Anderson v. Compass Bank
Florida Southern District Court, Case No. 1:11-cv-20436
District Judge James Lawrence King, presiding
docket://gov.uscourts.flsd.1-11-cv-20436 (What is this?)

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Judges don't know as much about themselves as we do.
Access comprehensive profiles on judges, firms, lawyers, and more with PlainSite Pro and Pro Se.
No Logo Stephen T. Anderson, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Compass Bank, NA, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Balch & Bingham LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Gregory C. Cook +1 205 251 8100 +1 205 488 5870 gcook@balch.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 190 Contract: Other
  Entries (27) Calendar Events Related (0) Tools Right End
PACER 27 Filed: 4/13/2011, Entered: None
REPORT of Mediation Disposition: Impasse(mg) (Entered: 04/14/2011)
PACER 26 Filed: 2/16/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER Modifying this Court's Order dated September 2, 2009 Regarding the August 26, 2009 Status Conference. Signed by Senior Judge James Lawrence King on 2/3/2011. (gp) (Entered: 02/16/2011)
PACER 25 Filed: 2/16/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER on October 22, 2009 Status Conference re: CM/ECF Filing Privileges. Signed by Senior Judge James Lawrence King on 09/06/2009. **See Order for further details** (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Understanding to be filed with Motion for Limited Appearance (original needed), # 2 Order to Comply) (gp) (Entered: 02/16/2011)
PACER 24 Filed: 2/16/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER on Motion to Approve addition of Baron & Budd, P.C. to Plaintiffs Executive Committee. Signed by Senior Judge James Lawrence King on 10/21/2009. (gp) (Entered: 02/16/2011)
PACER 23 Filed: 2/16/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
PRETRIAL ORDER No. 1. Signed by Senior Judge James Lawrence King on 9/14/2009. (gp) (Entered: 02/16/2011)
PACER 22 Filed: 2/16/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER on August 26, 2009 Status Conference Appointing Barry R. Davidson, Esq. of Hunton & Williams, LLP, as Temporary Liaison Counsel for Defendants. Signed by Senior Judge James Lawrence King on 9/2/2009. (gp) (Entered: 02/16/2011)
PACER 21 Filed: 2/14/2011, Entered: None
MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from Florida Northern; Case Number 1:10-cv-00208. Electronic file consisting of documents numbered 1-18. Assigned Case No. 1:11-cv-20436-JLK on 2/8/2011. re: SDFL MDL Conditional Transfer Order (TO-dated 02/03/2011) at DE # (1144 in 1:09-md-02036-JLK). See Docket Sheet at DE # (19 in 1:11-cv-20436-JLK). (gp) (Entered: 02/14/2011)
PACER 20 Filed: 2/8/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
Judge Assignment RE: Electronic Complaint to Senior Judge James Lawrence King. (gp) (Entered: 02/08/2011)
PACER 19 Filed: 2/8/2011, Entered: None
Case transferred in from Florida Northern; Case Number 1:10-cv-00208. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received.(gp) (Entered: 02/08/2011)
PACER 18 Filed: 2/8/2011, Entered: None
CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER MDL No. 09-md-2036 (Attachments: # 1 Letter) (jws) (Entered: 02/08/2011)
PACER 17 Filed: 2/3/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE of Filing Final Transfer Order by STEPHEN T ANDERSON (GOODMAN, LAWRENCE) (Entered: 02/03/2011)
PACER 16 Filed: 2/2/2011, Entered: None
REPLY to Response to Motion re 6 MOTION to Stay Proceedings and Compel Arbitration Consolidated Reply in Support of Motion to Stay Proceedings and Compel Arbitration and Motion to Strike the Affidavits of Stephen T. Anderson and Tod Aronovitz filed by COMPASS BANK. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2) (COOK, GREGORY) (Entered: 02/02/2011)
PACER 15 Filed: 1/24/2011, Entered: None
ORDER granting 14 MOTION for Leave to File re 12 Response in Opposition to Motion to Compel Arbitration filed by COMPASS BANK - Replies due by 2/2/2011; signed by CHIEF JUDGE STEPHAN P MICKLE on 1/24/11. (tss) (Entered: 01/25/2011)
PACER 14 Filed: 1/13/2011, Entered: None
MOTION for Leave to File re 12 Response in Opposition to Motion to Compel Arbitration by COMPASS BANK. (GIBSON, GERRY) (Entered: 01/13/2011)
PACER 13 Filed: 1/11/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE of Filing Corrected Exhibits by STEPHEN T ANDERSON re 12 Response in Opposition to Motion (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Anderson Declaration, # 2 Exhibit Aronovitz Declaration) (GOODMAN, LAWRENCE) (Entered: 01/11/2011)
PACER 12 Filed: 1/10/2011, Entered: None, Terminated: 1/24/2011
RESPONSE in Opposition re 6 MOTION to Stay Proceedings and Compel Arbitration filed by STEPHEN T ANDERSON. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit) (GOODMAN, LAWRENCE) (Entered: 01/10/2011)
PACER 11 Filed: 12/23/2010, Entered: None
ORDER granting 8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 12/23/10. (tss) (Entered: 12/23/2010)
PACER 10 Filed: 12/10/2010, Entered: None
ORDER GRANTING 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 6 MOTION to Stay Proceedings and Compel Arbitration filed by STEPHEN T ANDERSON. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if Plaintiff's response to 6 not filed earlier: 1/10/2011). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 12/10/2010. (kdm) (Entered: 12/13/2010)
PACER 9 Filed: 12/10/2010, Entered: None
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 6 MOTION to Stay Proceedings and Compel Arbitration by STEPHEN T ANDERSON. (GOODMAN, LAWRENCE) (Entered: 12/10/2010)
PACER 8 Filed: 12/3/2010, Entered: None
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 1 Complaint by COMPASS BANK. (GIBSON, GERRY) (Entered: 12/03/2010)
PACER 7 Filed: 12/2/2010, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM in Support re 6 MOTION to Stay Proceedings and Compel Arbitration filed by COMPASS BANK. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 to Memorandum in Support of Motion to Stay Proceedings and Compel Arbitration, # 2 Exhibit 2 to Memorandum in Support of Motion to Stay Proceedings and Compel Arbitration, # 3 Exhibit A to Affidavit of Shane Franklin, # 4 Exhibit B to Affidavit of Shane Franklin, # 5 Exhibit C to Affidavit of Shane Franklin, # 6 Exhibit D to Affidavit of Shane Franklin, # 7 Exhibit E - Part 1 - to Affidavit of Shane Franklin, # 8 Exhibit E - Part 2 - to Affidavit of Shane Franklin, # 9 Exhibit F to Affidavit of Shane Franklin, # 10 Exhibit G to Affidavit of Shane Franklin, # 11 Exhibit H to Affidavit of Shane Franklin) (COOK, GREGORY) (Entered: 12/02/2010)
PACER 6 Filed: 12/2/2010, Entered: None
MOTION to Stay Proceedings and Compel Arbitration by COMPASS BANK. (COOK, GREGORY) (Entered: 12/02/2010)
PACER 5 Filed: 11/17/2010, Entered: None
ORDER GRANTING 4 Consent MOTION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint filed by COMPASS BANK. (Defendant's Answer due by 12/3/2010). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 11/17/2010. (kdm) (Entered: 11/18/2010)
PACER 4 Filed: 11/16/2010, Entered: None
Consent MOTION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint by COMPASS BANK. (GIBSON, GERRY) (Entered: 11/16/2010)
PACER 3 Filed: 11/5/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE of Defendant Compass Bank consent to accept service through counsel via electronic mail and waiver of formal service of process by STEPHEN T ANDERSON (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B) (GOODMAN, LAWRENCE) (Entered: 11/05/2010)
PACER 2 Filed: 10/27/2010, Entered: None Summons Issued
Summons Issued as to COMPASS BANK. (tss) (Entered: 10/28/2010)
PACER 1 Filed: 10/22/2010, Entered: None
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 1129-1713361.), filed by STEPHEN T ANDERSON. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 SUMMONS, # 6 Civil Cover Sheet) (GOODMAN, LAWRENCE) (Entered: 10/22/2010)

Statistics

This case has been viewed 102 times.

No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Need Password Help?