AOL Inc. et al v. Yahoo! Inc. et al
New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:09-cv-03774
District Judge William H. Pauley, III, presiding
docket://gov.uscourts.nysd.1-09-cv-03774 (What is this?)

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Judges don't know as much about themselves as we do.
Access comprehensive profiles on judges, firms, lawyers, and more with PlainSite Pro and Pro Se.
No Logo Aol Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Joseph Aaron Sherinsky +1 212 278 0409 +1 212 391 0525 jsherinsky@orrick.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sullivan & Worcester, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Paul R. Gupta, Esq. +1 617 338 2800 +3382 338 338 2880
No Logo Platform-a Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Joseph Aaron Sherinsky +1 212 278 0409 +1 212 391 0525 jsherinsky@orrick.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sullivan & Worcester, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Paul R. Gupta, Esq. +1 617 338 2800 +3382 338 338 2880
No Logo Quigo Technologies LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Joseph Aaron Sherinsky +1 212 278 0409 +1 212 391 0525 jsherinsky@orrick.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sullivan & Worcester, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Paul R. Gupta, Esq. +1 617 338 2800 +3382 338 338 2880
Yahoo, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Danielle Anne Phillip +1 212 373 3429 +1 212 492 0429 dphillip@paulweiss.com
v.
Yahoo, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Brinks Hofer Gilson & Lione

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Charles M. McMahon +1 312 321 4200 +1 312 321 4299 cmcmahon@brinkshofer.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Danielle Anne Phillip +1 212 373 3429 +1 212 492 0429 dphillip@paulweiss.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 2201
Nature of Suit 830 Patent
  Entries (27) Calendar Events Related (0) Tools Right End
PDF 51
PDF 48
PACER 25 Filed: 1/5/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge William H. Pauley from W. Benjamin Tabler dated 12/30/09 re: counsel for plaintiffs request that the Court substitute "AOL Inc." for "AOL LLC" in this litigation and direct the clerk of the court to change the case caption accordingly. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. AOL Inc. is substituted for AOL LLC, and the caption is amended accordingly. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 1/4/10) (dle) (Entered: 01/05/2010)
PACER 24 Filed: 12/23/2009, Entered: None
SUPPLEMENTAL RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying AOL Inc. as Corporate Parent. Document filed by Quigo Technologies LLC.(Sherinsky, Joseph) (Entered: 12/23/2009)
PACER 23 Filed: 12/23/2009, Entered: None
SUPPLEMENTAL RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying AOL Inc. as Corporate Parent. Document filed by Platform-A Inc..(Sherinsky, Joseph) (Entered: 12/23/2009)
PACER 22 Filed: 12/23/2009, Entered: None
SUPPLEMENTAL RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by AOL LLC.(Sherinsky, Joseph) (Entered: 12/23/2009)
PACER 21 Filed: 11/9/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
SCHEDULING ORDER: This Court will hold a further status conference to discuss the schedule for claim construction and remainder of this action on February 5, 2010 at 11:00 a.m., before Judge William H. Pauley III. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 11/6/09) (djc) (Entered: 11/09/2009)
PACER 20 Filed: 11/5/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED LETTER: addressed to Judge William H. Pauley from Charles M. McMahon dated 11/3/09 re: Counsel for defendant request permission to appear by telephone for the initial pretrial hearing scheduled to begin at 10:30 a.m. on Friday, November 6. So Ordered. ENDORSEMENT: Application denied. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 11/5/09) (js) (Entered: 11/06/2009)
PACER 19 Filed: 11/3/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE ON WRITTEN MOTION: granting 17 Motion for Charles M. McMahon to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 11/2/2009) (jfe) (Entered: 11/03/2009)
PACER 18 Filed: 10/30/2009, Entered: None
RULE 26(f) DISCOVERY PLAN REPORT.Document filed by Yahoo! Inc., Overture Services, Inc., Platform-A Inc., AOL LLC, Quigo Technologies LLC.(Phillip, Danielle) (Entered: 10/30/2009)
PACER 17 Filed: 10/23/2009, Entered: None
MOTION for Charles M. McMahon to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Yahoo! Inc.(mro) (Entered: 10/27/2009)
PACER 16 Filed: 10/23/2009, Entered: None
ANSWER to Counterclaim. Document filed by AOL LLC, Platform-A Inc., Quigo Technologies LLC.(Gupta, Paul) (Entered: 10/23/2009)
PACER 15 Filed: 10/16/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge William H. Pauley, III from Paul R. Gupta dated 10/13/2009 re: Counsel for plaintiff writes with consent to request a 2 week adjournment of the Initial Pretrial Conference currently scheduled for 10/23/2009. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. This Court will hold the conference on 11/6/2009 at 10:30 a.m. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 10/16/2009) (tve) (Entered: 10/16/2009)
PACER 14 Filed: 9/30/2009, Entered: None
ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND., COUNTERCLAIM against all plaintiffs. Document filed by Yahoo! Inc..(Phillip, Danielle) (Entered: 09/30/2009)
PACER 13 Filed: 9/30/2009, Entered: None
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Yahoo! Inc..(Phillip, Danielle) (Entered: 09/30/2009)
PACER 12 Filed: 9/30/2009, Entered: None
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Danielle Anne Phillip on behalf of Yahoo! Inc. (Phillip, Danielle) (Entered: 09/30/2009)
PACER 11 Filed: 9/11/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge William H. Pauley, III from Paul R. Gupta dated 9/4/2009 re: Counsel respectfully request that the initial pretrial conference scheduled for September 25, 2009 be adjourned until Friday, October 23 or Friday, October 30. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. This Court will hold the conference on October 23, 2009 at 12:30 p.m. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 9/10/2009) (jfe) Modified on 9/18/2009 (jfe). (Entered: 09/11/2009)
PACER 10 Filed: 9/2/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
STIPULATION AND ORDER, Yahoo! Inc. answer due 9/30/2009; Overture Services, Inc. answer due 9/30/2009. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 8/31/09) (sac) (Entered: 09/02/2009)
PACER 9 Filed: 8/12/2009, Entered: None
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Overture Services, Inc. served on 8/11/2009, answer due 8/31/2009. Document filed by AOL LLC; Platform-A Inc.; Quigo Technologies LLC. (Gupta, Paul) (Entered: 08/12/2009)
PACER 8 Filed: 8/12/2009, Entered: None
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Yahoo! Inc. served on 8/11/2009, answer due 8/31/2009. Document filed by AOL LLC; Platform-A Inc.; Quigo Technologies LLC. (Gupta, Paul) (Entered: 08/12/2009)
PACER 7 Filed: 7/23/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge William H. Pauley from Paul Gupta dated 7/21/09 re: Request to adjourn the Initial Pretrial Conference set for 8/7/09. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. This Court will hold the initial pre-trial conference on 9/25/09 at 10:30 am. ( Initial Conference reset for 9/25/2009 at 10:30 AM before Judge William H. Pauley III.) (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 7/22/09) (cd) (Entered: 07/23/2009)
PACER 6 Filed: 5/28/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER FOR INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 8/7/2009 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 11D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge William H. Pauley III. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 5/27/09) Copies Mailed By Chambers.(tro) (Entered: 05/28/2009)
PACER 5 Filed: 5/26/2009, Entered: None
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joseph Aaron Sherinsky on behalf of AOL LLC, Platform-A Inc., Quigo Technologies LLC (Sherinsky, Joseph) (Entered: 05/26/2009)
PACER 4 Filed: 4/14/2009, Entered: None
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Time Warner Inc., AOL LLC as Corporate Parent. Document filed by Platform-A Inc.(ama) (rdz). (Entered: 04/15/2009)
PACER 3 Filed: 4/14/2009, Entered: None
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Time Warner Inc., AOL LLC as Corporate Parent. Document filed by Quigo Technologies LLC.(ama) (Entered: 04/15/2009)
PACER 2 Filed: 4/14/2009, Entered: None
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Time Warner Inc. as Corporate Parent. Document filed by AOL LLC.(ama) (Entered: 04/15/2009)
PACER 1 Filed: 4/14/2009, Entered: None
COMPLAINT against Yahoo! Inc., Overture Services, Inc. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 684185)Document filed by AOL LLC, Platform-A Inc., Quigo Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 exhibit 1, # 2 exhibit 2, # 3 exhibit 3)(ama) (Entered: 04/15/2009)

Statistics

This case has been viewed 231 times.

No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Need Password Help?