Kris Gounden
New York Eastern Bankruptcy Court, Case No. 1-10-47622
District Judge Jerome Feller, presiding
docket://gov.uscourts.nyeb.1-10-47622 (What is this?)

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
This docket can only tell you so much. Get the rest.
Access comprehensive profiles on judges, firms, lawyers, and more with PlainSite Pro and Pro Se.
No Logo Kris Gounden, Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Dahiya Law Offices, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Karamvir S Dahiya +1 212 766 8000 +1 212 766 8001 karam@legalpundit.com
No Logo Marianne DeRosa, Trustee
No Logo Michael J. Macco, Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee, U.S. Trustee
  Entries (26) Calendar Events Related (0) Tools Right End
PACER 26 Filed: 1/27/2011, Entered: None
Letter to Karamvir Dahiya Filed by Kris Gounden (cjm) (Entered: 01/27/2011)
PACER 25 Filed: 1/14/2011, Entered: None
Letter to Karamvir Dahiya Filed by Kris Gounden (mem) (Entered: 01/14/2011)
PACER 24 Filed: 1/8/2011, Entered: None
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Dismissal Service Date 01/08/2011. (Admin.) (Entered: 01/09/2011)
PACER 23 Filed: 1/6/2011, Entered: None
Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Case with Notice of Dismissal (RE: related document(s) 17 Motion to Dismiss Case filed by Trustee Marianne DeRosa). Signed on 1/6/2011 (evt) (Entered: 01/06/2011)
PACER 22 Filed: 12/14/2010, Entered: None
(INCORRECT REPORT ATTACHED) Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period Nov 1- Nov 30, 2010 Filed by Karamvir Dahiya on behalf of Kris Gounden (Dahiya, Karamvir) Modified on 12/15/2010 (mmr). (Entered: 12/14/2010)
PACER 21 Filed: 12/14/2010, Entered: None
Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period October 1- October 31, 2010 Filed by Karamvir Dahiya on behalf of Kris Gounden (Dahiya, Karamvir) (Entered: 12/14/2010)
PACER 20 Filed: 12/14/2010, Entered: None
Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period September 1- September 30, 2010 Filed by Karamvir Dahiya on behalf of Kris Gounden (Dahiya, Karamvir) (Entered: 12/14/2010)
PACER 19 Filed: 12/14/2010, Entered: None
Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period August 12- August 31, 2010 Filed by Karamvir Dahiya on behalf of Kris Gounden (Dahiya, Karamvir) (Entered: 12/14/2010)
PACER 18 Filed: 12/10/2010, Entered: None
Affidavit Re: Filed by Karamvir Dahiya on behalf of Kris Gounden (RE: related document(s) 17 Motion to Dismiss Case filed by Trustee Marianne DeRosa) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E) (Dahiya, Karamvir) (Entered: 12/10/2010)
PACER 17 Filed: 11/24/2010, Entered: None Motion to DismissCourt Filing
Motion to Dismiss Case Filed by Krista M Preuss on behalf of Marianne DeRosa. Hearing scheduled for 12/15/2010 at 09:00 AM at Courtroom 3554 (Judge Feller), Brooklyn, NY. (Preuss, Krista) (Entered: 11/24/2010)
PACER 16 Filed: 9/22/2010, Entered: None
Order Denying Motion To Extend Stay filed by Debtor. (Related Doc # 10 ) Signed on 9/22/2010. (evt) (Entered: 09/23/2010)
PACER 15 Filed: 9/3/2010, Entered: None
Affirmation in Opposition Filed by Krista M Preuss on behalf of Marianne DeRosa (RE: related document(s) 10 Motion to Continue/Extend/Reimpose Stay filed by Debtor Kris Gounden) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B) (Preuss, Krista) (Entered: 09/03/2010)
PACER 14 Filed: 8/25/2010, Entered: None
Employee Income Records / Copies of Pay Statements Filed by Karamvir Dahiya on behalf of Kris Gounden (RE: related document(s) 3 Deficient Filing Chapter 13) (Dahiya, Karamvir) (Entered: 08/25/2010)
PACER 13 Filed: 8/25/2010, Entered: None
Affidavit Re: Taxes Filed by Karamvir Dahiya on behalf of Kris Gounden (Dahiya, Karamvir) (Entered: 08/25/2010)
PACER 12 Filed: 8/25/2010, Entered: None
Chapter 13 Debtor's Certifications Regarding Domestic Support Obligations and Section 522(q) Filed for Debtor Filed by Karamvir Dahiya on behalf of Kris Gounden (Dahiya, Karamvir) (Entered: 08/25/2010)
PACER 11 Filed: 8/24/2010, Entered: None
Chapter 13 Plan dated August 24, 2010 Filed by Karamvir Dahiya on behalf of Kris Gounden (RE: related document(s) 3 Deficient Filing Chapter 13). (Dahiya, Karamvir) (Entered: 08/24/2010)
PACER 10 Filed: 8/24/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
Motion to Continue/Extend/Reimpose Stay Filed by Karamvir Dahiya on behalf of Kris Gounden. Hearing scheduled for 9/7/2010 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 3554 (Judge Feller), Brooklyn, NY. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Debtor Affidavit# 2 Exhibit Ex. A Matrix# 3 Affidavit Affidavit of Service) (Dahiya, Karamvir) (Entered: 08/24/2010)
PACER 9 Filed: 8/24/2010, Entered: None
Amended Schedule(s), Statement(s) and Affidavit LR1009-1(a) Schedule A, Schedule D, Filed by Karamvir Dahiya on behalf of Kris Gounden (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Mortgage Documents on father's name# 2 Affidavit LR-10091a) (Dahiya, Karamvir) (Entered: 08/24/2010)
PACER 8 Filed: 8/15/2010, Entered: None
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Deficient Filing Service Date 08/15/2010. (Admin.) (Entered: 08/16/2010)
PACER 7 Filed: 8/15/2010, Entered: None
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Electronic Filing Service Date 08/15/2010. (Admin.) (Entered: 08/16/2010)
PACER 6 Filed: 8/15/2010, Entered: None
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors Service Date 08/15/2010. (Admin.) (Entered: 08/16/2010)
PACER 5 Filed: 8/13/2010, Entered: None
Schedule(s), Statement(s) and Affidavit LR1007-1(b) Schedule A, Schedule B, Schedule C, Schedule D, Schedule E, Schedule F, Schedule G, Schedule H, Schedule I, Schedule J, Statistical Summary of Certain Liabilities, Summary of Schedules : Statement of Financial Affairs Filed by Karamvir Dahiya on behalf of Kris Gounden (Dahiya, Karamvir) (Entered: 08/13/2010)
PACER 4 Filed: 8/13/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
Request for Notice - Chapter 13 Meeting of Creditors and Hearing on Confirmation. Confirmation hearing to be held on 10/27/2010 at 09:00 AM at Courtroom 3554 (Judge Feller), Brooklyn, NY. Last day to Object to Confirmation 10/27/2010.Objections to 523 due by 11/22/2010. (mmr) (Entered: 08/13/2010)
PACER 3 Filed: 8/12/2010, Entered: None
Deficient Filing Chapter 13: Pre-Petition Statement Pursuant to Local Bankruptcy Rule 2017-1 due by 9/22/2010. Section 521 Incomplete Filings due by 9/27/2010. Exhibit D due by 8/26/2010. Statement Pursuant to LR1073-2b due by 8/26/2010. Disclosure of Compensation Pursuant to FBR 2016(b) due 8/26/2010. Summary of Schedules due 8/26/2010. Statistical Summary of Certain Liabilities due by 8/26/2010. Schedule A due 8/26/2010. Schedule B due 8/26/2010. Schedule C due 8/26/2010. Schedule D due 8/26/2010. Schedule E due 8/26/2010. Schedule F due 8/26/2010. Schedule G due 8/26/2010. Schedule H due 8/26/2010. Schedule I due 8/26/2010. Schedule J due 8/26/2010. Declaration Concerning Debtors schedules due 8/26/2010. Statement of Financial Affairs due 8/26/2010. Chapter 13 Plan due by 8/26/2010. Statement of Current Monthly Income and Means Test (Chapter 13) due by 8/26/2010. Copies of pay statements received from any employer due by 8/26/2010. Incomplete Filings due by 8/26/2010. (mmr) (Entered: 08/13/2010)
PACER 2 Filed: 8/12/2010, Entered: None
Certificate of Credit Counseling for Debtor Filed by Karamvir Dahiya on behalf of Kris Gounden (Dahiya, Karamvir) (Entered: 08/12/2010)
PACER 1 Filed: 8/12/2010, Entered: None
Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition. Fee Amount $274 Filed by Karamvir Dahiya on behalf of Kris Gounden Government Proof of Claim due by 2/8/2011. (Dahiya, Karamvir) (Entered: 08/12/2010)

Statistics

This case has been viewed 20 times.

No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Need Password Help?