Deep Marine Holdings, Inc. and Deep Marine 4, LLC- Adversary Proceeding
Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court, Case No. 10-03369
District Judge Marvin Isgur, presiding
docket://gov.uscourts.txsb.10-03369 (What is this?)

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
The right information can save you thousands of dollars.
Access comprehensive profiles on judges, firms, lawyers, and more with PlainSite Pro and Pro Se.
No Logo Deep Marine Liquidating Trust (as Successor to Deep Marine Holdings, Inc., Deep Marine Technology Incorporated, Deep Marine 1, LLC, and Deep Marine 2, LLC),, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bracewell & Giuliani, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
William Alfred Wood, III +1 713 223 2300 +1 713 221 1212 Trey.Wood@bgllp.com
No Logo Deep Marine Liquidating Trust,, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bracewell & Giuliani, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
William Alfred Wood, III +1 713 223 2300 +1 713 221 1212 Trey.Wood@bgllp.com
No Logo Deep Marine Liquidating Trust, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bracewell & Giuliani, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
William Alfred Wood, III +1 713 223 2300 +1 713 221 1212 Trey.Wood@bgllp.com
No Logo Deep Marine Liquidating Trust (as Successor to Deep Marine Holdings, Inc., Deep Marine Technology Incorporated, Deep Marine 1, LLC, and Deep Marine 2, LLC),, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bracewell & Giuliani, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
William Alfred Wood, III +1 713 223 2300 +1 713 221 1212 Trey.Wood@bgllp.com
Aramark Corporation, Cross Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by McCarter & English LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Angela Sheffler Abreu +1 973 848 5378 aabreu@mccarter.com
No Logo B & J Martin, Inc., Cross Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Weycer, Kaplan, Pulaski & Zuber, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Edward L Rothberg +1 713 961 9045 +1 713 961 5341 erothberg@wkpz.com
No Logo BNA Marine Services, LLC, Cross Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Barry & Sewart, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
David W. Barry +1 713 722 0281 +1 713 722 9786 bankruptcy@barryandsewart.com
No Logo Caprock Communications, Inc., Cross Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hoover Slovacek LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
T. Josh Judd +1 713 977 8686 +1 713 977 5395 judd@hooverslovacek.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Weycer, Kaplan, Pulaski & Zuber, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Edward L Rothberg +1 713 961 9045 +1 713 961 5341 erothberg@wkpz.com
No Logo Conrad Shipyards, LLC, Cross Defendant
No Logo Dcc Ventures, LLC, Cross Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Thomas S Henderson, Attorney at Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Thomas S Henderson, III +1 713 227 9500 +1 713 620 3023 thenderson@tsh-atty.com
No Logo Deep Marine Liquidating Trust (as Successor to Deep Marine Holdings, Inc., Deep Marine Technology Incorporated, Deep Marine 1, LLC, and Deep Marine 2, LLC), Cross Defendant
No Logo Deep Marine Liquidating Trust (as Successor to Deep Marine Holdings, Inc., Deep Marine Technology Incorporated, Deep Marine 1, LLC, and Deep Marine 2, LLC), , Cross Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bracewell & Giuliani, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
William Alfred Wood, III +1 713 223 2300 +1 713 221 1212 Trey.Wood@bgllp.com
No Logo Doerle Food Services, L.l.c., Cross Defendant
No Logo Greenwood Marine Management, Inc., Cross Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Gresham Marine Services, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by MOTION to Compel

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
No Logo Otto Candies LLC, Cross Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Thomas S Henderson, Attorney at Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Thomas S Henderson, III +1 713 227 9500 +1 713 620 3023 thenderson@tsh-atty.com
No Logo The IUC Group, Inspectronic Corporation, Cross-Claimant
  Entries (88) Calendar Events Related (0) Tools Right End
PACER 88 Filed: 1/15/2011, Entered: None
BNC Certificate of Mailing. (Related document(s): 87 Generic Order) No. of Notices: 12. Service Date 01/15/2011. (Admin.) (Entered: 01/16/2011)
PACER 87 Filed: 1/13/2011, Entered: None
Agreed Order Resolving Objection to Claim of Caprock Signed on 1/13/2011 (adol) (Entered: 01/13/2011)
PACER 86 Filed: 1/11/2011, Entered: None
Proposed Order RE: (and Certification of Notice Pursuant to Liquidating Trust Agreement) re: Trustee's Objection to Proof of Claim Filed by Caprock Communication (Filed By Deep Marine Liquidating Trust (as Successor to Deep Marine Holdings, Inc., Deep Marine Technology Incorporated, Deep Marine 1, LLC, and Deep Marine 2, LLC) ).(Related document(s): 22 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim) (Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 01/11/2011)
PACER 85 Filed: 11/24/2010, Entered: None
BNC Certificate of Mailing. (Related document(s): 82 Generic Order) No. of Notices: 12. Service Date 11/24/2010. (Admin.) (Entered: 11/25/2010)
PACER 84 Filed: 11/24/2010, Entered: None
Answer to Crossclaims of The IUC Group/Inspectronic Corporation Crossclaim Filed by Deep Marine Liquidating Trust (as Successor to Deep Marine Holdings, Inc., Deep Marine Technology Incorporated, Deep Marine 1, LLC, and Deep Marine 2, LLC) (Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 11/24/2010)
PACER 83 Filed: 11/23/2010, Entered: None
Answer to IUC Group/Inspectronic Corporation's Crossclaim Filed by Aramark U.S. Offshore Services, LLC (Abreu, Angela) (Entered: 11/23/2010)
PACER 82 Filed: 11/22/2010, Entered: None
Order Granting Motion (Related Doc # 78 ) Signed on 11/22/2010. (adol) (Entered: 11/22/2010)
PACER 81 Filed: 11/22/2010, Entered: None
Answer to The IUC Group/Inspectronic Corporation's Crossclaim Filed by Otto Candies, LLC (Henderson, Thomas) (Entered: 11/22/2010)
PACER 80 Filed: 11/22/2010, Entered: None
Answer to The IUC Group/Inspectronic Corporation's Crossclaim Filed by DCC Ventures, LLC (Henderson, Thomas) (Entered: 11/22/2010)
PACER 79 Filed: 11/19/2010, Entered: None
BNC Certificate of Mailing. (Related document(s): 77 Generic Order) No. of Notices: 12. Service Date 11/19/2010. (Admin.) (Entered: 11/20/2010)
PACER 78 Filed: 11/18/2010, Entered: None
Amended Motion to Reset Trial Date (Unopposed) Filed by The IUC Group, Inspectronic Corporation (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (White, Ronald) (Entered: 11/18/2010)
PACER 77 Filed: 11/17/2010, Entered: None
Order Denying Motion (Related Doc # 70 ) Signed on 11/17/2010. (adol) (Entered: 11/17/2010)
PACER 76 Filed: 11/15/2010, Entered: None
Notice of Service of Initial Disclosures. Filed by The IUC Group, Inspectronic Corporation (White, Ronald) (Entered: 11/15/2010)
PACER 75 Filed: 11/15/2010, Entered: None
Notice of Service of Initial Disclosures. Filed by Doerle Food Services, LLC (Jackson, Koetting) (Entered: 11/15/2010)
PACER 74 Filed: 11/12/2010, Entered: None
Initial Disclosure Rule 26 (Filed By Otto Candies, LLC ). (Henderson, Thomas) (Entered: 11/12/2010)
PACER 73 Filed: 11/12/2010, Entered: None
Initial Disclosure Rule 26 (Filed By DCC Ventures, LLC ). (Henderson, Thomas) (Entered: 11/12/2010)
PACER 72 Filed: 11/12/2010, Entered: None
Initial Disclosure Rule 26 (Filed By Aramark U.S. Offshore Services, LLC ). (Abreu, Angela) (Entered: 11/12/2010)
PACER 71 Filed: 11/12/2010, Entered: None
Answer to Complaint (Related document(s): 65 Amended Complaint) Filed by Conrad Shipyards, LLC (Pringle, Lara) (Entered: 11/12/2010)
PACER 70 Filed: 11/12/2010, Entered: None
Agreed Motion to Reset Trial Date Filed by The IUC Group, Inspectronic Corporation (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (White, Ronald) (Entered: 11/12/2010)
PACER 69 Filed: 11/12/2010, Entered: None
Initial Disclosure Rule 26 (Filed By Deep Marine Liquidating Trust (as Successor to Deep Marine Holdings, Inc., Deep Marine Technology Incorporated, Deep Marine 1, LLC, and Deep Marine 2, LLC) ). (Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 11/12/2010)
PACER 68 Filed: 11/12/2010, Entered: None
Answer to Complaint (Related document(s): 1 Complaint) Filed by B&J Martin, Inc. (Degruy, Jacques) (Entered: 11/12/2010)
PACER 67 Filed: 11/5/2010, Entered: None
Answer to Complaint (Related document(s): 65 Amended Complaint), Crossclaim by The IUC Group, Inspectronic Corporation against Aramark U.S. Offshore Services, LLC, B&J Martin, Inc., BNA Marine Services, LLC, CapRock Communications, Inc., Conrad Shipyards, LLC, DCC Ventures, LLC, Deep Marine Liquidating Trust (as Successor to Deep Marine Holdings, Inc., Deep Marine Technology Incorporated, Deep Marine 1, LLC, and Deep Marine 2, LLC), Doerle Food Services, LLC, Greenwood Marine Management, Inc., Otto Candies, LLC Filed by The IUC Group, Inspectronic Corporation (Rogers, E) (Entered: 11/05/2010)
PACER 66 Filed: 10/27/2010, Entered: None
BNC Certificate of Mailing. (Related document(s): 64 Comprehensive Scheduling Order) No. of Notices: 12. Service Date 10/27/2010. (Admin.) (Entered: 10/28/2010)
PACER 65 Filed: 10/27/2010, Entered: None
Amended Complaint (Related document(s): 1 Complaint) (Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 10/27/2010)
PACER 64 Filed: 10/21/2010, Entered: None
Comprehensive Scheduling Order Signed on 10/21/2010 Pre-Trial Order due by 5/9/2011. Discovery due by 3/21/2011. (kgui) (Entered: 10/25/2010)
PACER 63 Filed: 10/23/2010, Entered: None
BNC Certificate of Mailing. (Related document(s): 62 Order on Motion to Appear pro hac vice) No. of Notices: 11. Service Date 10/23/2010. (Admin.) (Entered: 10/24/2010)
PACER 62 Filed: 10/20/2010, Entered: None
Order Granting Motion To Appear pro hac vice (Related Doc # 40 ) Signed on 10/20/2010. Ordered that Ronald Savoie is admitted pro hac vice to appear as counsel for Doerle Food Services, LLC. (pcra) (Entered: 10/21/2010)
PACER 61 Filed: 10/18/2010, Entered: None
Answer to Conrad Shipyards, LLC's Crossclaim Filed by Otto Candies, LLC (Carrigee, David) (Entered: 10/18/2010)
PACER 60 Filed: 10/18/2010, Entered: None
Answer to Conrad Shipyard, LLC's Crossclaim Filed by CapRock Communications, Inc. (Judd, T.) (Entered: 10/18/2010)
PACER 59 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: None
Joint Discovery Plan/Case Management Plan (Filed By Deep Marine Liquidating Trust (as Successor to Deep Marine Holdings, Inc., Deep Marine Technology Incorporated, Deep Marine 1, LLC, and Deep Marine 2, LLC) ). (Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 10/15/2010)
PACER 58 Filed: 10/14/2010, Entered: None
Answer to Otto Candies, LLC Crossclaim Filed by Deep Marine Liquidating Trust (as Successor to Deep Marine Holdings, Inc., Deep Marine Technology Incorporated, Deep Marine 1, LLC, and Deep Marine 2, LLC) (Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 10/14/2010)
PACER 57 Filed: 10/14/2010, Entered: None
Answer to Conrad Shipyard, LLC's Crossclaim Filed by Deep Marine Liquidating Trust (as Successor to Deep Marine Holdings, Inc., Deep Marine Technology Incorporated, Deep Marine 1, LLC, and Deep Marine 2, LLC) (Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 10/14/2010)
PACER 56 Filed: 10/14/2010, Entered: None
Answer to DCC Ventures, LLC Crossclaim Filed by Deep Marine Liquidating Trust (as Successor to Deep Marine Holdings, Inc., Deep Marine Technology Incorporated, Deep Marine 1, LLC, and Deep Marine 2, LLC) (Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 10/14/2010)
PACER 55 Filed: 10/14/2010, Entered: None
Answer to Aramark US Offshore Services, LLC Crossclaim, Answer to Aramark US Offshore Services, LLC Counterclaim Filed by Deep Marine Liquidating Trust (as Successor to Deep Marine Holdings, Inc., Deep Marine Technology Incorporated, Deep Marine 1, LLC, and Deep Marine 2, LLC) (Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 10/14/2010)
PACER 54 Filed: 10/12/2010, Entered: None
Answer to Deep Marine Liquidating Trust's Crossclaim Filed by The IUC Group, Inspectronic Corporation (Rogers, E) (Entered: 10/12/2010)
PACER 53 Filed: 10/12/2010, Entered: None
Answer to Otto Candies, LLC's Crossclaim Filed by The IUC Group, Inspectronic Corporation (Rogers, E) (Entered: 10/12/2010)
PACER 52 Filed: 10/12/2010, Entered: None
Answer to DCC Venture, LLC's Crossclaim Filed by The IUC Group, Inspectronic Corporation (Rogers, E) (Entered: 10/12/2010)
PACER 51 Filed: 10/12/2010, Entered: None
Answer to Conrad Shipyard LLC's Crossclaim Filed by The IUC Group, Inspectronic Corporation (Rogers, E) (Entered: 10/12/2010)
PACER 50 Filed: 10/12/2010, Entered: None
Answer to Aramark US Offshore Services, LLC' Crossclaim Filed by The IUC Group, Inspectronic Corporation (Rogers, E) (Entered: 10/12/2010)
PACER 49 Filed: 10/11/2010, Entered: None
Answer to Conrad Shipyard, LLC's Crossclaim Filed by Aramark U.S. Offshore Services, LLC (Abreu, Angela) (Entered: 10/11/2010)
PACER 48 Filed: 10/6/2010, Entered: None
Answer to The Deep Marine Liquidating Trust Crossclaim Filed by Otto Candies, LLC (Henderson, Thomas) (Entered: 10/06/2010)
PACER 47 Filed: 10/6/2010, Entered: None
Answer to Aramark US Offshore Services, LLC Crossclaim Filed by Otto Candies, LLC (Henderson, Thomas) (Entered: 10/06/2010)
PACER 46 Filed: 10/6/2010, Entered: None
Answer to Aramark US Offshore Services, LLC Crossclaim Filed by DCC Ventures, LLC (Henderson, Thomas) (Entered: 10/06/2010)
PACER 45 Filed: 10/6/2010, Entered: None
Answer to The Deep Marine Liquidating Trust Crossclaim Filed by DCC Ventures, LLC (Henderson, Thomas) (Entered: 10/06/2010)
PACER 44 Filed: 10/6/2010, Entered: None
Answer to Aramark US Offshore Services, LLC, Crossclaim Filed by CapRock Communications, Inc. (Judd, T.) (Entered: 10/06/2010)
PACER 43 Filed: 10/6/2010, Entered: None
Answer to Deep Marine Liquidating Trustee's Crossclaim Filed by CapRock Communications, Inc. (Judd, T.) (Entered: 10/06/2010)
PACER 42 Filed: 10/5/2010, Entered: None
Answer to DCC Ventures, LLC's Crossclaim Filed by CapRock Communications, Inc. (Judd, T.) (Entered: 10/05/2010)
PACER 41 Filed: 10/5/2010, Entered: None
Answer to Otto Candies, LLC's Crossclaim Filed by CapRock Communications, Inc. (Judd, T.) (Entered: 10/05/2010)
PACER 40 Filed: 9/30/2010, Entered: None Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Motion to Appear pro hac vice . Filed by Doerle Food Services, LLC (Jackson, Koetting) (Entered: 09/30/2010)
PACER 39 Filed: 9/29/2010, Entered: None
Answer to Complaint (Related document(s): 1 Complaint) Filed by Doerle Food Services, LLC (Jackson, Koetting) (Entered: 09/29/2010)
PACER 38 Filed: 9/29/2010, Entered: None
Notice of Appearance. Filed by Doerle Food Services, LLC (Norman, Lisa) (Entered: 09/29/2010)
PACER 37 Filed: 9/29/2010, Entered: None
Answer to Complaint (Related document(s): 1 Complaint), Crossclaim by Conrad Shipyards, LLC against all defendants Filed by Conrad Shipyards, LLC (Pringle, Lara) (Entered: 09/29/2010)
PACER 36 Filed: 9/28/2010, Entered: None
Answer to Defendant, The Deep Marine Liquidating Trust's Crossclaims and Objections to Proofs of Claim of Certain Defendants Crossclaim Filed by Aramark U.S. Offshore Services, LLC (Abreu, Angela) (Entered: 09/28/2010)
PACER 35 Filed: 9/28/2010, Entered: None
Answer to Cross-Claim of Defendant Otto Candies, L.L.C. Crossclaim Filed by Aramark U.S. Offshore Services, LLC (Abreu, Angela) (Entered: 09/28/2010)
PACER 34 Filed: 9/28/2010, Entered: None
Answer to Cross-Claim of Defendant DCC Ventures, LLC Crossclaim Filed by Aramark U.S. Offshore Services, LLC (Abreu, Angela) (Entered: 09/28/2010)
PACER 33 Filed: 9/20/2010, Entered: None
Summons Service Executed on Doerle Food Services, LLC 8/30/2010. (Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 09/20/2010)
PACER 32 Filed: 9/20/2010, Entered: None
Summons Service Executed on DCC Ventures, LLC 8/30/2010. (Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 09/20/2010)
PACER 31 Filed: 9/20/2010, Entered: None
Summons Service Executed on CapRock Communications, Inc. 8/30/2010. (Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 09/20/2010)
PACER 30 Filed: 9/20/2010, Entered: None
Summons Service Executed on The IUC Group, Inspectronic Corporation 8/30/2010. (Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 09/20/2010)
PACER 29 Filed: 9/20/2010, Entered: None
Summons Service Executed on B&J Martin, Inc. 8/30/2010. (Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 09/20/2010)
PACER 28 Filed: 9/20/2010, Entered: None
Summons Service Executed on Conrad Shipyards, LLC 8/30/2010. (Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 09/20/2010)
PACER 27 Filed: 9/20/2010, Entered: None
Summons Service Executed on Aramark U.S. Offshore Services, LLC 8/30/2010. (Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 09/20/2010)
PACER 26 Filed: 9/20/2010, Entered: None
Summons Service Executed on Conrad Shipyards, LLC 8/30/2010. (Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 09/20/2010)
PACER 25 Filed: 9/20/2010, Entered: None
Summons Service Executed on BNA Marine Services, LLC 8/30/2010. (Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 09/20/2010)
PACER 24 Filed: 9/20/2010, Entered: None
Summons Service Executed on Greenwood Marine Management, Inc. 8/30/2010. (Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 09/20/2010)
PACER 23 Filed: 9/20/2010, Entered: None
Summons Service Executed on Deep Marine Liquidating Trust (as Successor to Deep Marine Holdings, Inc., Deep Marine Technology Incorporated, Deep Marine 1, LLC, and Deep Marine 2, LLC) 8/30/2010. (Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 09/20/2010)
PACER 22 Filed: 9/16/2010, Entered: None
Answer to Complaint (Related document(s): 1 Complaint), Crossclaim & Objections to Proofs of Claim by Deep Marine Liquidating Trust (as Successor to Deep Marine Holdings, Inc., Deep Marine Technology Incorporated, Deep Marine 1, LLC, and Deep Marine 2, LLC) against Aramark U.S. Offshore Services, LLC, B&J Martin, Inc., BNA Marine Services, LLC, CapRock Communications, Inc., Conrad Shipyards, LLC, DCC Ventures, LLC, Doerle Food Services, LLC, Greenwood Marine Management, Inc., Otto Candies, LLC, The IUC Group, Inspectronic Corporation Filed by Deep Marine Liquidating Trust (as Successor to Deep Marine Holdings, Inc., Deep Marine Technology Incorporated, Deep Marine 1, LLC, and Deep Marine 2, LLC) (Wood, William) (Entered: 09/16/2010)
PACER 21 Filed: 9/16/2010, Entered: None
Answer to Complaint (Related document(s): 1 Complaint), Crossclaim for Determination of Validity and Priority of (i) Lien for Seamens Wage Claims and (ii) First Preferred Ship Mortgage Lien Claim by Otto Candies, LLC against Aramark U.S. Offshore Services, LLC, B&J Martin, Inc., BNA Marine Services, LLC, CapRock Communications, Inc., Conrad Shipyards, LLC, DCC Ventures, LLC, Deep Marine Liquidating Trust (as Successor to Deep Marine Holdings, Inc., Deep Marine Technology Incorporated, Deep Marine 1, LLC, and Deep Marine 2, LLC), Doerle Food Services, LLC, Greenwood Marine Management, Inc., The IUC Group, Inspectronic Corporation Filed by Otto Candies, LLC (Henderson, Thomas) (Entered: 09/16/2010)
PACER 20 Filed: 9/16/2010, Entered: None
Answer to Complaint (Related document(s): 1 Complaint), Crossclaim for Determination of Validity and Priority of First Preferred Ship Mortgage Lien Claim by DCC Ventures, LLC against Aramark U.S. Offshore Services, LLC, B&J Martin, Inc., BNA Marine Services, LLC, CapRock Communications, Inc., Conrad Shipyards, LLC, Deep Marine Liquidating Trust (as Successor to Deep Marine Holdings, Inc., Deep Marine Technology Incorporated, Deep Marine 1, LLC, and Deep Marine 2, LLC), Doerle Food Services, LLC, Greenwood Marine Management, Inc., The IUC Group, Inspectronic Corporation Filed by DCC Ventures, LLC (Henderson, Thomas) (Entered: 09/16/2010)
PACER 19 Filed: 9/16/2010, Entered: None
Answer to Complaint (Related document(s): 1 Complaint), Counterclaim by Aramark U.S. Offshore Services, LLC against all plaintiffs, Crossclaim by Aramark U.S. Offshore Services, LLC against all defendants Filed by Aramark U.S. Offshore Services, LLC (Abreu, Angela) (Entered: 09/16/2010)
PACER 18 Filed: 9/16/2010, Entered: None
Answer to Complaint (Related document(s): 1 Complaint) Filed by The IUC Group, Inspectronic Corporation (White, Ronald) (Entered: 09/16/2010)
PACER 17 Filed: 9/7/2010, Entered: None
Certificate of Service (Filed By Deep Marine Liquidating Trust (as Successor to Deep Marine Holdings, Inc., Deep Marine Technology Incorporated, Deep Marine 1, LLC, and Deep Marine 2, LLC) ).(Related document(s): 14 Scheduling Order) (Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 09/07/2010)
PACER 16 Filed: 9/1/2010, Entered: None
BNC Certificate of Mailing. (Related document(s): 14 Scheduling Order) No. of Notices: 11. Service Date 09/01/2010. (Admin.) (Entered: 09/02/2010)
PACER 15 Filed: 9/1/2010, Entered: None
Answer to Complaint (Related document(s): 1 Complaint) Filed by CapRock Communications, Inc. (Judd, T.) (Entered: 09/01/2010)
PACER 14 Filed: 8/30/2010, Entered: None
Scheduling Order Signed on 8/30/2010 Scheduling Conference set for 10/21/2010 at 09:00 AM at Houston, Courtroom 404 (MI). (adol) (Entered: 08/30/2010)
PACER 13 Filed: 8/17/2010, Entered: None
Summons Issued on Doerle Food Services, LLC Date Issued 8/17/2010. (jdav) (Entered: 08/17/2010)
PACER 12 Filed: 8/17/2010, Entered: None
Summons Issued on DCC Ventures, LLC Date Issued 8/17/2010. (jdav) (Entered: 08/17/2010)
PACER 11 Filed: 8/17/2010, Entered: None
Summons Issued on CapRock Communications, Inc. Date Issued 8/17/2010. (jdav) (Entered: 08/17/2010)
PACER 10 Filed: 8/17/2010, Entered: None
Summons Issued on The IUC Group, Inspectronic Corporation Date Issued 8/17/2010. (jdav) (Entered: 08/17/2010)
PACER 9 Filed: 8/17/2010, Entered: None
Summons Issued on B&J Martin, Inc. Date Issued 8/17/2010. (jdav) (Entered: 08/17/2010)
PACER 8 Filed: 8/17/2010, Entered: None
Summons Issued on Conrad Shipyards, LLC Date Issued 8/17/2010. (jdav) (Entered: 08/17/2010)
PACER 7 Filed: 8/17/2010, Entered: None
Summons Issued on Aramark U.S. Offshore Services, LLC Date Issued 8/17/2010. (jdav) (Entered: 08/17/2010)
PACER 6 Filed: 8/17/2010, Entered: None
Summons Issued on Otto Candies, LLC Date Issued 8/17/2010. (jdav) (Entered: 08/17/2010)
PACER 5 Filed: 8/17/2010, Entered: None
Summons Issued on BNA Marine Services, LLC Date Issued 8/17/2010. (jdav) (Entered: 08/17/2010)
PACER 4 Filed: 8/17/2010, Entered: None
Summons Issued on Greenwood Marine Management, Inc. Date Issued 8/17/2010. (jdav) (Entered: 08/17/2010)
PACER 3 Filed: 8/17/2010, Entered: None Summons Issued
Summons Issued as to Deep Marine Liquidating Trust Date Issued 8/17/2010. (jdav) (Entered: 08/17/2010)
PDF 2 Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: None
Request for Issuance of Summons on Deep Marine Liquidating Trust; Greenwood Marine Management Inc.; BNA Marine Services, LLC; Otto Candies LLC; Aramark US Offshore Services LLC; Conrad Shipyard LLC; B&J Martin Inc.; The IUC Group, Inspectronic Corporation; CapRock Communications Inc.; DCC Ventures LLC; Doerle Food Services LLC. (Wood, William) (Entered: 08/16/2010)
PDF 1 Filed: 8/13/2010, Entered: None
Adversary case 10-03369. Nature of Suit: (91 (Declaratory judgment)),(21 (Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property)) Complaint Plaintiff's Original Complaint (I) to Interplead Funds and (II) to Determine Extent, Validity and Priority of Claims to Proceeds of the DMT Topaz by Deep Marine Liquidating Trust against Deep Marine Liquidating Trust, Greenwood Marine Management, Inc., BNA Marine Services, LLC, Otto Candies, LLC, Aramark U.S. Offshore Services, LLC, Conrad Shipyards, LLC, B&J Martin, Inc., The IUC Group, Inspectronic Corporation, CapRock Communications, Inc., DCC Ventures, LLC, Doerle Food Services, LLC. Fee Amount $250 (Wood, William) (Entered: 08/13/2010)

Statistics

This case has been viewed 85 times.

No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Need Password Help?