Tre Milano, LLC v. Hangfeng Wu et al
California Central District Court, Case No. 2:10-cv-02854
District Judge Dean D. Pregerson, presiding
docket://gov.uscourts.cacd.2-10-cv-02854 (What is this?)

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Judges don't know as much about themselves as we do.
Access comprehensive profiles on judges, firms, lawyers, and more with PlainSite Pro and Pro Se.
No Logo Tre Milano, L.l.c., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by attorney.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Christopher Q Pham +1 310 895 1188 +1 310 895 1180 cpham@spattorney.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Johnson & Pham LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Marcus F Chaney +1 818 888 7540 +1 818 888 7544 mchaney@johnsonpham.com
Christopher Dain Johnson +1 818 888 7540 +1 818 888 7544 cjohnson@johnsonpham.com
Citation Section 17 U.S.C. § 501
Nature of Suit 820 Copyright
  Entries (13) Calendar Events Related (0) Tools Right End
PDF 13 Filed: 6/25/2010, Entered: None
REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Copyright. (Closing) (Attachments: # 1 permanent injunction) (lc) (Entered: 06/25/2010)
PDF 12 Filed: 6/25/2010, Entered: None
REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or Trademark. (Closing) (Attachments: # 1 permanent injunction) (lc) (Entered: 06/25/2010)
PDF 11 Filed: 6/25/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ORER ENTEREING PERMANENT INJUNCTION filed by Judge Dean D. Pregerson against defendant Hangfeng Wu and his agents etc, re plaintiffs trademarks and copyrights (see document or specifics).The parties waive the requirement of the posting of any monetary bond to the entry of this permanent injunction.Noappeals shall be taken from this Final Judgment, Including Permanent Injunction,and the parties waive all rights to appeal. This Court expressly retains jurisdiction over this matter to enforce any violation of the terms of this Final Judgment and the Permanent Injunction herein.Each party shall bear its own attorneys fees and costs incurred in this matter.(MD JS-6. Case Terminated) (lc) (Entered: 06/25/2010)
PDF 10 Filed: 6/23/2010, Entered: None
STIPULATION for Permanent Injunction as to Against Defendant HANGFENG WU filed by Plaintiff Tre Milano, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Pham, Christopher) (Entered: 06/23/2010)
PDF 9 Filed: 5/24/2010, Entered: None
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Tre Milano, LLC, upon Defendant Hangfeng Wu served on 5/10/2010, answer due 6/1/2010. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon HANGFENG WU, DEFENDANT in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons NOT returned. (Pham, Christopher) (Entered: 05/24/2010)
PDF 8 Filed: 5/3/2010, Entered: None
REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Tre Milano, LLC. (Pham, Christopher) (Entered: 05/03/2010)
PDF 7 Filed: 5/3/2010, Entered: None
REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Tre Milano, LLC. (Pham, Christopher) (Entered: 05/03/2010)
PDF 6 Filed: 4/30/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER held before Judge Dean D. Pregerson:should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. The Court will consider the filing of the following, as an appropriate response to this OSC, on or before the above date: Complete and return forms AO 120 and/or AO 121. No oral argument on this Order to Show Cause will be heard unless ordered by the Court. The Order will stand submitted upon the filing of the response to the Order to Show Cause. (lc) (Entered: 04/30/2010)
PDF 5 Filed: 4/16/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE: Copyright, Patent and Trademark Reporting Requirements. Counsel shall file the appropriate AO-120 and/or AO-121 form with the Clerk within 10 days. (Attachments: # 1 AO 121 Form) (cbr) (Entered: 04/20/2010)
PDF 4 Filed: 4/16/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff Tre Milano, LLC. Related Case(s): There are no pending cases related to the Complaint herewith (cbr) (ds). (Entered: 04/20/2010)
PDF 3 Filed: 4/16/2010, Entered: None
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Tre Milano, LLC (cbr) (ds). (Entered: 04/20/2010)
PDF 2 Filed: 4/16/2010, Entered: None
CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Tre Milano, LLC, (cbr) (ds). (Entered: 04/20/2010)
PDF 1 Filed: 4/16/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1-10, Inclusive, Hangfeng Wu. Case assigned to Judge Dean D. Pregerson for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (Filing fee $350 PAID) Jury demanded, filed by Plaintiff Tre Milano, LLC.(cbr) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/23/2010: # 1 Notice of Assignment, # 2 Summons, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Exhibits A - B, # 5 Exhibits C - F) (ds). (Entered: 04/20/2010)

Statistics

This case has been viewed 74 times.

No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Need Password Help?