Smith, et al v. City and County of H
Hawaii District Court, Case No. 1:02-cv-00287-SOM-BMK
District Judge SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY, presiding
docket://gov.uscourts.hid.1-02-cv-00287-SOM (What is this?)

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Judges don't know as much about themselves as we do.
Access comprehensive profiles on judges, firms, lawyers, and more with PlainSite Pro and Pro Se.
No Logo James Smith, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Aitchison & Vick, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
MacDaniel Reynolds +1 503 282 6160

Toggle Switch Represented by Alston Hunt Floyd & Ing

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Thomas E. Bush +5241 524 524 1800 teb@ahfi.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Winer Meheula & Devens LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Vladimir Devens +2545 254 254 5855 +2546 254 254 6872 devens@pacificlaw.com
David F. Fasi +2954 295 295 4911 +3771 377 377 1282 fasi@pacificlaw.com
William Meheula +1 808 528 5003 +2546 254 254 6872 meheula@pacificlaw.com
v.
No Logo City and County of Honolulu , Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
David Z. Arakawa +5 234 859 main

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of Corporation Counsel-Honolulu

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Duane W.H. Pang dpang1@honolulu.gov
Paul T. Tsukiyama +5 234 859 main ptsukiyama@honolulu.gov
Office Hawaii
Filed 5/13/2002
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 710 - Labor: Fair Standards
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1441 Petition for Removal
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Transfer/Remand - Remanded to State Court
County Honolulu
Terminated 10/18/2002
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case CV02-1-1006-04[First Circuit]
Def Custody Status
Flags REMAND, TERMED
  Entries (62) Calendar Events Related (0) Tools Right End
Blank 59 Filed: 11/18/2002, Entered: 11/19/2002 Minutes - MiscellaneousCourt Filing
EO : Status Conference-Regarding Related Cases- CV NO. 02-00289HG-KSC, CV NO. 02-00296HG-BMK and CV 02-00286SPK-KSC as to Consolidation set for 11/25/2002 09:00 AM before Judge Chang. ; settlement/status conference set for 9:00 11/25/02 before Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang () JUDGE Judge Kevin S. Chang (bbb)
Blank 58 Filed: 11/7/2002, Entered: 11/8/2002 Acknowledgment of Service
ACCEPTANCE/ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE on 11/4/02 by First Circuit Court State of Hawaii of remanded case CV 02-1-1006-04 (fe)
Blank 57 Filed: 10/22/2002, Entered: 10/23/2002 Joinder
Plaintiffs' thirty-fourth filing on consents to JOIN action; certificate of service by plaintiff James Smith (bbb)
Blank 56 Filed: 10/21/2002, Entered: 10/23/2002 Joinder
Plaintiffs' thirty-third filing of consents to JOIN action; certificate of service by plaintiff James Smith (bbb)
Blank 55 Filed: 10/18/2002, Entered: 10/21/2002 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER adopting Magistrate's findings and recommendation granting motion to remand by Judge Samuel P. King [43-1], [36-1] (cc: all counsel) (bbb)
Blank 54 Filed: 10/18/2002, Entered: 10/21/2002 Joinder
Plaintiffs' thirty-second filing of consents to JOIN action; certificate of service (bbb)
Blank 53 Filed: 10/16/2002, Entered: 10/17/2002 Joinder
Plaintiffs' thirty-first filing of consents to JOIN action; certificate of service by plaintiff James Smith (bbb)
Blank 52 Filed: 10/15/2002, Entered: 10/16/2002 Joinder
Plaintiffs' thirtieth filing of consents to JOIN action; certificate of service by plaintiff James Smith (bbb)
Blank 51 Filed: 10/9/2002, Entered: 10/11/2002 Joinder
Plaintiffs' twenty-ninth filing of consentes to JOIN action; certificate of service by plaintiff James Smith (bbb)
Blank 50 Filed: 10/8/2002, Entered: 10/10/2002 Joinder
Plaintiffs' twenty-eight filing of consents to JOIN action; certificate of service (bbb)
Blank 49 Filed: 9/26/2002, Entered: 9/27/2002 Joinder
Plaintiffs' twenty-seventh filing of consents to JOIN action; certificate of service (bbb)
Blank 48 Filed: 9/24/2002, Entered: 9/27/2002 Minutes - MiscellaneousCourt Filing
EO : Pursuant to the Stipulation of the parties in Civ. Nos. 02-00286SPK-KSC, 02-00287SOM-BMK, 02-00289HG-KSC and 02-00296HG-BMK, the review of United States Magistrate Judge Kevin Chang's Findings and Recommendations (regarding respective Motions to Remand) shall be done by the same United States District Judge. Under Court policy, unless otherwise ordered, the mater follows the "low number" rule. Accordingly, the review of the Findings and Recommendation shall be done by Judge Samuel P. King who is the presiding Judge in Civ. No. 02-00286SPK-KSC. At present, the matters are not consolidated for any other purposes. For administrative purposes, the Order of September 19, 2002, adopting the Findings and Recommendation in Civ. No. 02-00286SPK-KSC is VACATED without prejudice to being reentered later. The maters are submitted for decision regarding respective Motions to Remand cc: All Counsel of Record ( Ct Rptr : ) JUDGE Samuel P. King (lmg) Modified on 09/27/2002
Blank 47 Filed: 9/23/2002, Entered: 9/24/2002 Joinder
Plaintiffs; twenty-sixth filing of consents to JOIN action; certificate of service (bbb)
Blank 46 Filed: 9/23/2002, Entered: 9/23/2002 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
STIPULATION and ORDER regarding assignment of United States District Court Judge to review United States Magistrate Judge's finding and recommendation denying motion for remand by Judge Susan O. Mollway : re [43-1] (bbb)
Blank 45 Filed: 9/17/2002, Entered: 9/19/2002 Joinder
Plaintiffs' twenty-fifth filing of consentes to JOIN action; certificate of service by plaintiff James Smith (bbb)
Blank 44 Filed: 9/13/2002, Entered: 9/16/2002 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
RESPONSE by plaintiff James Smith to defendant's objection [41-1] to Magistrate Chang's recommendation to grant plaintff's motion to remand dated August 20, 2002; certificate of service (eps)
Blank 43 Filed: 9/11/2002, Entered: 9/16/2002, Terminated: 9/23/2002 Findings and RecommendationsCourt Filing
Order Amending FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION concerning motion to remand [9-1] by Judge Kevin SC Chang (cc: all counsel & SOM) (bbb) Modified on 09/23/2002
Blank 42 Filed: 9/5/2002, Entered: 9/10/2002 Joinder
Plaintiffs' twenty-fourth filing of consents to JOIN action; certificate of service (bbb)
Blank 41 Filed: 9/3/2002, Entered: 9/10/2002 Response/Reply - Miscellaneous
OBJECTIONS by defendant City and County of Honolulu to order granting plaintiff James Smith's motion to remand dated August 20, 2002 [36-1] (bbb)
Blank 40 Filed: 8/30/2002, Entered: 9/3/2002 Joinder
Plaintiffs' Twenty-third filing of consents to JOIN action; certificate of service (bbb)
Blank 39 Filed: 8/29/2002, Entered: 8/30/2002 Joinder
Plaintiffs' twenty-second filing of consents to JOIN action; certificate of service (bbb)
Blank 38 Filed: 8/28/2002, Entered: 8/30/2002 Joinder
Plaintiffs' twenty-first filing of consents to JOIN action; certificate of service (bbb)
Blank 37 Filed: 8/26/2002, Entered: 8/30/2002 Joinder
Plaintiffs' Twentieth filing of consents to JOIN action; certificate of service (bbb)
Blank 36 Filed: 8/20/2002, Entered: 8/23/2002, Terminated: 9/3/2002 Findings and RecommendationsCourt Filing
FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION granting motion to remand [9-1] by Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang (cc: all counsel) (bbb)
Blank 35 Filed: 8/20/2002, Entered: 8/21/2002 Joinder
Plaintiffs' nineteenth filing of consents to JOIN action; certificate of service (bbb)
Blank 34 Filed: 8/20/2002, Entered: 8/21/2002 Joinder
Plaintiffs' eighteenth filing of consentes to JOIN action; certificate of service (bbb)
Blank 33 Filed: 8/14/2002, Entered: 8/15/2002 Joinder
Seventeenth filing of consents to JOIN action; certificate of service - by defendant re join/joinder [32-1] (fe)
Blank 32 Filed: 8/12/2002, Entered: 8/12/2002 Joinder
Plaintiffs' sixtenth filing of consents to JOIN action; certificate of service (bbb)
Blank 31 Filed: 8/9/2002, Entered: 8/12/2002 Minutes - MiscellaneousCourt Filing
EP : Plaintiff's Motions to Remand - arguments heard. Motions taken under advisement. Supplemental memorandum due by 8-14-02 from Mr. Aitchison. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference continued until moved on; taking under advisement on the motion to remand [9-1] ( Ct Rptr : tape C5 929) JUDGE Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang (lmg)
Blank 30 Filed: 8/8/2002, Entered: 8/9/2002 Joinder
Fifteenth filing of consents to JOIN actioni; certificate of service - by plaintiff (fe)
Blank 29 Filed: 8/2/2002, Entered: 8/2/2002 Scheduling Conference Statement
SCHEDULING CONFERENCE STATEMENT by plaintiff James Smith; certificate of service (bbb)
Blank 28 Filed: 8/2/2002, Entered: 8/2/2002 Certificate of Service
CERTIFICATE of service by defendant City and County of Honolulu (bbb)
Blank 27 Filed: 8/1/2002, Entered: 8/1/2002 Scheduling Conference Statement
SCHEDULING CONFERENCE STATEMENT by defendant City and County of H; certificate of service (fe)
Blank 26 Filed: 7/29/2002, Entered: 7/30/2002 Memorandum in Support of Motion
Reply MEMORANDUM by defendant in support of motion to remand [9-1]; certificate of service (fe)
Blank 25 Filed: 7/29/2002, Entered: 7/30/2002 Joinder
JOINDER by plaintiff to join action re [1-1]; certificate of service - the following employees of deft consent to join this action: John Agno; Mervin Asamura; Patti Asamura; Matthew Black, Jr.; Glen Cancino; Roger Cruz; Dennis Higa; Kim McCumsey; Susan Medeiros; Madeline Morikawa; Kevin Nishida; Garret Rivers; Patrick Romero; Denny Santiago; Moana Unwin; Leighton Uyeda (fe)
Blank 24 Filed: 7/22/2002, Entered: 7/23/2002 Joinder
Plaintiffs' thirteenth filing of consents to JOIN action; certificate of service [22-1] (bbb)
Blank 23 Filed: 7/19/2002, Entered: 7/22/2002 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
MEMORANDUM by defendant City and County of Honolulu in opposition to plaintiff's motion to remand filed 06/12/02 [9-1]; certificate of service (bbb)
Blank 22 Filed: 7/17/2002, Entered: 7/18/2002 Joinder
Twelfth filing of consents to JOIN action by plaintiff re [18-1]; certificate of service (fe)
Blank 21 Filed: 7/12/2002, Entered: 7/16/2002 Minutes - MiscellaneousCourt Filing
EO :Pursuant to the Stipulation and Order Regarding Magistrate Assignment filed on July 8, 2002, the Plaintiffs' Motions to Remand is rescheduled for Friday, August 9, 2002 at 10:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Kevin S. C. Chang. The Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is advanced from August 12, 2002 to August 9, 2002 at 10:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Kevin S. C. Chang. cc: Vladimir Devens Margaret Hanson Duane Pang Katherine Garson Blaine Kobayashi - setting hearing on motion to remand [9-1] 10:30 8/9/02 rule 16 conference set for 10:30 8/9/02 before Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang ( Ct Rptr : ) JUDGE Mag Kevin S. Chang (fe)
Blank 20 Filed: 7/11/2002, Entered: 7/11/2002 Ex Parte Motion and orderCourt Filing
EX PARTE MOTION and Order by Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren by plaintiff James Smith for attorney MacDaniel Reynolds to appear pro hac vice ; declaration of Vladimir Devens; declaration of MadDaniel Reynolds; certificate of service (fe)
Blank -- Filed: 7/11/2002, Entered: 7/11/2002 Filing Fee Received
FILING FEE PAID in the amount of $ 100.00, receipt # 209872- for PHV atty MacDaniel Reynolds (fe)
Blank 19 Filed: 7/9/2002, Entered: 7/10/2002 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
STIPULATION and ORDER regarding magistrate assignment by Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren : re motion to remand [9-1] (fe)
Blank 18 Filed: 7/8/2002, Entered: 7/9/2002 Joinder
Plaintiffs' eleventh filing of consentes to JOIN action; certificate of service by plaintiff James Smith (bbb)
Blank 17 Filed: 7/3/2002, Entered: 7/5/2002 Joinder
JOINDER by plaintiff - Tenth filing of consents to join actioin; certificate of service (fe)
Blank 16 Filed: 6/27/2002, Entered: 6/28/2002 Joinder
Plaintiff's Ninth filing of consents to JOIN action - re removal complaint [1-1]; certificate of service: the following employees of defendant City & County of Honolulu consent to join this action: (1) Nicholas Akaka, (2) Gerry Asato, (3) David Caraulia, (4) Darren Chun, (5) William Gasper, Jr. (6) Michael Ilar, (7) Dagan Tsuchida; these listed employees consent to their inclusion as party plaintiffs in this action (bbb)
Blank 15 Filed: 6/19/2002, Entered: 6/20/2002 Report of Planning Meeting
REPORT OF PARTIES PLANNING MEETING by plaintiff; discovery plan; certificate of service (fe)
Blank 14 Filed: 6/19/2002, Entered: 6/20/2002 Joinder
Eighth filing of consents to JOIN action by plaintiff re removal complaint [1-1]; certificate of service: the following employees of defendant City and County of Honolulu consent to join this action: (1) Joseph Amasiu; (2) Samuel Arcalas; (3)Tay Deering, Jr.; (4)Harris Donlin; (5)Michael Doole; (6) Alex Duyag; (7)Taase Faumui; (8)Brian Johnson; (9)Gilbert Kilantang; (10)Harrison Kim Han; (11)Gail Lovediro; (12)John Lovediro III; (13)Kyle Luke; (14)Rogert Napoleon, Jr.; (15)Robert Phillips; (16)Paul Pladera; (17)Derrick Sagawa; (18) Clifford Takesono; (19)Doreen Teramae; (20)Dason Toma; (21)Roy Tsujioka; (22)Timothy Wong; these listed employees consent to their inclusion as party plaintiffs in this action. (fe)
Blank 13 Filed: 6/18/2002, Entered: 6/20/2002 Certificate of Service
CERTIFICATE of service by plaintiff James Smith (bbb)
Blank 12 Filed: 6/18/2002, Entered: 6/19/2002 Minutes - MiscellaneousCourt Filing
EO :Plaintiff's x motion to remand [9-1] filed 6/12/02 is set for hearing on 2:00 8/9/02 before Magistrate Judge Barry M. Kurren ( Ct Rptr : ) JUDGE Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (fe)
Blank 11 Filed: 6/18/2002, Entered: 6/18/2002 Ex Parte Motion and orderCourt Filing
EX PARTE MOTION and Order by Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren by plaintiff James Smith for attorney William Aitchison to appear pro hac vice ; declaration of Vladimir Devens; declaration of William Aitchison; certificate of service (fe)
Blank 10 Filed: 6/17/2002, Entered: 6/18/2002 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER by Judge Susan O. Mollway referring to Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren the motion to remand [9-1] (fe)
Blank 9 Filed: 6/12/2002, Entered: 6/14/2002 Motion to RemandCourt Filing
NOTICE OF MOTION and motion by plaintiff James Smith to remand ; memorandum in support of motion; declaration of Vladimir Devens; exhibit a; certificate of service; referred to Judge Susan O. Mollway (bbb)
Blank -- Filed: 6/12/2002, Entered: 6/18/2002 Filing Fee Received
FILING FEE PAID in the amount of $ 100.00, receipt # 209273 - for PHV attorney William Aitchison (fe)
Blank 8 Filed: 6/11/2002, Entered: 6/12/2002 Joinder
Seventh filing of consent to JOIN action by plaintiff re removal complaint [1-1]: the following employees of defendant City and County of Honolulu consent to join this action: (1) Wallau Ainciu, (2) Daron Akiyama, (3) Tara Amuimuia, (4) Bryan Ellis, (5) John Esteban, (6) Terrence Kong, (7) Leslie Morris, (8) Lambert Ohio, (9) Sterling Ohia, (10) William Passos, (11) Jesus Rosalez, (12) Kevin Thomas, (13) James Vadset, (14) Alvin Vierra, Jr. (fe)
Blank 7 Filed: 6/5/2002, Entered: 6/7/2002 Joinder
Sixth filing of consents to JOIN action by plaintiff: the following defendant City and Count of Honolulu consent to join this action: Stanford Afong, Paul Awana, Rick Barnett, John Bennett, Alan Bluemke, Robert Bolson, Mark Boyce, Richard Brink, Philip Camero, Kean Caneda, John Cheong, Wallace Choy, Theodore Coons, Clinton Corpuz, Mark Cricchio, Frederick Denault Jr., David Do, Stacey Forges, Martha Fontana-Kwon, Stephen Forman, Howard Fu, Glen Gaspar, Gordon Gomes, Nathan Hee, Clyde Ho, Henry Holcombe, Erik Iinuma, Gay Ishihara, Ryan Kalahiki, Vivian Kaopua, Jill Kaui, Michael Kawamoto, Michael Kemna, Darryl Kon, Arthur Kurosu, Larry Lawson, Michael Lemes, Fabian Loo, Ramona Loo, Raleigh Lopes, Curtiss Loui, Gordon Makishima, Mark Martinez, Jesse Masagatani, Alan Masaki, Floyd Matsuda, Robert Mercado, Jeffrey Mertens, Allen Nagata, Paul Nagata Jr., Michael Ogawa, Andrew Okada, Dennis Ono, Kathleen Osmond, Guy Perreira, Olga Pinero, John Rilling, Randall Rivera, Michael Rodriguez, Clifford Rubio, Nancy Smit, Farrel Sojot, Bruce Swann, Landon Tafaoa, Arthur Takamiya, Joanne Takasato, Rex Takata, Wendell Takata, Peter Tampon, Bernadette Terry, David Thornton, Ken Tjomsland, Wayne Tom, Eril Tonouchi, Thomas Toyozaki, William Vinton, Mark Wiese, Dalton Wong (fe)
Blank 6 Filed: 5/29/2002, Entered: 5/30/2002 Joinder
Fifth filing of consents to JOIN action; certificate of service - by plaintiff; the following employees of defendant City and County of Honolulu consent to join this action: (1) Edward Ah Chong (2) Bentley Alama (3) Alan Anami (4)Grant Arakawa (5) David Bega Jr. (6) Andrew Brito (7) Phillip Buchanan (8) Clyde Bueno Jr. (9) Jared Chenlu (10) Will Cluney (11) Todd Conradt (12) Michael Garcia (13) James-Dean Goeas (14) Everett Higa (15) John Jerves (16) Ardi Maioho (17)Donald Marumoto (18)Watson Moe (19)Dayle Morita (20)Sharon Nanod (21)Leonard Nishimura (22)Kyle Nobriga (23)Derek Pa (24)Dwight Sato (25)Michael Serrao (26)Elton Shintoyu (27)Niall Silva (28)George Smith (29)Shayne Souza (30)Stason Tanaka (31)Kevin Tanaita (32)Coby Tatsuyama (33)Robert Timm Jr. (34)Alan Togami (35)John Torres, Jr. (36)Kirk Uemura (37)Ryan Ujimori (38)Sharon Walden (39)Richard Weitzel (40)Brian West (41)Deborah Wilson (42)Jerald Wojcik (43)Kevin Wong (44)Shane Wright (45)Chris Yamaguchi (46)Brandon Yamamoto (47)Dennis Yamashito (48)Myles Yoshimoto (fe)
Blank 5 Filed: 5/22/2002, Entered: 5/23/2002 Joinder
FOURTH filing of Consents to JOIN action by plaintiff's [1-1]; certificate of service - the following employees of defendant City and County of Honolulu consent to join this action: (1)George Abbley Jr., (2)Melvin Aiona; (3)Justin Aiu; (4)Bryson Apo, (5)David Barnett, (6)Gerald Bento, (7)Jeffrey Bruchal, (8)Harold Cabbab Jr. (9)Jonathan Carreiro, (10)James Chee Jr. (11)Neville Colburn, (12)Debra Collins, (13)Gary Daniels, (14)David Deitschman, (15)Prudencio Dela Cruz, Jr., (16)Samuel Delovio III, (17)Edson Duncan, (18)David Eber, (19)William Estrella, Jr., (20)Mark Feekin, (21)Richard Fikani, Jr., (22)Reupena Fitisemanu, (23)Roy Fuata, (24)Calvin Fujii; (25)Germaine Hall, (26)John Hall, (27)Rohn Hamasaki, (28)Frances Hill, (29)Dean Howe, (30)Sean Hughes, (31)Everett Hung, (32)Clint Ige, (33)Richard Jang, (34)Jonathan Jimenez, (35)Grant Kaneyuki, (36)William Kelley, (37)Susan Klimek, (38)Kerry Knudson, (39)Scott Kobayashi, (40)Vernon Kong, (41)Mark Kutsy, (42)Douglas Lee, (43)Gaylord Lee, (44)Joseph Lum, (45)Mark Matsusaka, (46)Kaipo Miller, (47)Glenn Miram, (48)Neal Murakami, (49)Sean Naito, (50)Glen Nakama, (51)Paula Nakamura, (52)Derek Nuuhiwa, (53)Reuben Oh, (54)Alan Oku, St., (55)Daniel Paperd, (56)Robin Puahala, (57)Lorenzo Ridela Jr., (58)Wallace Salazar Jr., (59)Brian Soderman, (60)Paul Stetser, (61)Malo Torres, (62)Roland Unciano, (63)Ronald Weston, (64)Shane Williams, (65)Jon Yoshida, (66)Gregory Young, (67)Lowen Young (fe)
Blank 3 Filed: 5/16/2002, Entered: 5/17/2002 Answer to Complaint
ANSWER to complaint filed April 23, 2002 by defendant City and County of Honolulu to [1-1]; certificate of service (bbb)
Blank 4 Filed: 5/15/2002, Entered: 5/20/2002 Joinder
THIRD filing of consents to join action; certificate of service - filed on behalrf of plaintiff - [the fillowing employees of deft C&C of Honolulu consent to their inclusion as party plaintiffs in this action: (1) Aaron Agmata; (2) TerrieAguiar; (3) William Axt; (4) Kevin Brunn; (5) Robert Burns, Jr.; (6) Wayne Cambra; (7) Bard Canada; (8) Aiku Caretti; (9) Manuel Castillo; (10) Laura Chong; (11) Stacey Christensen; (12) Theodore Chun; (13) Christopher Chung; (14) Alfred Collins, II; (15) Raymond Craig; (16) Michael Cusumano; (17) Robert Daclison, Jr.; (18) Ryan Daniels; (19) Guy Demello; (20) Clement Enoka, III; (21) Steven Erler; (22) Darin Evangelista; (23) Frank Everett; (24) Aaron Farias; (25) Evi Feato, Jr.; (26) Michael Fisher; (27) James Francisco; (28) Brandon Fukuda; (29) Michael Garcia; (30) Stephen Gerona, III; (31) Tracy Griffin; (32) Lilinoe Grube; (33) Glenn Hayashi ; (34) Mark Hirakawa; (35) Richard Ho ; (36) Herman Hose, III; (37) Paul Ikebe; (38) Raynor Ikehara; (39) Glen Ishikawa; (40) Christopher Johnson; (41) Michael Johnson; (42) Leonardo Juares; (43) Miles Jung; (44) Vernon Kaahanui; (45) Jacklynne Kanda; (46) David Kauahi; (47) James Kim; (48) Mae Kim; (49) Paul Kim; (50) Travis Kohatsu; (51) Allan Kuaana; (52) Michael Kuroda; (53) Henry Leis; (54) Winston Leong; (55) Matthew Lum; (56) Ross Maeda; (57) Ed Manzano; (58) Fabian Mata; (59) John Matassa; (60) Troy Matsuyama; (61) Allan Nagata; (62) Danton Nakama; (63) Bryant Natividad; (64) Brian Navares; (65) Hilarion Oliva, III; (66) Michael O'Neill; (67) Neil Pang; (68) Lawrence Peralta; (69) Kalae Phillips; (70) Juan Quintanilla Jr.; (71) Gerald Rebuldela; (72) John Russ; (73) Sini Salanoa; (74) George Silva; (75) Shellie Silva; (76) Donald Stafford; (77) Scott Tamasaka; (78) Michael Tamashiro; (79) Michael Tsuhako; (80) John Veneri; (81) Edwin Voller; and (82) Charles Wong] [1-1] (afc)
Blank 2 Filed: 5/13/2002, Entered: 5/14/2002 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER by Judge David A. Ezra rule 16 scheduling conference set for 9:00 8/12/02 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (lmg)
Blank 1 Filed: 5/13/2002, Entered: 5/14/2002 Notice of Removal
NOTICE OF REMOVAL; exhibit a; certificate of service - from First Circuit Case Number: CV 02-1-1006-04 (lmg)
Blank -- Filed: 5/13/2002, Entered: 5/14/2002 Filing Fee Received
FILING FEE PAID in the amount of $ 150.00, receipt # 208735 (lmg)

Statistics

This case has been viewed 169 times.

No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Need Password Help?