ALDO FLAVIO SESSAREGO ALAYZA
Puerto Rico Bankruptcy Court, Case No. 10-09751
District Judge Bankruptcy BRIAN K. TESTER, presiding
docket://gov.uscourts.prb.10-09751 (What is this?)

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
This docket can only tell you so much. Get the rest.
Access comprehensive profiles on judges, firms, lawyers, and more with PlainSite Pro and Pro Se.
No Logo ALDO FLAVIO SESSAREGO ALAYZA, Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by PUBLIC INTREST ENVIRONMENTAL LAW

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
JUAN O CALDERON LITHGOW +1 787 858 5476 juan004@prtc.net
No Logo OLGA SANTIAGO CANO, Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by PUBLIC INTREST ENVIRONMENTAL LAW

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
JUAN O CALDERON LITHGOW +1 787 858 5476 juan004@prtc.net
No Logo ALEJANDRO OLIVERAS RIVERA, Trustee

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
JOSE L JIMENEZ QUINONES +1 787 282 9009 +1 866 326 9416 jljimenez11@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Alejandro Oliveras-Rivera Chapter 13 Trustee Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
HERMAN VALENTIN FIGUEROA +1 787 250 8983 aor@ch13sju.com
No Logo WIGBERTO LUGO MENDER, Trustee
No Logo MIGDALIA VEGA GARCIA, Joint Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by PUBLIC INTREST ENVIRONMENTAL LAW

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
JUAN O CALDERON LITHGOW +1 787 858 5476 juan004@prtc.net
No Logo MONSITA LECAROZ ARRIBAS, U.S. Trustee
  Entries (33) Calendar Events Related (0) Tools Right End
PACER 33 Filed: 10/26/2010, Entered: None
Report on Unclaimed Monies. CITIFINANCIAL F/K/A ASSOCIATES FINANCE $590.47 filed by ALEJANDRO OLIVERAS RIVERA (LVB) (OLIVERAS RIVERA (LVB), ALEJANDRO) (Entered: 10/26/2010)
PACER 32 Filed: 10/19/2010, Entered: None
Report on Unclaimed Monies. CITIFINANCIAL F/K/A ASSOCIATES FINANCE $68.76 filed by ALEJANDRO OLIVERAS RIVERA (LVB) (OLIVERAS RIVERA (LVB), ALEJANDRO) (Entered: 10/19/2010)
PACER 31 Filed: 7/3/2010, Entered: None
Certificate of service (RE: related document(s) 30 ) Service Date 07/03/2010. (Admin.) (Entered: 07/04/2010)
PACER 30 Filed: 6/30/2010, Entered: None
Transfer of Claim Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferor: BANCO POPULAR DE PR (Claim No. 2) To JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS LLC. Filed by JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS LLC (PAYMENT, AMY) (Entered: 06/30/2010)
PACER 29 Filed: 4/28/2010, Entered: None
Certificate of service (RE: related document(s) 28 ) Service Date 04/28/2010. (Admin.) (Entered: 04/29/2010)
PACER 28 Filed: 4/23/2010, Entered: None
Transfer of Claim Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferor: R&G PREMIER BANK OF PUERTO RICO (Claim No. 4) To PR ACQUISITIONS LLC To PR ACQUISITIONS LLC250 MUNOZ RIVERA AVENUE SUITE 1200HATO REY, P.R. 00918. Filed by PR ACQUISITIONS LLC (SILVA, JESSICA) (Entered: 04/23/2010)
PACER 27 Filed: 11/5/2009, Entered: None
Withdrawal of Claim. 6. Filed by PR ACQUISITIONS LLC (ORTIZ, ELISANDRA) (Entered: 11/05/2009)
PACER 26 Filed: 10/28/2009, Entered: None
Receipt of Unclaimed - $122.02 by . Receipt Number 00405679. (Entered: 10/29/2009)
PACER 25 Filed: 10/16/2009, Entered: None
Report on Unclaimed Monies. CITIFINANCIAL F/K/A ASSOCIATES FINANCE $122.02, filed by ALEJANDRO OLIVERAS RIVERA (LVB) on behalf of ALEJANDRO OLIVERAS RIVERA (OLIVERAS RIVERA (LVB), ALEJANDRO) (Entered: 10/16/2009)
PACER 24 Filed: 1/22/2008, Entered: None
Motion to withdraw PROOF OF CLAIM No. 7 filed by MARICARMEN COLON DIAZ on behalf of BANCO SANTANDER PR [COLON DIAZ, MARICARMEN] (Entered: 01/22/2008)
PACER 23 Filed: 12/6/2007, Entered: None
Certificate of service (RE: related document(s) 22 ) Service Date 12/06/2007. (Admin.) (Entered: 12/07/2007)
PACER 22 Filed: 12/4/2007, Entered: None
ORDER CONFIRMING PLAN DATED 10/22/07 signed on 12/4/2007 (RE: related document(s) 16 ).(ROSADO LOZA, CARMINA) (Entered: 12/04/2007)
PACER 21 Filed: 11/27/2007, Entered: None
Minutes of Hearing held on: 11/27/2007 Subject: *CONF* CONFIRMATION OF AMENDED PLAN DATED 10/22/07 and *OTSC* ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND DEBTOR'S REPLY. (vCal Hearing ID (1064394)). (related document(s) 15 , 16 ) (VEGA VEGA, WENDY) (Entered: 12/03/2007)
PACER 20 Filed: 1/18/2011, Entered: None
BNC Notice (RE: related document(s) 19 ) (ROMO, JOSE) (Entered: 01/18/2011)
PACER 19 Filed: 1/18/2011, Entered: None
DISCHARGE OF DEBTOR AND JOINT DEBTOR signed on 1/18/2011 .(ROMO, JOSE) (Entered: 01/18/2011)
PACER 18 Filed: 1/7/2011, Entered: None
Certificate of service (RE: related document(s) 15 ) Service Date 01/07/2011. (Admin.) (Entered: 01/08/2011)
PACER 17 Filed: 1/7/2011, Entered: None
Certificate of service (RE: related document(s) 16 ) Service Date 01/07/2011. (Admin.) (Entered: 01/08/2011)
PACER 16 Filed: 1/5/2011, Entered: None
Notice to creditors: You are hereby notified that the trustee appointed in this case has filed a Report of No Distribution. Objections to the report, if any, must be filed within 30 days from notice of this notice pursuant to Rule 5009 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure. If no timely objection is filed the Court may enter an order discharging the Trustee, canceling his bond and closing the case pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 350(a). signed on 1/5/2011 (RE: related document(s) 14 ).(ROMO, JOSE) (Entered: 01/05/2011)
PACER 15 Filed: 1/5/2011, Entered: None
BNC Notice (RE: related document(s) 13 ) (ROMO, JOSE) (Entered: 01/05/2011)
PACER 14 Filed: 1/4/2011, Entered: None
Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution: I, WIGBERTO LUGO MENDER, having been appointed trustee of the estate of the above-named debtor(s), report that I have neither received any property nor paid any money on account of this estate; that I have made a diligent inquiry into the financial affairs of the debtor(s) and the location of the property belonging to the estate; and that there is no property available for distribution from the estate over and above that exempted by law. Pursuant to Fed R Bank P 5009, I hereby certify that the estate of the above-named debtor(s) has been fully administered. I request that I be discharged from any further duties as trustee. Key information about this case as reported in schedules filed by the debtor(s) or otherwise found in the case record: This case was pending for 3 months. Assets Abandoned (without deducting any secured claims): $ 241095.00, Assets Exempt: $ 14309.00, Claims Scheduled: $ 390241.00, Claims Asserted: Not Applicable, Claims scheduled to be discharged without payment (without deducting the value of collateral or debts excepted from discharge): $ 390241.00. filed by WIGBERTO LUGO MENDER on behalf of WIGBERTO LUGO MENDER (LUGO MENDER, WIGBERTO) (Entered: 01/04/2011)
PACER 13 Filed: 1/4/2011, Entered: None
Notice of abandonment of property: Location: 546 CALLE TULIPA ESTANCIAS DE TORTUGUERO, VEGA BAJA PR; JEEP COMPASS 2009 and HONDA ACCORD 2006 (14 Day Objection Language) filed by WIGBERTO LUGO MENDER on behalf of WIGBERTO LUGO MENDER (LUGO MENDER, WIGBERTO) (Entered: 01/04/2011)
PACER 12 Filed: 1/4/2011, Entered: None
Minutes of 341 meeting closed. filed by WIGBERTO LUGO MENDER on behalf of WIGBERTO LUGO MENDER (LUGO MENDER, WIGBERTO) (Entered: 01/04/2011)
PACER 11 Filed: 12/13/2010, Entered: None
Motion assuming legal representation on behalf of Doral Bank. (RAMIREZ DE ARELLANO, SERGIO) (Entered: 12/13/2010)
PDF 10 Filed: 12/3/2010, Entered: None
Certification of completion of instructional course concerning Personal Financial Management filed by JUAN O CALDERON LITHGOW on behalf of ALDO FLAVIO SESSAREGO ALAYZA, MIGDALIA VEGA GARCIA (CALDERON LITHGOW, JUAN) (Entered: 12/03/2010)
PACER 9 Filed: 11/23/2010, Entered: None
Statement of Intention amended filed by JUAN O CALDERON LITHGOW on behalf of ALDO FLAVIO SESSAREGO ALAYZA, MIGDALIA VEGA GARCIA (CALDERON LITHGOW, JUAN) (Entered: 11/23/2010)
PDF 8 Filed: 11/18/2010, Entered: None
Minutes of 341 Meeting - Case held open for: Documents on real property filed by WIGBERTO LUGO MENDER on behalf of WIGBERTO LUGO MENDER (LUGO MENDER, WIGBERTO) (Entered: 11/18/2010)
PACER 7 Filed: 11/2/2010, Entered: None
Request for Notice. filed by GE MONEY BANK (JC PENNEY CREDIT SERVICES) (APONTE REYES, CARLOS) (Entered: 11/04/2010)
PACER 6 Filed: 10/25/2010, Entered: None
Certificate of Credit Counseling Dated 07/05/2010 filed by JUAN O CALDERON LITHGOW on behalf of ALDO FLAVIO SESSAREGO ALAYZA, MIGDALIA VEGA GARCIA (CALDERON LITHGOW, JUAN) (Entered: 10/25/2010)
PACER 5 Filed: 10/21/2010, Entered: None
Certificate of service (RE: related document(s) 4 ) Service Date 10/21/2010. (Admin.) (Entered: 10/22/2010)
PACER 4 Filed: 10/19/2010, Entered: None
First Meeting of Creditors & Notice of Appointment of Interim Trustee WIGBERTO LUGO MENDER with 341(a) meeting to be held on 11/16/2010 at 03:30 PM at 341 MEETING ROOM, OCHOA BUILDING, 500 TANCA STREET, FIRST FLOOR, SAN JUAN. Objections for Discharge due by 01/15/2011. (Entered: 10/19/2010)
PACER 3 Filed: 7/4/2007, Entered: None
Certificate of Credit Counseling Dated 12/20/2006 filed by JUAN O CALDERON LITHGOW on behalf of OLGA SANTIAGO-CANO (CALDERON LITHGOW, JUAN) (Entered: 07/04/2007)
PACER 2 Filed: 10/18/2010, Entered: None
Receipt of Voluntary Petition Chapter 7 (Attorney)(10-09751-7) [misc,volp7a] ( 299.00) filing fee. Receipt number 4316007, amount $ 299.00. (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 10/18/2010)
PDF 1 Filed: 10/18/2010, Entered: None
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition. With Schedules, With Individual Debtors Statement of Intention, With Statement of Current Monthly Income and Means Test Calculation, With Notice to Individual Consumer Debtor, With Statement of Financial Affairs. Attorney Statement of Compensation $2500. Fee Amount $299. Filed by JUAN O CALDERON LITHGOW on behalf of ALDO FLAVIO SESSAREGO ALAYZA, MIGDALIA VEGA GARCIA (CALDERON LITHGOW, JUAN) (Entered: 10/18/2010)

Statistics

This case has been viewed 54 times.

No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Need Password Help?