FTC v. Trudeau, et al
Illinois Northern District Court, Case No. 1:03-cv-03904
District Judge Robert W. Gettleman, presiding
docket://gov.uscourts.ilnd.1-03-cv-03904 (What is this?)

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
The right information can save you thousands of dollars.
Access comprehensive profiles on judges, firms, lawyers, and more with PlainSite Pro and Pro Se.
Federal Trade Commission, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Heather Hippsley +1 301 627 5500
Daniel P. Kaufman +1 202 408 6088 +1 202 408 4400
Elizabeth Tucci +1 703 299 3700

Toggle Switch Represented by Federal Trade Commission

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Sandhya Prabhu Brown +1 202 326 2040 sbrown5@ftc.gov
Karen D. Dodge +1 312 960 5634 kdodge@ftc.gov
Todd Matthew Kossow +1 312 960 5634 tkossow@ftc.gov
Peter B Miller +1 202 326 2675
David A. O'Toole +1 312 960 5634 dotoole@ftc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Reminger & Reminger - Cleveland

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Laura Sullivan +1 216 687 1311

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Laureen Kapin +1 202 307 1011
v.
No Logo Deonna Enterprises, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Collier, Shannon, Rill & Scott, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Lewis Rose +1 202 342 8400

Toggle Switch Represented by Dentons (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
David L. Schiavone +1 312 876 8000

Toggle Switch Represented by Mintz, Levin, Cohn, Ferris, Glovsky & Popeo, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Harvey I. Saferstein +1 310 586 3200 +1 310 586 3202 hsaferstein@mintz.com
No Logo Kevin Trudeau, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
David J. Bradford +1 312 923 2975

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Daniel Jay Hurtado +1 312 222 9350 dhurtado@jenner.com
David Jimenez-Ekman +1 312 923 2683 +1 312 840 7683 djimenez-ekman@jenner.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Latham & Watkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Katherine R Saunders +1 202 637 2200 katharine.saunders@lw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
John F Kness +1 312 558 8802 john.kness@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Winston & Strawn, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Kimball Richard Anderson +1 312 558 5600 +1 312 558 5700 kanderson@winston.com
Aesha R Pallesen +1 312 558 3751 apallesen@winston.com
No Logo Robert Barefoot, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Collier, Shannon, Rill & Scott, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Lewis Rose +1 202 342 8400

Toggle Switch Represented by Dentons (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
David L. Schiavone +1 312 876 8000

Toggle Switch Represented by Mintz, Levin, Cohn, Ferris, Glovsky & Popeo, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Harvey I. Saferstein +1 310 586 3200 +1 310 586 3202 hsaferstein@mintz.com
No Logo Shop America (USA), LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
David J. Bradford +1 312 923 2975

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
David Jimenez-Ekman +1 312 923 2683 +1 312 840 7683 djimenez-ekman@jenner.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Latham & Watkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Katherine R Saunders +1 202 637 2200 katharine.saunders@lw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
John F Kness +1 312 558 8802 john.kness@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Winston & Strawn, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Kimball Richard Anderson +1 312 558 5600 +1 312 558 5700 kanderson@winston.com
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 0045
Nature of Suit 890 Other Statutory Actions
  Entries (777) Calendar Events Related (0) Tools Right End
PACER 777 Filed: 10/22/2013, Entered: 10/22/2013 order on motion for leave to file
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Plaintiff's motion for leave to file [774] a statement concerning defendant's letters of direction is granted. Status hearing held on 10/22/2013. Status hearing set for 10/24/2013 at 10:00 a.m. Mailed notice (gds)
PACER 776 Filed: 10/21/2013, Entered: 10/21/2013 other
Statement by Kevin Trudeau Regarding Purging Civil Contempt (Attachments: # (1) Index of Exhibits, # (2) Exhibit A-Z)(Anderson, Kimball)
PACER 775 Filed: 10/21/2013, Entered: 10/21/2013 notice of motion
NOTICE of Motion by Jonathan Cohen for presentment of motion for leave to file, [774] before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 10/22/2013 at 09:30 AM. (Cohen, Jonathan)
PDF 774 Filed: 10/21/2013, Entered: 10/21/2013 motion for leave to file
MOTION by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission for leave to file a Statement Concerning Defendant's Letters of Direction (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Statement Concerning Defendant's Letters of Direction, # (2) Exhibits PXA-PXC to Proposed Statement Concerning Defendant's Letters of Direction)(Cohen, Jonathan)
PDF 773 Filed: 10/17/2013, Entered: 10/17/2013 order
AMENDED ORDER signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 10/17/2013: Mailed notice (gds)
PACER 772 Filed: 10/16/2013, Entered: 10/16/2013 order on motion for leave to fileCourt Filing
ORDER signed by the Honorable Judge Robert Gettleman on 10/16/2013. Status hearing held on 10/16/2013. FTC motion for leave to file [767] reply is granted. Receiver's motion for leave to file [769] reply is granted. The U.S. Marshal is directed to take defendant Kevin Trudeau into custody on 10/22/2013 after this court's 9:30 a.m. hearing, and hold him until further order of court. Defendant Trudeau's oral motion for a stay of this order pending appeal is denied. Status hearing set for 10/22/2013 at 9:30 a.m. Mailed notice (gds)
PACER 771 Filed: 10/15/2013, Entered: 10/15/2013 response in opposition to motion
RESPONSE by Kevin Trudeauin Opposition to MOTION by Receiver Robb Evans & Associates LLC for leave to file Receiver's Reply in Support of the Imposition of Coercive Sanctions[769], MOTION by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission for leave to file a Reply in Support of Coercive Incarceration[767] (Anderson, Kimball)
PDF 770 Filed: 10/15/2013, Entered: 10/15/2013 notice of motion
NOTICE of Motion by Blair Robert Zanzig for presentment of motion for leave to file[769] before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 10/16/2013 at 01:30 PM. (Zanzig, Blair)
PACER 769 Filed: 10/15/2013, Entered: 10/15/2013 motion for leave to file
MOTION by Receiver Robb Evans & Associates LLC for leave to file Receiver's Reply in Support of the Imposition of Coercive Sanctions (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Zanzig, Blair)
PACER 768 Filed: 10/14/2013, Entered: 10/14/2013 notice of motion
NOTICE of Motion by Jonathan Cohen for presentment of motion for leave to file[767] before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 10/16/2013 at 01:30 PM. (Cohen, Jonathan)
PACER 767 Filed: 10/14/2013, Entered: 10/14/2013 motion for leave to file
MOTION by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission for leave to file a Reply in Support of Coercive Incarceration (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Reply, # (2) Exhibits PXA:1-PXA:27 to Proposed Reply)(Cohen, Jonathan)
PACER 766 Filed: 10/11/2013, Entered: 10/11/2013 other
Opposition to the FTC's and the Receiver's Statements Regarding the Need for Coercive Sanctions by Kevin Trudeau (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1-11)(Anderson, Kimball)
PACER 765 Filed: 10/4/2013, Entered: 10/4/2013 text entry
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Defendant is given leave to file response to Receiver's statement [764} on or before 10/11/2013. Mailed notice (gds)
PACER 764 Filed: 10/4/2013, Entered: 10/4/2013 statement
STATEMENT by Robb Evans & Associates LLC Supporting the Imposition of Coercive Sanctions (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E)(Zanzig, Blair)
PACER 763 Filed: 10/4/2013, Entered: 10/4/2013 text entry
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Defendant is given leave to file response to FTC's statement regarding the need for coercive sanctions [759] on or before 10/11/2013. Mailed notice (gds)
PACER 762 Filed: 10/2/2013, Entered: 10/2/2013 order on motion for miscellaneous relief
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Motion [761] to re-set Friday's proceeding pending new appropriations to the FTC is granted. Status hearing date of 10/4/2013 is re-set to 10/16/2013 at 1:30 p.m. Mailed notice (gds)
PACER 761 Filed: 10/1/2013, Entered: 10/1/2013 motion for miscellaneous relief
MOTION by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission To Reset Friday's Proceeding Pending New Appropriations to the FTC (Cohen, Jonathan)
PACER 760 Filed: 9/26/2013, Entered: 10/1/2013 order on motion to reset
ORDER signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 9/26/2013: Plaintiff's motion to modify the 8/7/2013 order to terminate Trudeau's personal expense allowance is granted. Mailed notice (gds)
PACER 759 Filed: 9/30/2013, Entered: 9/30/2013 statement
STATEMENT by Federal Trade Commission Regarding the Need for Coercive Sanctions (Attachments: # (1) PXA:1-PXA:13)(Cohen, Jonathan)
PACER 758 Filed: 9/30/2013, Entered: 9/30/2013 terminate hearings
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Status hearing date of 10/1/2013 is re-set to 10/4/2013 at 10:00 a.m. Mailed notice (gds)
PACER 757 Filed: 9/27/2013, Entered: 9/27/2013 other
Response to Trudeau's Opposition to the FTC's Proposed Order by Federal Trade Commission (Cohen, Jonathan)
PACER 756 Filed: 9/27/2013, Entered: 9/27/2013 motion to reset
MOTION by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission to reset October 1, 2013 Status Hearing (Cohen, Jonathan)
PACER 755 Filed: 9/26/2013, Entered: 9/27/2013 order on motion for miscellaneous relief
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Status hearing held on 9/26/2013. Motion [744] to modify Receivership order is granted. A draft order will follow. Status hearing set for 10/1/2013 at 9:30 a.m. Mailed notice (gds)
PACER 754 Filed: 9/19/2013, Entered: 9/20/2013 order
ORDER signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 9/19/2013: The court releases Kevin Trudeau from custody of the US Marshal. He is to comply with directions of the Receiver and is ordered to appear at the next court hearing Motion [744] to modify the receivership order is set for 9/26/2013, at 2:00 p.m. Mailed notice (gds)
PDF 753 Filed: 9/19/2013, Entered: 9/19/2013 order
ORDER defendant KEVIN TRUDEAU is to be released from custody forthwith, signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 9/19/2013: Mailed notice (gds)
PDF 752 Filed: 9/18/2013, Entered: 9/19/2013 other
NOTICE of Ruling from the Seventh Circuit in their case #13-3055. (Attachments: # (1) Notice of Filing Notice of Docketing) The following is before the Seventh Circuit Court : EMERGENCY PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS, or in the Alternative, a Writ Of Habeas Corpus, filed on September 18, 2013, by counsel for the petitioner.IT IS ORDERED that petition for writ of mandamus, or in the alternative, a writ ofhabeas corpus is DENIED. (tlm)
PDF 751 Filed: 9/18/2013, Entered: 9/18/2013 order
ORDER signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 9/18/2013: Status hearing held on 9/18/2013. The court finds defendant Kevin Trudeau in contempt of court and directs the US Marshal to take him into custody and hold him until further order of the court. Status hearing set for 9/19/2013 at 11:00 a.m. Defendant's request for a stay of this order is denied. Mailed notice (gds)
PDF 750 Filed: 9/16/2013, Entered: 9/16/2013 status report
STATUS Report Supplemental by Robb Evans & Associates LLC (Attachments: # (1) Receiver's Supplemental Report)(Zanzig, Blair)
PDF 749 Filed: 9/16/2013, Entered: 9/16/2013 reply
REPLY by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission to response in opposition to motion, [748] To Modify the Receivership Order To Prevent Trudeau From Funding Personal Expenses With Assets Needed To Compensate Consumers (Attachments: # (1) Exhibits PXA-PXB)(Cohen, Jonathan)
PDF 748 Filed: 9/12/2013, Entered: 9/12/2013 response in opposition to motion
RESPONSE by Kevin Trudeauin Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiff Federal Trade CommissionTo Modify the Receivership Order To Prevent Trudeau From Funding His Personal Living Expenses With Assets Needed To Compensate His Victims [744] (Anderson, Kimball)
PDF 747 Filed: 9/6/2013, Entered: 9/6/2013 status report
STATUS Report of Receiver for Period August 7, 2013 through September 5, 2013 by Robb Evans & Associates LLC (Attachments: # (1) Receiver's Report of Activities from 8/7/2013 through 9/5/2013, # (2) Exs 1-12 to Receiver's Report)(Zanzig, Blair)
PDF 746 Filed: 9/4/2013, Entered: 9/4/2013 motion hearing
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Motion hearing held on 9/4/2013 regarding motion [744] to modify the Receivership order. Response is due by 9/12/2013. Reply is due by 9/16/2013. Mailed notice (gds)
PDF 745 Filed: 8/30/2013, Entered: 8/30/2013 notice of motion
NOTICE of Motion by Jonathan Cohen for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief, [744] before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 9/4/2013 at 09:15 AM. (Cohen, Jonathan)
PDF 744 Filed: 8/30/2013, Entered: 8/30/2013 motion for miscellaneous relief
MOTION by Plaintiff Federal Trade CommissionTo Modify the Receivership Order To Prevent Trudeau From Funding His Personal Living Expenses With Assets Needed To Compensate His Victims (Attachments: # (1) Exhibits in Support of FTC's Motion To Modify the Receivership Order To Prevent Trudeau From Funding His Personal Living Expenses With Assets Needed To Compensate His Victims)(Cohen, Jonathan)
PDF 743 Filed: 8/21/2013, Entered: 8/21/2013 attorney appearance
ATTORNEY Appearance for Receiver Robb Evans & Associates LLC by Blair Robert Zanzig (Zanzig, Blair)
PDF 742 Filed: 8/7/2013, Entered: 8/7/2013 order
PACER 741 Filed: 8/6/2013, Entered: 8/7/2013 order on motion for miscellaneous relief
PACER 740 Filed: 8/7/2013, Entered: 8/7/2013 Response
PACER 739 Filed: 8/7/2013, Entered: 8/7/2013 notice of filing
PACER 738 Filed: 8/5/2013, Entered: 8/5/2013 notice of motion
PACER 737 Filed: 8/5/2013, Entered: 8/5/2013 motion for leave to file
PACER 736 Filed: 8/2/2013, Entered: 8/2/2013 motion for miscellaneous relief
PACER 735 Filed: 8/2/2013, Entered: 8/2/2013 Response
PACER 734 Filed: 7/31/2013, Entered: 8/1/2013 text entry
PACER 733 Filed: 7/31/2013, Entered: 8/1/2013 status hearing
PACER 732 Filed: 7/30/2013, Entered: 8/1/2013 status hearing
PACER 731 Filed: 8/1/2013, Entered: 8/1/2013 other
PDF 730 Filed: 7/29/2013, Entered: None
STATEMENT by Federal Trade Commission With Respect to the Appointment of a Receiver (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits PXA:1-PXA:2)(Cohen, Jonathan) (Entered: 07/29/2013)
PDF 729 Filed: 7/26/2013, Entered: None
ORDER signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 7/26/2013: Mailed notice (gds) (Entered: 07/26/2013)
PACER 728 Filed: 7/26/2013, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Status hearing held on 7/26/2013. Plaintiff's motion 481 to hold defendant Trudeau in contempt is granted in part. Plaintiff is to submit the name and qualifications of a Receiver. Until further order of court, defendant is enjoined from directing the transfer or use of any money or property of any Trudeau Entity. Status hearing set for 7/30/2013 at 1:00 p.m. Mailed notice (gds) (Entered: 07/26/2013)
PACER 727 Filed: 7/24/2013, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: The time of teh 7/26/2013 evidentiary hearing is re-set to 1:30 p.m. Mailed notice (gds) (Entered: 07/24/2013)
PDF 726 Filed: 7/23/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Kimball Richard Anderson for presentment of motion for leave to file, 725 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 7/26/2013 at 02:00 PM. (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 07/23/2013)
PDF 725 Filed: 7/23/2013, Entered: None
MOTION by Defendant Kevin Trudeau for leave to file Instanter a Response to the FTC's Post-Hearing Brief (Attachments: # 1 Defendant Kevin Trudeau's Response in Opposition to the FTC's Post-Hearing Brief in Support of Its Contempt Motion)(Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 07/23/2013)
PACER 724 Filed: 7/23/2013, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Motion hearing held on 7/23/2013. Defendant's motion for leave to file excess pages 708 is granted. Plaintiff's motion for leave to file excess pages 714 is granted. Defendant's motion 717 for continuance is denied. Plaintiff's motion for leave to file 719 response is granted. Plaintiff's motion 721 to lift stay of writ is granted. Mailed notice (gds) (Entered: 07/23/2013)
PDF 723 Filed: 7/22/2013, Entered: None
Pursuant to the Court's order (DE707), Plaintiff FTC hereby files its Ex Parte Motion For A Writ Ne Exeat and Related Filings, which were previously filed under seal. by Federal Trade Commission , previously filed Ex Parte Motion For A Writ Ne Exeat, An Order Compelling Trudeau To Surrender His Passports, And An Order To Show Cause Why Defendant Should Not Be Preliminarily Enjoined From Leaving The United States (Attachments: # 1 Brief in Support of Ex Parte Motion For A Writ Ne Exeat, # 2 Cover Letter in Support of Ex Parte Motion For A Writ Ne Exeat, # 3 Rule 65(b)(1) Certification of Jonathan Cohen in Support of Ex Parte Motion For A Writ Ne Exeat, # 4 Proposed Writ Ne Exeat, # 5 Ex Parte Motion For Leave to File Under Seal Temporarily Ex Parte Motion For A Writ Ne Exeat, # 6 Exhibits Part 1 (PXA1 through PXA19), # 7 Exhibits Part 2 (PXA20 through PXA28), # 8 Exhibits Part 3 (PXA29 through PXA42), # 9 Exhibits Part 4 (PXA43 through PXB))(Kostner, Amanda) (Entered: 07/22/2013)
PACER 722 Filed: 7/22/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Jonathan Cohen for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief, 721 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 7/23/2013 at 09:15 AM. (Cohen, Jonathan) (Entered: 07/22/2013)
PACER 721 Filed: 7/22/2013, Entered: None
MOTION by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission To Lift the Stay of the Writ Ne Exeat (Attachments: # 1 FTC's Opposition to Trudeau's Motion To Waive His Appearance and Cross-Motion To Lift the Stay of the Writ Ne Exeat, # 2 Exhibits PXA:1-PXA:4)(Cohen, Jonathan) (Entered: 07/22/2013)
PACER 720 Filed: 7/22/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Jonathan Cohen for presentment of motion for leave to file, 719 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 7/26/2013 at 02:00 PM. (Cohen, Jonathan) (Entered: 07/22/2013)
PACER 719 Filed: 7/22/2013, Entered: None
MOTION by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission for leave to file Response to Assertions of Law in Trudeaus Post-Hearing Brief (Attachments: # 1 Plaintiffs Response to Assertions of Law in Trudeaus Post-Hearing Brief, # 2 Exhibits PXA:1-PXA:2)(Cohen, Jonathan) (Entered: 07/22/2013)
PACER 718 Filed: 7/18/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Kimball Richard Anderson for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief 717 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 7/23/2013 at 09:15 AM. (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 07/18/2013)
PACER 717 Filed: 7/18/2013, Entered: None
MOTION by Defendant Kevin Trudeau for Short Continuance of July 26, 2013 Argument or in the Alternative to Waive Defendant Kevin Trudeau's Appearance (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 07/18/2013)
PACER 716 Filed: 7/15/2013, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by Federal Trade Commission in support of motion for miscellaneous relief, 481 Plaintiff's Post-Hearing Brief in Support of Motion To Hold Defendant Trudeau in Contempt for Violating the June 2, 2010 Order, Incarcerate Him, and Order Him To Provide An Accounting of and Turnover Assets (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A:1-A:2)(Cohen, Jonathan) (Entered: 07/15/2013)
PACER 715 Filed: 7/15/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Jonathan Cohen for presentment of motion for leave to file excess pages 714 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 7/26/2013 at 02:00 PM. (Cohen, Jonathan) (Entered: 07/15/2013)
PACER 714 Filed: 7/15/2013, Entered: None
MOTION by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission for leave to file excess pages (Cohen, Jonathan) (Entered: 07/15/2013)
PACER 713 Filed: 7/15/2013, Entered: None
Post-Hearing Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law by Federal Trade Commission (Kostner, Amanda) (Entered: 07/15/2013)
PACER 712 Filed: 7/15/2013, Entered: None
Post-Hearing Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law by Kevin Trudeau (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 07/15/2013)
PACER 711 Filed: 7/15/2013, Entered: None
SEALED EXHIBIT by Defendant Kevin Trudeau regarding memorandum, 710 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 25)(Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 07/15/2013)
PACER 710 Filed: 7/15/2013, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by Kevin Trudeau in Opposition to the FTC's Motion to Hold Him in Contempt(Post-Hearing) (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit 1- 56 Part 1, # 3 Exhibit 1- 56 Part 2, # 4 Exhibit 1- 56 Part 3, # 5 Exhibit 1- 56 Part 4, # 6 Exhibit 1- 56 Part 5, # 7 Exhibit 1- 56 Part 6, # 8 Exhibit 1- 56 Part 7, # 9 Exhibit 1- 56 Part 8, # 10 Exhibit 1- 56 Part 9, # 11 Exhibit 1- 56 Part 10)(Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 07/15/2013)
PACER 709 Filed: 7/15/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Kimball Richard Anderson for presentment of motion for leave to file excess pages 708 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 7/26/2013 at 02:00 PM. (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 07/15/2013)
PACER 708 Filed: 7/15/2013, Entered: None
MOTION by Defendant Kevin Trudeau for leave to file excess pages instanter (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 07/15/2013)
PACER 707 Filed: 7/1/2013, Entered: None
ORDER signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 7/1/2013: Mailed notice (gds) (Entered: 07/02/2013)
PACER 706 Filed: 7/1/2013, Entered: None
MINUTE entry Hearing held on 7/1/2013.The Writ Ne Exeat is stayed The hearing set for 7/8/2013 is continued to 7/26/2013, at 2:00 p.m. Parties' submissions re: FTC's motion to hold defendant Trudeau in contempt are due by 7/15/2013. Parties are to file all exhibits referred to in the briefs re: the Ne exeat order and the current contempt motion, as well as the exhibits introduced at the recent contempt hearings, unsealed. The parties shall redact personal identifiers from those documents. Further hearing is set for 7/26/2013 at 2:00 p.m. Defendant Trudeau is to be present. Mailed notice (gds ) (Entered: 07/02/2013)
PACER 705 Filed: 7/1/2013, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: The Clerk is to correct the docket to reflect attorney Kimball Anderson withdrew as counsel for defendants Marc J. Lane and the Law offices of Marc J. Lane PC only. Mr. Anderson continues to represent defendants Kevin Trudeau, Shop America (USA) LLC and Winston & Strawn LLP. Mailed notices (gcy, ) (Entered: 07/02/2013)
PACER 704 Filed: 7/1/2013, Entered: None
Opinion of Mary O'Connor, ASA by Kevin Trudeau (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 07/01/2013)
PACER 703 Filed: 6/27/2013, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Evidentiary hearing resumed on 6/27/2013 on plaintiff's motion 481 to hold defendant in contempt and for writ ne exeat order. Evidentiary hearing continued to 7/1/2013 at 10:00 a.m. As stated in open court, defendant is enjoined from transferring any assets outside of ordinary and customary living expenses until further order of court. Mailed notice (gds) (Entered: 06/27/2013)
PACER 702 Filed: 6/26/2013, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Evidentiary hearing resumed on 6/26/2013 on plaintiff's motion 481 to hold defendant in contempt. Evidentiary hearing continued to 6/27/2013 at 9:45 a.m. Mailed notice (gds) (Entered: 06/27/2013)
PACER 701 Filed: 6/25/2013, Entered: None
SEALED EXHIBIT filed in support of motion to admit evidence relative to Defendant Kevin Trudeau. (jmp, ) (Entered: 06/27/2013)
PACER 700 Filed: 6/25/2013, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Defendant is ordered not to leave the United States until further order of court. Defendant is ordered to surrender immediately all of his passports and any other documents that would permit international travel, to the Clerk of this Court. Defendant is ordered to attend all future hearings. Plaintiff's motion for a writ ne exeat and supporting documents are to be sealed for three business days after service of this order. Defendant is to appear on 7/8/2013, at 11:00 a.m. to show cause why he should not be preliminarily enjoined from leaving the United States. Mailed notice (gds) (Entered: 06/25/2013)
PACER 699 Filed: 6/25/2013, Entered: None
WRIT NE EXEAT, Order to Surrender Passports, and Order to Show Cause why defendant should not be preliminarily enjoined from leaving the United States Signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 6/25/2013. (ph, ) (Entered: 06/25/2013)
PACER 698 Filed: 6/25/2013, Entered: None
MOTION by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission to amend/correct MOTION by Plaintiff Federal Trade CommissionAdmit evidence in evidentiary hearing regarding FTC's pending motion to hold defendant in contempt 694 ; CORRECTED Attachment #1 (Brief in Support of Motion to Admit Evidence) to MOTION (Kostner, Amanda) (Entered: 06/25/2013)
PACER 697 Filed: 6/24/2013, Entered: None
SEALED EXHIBIT(S) by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission regarding MOTION by to seal temporarily FTC's proposed exhibits in the evidentiary hearing 696 (Exhibits 1 through 6). (jmp, ) (Entered: 06/25/2013)
PACER 696 Filed: 6/24/2013, Entered: None
MOTION by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission to seal temporarily FTC's proposed exhibits in the evidentiary hearing (Kostner, Amanda) (Entered: 06/24/2013)
PACER 695 Filed: 6/24/2013, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Motion hearing held. Respondents' Motion to substitute attorney 685 is granted. Vincent P. Schmeltz is substituted as counsel for respondent Marc J. Lane and the law offices of Marc J. Lane. Kimball Anderson is given leave to withdraw as their counsel. Attorney Kimball Richard Anderson terminated. Mailed notice (jmp, ) (Entered: 06/24/2013)
PACER 694 Filed: 6/24/2013, Entered: None
MOTION by Plaintiff Federal Trade CommissionAdmit evidence in evidentiary hearing regarding FTC's pending motion to hold defendant in contempt (Attachments: # 1 Brief in Support of Motion to Admit Evidence, # 2 Exhibits in Support of Motion to Admit Evidence)(Kostner, Amanda) (Entered: 06/24/2013)
PACER 693 Filed: 6/21/2013, Entered: None
LETTER from the Seventh Circuit regarding no return of the record on appeal in USCA no. 13-1746, 13-1747 (pg, ) (Entered: 06/24/2013)
PACER 692 Filed: 6/21/2013, Entered: None
CERTIFIED copy of order dated 4/29/13 from the 7th Circuit regarding notice of appeal 613 , notice of appeal 609 ; Appellate case no. : 13-1746, 13-1747 (pg, ) (Entered: 06/24/2013)
PACER 691 Filed: 6/21/2013, Entered: None
MANDATE of USCA dated 4/29/13 regarding notice of appeal 613 , notice of appeal 609 ; USCA No. 13-1746, 13-1747 (pg, ) (Entered: 06/24/2013)
PACER 690 Filed: 6/21/2013, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Respondents Marc J. Lane, The Law Offices of Marc J. Lane PC by Austin Jennings Burke CORRECTED (Burke, Austin) (Entered: 06/21/2013)
PACER 689 Filed: 6/21/2013, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Respondents Marc J. Lane, The Law Offices of Marc J. Lane PC by Vincent P. Schmeltz, III CORRECTED (Schmeltz, Vincent) (Entered: 06/21/2013)
PACER 688 Filed: 6/21/2013, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Respondents Marc J. Lane, The Law Offices of Marc J. Lane PC by Austin Jennings Burke (Burke, Austin) (Entered: 06/21/2013)
PACER 687 Filed: 6/21/2013, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Respondents Marc J. Lane, The Law Offices of Marc J. Lane PC by Vincent P. Schmeltz, III (Schmeltz, Vincent) (Entered: 06/21/2013)
PACER 686 Filed: 6/17/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Kimball Richard Anderson for presentment of motion to substitute attorney 685 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 6/20/2013 at 09:15 AM. (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 06/17/2013)
PACER 685 Filed: 6/17/2013, Entered: None
MOTION by Respondents Marc J. Lane, The Law Offices of Marc J. Lane PC to substitute attorney (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 06/17/2013)
PACER 684 Filed: 6/12/2013, Entered: None
Notice of Name Change by Marc J. Lane, The Law Offices of Marc J. Lane PC, Kevin Trudeau, Winston & Strawn LLP (Croswell, Katherine) (Entered: 06/12/2013)
PACER 683 Filed: 6/6/2013, Entered: None
Defendant Kevin Trudeau's Supplemental Objections to the FTC's Deposition Designations by Kevin Trudeau (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 06/06/2013)
PACER 682 Filed: 6/3/2013, Entered: None
LETTER from the Seventh Circuit returning the record on appeal in USCA no. 13-1898 consisting of 16 loose pleadings, 8 volumes of transcripts and 3 sealed items. (jmm-r, ) (Entered: 06/04/2013)
PACER 681 Filed: 5/31/2013, Entered: None
LETTER from the Seventh Circuit returning the record on appeal in USCA no. 13-1898 consisting of 16 loose pleadings, 8 transcripts, 3 sealed envelopes (jat, ) (Entered: 05/31/2013)
PACER 680 Filed: 5/30/2013, Entered: None
Deposition Designations and Objections by Kevin Trudeau (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Excerpts of Deposition of Michael Dow)(Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 05/30/2013)
PACER 679 Filed: 5/24/2013, Entered: None
MANDATE of USCA dated 5/24/13 regarding notice of appeal 650 ; USCA No. 13-1898 (pg, ) (Entered: 05/28/2013)
PACER 678 Filed: 5/24/2013, Entered: None
LETTER from the Seventh Circuit regarding return of the record on appeal in USCA no. 13-1898 at a later date (pg, ) (Entered: 05/28/2013)
PACER 677 Filed: 5/22/2013, Entered: None
USCA RECEIVED on 5/22/13 the long record regarding notice of appeal 650 , notice of appeal 613 , notice of appeal. 609 (dj ) (Entered: 05/24/2013)
PACER 676 Filed: 5/23/2013, Entered: None
ACKNOWLEDGMENT of receipt of long record on appeal regarding notice of appeal 650 , notice of appeal 613 , notice of appeal 609 ; USCA Case No. 13-1746, 13-1747, 13-1898 (pg, ) (Entered: 05/24/2013)
PACER 675 Filed: 5/22/2013, Entered: None
ORDER signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 5/22/2013: Mailed notice (gds) (Entered: 05/23/2013)
PACER 674 Filed: 5/21/2013, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Evidentiary hearing begins on plaintiff's motion 481 to hold Kevin Trudeau in contempt. Plaintiff's motion to compel 538 is withdrawn without prejudice. Suneil Sant's motion to quash 590 is denied as moot. Plaintiff's motion to compel 593 Sant to comply is denied as moot. Evidentiary hearing continued to 6/26/2013 at 10:00 a.m. Kevin Trudeau and Marc Lane are ordered to appear. Mailed notice (gds) (Entered: 05/23/2013)
PACER 673 Filed: 5/22/2013, Entered: None
TRANSMITTED to the USCA for the 7th Circuit the long record on appeal 650 , 609 (USCA no. 13-1746, 13-1747, 13-1898).(smm) (Entered: 05/22/2013)
PDF 672 Filed: 5/20/2013, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Status hearing held on 5/20/2013. Mailed notice (gds) (Entered: 05/21/2013)
PDF 671 Filed: 5/16/2013, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Defendant's motion to continue 667 hearing is denied. Status hearing held on 5/16/2013. A brief status hearing is set for 5/20/2013 at 1:30 p.m. Mailed notice (gds) (Entered: 05/17/2013)
PDF 670 Filed: 5/14/2013, Entered: None
SEVENTH CIRCUIT transcript information sheet by Winston & Strawn LLP (jmm-r, ) (Entered: 05/17/2013)
PDF 669 Filed: 5/16/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Kimball Richard Anderson for presentment of motion to continue 667 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 5/16/2013 at 02:30 PM. (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 05/16/2013)
PDF 668 Filed: 5/16/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Kimball Richard Anderson for presentment of motion to continue 667 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 5/16/2013 at 02:30 PM. (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 05/16/2013)
PDF 667 Filed: 5/16/2013, Entered: None
MOTION by Defendant Kevin Trudeau to continue Evidentiary Hearing Until Completion of Third Party Accounting (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 05/16/2013)
PDF 666 Filed: 5/14/2013, Entered: None
ORDER signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 5/14/2013: Mailed notice (gds) (Entered: 05/14/2013)
PDF 665 Filed: 5/14/2013, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Order entered regarding discovery, documents, depositions, etc. Defendant Trudeau is to be present at the 5/21/2013 hearing. A status hearing is set for 5/16/2013 at 2:30 p.m. Mailed notice (gds) (Entered: 05/14/2013)
PACER 664 Filed: 5/13/2013, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Status hearing held on 5/13/2013. Mailed notice (gds) (Entered: 05/14/2013)
PACER 663 Filed: 5/13/2013, Entered: None
Status Update of Third-Party Corporations and Alternative Request to Participate in Status Conference Telephonically by GIN USA, Inc., KT Radio Network, Inc., WebSite Solutions USA, Inc. (Donnellon, Daniel) (Entered: 05/13/2013)
PACER 662 Filed: 5/2/2013, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Motion of Amanda Brooke Kostner for leave to appear pro hac vice 632 is granted. Attorney Amanda Brooke Kostner for Federal Trade Commission added. Mailed notice (jmp, ) (Entered: 05/03/2013)
PDF 661 Filed: 5/2/2013, Entered: None
Order signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 5/2/2013: Mailed notice (gds) (Entered: 05/02/2013)
PDF 660 Filed: 5/2/2013, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert Gettleman: Status hearing held on 5/2/2013. Depositions are expected to proceed. FTC's motion to compel 626 Marc Lane to disclose information is granted on an attorneys'-eyes-only basis. Mr. Lane's deposition will remain under seal until further order of court. Status hearing set for 5/13/2013 at 3:30 p.m. Mailed notice (gds) Modified on 5/3/2013 (gds). (Entered: 05/02/2013)
PACER 659 Filed: 5/2/2013, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Respondents Marc J. Lane, The Law Offices of Marc J. Lane PC, Defendant Kevin Trudeau by William P Ferranti (Ferranti, William) (Entered: 05/02/2013)
PACER 658 Filed: 5/1/2013, Entered: None
REPLY by Federal Trade Commission to memorandum in opposition to motion 654 , MOTION by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission to compel Marc Lane To Disclose Information Regarding Trudeau's Asset Protection Plan 626 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit PXB-PXC)(Mora, Michael) (Entered: 05/01/2013)
PACER 657 Filed: 4/30/2013, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: The FTC may file a reply to Marc J. Lane and the Law Offices Marc J. Lane, PC's memorandum in opposition to the FTC's motion to compel 654 by close of business 5/1/2013. Mailed notice (gds) (Entered: 04/30/2013)
PACER 656 Filed: 4/29/2013, Entered: None
CERTIFIED copy of order dated 4/29/13 from the 7th Circuit regarding notice of appeal 650 ; Appellate case no. : 13-1898 (pg, ) (Entered: 04/30/2013)
PACER 655 Filed: 4/26/2013, Entered: None
ACKNOWLEDGMENT of receipt of short record on appeal regarding notice of appeal 650 ; USCA Case No. 13-1898. (jmm-r, ) (Entered: 04/30/2013)
PACER 654 Filed: 4/29/2013, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by Marc J. Lane, The Law Offices of Marc J. Lane PC in Opposition to motion to compel,,, 626 (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 04/29/2013)
PACER 653 Filed: 4/26/2013, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Request 647 to participate in status conference via telephonic appearance is granted. Telephone notice (gds) (Entered: 04/29/2013)
PACER 652 Filed: 4/29/2013, Entered: None
TRANSMITTED to the 7th Circuit the short record on notice of appeal 650 . Notified counsel (smm) (Entered: 04/29/2013)
PACER 651 Filed: 4/29/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appeal Due letter sent to counsel of record. (smm) (Entered: 04/29/2013)
PACER 650 Filed: 4/26/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of appeal by Kevin Trudeau regarding orders 649 Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 0752-8288181. (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 04/26/2013)
PACER 649 Filed: 4/26/2013, Entered: None
ORDER signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 4/26/2013: Mailed notice (gds) (Entered: 04/26/2013)
PACER 648 Filed: 4/26/2013, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Status hearing held on 4/26/2013. Plaintiff's motion 642 for a determination that the contempt proceedings in this court are not subject to the Automatic Stay Provision is granted. Lane's brief and sample documents for an in camera inspection are due by 4/29/2013. Parties are directed to proceed with depositions previously set forthwith. Status hearing is set for 5/2/2013, at 11:00 a.m. Mailed notice (gds) (Entered: 04/26/2013)
PACER 647 Filed: 4/26/2013, Entered: None
Request to Participate in Status Conference Via Telephonic Appearance by GIN USA, Inc., KT Radio Network, Inc., WebSite Solutions USA, Inc. (Donnellon, Daniel) (Entered: 04/26/2013)
PACER 646 Filed: 4/25/2013, Entered: None
RESPONSE by Kevin Trudeauin Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiff Federal Trade CommissionDetermine That Automatic Stay is Inapplicable 642 (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 04/25/2013)
PACER 645 Filed: 4/25/2013, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Status hearing held on 4/25/2013. Status hearing set for 4/26/2013 at 10:00 a.m. Mailed notice (gds) (Entered: 04/25/2013)
PACER 644 Filed: 4/24/2013, Entered: None
CIRCUIT RULE 3(c) directs the appellant to file and serve a Docketing Statement, which meets the requirements of Circuit Rule 28(a), with the clerk of the District Court at the time of the filing of the notice of appeal or with the clerk of this court within seven (7) days of filing the notice of appeal. Your Rule 3(c) Docketing Statement has not been filed to date. Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED that the appellant file this overdue Docketing Statement with the clerk of this court within fourteen (14) days of the date of this order. Failure to do so will result in a one hundred dollar ($100.00) fine and/or dismissal of this notice of appeal. (jmp, ) (Entered: 04/25/2013)
PACER 643 Filed: 4/24/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Michael Mora for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief 642 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 4/30/2013 at 09:15 AM. (Mora, Michael) (Entered: 04/24/2013)
PACER 642 Filed: 4/24/2013, Entered: None
MOTION by Plaintiff Federal Trade CommissionDetermine That Automatic Stay is Inapplicable (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support)(Mora, Michael) (Entered: 04/24/2013)
PACER 641 Filed: 4/23/2013, Entered: None
CERTIFIED copy of order dated 4/23/13 from the 7th Circuit regarding notice of appeal 613 , notice of appeal 609 ; Appellate case no. : 13-1746, 13-1747 (pg, ) (Entered: 04/24/2013)
PACER 640 Filed: 4/23/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Kimball Richard Anderson for presentment of motion to strike, 639 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 4/30/2013 at 09:15 AM. (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 04/23/2013)
PACER 639 Filed: 4/23/2013, Entered: None
MOTION by Respondent The Law Offices of Marc J. Lane PC, Defendant Kevin Trudeau to strike deadline to file response brief to Motion to Compel (D.I. 626), deadline to submit documents for in camera review and corresponding hearing date (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 04/23/2013)
PACER 638 Filed: 4/23/2013, Entered: None
SUGGESTION of Bankruptcy as to Kevin Trudeau (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 04/23/2013)
PACER 637 Filed: 4/18/2013, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Motion hearing held. FTC's motion 628 to file certain documents under seal temporarily, until 4/25/2013, is granted. Parties' in-camera submissions to the court for review are due by 4/24/2013, noon. Defendant's brief on crime fraud exception is due by 4/24/2013, noon. Hearing on motion to compel is set for 4/25/2013, at 2:00 p.m.Docketing mailed notice (pg, ) (Entered: 04/23/2013)
PACER 636 Filed: 4/19/2013, Entered: None
CERTIFIED copy of order dated 4/19/13 from the 7th Circuit regarding notice of appeal 613 , notice of appeal 609 ; Appellate case no. : 13-1746 & 13-1747 (jat, ) (Entered: 04/22/2013)
PACER 635 Filed: 4/22/2013, Entered: None
Corrected UNREDACTED Motion To Hold the Law Offices of Marc Lane, GIN USA, Website Solutions USA, and KT Radio Network in Contempt by Federal Trade Commission (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Jonathan Cohen in Support of Motion To Hold the Law Offices of Marc Lane, GIN USA, Website Solutions USA, and KT Radio Network in Contempt (PXG1-PXG11), # 2 Affidavit Motion To Hold the Law Offices of Marc Lane, GIN USA, Website Solutions USA, and KT Radio Network in Contempt (PXG12-PXG17), # 3 Affidavit Motion To Hold the Law Offices of Marc Lane, GIN USA, Website Solutions USA, and KT Radio Network in Contempt (PXG18-PXH1))(Cohen, Jonathan) (Entered: 04/22/2013)
PACER 634 Filed: 4/20/2013, Entered: None
UNREDACTED version of Brief in Support of Motion (DE597) To Hold the Law Offices of Marc Lane, GIN USA, Website Solutions USA, and KT Radio Network in Contempt, Filed Pursuant to Court Order (DE608) (Apr. 9, 2013) by Federal Trade Commission (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Jonathan Cohen in Support of Motion To Hold the Law Offices of Marc Lane, GIN USA, Website Solutions USA, and KT Radio Network in Contempt (PXG1-PXG11), # 2 Affidavit of Jonathan Cohen in Support of Motion To Hold the Law Offices of Marc Lane, GIN USA, Website Solutions USA, and KT Radio Network in Contempt (PXG12-PXG17), # 3 Affidavit of Jonathan Cohen in Support of Motion To Hold the Law Offices of Marc Lane, GIN USA, Website Solutions USA, and KT Radio Network in Contempt (PXG18-PXH1))(Cohen, Jonathan) (Entered: 04/20/2013)
PACER 633 Filed: 4/19/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Amanda Brooke Kostner for presentment of motion to appear pro hac vice 632 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 4/25/2013 at 02:00 PM. (Kostner, Amanda) (Entered: 04/19/2013)
PACER 632 Filed: 4/19/2013, Entered: None
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Amanda B. Kostner (Kostner, Amanda) (Entered: 04/19/2013)
PACER 631 Filed: 4/16/2013, Entered: None
SEALED BRIEF and EXHIBITS in support of motion to compel Marclane to disclose information regarding Trudeau's Asset Protection Plan by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission. (jmp, ) (Entered: 04/17/2013)
PACER 630 Filed: 4/16/2013, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Status hearing held on 4/16/2013. Status hearing set for 5/2/2013 at 11:00 a.m. Mailed notice (gds) (Entered: 04/17/2013)
PACER 629 Filed: 4/15/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Jonathan Cohen for presentment of motion to seal 628 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 4/18/2013 at 09:30 AM. (Cohen, Jonathan) (Entered: 04/15/2013)
PDF 628 Filed: 4/15/2013, Entered: None
MOTION by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission to seal documents temporarily (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Jonathan Cohen in Support of Motion for Leave To File Documents Under Temporary Seal)(Cohen, Jonathan) (Entered: 04/15/2013)
PACER 627 Filed: 4/15/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Jonathan Cohen for presentment of motion to compel,,, 626 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 4/18/2013 at 09:30 AM. (Cohen, Jonathan) (Entered: 04/15/2013)
PDF 626 Filed: 4/15/2013, Entered: None
MOTION by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission to compel Marc Lane To Disclose Information Regarding Trudeau's Asset Protection Plan (Attachments: # 1 Brief in Support of Motion To Compel Marc Lane To Disclose Information Regarding Trudeau's Asset Protection Plan, # 2 Affidavit of Jonathan Cohen in Support of Motion To Compel Marc Lane To Disclose Information Regarding Trudeau's Asset Protection Plan (PXA:1-PXA:2), # 3 Affidavit of Jonathan Cohen in Support of Motion To Compel Marc Lane To Disclose Information Regarding Trudeau's Asset Protection Plan (PXA:3-PXA:10), # 4 Affidavit of Jonathan Cohen in Support of Motion To Compel Marc Lane To Disclose Information Regarding Trudeau's Asset Protection Plan (PXA:11-PXA:14))(Cohen, Jonathan) (Entered: 04/15/2013)
PACER 625 Filed: 4/12/2013, Entered: None
COPY of order dated 4/12/13 from the Seventh Circuit regarding notices of appeal 613 , 609 ; Appellate case no. : 13-1746 & 13-1747; these appeals are consolidated for purposes of briefing and disposition. (jmm-r, ) (Entered: 04/15/2013)
PACER 624 Filed: 4/10/2013, Entered: None
SEVENTH CIRCUIT transcript information sheet by Winston & Strawn LLP (jmm-r, ) (Entered: 04/12/2013)
PACER 623 Filed: 4/10/2013, Entered: None
copy of order dated 4/10/13 from the 7th Circuit regarding notice of appeal 609 ; Appellate case no. : 13-1746 granting Emergency Motion For 48- Hour Stay. (pg, ) (Entered: 04/11/2013)
PACER 622 Filed: 4/9/2013, Entered: None
ACKNOWLEDGEMENT of receipt of short record on appeal regarding notice of appeal 613 ; USCA Case No. 13-1747 (pg, ) (Entered: 04/11/2013)
PACER 621 Filed: 4/9/2013, Entered: None
ACKNOWLEDGEMENT of receipt of short record on appeal regarding notice of appeal 609 ; USCA Case No. 13-1746 (pg, ) (Entered: 04/11/2013)
PACER 620 Filed: 4/10/2013, Entered: None
TRANSMITTED to the 7th Circuit the short record on notice of appeal 613 . Notified counsel (dj ) (Entered: 04/10/2013)
PACER 619 Filed: 4/10/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appeal Due letter sent to counsel of record. (dj ) (Entered: 04/10/2013)
PACER 618 Filed: 4/10/2013, Entered: None
TRANSMITTED to the 7th Circuit the short record on notice of appeal 609 . Notified counsel (dj ) (Entered: 04/10/2013)
PACER 617 Filed: 4/10/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appeal Due letter sent to counsel of record. (dj ) (Entered: 04/10/2013)
PACER 616 Filed: 4/9/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE by GIN USA, Inc., KT Radio Network, Inc., WebSite Solutions USA, Inc. re notice of appeal 613 and emergency motion for 48-hour stay (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lecroix, Kenjiro) (Entered: 04/09/2013)
PACER 615 Filed: 4/9/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Kenjiro D. Lecroix for presentment of motion to stay, motion for relief 614 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 4/16/2013 at 04:30 PM. (Lecroix, Kenjiro) (Entered: 04/09/2013)
PACER 614 Filed: 4/9/2013, Entered: None
MOTION by Movants GIN USA, Inc., KT Radio Network, Inc., WebSite Solutions USA, Inc. to stay regarding order 608 pending appeal (Lecroix, Kenjiro) (Entered: 04/09/2013)
PACER 613 Filed: 4/9/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of appeal by GIN USA, Inc., KT Radio Network, Inc., WebSite Solutions USA, Inc. regarding orders 608 , 606 Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 0752-8228016. (Lecroix, Kenjiro) (Entered: 04/09/2013)
PACER 612 Filed: 4/9/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE by The Law Offices of Marc J. Lane PC, Kevin Trudeau, Winston & Strawn LLP re notice of appeal 609 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 04/09/2013)
PACER 611 Filed: 4/9/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Kimball Richard Anderson for presentment of motion to stay 610 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 4/16/2013 at 04:30 PM. (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 04/09/2013)
PACER 610 Filed: 4/9/2013, Entered: None
MOTION by Respondents The Law Offices of Marc J. Lane PC, Winston & Strawn LLP, Defendant Kevin Trudeau to stay oral order of April 9, 2013 (Renewed Emergency) (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 04/09/2013)
PACER 609 Filed: 4/9/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of appeal by The Law Offices of Marc J. Lane PC, Kevin Trudeau, Winston & Strawn LLP regarding orders 606 Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 0752-8227361. (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 04/09/2013)
PACER 608 Filed: 4/9/2013, Entered: None
ORDER signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 4/9/2013: Mailed notice (gds) (Entered: 04/09/2013)
PACER 607 Filed: 4/9/2013, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Status hearing held on 4/9/2013. Motion 604 for leave to file a status report is granted. Plaintiff is directed to file documents with redactions forthwith. Defendant's and respondents' oral request for a stay of this order is denied. Status hearing set for 4/16/2013 at 4:30 p.m. Motions 538 590 593 597 are continued to that date and time. Mailed notice (gds) (Entered: 04/09/2013)
PACER 606 Filed: 4/4/2013, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Status hearing held. Plaintiff's motion 599 to file response to motion for continuance is granted. Defendant's motion 586 for continuance is denied. Plaintiff's motion 595 to file certain documents under seal is denied, and said documents will be unsealed on 4/9/2013 after counsel have had the opportunity to redact personal information. Plaintiff's motion 597 to hold parties in contempt, and plaintiff's motion 593 to compel Suneil Sant to comply with subpoena and Sant's motion 590 to quash subpoena are continued to 4/9/2013, at 1:00 p.m.Docketing mailed notice (pg, ) (Entered: 04/08/2013)
PACER 605 Filed: 4/6/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Jonathan Cohen for presentment of motion for leave to file, 604 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 4/9/2013 at 01:00 PM. (Cohen, Jonathan) (Entered: 04/06/2013)
PACER 604 Filed: 4/6/2013, Entered: None
MOTION by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission for leave to file Status Report Regarding Efforts To Depose Kevin Trudeau in Switzerland as the Corporate Designee of GIN USA, Website Solutions USA, and KT Radio Network (Attachments: # 1 Status Report Regarding Efforts To Depose Kevin Trudeau in Switzerland as the Corporate Designee of GIN USA, Website Solutions USA, and KT Radio Network)(Cohen, Jonathan) (Entered: 04/06/2013)
PACER 603 Filed: 4/1/2013, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT (Document Not Imaged). (jmp, ) (Entered: 04/05/2013)
PACER 602 Filed: 4/3/2013, Entered: None
STATUS Report Regarding the FTC's Post-Judgment Discovery by GIN USA, Inc., KT Radio Network, Inc., WebSite Solutions USA, Inc. (Donnellon, Daniel) (Entered: 04/03/2013)
PACER 601 Filed: 4/1/2013, Entered: None
REPLY by Suneil Sant to MOTION by Respondent Suneil Sant to quash SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM SERVED ON SUNEIL SANT 590 (Haim, Evan) (Entered: 04/01/2013)
PACER 600 Filed: 4/1/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Jonathan Cohen for presentment of motion for leave to file, 599 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 4/4/2013 at 11:00 AM. (Cohen, Jonathan) (Entered: 04/01/2013)
PACER 599 Filed: 4/1/2013, Entered: None
MOTION by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission for leave to file Response To Trudeaus Motion For Continuance, Status Report, And Statement Regarding The Scope Of The Evidentiary Hearing (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Attachment to Motion For Leave To File Response To Trudeaus Motion For Continuance, Status Report, And Statement Regarding The Scope Of The Evidentiary Hearing)(Cohen, Jonathan) (Entered: 04/01/2013)
PACER 598 Filed: 4/1/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Jonathan Cohen for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief 597 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 4/4/2013 at 11:00 AM. (Cohen, Jonathan) (Entered: 04/01/2013)
PACER 597 Filed: 4/1/2013, Entered: None
MOTION by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission To Hold The Law Offices of Marc Lane, GIN USA, Website Solutions USA, and KT Radio Network in Contempt (Cohen, Jonathan) (Entered: 04/01/2013)
PACER 596 Filed: 4/1/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Jonathan Cohen for presentment of motion to seal 595 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 4/4/2013 at 11:00 AM. (Cohen, Jonathan) (Entered: 04/01/2013)
PACER 595 Filed: 4/1/2013, Entered: None
MOTION by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission to seal Certain Documents Related to the Motion To Hold the Law Offices of Marc Lane, GIN USA, Website Solutions USA, and KT Radio Network in Contempt (Cohen, Jonathan) (Entered: 04/01/2013)
PACER 594 Filed: 3/28/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Jonathan Cohen for presentment of motion to compel 593 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 4/4/2013 at 11:00 AM. (Cohen, Jonathan) (Entered: 03/28/2013)
PACER 593 Filed: 3/28/2013, Entered: None
MOTION by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission to compel Suneil Sant To Comply With a Subpoena (Cohen, Jonathan) (Entered: 03/28/2013)
PACER 592 Filed: 3/28/2013, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by Federal Trade Commission in Opposition to motion to quash 590 and Memorandum in Support of Cross-Motion To Compel Suneil Sant To Comply With a Subpoena (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits PXA-PXB)(Cohen, Jonathan) (Entered: 03/28/2013)
PACER 591 Filed: 3/25/2013, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by Suneil Sant in support of motion to quash 590 SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM SERVED ON SUNEIL SANT (Haim, Evan) (Entered: 03/25/2013)
PDF 590 Filed: 3/25/2013, Entered: None
MOTION by Respondent Suneil Sant to quash SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM SERVED ON SUNEIL SANT (Haim, Evan) (Entered: 03/25/2013)
PACER 589 Filed: 3/21/2013, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Motion hearing held on 3/21/2013. Motion for leave to file 583 motion to quash under seal is denied. Memorandum in support of motion to quash is due by 3/25/2013. Plaintiff's response is due by 3/28/2013. Reply is due by 4/1/2013. Mailed notice (gds) (Entered: 03/25/2013)
PACER 588 Filed: 3/20/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Kimball Richard Anderson for presentment of motion to continue 586 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 4/4/2013 at 11:00 AM. (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 03/20/2013)
PACER 587 Filed: 3/19/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Kimball Richard Anderson for presentment of motion to continue 586 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 4/2/2013 at 09:15 AM. (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 03/19/2013)
PACER 586 Filed: 3/19/2013, Entered: None
MOTION by Defendant Kevin Trudeau to continue May 21, 2013 Evidentiary Hearing (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 03/19/2013)
PACER 585 Filed: 3/19/2013, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Respondent Suneil Sant by Patrick Edward Deady (Deady, Patrick) (Entered: 03/19/2013)
PACER 584 Filed: 3/18/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Evan J Haim for presentment of motion for leave to file 583 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 3/21/2013 at 09:15 AM. (Haim, Evan) (Entered: 03/18/2013)
PACER 583 Filed: 3/18/2013, Entered: None
MOTION by Respondent Suneil Sant for leave to file under seal (Haim, Evan) (Entered: 03/18/2013)
PACER 582 Filed: 3/18/2013, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Respondent Suneil Sant by Evan J Haim of Patrick E. Deady (Haim, Evan) (Entered: 03/18/2013)
PACER 581 Filed: 3/18/2013, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Respondent Suneil Sant by Evan J Haim (Haim, Evan) (Entered: 03/18/2013)
PACER 580 Filed: 3/7/2013, Entered: None
ORDER Signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 3/7/2013:Mailed notice(tlp, ) (Entered: 03/07/2013)
PACER 579 Filed: 3/7/2013, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Enter order. Motion hearing held on 3/7/2013. Status hearing held. The motion by respondents Marc J. Lane to quash third party subpoenas 568 is denied. Evidentiary Hearing set for 5/21/2013 at 10:00 AM. Status hearing set for 4/4/2013 at 11:00 AM.Mailed notice (tlp, ) (Entered: 03/07/2013)
PACER 578 Filed: 3/6/2013, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 3/6/2013: Mailed notice(tlp, ) (Entered: 03/06/2013)
PACER 577 Filed: 3/6/2013, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: ENTER MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. For the reasons set forth above, the motion to compel Winston & Strawn, the Law Offices of Marc Lane, and Website Solutions USA to comply with subpoenas 557 is granted. Mailed notice (tlp, ) (Entered: 03/06/2013)
PACER 576 Filed: 3/5/2013, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman:Motion hearing held on 3/5/2013. MOTION by Respondents Marc J. Lane, The Law Offices of Marc J. Lane PC to quash Third Party Subpoenas 568 is continued to 3/7/2013 at 11:00 AM.Mailed notice (tlp, ) (Entered: 03/05/2013)
PACER 575 Filed: 3/4/2013, Entered: None
REPLY by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission to motion to compel, 557 GIN USA and KTRN To Comply With Subpoenas, and Supplemental Reply Brief in Support of Motion To Compel Website Solutions To Comply With a Subpoena (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit PXB:1-PXB:3)(Cohen, Jonathan) (Entered: 03/04/2013)
PACER 574 Filed: 2/28/2013, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by WebSite Solutions USA, Inc. in Opposition to motion to compel, 538 (Donnellon, Daniel) (Entered: 02/28/2013)
PACER 573 Filed: 2/28/2013, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by KT Radio Network, Inc. in Opposition to motion to compel, 557 (Donnellon, Daniel) (Entered: 02/28/2013)
PACER 572 Filed: 2/28/2013, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by GIN USA, Inc. in Opposition to motion to compel, 557 (Donnellon, Daniel) (Entered: 02/28/2013)
PACER 571 Filed: 2/27/2013, Entered: None
Joint Discovery Plan by GIN USA, Inc., KT Radio Network, Inc., Marc J. Lane, The Law Offices of Marc J. Lane PC, Kevin Trudeau, WebSite Solutions USA, Inc., Winston & Strawn LLP (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 02/27/2013)
PACER 570 Filed: 2/26/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Kimball Richard Anderson for presentment of motion to quash 568 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 3/5/2013 at 09:15 AM. (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 02/26/2013)
PACER 569 Filed: 2/26/2013, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by Marc J. Lane, The Law Offices of Marc J. Lane PC in support of motion to quash 568 (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B)(Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 02/26/2013)
PACER 568 Filed: 2/26/2013, Entered: None
MOTION by Respondents Marc J. Lane, The Law Offices of Marc J. Lane PC to quash Third Party Subpoenas (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 02/26/2013)
PACER 567 Filed: 2/26/2013, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Respondent Marc J. Lane by Katherine E Croswell (Croswell, Katherine) (Entered: 02/26/2013)
PACER 566 Filed: 2/26/2013, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Respondent Marc J. Lane by Kimball Richard Anderson (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 02/26/2013)
PACER 565 Filed: 2/26/2013, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Respondent Marc J. Lane by Thomas Lee Kirsch, II (Kirsch, Thomas) (Entered: 02/26/2013)
PACER 564 Filed: 2/21/2013, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Motion to stay 545 third party discovery and appoint Special Master was denied. Motion hearing held on 2/21/2013 regarding plaintiff's motion 557 to compel GIN and KT Radio Network to comply with subpoenas. Response is due by 2/28/2013. Reply is due by 3/4/2013. That motion is continued to 3/7/2013, at 11:030 a.m. Mailed notice (gds) (Entered: 02/25/2013)
PACER 563 Filed: 2/21/2013, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Movants GIN USA, Inc., KT Radio Network, Inc. by Kenjiro D. Lecroix (Lecroix, Kenjiro) (Entered: 02/21/2013)
PACER 562 Filed: 2/21/2013, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Movants GIN USA, Inc., KT Radio Network, Inc. by Daniel J. Donnellon (Donnellon, Daniel) (Entered: 02/21/2013)
PACER 561 Filed: 2/20/2013, Entered: None
REPLY by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission to motion to compel, 538 Winston & Strawn, The Law Offices of Marc J. Lane, and Website Solutions USA To Comply With Subpoenas (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit F)(Cohen, Jonathan) (Entered: 02/20/2013)
PACER 560 Filed: 2/19/2013, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Leonard Gail is given leave to withdraw as counsel for Nataliya Babenko, GIN USA, KT Radio Network, and Website Solutions USA. Attorney Leonard A. Gail terminated. Mailed notice (jmp, ) (Entered: 02/20/2013)
PACER 558 Filed: 2/15/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Jonathan Cohen for presentment of motion to compel, 557 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 2/21/2013 at 09:15 AM. (Cohen, Jonathan) (Entered: 02/15/2013)
PACER 557 Filed: 2/15/2013, Entered: None
MOTION by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission to compel GIN USA and KT Radio Network To Comply With Subpoenas (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support of Motion To Compel GIN USA and KT Radio Network To Comply With Subpoenas, # 2 Exhibit PXA:1-PXA:17)(Cohen, Jonathan) (Entered: 02/15/2013)
PACER 556 Filed: 2/13/2013, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by The Law Offices of Marc J. Lane PC, Winston & Strawn LLP in Opposition to motion to compel, 538 (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D)(Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 02/13/2013)
PACER 555 Filed: 2/13/2013, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Respondent Winston & Strawn LLP by Katherine E Croswell (Croswell, Katherine) (Entered: 02/13/2013)
PACER 554 Filed: 2/13/2013, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Respondent Winston & Strawn LLP by Thomas Lee Kirsch, II (Kirsch, Thomas) (Entered: 02/13/2013)
PACER 553 Filed: 2/13/2013, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Respondent Winston & Strawn LLP by Kimball Richard Anderson (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 02/13/2013)
PACER 552 Filed: 2/13/2013, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Respondent The Law Offices of Marc J. Lane PC by Katherine E Croswell (Croswell, Katherine) (Entered: 02/13/2013)
PACER 551 Filed: 2/13/2013, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Respondent The Law Offices of Marc J. Lane PC by Thomas Lee Kirsch, II (Kirsch, Thomas) (Entered: 02/13/2013)
PACER 550 Filed: 2/13/2013, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Respondent The Law Offices of Marc J. Lane PC by Kimball Richard Anderson (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 02/13/2013)
PACER 549 Filed: 2/13/2013, Entered: None
Proposed Discovery and Contempt Hearing Schedule by Federal Trade Commission (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jonathan Cohen)(Cohen, Jonathan) (Entered: 02/13/2013)
PACER 548 Filed: 2/8/2013, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Status hearing held on 2/8/2013. Plaintiff's plan is due by 2/13/2013. Joint proposal is due by 2/27/2013. Mailed notice (gds) (Entered: 02/13/2013)
PACER 547 Filed: 2/4/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Kimball Richard Anderson for presentment of motion to stay 545 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 2/8/2013 at 01:30 PM. (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 02/04/2013)
PACER 546 Filed: 2/4/2013, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by Kevin Trudeau in support of motion to stay 545 (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B)(Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 02/04/2013)
PACER 545 Filed: 2/4/2013, Entered: None
MOTION by Defendant Kevin Trudeau to stay Third-Party Discovery and Appoint a Special Master for the Purpose of Establishing a Consumer Remediation Plan (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 02/04/2013)
PACER 544 Filed: 1/29/2013, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Movant WebSite Solutions USA, Inc. by Daniel J. Donnellon (Donnellon, Daniel) (Entered: 01/29/2013)
PACER 543 Filed: 1/29/2013, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Movant WebSite Solutions USA, Inc. by Daniel J. Donnellon (Donnellon, Daniel) (Entered: 01/29/2013)
PDF 542 Filed: 1/29/2013, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Leave is given to defendant to file financial statement under seal. Mailed notice (gds) (Entered: 01/29/2013)
PACER 541 Filed: 1/23/2013, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Motion hearing held on 1/23/2013 regarding plaintiff's motion to compel 538 . Response is due by 2/13/2013. Reply is due by 2/20/2013. Status hearing is set for 3/7/2013 at 11:00 a.m. Status hearing date of 2/1/2013 is re-set to 2/8/2013 at 1:30 p.m. Mailed notice (gds) (Entered: 01/29/2013)
PACER 540 Filed: 1/25/2013, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendant Kevin Trudeau Sworn Financial Statement (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 01/25/2013)
PACER 539 Filed: 1/18/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Jonathan Cohen for presentment of motion to compel, 538 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 1/24/2013 at 09:15 AM. (Cohen, Jonathan) (Entered: 01/18/2013)
PACER 538 Filed: 1/18/2013, Entered: None
MOTION by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission to compel Winston & Strawn, the Law Offices of Marc Lane, and Website Solutions USA To Comply With Subpoenas, and Certificate of Service (Attachments: # 1 Brief in Support, # 2 Exhibit FTC Exhibits PXA-PXE)(Cohen, Jonathan) (Entered: 01/18/2013)
PACER 537 Filed: 12/10/2012, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman:Motion hearing held on 12/10/2012 regarding defendant's motion 531 to abstain from filing non-parties' e-mails which is granted. E-mails by non-parties will not be accepted or filed as part of this case. Mailed notice (gds) (Entered: 12/17/2012)
PACER 536 Filed: 12/6/2012, Entered: None
FTC'S SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF Regarding the Court's Suggestion to Appoint a Forensic Accountant as a Master and in Support of Contempt Motion by Federal Trade Commission. (mr, ) (Entered: 12/07/2012)
PDF 535 Filed: 12/6/2012, Entered: None
ORDER signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 12/6/2012: Mailed notice (gds) (Entered: 12/06/2012)
PACER 534 Filed: 12/6/2012, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Plaintiff's motion 481 to hold defendant in contempt is continued until further order of court. Defendant's sworn complete statement of his financial condition is due by 1/25/2013. Mailed notice (gds) (Entered: 12/06/2012)
PACER 533 Filed: 12/6/2012, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Status hearing held on 12/6/2012. Plaintiff's motion for leave to file 526 is granted. Defendant's motion 528 for appointment of a Special Master is is denied. Status hearing set for 2/1/2013 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (gds) (Entered: 12/06/2012)
PACER 532 Filed: 12/6/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Kimball Richard Anderson for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief 531 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 12/10/2012 at 10:30 AM. (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 12/06/2012)
PACER 531 Filed: 12/6/2012, Entered: None
MOTION by Defendant Kevin Trudeau to Abstain from Filing Emails Erroneously Submitted Through Proposed Order Email System or, in the Alternative, to File Under Seal (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 12/06/2012)
PACER 530 Filed: 12/4/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Kimball Richard Anderson for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief 528 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 12/6/2012 at 10:00 AM. (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 12/04/2012)
PACER 529 Filed: 12/4/2012, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by Kevin Trudeau in support of motion for miscellaneous relief 528 for the Appointment of a Special Master Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 53 (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 12/04/2012)
PACER 528 Filed: 12/4/2012, Entered: None
MOTION by Defendant Kevin Trudeau for the Appointment of a Special Master Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. R. 53 (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 12/04/2012)
PACER 527 Filed: 11/30/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Michael Mora for presentment of motion for leave to file, 526 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 12/6/2012 at 10:00 AM. (Mora, Michael) (Entered: 11/30/2012)
PACER 526 Filed: 11/30/2012, Entered: None
MOTION by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission for leave to file Instanter a Supplemental Brief Re Court's Suggestion to Appoint Forensic Accountant as Master, and in Support of Contempt Motion (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Attachment A)(Mora, Michael) (Entered: 11/30/2012)
PACER 525 Filed: 11/28/2012, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Status hearing date of 12/5/2012 is re-set to 12/6/2012 at 10:00 a.m. Mailed notice (gds) (Entered: 11/29/2012)
PACER 524 Filed: 11/26/2012, Entered: None
TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 9/25/2012 before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman. Court Reporter Contact Information: LAURA R. RENKE, CSR, RDR, CRR, CLR Contract Court Reporter 219 S. Dearborn Street, Room 2144A Chicago, Illinois 60604 708.447.0905 laurarenke@hotmail.com. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 12/17/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/27/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/25/2013. (rp, ) (Entered: 11/28/2012)
PACER 523 Filed: 11/20/2012, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Status hearing held. Trudeau's Motion to Strike Mora Declaration (Doc. 500) is granted in part. The court strikes and will ignore the portions of the Mora declaration that contain improper argument. Trudeau's Motion to Strike New Matter and Argument in the FTC's Reply Brief (Doc. 519) is granted in part. Trudeau is given leave to file a sur-reply in opposition to the FTC's Motion to Hold Trudeau in Contempt (Doc. 481). Trudeau's sur-reply shall be limited to addressing the new matter raised in the FTC's reply brief. The FTC's motion to Hold Trudeau in Contempt (Doc. 481) is continued to December 5, 2012, at 10:00 a.m. Mailed notice. (mr, ) (Entered: 11/21/2012)
PACER 522 Filed: 10/30/2012, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable RObert Gettleman: Status hearing is re-set to 11/20/2012 at 9:30 a.m. Mailed notice (gds) Modified on 11/16/2012 (gds). (Entered: 10/30/2012)
PACER 521 Filed: 10/25/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Kimball Richard Anderson for presentment of motion to strike 519 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 10/30/2012 at 09:00 AM. (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 10/25/2012)
PACER 520 Filed: 10/25/2012, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by Kevin Trudeau in support of motion to strike 519 (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 10/25/2012)
PACER 519 Filed: 10/25/2012, Entered: None
MOTION by Defendant Kevin Trudeau to strike New Matter and Argument in FTC's Reply Brief (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 10/25/2012)
PACER 518 Filed: 10/16/2012, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Motion to continue 512 status hearing is granted. Status hearing date of 10/24/2012 is re-set to 10/30/2012 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (gds) (Entered: 10/16/2012)
PACER 517 Filed: 10/15/2012, Entered: None
REPLY by Federal Trade Commission to MOTION by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission to Hold Defendant Trudeau in Contempt for Violating the June 2, 2010 Order, Incarcerate Him, and Order Him to Provide an Accounting of and Turnover Assets 481 , response in opposition to motion, 508 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit FTC Reply Exhibit 6, # 2 Exhibit FTC Reply Exhibit 7, # 3 Exhibit FTC Reply Exhibits 8-9)(Mora, Michael) (Entered: 10/15/2012)
PACER 516 Filed: 10/12/2012, Entered: None
REPLY by Kevin Trudeau to MOTION by Defendant Kevin Trudeau to strike Declaration of Michael Mora in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Hold Defendant Kevin Trudeau in Contempt 481 500 (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 10/12/2012)
PACER 515 Filed: 10/12/2012, Entered: None
REPLY by Kevin Trudeau to MOTION by Defendant Kevin Trudeau to continue Status Hearing From October 24, 2012 to October 30, 2012 512 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 10/12/2012)
PACER 514 Filed: 10/10/2012, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by Federal Trade Commission in Opposition to motion to continue 512 October 24 Hearing on FTC's Motion to Hold Trudeau In Civil Contempt (Mora, Michael) (Entered: 10/10/2012)
PACER 513 Filed: 10/9/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Kimball Richard Anderson for presentment of motion to continue 512 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 10/18/2012 at 09:15 AM. (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 10/09/2012)
PACER 512 Filed: 10/9/2012, Entered: None
MOTION by Defendant Kevin Trudeau to continue Status Hearing From October 24, 2012 to October 30, 2012 (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 10/09/2012)
PACER 511 Filed: 10/5/2012, Entered: None
RESPONSE by Federal Trade Commissionin Opposition to MOTION by Defendant Kevin Trudeau to strike Declaration of Michael Mora in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Hold Defendant Kevin Trudeau in Contempt 481 500 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration FTC Exhibit 5 Supplemental Declaration of Ronald Lewis)(Mora, Michael) (Entered: 10/05/2012)
PACER 510 Filed: 9/25/2012, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Motion hearing held on 9/25/2012. Motion to file tax returns under seal 482 is granted. Motion for recusal 497 is denied. Defendant's motion for extension of time 503 to file response to motion to hold defendant in contempt is granted. Defendant's motion for leave to file excess pages 506 is granted, but is limited to 20 pages. Response to motion 500 to strike Mora declaration is due by 10/5/2012. Reply is due by 10/12/2012. Mailed notice (gds) (Entered: 10/01/2012)
PACER 509 Filed: 9/25/2012, Entered: None
SEALED RESPONSE by Kevin Trudeau to MOTION by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission to Hold Defendant Trudeau in Contempt for Violating the June 2, 2010 Order, Incarcerate Him, and Order Him to Provide an Accounting of and Turnover Assets 481 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit D, # 2 Exhibit F, # 3 Exhibit G, # 4 Exhibit H)(Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 09/25/2012)
PACER 508 Filed: 9/25/2012, Entered: None
RESPONSE by Kevin Trudeauin Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission to Hold Defendant Trudeau in Contempt for Violating the June 2, 2010 Order, Incarcerate Him, and Order Him to Provide an Accounting of and Turnover Assets 481 (REDACTED) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C-H)(Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 09/25/2012)
PACER 507 Filed: 9/21/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Kimball Richard Anderson for presentment of motion for leave to file excess pages, 506 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 9/25/2012 at 09:15 AM. (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 09/21/2012)
PACER 506 Filed: 9/21/2012, Entered: None
MOTION by Defendant Kevin Trudeau for leave to file excess pages For Brief In Opposition To The FTC's Motion To Hold Defendant Trudeau In Contempt For Violating The June 2, 2012 Order, Incarcerate Him, And Order Him To Provide An Accounting Of And Turnover Assets (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 09/21/2012)
PACER 505 Filed: 9/21/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Kimball Richard Anderson for presentment of extension of time, 503 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 9/25/2012 at 09:15 AM. (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 09/21/2012)
PACER 504 Filed: 9/20/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Kimball Richard Anderson for presentment of extension of time, 503 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 9/27/2012 at 09:15 AM. (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 09/20/2012)
PACER 503 Filed: 9/20/2012, Entered: None
MOTION by Defendant Kevin Trudeau for extension of time to File Response to the FTC's Motion to Hold Defendant Trudeau in Contempt for Violating June 2, 2012 order, Incarcerate Him, and Order Him to Provide an Accounting of and Turnover Assets 481 (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 09/20/2012)
PACER 502 Filed: 9/17/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Kimball Richard Anderson for presentment of motion to strike 500 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 9/25/2012 at 09:15 AM. (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 09/17/2012)
PACER 501 Filed: 9/17/2012, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by Kevin Trudeau in support of motion to strike 500 (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 09/17/2012)
PACER 500 Filed: 9/17/2012, Entered: None
MOTION by Defendant Kevin Trudeau to strike Declaration of Michael Mora in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Hold Defendant Kevin Trudeau in Contempt 481 (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 09/17/2012)
PACER 499 Filed: 9/11/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Kimball Richard Anderson for presentment of motion for recusal 497 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 9/25/2012 at 09:15 AM. (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 09/11/2012)
PACER 498 Filed: 9/11/2012, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by Kevin Trudeau in support of motion for recusal 497 (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D)(Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 09/11/2012)
PACER 497 Filed: 9/11/2012, Entered: None
MOTION by Defendant Kevin Trudeau for recusal (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 09/11/2012)
PACER 496 Filed: 8/29/2012, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Motion 468 of Stephen C. Dowdell for leave to appear pro hac vice is granted. Motion 495 of Jonathan Cohen for leave to appear pro hac vice is granted. Mailed notice. (mr, ) (Entered: 08/30/2012)
PACER 495 Filed: 8/17/2012, Entered: None
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (mr, ) (Entered: 08/22/2012)
PDF 494 Filed: 8/17/2012, Entered: None
Memorandum Opinion and Order signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 8/17/2012: Mailed notice (gds)
PACER 493 Filed: 8/17/2012, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Defendant's motion 476 for modification of order is denied. Hearing date of 8/30/2012 is stricken. Defendant's response to plaintiff's motionm 481 to hold defendant in contempt is due by 9/24/2012. Plaintiff's reply is due by 10/15/2012. Status hearing is set for 10/24/2012 at 1:30 p.m. mailed notice (gds) (Entered: 08/17/2012)
PACER 492 Filed: 8/15/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by David A. O'Toole for presentment of motion for leave to file 491 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 8/30/2012 at 11:00 AM. (O'Toole, David) (Entered: 08/15/2012)
PACER 491 Filed: 8/15/2012, Entered: None
MOTION by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission for leave to file Surreply in Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Modification of Order (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(O'Toole, David) (Entered: 08/15/2012)
PACER 490 Filed: 8/9/2012, Entered: None
TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 7/18/12 before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman. Court Reporter Contact Information: Laura R. Renke, (708) 447-0905, laurarenke@hotmail.com.. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 8/30/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/10/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/7/2012. (smm) (Entered: 08/09/2012)
PACER 489 Filed: 8/9/2012, Entered: None
REPLY by Defendant Kevin Trudeau to motion for miscellaneous relief 476 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-E)(Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 08/09/2012)
PACER 488 Filed: 7/18/2012, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Plaintiff's motion 483 for leave to file brief in excess of 15 pages is granted. Mailed notice. (mr, ) (Entered: 07/27/2012)
PACER 487 Filed: 7/26/2012, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by Federal Trade Commission in Opposition to motion for miscellaneous relief 476 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit FTC Attachment A, # 2 Exhibit FTC Attachment B, # 3 Exhibit FTC Attachment C)(Mora, Michael) (Entered: 07/26/2012)
PACER 486 Filed: 7/18/2012, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Motion hearing held on 7/18/2012 regarding motion to seal document 482 and motion to hold defendant in contempt 481 which are continued to 8/30/2012, at 11:00 a.m. Mailed notice (gds) (Entered: 07/26/2012)
PACER 485 Filed: 7/13/2012, Entered: None
RESTRICTED Documents Pursuant to LR 26.2 by Federal Trade Commission (mr, ) (Entered: 07/16/2012)
PACER 484 Filed: 7/13/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Michael Mora for presentment of motion for leave to file excess pages 483 , motion for miscellaneous relief, 481 , motion to seal, motion to seal document 482 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 7/18/2012 at 09:15 AM. (Mora, Michael) (Entered: 07/13/2012)
PACER 483 Filed: 7/13/2012, Entered: None
MOTION by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission for leave to file excess pages for Brief in Support of Motion to Hold Defendant Trudeau in Contempt (Mora, Michael) (Entered: 07/13/2012)
PACER 482 Filed: 7/13/2012, Entered: None
MOTION by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission to seal Certain Documents Related to Plaintiff's Motion to Hold Trudeau in Contempt, MOTION by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission to seal document (Mora, Michael) (Entered: 07/13/2012)
PDF 481 Filed: 7/13/2012, Entered: None
MOTION by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission to Hold Defendant Trudeau in Contempt for Violating the June 2, 2010 Order, Incarcerate Him, and Order Him to Provide an Accounting of and Turnover Assets (Attachments: # 1 Brief In Support of Motion, # 2 Exhibit FTCX 1, Part I, Lewis Dec & Att A-U, # 3 Exhibit FTCX 1, Part II, Att V-Z, # 4 Exhibit FTCX 2, Luceri Dec & Att A-H, # 5 Exhibit FTCX 3, Van Wazer Dec & Att. A-J, # 6 Exhibit FTCX 4, Mora Dec & Att A-J)(Mora, Michael) (Entered: 07/13/2012)
PACER 480 Filed: 6/19/2012, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Motion hearing held on 6/19/2012 regarding plaintiff's motion 476 for modification of order. Response is due by 7/26/2012. Reply is due by 8/9/2012. In court hearing is set for 8/30/2012 at 11:00 a.m. Mailed notice (gds) (Entered: 06/26/2012)
PACER 479 Filed: 6/22/2012, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Motion 473 of Daniel J. Donnellon for leave to appear pro hac vice is granted. Motion 474 of Kenjiro D. LeCroix for leave to appear pro hac vice is granted. Mailed notice. (mr, ) (Entered: 06/25/2012)
PACER 478 Filed: 6/11/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Kimball Richard Anderson for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief 476 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 6/19/2012 at 09:15 AM. (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 06/11/2012)
PACER 477 Filed: 6/11/2012, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by Kevin Trudeau in support of motion for miscellaneous relief 476 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 06/11/2012)
PACER 476 Filed: 6/11/2012, Entered: None
MOTION by Defendant Kevin Trudeau for Modification of Order, Approval of Consumer Remediation Plan, and Leave to Administer Consumer Remediation Plan through Rust Consulting, Inc. (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 06/11/2012)
PACER 475 Filed: 5/24/2012, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Motion hearing held on 5/24/2012 regarding motion to quash 470 . The motion to quash or modify the 5/8/2012 subpoena to produce is denied. Mailed notice (gds) (Entered: 05/25/2012)
PACER 474 Filed: 5/21/2012, Entered: None
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-7170908. (Lecroix, Kenjiro) (Entered: 05/21/2012)
PACER 473 Filed: 5/21/2012, Entered: None
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-7170858. (Donnellon, Daniel) (Entered: 05/21/2012)
PACER 472 Filed: 5/18/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Leonard A. Gail for presentment of motion to quash 470 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 5/24/2012 at 09:15 AM. (Gail, Leonard) (Entered: 05/18/2012)
PACER 471 Filed: 5/18/2012, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by GIN USA, Inc., KT Radio Network, Inc., WebSite Solutions USA, Inc. in support of motion to quash 470 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Gail, Leonard) (Entered: 05/18/2012)
PACER 470 Filed: 5/18/2012, Entered: None
MOTION by Movants GIN USA, Inc., KT Radio Network, Inc., WebSite Solutions USA, Inc. to quash Subpoena (Gail, Leonard) (Entered: 05/18/2012)
PACER 469 Filed: 5/18/2012, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Movants GIN USA, Inc., KT Radio Network, Inc., WebSite Solutions USA, Inc. by Leonard A. Gail (Gail, Leonard) (Entered: 05/18/2012)
PACER 468 Filed: 5/17/2012, Entered: None
MOTION by Plaintiff Federal Trade CommissionMotion and application to appear pro hac vice (Government attorney) (Dowdell, Stephen) (Entered: 05/17/2012)
PACER 467 Filed: 4/19/2012, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Motion 454 of Douglas R. Cole for leave to appear pro hac vice is granted. Mailed notice. (psm, ) (Entered: 04/24/2012)
PACER 466 Filed: 4/19/2012, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Motion for order 450 is denied. Motion to quash or for protective order 451 is denied. Motion 457 to adopt is granted;. Status hearing held on 4/19/2012 Mailed notice (gds) (Entered: 04/23/2012)
PACER 465 Filed: 4/12/2012, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Status hearing date of 4/13/2012 is re-set to 4/19/2012 at 10:30 a.m. Mailed notice (gds, ) (Entered: 04/12/2012)
PACER 464 Filed: 4/11/2012, Entered: None
Notice of Unavailability of Counsel STATEMENT by Nataliya Babenko (Gail, Leonard) (Entered: 04/11/2012)
PACER 463 Filed: 4/6/2012, Entered: None
REPLY by Defendant Kevin Trudeau to motion to quash, motion for protective order 451 (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 04/06/2012)
PACER 462 Filed: 4/3/2012, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Defendant's reply brief is due by 4/6/2012, noon. Mailed notice (gds, ) (Entered: 04/03/2012)
PACER 461 Filed: 3/28/2012, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by Federal Trade Commission in Opposition to motion to quash, motion for protective order 451 , motion for miscellaneous relief 457 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit FTC Attachment A, # 2 Exhibit FTC Attachment B, # 3 Exhibit FTC Attachment C)(Mora, Michael) (Entered: 03/28/2012)
PACER 460 Filed: 3/22/2012, Entered: None
SUPPLEMENT to memorandum in opposition to motion, 459 Notice of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit FTC Attachment A)(Mora, Michael) (Entered: 03/22/2012)
PACER 459 Filed: 3/21/2012, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by Federal Trade Commission in Opposition to motion for order 450 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit FTC Attachment A, # 2 Exhibit FTC Attachment B, # 3 Exhibit FTC Attachment C, # 4 Exhibit FTC Attachment D, # 5 Exhibit FTC Attachment E)(Mora, Michael) (Entered: 03/21/2012)
PACER 458 Filed: 3/14/2012, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Motion hearing held on 3/14/2012 regarding motion to quash, or for protective order 451 . Plaintiff's response is due by 3/28/2012. Defendant's reply is due by 4/4/2012. Status hearing date of 4/11/2012 is re-set to 4/13/2012 at 10:00 a.m. Mailed notice (gds) (Entered: 03/20/2012)
PACER 457 Filed: 3/16/2012, Entered: None
MOTION by Movant Nataliya Babenko Adopting and Joining Defendant Trudeau's Motion to Quash (Gail, Leonard) (Entered: 03/16/2012)
PACER 456 Filed: 3/9/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Kimball Richard Anderson for presentment of motion to quash, motion for protective order 451 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 3/14/2012 at 09:15 AM. (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 03/09/2012)
PACER 455 Filed: 3/8/2012, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT by Movant Nataliya Babenko (Gail, Leonard) (Entered: 03/08/2012)
PACER 454 Filed: 3/8/2012, Entered: None
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-6919313. (Cole, Douglas) (Entered: 03/08/2012)
PACER 453 Filed: 3/7/2012, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Motion hearing held. Movant Nataliya Babenko's motion 446 for leave to file a sworn statement under seal is granted. Movant's motion statement is due by 3/9/2012. Plaintiff FTC is given leave to file a response to the motion regarding marital privilege by 3/21/2012. Reply is due by 3/28/2012. Status hearing is set for 4/11/2012, at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice. (mr, ) (Entered: 03/08/2012)
PACER 452 Filed: 3/7/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Kimball Richard Anderson for presentment of motion to quash, motion for protective order 451 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 3/13/2012 at 09:15 AM. (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 03/07/2012)
PACER 451 Filed: 3/7/2012, Entered: None
MOTION by Defendant Kevin Trudeau to quash Third Party Subpoena Directed to Midwest Gaming & Entertainment LLC, d.b.a. Rivers Casino or in the Alternative, MOTION by Defendant Kevin Trudeau for protective order (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 03/07/2012)
PACER 450 Filed: 3/7/2012, Entered: None
MOTION by Movant Nataliya Babenko for order pursuant to Customer Challenge Provision of Right to Financial Privacy Act of 1978 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Gail, Leonard) (Entered: 03/07/2012)
PACER 449 Filed: 3/6/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Leonard A. Gail for presentment of motion to seal 446 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 3/7/2012 at 09:15 AM. (Gail, Leonard) (Entered: 03/06/2012)
PACER 448 Filed: 3/6/2012, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Unknown Nataliya Babenko by Leonard A. Gail on behalf of Matthew Reedy (Gail, Leonard) (Entered: 03/06/2012)
PACER 447 Filed: 3/6/2012, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Unknown Nataliya Babenko by Leonard A. Gail (Gail, Leonard) (Entered: 03/06/2012)
PACER 446 Filed: 3/5/2012, Entered: None
MOTION by Unknown Nataliya Babenko to seal sworn statement (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Gail, Leonard) (Entered: 03/05/2012)
PACER 445 Filed: 2/22/2012, Entered: None
LETTER from the Seventh Circuit returning the record on appeal in USCA no. 10-2418 consisting of three pleadings and twelve loose pleadings. (mr, ) (Entered: 02/24/2012)
PACER 444 Filed: 2/22/2012, Entered: None
LETTER from the Seventh Circuit returning the record on appeal in USCA no. 10-2418 consisting of three pleadings. (mr, ) (Entered: 02/23/2012)
PACER 443 Filed: 2/7/2012, Entered: None
LETTER from the USCA retaining the record on appeal in USCA no. 10-2418 consisting of three pleadings and twelve loose pleadings to be returned later. (mr, ) (Entered: 02/08/2012)
PACER 442 Filed: 2/7/2012, Entered: None
OPINION from the USCA for the 7th Circuit; Argued 9/24/2010; Decided 11/29/2011 in USCA case no. 10-2418. (mr, ) (Entered: 02/08/2012)
PACER 441 Filed: 2/7/2012, Entered: None
CERTIFIED copy of order dated 1/30/2012 from the USCA regarding notice of appeal 380 ; Appellate case no. : 10-2418; On consideration of the petition for rehearing and rehearing en banc, filed on January 13, 2012, no judge in active service has requested a vote on the petition for rehearing en banc and all of the judges on the original panel have voted to DENY the petition for rehearing. Accordingly, the petition for rehearing is DENIED. (mr, ) (Entered: 02/08/2012)
PACER 440 Filed: 2/7/2012, Entered: None
MANDATE of USCA dated 11/29/2011 regarding notice of appeal 380 ; USCA No. 10-2418; The judgment of the District Court is AFFIRMED, with costs, in accordance with the decision of this court entered on this date. (mr, ) (Entered: 02/08/2012)
PACER 439 Filed: 10/20/2010, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Defendant's motion for leave to withdraw Aesha R. Pallesen as counsel is granted. Mailed notice (ca, ) (Entered: 10/21/2010)
PACER 438 Filed: 10/20/2010, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Status hearing date of 10/22/2010 is stricken. Mailed notice (gds, ) (Entered: 10/20/2010)
PDF 437 Filed: 10/19/2010, Entered: None
Memorandum Opinion and Order signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 10/19/2010: Mailed notice (gds, ) (Entered: 10/19/2010)
PACER 436 Filed: 10/19/2010, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: The court overrules Trudeau's objections to the Show Cause order and denies his motion 416 to recuse. Mailed notice (gds, ) (Entered: 10/19/2010)
PACER 435 Filed: 10/19/2010, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: The undersigned judge chooses to exercise his prerogative as a senior judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sect. 294(b), to transfer the criminal proceedings arising from its order dated 9/16/2010, [doc. 339] ordering defendant Kevin Trudeau to show cause why he should not be held in criminal contempt for violating the agreed consent order dated 9/2/2004 [doc. 56], to the Executive Committee of this district for reassignment to another judge under a new number and caption: United states v. Kevin Trudeau. This court will continue to preside in the civil proceedings brought by the FTC against Trudeau. See FTC v. Truddeau 606 F.3d 382,391 (7th Cir. 2010). Mailed notice (gds, ) (Entered: 10/19/2010)
PACER 434 Filed: 10/5/2010, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Motion hearing held on 10/5/2010 regarding motion to correct 429 . That motion is denied. Mailed notice (gds, ) (Entered: 10/05/2010)
PACER 433 Filed: 9/29/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE of Removal of Material from the Custody of the Clerk's Office documents 237 and 313 by Shop America (USA), LLC, Kevin Trudeau (ca, ). (Entered: 10/01/2010)
PACER 432 Filed: 9/29/2010, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Argument heard on 9/29/2010. Status hearing and ruling set for 10/22/2010 at 10:00 a.m. By agreement of the parties, time is excluded under the Speedy Trial Act 18 U.S.C. Sect. 3161(h)(1) until that date. Mailed notice (gds, ) (Entered: 09/30/2010)
PACER 431 Filed: 9/29/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE of Exhibit Disposal Pursuant to Local Rule 79.1. The following documents are eligible for removal: Defendant's Counsel: David J. Bradford, Document #237, 313. Mailed Notice (jh, ) (Entered: 09/29/2010)
PACER 430 Filed: 9/29/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Kimball Richard Anderson for presentment of motion to amend/correct, motion for relief 429 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 10/5/2010 at 09:15 AM. (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 09/29/2010)
PACER 429 Filed: 9/29/2010, Entered: None
MOTION by Defendant Kevin Trudeau to amend/correct order 426 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 09/29/2010)
PACER 428 Filed: 9/27/2010, Entered: None
CERTIFIED copy of order dated 9/24/10 from the Seventh regarding notice of appeal 380 ; Appellate case no. : 10-3230. Upon consideration of the PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS, filed September 24, 2010, by counsel for the petitioner, IT IS ORDERED that the motion is DENIED as premature (ca, ). (Entered: 09/28/2010)
PACER 427 Filed: 9/24/2010, Entered: None
ACKNOWLEDGEMENT of receipt of short record on appeal regarding notice of appeal 380 ; USCA Case No. 10-3230 (ca, ). (Entered: 09/27/2010)
PACER 426 Filed: 9/24/2010, Entered: None
ORDER signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 9/24/2010: Mailed notice (gds, ) (Entered: 09/27/2010)
PACER 425 Filed: 9/24/2010, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Status hearing held on 9/24/2010. Defendant's motion to stay 420 further proceedings is denied and this matter is continued to 9/29/2010, at 2:00 p.m. By agreement of the parties, time is excluded under the Speedy Trial Act, 18 U.S.C. Sect. 3161(h)(1) until that date. Mailed notice (gds, ) (Entered: 09/27/2010)
PACER 424 Filed: 9/24/2010, Entered: None
ORDER signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 9/24/2010: Mailed notice (gds, ) (Entered: 09/27/2010)
PACER 423 Filed: 9/24/2010, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Defendant's motion for declaratory relief 401 and construction of corrected supplemental order is denied. Mailed notice (gds, ) (Entered: 09/27/2010)
PACER 422 Filed: 9/24/2010, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: It has been brought to the court's attention in defendant's motion for stay pending a petition for mandamus 420 that the minute order entered by the court on 9/14/2010 419 noted that the defendant's motion for recusal 416 is denied. That portion of the 9/14/2010 minute order is vacated as erroneously entered. As stated on the record and discussed with counsel on that date, defendant's motion for recusal was taken with the hearing regarding the rule to show cause, set to be heard 9/24/2010 at 2:00 p.m. The government was given leave to file a response to the motion to recuse, but government counsel stated in open court that he was unlikely to file an additional brief because the issue had been thoroughly discussed in the government's response to defendant's memorandum in response to the 4/16/2010 order to show cause and motion to dismiss 406 The denial of the motion to recuse is therefore vacated and will be addressed at the hearing on 9/24/2010, at 2:00 p.m.Mailed notice (gds, ) (Entered: 09/24/2010)
PACER 421 Filed: 9/24/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Kimball Richard Anderson for presentment of motion to stay 420 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 9/29/2010 at 09:15 AM. (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 09/24/2010)
PACER 420 Filed: 9/24/2010, Entered: None
MOTION by Defendant Kevin Trudeau to stay pending Petition for Writ of Mandamus (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 09/24/2010)
PACER 419 Filed: 9/14/2010, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Defendant's motion for recusal 416 is denied. Motion hearing held on 9/14/2010 regarding motion for recusal 416 . The time of the 9/24/2010 hearing regarding rule to show cause is re-set to 2:00 p.m. Mailed notice (gds, ) (Entered: 09/17/2010)
PACER 418 Filed: 9/10/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Kimball Richard Anderson for presentment of motion for recusal 416 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 9/14/2010 at 09:15 AM. (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 09/10/2010)
PACER 417 Filed: 9/10/2010, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by Kevin Trudeau in support of motion for recusal 416 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-D)(Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 09/10/2010)
PACER 416 Filed: 9/10/2010, Entered: None
MOTION by Defendant Kevin Trudeau for recusal (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 09/10/2010)
PACER 415 Filed: 8/26/2010, Entered: None
LETTER from the Seventh Circuit returning the record on appeal in USCA no. 10-1383 consisting of additional record, 1 box of exhibits; (return now complete). (lp, ) (Entered: 08/30/2010)
PACER 414 Filed: 8/26/2010, Entered: None
LETTER from the Seventh Circuit returning the record on appeal in USCA no. 10-1383 consisting of additional record; 8 Transcripts (return now complete). (lp, ) (Entered: 08/30/2010)
PACER 413 Filed: 8/27/2010, Entered: None
REPLY by Defendant Kevin Trudeau to memorandum 357 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 08/27/2010)
PACER 412 Filed: 8/27/2010, Entered: None
REPLY by Kevin Trudeau to MOTION by Defendant Kevin Trudeau for declaratory judgment and Construction of Corrected Supplemental Order 401 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 08/27/2010)
PACER 411 Filed: 8/26/2010, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Defendants' motion 409 for leave to withdraw Aesha R. Pallesen as counsel is granted. Mailed notice (ca, ) (Entered: 08/27/2010)
PACER 410 Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Aesha R Pallesen for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney 409 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 8/19/2010 at 09:15 AM. (Pallesen, Aesha) (Entered: 08/16/2010)
PACER 409 Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: None
MOTION by counsel for Defendant Kevin Trudeau to withdraw as attorney (Pallesen, Aesha) (Entered: 08/16/2010)
PACER 408 Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Kevin Trudeau by Katherine E Croswell (Croswell, Katherine) (Entered: 08/16/2010)
PACER 407 Filed: 8/13/2010, Entered: None
RESPONSE by Federal Trade Commissionin Opposition to MOTION by Defendant Kevin Trudeau for declaratory judgment and Construction of Corrected Supplemental Order 401 (Attachments: # 1 FTC Attachment 1, # 2 FTC Attachment 2, # 3 FTC Attachment 3, # 4 FTC Attachment 4)(Mora, Michael) (Entered: 08/13/2010)
PACER 406 Filed: 8/13/2010, Entered: None
RESPONSE by Unknown United States of America to motion hearing 404 to Defendant's Memorandum in Response to April 16, 2010, Order to Show Cause and Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Order to Show Cause (Krickbaum, Marc) (Entered: 08/13/2010)
PACER 405 Filed: 7/28/2010, Entered: None
EXHIBIT G (CD) by Defendant Kevin Trudeau regarding memorandum in support of motion 402 (Document not imaged)(ca, ). (Entered: 08/02/2010)
PACER 404 Filed: 7/28/2010, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Motion hearing held on 7/28/2010 regarding defendant's motion for declaratory judgment 401 . Response is due by 8/13/2010. Reply is due by 8/27/2010. Mailed notice (gds, ) (Entered: 07/30/2010)
PACER 403 Filed: 7/28/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Kimball Richard Anderson for presentment of motion for declaratory judgment 401 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 7/29/2010 at 10:00 AM. (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 07/28/2010)
PACER 402 Filed: 7/28/2010, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by Kevin Trudeau in support of motion for declaratory judgment 401 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-G)(Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 07/28/2010)
PACER 401 Filed: 7/28/2010, Entered: None
MOTION by Defendant Kevin Trudeau for declaratory judgment and Construction of Corrected Supplemental Order (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 07/28/2010)
PACER 400 Filed: 7/28/2010, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Status hearing is still set for 7/29/2010, at 10:00 a.m. Mailed notice (gds, ) (Entered: 07/28/2010)
PACER 399 Filed: 7/23/2010, Entered: None
STATUS Report On Monetary Sanction by Federal Trade Commission (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit FTC Attachment 1, # 2 Exhibit FTC Attachment 2, # 3 Exhibit FTC Attachment 3)(Mora, Michael) (Entered: 07/23/2010)
PACER 398 Filed: 7/13/2010, Entered: None
Order signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 7/13/2010: Mailed notice (gds, ) (Entered: 07/13/2010)
PACER 397 Filed: 7/13/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: This matter is referred to the U.S. Attorney for this District pursuant to 18 U.S.C. Sect. 401 and Fed. R. Crim. P. 42(a) The clerk is directed to create a separate docket entitled United States v. Kevin Trudeau and provide for random assignment to a judge other than Judge Gettleman. Mailed notice (gds, ) (Entered: 07/13/2010)
PACER 396 Filed: 7/12/2010, Entered: None
OPINION from the USCA for the Seventh Circuit; Argued April 8, 2010; Decided May 20, 2010 in USCA case no. 10-1383 (ca, ). (Entered: 07/13/2010)
PACER 395 Filed: 7/12/2010, Entered: None
MANDATE of USCA dated 5/20/10 regarding notice of appeal 301 ; USCA No. 10-1383. We VACATE Trudeau's sentence and the district court's finding of contempt, and REMAND for further proceedings according to 18 U.S.C. § 401, Fed. R. Crim. P. 42(a), and the opinion. The above is in accordance with the decision of this court entered on this date. (ca, ). (Entered: 07/13/2010)
PACER 394 Filed: 7/12/2010, Entered: None
LETTER from the Seventh Circuit returning the record on appeal in USCA no. 10-1383 consisting of eight volumes of transcripts, one volume of exhibits, and one box of additional exhibits (ca, ). (Entered: 07/13/2010)
PACER 393 Filed: 7/6/2010, Entered: None
USCA RECEIVED on 7/6/2010 the long record regarding notice of appeal 380 . (gej, ) (Entered: 07/09/2010)
PACER 392 Filed: 7/6/2010, Entered: None
TRANSMITTED to the USCA for the 7th Circuit the long record on appeal 380 (USCA no. 10-2418). (gej, ) (Entered: 07/06/2010)
PACER 391 Filed: 6/22/2010, Entered: None
SEVENTH CIRCUIT transcript information sheet by Kevin Trudeau (ca, ). (Entered: 06/24/2010)
PACER 390 Filed: 6/16/2010, Entered: None
AGREED ORDER Signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 6/16/2010(ca, ). (Entered: 06/18/2010)
PACER 389 Filed: 6/16/2010, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman:Motion 384 for extension of time is granted. Government's response to defendant's motion 363 is due by 8/13/2010. Defendant's reply is due by 8/27/2010. Hearing date of 7/29/10 is reset to 9/24/10 at 9:30 a.m. Time is excluded through 9/24/10 under T.18 U.S.C. Sect. 3161(h)(7)(A). The remedies hearing remains set for 7/29/2010 at 10:00 a.m. [For further detail see separate order(s).] Mailed notice (ca, ) (Entered: 06/18/2010)
PACER 388 Filed: 6/15/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE of Correction regarding 385 (ca, ). (Entered: 06/15/2010)
PACER 387 Filed: 6/10/2010, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Motion hearing held on 6/10/2010 regarding motion to stay pending ppeal, without requirement of a supersedeas bond 377 . That motion is denied. Mailed notice (gds, ) (Entered: 06/15/2010)
PACER 386 Filed: 6/14/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Lisa Marie Noller for presentment of extension of time 384 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 6/16/2010 at 09:15 AM. (Noller, Lisa) (Entered: 06/14/2010)
PACER 385 Filed: 6/14/2010, Entered: None
Document entered in error (Noller, Lisa) Modified on 6/15/2010 (ca, ). (Entered: 06/14/2010)
PACER 384 Filed: 6/14/2010, Entered: None
AGREED MOTION by Unknown United States of America for extension of time (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Noller, Lisa) Modified on 6/15/2010 (ca, ). (Entered: 06/14/2010)
PACER 383 Filed: 6/11/2010, Entered: None
ACKNOWLEDGEMENT of receipt of short record on appeal regarding notice of appeal 380 ; USCA Case No. 10-2418 (ca, ). (Entered: 06/14/2010)
PACER 382 Filed: 6/11/2010, Entered: None
TRANSMITTED to the 7th Circuit the short record on notice of appeal 380 . Notified counsel (gej, ) (Entered: 06/11/2010)
PACER 381 Filed: 6/11/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appeal Due letter sent to counsel of record. (gej, ) (Entered: 06/11/2010)
PACER 380 Filed: 6/11/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE of appeal by Kevin Trudeau regarding orders 335 , 371 , 337 , 370 , 372 , 336 , 373 , 334 Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 0752-4904032. (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 06/11/2010)
PACER 379 Filed: 6/7/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Kimball Richard Anderson for presentment of motion to stay, motion for relief 377 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 6/10/2010 at 09:15 AM. (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 06/07/2010)
PACER 378 Filed: 6/7/2010, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by Kevin Trudeau in support of motion for stay pending appeal 377 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-B)(Anderson, Kimball) Modified on 6/8/2010 (ca, ). (Entered: 06/07/2010)
PACER 377 Filed: 6/7/2010, Entered: None
MOTION by Defendant Kevin Trudeau to stay regarding order 372 PENDING APPEAL (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 06/07/2010)
PACER 376 Filed: 6/7/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE of Removal of Material from the Custody of the Clerk's Office 293 by Edward Bach (ca, ). (Entered: 06/07/2010)
PACER 375 Filed: 6/1/2010, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman:Defendant Kevin Trudeau's motion 366 to release bond and passport is granted. The Clerk is directed to release the $50,000 bond, with any accrued interest, and Mr. Trudeau's passport to Edward Bach, head of the docket dept, at defendant's counsel's firm. Mailed notice (ca, ) (Entered: 06/07/2010)
PACER 374 Filed: 6/1/2010, Entered: None
SUR-REPLY by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Amend the Supplemental Order Dated April 16, 2010 348 (ca, ). (Entered: 06/04/2010)
PACER 373 Filed: 6/2/2010, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: This Court's minute order dated 6/1/2010 is amended in part to VACATE that portion that denied defendant's motion 363 to dismiss the order to show cause, and to INCLUDE the denial of defendant's motion 348 to amend the supplemental order. Mailed notice (gds, ) (Entered: 06/02/2010)
PACER 372 Filed: 6/2/2010, Entered: None
Corrected Supplemental Order modifying the stipulated final order for permanent injunction and awarding monetary relief as to defendant Kevin Trudeau signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 6/2/2010: Mailed notice (gds, ) (Entered: 06/02/2010)
PACER 371 Filed: 6/1/2010, Entered: None
ORDER signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 6/1/2010: Mailed notice (gds, ) (Entered: 06/02/2010)
PACER 370 Filed: 6/1/2010, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Status hearing held on 6/1/2010. Both parties have moved 348 361 to amend the supplemental order dated 4/16/2010 and the court amends said order. Defendant's motion to dismiss 363 the order to show cause is denied. Plaintiff's motion for leave to file 368 sur-reply is granted. Defendant's oral motion to extend time to respond is denied. Mailed notice (gds, ) (Entered: 06/02/2010)
PACER 369 Filed: 5/27/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Michael Mora for presentment of motion for leave to file 368 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 6/3/2010 at 09:15 AM. (Mora, Michael) (Entered: 05/27/2010)
PACER 368 Filed: 5/27/2010, Entered: None
MOTION by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission for leave to file Surreply in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Amend the Supplemental Order Dated April 16, 2010 (Mora, Michael) (Entered: 05/27/2010)
PACER 367 Filed: 5/24/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Thomas Lee Kirsch, II for presentment of motion to release bond and passport 366 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 6/1/2010 at 10:00 AM. (Kirsch, Thomas) Modified on 5/25/2010 (ca, ). (Entered: 05/24/2010)
PACER 366 Filed: 5/24/2010, Entered: None
MOTION by Defendant Kevin Trudeau TO RELEASE BOND AND PASSPORT (Kirsch, Thomas) (Entered: 05/24/2010)
PACER 365 Filed: 5/21/2010, Entered: None
RESPONSE by Kevin Trudeau to MOTION by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission to Amend Supplemental Order 361 335 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Anderson, Kimball) Modified on 5/24/2010 (ca, ). (Entered: 05/21/2010)
PACER 364 Filed: 5/21/2010, Entered: None
REPLY Memorandum by Kevin Trudeau in Support of Motion to Amend the Supplemental order entered on April 16, 2010 348 337 (Anderson, Kimball) Modified on 5/24/2010 (ca, ). (Entered: 05/21/2010)
PACER 363 Filed: 5/13/2010, Entered: None
MOTION by Defendant Kevin Trudeau to dismiss ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Kirsch, Thomas) (Entered: 05/13/2010)
PACER 362 Filed: 5/10/2010, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Defendant's response to plaintiff's motion 361 to amend supplemental order is due by 5/21/2010. Plaintiff's reply is due by 5/27/2010. Telephone notice (gds, ) (Entered: 05/10/2010)
PACER 361 Filed: 5/7/2010, Entered: None
MOTION by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission to Amend Supplemental Order 335 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Attachment 1, Redlined Excerpted Supplemental Order, # 2 Exhibit Attachment 2, Revised Escrow Agreement ("Attachment A" to Supplemental Order)(Mora, Michael) Modified on 5/10/2010 (ca, ). (Entered: 05/07/2010)
PACER 360 Filed: 5/7/2010, Entered: None
OPPOSITION by Federal Trade Commission to MOTION by Defendant Kevin Trudeau to amend supplemental order and for Stay of enforcement pending resolution of motion 337 348 (Mora, Michael) Modified on 5/10/2010 (ca, ). (Entered: 05/07/2010)
PACER 359 Filed: 5/6/2010, Entered: None
ORDER dated 5/6/10 from the Seventh Circuit regarding notice of appeal 301 ; Appellate case no. : 10-1383 (ca, ). (Entered: 05/07/2010)
PACER 358 Filed: 5/3/2010, Entered: None
DESIGNATION of Marc Krickbaum as U.S. Attorney for Unknown United States of America (Krickbaum, Marc) (Entered: 05/03/2010)
PACER 357 Filed: 4/29/2010, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM in Response to April 16, 2010 Order to Show Cause 339 by Kevin Trudeau (ca, ). (Entered: 05/03/2010)
PACER 356 Filed: 4/29/2010, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Status hearing held. Defendant's motion 353 for leave to file excess pages is granted. Defendant's submission is due by 5/13/2010. Government's response is due by 6/14/2010. Defendant's reply is due by 6/28/2010. This Courts 7/29/2010, 10:00 a.m. status hearing will include hearing and argument. The Court waives setting a trial date at this time. The Court deems the period of time through 7/29/2010 excludable under the provisions of T. 18 U.S. Code, Section 3161(h)(7)(A) - interest of justice. Mailed notice (ca, ) (Entered: 05/03/2010)
PACER 355 Filed: 4/29/2010, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Kevin Trudeau by Steffen Nathanael Johnson (Johnson, Steffen) (Entered: 04/29/2010)
PACER 354 Filed: 4/28/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Kimball Richard Anderson for presentment of motion for leave to file excess pages 353 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 4/29/2010 at 02:30 PM. (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 04/28/2010)
PACER 353 Filed: 4/28/2010, Entered: None
MOTION by Defendant Kevin Trudeau for leave to file excess pages INSTANTER (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 04/28/2010)
PACER 352 Filed: 4/27/2010, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Defendants motion 346 for leave to withdraw the appearance of Lisa J Parker as counsel is granted. Mailed notice (ph, ) (Entered: 04/28/2010)
PACER 351 Filed: 4/27/2010, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Motion to reset 344 rule to show cause hearing is is granted. Rule to show cause hearing date of 4/28/2010 is stricken. Status hearing is set for 4/29/2010, at 2:30 p.m. Motion hearing held on 4/27/2010 regarding defendant's motion 348 to amend the supplemental order. Response is due by 5/7/2010. Reply is due by 5/22/2010. Status hearing set for 6/1/2010 at 10:00 a.m. Motion to stay enforcement of the 4/16/2010 order is granted until 6/1/2010. Mailed notice (gds, ) (Entered: 04/27/2010)
PACER 350 Filed: 4/22/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Kimball Richard Anderson for presentment of motion to amend/correct, motion to stay, motion for relief,,, 348 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 4/27/2010 at 09:15 AM. (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 04/22/2010)
PACER 349 Filed: 4/22/2010, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by Kevin Trudeau in support of Motion to amend the supplemental order entered on April 16, 2010 and for Stay of Enforcement pending resolution of the motion 348 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-B)(Anderson, Kimball) Modified on 4/23/2010 (ca, ). (Entered: 04/22/2010)
PACER 348 Filed: 4/22/2010, Entered: None
MOTION by Defendant Kevin Trudeau to Amend the Supplemental order entered on April 16, 2010 and for Stay of enforcement pending resolution of the motion 337 (Anderson, Kimball) Modified on 4/23/2010 (ca, ). (Entered: 04/22/2010)
PACER 347 Filed: 4/22/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Kimball Richard Anderson for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney 346 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 4/27/2010 at 09:15 AM. (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 04/22/2010)
PACER 346 Filed: 4/22/2010, Entered: None
MOTION by counsel for Defendant Kevin Trudeau to withdraw as attorney (Lisa J. Parker) (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 04/22/2010)
PACER 345 Filed: 4/22/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Kimball Richard Anderson for presentment of motion to reschedule 344 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 4/27/2010 at 09:15 AM. (Anderson, Kimball) Modified on 4/23/2010 (ca, ). (Entered: 04/22/2010)
PACER 344 Filed: 4/22/2010, Entered: None
MOTION by Defendant Kevin Trudeau to Reschedule Show Cause Hearing (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Anderson, Kimball) Modified on 4/23/2010 (ca, ). (Entered: 04/22/2010)
PACER 343 Filed: 4/22/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE of Correction regarding 341 (ca, ). (Entered: 04/22/2010)
PACER 342 Filed: 4/22/2010, Entered: None
DESIGNATION of Lisa Marie Noller as U.S. Attorney for Unknown United States of America (Noller, Lisa) (Entered: 04/22/2010)
PACER 341 Filed: 4/22/2010, Entered: None
Document entered in error (Noller, Lisa) Modified on 4/22/2010 (ca, ). (Entered: 04/22/2010)
PACER 340 Filed: 4/21/2010, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Motion 279 of John Kness for leave to withdraw as counsel for defendant is granted. Mailed notice (ca, ) (Entered: 04/22/2010)
PACER 339 Filed: 4/16/2010, Entered: None
ORDER signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 4/16/2010: Mailed notice (gds, ) (Entered: 04/16/2010)
PACER 338 Filed: 4/16/2010, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Order defendant Kevin Trudeau is directed to appear on 4/28/2010 at 11:00 a.m. to show cause why he should not be prosecuted for and held in criminal contempt of this court's 9/2/2004 Consent Order. The court requests the US Attorney prosecute defendant Trudeau for criminal contempt. The US Attorney or an assistant, is directed to appear at the 4/28/2010 hearing. Mailed notice (gds, ) (Entered: 04/16/2010)
PACER 337 Filed: 4/16/2010, Entered: None
Supplemental Order Modifying the Stipulated Final Order for Permanent Injunction and Awarding Monetary Relief as to defendant Kevin Trudeau signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 4/16/2010: Mailed notice (gds, ) (Entered: 04/16/2010)
PACER 336 Filed: 4/16/2010, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Supplemental order modifying the stipulated final order for permanent injunction and awarding monetary relief entered. Defendant Trudeau is ordered to obtain and maintain in force a performance bond in the principal amount of $2,000,000.00. In lieu of a performance bond, he may establish an interest-bearing escrow account fund. As a sanction for defendant Trudeau's contempt of the Final Order, and affirmed by the USCA, he is ordered to pay forthwith to plaintiff FTC the sum of $37,616.161.00, representing consumer loss. Plaintiff FTC's report on status of reimbursement efforts is due by 7/23/2010. Status hearing is set for 7/29/2010, at 10:00 a.m. This court shall retain jurisdiction. Mailed notice (gds, ) (Entered: 04/16/2010)
PACER 335 Filed: 4/16/2010, Entered: None
Memorandum Opinion and Order signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 4/16/2010: Mailed notice (gds, ) (Entered: 04/16/2010)
PACER 334 Filed: 4/16/2010, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Memorandum opinion and order entered. Accordingly, plaintiff's motion 267 for entry of compensatory monetary remedy, and plaintiff's motion 269 to modify the stipulated final order are granted in part. The Court will enter the Supplemental order modifying the stipulated final judgment for permanent injunction and awarding monetary relief. Mailed notice (gds, ) (Entered: 04/16/2010)
PACER 333 Filed: 3/25/2010, Entered: None
THIRD PARTY COMMUNICATIONS (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit) (Poor quality original - paper document on file) Modified on 3/29/2010 (ca, ). (Entered: 03/29/2010)
PACER 332 Filed: 3/19/2010, Entered: None
SUPPLEMENTAL Post-Hearing Brief by Federal Trade Commission in Support of its Renewed Motion 267 269 for Compensatory Contempt Remedy and Renewed Motion to Modify the Stipulated Final Order for Permanent Injunction As To Defendant Kevin Trudeau (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit FTC Attachments 1-3, # 2 Exhibit FTC Attachments 1-9)(Mora, Michael) Modified on 3/22/2010 (ca, ). (Entered: 03/19/2010)
PACER 331 Filed: 3/19/2010, Entered: None
SUPPLEMENTAL Brief by Kevin Trudeau in Opposition to the FTC's Renewed Remedy Motion, and Renewed Motion to modify the 2004 Stipulated Order 267 269 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-H, # 2 Exhibit I-J)(Anderson, Kimball) Modified on 3/22/2010 (ca, ). (Entered: 03/19/2010)
PACER 330 Filed: 3/12/2010, Entered: None
SUR-REPLY by Defendant Kevin Trudeau in Opposition to the FTC's Renewed Motions for Entry of Compensatory Monetary Remedy and to Modify the Stipulated Final Order 267 269 (ca, ). (Entered: 03/17/2010)
PACER 329 Filed: 3/12/2010, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Preliminary hearing held. Defendant's motion 323 for leave to file sur-reply in opposition to plaintiffs motion for compensatory remedy and motion to modify stipulated final order is granted. Defendant's motion 325 to stay is denied. The matter is taken under advisement. Mailed notice (ca, ) (Entered: 03/17/2010)
PACER 328 Filed: 3/11/2010, Entered: None
OPPOSITION by Federal Trade Commission to MOTION by Defendant Kevin Trudeau to stay Proceeding 325 (O'Toole, David) Modified on 3/12/2010 (ca, ). (Entered: 03/11/2010)
PACER 327 Filed: 3/9/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Kimball Richard Anderson for presentment of motion to stay 325 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 3/12/2010 at 10:30 AM. (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 03/09/2010)
PACER 326 Filed: 3/9/2010, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by Kevin Trudeau in support of motion to stay the proceedings in civil action no. 03-C-3904 Pending a Decision by the Appellate Court in expedited appeal no. 10-1381 325 (Anderson, Kimball) Modified on 3/10/2010 (ca, ). (Entered: 03/09/2010)
PACER 325 Filed: 3/9/2010, Entered: None
MOTION by Defendant Kevin Trudeau to stay THE PROCEEDINGS IN CIVIL ACTION NO. 03-C-3904 PENDING A DECISION BY THE APPELLATE COURT IN EXPEDITED APPEAL NO. 10-1381 (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 03/09/2010)
PACER 324 Filed: 3/9/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Kimball Richard Anderson for presentment of motion for leave to file 323 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 3/12/2010 at 10:30 AM. (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 03/09/2010)
PACER 323 Filed: 3/9/2010, Entered: None
MOTION by Defendant Kevin Trudeau for leave to file INSTANTER A SURREPLY IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR COMPENSATORY REMEDY AND MOTION TO MODIFY STIPULATED FINAL ORDER (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 03/09/2010)
PDF 437
PDF 322 Filed: 2/26/2010, Entered: None
ORDER dated 2/26/10 from the USCA Seventh Circuit regarding notice of appeal 301 ; Appellate case no. : 10-1383 (ca, ). (Entered: 03/01/2010)
PACER 321 Filed: 2/25/2010, Entered: None
TRANSMITTED to the USCA for the 7th Circuit supplemental record on appeal 301 (USCA no. 10-1383) consisting of four volume of transcripts (ca, ). (Entered: 02/25/2010)
PACER 320 Filed: 2/23/2010, Entered: None
TRANSMITTED to the USCA for the 7th Circuit supplemental record on appeal 301 (USCA no. 10-1383). (gej, ) (Entered: 02/25/2010)
PACER 319 Filed: 2/24/2010, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Status hearing held. The Court declines to rule on defendant's motion 310 to modify release conditions. This Court stays payment of the fine until the Court of Appeals rules.Mailed notice (ca, ) (Entered: 02/25/2010)
PACER 318 Filed: 2/24/2010, Entered: None
TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 02/18/10 before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman. Court Reporter Contact Information: Jennifer Costales, CRR, RMR jennifer_costales@ilnd.uscourts.gov (312)427-5351.

IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings.

Redaction Request due 3/17/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/29/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/25/2010. (Costales, Jennifer) (Entered: 02/24/2010)
PACER 317 Filed: 2/24/2010, Entered: None
TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 02/11/10 before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman. Court Reporter Contact Information: Jennifer Costales, CRR, RMR jennifer_costales@ilnd.uscourts.gov (312)427-5351.

IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings.

Redaction Request due 3/17/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/29/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/25/2010. (Costales, Jennifer) (Entered: 02/24/2010)
PACER 316 Filed: 2/24/2010, Entered: None
TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 12/22/09 before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman. Court Reporter Contact Information: Jennifer Costales, CRR, RMR jennifer_costales@ilnd.uscourts.gov (312)427-5351.

IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings.

Redaction Request due 3/17/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/29/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/25/2010. (Costales, Jennifer) (Entered: 02/24/2010)
PACER 315 Filed: 2/24/2010, Entered: None
TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 12/3/09 before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman. Court Reporter Contact Information: Jennifer Costales, CRR, RMR jennifer_costales@ilnd.uscourts.gov (312)427-5351.

IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings.

Redaction Request due 3/17/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/29/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/25/2010. (Costales, Jennifer) (Entered: 02/24/2010)
PACER 314 Filed: 2/23/2010, Entered: None
TRANSMITTED to the USCA for the 7th Circuit supplemental record on appeal 301 (USCA no. 10-1383). (gej, ) (Entered: 02/23/2010)
PACER 313 Filed: 2/17/2010, Entered: None
EXHIBIT (Transcript of Radio Broadcast of February 10, 2010 Taken from the Internet-USTREAM Website). (Document not Imaged) (gej, ) (Entered: 02/23/2010)
PACER 312 Filed: 2/19/2010, Entered: None
RECEIVED by USCA Seventh Circuit, long record on appeal, USCA No. 10-1383 (ca, ). (Entered: 02/23/2010)
PACER 311 Filed: 2/22/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Kimball Richard Anderson for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief 310 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 2/24/2010 at 03:00 PM. (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 02/22/2010)
PACER 310 Filed: 2/22/2010, Entered: None
MOTION by Defendant Kevin Trudeau to Modify Release Conditions (UNOPPOSED) (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 02/22/2010)
PACER 309 Filed: 2/18/2010, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Status hearing held on 2/18/2010. The Court stays payment of the fine to 2/24/2010. status hearing is set for 2/24/2010, at 3:00 p.m. Preliminary hearing date of 3/9/2010 is re-set to 3/12/2010 at 10:30 a.m. Mailed notice (gds, ) (Entered: 02/19/2010)
PACER 308 Filed: 2/18/2010, Entered: None
SEVENTH CIRCUIT transcript information sheet by Kevin Trudeau (Poor quality original - paper document on file). Modified on 2/19/2010 (ca, ). (Entered: 02/19/2010)
PACER 307 Filed: 2/18/2010, Entered: None
TRANSMITTED to the USCA for the 7th Circuit the long record on appeal 301 (USCA no. 10-1383). (gej, ) (Entered: 02/18/2010)
PACER 306 Filed: 2/17/2010, Entered: None
EXHIBIT. Modified on 2/19/2010 (ca, ). (Entered: 02/18/2010)
PACER 305 Filed: 2/18/2010, Entered: None
ACKNOWLEDGEMENT of receipt of short record on appeal regarding notice of appeal 301 ; USCA Case No. 10-1383 (ca, ). (Entered: 02/18/2010)
PACER 304 Filed: 2/18/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE of Case Opening (ca, ). (Entered: 02/18/2010)
PACER 303 Filed: 2/18/2010, Entered: None
TRANSMITTED to the 7th Circuit the short record on notice of appeal 301 . Notified counsel (gej, ) (Entered: 02/18/2010)
PACER 302 Filed: 2/18/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appeal Due letter sent to counsel of record. (gej, ) (Entered: 02/18/2010)
PACER 301 Filed: 2/17/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE of appeal by Kevin Trudeau regarding orders 299 , 300 Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 0752-4537069. (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 02/17/2010)
PDF 300 Filed: 2/17/2010, Entered: None
ORDER signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 2/17/2010: Mailed notice (gds, ) (Entered: 02/17/2010)
PACER 299 Filed: 2/17/2010, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Status hearing held on 2/17/2010. Defendant's motion for leave to file excess pages 296 is granted. The Court certifies that defendant committed direct criminal contempt of court. Under 18 U.S.C. Sect. 401 he is committed for a term of 30 days custody of the U.S. Marshal and he is fined $5,000.00. Defendant's motion 295 for acquittal and his oral motion for preparation of a pre-sentence report are denied. Imposition of the sanctions imposed herein are stayed until 2/18/2010, at 2:15 p.m. Status hearing set for 2/18/2010 at 2:15 p.m. Terms of defendant's bond are to stand until he surrenders into custody.Mailed notice (gds, ) (Entered: 02/17/2010)
PACER 298 Filed: 2/16/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Kimball Richard Anderson for presentment of motion for leave to file excess pages 296 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 2/17/2010 at 01:30 PM. (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 02/16/2010)
PACER 297 Filed: 2/16/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Kimball Richard Anderson for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief 295 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 2/17/2010 at 01:30 PM. (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 02/16/2010)
PACER 296 Filed: 2/16/2010, Entered: None
MOTION by Defendant Kevin Trudeau for leave to file excess pages INSTANTER (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 02/16/2010)
PDF 295 Filed: 2/16/2010, Entered: None
MOTION by Defendant Kevin Trudeau FOR ACQUITTAL (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 02/16/2010)
PDF 294 Filed: 2/16/2010, Entered: None
FTC's Statement Regarding the Court's February 11, 2010 Order Holding Defendant Kevin Trudeau in Criminal Contempt by Federal Trade Commission (Mora, Michael) (Entered: 02/16/2010)
PACER 293 Filed: 2/11/2010, Entered: None
APPEARANCE BOND in the amount of $ 50,000 posted by Kevin Trudeau (REDACTED IMAGE) (cdy, ) (Entered: 02/12/2010)
PACER 292 Filed: 2/11/2010, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Kevin Trudeau by Thomas Lee Kirsch, II (Kirsch, Thomas) (Entered: 02/11/2010)
PACER 291 Filed: 2/11/2010, Entered: None
ORDER Signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 2/11/2010(ca, ). (Entered: 02/11/2010)
PACER 290 Filed: 2/11/2010, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Return on rule to show cause held. The court finds defendant to be in direct criminal contempt. Defendant's bond is set at $50,000.00. Defendant is not to leave the Northern District of Illinois without prior permission by this Court. Defendant is to surrender his passport. Defendant is ordered RELEASED after processing. He is allowed to post the $50,000.00 on 2/12/2010. Parties submission to the court are due by 2/16/2010. Status hearing is set for 2/17/2010, at 1:30 p.m.Mailed notice (ca, ) (Entered: 02/11/2010)
PACER 289 Filed: 2/11/2010, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman:Status hearing held on 2/11/2010. Rule to show cause why defendant Kevin Trudeau should not be held in contempt issues and is returnable 2/11/2010 at 01:00 PM. Mailed notice (gds, ) (Entered: 02/11/2010)
PACER 288 Filed: 2/10/2010, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Status hearing set for 2/11/2010 at 10:00 a.m. to deal with an urgent matter that has come to the Court's attention. Counsel are directed to appear. Mailed notice (gds, ) (Entered: 02/10/2010)
PACER 287 Filed: 2/1/2010, Entered: None
REPLY by Federal Trade Commission to MOTION by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission Modification of Stipulated Final Order 269 , response in opposition to motion 278 FTC's Reply to Kevin Trudeau's Opposition to the FTC's Motion to Modify the Stipulated Final Order (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit FTC Ex. 61-63, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Mora, Michael) (Entered: 02/01/2010)
PACER 286 Filed: 2/1/2010, Entered: None
REPLY by Federal Trade Commission to MOTION by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission Contempt Remedy Order 267 , response to motion 284 FTC's Reply in Support of Its Renewed Motion for Entry of Compensatory Contempt Remedy Against Kevin Trudeau, and Certificate of Service (Mora, Michael) (Entered: 02/01/2010)
PACER 285 Filed: 1/19/2010, Entered: None
SEALED EXHIBIT by Defendant Kevin Trudeau regarding response to motion 284 (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 01/19/2010)
PACER 284 Filed: 1/19/2010, Entered: None
SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE by Kevin Trudeau to the FTC's renewed motion for entry of compensatory monetary remedy 267 (Anderson, Kimball) Modified on 1/20/2010 (cdy, ). (Entered: 01/19/2010)
PACER 283 Filed: 12/22/2009, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Status hearing held on 12/22/2009. Defendant's response to plaintiff's motion 267 for compensatory monetary remedy is due by 1/18/2010. Plaintiff's reply is due by 2/1/2010. Plaintiff's reply to defendant's response to plaintiff's renewed motion 269 for permanent injunction is due by 2/1/2010. Status hearing set for 3/9/2010 at 10:00 a.m. Mailed notice (gds, ) (Entered: 12/23/2009)
PACER 282 Filed: 12/23/2009, Entered: None
NOTICE by Sandhya Prabhu Brown of Change of Address Notice of Name Change (Brown, Sandhya) (Entered: 12/23/2009)
PACER 281 Filed: 12/21/2009, Entered: None
OPPOSITION by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission to Kevin Trudeau's Addendum Discovery Proposal 277 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Attachments A through D)(Prabhu, Sandhya) Modified on 12/22/2009 (ca, ). (Entered: 12/21/2009)
PACER 280 Filed: 12/17/2009, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Kimball Richard Anderson for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney 279 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 12/22/2009 at 02:00 PM. (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 12/17/2009)
PACER 279 Filed: 12/17/2009, Entered: None
MOTION by counsel for Defendant Kevin Trudeau to withdraw as attorney (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 12/17/2009)
PACER 278 Filed: 12/17/2009, Entered: None
RESPONSE by Kevin Trudeauin Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission Modification of Stipulated Final Order 269 (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 12/17/2009)
PACER 277 Filed: 12/17/2009, Entered: None
RESPONSE by Kevin Trudeau to MOTION by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission for Entry of compensatory Monetary Remendy 267 (Attachments: # 1 Addendum)(Anderson, Kimball) Modified on 12/18/2009 (ca, ). (Entered: 12/17/2009)
PACER 276 Filed: 12/3/2009, Entered: None
ORDER Signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 12/3/2009(ca, ). (Entered: 12/04/2009)
PACER 275 Filed: 12/3/2009, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Telephone status hearing held. Defendant's response to plaintiff's renewed motion to modify the injunction is due by 12/17/2009. Defendant's response to plaintiff's renewed motion for compensatory monetary remedy is due by 12/17/2009. Plaintiff's motion 272 to enter proposed scheduling order is denied. Defendant's discovery plan is due by 12/17/2009. A preliminary hearing is set for 12/22/2009, at 2:00 p.m. [For further detail see separate order] Mailed notice (ca, ) (Entered: 12/04/2009)
PACER 274 Filed: 12/1/2009, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Status hearing held on 12/1/2009. Telephonic status hearing set for 12/3/2009 at 8:45 a.m. Mailed notice (gds, ) (Entered: 12/02/2009)
PACER 273 Filed: 11/30/2009, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Kimball Richard Anderson for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief 272 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 12/3/2009 at 08:30 AM. (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 11/30/2009)
PACER 272 Filed: 11/30/2009, Entered: None
MOTION by Defendant Kevin Trudeau TO ENTER PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kimball R. Anderson)(Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 11/30/2009)
PACER 271 Filed: 11/17/2009, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Status hearing held on 11/17/2009. Status hearing set for 12/1/2009 at 9:30 a.m.Mailed notice (gds, ) (Entered: 11/17/2009)
PACER 270 Filed: 11/13/2009, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Michael Mora for presentment of Renewed motion to Modify 269 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 11/17/2009 at 09:30 AM. (Mora, Michael) Modified on 11/16/2009 (ca, ). (Entered: 11/13/2009)
PACER 269 Filed: 11/13/2009, Entered: None
RENEWED MOTION by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission to Modify the Stipulated Final Order for Permanent Injunction as to Defendant Kevin Trudeau (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit FTC Ex. 56-60, # 2 Text of Proposed Order (Proposed) Supplemental Order Modifying Stipulated Final Order)(Mora, Michael) Modified on 11/16/2009 (ca, ). (Entered: 11/13/2009)
PACER 268 Filed: 11/13/2009, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Michael Mora for presentment of Renewed motion for entry of Compensatory 267 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 11/17/2009 at 09:30 AM. (Mora, Michael) Modified on 11/16/2009 (ca, ). (Entered: 11/13/2009)
PACER 267 Filed: 11/13/2009, Entered: None
RENEWED MOTION by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission for Entry of Compensatory Monetary Remedy Against Kevin Trudeau (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order (Proposed) Contempt Remedy Order)(Mora, Michael) Modified on 11/16/2009 (ca, ). (Entered: 11/13/2009)
PACER 266 Filed: 11/2/2009, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Status hearing is re-set to 11/17/2009 at 9:30 a.m. Telephone notice (gds, ) (Entered: 11/02/2009)
PACER 265 Filed: 10/29/2009, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Status hearing is set for 11/4/2009 at 9:30 a.m. Mailed notice (gds, ) (Entered: 10/29/2009)
PACER 264 Filed: 10/20/2009, Entered: None
LETTER from the Seventh Circuit returning the record on appeal in USCA no. 08-4249 consisting of four volume of pleadings, eight volume of loose pleadings, eight transcripts and one box of exhibits (ca, ). (Entered: 10/23/2009)
PACER 263 Filed: 10/19/2009, Entered: None
OPINION from the USCA for the Seventh Circuit; Argued May 14, 2009; Decided August 27, 2009 in USCA case no. 08-4249 (ca, ). (Entered: 10/21/2009)
PACER 262 Filed: 10/19/2009, Entered: None
MANDATE of USCA dated 8/27/09 regarding notice of appeal 231 ; USCA No. 08-4249. The district court's finding Trudeau in contempt of the 2004 Consent Order is Affirmed. However, the monetary sanction and the infomercial ban is Vacated and the case is Remanded for further proceedings consistent with this opinion. The above is in accordance with the decision of this court entered on this date. No award of costs. (ca, ). (Entered: 10/21/2009)
PACER 261 Filed: 10/19/2009, Entered: None
LETTER from the USCA retaining the record on appeal in USCA no. 08-4249 consisting of four volumes of pleadings, eight volumes of loose pleadings, eight transcripts, and one volume of exhibits (ca, ). (Entered: 10/21/2009)
PACER 260 Filed: 7/8/2009, Entered: None
AGREED ORDER Signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 7/8/2009(ca, ). (Entered: 07/13/2009)
PACER 259 Filed: 7/8/2009, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Defendant's motion 255 for protective order is granted. [For further detail see separate order]Mailed notice. (ca, ) (Entered: 07/13/2009)
PACER 258 Filed: 7/8/2009, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Kevin Trudeau by Aesha R Pallesen (Pallesen, Aesha) (Entered: 07/08/2009)
PACER 257 Filed: 6/29/2009, Entered: None
EXHIBIT by Defendant Kevin Trudeau (AMENDED) 1-4 regarding MOTION by Defendant Kevin Trudeau for protective order 255 (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 06/29/2009)
PACER 256 Filed: 6/26/2009, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Kimball Richard Anderson for presentment of motion for protective order 255 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 7/8/2009 at 09:15 AM. (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 06/26/2009)
PACER 255 Filed: 6/26/2009, Entered: None
MOTION by Defendant Kevin Trudeau for protective order (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-4)(Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 06/26/2009)
PACER 254 Filed: 6/18/2009, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Plaintiff's motion to compel discovery 245 is withdrawn. Status hearing date of 6/30/2009 is stricken. Mailed notice (gds, ) (Entered: 06/18/2009)
PACER 253 Filed: 6/17/2009, Entered: None
UNOPPOSED Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Compel Discovery and Request to cancel status hearing by Federal Trade Commission (Mora, Michael) Modified on 6/18/2009 (ca, ). (Entered: 06/17/2009)
PACER 252 Filed: 6/3/2009, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Plaintiff's motion 245 to compel is continued to 6/30/2009, at 9:30 a.m. Telephone notice (gds, ) (Entered: 06/03/2009)
PACER 251 Filed: 5/20/2009, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Plaintiff's motion to compel is re-set to 6/4/2009 at 9:30 a.m. Telephone notice (gds, ) (Entered: 05/20/2009)
PACER 250 Filed: 4/28/2009, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Status hearing held on 4/28/2009. Status hearing set for 5/20/2009 at 9:30 a.m. Mailed notice (gds, ) (Entered: 04/29/2009)
PACER 249 Filed: 4/9/2009, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Plaintiff's motion 246 for leave to file under seal Ex. 10 to plaintiff's motion to compel postjudgment discovery responses is granted. Mailed notice (ca, ) (Entered: 04/14/2009)
PACER 248 Filed: 4/13/2009, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Motion hearing held on 4/13/2009 regarding plaintiff's motion to compel discovery responses, 245 which is continued to 4/28/2009 at 9:30 a.m. Mailed notice (gds, ) (Entered: 04/13/2009)
PACER 247 Filed: 4/6/2009, Entered: None
Plaintiff's NOTICE of Motion by Michael Mora for presentment of motion for discovery,, 245 , motion to seal document, 246 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 4/9/2009 at 09:15 AM. (Mora, Michael) (Entered: 04/06/2009)
PACER 246 Filed: 4/6/2009, Entered: None
MOTION by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission For Leave to File Under Seal Exhibit 10 to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Post-Judgment Discovery Responses from Defendant Kevin Trudeau, and Certificate of Service (Mora, Michael) Modified on 4/7/2009 (ca, ). (Entered: 04/06/2009)
PACER 245 Filed: 4/6/2009, Entered: None
MOTION by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission to Compel Post-Judgment Discovery Responses from Defendant Kevin Trudeau, and Certificate of Service (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit FTC Ex 1, # 2 Exhibit FTC Ex 2, # 3 Exhibit FTC Ex 3, # 4 Exhibit FTC Ex 4, # 5 Exhibit FTC Ex 5, # 6 Exhibit FTC Ex 6, # 7 Exhibit FTC Ex 7, # 8 Exhibit FTC Ex 8, # 9 Exhibit FTC Ex 9, # 10 Exhibit FTC Ex 11, # 11 Exhibit FTC Ex 12, # 12 Exhibit FTC Ex 13, # 13 Exhibit FTC Ex 14)(Mora, Michael) Modified on 4/7/2009 (ca, ). (Entered: 04/06/2009)
PACER 244 Filed: 3/6/2009, Entered: None
ABSTRACT of judgment issued by the USA as to Kevin Trudeau in the amount of $37,616,161. (cdy, ). (Entered: 03/09/2009)
PACER 243 Filed: 2/17/2009, Entered: None
ABSTRACT of Judgment issued per the request of USA as to Kevin Trudeau in the amount of $37, 616,161. (ca, ) (Entered: 02/18/2009)
PACER 242 Filed: 2/17/2009, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Motion 241 of Michael Mora for leave to appear pro hac vice is granted. Mailed notice (ca, ) (Entered: 02/17/2009)
PACER 241 Filed: 1/30/2009, Entered: None
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Mora, Michael) (Entered: 01/30/2009)
PACER 240 Filed: 1/23/2009, Entered: None
USCA RECEIVED on 1/23/2009 the long record regarding notice of appeal 231 . (gej, ) (Entered: 01/27/2009)
PACER 239 Filed: 1/23/2009, Entered: None
TRANSMITTED to the USCA for the 7th Circuit the long record on appeal 231 (USCA no. 08-4249) consisting of 4 volumes of pleadings, 8 loose pleadings, 8 transcripts and 1 box of exhibits. (gej, ) (Entered: 01/23/2009)
PACER 238 Filed: 12/30/2008, Entered: None
SEVENTH CIRCUIT transcript information sheet by Kevin Trudeau, Shop America (USA), LLC. (Poor quality original - paper document on file). (ca, ) (Entered: 01/05/2009)
PACER 237 Filed: 12/30/2008, Entered: None
EXHIBITS by Defendants Kevin Trudeau, Shop America (USA), LLC. (1 Box) (Document not scanned) (td, ) (Entered: 12/31/2008)
PACER 236 Filed: 12/30/2008, Entered: None
DESIGNATION by Kevin Trudeau of record on appeal : USCA Case No. 08-4249 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Parker, Lisa) (Entered: 12/30/2008)
PACER 235 Filed: 12/19/2008, Entered: None
NOTICE of Case Opening. (ca, ) (Entered: 12/22/2008)
PACER 234 Filed: 12/19/2008, Entered: None
ACKNOWLEDGEMENT of receipt of short record on appeal regarding notice of appeal 231 ; USCA Case No. 08-4249. (ca, ) (Entered: 12/22/2008)
PACER 233 Filed: 12/19/2008, Entered: None
TRANSMITTED to the 7th Circuit the short record on notice of appeal 231 . Notified counsel (gej, ) (Entered: 12/19/2008)
PACER 232 Filed: 12/19/2008, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appeal Due letter sent to counsel of record. (gej, ) (Entered: 12/19/2008)
PACER 231 Filed: 12/16/2008, Entered: None
NOTICE of appeal by Kevin Trudeau regarding orders 221 , 156 , 158 , 228 , 93 , 211 , 220 , 212 , 157 , 92 , 229 , 219 Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 07520000000003360763. (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 12/16/2008)
PACER 230 Filed: 12/15/2008, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Status hearing date of 12/19/2008 is stricken. Telephone notice (gds, ) (Entered: 12/15/2008)
PACER 229 Filed: 12/11/2008, Entered: None
Order signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 12/11/2008: Mailed notice (gds, ) (Entered: 12/11/2008)
PACER 228 Filed: 12/11/2008, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Defendant's motion to alter or amend judgment 222 is denied and motion to stay 222 is denied Mailed notice (gds ) (Entered: 12/11/2008)
PACER 227 Filed: 12/3/2008, Entered: None
REPLY by Defendant Kevin Trudeau to motion to alter judgment, motion to stay, motion for relief 222 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-E)(Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 12/03/2008)
PACER 226 Filed: 11/26/2008, Entered: None
RESPONSE by Federal Trade Commissionin Opposition to MOTION by Defendant Kevin Trudeau to alter judgment OR IN THE ALTERNATIVEMOTION by Defendant Kevin Trudeau to stay regarding entered judgment 221 PENDING APPEAL 222 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Attachments)(Prabhu, Sandhya) (Entered: 11/26/2008)
PACER 225 Filed: 11/18/2008, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Motion hearing held on 11/18/2008 regarding defendant's motion to alter judgment, motion to stay, motion for relief 222 . Response is due by 11/26/2008. Reply is due by 12/3/2008. Status hearing set for 12/19/2008 at 10:00 a.m. Mailed notice (gds ) (Entered: 11/20/2008)
PACER 224 Filed: 11/13/2008, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by Kevin Trudeau in support of motion to alter judgment, motion to stay, motion for relief 222 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-H)(Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 11/13/2008)
PACER 223 Filed: 11/13/2008, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Kimball Richard Anderson for presentment of motion to alter judgment, motion to stay, motion for relief 222 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 11/18/2008 at 10:00 AM. (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 11/13/2008)
PACER 222 Filed: 11/13/2008, Entered: None
MOTION by Defendant Kevin Trudeau to alter judgment OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION by Defendant Kevin Trudeau to stay regarding entered judgment 221 PENDING APPEAL (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 11/13/2008)
PACER 221 Filed: 11/4/2008, Entered: None
ENTERED JUDGMENT. (ca, ) (Entered: 11/05/2008)
PACER 220 Filed: 11/4/2008, Entered: None
Supplemental Order and Judgment entered signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 11/4/2008: mailed notice ( gds ) (Entered: 11/04/2008)
PACER 219 Filed: 11/4/2008, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Supplemental Order and Judgment entered. Accordingly, the court denies defendant's motion to reconsider its finding that he is in contempt of the 2004 injunction. The court enters judgment in favor of the FTC and against defendant Kevin Trudeau in the amount of $37,616,161, representing a reasonable approximation of the loss consumers suffered as a result of defendant's deceptive infomercials. The 2004 injunction remains in full force and effect. Defendant is enjoined. This court retains jurisdiction. mailed notice (gds, ) (Entered: 11/04/2008)
PACER 218 Filed: 11/4/2008, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Motion for leave to file 215 supplemental authority is granted. Status hearing held on 11/4/2008 mailed notice (gds, ) (Entered: 11/04/2008)
PACER 217 Filed: 10/30/2008, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Status hearing held on 10/30/2008. Status hearing set for 11/4/2008 at 10:00 a.m. mailed notice (gds ) (Entered: 11/03/2008)
PACER 216 Filed: 11/3/2008, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Kimball Richard Anderson for presentment of motion for leave to file 215 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 11/4/2008 at 10:00 AM. (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 11/03/2008)
PACER 215 Filed: 11/3/2008, Entered: None
MOTION by Defendant Kevin Trudeau for leave to file SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY REGARDING REMEDIES (Attachments: # 1 SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY REGARDING REMEDIES, # 2 Exhibit 1-3 TO SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY REGARDING REMEDIES)(Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 11/03/2008)
PACER 214 Filed: 10/29/2008, Entered: None
PROPOSED REVISIONS TO THE COURT'S OCTOBER 21, 2008 PROPOSED SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER AND JUDGMENT by Kevin Trudeau (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-9)(Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 10/29/2008)
PACER 213 Filed: 10/27/2008, Entered: None
FTC PROPOSED Revisions to Court's October 21, 2008 Proposed Supplemental Order and Judgment by Federal Trade Commission (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit FTC's Proposed Revisions to Court's Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit Red-line of FTC Proposed Revisions)(Prabhu, Sandhya) Modified on 10/28/2008 (cdy, ). (Entered: 10/27/2008)
PACER 212 Filed: 10/23/2008, Entered: None
ORDER Regarding Trial Exhibits Signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 10/23/2008.(ca, ) (Entered: 10/24/2008)
PACER 211 Filed: 10/23/2008, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman:Enter order regarding trial exhibits. [For further detail see separate order]. Mailed notice (ca, ) (Entered: 10/24/2008)
PACER 210 Filed: 10/21/2008, Entered: None
CORRECTED REPLY by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission in Support of it's Motion to Clarify and Amend the Judgment entered against Defendant Kevin Trudeau on August 7, 2008. 165 (ca, ) (Entered: 10/22/2008)
PACER 209 Filed: 10/21/2008, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman:Plaintiff's motion 202 for leave to file corrected reply brief is granted.Mailed notice (ca, ) (Entered: 10/22/2008)
PACER 208 Filed: 10/21/2008, Entered: None
Order signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 10/21/2008: Mailed notice (Attachments: # 1 Supplement)(gds, ) (Entered: 10/21/2008)
PACER 207 Filed: 10/20/2008, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Status hearing held on 10/20/2008. Status hearing set for 10/30/2008 at 11:00 a.m. Mailed notice (gds, ) (Entered: 10/21/2008)
PACER 206 Filed: 10/17/2008, Entered: None
MANDATE of USCA dated 10/17/08 regarding notice of appeal 196 ; USCA No. 08-3548. IT IS ORDERED that this case is DISMISSED, pursuant to Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 42(b). (ca, ) (Entered: 10/21/2008)
PACER 205 Filed: 10/17/2008, Entered: None
LETTER from the Seventh Circuit in USCA no. 08-3548, no record to be returned. (ca, ) (Entered: 10/20/2008)
PACER 204 Filed: 10/16/2008, Entered: None
Joint Submission Regarding Evidentiary Rulings On Trial Exhibits by Federal Trade Commission, Kevin Trudeau (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Hurtado, Daniel) (Entered: 10/16/2008)
PACER 203 Filed: 10/14/2008, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Sandhya Prabhu for presentment of motion for leave to file 202 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 10/20/2008 at 10:00 AM. (Prabhu, Sandhya) (Entered: 10/14/2008)
PACER 202 Filed: 10/14/2008, Entered: None
MOTION by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission for leave to file Corrected Reply in Support of Motion to Clarify and Amend Judgment (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Corrected Reply Brief)(Prabhu, Sandhya) (Entered: 10/14/2008)
PACER 201 Filed: 10/8/2008, Entered: None
ACKNOWLEDGEMENT of receipt of short record on appeal regarding notice of appeal 196 ; USCA Case No. 08-3548. (ca, ) (Entered: 10/09/2008)
PACER 200 Filed: 10/7/2008, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Defendant's motion to stay 193 judgment pending disposition of FTC's Rule 59(e) motion is granted. There will be no production of any infomercials promoting products in which defendant has an interest. Mailed notice (gds, ) (Entered: 10/08/2008)
PACER 199 Filed: 10/7/2008, Entered: None
REPLY by Federal Trade Commission to response to motion 191 to Clarify/Amend (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Reply Exhibits)(Prabhu, Sandhya) (Entered: 10/07/2008)
PACER 198 Filed: 10/7/2008, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appeal Due letter sent to counsel of record. (ef, ) (Entered: 10/07/2008)
PACER 197 Filed: 10/7/2008, Entered: None
TRANSMITTED to the 7th Circuit the short record on notice of appeal 196 . Notified counsel (ef, ) (Entered: 10/07/2008)
PACER 196 Filed: 10/6/2008, Entered: None
NOTICE of appeal by Kevin Trudeau regarding orders 156 , 158 , 93 , 157 , 92 Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 07520000000003167371. (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 10/06/2008)
PACER 195 Filed: 10/1/2008, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Kimball Richard Anderson for presentment of motion to stay 193 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 10/7/2008 at 09:15 AM. (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 10/01/2008)
PACER 194 Filed: 10/1/2008, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by Kevin Trudeau in support of motion to stay 193 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 & 2)(Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 10/01/2008)
PACER 193 Filed: 10/1/2008, Entered: None
MOTION by Defendant Kevin Trudeau to stay JUDGMENT PENDING DISPOSITION OF THE FTC'S RULE 59(e) MOTION (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 10/01/2008)
PACER 192 Filed: 9/30/2008, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Status hearing is re-set to 10/20/2008 at 10:00 a.m. Mailed notice (gds, ) (Entered: 09/30/2008)
PACER 191 Filed: 9/22/2008, Entered: None
RESPONSE by Kevin Trudeau to MOTION by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission to amend/correct Judgment Entered Against Defendant Kevin Trudeau on August 7, 2008 165 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-7)(Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 09/22/2008)
PACER 190 Filed: 9/9/2008, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Status hearing held on 9/9/2008. Defendant's response to plaintiff's motion 165 to clarify and amend judgment is due by 9/22/2008. Plaintiff's reply is due by 10/7/2008. Status hearing set for 10/21/2008 at 1:30 p.m. Mailed notice (gds, ) (Entered: 09/12/2008)
PACER 189 Filed: 9/11/2008, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Kevin Trudeau, Shop America (USA), LLC by Lisa Janice Parker (Parker, Lisa) (Entered: 09/11/2008)
PACER 188 Filed: 5/21/2008, Entered: None
EXHIBIT 30 & 31 in Support of its Remedy Brief for compensatory contempt sanctions and motion to modify the stipulated final order for permanent injunction by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission.(Poor Quality Original - paper document on file) Modified on 9/10/2008 (ca, ). (Entered: 09/09/2008)
PACER 187 Filed: 3/6/2008, Entered: None
MOTION by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission To Modify the Stipulated Final Order for Permanent Injunction as to Defendant Kevin Trudeau. (ca, ) (Entered: 09/09/2008)
PACER 186 Filed: 5/21/2008, Entered: None
Plaintiff's Remedy Brief for Compensatory Contempt Sanctions by Federal Trade Commission. (ca, ) (Entered: 09/09/2008)
PACER 185 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Daniel Jay Hurtado for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief 184 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 9/9/2008 at 09:15 AM. (Hurtado, Daniel) (Entered: 09/08/2008)
PACER 184 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: None
MOTION by Defendant Kevin TrudeauTo Admit Evidence And Objections To Plaintiff FTC's Proposed Evidence (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit List)(Hurtado, Daniel) (Entered: 09/08/2008)
PACER 183 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Sandhya Prabhu for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief 182 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 9/9/2008 at 09:15 AM. (Prabhu, Sandhya) (Entered: 09/08/2008)
PACER 182 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: None
MOTION by Plaintiff Federal Trade CommissionAdmit Evidence (Attachments: # 1 Appendix FTC Objections to Defense Exhibits)(Prabhu, Sandhya) (Entered: 09/08/2008)
PACER 181 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Kevin Trudeau, Shop America (USA), LLC by John F Kness (Kness, John) (Entered: 09/08/2008)
PACER 180 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Kevin Trudeau, Shop America (USA), LLC by Kimball Richard Anderson (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 09/08/2008)
PACER 179 Filed: 9/5/2008, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Motion 172 of David J. Bradford, Daniel J. Hurtado and David Eric Jiminez-Ekman to withdraw as counsel for defendant Kevin Trudeau is granted. Motion 175 of Katharine R. Saunders to withraw appearance as counsel for defendants Kevin Trudeau and Shop America is granted. Mailed notice (ca, ) (Entered: 09/08/2008)
PACER 178 Filed: 9/2/2008, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Defendant's motion to stay 168 judgment pending appeal is denied. Motion hearing held on 9/2/2008 regarding motion to stay, 168 . Plaintiff's motion to clarify 165 is continued to 9/9/2008 at 9:30 a.m. Mailed notice (gds, ) (Entered: 09/05/2008)
PACER 177 Filed: 8/29/2008, Entered: None
RESPONSE by Federal Trade Commissionin Opposition to MOTION by counsel for Defendant Kevin Trudeau to withdraw as attorney 172 (Prabhu, Sandhya) (Entered: 08/29/2008)
PACER 176 Filed: 8/26/2008, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Katharine R Saunders for presentment of motion to withdraw appearance 175 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 9/2/2008 at 9:15 AM. (ca, ) . (Entered: 08/27/2008)
PACER 175 Filed: 8/26/2008, Entered: None
MOTION by counsel for Defendants Kevin Trudeau, Shop America (USA), LLC to withdraw appearance. (ca, ) (Entered: 08/27/2008)
PACER 174 Filed: 8/26/2008, Entered: None
Amended NOTICE of Motion by David J. Bradford for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney 172 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 9/2/2008 at 09:15 AM. (Bradford, David) (Entered: 08/26/2008)
PACER 173 Filed: 8/22/2008, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by David J. Bradford for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney 172 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 8/27/2008 at 09:15 AM. (Bradford, David) (Entered: 08/22/2008)
PACER 172 Filed: 8/22/2008, Entered: None
MOTION by counsel for Defendant Kevin Trudeau to withdraw as attorney (Bradford, David) (Entered: 08/22/2008)
PACER 171 Filed: 8/22/2008, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Defendant's motion to stay 162 is withdrawn. Telephone notice (gds, ) (Entered: 08/22/2008)
PACER 170 Filed: 8/21/2008, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by Kevin Trudeau in support of motion to stay, motion for relief 168 (Amended Memorandum). (Hurtado, Daniel) (Entered: 08/21/2008)
PACER 169 Filed: 8/21/2008, Entered: None
Amended NOTICE of Motion by Daniel Jay Hurtado for presentment of motion to stay, motion for relief 168 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 9/2/2008 at 09:15 AM. (Hurtado, Daniel) (Entered: 08/21/2008)
PACER 168 Filed: 8/21/2008, Entered: None
MOTION by Defendant Kevin Trudeau to stay regarding entered judgment 158 (Hurtado, Daniel) (Entered: 08/21/2008)
PACER 167 Filed: 8/21/2008, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Federal Trade Commission for presentment of motion to amend/correct, 165 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 9/2/2008 at 09:15 AM. (Prabhu, Sandhya) (Entered: 08/21/2008)
PACER 166 Filed: 8/21/2008, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by Federal Trade Commission in support of motion to amend/correct, 165 Judgment Entered Against Defendant Kevin Trudeau on August 7, 2008 (Prabhu, Sandhya) (Entered: 08/21/2008)
PACER 165 Filed: 8/21/2008, Entered: None
MOTION by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission to amend/correct Judgment Entered Against Defendant Kevin Trudeau on August 7, 2008 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Supplemental Order and Judgment in a Civil Case Amending the Judgment Entered on August 7, 2008)(Prabhu, Sandhya) (Entered: 08/21/2008)
PACER 164 Filed: 8/20/2008, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by Kevin Trudeau in support of motion to stay, motion for relief 162 (Hurtado, Daniel) (Entered: 08/20/2008)
PACER 163 Filed: 8/20/2008, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Daniel Jay Hurtado for presentment of motion to stay, motion for relief 162 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 8/26/2008 at 09:15 AM. (Hurtado, Daniel) (Entered: 08/20/2008)
PACER 162 Filed: 8/20/2008, Entered: None
MOTION by Defendant Kevin Trudeau to stay regarding entered judgment 158 pending appeal. (Hurtado, Daniel) (Entered: 08/20/2008)
PACER 161 Filed: 8/19/2008, Entered: None
TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 07/25/08 before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman. Court Reporter Contact Information: JENNIFER COSTALES, CRR, RMR (312)427-5351 jennifer_costales@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 9/9/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/19/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/17/2008. (Costales, Jennifer) (Entered: 08/19/2008)
PACER 160 Filed: 8/19/2008, Entered: None
TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 07/23/08 before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman. Court Reporter Contact Information: JENNIFER COSTALES, CRR, RMR (312)427-5351 jennifer_costales@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 9/9/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/19/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/17/2008. (Costales, Jennifer) (Entered: 08/19/2008)
PACER 159 Filed: 8/19/2008, Entered: None
TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 07/22/08 before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman. Court Reporter Contact Information: JENNIFER COSTALES, CRR, RMR (312)427-5351 jennifer_costales@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 9/9/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/19/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/17/2008. (Costales, Jennifer) (Entered: 08/19/2008)
PACER 158 Filed: 8/7/2008, Entered: None
ENTERED JUDGMENT signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 8/7/2008: Mailed notice ( gds, ) (Entered: 08/07/2008)
PDF 157 Filed: 8/7/2008, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 8/7/2008:Mailed notice (gds, ) (Entered: 08/07/2008)
PACER 156 Filed: 8/7/2008, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Memorandum opinion and order entered. Accordingly, defendant Trudeau's motion for reconsideration 95 of this court's finding of contempt is denied and he is enjoined from participating in the production or publication of any infomercial for any product, including books, for a period of three years. In addition, judgment is entered in favor of FTC and against Kevin Trudeau in the sum of $5,173,000 representing a conservative estimate of the royalties Trudeau realized from the sale of the Weight Loss Book through the offending infomercials. Mailed notice (gds, ) (Entered: 08/07/2008)
PACER 155 Filed: 7/25/2008, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Hearing resumed, Further evidence heard and concluded. Hearing ends. Plaintiffs motion 148 to disqualify is granted in part and denied in part as stated on the record. Motion 62 to show cause why defendant should not be held in contempt, motion 95 for reconsideration, and motion 146 to withdraw are taken under advisement. Mailed notice (ca, ) (Entered: 07/29/2008)
PACER 154 Filed: 7/25/2008, Entered: None
DOCUMENT entered in error. (cdy, ). (Entered: 07/25/2008)
PACER 153 Filed: 7/23/2008, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Evidentuary hearing resumed. Evidence heard in part. Hearing continued to 7/25/2008, at 10:30 a.m. Mailed notice (cdy, ) (Entered: 07/25/2008)
PACER 152 Filed: 7/22/2008, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Motion to withdraw 146 continued generally. Evidentiary hearing begins. Evidence heard in part. Hearing continued to 7/23/2008 at 10:00 a.m. Mailed notice (cdy, ) (Entered: 07/25/2008)
PACER 151 Filed: 7/22/2008, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Any documents still under seal in this case are ordered UNSEALED. Mailed notice (cdy, ) (Entered: 07/25/2008)
PACER 150 Filed: 7/18/2008, Entered: None
NOTICE of Correction regarding MOTION by counsel for Defendant Kevin Trudeau to withdraw as attorney 145 . The Motion was filed in error. The attorney refiled the correct motion. (ca, ) (Entered: 07/18/2008)
PACER 149 Filed: 7/17/2008, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Sandhya Prabhu for presentment of motion in limine 148 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 7/22/2008 at 01:30 PM. (Prabhu, Sandhya) (Entered: 07/17/2008)
PACER 148 Filed: 7/17/2008, Entered: None
MOTION by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commissionin limine to Disqualify Proposed Experts and Exclude Their Testimony (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Attachments to Motion in Limine)(Prabhu, Sandhya) (Entered: 07/17/2008)
PACER 147 Filed: 7/16/2008, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by David J. Bradford for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney 146 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 7/22/2008 at 09:15 AM. (Bradford, David) (Entered: 07/16/2008)
PACER 146 Filed: 7/16/2008, Entered: None
MOTION by counsel for Defendant Kevin Trudeau to withdraw as attorney (Bradford, David) (Entered: 07/16/2008)
PACER 145 Filed: 7/16/2008, Entered: None
MOTION by counsel for Defendant Kevin Trudeau to withdraw as attorney (Hurtado, Daniel).(Entered in error). (Entered: 07/16/2008)
PACER 144 Filed: 7/16/2008, Entered: None
MOTION by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commissionin limine Notice of Motion in Limine (Attachments: # 1 Appendix)(Prabhu, Sandhya) (Entered: 07/16/2008)
PACER 143 Filed: 7/16/2008, Entered: None
MOTION by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commissionin limine to Disqualify Proposed Experts and Exclude Their Testimony (Prabhu, Sandhya) (Entered: 07/16/2008)
PDF 142 Filed: 7/7/2008, Entered: None
TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 5/29/08 before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman. Court Reporter Contact Information: Valarie M. Ramsey, (708)840-8482, valharam@aol.com. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Under Quick Links select Electronic Transcript Procedures. Redaction Request due 7/28/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/7/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/6/2008. (amb, ) (Entered: 07/07/2008)
PACER 141 Filed: 6/26/2008, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Defendant's motion for extension of time 139 to 7/11/2008 for taking fact depositions is granted. Telephone notice (gds, ) (Entered: 06/26/2008)
PACER 140 Filed: 6/20/2008, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Daniel Jay Hurtado for presentment of extension of time 139 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 6/25/2008 at 09:15 AM. (Hurtado, Daniel) (Entered: 06/20/2008)
PACER 139 Filed: 6/20/2008, Entered: None
MOTION by Defendant Kevin Trudeau for extension of time For Taking Depositions (Hurtado, Daniel) (Entered: 06/20/2008)
PACER 138 Filed: 6/4/2008, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman:Documents nos. 108,117,118,119,120,130,131,and 132 are ordered UNSEALED.Mailed notice (ca, ) (Entered: 06/05/2008)
PACER 137 Filed: 5/29/2008, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Motion for extension of time 134 to 6/20/2008 to take depositions is granted. Status hearing held on 5/29/2008. Show Cause Hearing set for 7/22/2008 at 01:30 p.m. Mailed notice (gds, ) (Entered: 06/04/2008)
PACER 136 Filed: 5/29/2008, Entered: None
TRANSCRIPT of proceedings for the following dates: 10/19/07; Before the Honorable Honorable Robert W. Gettleman. (Document Not Scanned) (lcw, ) (Entered: 05/30/2008)
PACER 135 Filed: 5/23/2008, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Daniel Jay Hurtado for presentment of extension of time 134 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 5/29/2008 at 10:00 AM. (Hurtado, Daniel) (Entered: 05/23/2008)
PACER 134 Filed: 5/23/2008, Entered: None
MOTION by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission, Defendant Kevin Trudeau for extension of time for taking depositions. (joint motion) (Hurtado, Daniel) (Entered: 05/23/2008)
PACER 133 Filed: 5/23/2008, Entered: None
STATUS Report (Joint). by Federal Trade Commission, Kevin Trudeau (Hurtado, Daniel) (Entered: 05/23/2008)
PACER 132 Filed: 5/21/2008, Entered: None
EXHIBITS 30 and 31 by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission in Support of its Remedy Brief for compensatory contempt sanctions and motion to modify the stipulated final order for permanent injunction. (lcw, ) # 1 Exhibits) (ca, ). (Entered: 05/22/2008)
PACER 131 Filed: 5/21/2008, Entered: None
REPLY by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission in Support of its motion to modify the stipulated final order for permanent injunction as to defendant Kevin Trudeau. (lcw, ) # 1 Main document) (ca, ). (Entered: 05/22/2008)
PACER 130 Filed: 5/21/2008, Entered: None
REPLY by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission in Support of its Remedy Brief for compensatory contempt sanctions. (lcw, ) # 1 Main Document) (ca, ). (Entered: 05/22/2008)
PACER 129 Filed: 5/20/2008, Entered: None
APPENDIX by Federal Trade Commission Unpublished Cases - Part 2 (Prabhu, Sandhya) (Entered: 05/20/2008)
PACER 128 Filed: 5/20/2008, Entered: None
APPENDIX by Federal Trade Commission Unpublished Cases - Part 1 (Prabhu, Sandhya) (Entered: 05/20/2008)
PACER 127 Filed: 5/20/2008, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE of Service by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission (Prabhu, Sandhya) (Entered: 05/20/2008)
PACER 126 Filed: 5/8/2008, Entered: None
TRANSCRIPT of proceedings for the following dates: 2/14/08; Before the Honorable Honorable Robert W. Gettleman. (Document Not Scanned) (lcw, ) (Entered: 05/12/2008)
PACER 125 Filed: 4/29/2008, Entered: None
NOTICE by Kevin Trudeau re Response 123 , exhibit list,,,,, 124 , Response 122 (Hurtado, Daniel) (Entered: 04/29/2008)
PACER 124 Filed: 4/29/2008, Entered: None
Exhibit List in Support of Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Modify (122) and Response to Plaintiff's Remedy Brief (123) by Kevin Trudeau. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit T - Transcript of January 29, 2008 deposition of Kevin Trudeau, # 2 Exhibit U - Transcript of February 8, 2008 deposition of George Potts, # 3 Exhibit V- Transcript of January 28, 2008 deposition of Suneil Sant, # 4 Exhibit W- Trucom Custom Transaction Detail, # 5 Exhibit X - November 20, 2007 letter from C. Robertson to L. Kapin, # 6 Exhibit Y - November 21, 2007 Hearing Transcript, # 7 Exhibit Z - Report of Jeffrey Harris, # 8 Exhibit AA - ITV Return Policy, # 9 Exhibit BB - Chronology of Communications, # 10 Exhibit CC - FTC's Responses to Requests for Admission, # 11 Exhibit DD - March 19, 2008 letter from L. Kapin to D. Hurtado, # 12 Exhibit EE - FTC Privilege Log, # 13 Exhibit FF - Article, Asher and Harper, American Journal of Clinical Nutrition, # 14 Exhibit GG - Article, Lebon, Journal for the American Geriatrics Society, # 15 Exhibit HH - Article, Lebon, Treatment of Overweight Patients with Chorionic Gonadotropin, # 16 Exhibit II - September 13, 2007 letter from D. Hurtado to R. Kaye, # 17 Exhibit JJ - Keith R. Fentonmiller, Reflections on the Mirror Image Doctrine: Should the Federal Trade Commission Regulate False Advertising for Books Promoting Wealth, Weight Loss, and Miraculous Cures? 110 W. Va. L. Rev. 573 (2008))(Hurtado, Daniel) (Entered: 04/29/2008)
PACER 123 Filed: 4/29/2008, Entered: None
RESPONSE by Defendant Kevin Trudeau To Plaintiff's Remedy Brief For Compensatory Contempt Sanctions (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Of Brian Kleiner, # 2 Declaration Of William M. Hughes, Jr.)(Hurtado, Daniel) (Entered: 04/29/2008)
PACER 122 Filed: 4/29/2008, Entered: None
RESPONSE by Defendant Kevin Trudeau To Plaintiff's Rule 60(b) Motion To Modify The Stipulated Final Order For Permanent Injunction As To Defendant Kevin Trudeau (Hurtado, Daniel) (Entered: 04/29/2008)
PACER 121 Filed: 4/25/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTE entry before Judge Honorable Robert W. Gettleman:Defendants motion for leave to file response to plaintiffs remedy brief and response to plaintiffs motion to modify the stipulated final order under seal is granted.Telephoned notice (rbf, ) (Entered: 04/29/2008)
PACER 120 Filed: 4/28/2008, Entered: None
DECLARATION of Marc J. Lane. (lcw, ) # 1 Main Document) (ca, ). (Entered: 04/29/2008)
PACER 119 Filed: 4/28/2008, Entered: None
RESPONSE by Defendant Kevin Trudeau to plaintiff's Rule 60(b) motion to modify the stipulated final order for permanent injunction as to defendant Kevin Trudeau. (lcw, ) # 1 Main Document) (ca, ) (Entered: 04/29/2008)
PACER 118 Filed: 4/28/2008, Entered: None
CONSOLIDATED EXHIBITS by Defendant Kevin Trudeau in Response to plaintiff's Remedy Brief and Motion to modify the stipulated final order. (lcw, ) # 1 Main Document) (ca, ) (Entered: 04/29/2008)
PACER 117 Filed: 4/28/2008, Entered: None
RESPONSE by Defendant Kevin Trudeau to plaintiff's remedy brief for compensatory contempt sanctions. (lcw, ) # 1 Main Document) (ca, ). (Entered: 04/29/2008)
PACER 116 Filed: 4/28/2008, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE of Service to 1) Defendant Kevin Trudeaus Response To Plaintiffs Rule 60(b) Motion To Modify The Stipulated Protective Order For Permanent Injunction As To Defendant Kevin Trudeau, 2) Defendant Kevin Trudeaus Response to Plaintiffs Remedy Brief for Compensatory Contempt Sanctions, 3) Defendant Kevin Trudeaus Consolidated Exhibits in Response to Plaintiffs Remedy Brief and Motion to Modify the Stipulated Final Order, and 4) Declaration of Marc J. Lane by Daniel Jay Hurtado on behalf of Kevin Trudeau (Hurtado, Daniel) (Entered: 04/28/2008)
PACER 115 Filed: 4/15/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTE entry before Judge Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Motion to amend 111 scheduling order is granted. Motion hearing held on 4/15/2008 regarding motion to amend 111 . Defendant's response is due by 4/18/2008 and plaintiff's reply is due by 5/20/2008. Status rep;ort is due by 5/22/2008. All depositions are to be taken by 5/27/2008. Status hearing is re-set to 5/29/2008 at 10:00 a.m. Mailed notice (gds, ) (Entered: 04/22/2008)
PACER 114 Filed: 4/21/2008, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Daniel Jay Hurtado for presentment of motion for leave to file 113 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 4/24/2008 at 09:15 AM. (Hurtado, Daniel) (Entered: 04/21/2008)
PACER 113 Filed: 4/18/2008, Entered: None
MOTION by Defendant Kevin Trudeau for leave to file His Response To Plaintiff's Remedy Brief And Response To Plaintiff's Motion To Modify The Stipulated Final Order Under Seal (Unopposed) (Hurtado, Daniel) (Entered: 04/18/2008)
PACER 112 Filed: 4/1/2008, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Daniel Jay Hurtado for presentment of motion to amend/correct 111 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 4/15/2008 at 09:15 AM. (Hurtado, Daniel) (Entered: 04/01/2008)
PACER 111 Filed: 4/1/2008, Entered: None
MOTION by Defendant Kevin Trudeau to amend/correct Scheduling Order (Joint) (Hurtado, Daniel) (Entered: 04/01/2008)
PACER 110 Filed: 3/7/2008, Entered: None
APPENDIX by plaintiff of unpublished cases. (lcw, ) (Entered: 03/11/2008)
PACER 109 Filed: 3/7/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTE entry before Judge Robert W. Gettleman : Plaintiff's unopposed motion for leave to file remedy brief for compensatory contempt sanctions and its motion to modify the permanent injunction under seal is granted. Mailed notice (lcw, ) (Entered: 03/10/2008)
PACER 108 Filed: 3/7/2008, Entered: None
CONSOLIDATED EXHIBITS by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission in Support of its remedy brief for compensatory sanctions and motion to modify the stipulated final order for permanent injunction. (lcw, )# 1(ca, ). (Entered: 03/10/2008)
PACER 107 Filed: 3/6/2008, Entered: None
MOTION by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission for leave to file remedy brief under seal (O'Toole, David) (Entered: 03/06/2008)
PACER 106 Filed: 2/14/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
STIPULATION and Agreed Confidentiality Order. Signed by Judge Robert W. Gettleman on 2/14/2008.(lcw, ) (Entered: 02/26/2008)
PACER 105 Filed: 2/14/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTE entry before Judge Robert W. Gettleman : Defendant's motion for entry of stipulation and agreed confidentiality order is granted. Mailed notice (lcw, ) (Entered: 02/26/2008)
PACER 104 Filed: 2/21/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTE entry before Judge Robert W. Gettleman: Motion hearing held on 2/21/2008 regarding motion 99 to modify the 11/21/2007 scheduling order. That motion is granted, and plaintiff's brief is due by 3/6/2008, response is due by 4/4/2008 and reply is due by 4/18/2008. A status report is due by 4/24/2008. Status hearing is re-set to 5/1/2008 at 11:30 a.m. Mailed notice (gds,) (Entered: 02/21/2008)
PACER 103 Filed: 2/13/2008, Entered: None
REPLY by Kevin Trudeau to memorandum in opposition to motion 98 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit C)(Hurtado, Daniel) (Entered: 02/13/2008)
PACER 102 Filed: 2/11/2008, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Daniel Jay Hurtado for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief 101 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 2/14/2008 at 09:15 AM. (Hurtado, Daniel) (Entered: 02/11/2008)
PACER 101 Filed: 2/11/2008, Entered: None
MOTION by Defendant Kevin TrudeauFor Entry Of Stipulation And Agreed Confidentiality Order (Agreed) (Hurtado, Daniel) (Entered: 02/11/2008)
PACER 100 Filed: 2/11/2008, Entered: None
Notice of FTC's Unnopposed Motion to Modify November 21, 2007 Scheduling Order NOTICE of Motion by Laureen Kapin for presentment of motion by filer to set a briefing schedule 99 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 2/14/2008 at 09:15 AM. (Kapin, Laureen) (Entered: 02/11/2008)
PACER 99 Filed: 2/11/2008, Entered: None
MOTION by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission to set a briefing schedule FTC's Unopposed Motion to Modify November 21, 2007 Scheduling Order (Kapin, Laureen) (Entered: 02/11/2008)
PACER 98 Filed: 2/7/2008, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by Federal Trade Commission in Opposition to motion for reconsideration, motion for relief 95 (O'Toole, David) (Entered: 02/07/2008)
PACER 97 Filed: 2/4/2008, Entered: None
Amended NOTICE of Motion by Daniel Jay Hurtado for presentment of motion for reconsideration, motion for relief 95 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 2/14/2008 at 09:15 AM. (Hurtado, Daniel) (Entered: 02/04/2008)
PACER 96 Filed: 2/4/2008, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Daniel Jay Hurtado for presentment of motion for reconsideration, motion for relief 95 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 2/7/2008 at 09:15 AM. (Hurtado, Daniel) (Entered: 02/04/2008)
PACER 95 Filed: 2/4/2008, Entered: None
MOTION by Defendant Kevin Trudeau for reconsideration regarding memorandum opinion and order 93 and/or clarification. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Hurtado, Daniel) (Entered: 02/04/2008)
PACER 94 Filed: 11/21/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTE entry before Judge Robert W. Gettleman :Status hearing held on 11/21/2007. Plaintiff's brief and motion to enlarge injunction are due by 2/21/2008. Response is due by 3/21/2008. Reply is due by 4/4/2008. Status hearing set for 4/11/2008 at 09:30 a.m.Mailed notice (gds, ) (Entered: 11/30/2007)
PACER 93 Filed: 11/16/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. Signed by Judge Robert W. Gettleman on 11/16/2007.(lcw, ) (Entered: 11/19/2007)
PACER 92 Filed: 11/16/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTE entry before Judge Robert W. Gettleman : Memorandum opinion and order entered. Accordingly, the court holds defendant Kevin Trudeau in contempt. Mailed notice (lcw, ) (Entered: 11/19/2007)
PACER 91 Filed: 11/16/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTE entry before Judge Robert W. Gettleman :Status hearing set for 11/21/2007 at 10:00 a.m.Mailed notice (gds, ) (Entered: 11/19/2007)
PACER 90 Filed: 10/19/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTE entry before Judge Robert W. Gettleman :Evidentiary hearing held on 10/19/2007 on plaintiff's motion for rule to show cause. The Court will rule by mail.Mailed notice (gds, ) (Entered: 10/23/2007)
PACER 89 Filed: 10/18/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTE entry before Judge Robert W. Gettleman : Defendant's motion for leave to file sur-reply 85 is granted.Mailed notice (kw, ) (Entered: 10/19/2007)
PACER 88 Filed: 10/18/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTE entry before Judge Robert W. Gettleman :Motion hearing held on 10/18/2007 regarding defendant's motion for judicial notice of parrallel proceeding 80 which is granted. Motion for a stay is denied.Mailed notice (gds, ) (Entered: 10/18/2007)
PACER 87 Filed: 10/17/2007, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Daniel Jay Hurtado for presentment of motion for leave to file, 85 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 10/18/2007 at 09:15 AM. (Hurtado, Daniel) (Entered: 10/17/2007)
PACER 86 Filed: 10/17/2007, Entered: None
DECLARATION of Daniel J. Hurtado regarding motion for leave to file, 85 by Kevin Trudeau (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit M# 2 Exhibit N# 3 Exhibit O# 4 Exhibit P# 5 Exhibit Q# 6 Exhibit R# 7 Exhibit S)(Hurtado, Daniel) (Entered: 10/17/2007)
PACER 85 Filed: 10/17/2007, Entered: None
MOTION by Defendant Kevin Trudeau for leave to file Instanter A Surreply In Opposition To Plaintiff's Motion For Order To Show Cause (Attachments: # 1 Kevin Trudeau's Surreply In Opposition To Plaintiff's Motion For Defendant Trudeau To Show Cause Why He Should Not Be Held In Contempt For Violating The 2004 Permanent Injunction)(Bradford, David) (Entered: 10/17/2007)
PACER 84 Filed: 10/17/2007, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE of Service by Federal Trade Commission regarding response 84 . (Prabhu, Sandhya) Modified on 10/18/2007 (lcw, ). (Entered: 10/17/2007)
PACER 83 Filed: 10/17/2007, Entered: None
RESPONSE by Federal Trade Commission to MOTION by Defendant Kevin Trudeau for Judicial Notice of Parallel Proceeding 80 (Prabhu, Sandhya) (Entered: 10/17/2007)
PACER 82 Filed: 10/12/2007, Entered: None
REPLY by Federal Trade Commission to response in opposition to motion 76 For Defendant Trudeau to Show Cause Why He Should Not Be Held in Contempt (Prabhu, Sandhya) (Entered: 10/12/2007)
PACER 81 Filed: 10/12/2007, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Daniel Jay Hurtado for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief 80 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 10/18/2007 at 09:15 AM. (Hurtado, Daniel) (Entered: 10/12/2007)
PACER 80 Filed: 10/12/2007, Entered: None
MOTION by Defendant Kevin Trudeau for Judicial Notice of Parallel Proceeding (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Bradford, David) (Entered: 10/12/2007)
PACER 79 Filed: 10/3/2007, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE of Service by Daniel Jay Hurtado on behalf of Kevin Trudeau regarding declaration 77 , declaration, 78 (Hurtado, Daniel) (Entered: 10/03/2007)
PACER 78 Filed: 10/2/2007, Entered: None
DECLARATION of Mary Louise Cribbin regarding response in opposition to motion 76 by Kevin Trudeau (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit G# 8 Exhibit G, Part 2# 9 Exhibit H# 10 Exhibit H, Part 2# 11 Exhibit H, Part 3# 12 Exhibit H, Part 4# 13 Exhibit I# 14 Exhibit J# 15 Exhibit K# 16 Exhibit K, Part 2# 17 Exhibit L# 18 Exhibit L, Part 2)(Hurtado, Daniel) (Entered: 10/02/2007)
PACER 77 Filed: 10/2/2007, Entered: None
DECLARATION of Kevin Trudeau regarding response in opposition to motion 76 by Kevin Trudeau (Hurtado, Daniel) (Entered: 10/02/2007)
PACER 76 Filed: 10/2/2007, Entered: None
RESPONSE by Kevin Trudeauin Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission for order to show cause Why Kevin Trudeau Should Not Be Held in Contempt for Violating the Court's 2004 Permanent Injunction 62 (Hurtado, Daniel) (Entered: 10/02/2007)
PACER 75 Filed: 9/27/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTE entry before Judge Robert W. Gettleman : Plaintiff's motion 73 for substitution of counsel is granted. Lauren Kapin, Elizabeth Tucci, Sandhya Prabhu and David OToole are granted leave to appear as plaintiff's counsel. Daniel Kaufman, Heather Hippsley, Laura Sullivan, Peter Miller, Todd Kossow and Karen Dodge are granted leave to withdraw as plaintiffs counsel. Defendant's further response to plaintiff's motion 62 for rule to show cause is due by 10/2/2007. Reply is due by 10/12/2007. Hearing on said motion is set for 10/19/2007, at 9:30 a.m. Mailed notice (lcw, ) Modified on 10/2/2007 (lcw, ). (Entered: 10/02/2007)
PACER 74 Filed: 9/27/2007, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance of David A. O'Toole, Federal Trade Commission by Federal Trade Commission. (O'Toole, David) Modified on 10/1/2007 (lcw, ). (Entered: 09/27/2007)
PACER 73 Filed: 9/27/2007, Entered: None
MOTION by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission to substitute attorney (O'Toole, David) (Entered: 09/27/2007)
PACER 72 Filed: 9/25/2007, Entered: None
RESPONSE by Defendant Kevin Trudeau to motion for order to show cause 62 (Preliminary Response). (Bradford, David) (Entered: 09/25/2007)
PACER 71 Filed: 9/19/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
APPLICATION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Federal Trade Commission by Sandhya Prabhu; Order entered granting leave by Judge Robert W. Gettleman. (lcw, ) (Entered: 09/24/2007)
PACER 70 Filed: 9/19/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
APPLICATION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Federal Trade Commission by Laureen Kapin; Order entered granting leave by Judge Robert W. Gettleman. (lcw, ) (Entered: 09/24/2007)
PACER 69 Filed: 9/19/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
APPLICATION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Federal Trade Commission by Elizabeth Tucci; Order entered granting leave by Judge Robert W. Gettleman. (lcw, ) (Entered: 09/24/2007)
PACER 68 Filed: 9/19/2007, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Kevin Trudeau by Daniel Jay Hurtado (Hurtado, Daniel) (Entered: 09/19/2007)
PACER 67 Filed: 9/17/2007, Entered: None
BRIEF by Federal Trade Commission Supporting its motion for defendant Trudeau to show cause why he should not be held in contempt. (Exhibits: Volume 1 of 2, Exhibits 1-11)(Exhibits: 2 of 2, Exhibits 12-14) (Documents 67-1 through 67-2) (Document Not Scanned) (lcw, ) (Entered: 09/19/2007)
PACER 66 Filed: 9/13/2007, Entered: None
Notice of Paper Filing by Federal Trade Commission in Support of its Motion for Defendant Kevin Trudeau to Show Cause Why He Should Not Be Held in Contempt (Davis, James) (Entered: 09/13/2007)
PACER 65 Filed: 9/13/2007, Entered: None
DECLARATION of Laureen Kapin in support of plaintiff's motion for order to show cause Why Kevin Trudeau Should Not Be Held in Contempt for Violating the Court's 2004 Permanent Injunction 62 (Attachments: # 1 Exs. 1 - 5# 2 Exs. 6 - 11# 3 Ex. 12 pt. 1# 4 Ex. 12 Pt. 2# 5 Ex. 13# 6 Ex. 14)(Davis, James) Text Modified on 9/14/2007 (lcw, ). (Entered: 09/13/2007)
PACER 64 Filed: 9/13/2007, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by Federal Trade Commission in support of motion for order to show cause 62 (Davis, James) (Entered: 09/13/2007)
PACER 63 Filed: 9/13/2007, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by James Davis for presentment of motion for order to show cause 62 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 9/27/2007 at 09:15 AM. (Davis, James) (Entered: 09/13/2007)
PACER 62 Filed: 9/13/2007, Entered: None
MOTION by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission for order to show cause Why Kevin Trudeau Should Not Be Held in Contempt for Violating the Court's 2004 Permanent Injunction (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, James) (Entered: 09/13/2007)
PACER 61 Filed: 7/17/2006, Entered: None
TRANSCRIPT of proceedings for the following dates: 6/12/2003, 10/2/2003, 12/17/2003, 1/06/2004, 3/31/2004, 9/2/2004; Before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman. (61-1 through 61-6) (air, ) (Entered: 07/18/2006)
PACER 60 Filed: 6/30/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE of Correction regarding document 59 . (dmkf, ) (Entered: 06/30/2006)
PACER 59 Filed: 6/15/2006, Entered: None
(DOCUMENT entered in error.) Modified on 6/30/2006 (dmkf, ). (Entered: 06/30/2006)
PACER 58 Filed: 10/19/2004, Entered: None
MINUTE ORDER of 10/19/04 by Hon. Robert W. Gettleman : This Court's order dated 10/14/04 is clarified to reflect defendant's motion to supplement the record is granted in its entirety to include the videocasette and also to include the Natural Cures book. [57-1] Telephoned notice (hp) (Entered: 10/21/2004)
PACER 57 Filed: 10/14/2004, Entered: None
MINUTE ORDER of 10/14/04 by Hon. Robert W. Gettleman: Defendant Kevin Trudeau's agreed motion to supplement the record with a videocassette of the "Natural Cures" informercial is granted [0-1]. Mailed notice (air) (Entered: 10/15/2004)
PACER 56 Filed: 9/2/2004, Entered: None
MINUTE ORDER of 9/2/04 by Hon. Robert W. Gettleman : Stipulated final order for permanent injunction and settlement of claims entered. (Entered Order) terminating case No notice (eav) (Entered: 09/03/2004)
PACER 55 Filed: 6/29/2004, Entered: None
MINUTE ORDER of 6/29/04 by Hon. Robert W. Gettleman: Status hearing set for 7/14/04 at 10:00 a.m. Plaintiff's motion to find defendant Trudeau in contempt in granted as the court finds that he violated paragraph 1 of the preliminary injunction. Defendant Trudeau is ordered to cease all promotion of coral calcium. (Entered Order.) Mailed notice by judge's staff. (gma) (Entered: 07/01/2004)
PACER 54 Filed: 6/10/2004, Entered: None
MINUTE ORDER of 6/10/04 by Hon. Robert W. Gettleman : Plaintiff is granted leave to take expedited discovery. Parties' supplemental briefs are due by 06/28/04, noon. No notice (lc) (Entered: 06/14/2004)
PACER 53 Filed: 3/31/2004, Entered: None
MINUTE ORDER of 3/31/04 by Hon. Robert W. Gettleman : For the reasons stated in open court this date, defendants' motions (1) for relief from stipulated order to permit airing of coral calcium infomercial, and (2) to strike expert report and testimony of Michael B. Mazis are denied. The parties are directed to appear for a status report on 05/05/04 at 9:00a.m. No notice (lc) Modified on 04/09/2004 (Entered: 04/01/2004)
PACER 52 Filed: 1/27/2004, Entered: None
MINUTE ORDER of 1/27/04 by Hon. Robert W. Gettleman : Defendants Shop, Trustar and relief defendants K.T. and TruCom shall have until thirty (30) days after the Court rules on defendants' motion for relief from stipulated order or until 04/30/04 to answer or respond to the first amended complaint. (Entered Stipulated Order). Mailed notice (ar) (Entered: 01/29/2004)
PACER 51 Filed: 1/26/2004, Entered: None
NOTICE of filing by defendants Kevin Trudeau and Shop Amer USA LLC regarding stipulated order (ar) (Entered: 01/29/2004)
PACER 50 Filed: 1/15/2004, Entered: None
MINUTE ORDER of 1/15/04 by Hon. Robert W. Gettleman : The court shall retain jurisdiction. (Entered Stipulated Final Orer For Permanent Injunction and Settlement of Claims For Monetary Relief As To Defendants Robert Barefoot, Deonna Enterprises, Inc. and Karbo Enterprises, Inc.) No notice (lc) (Entered: 01/20/2004)
PACER 49 Filed: 1/14/2004, Entered: None
RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to defendant Karbo Ent Inc on 01/13/04; Notice. (lc) (Entered: 01/16/2004)
PACER 48 Filed: 1/6/2004, Entered: None
MINUTE ORDER of 1/6/04 by Hon. Robert W. Gettleman : Defendant's reply to plaintiffs memorandum in opposition to motion for relief from stipulated order is due by 01/09/04. Plaintiff's opposition to defendants' motion to strike expert report is due by 01/20/04. Defendants' reply is due by 01/22/04. Pretrial conference date of 02/13/04 and trial date of 02/23/04 are stricken. Status hearing set for 03/31/04 at 9:00a.m. No notice (lc) Modified on 02/17/2004 (Entered: 01/08/2004)
PACER 47 Filed: 12/30/2003, Entered: None Amended Complaint
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT [1-1] by plaintiff Federal Trade Commission for permanent injunction and other equitable relief; adding Trustar Global Media, Karbo Ent Inc, K.T. Corp Ltd, and Trucom LLC. (jmm) (Entered: 01/02/2004)
PACER 46 Filed: 12/17/2003, Entered: None
MINUTE ORDER of 12/17/03 by Hon. Robert W. Gettleman : Defendant's motion for leave to file instanter a sur-reply in opposition to motion for order to show cause is granted [0-1]. Plaintiff's motion for and order to show cause is denied without prejudice [0-1]. Plaintiff's motion for leave to take more than ten depositions is granted [0-1]. Plaintiff's motion to name additional defendants [41-1] and to file amended complaint is granted. Pretrial order is due by 02/04/04. Pretrial conference is set for 2/13/04 at 10:30a.m. No notice (lc) (Entered: 12/19/2003)
PACER 45 Filed: 11/24/2003, Entered: None
MINUTE ORDER of 11/24/03 by Hon. Robert W. Gettleman : Defendant's response to plaintiff's motion to show cause [0-1] is due by 11/26/03. Reply is due 12/4/03. Status hearing set for 12/17/03 at 1:30p.m. No notice (lc) (Entered: 11/25/2003)
PACER 44 Filed: 11/6/2003, Entered: None
DECLARATION of Christina E. Turner. (lc) (Poor Quality Original - Paper Document on File.) (td, ). Modified on 8/1/2008 (td, ). (Entered: 11/17/2003)
PACER 43 Filed: 11/6/2003, Entered: None
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for plaintiff by Heather Hippsley, Peter B. Miller. (lc) (Entered: 11/17/2003)
PACER 42 Filed: 11/6/2003, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by plaintiff in support of motion for leave to name additional defendants [41-1], relief defendants [41-2], and to file first amended complaint [41-3] (Attachments). (lc) (Entered: 11/17/2003)
PACER 41 Filed: 11/6/2003, Entered: None
MOTION by plaintiff for leave to name additional defendants and relief defendants and to file first amended complaint (Attachments). (lc) (Entered: 11/17/2003)
PACER 40 Filed: 11/6/2003, Entered: None
DECLARATION of Christina E. Turner (Attachments); Notice. (lc) (Entered: 11/17/2003)
PACER 39 Filed: 11/10/2003, Entered: None
APPLICATION for leave to appear pro hac vice for plaintiff by Heather Hippsley; Order entered granting leave by Hon. Robert W. Gettleman (lc) (Entered: 11/14/2003)
PACER 38 Filed: 10/2/2003, Entered: None
MINUTE ORDER of 10/2/03 by Hon. Robert W. Gettleman : Status hearing held. Settlement pretrial conference set for 11/12/03, at 11:00 a.m. Plaintiff's motion to strike affirmative defenses of defendants Barefoot and Deonna Enterprises is withdrawn without prejudice is granted. [30-1] Plaintiff's expert disclosures are due by 11/12/03. Defendant's expert disclosures are due by 12/08/03. No notice (hp) (Entered: 10/06/2003)
PACER 37 Filed: 10/1/2003, Entered: None
JOINT STATUS REPORT by defendants Kevin Trudeau, Shop Amer USA LLC; Notice. (lc) (Entered: 10/03/2003)
PACER 36 Filed: 9/5/2003, Entered: None
MINUTE ORDER of 9/5/03 by Hon. Robert W. Gettleman : (Entered Stipulated Protective Order.) No notice (lc) (Entered: 09/08/2003)
PACER 35 Filed: 8/27/2003, Entered: None
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for defendants Robert Barefoot, Deonna Ent Inc by Lewis Rose. (lc) (Entered: 08/29/2003)
PACER 34 Filed: 8/27/2003, Entered: None
APPLICATION for leave to appear pro hac vice for defendants Robert Barefoot, Deonna Ent Inc by Lewis Rose ; Order entered granting leave by Hon. Robert W. Gettleman (lc) (Entered: 08/29/2003)
PACER 33 Filed: 8/26/2003, Entered: None
MINUTE ORDER of 8/26/03 by Hon. Robert W. Gettleman : Defendants Barefoot and Deonna's motion to withdraw the appearance of Mr. Saferstein [32-1] and to substitute appearance Mr. Rose [32-2] is granted. Plaintiff's motion strike the affirmative defenses [30-1] is continued to the next scheduled status hearing date of 10/2/03. No notice (lc) (Entered: 08/28/2003)
PACER 32 Filed: 8/25/2003, Entered: None
MOTION by defendants Robert Barefoot, Deonna Ent Inc to withdraw attorney Mr. Saferstein and substitute attorney Mr. Rose (Attachment); Notice. (lc) (Entered: 08/28/2003)
PACER 31 Filed: 8/5/2003, Entered: None
MINUTE ORDER of 8/5/03 by Hon. Robert W. Gettleman : Plaintiff's motion to strike the affirmative defenses of defendants Robert Barefoot and Deonna Enterprises, Inc [30-1] is continued to 8/26/03 at 9:00a.m. No notice (lc) (Entered: 08/06/2003)
PACER 30 Filed: 7/30/2003, Entered: None
MOTION by plaintiff to strike the affirmative defenses of defendant Robert Barefoot and Deonna Enterprises, Inc ; Memorandum in support (Attachment); Notice. (lc) (Entered: 08/06/2003)
PACER 29 Filed: 6/16/2003, Entered: None
APPLICATION for leave to appear pro hac vice for defendants Robert Barefoot, Deonna Ent Inc by Harvey I. Saferstein; Order entered granting leave by Hon. Robert W. Gettleman (lc) (Entered: 07/14/2003)
PACER 28 Filed: 7/9/2003, Entered: None
ANSWER by defendants Robert Barefoot, Deonna Ent Inc to plaintiff's complaint [1-1] (lc) (Entered: 07/10/2003)
PACER 27 Filed: 7/9/2003, Entered: None
ANSWER by defendants Kevin Trudeau, Shop Amer USA LLC to plaintiffs complaint [1-1]; Notice. (lc) (Entered: 07/10/2003)
PACER 26 Filed: 7/1/2003, Entered: None
MINUTE ORDER of 7/1/03 by Hon. Robert W. Gettleman : (Entered Stipulated Preliminary Injunction Order as to Defendants Shop America (USA), LLC and Kevin Trudeau.) No notice (lc) (Entered: 07/02/2003)
PACER 25 Filed: 6/30/2003, Entered: None
RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to defendants Kevin Trudeau, Shop Amer USA LLC, Robert Barefoot, Deonna Ent Inc on 06/11/03; Notice (25-1 through 25-4) (ntf) (Entered: 07/01/2003)
PACER 24 Filed: 6/27/2003, Entered: None
MINUTE ORDER of 6/27/03 by Hon. Robert W. Gettleman : Defendant Shop Americ'a motion for leave to file instanter third-party complaint is withdrawn [23-1]. No notice (lc) (Entered: 06/30/2003)
PACER 23 Filed: 6/18/2003, Entered: None
MOTION by defendant Shop Amer USA LLC for leave to file instanter third-party complaint . (lc) (Entered: 06/30/2003)
PACER 22 Filed: 6/27/2003, Entered: None
MINUTE ORDER of 6/27/03 by Hon. Robert W. Gettleman : Defendant Shop America's motion for reassignment of related case 03 C 4201 is granted [21-1]. No notice (lc) (Entered: 06/30/2003)
PACER 21 Filed: 6/25/2003, Entered: None
MOTION by defendant Shop Amer USA LLC for reassignment of related case pursuant to Local Rule 40.4 ; Notice. (lc) (Entered: 06/30/2003)
PACER 20 Filed: 6/24/2003, Entered: None
MINUTE ORDER of 6/24/03 by Hon. Robert W. Gettleman : (Entered Stipulated Preliminary Injunction Order As To Defendants Robert Barefoot and Deonna Enterprises, Inc.) Mailed notice by judge's staff (lc) (Entered: 06/30/2003)
PACER 19 Filed: 6/24/2003, Entered: None
MINUTE ORDER of 6/24/03 by Hon. Robert W. Gettleman : Trial set for 02/23/04 at 9:00a.m. Stipulated restraining order shall continued in effect through 07/01/03. Defendants' time to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to 07/09/03..Entered. (Entered Stipulated Order.) No notice (lc) (Entered: 06/30/2003)
PACER 18 Filed: 6/18/2003, Entered: None
NOTICE by defendant Shop Amer USA LLC of summons and third party complaint for declaratory judgment and a temporary restraining order (lc) (Entered: 06/30/2003)
PACER 17 Filed: 6/18/2003, Entered: None
MOTION by defendant Shop Amer USA LLC for temporary restraining order ; Memorandum in support (Attachments); Notice. (lc) (Entered: 06/30/2003)
PACER 16 Filed: 6/25/2003, Entered: None
NOTICE OF DISMISSAL by defendant Shop Amer USA LLC without prejudice; Notice. (lc) (Entered: 06/26/2003)
PACER 15 Filed: 6/9/2003, Entered: None
EXHIBITS by plaintiff in support of plaintiff's motion for temporary restraining order with appointment of a temporary receiver, asset freeze, accounting and order to show cause why a preliminary injunction should not issue as to defendants [10-1] (Attachments). (Volumes 1 through 3). (gcy) (Entered: 06/23/2003)
PACER 14 Filed: 6/9/2003, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM in support of plaintiff's motion for temporary restraining order with appointment of a temporary receiver, asset freeze, accounting and order to show cause why a preliminary injunction should not issue as to defendants (Attachments). (gcy) (Entered: 06/23/2003)
PACER 13 Filed: 6/20/2003, Entered: None
NOTICE OF DISMISSAL of dismissal without prejudice of third party defendant Eric E. Whitaker; Notice. (gcy) (Entered: 06/23/2003)
PACER 12 Filed: 6/9/2003, Entered: None
MOTION by plaintiff to file brief in excess of 15 pages . (lc) (Entered: 06/20/2003)
PACER 11 Filed: 6/9/2003, Entered: None
DECLARATION of Daniel Kaufman in support of plaintiff's motion for temporary [10-1] (lc) (Entered: 06/20/2003)
PACER 10 Filed: 6/9/2003, Entered: None
MOTION by plaintiff for temporary restraining order with appointment of a temporary receiver, asset freeze, accounting and order to show cause why a perliminary injunction should not issue as to defendants ; Notice. (lc) (Entered: 06/20/2003)
PACER 9 Filed: 6/18/2003, Entered: None
STIPULATED PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ORDER by parties as to defendants Robert Barefoot and Deonna Enterprises, Inc. (Attachment); Notice. (lc) (Entered: 06/19/2003)
PACER 8 Filed: 6/12/2003, Entered: None
APPLICATION for leave to appear pro hac vice for plaintiff by Laura M. Sullivan ; Order entered granting leave by Hon. Charles R. Norgle Sr (lc) (Entered: 06/19/2003)
PACER 7 Filed: 6/12/2003, Entered: None
APPLICATION for leave to appear pro hac vice for plaintiff by Daniel Kaufman ; Order entered granting leave by Hon. Charles R. Norgle Sr (lc) (Entered: 06/19/2003)
PACER 6 Filed: 6/12/2003, Entered: None
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for defendants Kevin Trudeau, Shop Amer USA LLC by David J. Bradford, David Eric Jimenez-Ekman, Katherine R Saunders (lc) (Entered: 06/16/2003)
PACER 5 Filed: 6/11/2003, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by defendants Kevin Trudeau, Shop Amer USA LLC in response to motion for temporary restraining order; Notice. (lc) (Entered: 06/16/2003)
PACER 4 Filed: 6/13/2003, Entered: None
REASSIGNMENT ORDER of 6/13/03 This case is reassigned to the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman from Honorable Robert W. Gettleman pursuant to Local Rule 40.4. Case consolidated 1:98-cv-168 with member cases 1:03-cv-3904. Mailed notice (lc) (Entered: 06/16/2003)
PACER 3 Filed: 6/12/2003, Entered: None
MINUTE ORDER of 6/12/03 by Hon. Robert W. Gettleman: (Enter stipulated temporary restraining order as to defendant Shop America (USA) Inc., LLC.) (Attachment) No notice (lc) (Entered: 06/16/2003)
PACER 2 Filed: 6/11/2003, Entered: None
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for defendants Robert Barefoot, Deonna Ent Inc by David L. Schiavone (lc) (Entered: 06/12/2003)
PACER 1 Filed: 6/9/2003, Entered: None
COMPLAINT (Attachments) - Civil cover sheet - Appearance(s) of Daniel Kaufman, Laura Sullivan, Todd Matthew Kossow, Karen D. Dodge as attorney(s) for plaintiff (Four original and four copies summons(es) issued.) ( Documents: 1-1 through 1-3) (hp) (Entered: 06/10/2003)

Statistics

This case has been viewed 364 times.

No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Need Password Help?