Kelly v. White
Illinois Northern District Court, Case No. 1:10-cv-00583
District Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer, presiding
docket://gov.uscourts.ilnd.1-10-cv-00583 (What is this?)

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
This docket can only tell you so much. Get the rest.
Access comprehensive profiles on judges, firms, lawyers, and more with PlainSite Pro and Pro Se.
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 440 Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (20) Calendar Events Related (0) Tools Right End
PACER 20 Filed: 7/20/2010, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Ruling held. Plaintiff has alleged that Defendant permitted posting by an anti-religion group of a printed sign, together with religious symbols posted by religious organizations. The identity of the anti-religion organization was clearly displayed, defeating any inference that the sign was somehow sponsored by Defendant. The First Amendment prohibits the content-based discrimination for which Plaintiff's complaint argues. Defendant's conduct may violate the state laws and regulations cited by Plaintiff, but his allegations do not support the conclusion that such conduct violated Plaintiff's federal constitutional rights. Defendant's motion to dismiss 11 is granted. This case is dismissed. Rule 16 conference is stricken. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (etv, ) (Entered: 07/20/2010)
PACER 19 Filed: 6/30/2010, Entered: None
REPLY by Jesse White to response to motion 17 to dismiss (Lang, James) (Entered: 06/30/2010)
PACER 18 Filed: 6/16/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE by William J. Kelly Response To Motion To Dismiss (Roth, Mark) (Entered: 06/16/2010)
PACER 17 Filed: 6/16/2010, Entered: None
RESPONSE by William J. Kelly to MOTION by Defendant Jesse White to dismiss 11 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Roth, Mark) (Entered: 06/16/2010)
PACER 16 Filed: 6/1/2010, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Status hearing held. Rule 16 conference entered and continued to 7/20/2010 at 9:00 AM. Mailed notice (etv, ) (Entered: 06/01/2010)
PACER 15 Filed: 5/27/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE by William J. Kelly Report Of Parties Planning Meeting (Roth, Mark) (Entered: 05/27/2010)
PACER 14 Filed: 5/27/2010, Entered: None
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Roth, Mark) (Entered: 05/27/2010)
PACER 13 Filed: 5/26/2010, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Motion hearing held. Defendant's motion to dismiss 11 entered and continued for briefing. Response to be filed by or on 6/16/2010; reply 6/30/2010; ruling set for 7/20/2010 at 9:00 AM. Mailed notice (etv, ) (Entered: 05/26/2010)
PACER 12 Filed: 5/21/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by James Allen Lang for presentment of motion to dismiss 11 before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 5/26/2010 at 08:45 AM. (Lang, James) (Entered: 05/21/2010)
PACER 11 Filed: 5/21/2010, Entered: None
MOTION by Defendant Jesse White to dismiss (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lang, James) (Entered: 05/21/2010)
PACER 10 Filed: 4/15/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTE entry before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Agreed motion for extension of time to file responsive pleading 8 granted to and including 5/21/2010. Status hearing set for 5/6/2010 stricken. The parties are directed to appear through lead counsel for a pretrial conference pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16. on 6/1/2010 at 9:00 AM. Counsel are requested promptly to meet face-to-face for a discussion of possible settlement and for preparation of a planning report. The form is accessible from the court's Internet site, www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Such report shall be submitted to Judge Pallmeyer in chambers no later than two business days prior to the conference. Mailed notice (etv, ) (Entered: 04/15/2010)
PACER 9 Filed: 4/14/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by James Allen Lang for presentment of extension of time 8 before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 4/22/2010 at 08:45 AM. (Lang, James) (Entered: 04/14/2010)
PACER 8 Filed: 4/14/2010, Entered: None
MOTION by Defendant Jesse White for extension of time to file responsive pleading (Lang, James) (Entered: 04/14/2010)
PACER 7 Filed: 4/5/2010, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Jesse White by James Allen Lang (Lang, James) (Entered: 04/05/2010)
PACER 6 Filed: 3/29/2010, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Status hearing held on 3/29/2010. Status hearing set for 5/6/2010 at 09:00 AM. Mailed notice (etv, ) (Entered: 03/29/2010)
PACER 5 Filed: 1/29/2010, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Status hearing set for 3/29/2010 at 09:00 AM, courtroom 2119. Mailed notice (etv, ) (Entered: 01/29/2010)
PACER 4 Filed: 1/28/2010, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff William J. Kelly by Beata Bukranova (Bukranova, Beata) (Entered: 01/28/2010)
PACER 3 Filed: 1/28/2010, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff William J. Kelly by Mark Daniel Roth (Roth, Mark) (Entered: 01/28/2010)
PACER 2 Filed: 1/28/2010, Entered: None
CIVIL Cover Sheet (Roth, Mark) (Entered: 01/28/2010)
PACER 1 Filed: 1/28/2010, Entered: None
COMPLAINT filed by William J. Kelly ; n. Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 0752-4477576.(Roth, Mark) (Entered: 01/28/2010)

Statistics

This case has been viewed 53 times.

No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Need Password Help?