Bowman Metal Deck, et al v. Blount Inc, et al
Illinois Central District Court, Case No. 1:94-cv-01214-JBM
District Judge Joe Billy McDade, presiding
docket://gov.uscourts.ilcd.1-94-cv-01214 (What is this?)

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Judges don't know as much about themselves as we do.
Access comprehensive profiles on judges, firms, lawyers, and more with PlainSite Pro and Pro Se.
No Logo Bowman Metal Deck, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Donald V O'Brien +1 312 372 1462
No Logo United States of America for the use of Bowman Metal Deck, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Carol Coplan Babbitt +1 312 435 9775 +1 312 427 9552 ccblaw@msn.com
Donald V O'Brien +1 312 372 1462
No Logo Construction Systems, Inc., Counter-Claimant
v.
No Logo Aetna Casualty And Surety Company, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Heyl, Royster, Voelker & Allen, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Matthew S Hefflefinger +1 309 676 0400 +1 309 676 3374 mhefflefinger@hrva.com
MARK L. LUDOLPH +1 309 676 0400 +1 309 676 3374 mludolph@heylroyster.com
Gary D Nelson +1 309 676 0400 +1 309 676 3374 gnelson@hrva.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hinshaw & Culbertson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Paul C Estes +1 309 674 1025 +1 309 674 9328 pestes@hinshawlaw.com
D Kevin Sommer +1 309 674 1025 +6749 674 674 9328
No Logo Blount Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Heyl, Royster, Voelker & Allen, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Matthew S Hefflefinger +1 309 676 0400 +1 309 676 3374 mhefflefinger@hrva.com
MARK L. LUDOLPH +1 309 676 0400 +1 309 676 3374 mludolph@heylroyster.com
Gary D Nelson +1 309 676 0400 +1 309 676 3374 gnelson@hrva.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hinshaw & Culbertson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Paul C Estes +1 309 674 1025 +1 309 674 9328 pestes@hinshawlaw.com
D Kevin Sommer +1 309 674 1025 +6749 674 674 9328
No Logo Construction Systems, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Heyl, Royster, Voelker & Allen, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Matthew S Hefflefinger +1 309 676 0400 +1 309 676 3374 mhefflefinger@hrva.com
MARK L. LUDOLPH +1 309 676 0400 +1 309 676 3374 mludolph@heylroyster.com
Gary D Nelson +1 309 676 0400 +1 309 676 3374 gnelson@hrva.com
No Logo Seaboard Surety Company, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Heyl, Royster, Voelker & Allen, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Matthew S Hefflefinger +1 309 676 0400 +1 309 676 3374 mhefflefinger@hrva.com
MARK L. LUDOLPH +1 309 676 0400 +1 309 676 3374 mludolph@heylroyster.com
Gary D Nelson +1 309 676 0400 +1 309 676 3374 gnelson@hrva.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hinshaw & Culbertson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Paul C Estes +1 309 674 1025 +1 309 674 9328 pestes@hinshawlaw.com
D Kevin Sommer +1 309 674 1025 +6749 674 674 9328
No Logo Bowman Metal Deck, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Donald V O'Brien +1 312 372 1462
No Logo United States of America for the use of Bowman Metal Deck, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Carol Coplan Babbitt +1 312 435 9775 +1 312 427 9552 ccblaw@msn.com
Donald V O'Brien +1 312 372 1462
Office Peoria
Filed 5/9/1994
Jury Demand Both
Demand $425000
Nature of Suit 190 - Contract: Other
Cause Section 40 U.S.C. § 270 Miller Act
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County XX US, Outside State
Terminated 6/19/1998
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags 13, CLOSED
  Entries (98) Calendar Events Related (0) Tools Right End
Blank -- Filed: 11/12/2004, Entered: 12/3/2004 Archives File Sent to FRC
Archives File Sent to FRC Chicago on 11/12/2004; Accession No. 021 04 0241, Box No. 3 of 32; Location 884538-884569. (HK, ilcd)
Blank 64 Filed: 7/6/1998, Entered: 7/6/1998 Mail Returned
MAIL Returned: order [62-1], case dismiss/dismissal [61-1] addressed to Atty Donald O'Brien, attorney for Bowman Metal Deck (SH, ilcd)
Blank 63 Filed: 7/6/1998, Entered: 7/6/1998 Mail Returned
MAIL Returned: minute entry [0-0] addressed to Donald V. O'Brien, attorney for Bowman Metal Deck (SH, ilcd)
Blank 62 Filed: 6/19/1998, Entered: 6/22/1998 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER by Judge Joe B. McDade The parties having stipulated to the dismissal of the Miller Act claims brought by Bowman Metal Deck, a division of Armco, Inc., as well as the Counterclaims of Construction Systems Inc. a/k/a Jansteel, Inc., there being no other claims pending before this Court, it is ORDERED that said claims are dismissed pursuant to F. R. C. P. 41(a)(1). (cc: all counsel) (SH, ilcd)
Blank 61 Filed: 6/19/1998, Entered: 6/22/1998 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
NOTICE of DISMISSAL pursuant to 41(a) (filed as Stipulation for Dismissal) (SH, ilcd)
Blank -- Filed: 6/18/1998, Entered: 6/19/1998 Minutes - Miscellaneous
MINUTE-ENTRY: by Judge Joe B. McDade The Court has been advised that the parties to this action have agreed to arbitrate their dispute. Accordingly, the Final Pretrial conference set Friday, 6/26/98 and the Jury trial set 8/17/98 are CANCELLED. In addition, all pending motions are DENIED as MOOT. Plaintiff is to file a motion to dismiss no later than 7/8/98. (cc: all counsel) (SH, ilcd)
Blank 60 Filed: 4/28/1998, Entered: 4/28/1998 Mail Returned
MAIL Returned: minute entry [0-0] addressed to Attorney Karen Seimetz, one of the attorneys for Blount Inc, Aetna Casualty, Construction Sys, Seaboard Surety Co (SH, ilcd)
Blank -- Filed: 4/22/1998, Entered: 4/22/1998 Minutes - Miscellaneous
MINUTE-ENTRY: by Judge Joe B. McDade Attorney Anthony J. Ashley's and Scott B. Green's renewed motion to withdraw is GRANTED. (cc: all counsel) (SH, ilcd)
Blank -- Filed: 4/3/1998, Entered: 4/6/1998 Minutes - Miscellaneous
MINUTE-ENTRY: by Judge Joe B. McDade Parties present in open court by Attys O'Brien/Nelson/Ludolph/Ashley and Berg for Status hearing held 1:30 4/3/98 . Discussion re: status of case. Court sets jury trial on Monday, 7/27/98 at 9:00 AM (in person in Peoria). Final pretrial conference set Friday, 6/26/98 at 3:30 PM. Court is transferring 96-1165 back to the Southern District of Illinois on the basis that it was improperly transferred here on 3/21/96. All Discovery to be completed by 4/30/98 . If parties wish to submit agreed scheduling order to cover disclosure of experts, court will enter same. Oral motion by Atty Ashley to renew motion to withdraw. Motion taken under advisement. Court will rule on 4/10/98. Oral motion by plaintiff to continue trial date of 7/27/98 due to prior commitments. Court allows motion and Jury trial reset 9:00 Monday, 8/17/98 . Final Pretrial conference remains set Fri., 6/26/98 at 3:30 PM (in person in Peoria). (cc: all counsel) (SH, ilcd)
Blank 59 Filed: 4/1/1998, Entered: 4/1/1998 Notice of Change of Address
NOTICE by attorney Carol Coplan Babbitt for plaintiff Bowman Metal Deck of change of address (SH, ilcd)
Blank 58 Filed: 3/30/1998, Entered: 3/30/1998 Status Report
STATUS REPORT by plaintiff Bowman Metal Deck, plaintiff Bowman Metal (SH, ilcd)
Blank 57 Filed: 3/27/1998, Entered: 3/30/1998 Status Report
STATUS REPORT by defendant Construction Sys, defendant Aetna Casualty, defendant Seaboard Surety Co, counter-claimant Construction Sys (SH, ilcd)
Blank -- Filed: 3/19/1998, Entered: 3/19/1998 Minutes - Miscellaneous
MINUTE-ENTRY: by Judge Joe B. McDade Case referral terminated as to Mag. Judge Robert J. Kauffman . The Order of 10/9/97 granting the motion of Scott B. Green and Anthony J. Ashley leave to withdraw as counsel for Blount, et al and Dailey, et al is vacated and set aside. The Order of 3/3/98 granting motion of the defendants to modify scheduling order is vacated and set aside. Parties to submit within 7 days (misc ddl set 3/30/98) a written statement of the status of this litigation, including the procedural history and efforts to settle, all outstanding issues, including the latest settlement demand and offer. Status hearing set Friday, April 3, 1998 at 1:30 PM (in person in Peoria) before Judge McDade. NOTE: AUTHORIZED REPRESENTATIVE WITH SETTLEMENT AUTHORITY SHOULD BE PRESENT PERSONALLY OR IMMEDIATELY AVAILABLE BY TELEPHONE. (cc: all counsel) (SH, ilcd)
Blank 56 Filed: 3/3/1998, Entered: 3/3/1998, Terminated: 3/3/1998 Motion for Order
MOTION by defendants for order to modify scheduling order (SH, ilcd)
Blank 55 Filed: 3/3/1998, Entered: 3/3/1998 Notice of Appearance of Attorney
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for defendant Blount Inc, defendant Aetna Casualty, defendant Construction Sys, defendant Seaboard Surety Co (SH, ilcd)
Blank -- Filed: 3/3/1998, Entered: 3/3/1998 Order
ENDORSED ORDER on its face by Mag. Judge Robert J. Kauffman granting motion for order to modify scheduling order [56-1]; Documents to be made available for inspection and document exchange completed by 4/30/98; depositions of all non-opinion witnesses to be completed by 10/15/98; defendants shall identify any opinion witnesses by 11/15/98; plaintiffs to depose defendants' opinion witnesses by 12/15/98; plaintiffs to name any opinion witnesses they intend to use as rebuttal witnesses by 12/31/98; ALL Discovery to be complete by 12/31/98 , Dispositive motions to be on file by 1/30/99 Mtn filing ddl extended to 1/30/99 (cc: all counsel). (SH, ilcd)
Blank 54 Filed: 10/9/1997, Entered: 10/9/1997 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER by Mag. Judge Robert J. Kauffman granting motion to withdraw attorney Scott B Greene and Anthony J. Ashley [52-1] attorneys for Construction Sys, Seaboard Surety, Aetna Casualty & Surety & Blount, Inc (cc: all counsel) (SH, ilcd)
Blank 53 Filed: 10/6/1997, Entered: 10/7/1997 Mail Returned
MAIL Returned: Scheduling order All Discovery to be completed by 4/30/98 [51-1], Scheduling order ; Motion deadline for dispositive motions extended to 6/1/98 [51-2], order [51-3] addressed to Scott B Greene as counsel for Construction Sys and USF&G at Cahil, Christian & Kunkle, Ste 4200, 311 S Wacker Drive, Chicago, IL 60606 (WW, ilcd)
Blank 52 Filed: 10/3/1997, Entered: 10/3/1997, Terminated: 10/9/1997 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
MOTION by defendant Blount Inc, defendant Aetna Casualty, defendant Seaboard Surety Co, defendant Construction Sys to withdraw attorney Scott B Greene and Anthony J. Ashley (SH, ilcd)
Blank 51 Filed: 9/29/1997, Entered: 9/29/1997 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER by Mag. Judge Robert J. Kauffman granting motion to extend discovery schedule [50-1]. Oral depositions to be completed by 12/31/97; Defendants/counterplaintiffs to disclose experts by 1/1/98; defendants/counterplaintiffs experts to be deposed by 2/28/98; plaintiffs/counterdefendants to disclose experts by 3/31/98; plaintiffs/counterplaintiffs experts to be deposed by 4/30/98; All Discovery to be completed by 4/30/98 ; Motion deadline for dispositive motions extended to 6/1/98 (cc: all counsel) (SH, ilcd)
Blank 50 Filed: 9/26/1997, Entered: 9/29/1997, Terminated: 9/29/1997 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
MOTION by defendant Blount Inc, defendant Aetna Casualty, defendant Construction Sys, defendant Seaboard Surety Co to extend discovery schedule (SH, ilcd)
Blank 49 Filed: 5/12/1997, Entered: 5/13/1997 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
MOTION by defendant Blount Inc to withdraw attorneys Douglas M Reimer & Christine Drylie employed at McDermott, Will & Emery (HK, ilcd)
Blank 48 Filed: 5/1/1997, Entered: 5/1/1997 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER by Mag. Judge Robert J. Kauffman granting motion to extend discovery schedule [44-1] ; Discovery extended to 12/31/97 ; Mtn filing ddl extended to 1/31/98 (cc: all counsel) (SH, ilcd) Modified on 05/01/1997
Blank 47 Filed: 4/30/1997, Entered: 4/30/1997 Notice (Other)
NOTICE of Filing (Re: #43, 44, & 45) by plaintiff Bowman Metal Deck, plaintiff Bowman Metal (SH, ilcd)
Blank 46 Filed: 4/30/1997, Entered: 4/30/1997 Miscellaneous Document
CERTIFICATE of Service (Re: #43,44,45) by plaintiff Bowman Metal Deck, plaintiff Bowman Metal (SH, ilcd)
Blank 45 Filed: 4/30/1997, Entered: 4/30/1997 Affidavit
AFFIDAVIT of Carol Coplan Babbitt (SH, ilcd)
Blank 44 Filed: 4/30/1997, Entered: 4/30/1997, Terminated: 5/1/1997 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
MOTION by plaintiff Bowman Metal Deck, plaintiff Bowman Metal to extend discovery schedule (SH, ilcd)
Blank 43 Filed: 4/30/1997, Entered: 4/30/1997 Notice of Change of Address
NOTICE by plaintiff Bowman Metal Deck, plaintiff Bowman Metal of change of address of Attorney Carol Coplan Bibbitt (SH, ilcd)
Blank -- Filed: 12/9/1996, Entered: 12/9/1996 Order
ENDORSED ORDER on its face by Mag. Judge Robert J. Kauffman granting motion to extend discovery schedule [42-1]. Oral depositions to be completed by 4/30/97; defendants/counterplaintiffs to disclose all expert witnesses by 5/31/97 and be deposed by 6/30/97; Plaintiffs/Counterdefendants to disclose all expert witnesses by 7/31/97 and be deposed by 8/30/97; Dispositive Mtn filing ddl extended to 10/31/97 . (cc: all counsel). (SH, ilcd)
Blank 42 Filed: 12/6/1996, Entered: 12/9/1996 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
MOTION by defendants to extend discovery schedule (SH, ilcd)
Blank -- Filed: 8/22/1996, Entered: 8/22/1996 Minutes - Miscellaneous
MINUTE-ENTRY: by Mag. Judge Robert J. Kauffman - It has come to the Court's attention that the Agreed Discovery and Litigation Schedule filed 6/3/96 and approved 7/9/96 contains incorrect dates. Order amended to reflect all Discovery including expert disclosure and depositions to be completed by 4/30/97 ; Mtn filing ddl corrected to reflect dispositive motions to be filed by 5/31/97 (cc: all counsel) (SH, ilcd)
Blank -- Filed: 7/9/1996, Entered: 7/9/1996 Order
ENDORSED ORDER on its face by Mag. Judge Robert J. Kauffman granting agreed discovery and litigation schedule [41-1] ; Discovery extended to 7/31/96 ; Mtn filing ddl for dispositive motions extended to 5/31/96 (cc: all counsel). (SH, ilcd)
Blank 41 Filed: 6/3/1996, Entered: 6/3/1996, Terminated: 7/9/1996 Discovery - Miscellaneous
PROPOSED DISCOVERY PLAN filed by parties w/Notice of Filing (SH, ilcd)
Blank -- Filed: 5/17/1996, Entered: 5/17/1996 Minutes - Miscellaneous
MINUTE-ENTRY: by Mag. Judge Robert J. Kauffman granting motion to extend time to submit an agreed discovery calendar [40-1] ; misc ddl set for agreed discovery calendar by 6/4/96 (cc: all counsel) (SH, ilcd)
Blank 40 Filed: 5/15/1996, Entered: 5/15/1996, Terminated: 5/17/1996 Motion for Extension of Time to File
Agreed MOTION by defendant Blount Inc, defendant Aetna Casualty, defendant Construction Sys, defendant Seaboard Surety Co and non-defendant Jansteel Inc. to extend time to submit an agreed discovery calendar (SH, ilcd)
Blank -- Filed: 4/23/1996, Entered: 4/23/1996 Minutes - Miscellaneous
MINUTE-ENTRY: by Mag. Judge Robert J. Kauffman. Attorneys Coplan & Greene present via phone for Telephone Status hearing. Same held 4/23/96 2:00 . Attorney Scott Greene will be entering his appearance & agrees to be admitted to the Central District of Illinois. Oath card mailed to Attorney Greene. Based on Scott Greene's entry of appearance as new counsel, parties request extension of time to complete discovery & file dispositive motions ; Parties are to submit agreed discovery calendar to the Court by 5/14/96 . See companion case 96-1165 (cc: all counsel) (HK, ilcd) Modified on 04/23/1996
Blank -- Filed: 4/16/1996, Entered: 4/16/1996 Order
ENDORSED ORDER on its face by Mag. Judge Robert J. Kauffman granting motion to withdraw attorney Karen G Seimetz [39-1] attorney Karen G Seimetz for Construction Sys, attorney Karen G Seimetz for Seaboard Surety Co, attorney Karen G Seimetz for Construction Sys, attorney Karen G Seimetz for Aetna Casualty, attorney Karen G Seimetz for Blount Inc (cc: all counsel). (SH, ilcd)
Blank 39 Filed: 4/10/1996, Entered: 4/11/1996 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
MOTION by defendant Construction Sys, counter-claimant Construction Sys to withdraw attorney Karen G Seimetz (SH, ilcd)
Blank -- Filed: 3/14/1996, Entered: 3/14/1996 Minutes - Miscellaneous
MINUTE-ENTRY: by Mag. Judge Robert J. Kauffman. Parties present via phone by Attys Coplan/Seimetz for Status hearing held at 10:15 Thursday, 3/14/96. Law firm of Pope Cahill & Devine Ltd no longer exists. Discovery conference set at 2:00 Tuesday, 4/23/96 via phone. Court to call. Attorney Seimetz will be filing a motion to withdraw in this case or a substitution of attorneys. (cc: all counsel) (VB, ilcd)
Blank -- Filed: 8/14/1995, Entered: 8/15/1995 Order
ENDORSED ORDER on its face by Mag. Judge Robert J. Kauffman granting motion to substitute attorney [37-1] attorney Christine Drylie for Seaboard Surety Co, attorney Douglas M Reimer for Seaboard Surety Co, attorney Douglas M Reimer for Seaboard Surety Co, attorney Christine Drylie for Aetna Casualty, attorney Douglas M Reimer for Aetna Casualty, attorney Douglas M Reimer for Aetna Casualty, attorney Christine Drylie for Blount Inc, attorney Douglas M Reimer for Blount Inc, attorney Douglas M Reimer for Blount Inc and substituting attorney Karen G Seimetz (cc: all counsel). (SH, ilcd)
Blank -- Filed: 8/14/1995, Entered: 8/15/1995 Order
ENDORSED ORDER on its face by Mag. Judge Robert J. Kauffman granting motion to dismiss certain Claims [35-1] terminating party Seaboard Surety Co, party Aetna Casualty, party Blount Inc, party Construction Sys, party USF&G, party Seaboard Surety Co, party Aetna Casualty, party Blount Inc, party Construction Sys, party Seaboard Surety Co, party Aetna Casualty, party Blount Inc (cc: all counsel). (SH, ilcd)
Blank 38 Filed: 8/11/1995, Entered: 8/11/1995 Notice (Other)
NOTICE OF FILING #37 by defendant Blount Inc, defendant Aetna Casualty, defendant Seaboard Surety Co (HK, ilcd)
Blank 37 Filed: 8/11/1995, Entered: 8/11/1995, Terminated: 8/14/1995 Motion to Substitute Attorney
MOTION by defendant Blount Inc, defendant Aetna Casualty, defendant Seaboard Surety Co to substitute attorney (HK, ilcd)
Blank 36 Filed: 8/11/1995, Entered: 8/11/1995 Notice (Other)
NOTICE of Filing #35 by counter-claimant Construction Sys, cross-claimant Blount Inc, cross-claimant Aetna Casualty, cross-claimant Seaboard Surety Co, third-party plaintiff Blount Inc, third-party plaintiff Aetna Casualty, third-party plaintiff Seaboard Surety Co (HK, ilcd)
Blank 35 Filed: 8/11/1995, Entered: 8/11/1995, Terminated: 8/14/1995 Motion to Dismiss
MOTION by counter-claimant Construction Sys, cross-claimant Blount Inc, cross-claimant Aetna Casualty, cross-claimant Seaboard Surety Co, third-party plaintiff Blount Inc, third-party plaintiff Aetna Casualty, third-party plaintiff Seaboard Surety Co to dismiss certain Claims (HK, ilcd)
Blank 34 Filed: 7/25/1995, Entered: 7/25/1995 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER by Mag. Judge Robert J. Kauffman. THEREFORE the stipulation (#32) is disapproved and the Court is denying motion to substitute attorneys (granting leave to the firm of Phelan, Cahill & Quinlan to substitute as attys in lieu of McDermott, WIll & Emery [31-1]. (cc: all counsel) (VB, ilcd)
Blank 33 Filed: 7/21/1995, Entered: 7/21/1995 Notice (Other)
NOTICE OF MOTION set for hearing on 7/28/95 for ruling by R.J.Kauffman by defendant Blount Inc, defendant Aetna Casualty, defendant Seaboard Surety Co, cross-claimant Blount Inc, cross-claimant Aetna Casualty, cross-claimant Seaboard Surety Co, third-party plaintiff Blount Inc, third-party plaintiff Aetna Casualty, third-party plaintiff Seaboard Surety Co (HK, ilcd)
Blank 32 Filed: 7/21/1995, Entered: 7/21/1995, Terminated: 6/19/1998 Stipulation
STIPULATION re motion to substitute attorneys (granting leave to the firm of Phelan, Cahill & Quinlan to substitute as attys in lieu of McDermott, WIll & Emery [31-1] (cc: all counsel) (HK, ilcd)
Blank 31 Filed: 7/21/1995, Entered: 7/21/1995, Terminated: 7/25/1995 Motion to Substitute Attorney
MOTION by defendant Blount Inc, defendant Aetna Casualty, defendant Seaboard Surety Co, cross-claimant Blount Inc, cross-claimant Aetna Casualty, cross-claimant Seaboard Surety Co, third-party plaintiff Blount Inc, third-party plaintiff Aetna Casualty, third-party plaintiff Seaboard Surety Co to substitute attorneys (granting leave to the firm of Phelan, Cahill & Quinlan to substitute as attys in lieu of McDermott, WIll & Emery (HK, ilcd)
Blank 30 Filed: 7/14/1995, Entered: 7/14/1995, Terminated: 7/14/1995 Motion for Leave to File
MOTION by plaintiff Bowman Metal Deck, plaintiff Bowman Metal for leave to file amended discovery and litigation schedule (SH, ilcd)
Blank -- Filed: 7/14/1995, Entered: 7/14/1995 Minutes - Miscellaneous
MINUTE-ENTRY: by Mag. Judge Robert J. Kauffman granting motion for leave to file amended discovery and litigation schedule [30-1] ; Document Discovery extended to 11/1/95 , ;Dispositive Mtn filing ddl extended to 4/15/96 (cc: all counsel) (SH, ilcd)
Blank -- Filed: 6/22/1995, Entered: 6/22/1995 Order
ENDORSED ORDER on its face by Mag. Judge Robert J. Kauffman granting motion for leave to file amended discovery schedule [29-1] (cc: all counsel). (VB, ilcd)
Blank 29 Filed: 6/21/1995, Entered: 6/21/1995, Terminated: 6/22/1995 Motion for Leave to File
AGREED MOTION by plaintiff for leave to file amended discovery schedule (SH, ilcd)
Blank 28 Filed: 5/31/1995, Entered: 5/31/1995 Answer - Miscellaneous
AMENDED ANSWER [10-2] by defendant Blount Inc, defendant Aetna Casualty, defendant Seaboard Surety Co; AMENDED CROSS CLAIM against Construction Systems, Inc and AMENDED THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against United States Fidelity & Guaranty Company (USF&G) (HK, ilcd)
Blank -- Filed: 5/31/1995, Entered: 5/31/1995 Minutes - Miscellaneous
MINUTE-ENTRY:by Mag. Judge Robert J. Kauffman granting motion for leave to file amended answer to complaint [27-1] (cc: all counsel) (HK, ilcd)
Blank 27 Filed: 5/23/1995, Entered: 5/23/1995, Terminated: 5/31/1995 Motion for Leave to File
MOTION by defendant Blount Inc, defendant Aetna Casualty, defendant Seaboard Surety Co for leave to file amended answer to complaint (HK, ilcd)
Blank 26 Filed: 10/20/1994, Entered: 10/20/1994 Response
REPLY to CONSTRUCTION SYSTEMS, INC's.AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by plaintiff Bowman Metal Deck, plaintiff Bowman Metal (HK, ilcd)
Blank -- Filed: 10/20/1994, Entered: 10/20/1994 Minutes - Miscellaneous
MINUTE-ENTRY: by Mag. Judge Robert J. Kauffman granting motion for leave to file Reply to Construction Systems, Inc.'s Affirmative Defenses [24-1] (cc: all counsel) (HK, ilcd)
Blank 25 Filed: 10/19/1994, Entered: 10/20/1994 Notice (Other)
NOTICE OF FILING # 24 by plaintiff Bowman Metal Deck, plaintiff Bowman Metal (HK, ilcd)
Blank 24 Filed: 10/19/1994, Entered: 10/20/1994 Motion for Leave to File
MOTION by plaintiff Bowman Metal Deck, plaintiff Bowman Metal for leave to file Reply to Construction Systems, Inc.'s Affirmative Defenses (HK, ilcd)
Blank -- Filed: 9/13/1994, Entered: 9/13/1994 Minutes - Miscellaneous
MINUTE-ENTRY: by Mag. Judge Robert J. Kauffman granting stipulation [20-1]; Answers filed on 9/12/94. (cc: all counsel) (VB, ilcd)
Blank 23 Filed: 9/12/1994, Entered: 9/15/1994 Discovery - Miscellaneous
DISCLOSURE PLAN filed by plaintiff, defendant, counter-claimant, counter-defendant, cross-claimant, cross-defendant, third-party plaintiff, third-party defendant (filed as Rule 26 Joint Discovery Schedule and Disclosure Statement) (SH, ilcd)
Blank 22 Filed: 9/12/1994, Entered: 9/13/1994 Answer to Complaint
ANSWER to Third Party Complain by third-party defendant USF&G (CL, ilcd)
Blank 21 Filed: 9/12/1994, Entered: 8/15/1995 Crossclaim
CROSSCLAIM by cross-defendant Construction Sys against defendant Blount Inc, defendant Aetna Casualty, defendant Seaboard Surety Co (SH, ilcd)
Blank 21 Filed: 9/12/1994, Entered: 9/13/1994 Answer to Complaint
ANSWER to Cross Claim by cross-defendant Construction Sys (CL, ilcd)
Blank -- Filed: 9/12/1994, Entered: 9/15/1994 Minutes - Miscellaneous
MINUTE-ENTRY: by Mag. Judge Robert J. Kauffman Parties pres. via phone by Attys O'Brien/Coplan/Sackley/Seimetz for discovery conference. Same held 11:15 9/12/94 . Parties discuss discovery schedule previously submitted to the Court. Court adopts discovery schedule as amended. Joinder of additional parties no later than 10/1/94; All Discovery to be completed by 8/15/95 ; Mtn filing ddl for dispositive motion by 9/15/95 (See Discovery Schedule) (cc: all counsel) (SH, ilcd)
Blank 20 Filed: 9/9/1994, Entered: 9/10/1994 Stipulation
STIPULATION filed by Third-Party plaintiff Blount Inc agree and stipulate that US Fidelity & Guaranty Company and Construction Systems Inc have an extention of time to respond to the complaint of Blount Inc until 9/7/94 (VB, ilcd)
Blank -- Filed: 9/2/1994, Entered: 9/6/1994 Minutes - Miscellaneous
MINUTE-ENTRY: by Mag. Judge Robert J. Kauffman granting Stipulation/motion for leave to file answer to counterlclaim [17-1] (cc: all counsel) (HK, ilcd)
Blank -- Filed: 9/2/1994, Entered: 9/2/1994 Minutes - Miscellaneous
MINUTE-ENTRY: by Mag. Judge Robert J. Kauffman granting motion to extend time to answer 3rd Party Complaint until 9/1/94 [15-1] ; Mtn filing ddl updated to 9/1/94 (cc: all counsel) (HK, ilcd)
Blank 19 Filed: 9/1/1994, Entered: 9/1/1994 Notice (Other)
NOTICE OF FILING by plaintiff/cntrdeft. Bowman Metal Deck, Bowman Metal (HK, ilcd)
Blank 18 Filed: 9/1/1994, Entered: 9/1/1994 Answer to Counterclaim
PLTF'S ANSWER TO DEFT. CONSTRUCTION SYSTEMS INC'S SET-OFF & COUNTERCLAIM [6-2] by counter-defendant Bowman Metal Deck, counter-defendant Bowman Metal (HK, ilcd)
Blank 17 Filed: 9/1/1994, Entered: 9/1/1994, Terminated: 9/2/1994 Motion for Leave to File
MOTION by plaintiff Bowman Metal Deck, defendant Construction Sys, plaintiff Bowman Metal, counter-claimant Construction Sys, counter-defendant Bowman Metal Deck, counter-defendant Bowman Metal for leave to file answer to counterlclaim (HK, ilcd)
Blank 16 Filed: 8/30/1994, Entered: 8/30/1994 Notice (Other)
NOTICE OF FILING #15 by third-party plaintiff Blount Inc, third-party defendant USF&G (HK, ilcd)
Blank 15 Filed: 8/30/1994, Entered: 8/30/1994, Terminated: 9/2/1994 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
MOTION by third-party plaintiff Blount Inc, third-party defendant USF&G to extend time to answer 3rd Party Complaint until 9/1/94 (HK, ilcd)
Blank -- Filed: 8/30/1994, Entered: 8/30/1994 Minutes - Miscellaneous
MINUTE-ENTRY: by Mag. Judge Robert J. Kauffman granting motion to extend time to answer 3rd party complaint [13-1] ; Mtn filing ddl created 8/29/94 (cc: all counsel) (HK, ilcd)
Blank 14 Filed: 8/29/1994, Entered: 8/29/1994 Notice (Other)
NOTICE of FILING #13 by third-party plaintiff Blount Inc, third-party defendant USF&G (HK, ilcd)
Blank 13 Filed: 8/29/1994, Entered: 8/29/1994, Terminated: 8/30/1994 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
STIPULATION/MOTION by third-party plaintiff Blount Inc, third-party defendant USF&G to extend time to answer 3rd party complaint (HK, ilcd)
Blank -- Filed: 8/29/1994, Entered: 8/29/1994 Minutes - Miscellaneous
MINUTE-ENTRY:by Mag. Judge Robert J. Kauffman ;Discovery Conf/Status hearing set 8/29/94 is CANCELLED per request of attorneys & is reset to 11:15am on Monday, 9/12/94;via phone, crt. to set up call. (cc: all counsel) (HK, ilcd)
Blank 12 Filed: 8/25/1994, Entered: 8/25/1994 Notice of Appearance of Attorney
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for third-party defendant USF&G (HK, ilcd)
Blank -- Filed: 8/4/1994, Entered: 8/5/1994 Minutes - Miscellaneous
MINUTE-ENTRY:by Mag. Judge Robert J. Kauffman ;Parties pres. via phone by Attys. O'Brien/Coplan/Reimer & Seimetz for Initial Pre-Trial Conf. Same held 8/4/94. Discovery Conf. set at 11:30am on Monday, 8/29/94;via phone, Crt. to set up call. (cc: all counsel) (HK, ilcd)
Blank 11 Filed: 7/18/1994, Entered: 7/21/1994 Notice (Other)
NOTICE OF FILING by third-party plaintiff Blount Inc, third-party plaintiff Aetna Casualty, third-party plaintiff Seaboard Surety Co (HK, ilcd)
Blank 10 Filed: 7/15/1994, Entered: 7/18/1994 Third Party Complaint
THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT: by defendant Blount Inc, defendant Aetna Casualty, defendant Seaboard Surety Co (SH, ilcd)
Blank 10 Filed: 7/15/1994, Entered: 7/18/1994 Crossclaim
ANSWER to complaint and CROSSCLAIM by defendant Blount Inc, defendant Aetna Casualty, defendant Seaboard Surety Co against defendant Construction Sys and Third Party Complaint against United States Fidelity & Guaranty Company (SH, ilcd)
Blank 9 Filed: 7/15/1994, Entered: 7/15/1994, Terminated: 7/15/1994 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
MOTION by defendant Blount Inc, defendant Aetna Casualty, defendant Seaboard Surety Co for attorney to appear pro hac vice (HK, ilcd)
Blank -- Filed: 7/15/1994, Entered: 7/15/1994 Minutes - Miscellaneous
MINUTE-ENTRY: by Mag. Judge Robert J. Kauffman granting motion for attorney to appear pro hac vice [9-1] (cc: all counsel) (HK, ilcd)
Blank -- Filed: 7/14/1994, Entered: 7/14/1994 Minutes - Miscellaneous
MINUTE-ENTRY:by Mag. Judge Robert J. Kauffman ;Initial Pre-Trial/Rule 16 conference set at 10:00am on Thursday, 8/4/94;via phone, Crt.to set up call. (cc: all counsel) (HK, ilcd)
Blank 8 Filed: 7/8/1994, Entered: 7/11/1994 Notice of Appearance of Attorney
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for defendant Construction Sys (HK, ilcd)
Blank 7 Filed: 7/8/1994, Entered: 7/11/1994 Notice (Other)
NOTICE of Filing #6 by defendant Construction Sys (HK, ilcd)
Blank 6 Filed: 7/8/1994, Entered: 7/11/1994 Answer to Complaint
ANSWER to complaint for Miller Act Relief and Breach of Contract and COUNTERCLAIM by defendant Construction Sys against plaintiff Bowman Metal Deck, a dvision of Armco, Inc and Bowman Metal Deck, a Division of Armco, Inc., individually (HK, ilcd)
Blank -- Filed: 6/28/1994, Entered: 6/28/1994 Minutes - Miscellaneous
MINUTE-ENTRY: by Mag. Judge Robert J. Kauffman granting motion to withdraw attorney Paul C Estes, D Kevin Sommer, Douglas M Reimer [5-1];attorneys Douglas M Reimer, Paul C Estes, D Kevin Sommer for Construction System are withdrawn (cc: all counsel) (HK, ilcd)
Blank -- Filed: 6/28/1994, Entered: 6/28/1994 Minutes - Miscellaneous
MINUTE-ENTRY:by Mag. Judge Robert J. Kauffman granting motion to extend time to answer or otherwise respond [4-1] ; misc ddl created for 7/15/94 for said filing (cc: all counsel) (HK, ilcd)
Blank 5 Filed: 6/23/1994, Entered: 6/27/1994 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
MOTION by defendant Construction Sys to withdraw attorney Paul C Estes, D Kevin Sommer, Douglas M Reimer (HK, ilcd)
Blank 4 Filed: 6/22/1994, Entered: 6/23/1994 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
MOTION by defendant Blount Inc, defendant Aetna Casualty, defendant Construction Sys, defendant Seaboard Surety Co to extend time to answer or otherwise respond (HK, ilcd)
Blank 3 Filed: 6/22/1994, Entered: 6/23/1994 Jury Demand
Demand for jury trial by defendant Blount Inc, defendant Aetna Casualty, defendant Construction Sys, defendant Seaboard Surety Co (HK, ilcd)
Blank 3 Filed: 6/22/1994, Entered: 6/23/1994 Notice of Appearance of Attorney
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for defendant Blount Inc, defendant Aetna Casualty, defendant Construction Sys, defendant Seaboard Surety Co (HK, ilcd)
Blank 2 Filed: 5/9/1994, Entered: 5/10/1994 Certificate of Interest
CERTIFICATE OF INTEREST pursuant to Local Rule 1.6 filed by plaintiff Bowman Metal Deck (VB, ilcd)
Blank 1 Filed: 5/9/1994, Entered: 5/10/1994 ComplaintCourt Filing
COMPLAINT FOR MILLER ACT RELIEF AND BREACH OF CONTRACT filed; (summons(es) issued); case referred to Mag. Judge Robert J. Kauffman (VB, ilcd)
Blank -- Filed: 5/9/1994, Entered: 5/10/1994 Filing Fee Received
FILING FEE PAID on 5/9/94 in the amount of $ 120.00 receipt # 021507. (VB, ilcd)

Statistics

This case has been viewed 108 times.

No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Need Password Help?