Patrick A. Pelar
Pennsylvania Middle Bankruptcy Court, Case No. 1:10-bk-07299
District Judge Mary D France, presiding
docket://gov.uscourts.pamb.1-10-bk-07299 (What is this?)

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
The right information can save you thousands of dollars.
Access comprehensive profiles on judges, firms, lawyers, and more with PlainSite Pro and Pro Se.
No Logo Charles J. DeHart, III (Trustee), Trustee
No Logo DeAnn M. Pelar, Joint Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Douglas R Roeder +1 717 233 1151 +1 717 238 2946 droeder1@comcast.net
No Logo Patrick A. Pelar, Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Douglas R Roeder +1 717 233 1151 +1 717 238 2946 droeder1@comcast.net
Office of the United States Trustee, Asst. U.S. Trustee
  Entries (33) Calendar Events Related (0) Tools Right End
PACER 33 Filed: 12/19/2010, Entered: None
BNC Certificate of Mailing. (RE: related document(s) 32 ). Service Date 12/19/2010. (Admin.) (Entered: 12/20/2010)
PACER 32 Filed: 12/17/2010, Entered: None
Order Dismissing Case (RE: related document(s) 16 , 31 ). (Rushow, Brian) (Entered: 12/17/2010)
PACER 31 Filed: 12/15/2010, Entered: None
Order Denying Motion For Exemption from Credit Counseling (RE: related document(s) 25 ). (Rushow, Brian) (Entered: 12/16/2010)
PACER 30 Filed: 12/15/2010, Entered: None
BNC Certificate of Mailing of Notice of Intent to Dismiss for nonappearance at 341 meeting. (RE: related document(s) 28 ). Service Date 12/15/2010. (Admin.) (Entered: 12/16/2010)
PACER 29 Filed: 12/15/2010, Entered: None
Proceeding Memo re: Hearing on Motion for Exemption from Credit Counseling; held. Record Made. Motion denied. Court to enter order. Appearances: Douglas Roeder. Non-Appearances:. (There is no image or paper document associated with this entry.) (RE: related document(s) 25 ). (Goodling, Joan) (Entered: 12/15/2010)
PACER 28 Filed: 12/13/2010, Entered: None
Certification that Debtor and Joint Debtor, without excuse, failed to appear at the 341 meeting. Notice sent to all creditors.. Objections due by 1/6/2011. (dehart, III(cm), Charles) (Entered: 12/13/2010)
PACER 27 Filed: 12/9/2010, Entered: None
BNC Certificate of Mailing of Notice to Parties of Hearing (RE: related document(s) 26 ). Service Date 12/09/2010. (Admin.) (Entered: 12/10/2010)
PACER 26 Filed: 12/7/2010, Entered: None
Request to BNC - Notice to parties scheduling hearing (RE: related document(s) 25 ). Hearing scheduled for 12/15/2010 at 09:30 AM at 3rd & Walnut Sts., Bankruptcy Courtroom (3rd Floor), Ronald Reagan Federal Building, Harrisburg, PA. (Rushow, Brian) (Entered: 12/07/2010)
PACER 25 Filed: 12/2/2010, Entered: None
Motion for Exemption from Credit Counseling Due to Exigent Circumstances Filed by Douglas R Roeder of Law Office of Douglas R. Roeder on behalf of DeAnn M. Pelar, Patrick A. Pelar (RE: related document(s) 1 ). (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order # 2 Certificate of Service) (Roeder, Douglas) (Entered: 12/02/2010)
PACER 24 Filed: 12/1/2010, Entered: None
Proceeding Memo re: Hearing on Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Comply with Credit Counseling Requirements; held. Record Made. Debtors given five (5) days to file Motion for Waiver of Credit Counseling Requirements which is to be set for hearing. Appearances: Douglas Roeder and Charles J. DeHart, III, Trustee. Non-Appearances:. (There is no image or paper document associated with this entry.) (RE: related document(s) 16 ). (Goodling, Joan) (Entered: 12/01/2010)
PACER 23 Filed: 11/21/2010, Entered: None
Correspondence regarding notice of mortgage payment change. Filed by Joseph P Schalk of Phelan Hallinan & Schmieg, LLP on behalf of PHH Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service # 2 Exhibit A) (Schalk, Joseph) (Entered: 11/21/2010)
PACER 22 Filed: 11/11/2010, Entered: None
BNC Certificate of Mailing of Notice to Parties of Hearing (RE: related document(s) 21 ). Service Date 11/11/2010. (Admin.) (Entered: 11/12/2010)
PACER 21 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: None
Request to BNC - Notice to parties scheduling hearing (RE: related document(s) 16 , 19 ). Hearing scheduled for 12/1/2010 at 09:30 AM at 3rd & Walnut Sts., Bankruptcy Courtroom (3rd Floor), Ronald Reagan Federal Building, Harrisburg, PA. (Rushow, Brian) (Entered: 11/09/2010)
PACER 20 Filed: 11/4/2010, Entered: None
BNC Certificate of Mailing of Continued 341 Meeting (RE: related document(s) 18 ). Service Date 11/04/2010. (Admin.) (Entered: 11/05/2010)
PACER 19 Filed: 11/2/2010, Entered: None
Answer to Trustee's Motion to Dismiss for Failure to Obtain Credit Counseling Filed by Douglas R Roeder of Law Office of Douglas R. Roeder on behalf of DeAnn M. Pelar, Patrick A. Pelar (RE: related document(s) 16 ). (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service # 2 Proposed Order) (Roeder, Douglas) (Entered: 11/02/2010)
PACER 18 Filed: 11/1/2010, Entered: None
Certification that Debtor and Joint Debtor, without excuse, failed to appear at the 341 meeting. Meeting of Creditors Continued. Notice sent to all Creditors.. 341(a) meeting to be held 12/9/2010 at 12:00 PM at Federal Bldg, Trustee Hearing Rm, Rm 1160, 11th Fl, 228 Walnut St, Harrisburg, PA. (dehart, III(cm), Charles) (Entered: 11/01/2010)
PACER 17 Filed: 10/14/2010, Entered: None
BNC Certificate of Mailing. (RE: related document(s) 16 ). Service Date 10/14/2010. (Admin.) (Entered: 10/15/2010)
PACER 16 Filed: 10/12/2010, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
Motion to Dismiss Case for failure to comply with the credit counseling requirements of 11 U.S.C. Sections 109(h) and 521(b) of the Bankruptcy Code . Notice sent to all creditors. Filed by Trustee. Objections due by 11/5/2010. (dehart, III(dr), Charles) (Entered: 10/12/2010)
PACER 15 Filed: 10/6/2010, Entered: None
Tax Documents for the Year for 2009 (Document is restricted and can only be viewed by Court staff.) Filed by Douglas R Roeder of Law Office of Douglas R. Roeder on behalf of DeAnn M. Pelar, Patrick A. Pelar. (Roeder, Douglas) (Entered: 10/06/2010)
PACER 14 Filed: 10/5/2010, Entered: None
Chapter 13 Plan (Includes no Motion(s) to Avoid Liens and no Motion(s) to Value Collateral) Filed by Douglas R Roeder of Law Office of Douglas R. Roeder on behalf of DeAnn M. Pelar, Patrick A. Pelar (RE: related document(s) 1 ). (Roeder, Douglas) (Entered: 10/05/2010)
PACER 13 Filed: 10/5/2010, Entered: None
Employee Income Records (Payment Advices) Filed by Douglas R Roeder of Law Office of Douglas R. Roeder on behalf of Patrick A. Pelar. (Roeder, Douglas) (Entered: 10/05/2010)
PACER 12 Filed: 10/5/2010, Entered: None
Employee Income Records (Payment Advices) Filed by Douglas R Roeder of Law Office of Douglas R. Roeder on behalf of DeAnn M. Pelar. (Roeder, Douglas) (Entered: 10/05/2010)
PACER 11 Filed: 10/5/2010, Entered: None
Schedules A through J and Summary of Schedules , Statement of Financial Affairs , Statistical Summary of Certain Liabilities , Notice to Individual Consumer Debtor , Statement of Disclosure of Compensation , Chapter 13 Statement of Current Monthly Income and Disposable Monthly Income - Form 22C . Filed by Douglas R Roeder of Law Office of Douglas R. Roeder on behalf of DeAnn M. Pelar, Patrick A. Pelar. (Roeder, Douglas) (Entered: 10/05/2010)
PACER 10 Filed: 9/29/2010, Entered: None
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time to file schedules or provide required information (RE: related document(s) 9 ). Clerks Office Follow-Up Due by 10/5/2010. (Rushow, Brian) (Entered: 09/29/2010)
PACER 9 Filed: 9/20/2010, Entered: None
Motion to Extend Time to file schedules or provide required information Filed by Douglas R Roeder of Law Office of Douglas R. Roeder on behalf of DeAnn M. Pelar, Patrick A. Pelar. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order # 2 Certificate of Service) (Roeder, Douglas) (Entered: 09/20/2010)
PACER 8 Filed: 9/16/2010, Entered: None
BNC Certificate of Mailing of Notice of Deficient Filing (Missing Documents) (RE: related document(s) 6 ). Service Date 09/16/2010. (Admin.) (Entered: 09/17/2010)
PACER 7 Filed: 9/15/2010, Entered: None
BNC Certificate of Mailing of 341 Meeting Notice (Chapter 13) (RE: related document(s) 3 ). Service Date 09/15/2010. (Admin.) (Entered: 09/16/2010)
PACER 6 Filed: 9/14/2010, Entered: None
Notice of missing documents (RE: related document(s) 1 ). (Rushow, Brian) (Entered: 09/14/2010)
PACER 5 Filed: 9/13/2010, Entered: None
Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Douglas R Roeder of Law Office of Douglas R. Roeder on behalf of DeAnn M. Pelar (RE: related document(s) 1 ). (Roeder, Douglas) (Entered: 09/13/2010)
PACER 4 Filed: 9/13/2010, Entered: None
Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Douglas R Roeder of Law Office of Douglas R. Roeder on behalf of Patrick A. Pelar (RE: related document(s) 1 ). (Roeder, Douglas) (Entered: 09/13/2010)
PACER 3 Filed: 9/11/2010, Entered: None
341(a) meeting to be held on 10/28/2010 at 11:00AM at Federal Bldg, Trustee Hearing Rm, Rm 1160, 11th Fl, 228 Walnut St, Harrisburg, PA Proofs of Claim due by 01/26/2011. Objections to Dischargeability due by 12/27/2010(Docketer, Automatic) (Entered: 09/11/2010)
PACER 2 Filed: 9/7/2010, Entered: None
Matrix filed/Creditor List Uploaded. (There is no image or paper document associated with this entry.) Filed by Douglas R Roeder of Law Office of Douglas R. Roeder on behalf of DeAnn M. Pelar, Patrick A. Pelar (RE: related document(s) 1 ). (Roeder, Douglas) (Entered: 09/07/2010)
PACER 1 Filed: 9/7/2010, Entered: None
Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition . Filing fee due in the amount of $ 274.00 Filed by Douglas R Roeder of Law Office of Douglas R. Roeder on behalf of Patrick A. Pelar, DeAnn M. Pelar. (Roeder, Douglas) (Entered: 09/07/2010)

Statistics

This case has been viewed 53 times.

No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Need Password Help?