Johnson v. Midland Credit Management, Inc. et al
Ohio Northern District Court, Case No. 1:05-cv-01094
District Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr, presiding
docket://gov.uscourts.ohnd.1-05-cv-01094 (What is this?)

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
This docket can only tell you so much. Get the rest.
Access comprehensive profiles on judges, firms, lawyers, and more with PlainSite Pro and Pro Se.
No Logo Rod L. Feyedelem, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Murray & Murray

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Donna Jean A. Evans +1 419 624 3000 +1 419 624 0707 dae@murrayandmurray.com
No Logo Zloro Johnson, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Murray & Murray

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Donna Jean A. Evans +1 419 624 3000 +1 419 624 0707 dae@murrayandmurray.com
v.
No Logo Encore Capital Group, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dickinson Wright PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
William M. Thacker +1 734 623 7075 +1 734 623 1625 wthacker@dickinsonwright.com
No Logo Midland Credit Management, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dickinson Wright PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
William M. Thacker +1 734 623 7075 +1 734 623 1625 wthacker@dickinsonwright.com
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 1692
Nature of Suit 480 Consumer Credit
  Entries (169) Calendar Events Related (0) Tools Right End
PACER 169 Filed: 12/20/2010, Entered: None
Reply to response to 167 Motion for conference/hearing Re: Pending Motions filed by Zloro Johnson. (Murray, Dennis) (Entered: 12/20/2010)
PACER 168 Filed: 12/10/2010, Entered: None
Response to 167 Motion for conference/hearing and/or for Oral Argument re Pending Motions filed by All Defendants. (Seitz, Theodore) (Entered: 12/10/2010)
PACER 167 Filed: 11/23/2010, Entered: None
Motion for conference/hearing filed by Plaintiff Zloro Johnson. Related document(s) 155 , 159 , 164 . (Murray, Dennis) (Entered: 11/23/2010)
PACER 166 Filed: 10/28/2010, Entered: None
Reply to response to 164 Motion for hearing on defendants' motion to exclude the opinions and testimony of Ruoming Jin filed by Zloro Johnson. (Murray, Dennis) Modified text on 10/29/2010 (E,P). (Entered: 10/28/2010)
PACER 165 Filed: 10/18/2010, Entered: None
Response to 164 Motion for hearing on defendants' motion to exclude the opinions and testimony of ruoming Jin filed by Encore Capital Group, Inc., Midland Credit Management, Inc. (Seitz, Theodore) Modified text on 10/19/2010 (E,P). (Entered: 10/18/2010)
PACER 164 Filed: 10/1/2010, Entered: None
Motion for hearing on defendants' motion to exclude the opinions and testimony of Ruoming Jin filed by Plaintiff Zloro Johnson. Related document(s) 159 . (Murray, Dennis) Modified text on 10/4/2010 (E,P). (Entered: 10/01/2010)
PACER 163 Filed: 9/16/2010, Entered: None
SEALED Document: Reply In Further Support Of Their Joint Motion to Exclude The Opinions and Testimony Of Ruoming Jin filed by Encore Capital Group, Inc., Midland Credit Management, Inc.. Related document(s) 31 , 161 , 159 . (Seitz, Theodore) (Entered: 09/16/2010)
PACER 162 Filed: 9/2/2010, Entered: None
Unopposed Motion for extension of Reply until September 16, 2010 filed by Encore Capital Group, Inc., Midland Credit Management, Inc.. Related document(s) 161 , 159 . (Seitz, Theodore) (Entered: 09/02/2010)
PACER 161 Filed: 8/30/2010, Entered: None
SEALED Document: Response in opposition to defendants' motion to exclude the opinions and testimony of Ruoming Jin, filed by Zloro Johnson (Related document(s) 31 , 159 ). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit No. 1)(Murray, Dennis) Modified text on 8/31/2010 (E,P). Modified text on 8/31/2010 (H,SP). (Entered: 08/30/2010)
PACER 160 Filed: 8/30/2010, Entered: None
Motion for leave to Exceed Page Limitations filed by Plaintiff Zloro Johnson. Related document(s) 159 . (Murray, Dennis) (Entered: 08/30/2010)
PACER 159 Filed: 8/11/2010, Entered: None
SEALED Motion to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Ruoming Jin, filed by Encore Capital Group, Inc., Midland Credit Management, Inc. (Related document(s) 31 ). (Attachments: # 1 Brief in Support, # 2 Exhibit A - Stirewalt Report, # 3 Exhibit B - Sitrewalt Supplemental Report, # 4 Exhibit C - Dr. Jin's Deposition, # 5 Exhibit D - Dr. Jin's Report, # 6 Exhibit E - Stirewalt Deposition, # 7 Exhibit F - Dr. Jin's Corrections to Deposition) (Seitz, Theodore). (Entered: 08/11/2010)
PACER 158 Filed: 7/2/2010, Entered: None
SEALED Document: Reply In Support Of Second Renewed And Amended Class Certification Motion filed by Zloro Johnson. Related document(s) 31 , 155 . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Dr. Breitbart's Deposition, # 2 Exhibit Dr. Stirewalt's Deposition, # 3 Exhibit Account Print Out)(Murray, Dennis) (Entered: 07/02/2010)
PACER 157 Filed: 6/18/2010, Entered: None
SEALED Document: Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Renewed and Second Amended Motion for Class Certification filed by Encore Capital Group, Inc., Midland Credit Management, Inc.. Related document(s) 31 , 155 . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Jin Deposition, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Stirewalt Deposition, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Jin Corrections, # 4 Exhibit 4 - Eversole v. EMC, # 5 Exhibit 5 - In Re Wal-Mart, # 6 Exhibit 6 - Moore v. Blatt, Hassenmiller, # 7 Exhibit 7 - Holsinger v. Wolpoff, # 8 Exhibit 8 - Gates v. Rohm)(Seitz, Theodore) (Entered: 06/18/2010)
PACER 156 Filed: 5/27/2010, Entered: None
Unopposed Motion for extension of time until June 18, 2010 to Respond to Plaintiff's Renewed and Amended Class Certification Motion and Exceed Page Limit filed by Encore Capital Group, Inc., Midland Credit Management, Inc.. Related document(s) 155 . (Seitz, Theodore) (Entered: 05/27/2010)
PACER 155 Filed: 5/18/2010, Entered: None
SEALED Document Memorandum in Support of Second Renewed and Amended Class Certification Motion, filed by Plaintiff Zloro Johnson (Related document(s) 31 ). (Attachments: # 1 Dr. Ruoming Jin Depo Excerpts, # 2 Midland's Responses to Interrogatories, # 3 Midland Responses to Req Prod, # 4 Brian Frary Depo Excerpts, # 5 Lisa Steen Depo Excerpts, # 6 Kevin McLaughlin Depo Excerpts, # 7 Midland Supp Responses to Interrogatories, # 8 Rober Morgan Depo Excerpts, # 9 Nayri Melconian Depo Excerpts, # 10 Michael Hennessy Depo Excerpts, # 11 Affidavit of Rhonda Rice, # 12 Midland Responses to RFA, # 13 Disiree Thomas Depo Excerpts, # 14 Declaration of Dr. Jin & Report) (Murray, Dennis). Modified to correct entry from motion to document on 5/18/2010 (H,SP). (Entered: 05/18/2010)
PACER 154 Filed: 5/17/2010, Entered: None
Motion for to Exceed Page Limitations filed by Plaintiff Zloro Johnson. (Murray, Dennis) (Entered: 05/17/2010)
PACER 153 Filed: 3/15/2010, Entered: None
SEALED Document: Defendants' Expert's Supplemental Report filed by Encore Capital Group, Inc., Midland Credit Management, Inc.. Related document(s) 31 , 148 . (Seitz, Theodore) (Entered: 03/15/2010)
PACER 152 Filed: 3/8/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
Minutes of proceedings Telephonic Discovery Conference held on 3/5/10 with Magistrate Judge Perelman. Counsel agreed to go forward with the deposition of Dr. Stirewalt on 4/21/10. Magistrate Judge David S. Perelman, (G,S) (Entered: 03/08/2010)
PACER 151 Filed: 1/14/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
Order . It appearing to this Court that the taking of Dr. Jin's deposition has not been shown to be likely to cause delay in the progress of this action, which has been pending almost five years with no end in sight, It is Ordered that the motion for protective order (Related Doc # 146 ) is denied, and the deposition of Dr. Jin may go forward at some time in the next thirty days, on a date to be agreed upon by counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Perelman on 1/14/10.(W,Jo) (Entered: 01/14/2010)
PACER 150 Filed: 1/9/2010, Entered: None
Reply to response to 146 Motion for protective order filed by Zloro Johnson. (Murray, Dennis) Modified text on 1/11/2010 (B,B). (Entered: 01/09/2010)
PACER 149 Filed: 12/28/2009, Entered: None
Opposition to 146 Motion for protective order filed by Encore Capital Group, Inc., Midland Credit Management, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Evans 12/7/09 E-Mail, # 2 Exhibit B - Seitz 12/7/09 letter, # 3 Exhibit C - Haynes v. City of Circleville, # 4 Exhibit D - Suskind v. Home Depot, # 5 Exhibit E - The Hartford Fire Ins. Co. v. Transgroup Express)(Seitz, Theodore) Modified text on 12/30/2009 (B,B). (Entered: 12/28/2009)
PACER 148 Filed: 12/21/2009, Entered: None
SEALED Document: Defendants' Expert Report filed by Encore Capital Group, Inc., Midland Credit Management, Inc.. Related document(s) 31 , 145 , 143 , 144 , 130 , 113 . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit CV)(Seitz, Theodore) (Entered: 12/21/2009)
PACER 147 Filed: 12/9/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
Order. It is ORDERED that the deposition of Ruoming Jin scheduled for December 14, 2009 is stayed pending this Court's resolution of plaintiff's re 146 "Motion For A Protective Order" of December 8, 2009 and any appeal to Judge Oliver, should one be taken from this Court's ruling. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Perelman on 12/9/09. (W,Jo) (Entered: 12/10/2009)
PACER 146 Filed: 12/8/2009, Entered: None
Motion for protective order and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Zloro Johnson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Notice of Deposition, # 2 Exhibit Email to Ted Seitz from Donna Evans)(Murray, Dennis) (Entered: 12/08/2009)
PACER 145 Filed: 11/16/2009, Entered: None
SEALED Document: Plaintiff's Expert Report filed by Zloro Johnson. Related document(s) 31 , 143 . (Murray, Dennis) (Entered: 11/16/2009)
PACER 144 Filed: 10/13/2009, Entered: None
Notice of Plaintiff's Preliminary Results of the Inspection of Defendants' Computer System filed by Zloro Johnson. Related document(s) 130 .(Murray, Dennis) (Entered: 10/13/2009)
PACER 143 Filed: 8/21/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Perelman on 08/21/09. (W,Jo) (Entered: 08/24/2009)
PACER 142 Filed: 7/21/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
Letter from Plaintiff's counsel Donna J. Evans, dated 7/8/2009, addressed to Magistrate Judge Perelman, updating him on the progress of the ongoing preparation for the computer inspection of Midland Credit Management computer datatbase and programming. (D,M) (Entered: 07/21/2009)
PACER 141 Filed: 5/27/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
Minutes of proceedings - Telephonic discovery conference held with Magistrate Judge Perelman. Counsel agreed to have their experts confer and try to come to an understanding regarding examination; will probably take until mid-June for that to happen. Parties need, and were given, a 90 day extension of dates regarding examination. Magistrate Judge David S. Perelman, (G,S) (Entered: 05/27/2009)
PACER 140 Filed: 5/22/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
Notice of Discovery Conference set for 5/27/2009 at 02:30 PM to be held telephonically with Magistrate Judge Perelman. The plaintiff's counsel is to set up the conference call. (G,S) Modified text on 5/22/2009 (B,B). (Entered: 05/22/2009)
PACER 139 Filed: 5/15/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
Motion to schedule discovery conference with Magistrate Judge Perelman filed by all plaintiffs. Related document(s) 130 , 138 . (Murray, Dennis) Modified text on 5/15/2009 (B,B). (Entered: 05/15/2009)
PACER 138 Filed: 4/9/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
Stipulation & Order modifying schedule previously set on the time frame for the Protocol concerning the computer inspection. Signed by Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr on 4/9/2009. (Related doc 137 ) (D,M) Modified to create link on 4/9/2009 (B, B). (Entered: 04/09/2009)
PACER 137 Filed: 4/9/2009, Entered: None
Proposed Stipulated Order filed by all parties. Related document(s) 130 , 136 . (Murray, Dennis) Modified text on 4/9/2009 (B,B). (Entered: 04/09/2009)
PACER 136 Filed: 4/6/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
Minutes of proceedings - Telephone Conference held on 4/6/09 with Magistrate Judge Perelman. Discussion regarding need to modify timeline regarding completion of computer inspection protocol. Parties will agree on dates and submit proposed stipulated order to Judge Oliver. Reference closed. Magistrate Judge David S. Perelman, (G,S) (Entered: 04/06/2009)
PACER 135 Filed: 3/20/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
Joint Motion to Schedule Telephone Discovery Conference with Magistrate Judge Perelman filed by Plaintiff Zloro Johnson. (Murray, Dennis) Modified text on 3/23/2009 (B,B). (Entered: 03/20/2009)
PACER 134 Filed: 3/5/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
Order denying Defendants' Emergency Motion to Stay the Computer Inspection Ordered (Related Doc # 131 ) in the court's July 22, 2008 and February 9, 2009 Orders. The parties shall comply with the court's protocol issued in the February 9, 2009 Order (ECF No. 130 ). Signed by Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr on 3/5/2009. (D,M) (Entered: 03/05/2009)
PACER 133 Filed: 3/3/2009, Entered: None
Appeal Remark from USCA for the Sixth Circuit: A petition for writ of mandamus has been filed (USCA# 09-3210) (H,SP) (Entered: 03/03/2009)
PACER 132 Filed: 3/2/2009, Entered: None
Opposition to 131 Emergency Motion to stay the Computer Inspection Ordered in the Court's July 22, 2008 and February 9, 2009 Orders filed by Zloro Johnson. (Murray, Dennis) Modified text on 3/2/2009 (B,B). (Entered: 03/02/2009)
PACER 131 Filed: 2/25/2009, Entered: None
Emergency Motion to stay the Computer Inspection Ordered in the Court's July 22, 2008 and February 9, 2009 Orders filed by Midland Credit Management, Inc., Encore Capital Group, Inc.. Related document(s) 130 , 113 . (Attachments: # 1 Brief in Support)(Seitz, Theodore) (Entered: 02/25/2009)
PACER 130 Filed: 2/9/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
Order denying Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration (Related Doc # 117 ); denying Plaintiff's Motion for the Appointment of an Independent Computer Expert (Related Doc # 126 ); and granting Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply (Related Doc # 129 ). The parties are to carry out the protocol for Midland's computer database inspection as outlined herein. Signed by Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr on 2/9/2009. (D,M) (Entered: 02/09/2009)
PACER 129 Filed: 1/30/2009, Entered: None
Motion for leave to file Sur-Reply in Opposition to Plaintiff's motion for the appointment of an independent computer expert to undertake inspection of Defendants' computer data filed by Midland Credit Management, Inc., Encore Capital Group, Inc.. Related document(s) 126 . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Sur-Reply)(Seitz, Theodore) Modified text on 1/30/2009 (B,B). (Entered: 01/30/2009)
PACER 128 Filed: 1/9/2009, Entered: None
Reply to response to 126 Motion for the Appointment of an Independent Computer Expert to Undertake Inspection of Defendants' Computer Data filed by Zloro Johnson. (Murray, Dennis) Modified text on 1/15/2009 (B,B). (Entered: 01/09/2009)
PACER 127 Filed: 12/24/2008, Entered: None
Opposition to 126 Motion for the Appointment of an Independent Computer Expert to Undertake Inspection of Defendants' Computer Data filed by Midland Credit Management, Inc., Encore Capital Group, Inc.. (Seitz, Theodore) Modified text on 12/29/2008 (B,B). (Entered: 12/24/2008)
PACER 126 Filed: 12/9/2008, Entered: None
Motion for the Appointment of an Independent Computer Expert to Undertake Inspection of Defendants' Computer Data filed by Plaintiff Zloro Johnson. Related document(s) 113 . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Koninklijke Electronics v. KXD Technology, # 2 Exhibit Advante International v. Mintel Learning Technology, # 3 Exhibit Ferron v. Search Cactus)(Murray, Dennis) Modified text on 1/15/2009 (B,B). (Entered: 12/09/2008)
PACER 125 Filed: 9/4/2008, Entered: None
Response ro Plaintiff's notice to the Court dated 8/29/2008 filed by Midland Credit Management, Inc., Encore Capital Group, Inc.. Related document(s) 124 . (Seitz, Theodore) Modified text on 9/5/2008 (B,B). (Entered: 09/04/2008)
PACER 124 Filed: 8/29/2008, Entered: None
Notice to Court filed by Zloro Johnson. (Attachments: # 1 Submission)(Murray, Dennis) (Entered: 08/29/2008)
PACER 123 Filed: 8/25/2008, Entered: None
Reply to response to 117 Motion for reconsideration filed by Midland Credit Management, Inc., Encore Capital Group, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Seitz, Theodore) (Entered: 08/25/2008)
PACER 122 Filed: 8/19/2008, Entered: None
Opposition to 117 Motion for reconsideration filed by Zloro Johnson. (Attachments: # 1 Exh. 1, # 2 Exh. 2)(Murray, Dennis) (Entered: 08/19/2008)
PACER 121 Filed: 8/18/2008, Entered: None
Reply to Defendants' Objection to Plaintiff's Proposed Protocol and Response to Defendants' Proposed Protocol and Oppostion to Defendant's Request to Stay filed by Zloro Johnson. Related document(s) 120 .(Murray, Dennis) Modified text on 8/19/2008 (B,B). (Entered: 08/18/2008)
PACER 120 Filed: 8/6/2008, Entered: None
Objection and Supplemental Response to Plaintiff's Proposed Protocol and Notice Submitted Pursuant to This Court's July 22, 2008 Order; Request to Stay Entry of Inspection Protocol Until the Court Decides the Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration; and Proposed Inspection Protocol filed by Midland Credit Management, Inc., Encore Capital Group, Inc.. Related document(s) 113 , 119 . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Protocol) (Seitz, Theodore) Modified text on 8/6/2008 (B,B). (Entered: 08/06/2008)
PACER 119 Filed: 8/5/2008, Entered: None
Notice Regarding Proposed Inspection Protocol filed by Zloro Johnson. (Murray, Dennis) (Entered: 08/05/2008)
PACER 118 Filed: 8/5/2008, Entered: None
Memorandum in Support of their motion for reconsideration filed by Midland Credit Management, Inc., Encore Capital Group, Inc.. Related document(s) 117 . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Scotts Co., LLC v. Liberty Mutual, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Palgut v. City of Colorado Springs, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Stirewalt Declaration, # 4 Exhibit 4 - Nelski v. Trans Union) (Seitz, Theodore) Modified text on 8/6/2008 (B,B). (Entered: 08/05/2008)
PACER 117 Filed: 8/5/2008, Entered: None
Motion for reconsideration of July 22, 2008 order filed by Midland Credit Management, Inc., Encore Capital Group, Inc.. Related document(s) 113 . (Seitz, Theodore) Modified text on 8/6/2008 (B,B). (Entered: 08/05/2008)
PACER 116 Filed: 7/30/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
Order requiring Plaintff's counsel to contact Defendants' counsel within seven days of the date of this Order in an attempt to agree on a protocol for conducting additional limited discovery. By 8/6/2008, Plaintiff's counsel shall notify the court whether the parties have reached a settlement on said protocol. Signed by Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr on 7/30/2008. (D,M) (Entered: 07/30/2008)
PACER 115 Filed: 7/28/2008, Entered: None
Objection /Response to Plaintiff's Proposed Protocol filed by Midland Credit Management, Inc., Encore Capital Group, Inc.. Related document(s) 114 , 113 . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C) (Seitz, Theodore) (Entered: 07/28/2008)
PACER 114 Filed: 7/28/2008, Entered: None
Notice of Disclosure of Additional Discovery Protocol filed by Zloro Johnson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Inspection Protocol, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Jin C.V.)(Murray, Dennis) Modified text on 7/29/2008 (B,B). (Entered: 07/28/2008)
PACER 113 Filed: 7/22/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
Order The court hereby orders the parties to submit a proposed protocol with the court by July 28, 2008, which shall establish the procedures by which Plaintiff's expert will have access to Midland's computer databases. The protocol shall allow Plaintiff only restricted access to Midland's computer system and shall require Midland's programmers to be present at all times during the inspection. Plaintiff must name the expert who will be conducting the above-mentioned discovery by July 28, 2008. Such discovery shall be conducted by August 31, 2008. Plaintiff shall have until September 10, 2008, to file an expert report, and Defendant shall have until September 22, 2008, to file a rebuttal report. Signed by Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr. on 7/21/08. Related documents 110 , 111 .(K,K) (Entered: 07/22/2008)
PACER 112 Filed: 7/21/2008, Entered: None
Reply Letter in Support of Plaintiff's Request for Discovery filed by Zloro Johnson. (Murray, Dennis) (Entered: 07/21/2008)
PACER 111 Filed: 7/15/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
Letter to the Honorable Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr. in Response to Plaintiff's request for additional discovery filed by all defendants. (Related doc 7 , 12 , 82 , 94 , 96 , 101 , 108 , 110 ) (Seitz, Theodore) Modified text and links on 7/16/2008 (B, B). (Entered: 07/15/2008)
PACER 110 Filed: 7/8/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
Letter to The Honorable Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr. filed by Zloro Johnson. Related document(s) 109 . (Murray, Dennis) (Entered: 07/08/2008)
PACER 109 Filed: 7/2/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
Order/Minutes of Telephonic Status Conference held on 6/30/2008. Plaintiffs must file a motion or letter with the court outlining the details of their discovery request and the reasons for it within seven days of this Order. Defendants must file a response to said motion or letter within seven days thereafter. The court will give expedited consideration to the discovery request and opposition. Signed by Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr on 7/1/2008. (D,M) (Entered: 07/02/2008)
PACER 108 Filed: 6/24/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
Order denying Plaintiff's Renewed and Amended Motion for Class Certification (Related Doc # 96 ); and granting in part and denying in part Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Breitbart (Related Doc # 101 ). Telephone Conference with counsel for the parties set for 6/30/2008, at 4:30 PM before Judge Solomon Oliver Jr. The court will initiate this call. Signed by Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr on 6/24/2008.(D,M) (Entered: 06/24/2008)
PACER 107 Filed: 4/30/2008, Entered: None
Reply in Support of Plaintiff's Notice of Supplemental Authorities filed by Zloro Johnson. Related document(s) 105 . (Murray, Dennis) (Entered: 04/30/2008)
PACER 106 Filed: 4/21/2008, Entered: None
Response to plaintiffs' notice of supplemental authorities' filed by Midland Credit Management, Inc., Encore Capital Group, Inc.. Related document(s) 105 . (Seitz, Theodore) Modified text on 4/22/2008 (B,B). (Entered: 04/21/2008)
PACER 105 Filed: 4/11/2008, Entered: None
Notice of Supplemental Authorities filed by Zloro Johnson. (Attachments: # 1 Decision)(Murray, Dennis) (Entered: 04/11/2008)
PACER 104 Filed: 10/4/2007, Entered: None
Reply Memorandum In Support of 31 , 101 Motion to exclude the opinions and testimony of Yuri Breitbart filed by Midland Credit Management, Inc., Encore Capital Group, Inc. (E,P)Filed Under Seal. (Entered: 10/04/2007)
PACER 103 Filed: 9/24/2007, Entered: None
Opposition to 101 defendants' Motion in limine to exclude opinions and testimony of Yuri Breitbart filed by all plaintiffs. Filed Under Seal, 31 . (C,KA) (Entered: 09/24/2007)
PACER 102 Filed: 9/14/2007, Entered: None
Reply in support of 96 Renewed Motion for class certification filed by all plaintiffs. Filed Under Seal (related doc 31 ). (C,KA) (Entered: 09/14/2007)
PACER 101 Filed: 9/5/2007, Entered: None
Motion and memorandum in support to exclude opinions and testimony of Yuri Breitbart filed by all defendants. Related document(s) 31 . Filed Under Seal.(C,KA) (Entered: 09/05/2007)
PACER 100 Filed: 8/31/2007, Entered: None
Opposition to Renewed and Amended Motion for class certification filed by Midland Credit Management, Inc., Encore Capital Group, Inc.(Related doc 31 , 96 ) (Document filed under seal pursuant to Court order)(B,B) Modified to create an additional link on 8/31/2007 (B, B). (Entered: 08/31/2007)
PACER 99 Filed: 8/7/2007, Entered: None
Affidavit of Rhonda Rice filed by Zloro Johnson, Rod L. Feyedelem. Related document(s) 95 , 96 . (FILED UNDER SEAL)(E,P) (Entered: 08/16/2007)
PACER 98 Filed: 8/3/2007, Entered: None
Deposition Transcript of Richard Erick Kurt Stirewalt, Ph. D. taken on 7/16/07. filed by all plaintiffs. Related document(s) 31 . (FILED UNDER SEAL)(E,P) (Entered: 08/03/2007)
PACER 97 Filed: 8/3/2007, Entered: None
Deposition Transcript of Dr. Yuri Breitbart taken on 5/11/07. filed by all plaintiffs. Related document(s) 31 . (FILED UNDER SEAL)(E,P) (Entered: 08/03/2007)
PACER 96 Filed: 8/1/2007, Entered: None
Renewed Amended Motion (and memorandum) for class certification filed by all plaintiffs. Related document(s) 31 . Filed Under Seal.(C,KA) (Entered: 08/01/2007)
PACER 95 Filed: 7/31/2007, Entered: None
Notice of Manual Filing (Under Seal) of Plaintiff's Renewed and Amended Motion for Class Certification filed by all plaintiffs. (Murray, Dennis) Modified text on 8/2/2007 (B, B). (Entered: 07/31/2007)
PACER 94 Filed: 5/24/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
Marginal Order granting Joint Motion (Related Doc # 93 ). Expert Discovery due 7/16/2007. Plaintiff's Motion on Class Certification due 8/1/2007. Defendant's Opposition Brief due 8/31/2007. Plaintiff's Reply Brief due 9/14/2007. The pretrial and trial dates are hereby vacated and will be rescheduled after a ruling on Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification. Signed by Judge Solomon Oliver Jr. on 5/24/2007.(D,M) (Entered: 05/24/2007)
PACER 93 Filed: 5/16/2007, Entered: None
Joint Motion for Extension of Discovery, Amend Class Certification Briefing Schedule and Adjourn Pretrial and Trial dates filed by Midland Credit Management, Inc., Encore Capital Group, Inc., Zloro Johnson. (Seitz, Theodore) Modified text on 5/17/2007 (B, B). (Entered: 05/16/2007)
PACER 92 Filed: 5/15/2007, Entered: None
Witness List (Expert) filed by Midland Credit Management, Inc., Encore Capital Group, Inc.. (Seitz, Theodore) (Entered: 05/15/2007)
PACER 91 Filed: 4/4/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
Civil Trial Order. Pretrial Conference set for 10/5/2007, at 11:00 AM in Chambers 17A before Hon. Solomon Oliver Jr., and Jury Trial set for 10/29/2007, at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 17A before Hon. Solomon Oliver Jr. Signed by Judge Solomon Oliver Jr. on 4/4/2007.(D,M) (Entered: 04/04/2007)
PACER 90 Filed: 4/4/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
Order/Minutes of Telephone Conference held on 4/2/2007. Plaintiff's expert will be deposed within the next few weeks and will file their expert report by end of April. Defendants will identify their own expert, if any, by 5/15/2007. Plaintiffs' will file their motion for class certification no later than 6/1/2007. Defendants' Opposition Brief is due by 7/1/2007, and Plaintiffs' Reply Brief is due by 7/15/2007. The court grants up to 15 additional pages for each party's brief. Jury Trial set for 10/29/2007, at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 17A before Hon. Solomon Oliver Jr. and a Final Pretrial Conference is set for 10/5/2007, at 11:00 AM before Hon. Solomon Oliver Jr. Signed by Judge Solomon Oliver Jr. on 4/4/ (Entered: 04/04/2007)
PACER 89 Filed: 3/13/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
Order granting in part and denying in part Defendants' Motion to strike (Related Doc # 83 ). The Court hereby strikes Plaintiff's request for individual actual damages and all references to injunctive relief. The Court denies Defendant's request for expenses and attorney fees. A Telephone Conference set for 4/2/2007 02:00 PM in Chambers 17A before Hon. Solomon Oliver Jr. Signed by Judge Solomon Oliver Jr. on 3/12/07.(D,M) Modified text on 3/15/2007 (B, B). (Entered: 03/13/2007)
PACER 88 Filed: 2/20/2007, Entered: None
Joint Motion for extension of time until April 30, 2007 for Discovery Cutoff and Dispositive Motion deadline filed by Zloro Johnson, Midland Credit Management, Inc., Encore Capital Group, Inc.. (Seitz, Theodore) Modified text of docket entry on 2/21/2007 (B, B). (Entered: 02/20/2007)
PACER 87 Filed: 12/12/2006, Entered: None
Joint Motion for extension of Discovery and Depositions until February 28, 2007 filed by all parties. (Murray, Dennis) (Entered: 12/12/2006)
PDF 86 Filed: 10/18/2006, Entered: None
Reply to response to Motion to strike Plaintiff's Claim for Injunctive Relief and Individual Actual Damages from Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint filed by all defendants. Related document(s) 83 . (Seitz, Theodore) (Entered: 10/18/2006)
PACER 85 Filed: 10/3/2006, Entered: None
Opposition to Motion to strike Plaintiff's Claim for Injunctive Relief and Individual Actual Damages from Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint filed by Zloro Johnson. Related document(s) 83 . (Murray, Dennis) (Entered: 10/03/2006)
PACER 84 Filed: 9/18/2006, Entered: None
Answer to Second Amended Class Action Complaint and Affirmative Defenses (Related Doc # 82 ) filed by Midland Credit Management, Inc., Encore Capital Group, Inc.. (Seitz, Theodore) Modified text of docket entry on 9/25/2006 (B, B). (Entered: 09/18/2006)
PACER 83 Filed: 9/18/2006, Entered: None
Motion to strike Plaintiff's Claim for Injunctive Relief and Individual Actual Damages from Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint filed by Midland Credit Management, Inc., Encore Capital Group, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - 9/14/06 Letter# 2 Exhibit 2 - 9/15/06 Letter)(Seitz, Theodore) (Entered: 09/18/2006)
PACER 82 Filed: 8/30/2006, Entered: None Amended Complaint
Second Amended complaint (Class Action) with jury demand against all defendants. Filed by Zloro Johnson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Letter to Johnson)(Murray, Sr., Dennis) Modified text of docket entry on 8/30/2006 (B, B). (Entered: 08/30/2006)
PACER 81 Filed: 8/24/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
Order denying without prejudice Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Case Management Conference (Related Doc # 48 ), granting Plaintiff's Motion for Status Conference (Related Doc # 53 ), denying as moot Defendants' Motion to Strike (Related Doc # 54 ), granting in part and denying in part Johnson's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Related Doc # 61 ), granting in part and denying in part Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (Related Doc # 62 ), granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply (Related Doc # 78 ), denying Plaintiffs'Motion for Class Certification (Related Doc # 12 ). Telephone Conference set for 9/6/2006, at 4:00 PM before Hon. Solomon Oliver Jr. Signed by Judge Solomon Oliver Jr. on 8/23/2006. (D, M) (Entered: 08/24/2006)
PACER 80 Filed: 8/16/2006, Entered: None
Reply to response to Motion for leave to File Sur-Reply to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by all plaintiffs. Related document(s) 78 . (Murray, Sr., Dennis) (Entered: 08/16/2006)
PACER 79 Filed: 8/7/2006, Entered: None
Opposition to Motion for leave to File Sur-Reply to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Midland Credit Management, Inc., Encore Capital Group, Inc.. Related document(s) 78 . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Jacobson v Healthcare Financial)(Seitz, Theodore) (Entered: 08/07/2006)
PACER 78 Filed: 7/20/2006, Entered: None
Motion for leave to File Sur-Reply to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Zloro Johnson. Related document(s) 76 . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Murray, Sr., Dennis) Modified text of docket entry on 7/25/2006 (B, B). (Entered: 07/20/2006)
PACER 77 Filed: 7/18/2006, Entered: None
Reply to Response to Motion for partial summary judgment filed by all plaintiffs. Related document(s) 61 . (Murray, Sr., Dennis) Modified text of docket entry on 7/25/2006 (B, B). (Entered: 07/18/2006)
PACER 76 Filed: 7/17/2006, Entered: None
Reply to response to Motion for summary judgment filed by Midland Credit Management, Inc., Encore Capital Group, Inc.. Related document(s) 62 . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Crawford v Equifax# 2 Exhibit 2 - Stepney v Outsourcing Solutions)(Seitz, Theodore) (Entered: 07/17/2006)
PACER 75 Filed: 7/7/2006, Entered: None
Opposition to Motion for summary judgment filed by Midland Credit Management, Inc., Encore Capital Group, Inc.. Related document(s) 61 . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-Palmer Case# 2 Exhibit 2 - Hernandez Case)(Seitz, Theodore) (Entered: 07/07/2006)
PACER 74 Filed: 6/28/2006, Entered: None
Response in Opposition to Motion for summary judgment filed by all plaintiffs. Related document(s) 62 . (Murray, Sr., Dennis) Modified text of docket entry on 6/29/2006 (B, B). (Entered: 06/28/2006)
PACER 73 Filed: 6/22/2006, Entered: None
Joint Motion for extension of Responses to Cross Motions for Summary Judgment until July 7, 2006 (Defendants); July 10, 2006 (Plaintiffs) filed by all parties. Related document(s) 62 , 61 . (Seitz, Theodore) (Entered: 06/22/2006)
PACER 72 Filed: 5/30/2006, Entered: None
Exhibits 5, 7, 10 and 11 in support of motion for summary judgment filed by all defendants. Related document(s) 31 , 62 . Filed Under Seal. (C, K A) (Entered: 05/30/2006)
PACER 71 Filed: 5/30/2006, Entered: None
Reply to response to Motion for Status Conference and In Camera Inspection of Discovery Documents by Court to Determine Compliance with Magistrate's Order filed by all plaintiffs. Related document(s) 53 . (Murray, Sr., Dennis) (Entered: 05/30/2006)
PACER 70 Filed: 5/26/2006, Entered: None
Deposition of Kristie Stacy taken on 9/28/05. Complete document on file, 25 pages, filed by all plaintiffs. Related document(s) 59 . (C, K A) (Entered: 05/30/2006)
PACER 69 Filed: 5/26/2006, Entered: None
Deposition of Michael Hennessy taken on 4/19/06. Complete document on file, 201 pages, filed by all plaintiffs. Related document(s) 59 . (C, K A) (Entered: 05/30/2006)
PACER 68 Filed: 5/26/2006, Entered: None
Deposition of Lisa Steen taken on 10/19/05. Complete document on file, 80 pages, filed by all plaintiffs. Related document(s) 59 . (C, K A) (Entered: 05/30/2006)
PACER 67 Filed: 5/26/2006, Entered: None
Deposition of Nayri Rita Melconian taken on 10/18/05. Complete document on file, 127 pages, filed by all plaintiffs. Related document(s) 59 . (C, K A) (Entered: 05/30/2006)
PACER 66 Filed: 5/26/2006, Entered: None
Deposition of Zloro D. Johnson taken on 9/27/05. Complete document on file, 85 pages, filed by all plaintiffs. Related document(s) 59 . (C, K A) (Entered: 05/30/2006)
PACER 65 Filed: 5/26/2006, Entered: None
Deposition of Brian Frary taken on 10/18/05. Complete document on file, 98 pages, filed by all plaintiffs. Related document(s) 59 . (C, K A) (Entered: 05/30/2006)
PACER 64 Filed: 5/26/2006, Entered: None
Address Change Notice filed by Theodore W. Seitz on behalf of Midland Credit Management, Inc., Encore Capital Group, Inc.. (Seitz, Theodore) Modified text of docket entry on 5/31/2006 (B, B). (Entered: 05/26/2006)
PACER 63 Filed: 5/26/2006, Entered: None
Memorandum In Support of Motion for summary judgment filed by Midland Credit Management, Inc., Encore Capital Group, Inc.. Related document(s) 62 . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Johnson Deposition# 2 Exhibit 2 - Feyedelem Deposition# 3 Exhibit 3 - Frary Deposition# 4 Exhibit 4 - Johnson's Responses to Admissions# 5 Exhibit 5 - under seal# 6 Exhibit 6 - Melconian Deposition# 7 Exhibit 7- under seal# 8 Exhibit 8 - Feyedelem's Responses to Admissions# 9 Exhibit 9 - Steen Deposition# 10 Exhibit 10 - under seal# 11 Exhibit 11 - under seal# 12 Exhibit 12 - Hennessy Deposition)(Seitz, Theodore) Modified text of docket entry on 5/31/2006 (B, B). (Entered: 05/26/2006)
PACER 62 Filed: 5/26/2006, Entered: None Motion for Summary Judgment
Motion for summary judgment filed by Midland Credit Management, Inc., Encore Capital Group, Inc.. (Seitz, Theodore) (Entered: 05/26/2006)
PACER 61 Filed: 5/26/2006, Entered: None Motion for Summary Judgment
Motion for summary judgment on liability with memorandum in support filed by Zloro Johnson, Rod L. Feyedelem. (Related Document# 31 , 58 )) (FILED UNDER SEAL)(E, P) Modified on 5/26/2006 (E, P). (Entered: 05/26/2006)
PACER 60 Filed: 5/25/2006, Entered: None
Reply to response to Motion to strike Plaintiffs' Alleged Damages, Or In the Alternative To Compel, And For Sanctions filed by Midland Credit Management, Inc., Encore Capital Group, Inc.. Related document(s) 54 . (Seitz, Theodore) (Entered: 05/25/2006)
PACER 59 Filed: 5/25/2006, Entered: None
Notice of Manual Filing of Depositions filed by all plaintiffs. (Murray, Sr., Dennis) (Entered: 05/25/2006)
PACER 58 Filed: 5/25/2006, Entered: None
Notice of Manual Filing (Under Seal) of Plaintiff Johnson's Motion and Memorandum for Partial Summary Judgment on Liability filed by all plaintiffs. Related document(s) 31 . (Murray, Sr., Dennis) (Entered: 05/25/2006)
PACER 57 Filed: 5/18/2006, Entered: None
Response to Motion for Status Conference and In Camera Inspection of Discovery Documents by Court to Determine Compliance with Magistrate's Order filed by all defendants. Related document(s) 53 . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit Exhibit D)(Seitz, Theodore) (Entered: 05/18/2006)
PACER 56 Filed: 5/11/2006, Entered: None
Response to Motion to strike Plaintiffs' Alleged Damages, Or In the Alternative To Compel, And For Sanctions filed by all plaintiffs. Related document(s) 54 . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit 5)(Murray, Sr., Dennis) (Entered: 05/11/2006)
PACER 55 Filed: 5/1/2006, Entered: None
Brief Defendants' Brief In Support of Their Motion To Strike Plaintiffs' Alleged Damages, Or In the Alternative To Compel, And For Sanctions filed by all defendants. Related document(s) 54 . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit G# 8 Exhibit H# 9 Exhibit I# 10 Exhibit J# 11 Exhibit K) (Seitz, Theodore) Modified text of docket entry on 5/2/2006 (B, B). (Entered: 05/01/2006)
PACER 54 Filed: 5/1/2006, Entered: None
Motion to strike Plaintiffs' Alleged Damages, Or In the Alternative To Compel, And For Sanctions filed by all defendants. (Seitz, Theodore) (Entered: 05/01/2006)
PACER 53 Filed: 5/1/2006, Entered: None
Motion for Status Conference and In Camera Inspection of Discovery Documents by Court to Determine Compliance with Magistrate's Order filed by all plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Murray, Sr., Dennis) (Entered: 05/01/2006)
PACER 52 Filed: 4/26/2006, Entered: None
Subpoena Returned Executed; served upon PSC Info Group by personal service through Marle Gunning on March 20, 2006 filed by all plaintiffs (Murray, Sr., Dennis) Modified text of docket entry on 4/27/2006 (B, B). (Entered: 04/26/2006)
PACER 51 Filed: 4/25/2006, Entered: None
Reply to response to Motion to amend Case Management Conference Order filed by all plaintiffs. Related document(s) 48 . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - 3/28/06 Letter to Seitz)(Murray, Sr., Dennis) Modified text of docket entry on 4/26/2006 (B, B). (Entered: 04/25/2006)
PACER 50 Filed: 4/10/2006, Entered: None
Brief in Opposition to motion to amend the case management conference order filed by Midland Credit Management, Inc., Encore Capital Group, Inc.. Related document(s) 48 . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - letter# 2 Exhibit B - responses to admissions# 3 Exhibit C - letter# 4 Exhibit D - Haynes case) (Seitz, Theodore) Modified text of docket entry on 4/11/2006 (B, B). (Entered: 04/10/2006)
PACER 49 Filed: 4/5/2006, Entered: None
Joint Motion for extension of discovery deadline from March 31, 2006 until April 19, 2006 filed by all parties. Related document(s) 17 . (Murray, Sr., Dennis) Modified text of docket entry on 4/7/2006 (B, B). (Entered: 04/05/2006)
PACER 48 Filed: 3/22/2006, Entered: None Motion to Amend/Correct
Motion to amend Case Management Conference Order filed by all plaintiffs. Related document(s) 17 . (Murray, Sr., Dennis) Modified text of docket entry on 3/23/2006 (B, B). (Entered: 03/22/2006)
PACER 47 Filed: 3/16/2006, Entered: None
Reply in Support of Objections to Magistrate's Order filed by all plaintiffs. Related document(s) 44 . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1) (Murray, Sr., Dennis) Modified text of docket entry on 3/17/2006 (B, B). (Entered: 03/16/2006)
PACER 46 Filed: 3/14/2006, Entered: None
Subpoena Returned Executed; served upon Moore Wallace North America Inc. by Private Process Server on 11/14/05 filed by all plaintiffs (Murray, Sr., Dennis) (Entered: 03/14/2006)
PACER 45 Filed: 3/2/2006, Entered: None
Response To Plaintiffs' Partial Objections To The Magistrate's Order Denying Plaintiffs' Leave To File A Second Amended Complaint filed by Midland Credit Management, Inc., Encore Capital Group, Inc.. Related document(s) 43 , 44 . (Seitz, Theodore) Modified text of docket entry on 3/3/2006 (B, B). (Entered: 03/02/2006)
PACER 44 Filed: 2/13/2006, Entered: None
Objection to Magistrate's Order filed by all plaintiffs. Related document(s) 43 . (Murray, Sr., Dennis) (Entered: 02/13/2006)
PACER 43 Filed: 1/30/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
Memorandum Opinion and Order. The plaintiffs motion 34 for leave to file a second amended complaint is denied. The motion 33 to compel is granted in part and denied in part, with the request for sanctions denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Perelman on 1/30/06. (W, Jo) (Entered: 01/31/2006)
PACER 42 Filed: 1/9/2006, Entered: None
Reply to response to Motion for Leave to file Second Amended Class Action Complaint filed by all plaintiffs. Related document(s) 34 . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4)(Murray, Sr., Dennis) Modified text of docket entry on 1/10/2006 (B, B). (Entered: 01/09/2006)
PACER 41 Filed: 1/6/2006, Entered: None
Reply to response to Motion to compel discovery and Sanctions filed by all plaintiffs. Related document(s) 33 . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit 5# 6 Exhibit 6# 7 Exhibit 7# 8 Exhibit 8# 9 Exhibit 9# 10 Exhibit 10# 11 Exhibit 11)(Murray, Sr., Dennis) (Entered: 01/06/2006)
PACER 40 Filed: 1/6/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
Order referring case to Magistrate Judge David S. Perelman for an expedited ruling on Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Class Action Complaint (ECF 34 ). Signed by Judge Solomon Oliver Jr. on 1/6/2006. (D, M) (Entered: 01/06/2006)
PACER 39 Filed: 12/27/2005, Entered: None
Opposition to Motion to compel discovery and Sanctions filed by Midland Credit Management, Inc., Encore Capital Group, Inc.. Related document(s) 33 . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit 5# 6 Exhibit 6# 7 Exhibit 7# 8 Exhibit 8# 9 Exhibit 9# 10 Exhibit 10)(Seitz, Theodore) (Entered: 12/27/2005)
PACER 38 Filed: 12/27/2005, Entered: None
Opposition to Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Midland Credit Management, Inc., Encore Capital Group, Inc.. Related document(s) 34 . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit 5)(Seitz, Theodore) Modified text of docket entry on 12/28/2005 (B, B). (Entered: 12/27/2005)
PACER 37 Filed: 12/22/2005, Entered: None
Joint Motion to Vacate Hearing and Stay Briefing on Class Certification Pending Resolution of Motions to Compel and Leave to File Second Amended Class Action Complaint filed by all parties. Related document(s) 17 , 35 , 36 . (Seitz, Theodore) Modified text on 12/23/2005 (H, D). (Entered: 12/22/2005)
PACER 36 Filed: 12/22/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
Order referring case to Magistrate Judge David S. Perelman to rule on Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Discovery, after full briefing. Signed by Judge Solomon Oliver Jr. on 12/22/2005. (D, M) (Entered: 12/22/2005)
PACER 35 Filed: 12/19/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
Marginal Order granting Motion to continue (Related Doc # 32 ).Hearing on Class Certification set for 1/12/2006, at 10:00 AM in Chambers 17A before Hon. Solomon Oliver Jr. Signed by Judge Solomon Oliver Jr. on 12/19/2005. (D, M) (Entered: 12/19/2005)
PACER 34 Filed: 12/8/2005, Entered: None
Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Class Action Complaint filed by all plaintiffs. Related document(s) 7 . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Second Amended Complaint# 2 Exhibit Letter to Johnson# 3 Exhibit Letter to Feyedelem)(Murray, Sr., Dennis) Modified text on 12/9/2005 (E, P). (Entered: 12/08/2005)
PACER 33 Filed: 12/8/2005, Entered: None Motion to Compel
Motion to compel discovery and Sanctions filed by all plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit 5# 6 Exhibit # 7 Exhibit 7# 8 Exhibit 8)(Murray, Sr., Dennis) (Entered: 12/08/2005)
PACER 32 Filed: 12/7/2005, Entered: None
Joint Motion to continue Hearing on Class Certification and to Amend Briefing Schedule filed by all parties. Related document(s) 17 . (Murray, Sr., Dennis) (Entered: 12/07/2005)
PACER 31 Filed: 11/17/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by Judge Solomon Oliver Jr. on 11/17/2005. (D, M) (Entered: 11/17/2005)
PACER 30 Filed: 11/16/2005, Entered: None
Subpoena Returned Executed; served upon PSC INFO GROUP by Damien Riccitelli, Process Server on November 3, 2005 filed by all plaintiffs (Murray, Sr., Dennis) (Entered: 11/16/2005)
PACER 29 Filed: 11/7/2005, Entered: None
Motion for 30 day extension of time to file supplement to motion for class certification filed by all plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Murray, Sr., Dennis) Modified text 11/15/2005 (C, K A). (Entered: 11/07/2005)
PACER 28 Filed: 11/4/2005, Entered: None
Proposed Stipulated Protective Order filed by Midland Credit Management, Inc., Encore Capital Group, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Seitz, Theodore) Modified text of docket entry on 11/10/2005 (B, B). (Entered: 11/04/2005)
PACER 27 Filed: 10/17/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
Minutes of proceedings. Interim Pretrial Conference held on 10/17/05 before Magistrate Judge Perelman. Settlement conference cancelled. File returned to Judge Oliver for determination re cross. Magistrate Judge David S. Perelman, (G, S) (Entered: 10/17/2005)
PACER 26 Filed: 10/11/2005, Entered: None
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Plaintiffs' Motion to Continue Pretrial filed by all plaintiffs. Related document(s) 22 . (Murray, Sr., Dennis) (Entered: 10/11/2005)
PACER 25 Filed: 10/6/2005, Entered: None
Notice to take Deposition of a representative of Midland Credit Management, Inc. per Federal Rule 30(b)(6) on October 18 and/or 19, 2005 filed by all plaintiffs. (Murray, Sr., Dennis) (Entered: 10/06/2005)
PACER 24 Filed: 10/6/2005, Entered: None
Notice to take Deposition of Lisa Steen on October 19, 2005 filed by all plaintiffs. (Murray, Sr., Dennis) (Entered: 10/06/2005)
PACER 23 Filed: 10/6/2005, Entered: None
Notice to take Deposition of Rita Melconian on October 18, 2005 filed by all plaintiffs. (Murray, Sr., Dennis) (Entered: 10/06/2005)
PACER 22 Filed: 10/4/2005, Entered: None
Motion to continue Pretrial filed by all plaintiffs. Related document(s) 21 . (Murray, Sr., Dennis) (Entered: 10/04/2005)
PACER 21 Filed: 10/4/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
Notice of Pretrial set for Monday, October 17, 2005 at 2:30 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Perelman in Chambers 11A. Counsel only to attend. Magistrate Judge David S. Perelman, (G, S) (Entered: 10/04/2005)
PACER 20 Filed: 9/19/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
Marginal Order denying Plaintiff's Motion to Shorten Time Period for Defendants' response to discovery requests (Related Doc # 18 ) however, the court extends the time for Plaintiffs to supplement their motion for class certification as follows: Plaintiffs may supplement its motion for class certification by 11/8/2005. Defendants must respond by 11/22/2005. Plaintiff's reply is due by 12/2/2005. Signed by Judge Solomon Oliver Jr. on 9/19/2005.(D, M) (Entered: 09/19/2005)
PACER 19 Filed: 9/16/2005, Entered: None
Opposition to Motion for Shortening Time Period for Defendants' Response to Discovery Requests filed by Midland Credit Management, Inc., Encore Capital Group, Inc.. Related document(s) 18 . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Plaintiffs' First Interrogatories to Midland Credit Management# 2 Exhibit Plaintiffs' First Interrogatories to Encore Capital Group, Inc.# 3 Exhibit Plaintiffs' First Request for Production of Documents to Midland Credit Management and Encore Capital Group# 4 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Requests for Admissions to Midland Credit Management and Encore Capital Group# 5 Exhibit Gucci America, Inc. v. Daffy's, Inc.)(Seitz, Theodore) (Entered: 09/16/2005)
PACER 18 Filed: 9/1/2005, Entered: None
Motion for Shortening Time Period until 9/19/05 for Defendants' Response to Discovery Requests filed by all plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Murray, Sr., Dennis) Modified text on 9/16/2005 (E, P). (Entered: 09/01/2005)
PACER 17 Filed: 8/12/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
Case Management Conference Order/Minutes of Case Management Conference held on 8/11/2005 before Judge Solomon Oliver Jr. Discovery due by 3/31/2006; Parties to be Joined and Pleading Amendments due by 9/26/2005; Dispositive Motions due by 5/26/2006. Hearing on Motion for Class Certification set for 12/8/2005, at 10:00 AM in Chambers 17A before Hon. Solomon Oliver Jr. Settlement Conference set for 10/27/2005, at 1:30 PM in Chambers 11A before Mag. David S. Perelman. Signed by Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr., on 8/12/2005 (D, M) (Entered: 08/12/2005)
PACER 16 Filed: 8/4/2005, Entered: None
Motion to excuse appearance of Defendants' Representative from August 11, 2005 Case Management Conference filed by Midland Credit Management, Inc., Encore Capital Group, Inc.. Related document(s) 11 . (Seitz, Theodore) (Entered: 08/04/2005)
PACER 15 Filed: 8/4/2005, Entered: None
Unopposed Motion for extension of time until 8/19/05 to Respond to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification until August 19, 2005 filed by Midland Credit Management, Inc., Encore Capital Group, Inc. Related document(s) 12 . (Seitz, Theodore) Modified on 8/15/2005 (H, D). (Entered: 08/04/2005)
PACER 14 Filed: 8/4/2005, Entered: None
Report of Parties' Planning Meeting Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) and L.R. 16.3(b) filed by all plaintiffs. (Murray, Sr., Dennis) (Entered: 08/04/2005)
PACER 13 Filed: 7/28/2005, Entered: None
Motion to excuse appearance of Named Plaintiffs from Attendance at August 11, 2005 Case Management Conference filed by all plaintiffs. Related document(s) 11 . (Murray, Sr., Dennis) (Entered: 07/28/2005)
PACER 12 Filed: 7/27/2005, Entered: None
Motion for class certification filed by all plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Brief in Support of Class Certification)(Murray, Sr., Dennis) (Entered: 07/27/2005)
PACER 11 Filed: 7/26/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with case management conference to be held on 8/11/2005 at 02:00 PM at Chambers 17A before Hon. Solomon Oliver Jr. Signed by Judge Solomon Oliver Jr. on 7/26/2005. (D, M) (Entered: 07/26/2005)
PACER 10 Filed: 7/19/2005, Entered: None
Motion for leave to Exceed Page Limitation filed by all plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Murray, Sr., Dennis) (Entered: 07/19/2005)
PACER 9 Filed: 6/30/2005, Entered: None
Notice of Magistrate Consent form (D, M) (Entered: 06/30/2005)
PACER 8 Filed: 6/6/2005, Entered: None
Defendants' Answer to Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defendants (Related Doc # 7 ) filed by Midland Credit Management, Inc., Encore Capital Group, Inc.. (McAllister, Lori) (Entered: 06/06/2005)
PACER 7 Filed: 5/25/2005, Entered: None Amended Complaint
First Amended complaint with jury demand against all defendants. Filed by Zloro Johnson and new party plaintiff Rod L. Feyedelem. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Murray, Sr., Dennis) Modified text of docket entry on 6/23/2005 (B, B). (Entered: 05/25/2005)
PACER 6 Filed: 5/5/2005, Entered: None
Motion for appearance pro hac vice of Lori McAllister filed by all defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit# 2 Proposed Order)(C, K A) (Entered: 05/06/2005)
PACER 5 Filed: 5/5/2005, Entered: None
Motion for appearance pro hac vice of Theodore Seitz filed by all defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit# 2 Proposed Order)(C, K A) (Entered: 05/06/2005)
PACER 4 Filed: 5/4/2005, Entered: None
Unopposed Motion for extension of time until 06/06/2005 to move, plead or otherwise respond to plaintiff's complaint filed by all defendants. (Thacker, William) Modified text of docket entry on 5/12/2005 (B, B). (Entered: 05/04/2005)
PACER 3 Filed: 4/29/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge Perelman. (R, Ci) (Entered: 05/03/2005)
PACER 2 Filed: 4/29/2005, Entered: None
Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Midland Credit Management, Inc. (R, Ci) (Entered: 05/03/2005)
PACER 1 Filed: 4/29/2005, Entered: None
Notice of Removal by Midland Credit Management, Inc., Encore Capital Group, Inc. Filing fee paid; receipt number 320078. (jury demand filed with complaint) (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(R, Ci) (Entered: 05/03/2005)

Statistics

This case has been viewed 346 times.

No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Need Password Help?