000, Entered: 10/4/2000 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER as to Joseph Rotunno denying without prejudice [322-1] motion to have defendant undergo an independent evaluation for memory impairment/loss as to Joseph Rotunno (2), denying without prejudice [322-2] motion for medical severance as to Joseph Rotunno (2) (Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 10/3/00) CCAP [EOD Date: 10/4/00] CCAP (ss, Deputy Clerk)
PDF 392 Filed: 10/3/2000, Entered: 10/4/2000 Minutes - MiscellaneousCourt Filing
Minutes of motions for independent medical evaluation and motion to sever held on 10/3/00 before Judge William P. Dimitrouleas as to Joseph Rotunno; Court Reporter Name or Tape #: Bob Ryckoff (ss, Deputy Clerk)
Blank -- Filed: 10/3/2000, Entered: 10/4/2000 Motion Hearing
Motion hearing as to Joseph Rotunno re: [322-1] motion to have defendant undergo an independent evaluation for memory impairment/loss Motion hearing held, [322-2] motion for medical severance before Judge William P. Dimitrouleas (ss, Deputy Clerk)
PDF 391 Filed: 9/28/2000, Entered: 9/29/2000 Minutes - MiscellaneousCourt Filing
Minutes of Status Conference held on 9/28/00 before Judge William P. Dimitrouleas as to Joseph Rotunno; Status Conference 10/3/00 at 1:00; Court Reporter Name or Tape #: Bob Ryckoff (ss, Deputy Clerk)
Blank -- Filed: 9/28/2000, Entered: 9/29/2000 Status Conference
Status conference as to Joseph Rotunno held (ss, Deputy Clerk)
Blank 366 Filed: 9/22/2000, Entered: 9/26/2000 Sealed Document
SEALED DOCUMENT (ss, Deputy Clerk)
PDF 360 Filed: 9/22/2000, Entered: 9/25/2000 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER as to Joseph Rotunno [322-2] renewed motion for medical severance defer ruling as to Joseph Rotunno (2) Motion hearing before Judge William P. Dimitrouleas set for 1:00 9/28/00 for Joseph Rotunno for [322-1] motion to have defendant undergo an independent evaluation for memory impairment/loss (Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 9/22/00) CCAP [EOD Date: 9/25/00] CCAP (ss, Deputy Clerk)
PDF 359 Filed: 9/22/2000, Entered: 9/25/2000 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER as to Martin Zarcadoolas, Joseph Rotunno, Kaiser Akel, Bert Caskill, Daniel Meisel, Jeanne Brooks denying [301-1] motion to suppress recordings of statements and testimony concerning statements made by Zarcadoolas pursuant to authorizations for interception of wire communications and all evidence derived as a result of those interceptions as to Martin Zarcadoolas (12) (Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 9/22/00) CCAP [EOD Date: 9/25/00] CCAP (ss, Deputy Clerk)
PDF 354 Filed: 9/22/2000, Entered: 9/25/2000 Reply to Response
REPLY by Joseph Rotunno to response to [318-1] motion to suppress interception of wire communications, including legal argument (ss, Deputy Clerk)
PDF 353 Filed: 9/21/2000, Entered: 9/22/2000 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER as to Joseph Rotunno denying [321-1] motion for severance of offenses as to Joseph Rotunno (2) ( Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 9/21/00) CCAP [EOD Date: 9/22/00] CCAP (lh, Deputy Clerk)
PDF 352 Filed: 9/21/2000, Entered: 9/22/2000 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER as to Joseph Rotunno denying [316-1] motion in limine prohibiting or limiting the introduction of irrelevant, prejudicial evidence as to Joseph Rotunno (2) ( Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 9/21/00) CCAP [EOD Date: 9/22/00] CCAP (lh, Deputy Clerk)
PDF 345 Filed: 9/19/2000, Entered: 9/20/2000 Response in Opposition
RESPONSE by USA as to Joseph Rotunno, Martin Zarcadoolas in opposition to [318-1] motion to suppress interception of wire communications, including legal argument, [301-1] motion to suppress recordings of statements and testimony concerning statements made by Zarcadoolas pursuant to authorizations for interception of wire communications and all evidence derived as a result of those interceptions (ss, Deputy Clerk)
PDF 344 Filed: 9/19/2000, Entered: 9/20/2000 Response in Opposition
RESPONSE by USA as to Joseph Rotunno in opposition to [321-1] motion for severance of offenses (ss, Deputy Clerk)
PDF 343 Filed: 9/19/2000, Entered: 9/20/2000 Response in Opposition
OMNIBUS RESPONSE by USA as to Martin Zarcadoolas, Joseph Rotunno in opposition to [300-1] motion for Bill of Particulars, [300-2] motion to dismiss count 2, [300-3] motion to dismiss count 5, [300-4] motion for inspection and copying of tape recordings and transcripts of conversations between Zarcadoolas and Albert Polito, [300-5] motion to exclude tape recordings, or evidence of conversations between persons that refer to "Marty", [300-6] motion to strike both irrelevant and prejudicial allegations and the alias "Marty" from the indictment, [302-1] motion to exclude derogatory characterizations from tape-recordings, [315-1] request for specific Kyles/Brady/Agurs/Giglio/Napue Material, [316-1] motion in limine prohibiting or limiting the introduction of irrelevant, prejudicial evidence (ss, Deputy Clerk)
PDF 342 Filed: 9/19/2000, Entered: 9/20/2000 Response to Motion
RESPONSE by USA as to Joseph Rotunno re [322-1] motion to undergo an independent evaluation for memory impairment/loss, [322-2] motion for medical severance (ss, Deputy Clerk)
PDF 336 Filed: 9/12/2000, Entered: 9/13/2000 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER as to Joseph Rotunno [318-1] motion to suppress interception of wire communications, including legal argument defer ruling for ten days; [321-1] motion for severance of offenses defer ruling for ten days; [316-1] motion in limine prohibiting or limiting the introduction of irrelevant, prejudicial evidence defer ruling for ten days; [322-2] motion for medical severance under advisement as to Joseph Rotunno (2), [322-1] motion to have defendant undergo an independent evaluation for memory impairment/loss defer ruling for ten days (Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 9/12/00) CCAP [EOD Date: 9/13/00] CCAP (ss, Deputy Clerk)
PDF 334 Filed: 9/12/2000, Entered: 9/13/2000 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER as to Joseph Rotunno granting [320-1] motion to Adopt Motion of Other Defendant as to Joseph Rotunno (2) (Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 9/12/00) CCAP [EOD Date: 9/13/00] CCAP (ss, Deputy Clerk)
Blank 324 Filed: 9/11/2000, Entered: 9/12/2000 Sealed Document
SEALED DOCUMENT (ss, Deputy Clerk)
PDF 323 Filed: 9/11/2000, Entered: 9/12/2000 Motion to Seal
MOTION by Joseph Rotunno to seal memory loss evaluation submitted in support of his motion to have him independently evaluated for memory loss (ss, Deputy Clerk)
PDF 322 Filed: 9/11/2000, Entered: 9/12/2000, Terminated: 10/3/2000 Motion for Medical Exam
MOTION by Joseph Rotunno to have defendant undergo an independent evaluation for memory impairment/loss , and RENEWED for medical severance (ss, Deputy Clerk)
PDF 321 Filed: 9/11/2000, Entered: 9/12/2000, Terminated: 9/21/2000 Motion to Sever Defendant
MOTION by Joseph Rotunno for severance of offenses (ss, Deputy Clerk)
PDF 320 Filed: 9/11/2000, Entered: 9/12/2000, Terminated: 9/12/2000 Motion for Joinder
MOTION by Joseph Rotunno to Adopt Motion of Other Defendant (ss, Deputy Clerk)
PDF 319 Filed: 9/11/2000, Entered: 9/12/2000 Appendix
APPENDIX to: [318-1] motion to suppress interception of wire communications, including legal argument by Joseph Rotunno (ss, Deputy Clerk)
PDF 318 Filed: 9/11/2000, Entered: 9/12/2000 Motion to Suppress
MOTION by Joseph Rotunno to suppress interception of wire communications, including legal argument (ss, Deputy Clerk)
PDF 317 Filed: 9/11/2000, Entered: 9/12/2000 Appendix
APPENDIX to: [316-1] motion in limine prohibiting or limiting the introduction of irrelevant, prejudicial evidence by Joseph Rotunno (ss, Deputy Clerk)
PDF 316 Filed: 9/11/2000, Entered: 9/12/2000, Terminated: 9/21/2000 Motion in Limine
MOTION by Joseph Rotunno in limine prohibiting or limiting the introduction of irrelevant, prejudicial evidence (ss, Deputy Clerk)
PDF 292 Filed: 9/8/2000, Entered: 9/8/2000 Notice (Other)
NOTICE re: inspection of wiretap documents by Joseph Rotunno (ss, Deputy Clerk)
Blank -- Filed: 9/8/2000, Entered: 9/11/2000 Acknowledgment of Receipt from USCA
ACKNOWLEDGMENT of receipt by U.S.C.A. of: COR on 8/25/00 U.S.C.A. # 00-11998-A (Former Deputy Clerk)
Blank 291 Filed: 9/7/2000, Entered: 9/7/2000 Sealed Document
SEALED DOCUMENT (ss, Deputy Clerk)
Blank 290 Filed: 9/7/2000, Entered: 9/7/2000 Sealed Document
SEALED DOCUMENT (ss, Deputy Clerk)
Blank 289 Filed: 9/7/2000, Entered: 9/7/2000 Sealed Document
SEALED DOCUMENT (ss, Deputy Clerk)
PDF 285 Filed: 9/6/2000, Entered: 9/7/2000 Motion to Seal
MOTION by Joseph Rotunno to seal re: ex parte motion for extension of time (ss, Deputy Clerk)
PDF 284 Filed: 9/5/2000, Entered: 9/6/2000 Response to Motion
RESPONSE by USA as to Joseph Rotunno re [279-1] motion for extension of time to file motion to suppress interception wire communications (ss, Deputy Clerk)
PDF 281 Filed: 9/1/2000, Entered: 9/5/2000 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER as to Joseph Rotunno denying [279-1] motion for extension of time to file motion to suppress interception of wire communications as to Joseph Rotunno (2) (Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 9/1/00) CCAP [EOD Date: 9/5/00] CCAP (ss, Deputy Clerk)
PDF 279 Filed: 9/1/2000, Entered: 9/1/2000, Terminated: 9/1/2000 Motion for Extension of Time to File
MOTION by Joseph Rotunno for extension of time to file motion to suppress interception of wire communications (ss, Deputy Clerk)
PDF 288 Filed: 8/31/2000, Entered: 9/7/2000 USCA Decision on Interlocutory Appeal
USCA Decision on Interlocutory Appeal as to Joseph Rotunno re: [234-1] appeal. Appellant's motion for release pending conviction, construed as a motion for release pending trial, is denied. The Clerk is directed to close this appeal. (Former Deputy Clerk)
PDF 278 Filed: 8/30/2000, Entered: 8/31/2000 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER as to Joseph Rotunno denying [277-1] motion for the Court to order the United States Attorney's Office to set an alternate time to inspect the original wiretap documents as to Joseph Rotunno (2) (Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 8/30/00) CCAP [EOD Date: 8/31/00] CCAP (ss, Deputy Clerk)
PDF 277 Filed: 8/29/2000, Entered: 8/30/2000, Terminated: 8/30/2000 Motion to Compel
NOTICE of Conflict and EMERGENCY MOTION by Joseph Rotunno for the Court to order the United States Attorney's Office to set an alternate time to inspect the original wiretap documents (ss, Deputy Clerk)
Blank 276 Filed: 8/28/2000, Entered: 8/29/2000 Sealed Document
SEALED DOCUMENT (ss, Deputy Clerk)
Blank 275 Filed: 8/28/2000, Entered: 8/29/2000 Sealed Document
SEALED DOCUMENT (ss, Deputy Clerk)
PDF 274 Filed: 8/25/2000, Entered: 8/28/2000 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER as to Joseph Rotunno granting [265-1] motion for inspection of original documents re: court authorized interception of wire communications as to Joseph Rotunno (2) (Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 8/25/00) CCAP [EOD Date: 8/28/00] CCAP (ss, Deputy Clerk)
Blank 272 Filed: 8/24/2000, Entered: 8/25/2000 Sealed Document
SEALED DOCUMENT (ss, Deputy Clerk)
Blank 270 Filed: 8/24/2000, Entered: 8/24/2000 Sealed Document
SEALED DOCUMENT (ss, Deputy Clerk)
Blank 269 Filed: 8/24/2000, Entered: 8/24/2000 Sealed Document
SEALED DOCUMENT (ss, Deputy Clerk)
PDF 268 Filed: 8/23/2000, Entered: 8/24/2000 Response to Motion
RESPONSE by USA as to Joseph Rotunno re [265-1] motion for inspection of original documents re: court authorized interception of wire communications (ss, Deputy Clerk)
PDF 267 Filed: 8/21/2000, Entered: 8/22/2000 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER as to Joseph Rotunno [265-1] motion for inspection of original documents re: court authorized interception of wire communications defer ruling for five days (Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 8/21/00) CCAP [EOD Date: 8/22/00] CCAP (ss, Deputy Clerk)
PDF 266 Filed: 8/21/2000, Entered: 8/21/2000 Certificate of Readiness
Certificate of readiness transmitted to USCA as to Joseph Rotunno re: [234-1] appeal by Joseph Rotunno USCA # 00-11998-A (Former Deputy Clerk)
PDF 265 Filed: 8/18/2000, Entered: 8/21/2000, Terminated: 8/25/2000 Motion to Unseal Case
MOTION by Joseph Rotunno for inspection of original documents re: court authorized interception of wire communications (ss, Deputy Clerk)
PDF 264 Filed: 8/11/2000, Entered: 8/15/2000 Appeal - Miscellaneous
Appeal Information Sheet as to Joseph Rotunno re: [234-1] appeal Transcript filed on 8/4/00 for Joseph Rotunno (Former Deputy Clerk)
PDF 263 Filed: 8/8/2000, Entered: 8/9/2000 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER as to Joseph Rotunno denying without prejudice [251-2] motion for medical severance as to Joseph Rotunno (2), denying without prejudice [251-3] motion to allow the defendant to be examined by his regular treating physicians as to Joseph Rotunno (2) (Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 8/8/00) CCAP [EOD Date: 8/9/00] CCAP (ss, Deputy Clerk)
PDF 260 Filed: 8/8/2000, Entered: 8/8/2000 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER as to Joseph Rotunno [251-2] motion for medical severance defers ruling for five days; [251-3] motion to allow the defendant to be examined by his regular treating physicians defers ruling for five days (Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 8/8/00) CCAP [EOD Date: 8/8/00] CCAP (ss, Deputy Clerk)
PDF 258 Filed: 8/7/2000, Entered: 8/8/2000 Response to Motion
RESPONSE by USA as to Joseph Rotunno re [251-2] motion for medical severance, [251-3] motion to allow the defendant to be examined by his regular treating physicians (ss, Deputy Clerk)
PDF 256 Filed: 8/7/2000, Entered: 8/7/2000 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER as to Reynolds Maragni, Joseph Rotunno, Percy Morris, Bert Caskill, Gary Braeseke, Emro Capri, William Hawkins, James Travers, Barbara Drezek, Martin Zarcadoolas, Michael Eddy, Richard D'Onofrio, Jeanne Brooks; Reset Jury trial for 9:00 10/23/00 for Reynolds Maragni, for Joseph Rotunno, for Percy Morris, for Bert Caskill, for Gary Braeseke, for Emro Capri, for William Hawkins, for James Travers, for Barbara Drezek, for Martin Zarcadoolas, for Michael Eddy, for Richard D'Onofrio, for Jeanne Brooks before Judge William P. Dimitrouleas , Reset calendar call for 9:00 10/20/00 for Reynolds Maragni, for Joseph Rotunno, for Percy Morris, for Bert Caskill, for Gary Braeseke, for Emro Capri, for William Hawkins, for James Travers, for Barbara Drezek, for Martin Zarcadoolas, for Michael Eddy, for Richard D'Onofrio, for Jeanne Brooks before Judge William P. Dimitrouleas , to Continue in Interest of Justice (Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 8/7/00) CCAP [EOD Date: 8/7/00] CCAP (ss, Deputy Clerk)
PDF 257 Filed: 8/4/2000, Entered: 8/7/2000 Transcript - AppealCourt Filing
TRANSCRIPT filed as to Joseph Rotunno of Review of Detention Order Hearing held 7/13/00 before Judge William P. Dimitrouleas Volume #: 1 Pages: 1-47 re: [234-1] appeal . Appeal record due on 8/19/00 for Joseph Rotunno (Former Deputy Clerk)
PDF 255 Filed: 8/4/2000, Entered: 8/7/2000 Minutes - MiscellaneousCourt Filing
Minutes of Calendar Call/Status Conference held on 8/4/00 before Judge William P. Dimitrouleas as to Reynolds Maragni, Joseph Rotunno, Percy Morris, Bert Caskill, Gary Braeseke, Emro Capri, Daniel Meisel, William Hawkins, James Travers, Martin Zarcadoolas, Michael Eddy, Kaiser Akel, Richard D'Onofrio, Scott Miller, Jeanne Brooks; Pretrial Motion deadline 9/11/00; Calendar Call 10/20/00 at 9:00; 2 week trial period 10/23/00 at 9:00; Calendar Call Reset 8/8/00 at 8:45 as to Daniel Meisel, Kaiser Akel and Scott Miller; Court Reporter Name or Tape #: Bob Ryckoff (ss, Deputy Clerk)
Blank 254 Filed: 8/4/2000, Entered: 8/7/2000 Sealed Document
SEALED DOCUMENT (ss, Deputy Clerk)
Blank -- Filed: 8/4/2000, Entered: 8/7/2000 Status Conference
Status conference as to Reynolds Maragni, Joseph Rotunno, Percy Morris, Bert Caskill, Gary Braeseke, Emro Capri, Daniel Meisel, William Hawkins, James Travers, Martin Zarcadoolas, Michael Eddy, Kaiser Akel, Richard D'Onofrio, Scott Miller, Jeanne Brooks held (ss, Deputy Clerk)
Blank 253 Filed: 8/2/2000, Entered: 8/3/2000 Sealed Document
SEALED DOCUMENT (ss, Deputy Clerk)
PDF 252 Filed: 8/2/2000, Entered: 8/3/2000 Motion to Seal
MOTION by Joseph Rotunno to seal re: renewed motion for continuance, motion for medical severance, motion to allow the defendant to be examined by his regular treating physicians and certification (ss, Deputy Clerk)
PDF 251 Filed: 8/2/2000, Entered: 8/3/2000 Motion to Continue
RENEWED MOTION with certification pursuant to local rule 88.9 by Joseph Rotunno for continuance of trial , for medical severance , to allow the defendant to be examined by his regular treating physicians (ss, Deputy Clerk)
PDF 250 Filed: 8/1/2000, Entered: 8/2/2000 Transcript Information Form
TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM as to Joseph Rotunno re: [234-1] appeal received. (Forwarded to Court Reporter Coordinator) (Former Deputy Clerk)
Blank -- Filed: 8/1/2000, Entered: 8/2/2000 Notice of Receipt of Transmittal Letter from USCA
NOTICE of Receipt of Transmittal Letter from USCA as to Joseph Rotunno Re: [234-1] appeal USCA Number: 00-13913-G (Former Deputy Clerk)
PDF 249 Filed: 7/31/2000, Entered: 8/1/2000 Notice (Other)
NOTICE of Conflict by Joseph Rotunno (ss, Deputy Clerk)
PDF 243 Filed: 7/28/2000, Entered: 7/28/2000 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER as to Joseph Rotunno denying without prejudice [221-1] revised motion for continuance of trial date as to Joseph Rotunno (2) (Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 7/28/00) CCAP [EOD Date 7/28/00] CCAP (ss, Deputy Clerk)
PDF 234 Filed: 7/25/2000, Entered: 7/25/2000, Terminated: 8/31/2000 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal
NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL by Joseph Rotunno re: [160-1] order EOD Date: 7/5/00; Filing Fee: $ 105.00; Receipt #: 520034; Copies to USCA, AUSA, USM, USPTS and Counsel of Record. (Former Deputy Clerk)
Blank -- Filed: 7/25/2000, Entered: 7/25/2000 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet
Certified copies of Notice of Appeal, Docket and Order under appeal to USCA: as to Joseph Rotunno [234-1] appeal (Former Deputy Clerk)
PDF 233 Filed: 7/21/2000, Entered: 7/25/2000 Status Report OrderCourt Filing
STATUS REPORT ORDER as to Joseph Rotunno. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow on 7/21/00) CCAP [EOD Date: 7/25/00] CCAP (ss, Deputy Clerk)
PDF 224 Filed: 7/21/2000, Entered: 7/24/2000 Minutes - MiscellaneousCourt Filing
Minutes of Status Conference held on 7/21/00 before Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow as to Joseph Rotunno; Court Reporter Name or Tape #: 00-039 @ 631 (ss, Deputy Clerk)
Blank -- Filed: 7/21/2000, Entered: 7/24/2000 Status Conference
Status conference as to Joseph Rotunno held (ss, Deputy Clerk)
PDF 222 Filed: 7/20/2000, Entered: 7/21/2000 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER as to Joseph Rotunno denying without prejudice [217-1] motion for continuance of trial date as to Joseph Rotunno (2) (Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 7/20/00) CCAP [EOD 7/21/00] CCAP (ss, Deputy Clerk)
PDF 221 Filed: 7/20/2000, Entered: 7/21/2000, Terminated: 7/28/2000 Motion to Continue
REVISED MOTION with certification by Joseph Rotunno for continuance of trial date (ss, Deputy Clerk)
PDF 220 Filed: 7/19/2000, Entered: 7/20/2000 TranscriptCourt Filing
TRANSCRIPT filed as to Reynolds Maragni, Joseph Rotunno, Percy Morris, Bert Caskill, Gary Braeseke, Emro Capri, Martin Halpern, Daniel Meisel, William Hawkins, James Travers, Barbara Drezek, Martin Zarcadoolas, Michael Eddy, Kaiser Akel, James Lapolla, Richard D'Onofrio, Scott Miller, Jeanne Brooks of Arraignment of Percy Morris and Detention Hearing for Joseph Rotunno held 6/27/00 before Judge Stephen T. Brown Pages: 1-62 (sn, Deputy Clerk)
PDF 217 Filed: 7/19/2000, Entered: 7/20/2000, Terminated: 7/20/2000 Motion to Continue
MOTION with certification pursuant to local rule 88.9 by Joseph Rotunno for continuance of trial date (ss, Deputy Clerk)
PDF 213 Filed: 7/17/2000, Entered: 7/20/2000 Order of Detention
ORDER OF DETENTION as to Joseph Rotunno (Signed by Magistrate Stephen T. Brown on 7/13/00) CCAP (ss, Deputy Clerk)
PDF 207 Filed: 7/14/2000, Entered: 7/17/2000 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER as to Joseph Rotunno denying [176-1] motion to revoke or amend [160-1] pretrial detention order to establish reasonable conditions of pretrial release as to Joseph Rotunno (2) (Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 7/14/00) CCAP [EOD Date: 7/17/00] CCAP (ss, Deputy Clerk)
PDF 206 Filed: 7/13/2000, Entered: 7/14/2000 Exhibit and Witness List
Exhibit and Witness List as to Joseph Rotunno (ss, Deputy Clerk)
PDF 205 Filed: 7/13/2000, Entered: 7/14/2000 Minutes - MiscellaneousCourt Filing
Minutes of Review of detention order/hearing held on 7/13/00 before Judge William P. Dimitrouleas as to Joseph Rotunno; Court Reporter Name or Tape #: Bob Ryckoff (ss, Deputy Clerk)
Blank -- Filed: 7/13/2000, Entered: 7/14/2000 Motion Hearing
Review of detention order/hearing as to Joseph Rotunno re: [176-1] motion to revoke or amend [160-1] pretrial detention order to establish reasonable conditions of pretrial release held before Judge William P. Dimitrouleas (ss, Deputy Clerk)
PDF 202 Filed: 7/12/2000, Entered: 7/13/2000 Response in Opposition
RESPONSE by USA as to Joseph Rotunno in opposition to [176-1] motion to revoke or amend [160-1] pretrial detention order to establish reasonable conditions of pretrial release (ss, Deputy Clerk)
PDF 201 Filed: 7/12/2000, Entered: 7/12/2000 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER as to Joseph Rotunno granting De Novo Hearing: Hearing before Judge William P. Dimitrouleas set for 1:00 7/13/00 re: [176-1] motion to revoke or amend [160-1] pretrial detention order to establish reasonable conditions of pretrial release (Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 7/12/00) CCAP [EOD Date: 7/12/00] CCAP (ss, Deputy Clerk)
Blank 198 Filed: 7/11/2000, Entered: 7/12/2000 Sealed Document
SEALED DOCUMENT (ss, Deputy Clerk)
Blank 197 Filed: 7/11/2000, Entered: 7/12/2000 Sealed Document
SEALED DOCUMENT (ss, Deputy Clerk)
PDF 193 Filed: 7/10/2000, Entered: 7/11/2000 Warrant Returned Executed
arrest WARRANT Returned Executed as to Joseph Rotunno on 6/22/00 (Former Deputy Clerk)
PDF 191 Filed: 7/10/2000, Entered: 7/11/2000 Notice of HearingCourt Filing
NOTICE of Hearing as to Reynolds Maragni, Joseph Rotunno, Percy Morris, Bert Caskill, Gary Braeseke, Emro Capri, Martin Halpern, William Hawkins, James Travers, Martin Zarcadoolas, Michael Eddy, Kaiser Akel, Richard D'Onofrio, Scott Miller, Jeanne Brooks: Set Jury trial for 9:00 8/7/00 before Judge William P. Dimitrouleas , Set calendar call for 9:00 8/4/00 before Judge William P. Dimitrouleas (ss, Deputy Clerk)
PDF 176 Filed: 7/7/2000, Entered: 7/10/2000, Terminated: 7/12/2000 Motion to Amend/Correct
MOTION by Joseph Rotunno to revoke or amend [160-1] pretrial detention order to establish reasonable conditions of pretrial release (ss, Deputy Clerk)
Blank 175 Filed: 7/7/2000, Entered: 7/10/2000 Sealed Document
SEALED DOCUMENT (ss, Deputy Clerk)
Blank 174 Filed: 7/7/2000, Entered: 7/10/2000 Sealed Document
SEALED DOCUMENT (ss, Deputy Clerk)
PDF 173 Filed: 7/7/2000, Entered: 7/10/2000 Arraignment Information Sheet
ARRAIGNMENT INFORMATION SHEET for Joseph Rotunno (2) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4, 5, 6 NOT GUILTY PLEA ENTERED as to all counts. Court accepts plea. (ss, Deputy Clerk)
PDF 172 Filed: 7/7/2000, Entered: 7/7/2000 Order Re: Status ConferenceCourt Filing
ORDER RE: STATUS CONFERENCE, SPEEDY TRIAL, PRETRIAL MATTERS as to Joseph Rotunno Status conference set for 11:00 7/21/00 for Joseph Rotunno before Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow (Signed by Magistrate Barry S. Seltzer on 7/7/00) CCAP [EOD Date: 7/7/00] CCAP (ss, Deputy Clerk)
PDF 171 Filed: 7/7/2000, Entered: 7/7/2000 Standing Discovery Order
STANDING DISCOVERY ORDER as to Joseph Rotunno all motions concerning matters not covered by this order must be filed within 28 days of this order (Signed by Magistrate Barry S. Seltzer on 7/7/00) CCAP (ss, Deputy Clerk)
PDF 170 Filed: 7/7/2000, Entered: 7/7/2000 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
NOTICE of Appearance for Joseph Rotunno by Attorney Harry Dohn Williams Jr. (ss, Deputy Clerk)
PDF 169 Filed: 7/7/2000, Entered: 7/7/2000 Minutes - Miscellaneous
Minutes of Inquiry Re Counsel/Arraignment held on 7/7/00 before Magistrate Barry S. Seltzer as to Joseph Rotunno; Status Conference 7/21/00 at 11:00; Court Reporter Name or Tape #: 00-054 @ 2799-2843 (ss, Deputy Clerk)
PDF 162 Filed: 7/3/2000, Entered: 7/5/2000 Order on Hearing to Report Re: CounselCourt Filing
ORDER on Hearing to Report Re Counsel as to Joseph Rotunno by reset to 11:00 6/30/00 for Joseph Rotunno before Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow (Signed by Magistrate Stephen T. Brown on 6/27/00) Tape # 00D-72-860, 73-1 CCAP (ss, Deputy Clerk)
PDF 160 Filed: 7/3/2000, Entered: 7/5/2000 Order of Detention
ORDER OF DETENTION as to Joseph Rotunno (Danger) (Signed by Magistrate Stephen T. Brown on 6/27/00) Tape # 00D-72-860, 73-1 CCAP (ss, Deputy Clerk)
PDF 120 Filed: 6/30/2000, Entered: 7/3/2000 Response to Standing Discovery Order
RESPONSE to Standing Discovery Order by USA as to Joseph Rotunno (ss, Deputy Clerk)
Blank -- Filed: 6/30/2000, Entered: 7/3/2000 Indictment Unsealed
Indictment unsealed as to Reynolds Maragni, Joseph Rotunno, Percy Morris, Bert Caskill, Gary Braeseke, Emro Capri, Martin Halpern, Daniel Meisel, William Hawkins, James Travers, Barbara Drezek, Martin Zarcadoolas, Michael Eddy, Kaiser Akel, James Lapolla, Richard D'Onofrio, Scott Miller, Jeanne Brooks (mg, Deputy Clerk)
PDF 105 Filed: 6/28/2000, Entered: 6/29/2000 Order of RecusalCourt Filing
ORDER OF RECUSAL: transferring case to the calendar of District Judge William P. Dimitrouleas as to Reynolds Maragni, Joseph Rotunno, Percy Morris, Bert Caskill, Gary Braeseke, Emro Capri, Martin Halpern, Daniel Meisel, William Hawkins, James Travers, Barbara Drezek, Martin Zarcadoolas, Michael Eddy, Kaiser Akel, James Lapolla, Richard D'Onofrio, Scott Jeanne Brooks ( Signed by Judge Adalberto Jordan on 6/26/00) CCAP [EOD Date: 6/29/00] CCAP (Former Deputy Clerk)
Blank -- Filed: 6/28/2000, Entered: 6/29/2000 Case Assigned/Reassigned
CASE reassigned to Judge William P. Dimitrouleas (Former Deputy Clerk)
PDF 71 Filed: 6/22/2000, Entered: 6/29/2000 Order on Initial AppearanceCourt Filing
ORDER on Initial Appearance as to Joseph Rotunno Bond set to for Joseph Rotunno. Detention hearing set for 2:00 6/27/00 for Joseph Rotunno before Magistrate Brown ; Arraignment set for 11:00 6/30/00 for Joseph Rotunno ; Report re counsel set for 11:00 6/30/00 for Joseph Rotunno ; before Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow, , ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow on 6/21/00) Tape # 00-31 CCAP (Former Deputy Clerk)
PDF 57 Filed: 6/22/2000, Entered: 6/29/2000 Minutes - MiscellaneousCourt Filing
Minutes of initial appearance held on 6/21/00 before Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow as to Joseph Rotunno ; set Detention Hearing for 6/27/00 2:00 before Magistrate Stephen T. Brown , and setting Report re counsel for 6/30/00 11:00 before Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow , and set Arraignment for 6/30/00 11:00 before Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow Tape #: FTL/LSS 00-031-1197 thru 1470 (Former Deputy Clerk)
PDF 22 Filed: 6/21/2000, Entered: 6/27/2000 Order to Unseal IndictmentCourt Filing
ORDER unsealing as to Reynolds Maragni, Joseph Rotunno, Percy Morris, Bert Caskill, Gary Braeseke, Emro Capri, Martin Halpern, Daniel Meisel, William Hawkins, James Travers, Barbara Drezek, Martin Zarcadoolas, Michael Eddy, Kaiser Akel, James Lapolla, Richard D'Onofrio, Scott Miller, Jeanne Brooks ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow on 6/21/00) CCAP [EOD Date: 6/27/00] (Former Deputy Clerk)
PDF 5 Filed: 6/6/2000, Entered: 6/7/2000 Warrant Issued
ARREST WARRANT issued as to Joseph Rotunno . Warrant issued by Magistrate Barry S. Seltzer Pretrial Detention Requested (Former Deputy Clerk)
PDF 3 Filed: 6/6/2000, Entered: 6/7/2000 Indictment (Sealed)
SEALED INDICTMENT as to Reynolds Maragni (1) count(s) 1, 3, 4, 5, Joseph Rotunno (2) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4, 5, 6, Percy Morris (3) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4, 5, Bert Caskill (4) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4, 5, Gary Braeseke (5) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4, 5, Emro Capri (6) count(s) 1, 2, 5, Martin Halpern (7) count(s) 1, 2, Daniel Meisel (8) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4, William Hawkins (9) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4, James Travers (10) count(s) 1, 2, Barbara Drezek (11) count(s) 1, 2, Martin Zarcadoolas (12) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4, 5, Michael Eddy (13) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4, 5, Kaiser Akel (14) count(s) 1, 5, James Lapolla (15) count(s) 1, 3, 4, Richard D'Onofrio (16) count(s) 1, 6, Scott Miller (17) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4, Jeanne Brooks (18) count(s) 1 (Criminal Category 3) (Former Deputy Clerk)
PDF 2 Filed: 6/6/2000, Entered: 6/7/2000 Order
ORDER as to Reynolds Maragni, Joseph Rotunno, Percy Morris, Bert Caskill, Gary Braeseke, Emro Capri, Martin Halpern, Daniel Meisel, William Hawkins, James Travers, Barbara Drezek, Martin Zarcadoolas, Michael Eddy, Kaiser Akel, James Lapolla, Richard D'Onofrio, Scott Miller, Jeanne Brooks granting [1-1] motion to seal indictment and arrest warrants until the arrest of the first defendant as to Reynolds Maragni (1), Joseph Rotunno (2), Percy Morris (3), Bert Caskill (4), Gary Braeseke (5), Emro Capri (6), Martin Halpern (7), Daniel Meisel (8), William Hawkins (9), James Travers (10), Barbara Drezek (11), Martin Zarcadoolas (12), Michael Eddy (13), Kaiser Akel (14), James Lapolla (15), Richard D'Onofrio (16), Scott Miller (17), Jeanne Brooks (18) ( Signed by Magistrate Barry S. Seltzer on 6/6/00) CCAP [EOD Date: 6/7/00] CCAP (Former Deputy Clerk)
PDF 1 Filed: 6/6/2000, Entered: 6/7/2000, Terminated: 6/6/2000 Motion to Seal
MOTION by USA as to Reynolds Maragni, Joseph Rotunno, Percy Morris, Bert Caskill, Gary Braeseke, Emro Capri, Martin Halpern, Daniel Meisel, William Hawkins, James Travers, Barbara Drezek, Martin Zarcadoolas, Michael Eddy, Kaiser Akel, James Lapolla, Richard D'Onofrio, Scott Miller, Jeanne Brooks to seal indictment and arrest warrants until the arrest of the first defendant (Former Deputy Clerk)
Blank -- Filed: 6/6/2000, Entered: 6/7/2000 Magistrate Judge Selection
Magistrate identification: Magistrate Judge Ted E. Bandstra (Former Deputy Clerk)

Statistics

This case has been viewed 180 times.

No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Need Password Help?