Rene R. Rodriguez v. Farmers Insurance Co of Arizona et al
California Central District Court, Case No. 2:09-cv-06786
District Judge Dean D. Pregerson, presiding
docket://gov.uscourts.cacd.2-09-cv-06786 (What is this?)

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Judges don't know as much about themselves as we do.
Access comprehensive profiles on judges, firms, lawyers, and more with PlainSite Pro and Pro Se.
No Logo Rene R. Rodriguez, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Farmers Group, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fulbright & Jaworski, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Eric Andrew Herzog +1 213 892 9200 +1 213 892 9494
Peter H Mason +1 213 892 9200 +1 213 892 9494 pmason@fulbright.com
No Logo Farmers Insurance Co of Arizona, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fulbright & Jaworski, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Eric Andrew Herzog +1 213 892 9200 +1 213 892 9494
Peter H Mason +1 213 892 9200 +1 213 892 9494 pmason@fulbright.com
No Logo Farmers Insurance Exchange, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fulbright & Jaworski, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Eric Andrew Herzog +1 213 892 9200 +1 213 892 9494
Peter H Mason +1 213 892 9200 +1 213 892 9494 pmason@fulbright.com
No Logo Fire Insurance Exchange, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fulbright & Jaworski, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Eric Andrew Herzog +1 213 892 9200 +1 213 892 9494
Peter H Mason +1 213 892 9200 +1 213 892 9494 pmason@fulbright.com
No Logo Mid-Century Insurance Co., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fulbright & Jaworski, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Eric Andrew Herzog +1 213 892 9200 +1 213 892 9494
Peter H Mason +1 213 892 9200 +1 213 892 9494 pmason@fulbright.com
No Logo Truck Insurance Exchange, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fulbright & Jaworski, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Eric Andrew Herzog +1 213 892 9200 +1 213 892 9494
Peter H Mason +1 213 892 9200 +1 213 892 9494 pmason@fulbright.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 110 Insurance
  Entries (40) Calendar Events Related (0) Tools Right End
PDF 40 Filed: 8/11/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Wistrich re Stipulation for Protective Order 37 . See document for details. (yb) (Entered: 08/11/2010)
PDF 39 Filed: 8/6/2010, Entered: None
RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS. The document is stricken, RE: APPLICATION for Protective Order for Confidential Information, 36 . (mz) (Entered: 08/06/2010)
PDF 38 Filed: 8/6/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: APPLICATION for Protective Order for Confidential Information 36 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect document is attached to the docket entry and Incorrect event selected. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (mz) (Entered: 08/06/2010)
PDF 37 Filed: 8/6/2010, Entered: None
STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Defendants Farmers Group Inc., Farmers Insurance Co of Arizona, Farmers Insurance Exchange, Fire Insurance Exchange, Mid-Century Insurance Co., Truck Insurance Exchange. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Stipulated Protective Order)(Mason, Peter) (Entered: 08/06/2010)
PDF 36 Filed: 8/5/2010, Entered: None
(STRICKEN) APPLICATION for Protective Order for Confidential Information filed by Defendants Farmers Group Inc., Farmers Insurance Co of Arizona, Farmers Insurance Exchange, Fire Insurance Exchange, Mid-Century Insurance Co., Truck Insurance Exchange. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Stipulated Protective Order)(Mason, Peter) Modified on 8/6/2010 (mz). (Entered: 08/05/2010)
PDF 35 Filed: 7/22/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT OF CASE due to Unavailability of Judicial Officer filed. The previously assigned Magistrate Judge is no longer available. Pursuant to directive of the Chief Magistrate Judge and in accordance with the rules of this Court, the case has been returned to the Clerk for reassignment. This case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Wistrich for any discovery and/or post-judgment matters that may be referred. Case number will now read CV09-06786 DDP (AJWx). (at) (Entered: 07/22/2010)
PDF 34 Filed: 6/7/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER by Judge Dean D. Pregerson,( Motion set for hearing on 8/29/2011 at 10:00 AM before Judge Dean D. Pregerson.) (sce) (Entered: 06/07/2010)
PDF 33 Filed: 5/28/2010, Entered: None
STIPULATION for Hearing re Motion for Class Certification filed by Defendants Farmers Group Inc., Farmers Insurance Co of Arizona, Farmers Insurance Exchange, Fire Insurance Exchange, Mid-Century Insurance Co., Truck Insurance Exchange. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Order Re: Class Certification Briefing Schedule and Hearing Date)(Herzog, Eric) (Entered: 05/28/2010)
PDF 32 Filed: 5/18/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTES OF Motion Hearing and Status Conference re scheduling conference held before Judge Dean D. Pregerson: Court hears oral argument and vacates the MOTION FOR ORDER FOR SCHEDULING ORDER FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION PHASE for reasons as stated on the record 28 . The SCHEDULING CONFERENCE is hereby continued to September 26, 2011 at 3:30 p.m.Court Reporter: Maria Bustillos. (lc) (Entered: 05/18/2010)
PDF 31 Filed: 5/10/2010, Entered: None
REPLY In Support MOTION for Order for Scheduling Order for Class Certification Phase 28 filed by Plaintiff Rene R. Rodriguez. (Fein, Cory) (Entered: 05/10/2010)
PDF 30 Filed: 5/6/2010, Entered: None
STATEMENT of Defendants' Scheduling Conference Statement MOTION for Order for Scheduling Order for Class Certification Phase 28 (and Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of Scheduling Order) filed by Defendants Farmers Group Inc., Farmers Insurance Co of Arizona, Farmers Insurance Exchange, Fire Insurance Exchange, Mid-Century Insurance Co., Truck Insurance Exchange. (Mason, Peter) (Entered: 05/06/2010)
PDF 29 Filed: 4/14/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER held before Judge Dean D. Pregerson:COUNSEL ARE NOTIFIED that on the Court's own motion the MOTION FOR ORDER FOR SCHEDULING ORDER FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION PHASE FILED BY PLAINTIFF RENE R. RODRIGUEZ 28 and the SCHEDULING CONFERENCE are hereby continued from May 10, 2010 to May 17, 2010 at 11:00 a.m. (lc) (Entered: 04/14/2010)
PDF 28 Filed: 4/13/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Scheduling Order for Class Certification Phase filed by Plaintiff Rene R. Rodriguez. Motion set for hearing on 5/10/2010 at 03:30 PM before Judge Dean D. Pregerson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - McDougall Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Eich Declaration, # 3 Proposed Order)(Fein, Cory) (Entered: 04/13/2010)
PDF 27 Filed: 2/8/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTES OF Status Conference held before Judge Dean D. Pregerson: Scheduling Conference continued to 5/10/2010 03:30 PM before Judge Dean D. Pregerson. Court Reporter: None. (tad) (Entered: 02/09/2010)
PDF 26 Filed: 2/1/2010, Entered: None
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5 days, filed by Defendants Farmers Group Inc., Farmers Insurance Co of Arizona, Farmers Insurance Exchange, Truck Insurance Exchange, Fire Insurance Exchange, Mid-Century Insurance Co., Plaintiff Rene R. Rodriguez.. (Fein, Cory) (Entered: 02/01/2010)
PDF 25 Filed: 11/25/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER by Judge Dean D. Pregerson Setting Scheduling Conference: set for 2/8/2010 03:30 PM before Judge Dean D. Pregerson. (tad) (Entered: 11/25/2009)
PDF 24 Filed: 11/13/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTE ORDER (In Chambers) by Judge Dean D. Pregerson. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Dean D. Pregerson. Counsel are encouraged to review the Central Districts website for additional information. The address is http://www.cacd.uscourts.gov. It is not necessary to clear a motion date with the Court Clerk prior to filing the motion. The Court hears motions only on Mondays at 10:00 a.m. The Court requires delivery of two non-blue backed Mandatory Chambers Copies* of only the following manual and electronically filed documents to Room 244-J: (1) All noticed motions and related documents;(2) All ex parte applications and related documents; and (3) All exhibits and attachments must be separately tabbed. *[Refer to the Court's General Order No. 08-02 regarding ECF Courtesy Paper Copies.] (pp) (Entered: 11/16/2009)
PDF 23 Filed: 11/12/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER upon stipulation that the following portions of Plaintiffs Original Complaint filed in this action are deemed stricken therefrom, without prejudice:1. In Part IV (Class Action Allegations), Paragraph 25(d) is stricken inits entirety; 2. In Part VIII (Damages and Other Relief), Paragraph 60 is stricken in its entirety; and 3. In Part IX (Prayer for Relief), Paragraph 3 thereunder is stricken in its entirety by Judge Dean D. Pregerson (lc) (Entered: 11/12/2009)
PDF 22 Filed: 11/5/2009, Entered: None
NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Stipulation to Amend/Correct, 14 (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Re Stipulation (Docket # 14))(Mason, Peter) (Entered: 11/05/2009)
PDF 21 Filed: 11/3/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to General Order 08-05 by Judge S. James Otero. Case transferred to the calendar of Judge Dean D. Pregerson for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as CV 09-06786 DDP (CTx). (rn) (Entered: 11/03/2009)
PDF 20 Filed: 11/3/2009, Entered: None
NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error the NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents re Farmers certicate of interested party not on file upon filing of answer RE: Notice of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112) 18 was issued in Error; Farmers certificate of interested party was filed 10/9/09 as docket entry # 12. Therefore, No response by Farmers to deficiency notice is required (lc) (Entered: 11/03/2009)
PDF 19 Filed: 11/2/2009, Entered: None
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following error(s) was found: Missing proposed order which should have been submitted as a separate attachment to main document. RE: Stipulation to Amend/Correct, 14 . In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. (lc) (Entered: 11/02/2009)
PDF 18 Filed: 11/2/2009, Entered: None
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following error(s) was found: No Local Rule 7.1-1 Certification of Interested Parties on file as required upon filing RE: Farmers Answer to Complaint (Discovery), Answer to Complaint (Discovery) 13 . In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. (lc) (Entered: 11/02/2009)
PDF 17 Filed: 11/2/2009, Entered: None
NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Eric Andrew Herzog counsel for Defendants Farmers Group Inc., Farmers Insurance Co of Arizona, Farmers Insurance Exchange, Truck Insurance Exchange, Fire Insurance Exchange, Mid-Century Insurance Co.. Adding Eric A. Herzog as attorney as counsel of record for Farmers Insurance Co. of Arizona; Farmers Insurance Exchange; Truck Insurance Exchange; Fire Insurance Exchange; Mid-Century Insurance Co.; and Farmers Group, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by defendants Farmers Insurance Co. of Arizona; Farmers Insurance Exchange; Truck Insurance Exchange; Fire Insurance Exchange; Mid-Century Insurance Co.; and Farmers Group, Inc. (Herzog, Eric) (Entered: 11/02/2009)
PDF 16 Filed: 10/30/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
REFERRAL OF MOTION to Disqualify Judge/Magistrate Judge has been filed. Pursuant to GO 08.05 and Local Rule 72-5 MOTION to Disqualify Judge S. James Otero 15 is referred to Judge Gary A. Feess for determination. (at) (Entered: 10/30/2009)
PDF 15 Filed: 10/30/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Disqualify Judge S. James Otero filed by defendants Farmers Group Inc., Farmers Insurance Co of Arizona, Farmers Insurance Exchange, Truck Insurance Exchange, Fire Insurance Exchange, Mid-Century Insurance Co.. (Mason, Peter) (Entered: 10/30/2009)
PDF 14 Filed: 10/30/2009, Entered: None
STIPULATION to amend Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery) 1 filed by defendants Farmers Group Inc., Farmers Insurance Co of Arizona, Farmers Insurance Exchange, Truck Insurance Exchange, Fire Insurance Exchange, Mid-Century Insurance Co..(Mason, Peter) (Entered: 10/30/2009)
PDF 13 Filed: 10/30/2009, Entered: None
ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery) 1 filed by defendants Farmers Group Inc., Farmers Insurance Co of Arizona, Farmers Insurance Exchange, Truck Insurance Exchange, Fire Insurance Exchange, Mid-Century Insurance Co..(Mason, Peter) (Entered: 10/30/2009)
PDF 12 Filed: 10/9/2009, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants all defendants, identifying Zurich Insurance Co., Ltd., Zurich Financial Services, Ltd., Zurich Group Holding, Zurich RegCaPs Funding Limited Partnership II, Zurich RegCaPs Funding Limited Partnership V, Zurich RegCaPs Funding Limited Partnership IV. (Mason, Peter) (Entered: 10/09/2009)
PDF 11 Filed: 10/9/2009, Entered: None
FIRST STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Farmers Group Inc. answer now due 10/30/2009; Farmers Insurance Co of Arizona answer now due 10/30/2009; Farmers Insurance Exchange answer now due 10/30/2009; Truck Insurance Exchange answer now due 10/30/2009; Fire Insurance Exchange answer now due 10/30/2009; Mid-Century Insurance Co. answer now due 10/30/2009, filed by Defendants Farmers Group Inc.; Farmers Insurance Co of Arizona; Farmers Insurance Exchange; Truck Insurance Exchange; Fire Insurance Exchange; Mid-Century Insurance Co..(Mason, Peter) (Entered: 10/09/2009)
PDF 10 Filed: 10/1/2009, Entered: None
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Rene R. Rodriguez, upon Truck Insurance Exchange served on 9/24/2009, answer due 10/14/2009. The Summons and Complaint were served by Personal service, by Federal statute, upon Gus Morales, Security person authorized to accept service at the office of Doren E. Hohl, 4680 Wilshire Blvd., Los Angeles, CA 90010. Due Dilligence declaration No. Original Summons Copy of Summons. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Summons)(Caddell, Michael) (Entered: 10/01/2009)
PDF 9 Filed: 10/1/2009, Entered: None
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Rene R. Rodriguez, upon Mid-Century Insurance Co. served on 9/24/2009, answer due 10/14/2009. The Summons and Complaint were served by Personal service, by Federal statute, upon Gus Morales, Security person authorized to accept service, at the office of Doren E. Hohl, 4680 Wilshire Blvd., Los Angeles, CA 90010. Due Dilligence declaration No. Original Summons Copy of Summons. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Summons)(Caddell, Michael) (Entered: 10/01/2009)
PDF 8 Filed: 10/1/2009, Entered: None
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Rene R. Rodriguez, upon Fire Insurance Exchange served on 9/24/2009, answer due 10/14/2009. The Summons and Complaint were served by Personal service, by Federal and State statute, upon Gus Morales, Security Person authorized to accept service at the office of Doren E. Hohl, 4680 Wilshire Blvd., Los Angeles, CA 90010. Due Dilligence declaration No. Original Summons Copy of Summons. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1- Summons)(Caddell, Michael) (Entered: 10/01/2009)
PDF 7 Filed: 10/1/2009, Entered: None
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Rene R. Rodriguez, upon Farmers Insurance Exchange served on 9/24/2009, answer due 10/14/2009. The Summons and Complaint were served by Personal service, by Federal and State statute, upon Gus Morales, Security Person authorized to accept service at the office of Doren E. Hohl, 4680 Wilshire Blvd., Los Angeles, CA 90010. Due Dilligence declaration No. Original Summons Copy of Summons. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Summons)(Caddell, Michael) (Entered: 10/01/2009)
PDF 6 Filed: 10/1/2009, Entered: None
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Rene R. Rodriguez, upon Farmers Insurance Co of Arizona served on 9/25/2009, answer due 10/15/2009. The Summons and Complaint were served by Personal service, by Federal and State statute, upon Steve Poizner, CA Commissioner of Insurance, by serving Darrel Woo, Custodian of Records and person authorized to accept service, 300 Capitol Mall, 17th Floor, Sacramento, CA 95814. Due Dilligence declaration No. Original Summons Copy of Summons. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Summons)(Caddell, Michael) (Entered: 10/01/2009)
PDF 5 Filed: 10/1/2009, Entered: None
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Rene R. Rodriguez, upon Farmers Group Inc. served on 9/24/2009, answer due 10/14/2009. The Summons and Complaint were served by Personal service, by Federal and State statute, upon Gus Morales, Security Person Authorized to Accept Service. Due Dilligence declaration No. Original Summons Copy. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Summons)(Caddell, Michael) (Entered: 10/01/2009)
PDF 4 Filed: 9/18/2009, Entered: None
INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE S. JAMES OTERO. (rrey) (Entered: 09/22/2009)
PDF 3 Filed: 9/16/2009, Entered: None
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF ADR PILOT PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 09/22/2009)
PDF 2 Filed: 9/16/2009, Entered: None
CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Rene R. Rodriguez. (et) (ds). (Entered: 09/22/2009)
PDF 1 Filed: 9/16/2009, Entered: None
COMPLAINT against Defendants Farmers Group Inc., Farmers Insurance Co of Arizona, Farmers Insurance Exchange, Truck Insurance Exchange, Fire Insurance Exchange, Mid-Century Insurance Co. (Filing fee $ 350 PAID.) Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiff Rene R. Rodriguez. (et) (ds). (Entered: 09/22/2009)

Statistics

This case has been viewed 203 times.

No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Need Password Help?