MIRABILE v. TOWNSHIP OF LIVINGSTON et al
New Jersey District Court, Case No. 2:10-cv-03213
District Judge Dickinson R. Debevoise, presiding
docket://gov.uscourts.njd.2-10-cv-03213 (What is this?)

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
This docket can only tell you so much. Get the rest.
Access comprehensive profiles on judges, firms, lawyers, and more with PlainSite Pro and Pro Se.
No Logo ED MEYER, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Ramsey Berman PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
THOMAS C. JARDIM +1 973 267 9600 tjardim@ramseyberman.com
No Logo JEFF MIRABILE, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by C. ELSTON & ASSOCIATES, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
CATHERINE M. ELSTON +1 732 280 6911 +1 732 280 6955 cmelston@elstonlaw.com
MITESH M. PATEL +1 732 280 6911 +1 732 280 6955 mpatel@elstonlaw.com
No Logo JOHN BELLUARDO, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Ramsey Berman PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
THOMAS C. JARDIM +1 973 267 9600 tjardim@ramseyberman.com
No Logo KAITLYN JACKSON, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Ramsey Berman PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
THOMAS C. JARDIM +1 973 267 9600 tjardim@ramseyberman.com
No Logo KEN BOSLAND, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Ramsey Berman PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
THOMAS C. JARDIM +1 973 267 9600 tjardim@ramseyberman.com
No Logo LEANN LUGASHI, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of O. Gene Hurst

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
O. GENE HURST +1 732 382 6748 oghurst@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ramsey Berman PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
THOMAS C. JARDIM +1 973 267 9600 tjardim@ramseyberman.com
No Logo MARC TARABOUR, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Ramsey Berman PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
THOMAS C. JARDIM +1 973 267 9600 tjardim@ramseyberman.com
No Logo MIKE DIMURO, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Ramsey Berman PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
THOMAS C. JARDIM +1 973 267 9600 tjardim@ramseyberman.com
No Logo PETER RIORDAN, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Ramsey Berman PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
THOMAS C. JARDIM +1 973 267 9600 tjardim@ramseyberman.com
No Logo ROBERT LEWIS, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Ramsey Berman PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
THOMAS C. JARDIM +1 973 267 9600 tjardim@ramseyberman.com
No Logo ROBIN DRYLIE, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Ramsey Berman PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
THOMAS C. JARDIM +1 973 267 9600 tjardim@ramseyberman.com
No Logo STAN KLEIMAN, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Ramsey Berman PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
THOMAS C. JARDIM +1 973 267 9600 tjardim@ramseyberman.com
No Logo THE ASSOCIATION OF CURRENT AND RETIRED LIVINGSTON AUXILIARY POLICE OFFICERS, INC., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Ramsey Berman PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
THOMAS C. JARDIM +1 973 267 9600 tjardim@ramseyberman.com
No Logo TONY MONG, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Ramsey Berman PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
THOMAS C. JARDIM +1 973 267 9600 tjardim@ramseyberman.com
v.
No Logo LIVINGSTON POLICE DEPARTMENT, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by VanDerGinst Law, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
SANDRO POLLEDRI +1 973 533 0777 spolledri@gbvlaw.com
No Logo POLICE CHIEF CRAIG M. HANDSCHUCH, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by VanDerGinst Law, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
SANDRO POLLEDRI +1 973 533 0777 spolledri@gbvlaw.com
No Logo TOWNSHIP OF LIVINGSTON, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by VanDerGinst Law, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
SANDRO POLLEDRI +1 973 533 0777 spolledri@gbvlaw.com
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 440 Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (53) Calendar Events Related (0) Tools Right End
PDF 145 Filed: 2/1/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 142 Report and Recommendations, and that the Association and the Pltfs are dismissed from the case. Signed by Judge Dickinson R. Debevoise on 1/31/12. (dc, )
PACER 52 Filed: 1/13/2011, Entered: None
Order to Refund Fees re 44 Application/Petition. Signed by Chief Deputy Clerk James P. Murphy on 1/13/11. (dc, ) (Entered: 02/01/2011)
PACER 51 Filed: 1/25/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
TEXT ORDER - Due to the cancellation of the 1/12/11 scheduling conference as a result of the inclement weather, there shall be a scheduling conference on 2/8/11 at 1:00 p.m. in Newark - Courtroom 2C. ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Shipp on 1/25/11. (NR ) (Entered: 01/25/2011)
PACER 50 Filed: 1/11/2011, Entered: None
Joint Discovery Plan by CRAIG M. HANDSCHUCH, LIVINGSTON POLICE DEPARTMENT, TOWNSHIP OF LIVINGSTON.(POLLEDRI, SANDRO) (Entered: 01/11/2011)
PACER 49 Filed: 1/11/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
TEXT ORDER - Due to the anticipated inclement weather, the R.16 scheduling conference set for 1/12/11 will be held via telephone at 11:00 am. Plaintiff's counsel shall initiate the call to 973-645-3827. ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Shipp on 1/11/11. (NR) (Entered: 01/11/2011)
PACER 48 Filed: 1/7/2011, Entered: None
Interim MOTION for Attorney Fees Co-counsel, Catherine Elston, Esq. and Thomas C. Jardim, Esq. by JOHN BELLUARDO, KEN BOSLAND, MIKE DIMURO, ROBIN DRYLIE, KAITLYN JACKSON, STAN KLEIMAN, ROBERT LEWIS. (Attachments: # 1 Certification of Thomas. C. Jardim, Esq., # 2 Certification of Catherine Elston, Esq., # 3 by Co-counsel, # 4 Proposed Order)(JARDIM, THOMAS) (Entered: 01/07/2011)
PACER 47 Filed: 1/7/2011, Entered: None
Interim MOTION for Attorney Fees for Co-counsel, C. Elston, Esq, and T. Jardim, Esq. by JOHN BELLUARDO, KEN BOSLAND, MIKE DIMURO, ROBIN DRYLIE, KAITLYN JACKSON, STAN KLEIMAN, ROBERT LEWIS. (JARDIM, THOMAS) (Entered: 01/07/2011)
PACER 46 Filed: 1/5/2011, Entered: None
TRANSCRIPT REQUEST FOR INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL TO THIRD CIRCUIT (ALREADY ON FILE IN THE DISTRICT COURT) by JOHN BELLUARDO, KEN BOSLAND, MIKE DIMURO, ROBIN DRYLIE, KAITLYN JACKSON, STAN KLEIMAN, ROBERT LEWIS, ED MEYER, JEFF MIRABILE, TONY MONG, PETER RIORDAN, MARC TARABOUR, THE ASSOCIATION OF CURRENT AND RETIRED LIVINGSTON AUXILIARY POLICE OFFICERS, INC.. (PATEL, MITESH) (Entered: 01/05/2011)
PACER 45 Filed: 1/5/2011, Entered: None
Corporate Disclosure Statement by JOHN BELLUARDO, KEN BOSLAND, MIKE DIMURO, ROBIN DRYLIE, KAITLYN JACKSON, STAN KLEIMAN, ROBERT LEWIS, ED MEYER, JEFF MIRABILE, TONY MONG, PETER RIORDAN, MARC TARABOUR, THE ASSOCIATION OF CURRENT AND RETIRED LIVINGSTON AUXILIARY POLICE OFFICERS, INC.. (PATEL, MITESH) (Entered: 01/05/2011)
PACER 44 Filed: 12/30/2010, Entered: None
APPLICATION/PETITION for Refund of Fees for by JOHN BELLUARDO, KEN BOSLAND, MIKE DIMURO, ROBIN DRYLIE, KAITLYN JACKSON, STAN KLEIMAN, ROBERT LEWIS, ED MEYER, JEFF MIRABILE, TONY MONG, PETER RIORDAN, MARC TARABOUR, THE ASSOCIATION OF CURRENT AND RETIRED LIVINGSTON AUXILIARY POLICE OFFICERS, INC.. (PATEL, MITESH) (Entered: 12/30/2010)
PACER 43 Filed: 12/30/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL as to 37 Order, by JOHN BELLUARDO, KEN BOSLAND, MIKE DIMURO, ROBIN DRYLIE, KAITLYN JACKSON, STAN KLEIMAN, ROBERT LEWIS, ED MEYER, JEFF MIRABILE, TONY MONG, PETER RIORDAN, MARC TARABOUR, THE ASSOCIATION OF CURRENT AND RETIRED LIVINGSTON AUXILIARY POLICE OFFICERS, INC.. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 0312-3490401. The Clerk's Office hereby certifies the record and the docket sheet available through ECF to be the certified list in lieu of the record and/or the certified copy of the docket entries. (PATEL, MITESH) (Entered: 12/30/2010)
PACER 42 Filed: 12/28/2010, Entered: None
Notice to be terminated and withdraw from Notices of Electronic filing as to case. Attorney O. GENE HURST terminated. (HURST, O.) (Entered: 12/28/2010)
PACER 41 Filed: 12/28/2010, Entered: None
APPLICATION/PETITION for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically for by JOHN BELLUARDO, KEN BOSLAND, MIKE DIMURO, ROBIN DRYLIE, KAITLYN JACKSON, STAN KLEIMAN, ROBERT LEWIS, ED MEYER, JEFF MIRABILE, TONY MONG, PETER RIORDAN, MARC TARABOUR, THE ASSOCIATION OF CURRENT AND RETIRED LIVINGSTON AUXILIARY POLICE OFFICERS, INC.. (PATEL, MITESH) (Entered: 12/28/2010)
PACER 40 Filed: 12/23/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL as to 37 Order, by JOHN BELLUARDO, KEN BOSLAND, MIKE DIMURO, ROBIN DRYLIE, KAITLYN JACKSON, STAN KLEIMAN, ROBERT LEWIS, ED MEYER, JEFF MIRABILE, TONY MONG, PETER RIORDAN, MARC TARABOUR, THE ASSOCIATION OF CURRENT AND RETIRED LIVINGSTON AUXILIARY POLICE OFFICERS, INC.. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 0312-3485818. The Clerk's Office hereby certifies the record and the docket sheet available through ECF to be the certified list in lieu of the record and/or the certified copy of the docket entries. Appeal Record due by 12/29/2010. (PATEL, MITESH) (Entered: 12/23/2010)
PACER 39 Filed: 12/22/2010, Entered: None
ANSWER to Amended Complaint and Separate Defenses by CRAIG M. HANDSCHUCH, LIVINGSTON POLICE DEPARTMENT, TOWNSHIP OF LIVINGSTON. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(POLLEDRI, SANDRO) (Entered: 12/22/2010)
PACER 38 Filed: 12/9/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
SCHEDULING ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 1/12/2011 at 03:30 PM in Newark - Courtroom 2C before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Shipp. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Shipp on 12/9/10. (NR ) (Entered: 12/09/2010)
PACER 37 Filed: 11/29/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER Ordered that, Pltfs' application for injunctive relief with respect to the investigation and interview of Mirabile is denied; that Defts. are enjoined from implementing the memorandum dated 5/31/10 issued by the Township of Livingston; Pltfs' application for injunctive relief is granted only to the extent that it applies to the memorandum dated 5/31/10, etc., Signed by Judge Dickinson R. Debevoise on 11/29/10. (dc, ) (Entered: 11/29/2010)
PACER 36 Filed: 11/16/2010, Entered: None
Letter. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(POLLEDRI, SANDRO) (Entered: 11/16/2010)
PACER 35 Filed: 11/15/2010, Entered: None
Letter from Sandro Polledri, Esq. re 33 Letter, 30 Letter. (POLLEDRI, SANDRO) (Entered: 11/15/2010)
PACER 34 Filed: 11/4/2010, Entered: None
Letter from Thomas C. Jardim, Esq.. (JARDIM, THOMAS) (Entered: 11/04/2010)
PACER 33 Filed: 11/3/2010, Entered: None
Letter from Sandro Polledri, Esq. re 31 Letter. (BOREK, JENNIFER) (Entered: 11/03/2010)
PACER 32 Filed: 10/29/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
Transcript of Proceedings held on 9/17/10, before Judge Debevoise. Court Reporter/Transcriber Mollie Ann Giordano, Telephone number 973 220 9465. Tape Number: Motion (pgs 1-71). NOTICE REGARDING REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript. Redaction Request due 11/19/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/29/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/27/2011. (tjg,) (Entered: 11/01/2010)
PACER 31 Filed: 10/14/2010, Entered: None
Letter from Sandro Polledri, Esq. re 30 Letter. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(POLLEDRI, SANDRO) (Entered: 10/14/2010)
PACER 30 Filed: 10/13/2010, Entered: None
Letter from Thomas C. Jardim, Esq. regarding preliminary injuctive relief and proposed Order. (JARDIM, THOMAS) (Entered: 10/13/2010)
PACER 29 Filed: 9/17/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Dickinson R. Debevoise: Show Cause Hearing held on 9/17/2010. (Court Reporter/Recorder Mollie Giordano.) (em, ) (Entered: 10/05/2010)
PACER 28 Filed: 9/17/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 24 Motion to Withdraw Leann Lugashi as pltf.. Signed by Judge Dickinson R. Debevoise on 9/17/10. (dc, ) (Entered: 09/17/2010)
PACER 27 Filed: 9/16/2010, Entered: None
Letter from O. Gene Hurst, Esq.. (HURST, O.) (Entered: 09/16/2010)
PACER 26 Filed: 9/13/2010, Entered: None
BRIEF Sur-Reply Brief filed by CRAIG M. HANDSCHUCH, LIVINGSTON POLICE DEPARTMENT, TOWNSHIP OF LIVINGSTON. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Certification of Sandro Polledri, Esq., # 2 Certificate of Service)(POLLEDRI, SANDRO) (Entered: 09/13/2010)
PACER 25 Filed: 9/9/2010, Entered: None
Letter from Sandro Polledri, Esq.. (POLLEDRI, SANDRO) (Entered: 09/09/2010)
PACER 24 Filed: 9/9/2010, Entered: None
MOTION to Withdraw by LEANN LUGASHI. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Certificate of Service)(HURST, O.) (Entered: 09/09/2010)
PACER 23 Filed: 9/7/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER adjourning case management conference until after the disposition of the pending motion for preliminary injunction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Shipp on 9/7/10. (sr, ) (Entered: 09/08/2010)
PACER 22 Filed: 9/7/2010, Entered: None
Letter from Mitesh Patel and Thomas Jardim re 21 Letter. (PATEL, MITESH) (Entered: 09/07/2010)
PACER 21 Filed: 9/7/2010, Entered: None
Letter from Sandro Polledri, Esq.. (POLLEDRI, SANDRO) (Entered: 09/07/2010)
PACER 20 Filed: 9/1/2010, Entered: None
REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion re 12 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by JOHN BELLUARDO, KEN BOSLAND, MIKE DIMURO, ROBIN DRYLIE, KAITLYN JACKSON, STAN KLEIMAN, JACK KRAMER, ROBERT LEWIS, MURRAY MANKOWITZ, ED MEYER, JEFF MIRABILE, TONY MONG, PETER RIORDAN, MARC TARABOUR, THE ASSOCIATION OF CURRENT AND RETIRED LIVINGSTON AUXILIARY POLICE OFFICERS, INC.. (PATEL, MITESH) (Entered: 09/01/2010)
PACER 19 Filed: 8/31/2010, Entered: None
REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion re 12 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by JOHN BELLUARDO, KEN BOSLAND, MIKE DIMURO, ROBIN DRYLIE, KAITLYN JACKSON, STAN KLEIMAN, JACK KRAMER, ROBERT LEWIS, MURRAY MANKOWITZ, ED MEYER, JEFF MIRABILE, TONY MONG, PETER RIORDAN, MARC TARABOUR, THE ASSOCIATION OF CURRENT AND RETIRED LIVINGSTON AUXILIARY POLICE OFFICERS, INC.. (PATEL, MITESH) (Entered: 08/31/2010)
PACER 18 Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: None
Letter from Mitesh M. Patel, Esq. on behalf of Plaintiffs request for an extension for submission of the reply brief on the Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (PATEL, MITESH) (Entered: 08/16/2010)
PACER 17 Filed: 8/11/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
Letter from Mitesh M. Patel, Esq. per Judge Debevoise's Order scheduling the hearing for Preliminary Injunction on September 17, 2010 at 9:00am. (PATEL, MITESH) (Entered: 08/11/2010)
PACER 16 Filed: 8/10/2010, Entered: None
BRIEF in opposition to the Amended Verified Complaint filed by CRAIG M. HANDSCHUCH, LIVINGSTON POLICE DEPARTMENT, TOWNSHIP OF LIVINGSTON. (Attachments: # 1 Certification of Sandro Polledri, Esq., # 2 Exhibit Exhibits 1-12 to Certification of Sandr Polledri, # 3 Exhibit Exhibits 13-24 to Certification of Sandro Polledri, # 4 Exhibit Exhibits 25-36 to Certification of Sandro Polledri, # 5 Exhibit Exhibits 37-38 to Certification of Sandr Polledri, # 6 Certification of Craig Handschuch, # 7 Certification of Michele Meade, # 8 Certificate of Service)(POLLEDRI, SANDRO) (Entered: 08/10/2010)
PACER 15 Filed: 8/2/2010, Entered: None
Letter from Sandro Polledri, Esq.. (POLLEDRI, SANDRO) (Entered: 08/02/2010)
PACER 14 Filed: 7/30/2010, Entered: None
Letter from Mitesh M. Patel, Esq. and Thomas C. Jardim, Esq. re 13 Letter. (PATEL, MITESH) (Entered: 07/30/2010)
PACER 13 Filed: 7/30/2010, Entered: None
Letter from Sandro Polledri, Esq.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Scheduling Order)(POLLEDRI, SANDRO) (Entered: 07/30/2010)
PACER 12 Filed: 7/26/2010, Entered: None
First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by JOHN BELLUARDO, KEN BOSLAND, MIKE DIMURO, ROBIN DRYLIE, KAITLYN JACKSON, STAN KLEIMAN, JACK KRAMER, ROBERT LEWIS, LEANN LUGASHI, MURRAY MANKOWITZ, ED MEYER, JEFF MIRABILE, TONY MONG, PETER RIORDAN, MARC TARABOUR, THE ASSOCIATION OF CURRENT AND RETIRED LIVINGSTON AUXILIARY POLICE OFFICERS, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Brief In Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction, # 2 Exhibits A to K in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction, # 3 Proposed form of Order)(PATEL, MITESH) (Entered: 07/26/2010)
PACER 11 Filed: 7/23/2010, Entered: None
First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction BY MARC TARABOUR, PETER RIORDAN, MURRAY MANKOWITZ, MIKE DIMURO, KEN BOSLAND, JOHN BELLUARDO, TONY MONG, JEFF MIRABILE, JACK KRAMER, ROBIN DRYLIE, KAITLYN JACKSON, LEANN LUGASHI, STAN KLEIMAN, ROBERT LEWIS, ED MEYER and THE ASSOCIATION OF CURRENT AND RETIRED LIVINGSTON AUXILIARY POLICE OFFICERS, INC., FILED by JEFF MIRABILE, THE ASSOCIATION OF CURRENT AND RETIRED LIVINGSTON AUXILIARY POLICE OFFICERS, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to K in Support of Preliminary Injunction, # 2 Order to Show Cause With Preliminary Injunctive Relief)(PATEL, MITESH) (Entered: 07/23/2010)
PACER 10 Filed: 7/23/2010, Entered: None
AMENDED COMPLAINT BY PLAINTIFFS MARC TARABOUR, PETER RIORDAN, MURRAY MANKOWITZ, MIKE DIMURO, KEN BOSLAND, JOHN BELLUARDO, TONY MONG, JEFF MIRABILE, JACK KRAMER, ROBIN DRYLIE, KAITLYN JACKSON, LEANN LUGASHI, STAN KLEIMAN, ROBERT LEWIS, ED MEYER, and THE ASSOCIATION OF CURRENT AND RETIRED LIVINGSTON AUXILIARY POLICE OFFICERS, INC. against CRAIG M. HANDSCHUCH, LIVINGSTON POLICE DEPARTMENT, TOWNSHIP OF LIVINGSTON, filed by THE ASSOCIATION OF CURRENT AND RETIRED LIVINGSTON AUXILIARY POLICE OFFICERS, INC., JEFF MIRABILE.(PATEL, MITESH) (Entered: 07/23/2010)
PACER 9 Filed: 7/23/2010, Entered: None
Corporate Disclosure Statement by THE ASSOCIATION OF CURRENT AND RETIRED LIVINGSTON AUXILIARY POLICE OFFICERS, INC.. (PATEL, MITESH) (Entered: 07/23/2010)
PACER 8 Filed: 7/16/2010, Entered: None
Letter from Sandro Polledri, Esq.. (POLLEDRI, SANDRO) (Entered: 07/16/2010)
PACER 7 Filed: 7/16/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
TEXT ORDER - Pursuant to the Scheduling/Status Conference held on July 16, 2010, this matter is scheduled for an in-person status/case management conference on September 13, 2010 at 3:00 P.M. in Newark - Courtroom 2C before the Hon. Michael A. Shipp, U.S.M.J. ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Shipp on 7/16/10. (NR ) (Entered: 07/16/2010)
PACER 6 Filed: 7/15/2010, Entered: None
Joint Discovery Plan by CRAIG M. HANDSCHUCH, LIVINGSTON POLICE DEPARTMENT, TOWNSHIP OF LIVINGSTON.(POLLEDRI, SANDRO) (Entered: 07/15/2010)
PACER 5 Filed: 7/8/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
TEXT ORDER - Per counsel's request, the parties shall submit a joint discovery plan to the Court by July 15, 2010. The initial scheduling conference will take place on July 16, 2010 at 11:00 A.M. ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Shipp on 7/8/10. (NR) (Entered: 07/08/2010)
PACER 4 Filed: 7/2/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER setting an initial scheduling conference for July 16, 2010 at 11:00 A.M. The parties shall submit a joint discovery plan to the Court by July 9, 2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Shipp on 7/2/10. (NR) (Entered: 07/02/2010)
PACER 3 Filed: 6/30/2010, Entered: None
Letter from Sandro Polledri, Esq.. (POLLEDRI, SANDRO) (Entered: 06/30/2010)
PACER 2 Filed: 6/23/2010, Entered: None
Corporate Disclosure Statement by CRAIG M. HANDSCHUCH, LIVINGSTON POLICE DEPARTMENT, TOWNSHIP OF LIVINGSTON identifying NONE as Corporate Parent.. (ld, ) (Entered: 06/28/2010)
PACER 1 Filed: 6/23/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CRAIG M. HANDSCHUCH, LIVINGSTON POLICE DEPARTMENT, TOWNSHIP OF LIVINGSTON from NJ SUPERIOR COURT LAW DIVISION: ESSEX COUNTY, case number ESX-L-4994-10. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 3185590) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 to Notice of Removal, # 2 Exhibit 2 to Notice of Removal, # 3 Exhibit 3 to Notice of Removal, # 4 Exhibit 4 to Notice of Removal, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet)(ld, ) (Entered: 06/28/2010)

Statistics

This case has been viewed 139 times.

No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Need Password Help?