Trusz v. UBS Rlty Investors LLC et al
Connecticut District Court, Case No. 3:09-cv-00268
District Judge Dominic J. Squatrito, presiding
docket://gov.uscourts.ctd.3-09-cv-00268 (What is this?)

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
The right information can save you thousands of dollars.
Access comprehensive profiles on judges, firms, lawyers, and more with PlainSite Pro and Pro Se.
No Logo Richard Trusz, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Madsen, Prestley & Parenteau, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
William G. Madsen +1 860 246 2466 +1 860 246 1794 wmadsen@mppjustice.com
v.
UBS AG, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Day Pitney, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Victoria Woodin Chavey +1 860 275 0467 +1 860 275 0343 vwchavey@daypitney.com
Jeffrey Allan Fritz +1 860 275 0116 +1 860 275 0343 jafritz@daypitney.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jackson Lewis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Alison Jacobs Wice +1 203 961 0404 +1 203 324 4704 wicea@jacksonlewis.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Neal Gerber & Eisenberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Nineveh Alkhas +1 312 269 5321 +1 312 980 0760 nalkhas@ngelaw.com
No Logo UBS Rlty Investor LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Day Pitney, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Victoria Woodin Chavey +1 860 275 0467 +1 860 275 0343 vwchavey@daypitney.com
Jeffrey Allan Fritz +1 860 275 0116 +1 860 275 0343 jafritz@daypitney.com
Stacy Smith Walsh +1 860 275 0565 +1 860 275 0343 sswalsh@daypitney.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jackson Lewis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Alison Jacobs Wice +1 203 961 0404 +1 203 324 4704 wicea@jacksonlewis.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Neal Gerber & Eisenberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Nineveh Alkhas +1 312 269 5321 +1 312 980 0760 nalkhas@ngelaw.com
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1514
Nature of Suit 442 Civil Rights: Jobs
  Entries (259) Calendar Events Related (0) Tools Right End
PDF 346 Filed: 3/10/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
RULING: denying 327 Motion to Compel, denying 341 Motion for Attorney's Fees. Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 3/9/2012. (Rodko, B.)
PACER 258 Filed: 7/8/2011, Entered: 7/8/2011 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
PACER 257 Filed: 7/8/2011, Entered: 7/8/2011 Reply to Response to Motion
PACER 256 Filed: 7/8/2011, Entered: 7/8/2011 Response
PACER 255 Filed: 7/8/2011, Entered: 7/8/2011 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
PACER 254 Filed: 7/8/2011, Entered: 7/8/2011 Order
PACER 253 Filed: 7/7/2011, Entered: 7/7/2011 Objection
PACER 252 Filed: 7/1/2011, Entered: 7/1/2011 Response
PACER 251 Filed: 7/1/2011, Entered: 7/1/2011 Response
PACER 250 Filed: 6/30/2011, Entered: 6/30/2011 Memorandum of Conference
PACER 249 Filed: 6/30/2011, Entered: 6/30/2011 Order on Motion for Conference
PACER 248 Filed: 6/30/2011, Entered: 6/30/2011 Status Conference
PACER 247 Filed: 6/29/2011, Entered: 6/29/2011 Memorandum in Support of Motion
PACER 246 Filed: 6/29/2011, Entered: 6/29/2011 Order on Motion to Take Deposition
PACER 245 Filed: 6/29/2011, Entered: 6/29/2011 Order on Motion to Withdraw
PACER 244 Filed: 6/29/2011, Entered: 6/29/2011 Motion to Withdraw
PACER 243 Filed: 6/28/2011, Entered: 6/28/2011 Calendar Entry
PACER 242 Filed: 6/27/2011, Entered: 6/27/2011 Motion to Take Deposition
PACER 241 Filed: 6/27/2011, Entered: 6/27/2011 Order on Motion to Quash
PDF 240 Filed: 6/27/2011, Entered: 6/27/2011 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
PACER 239 Filed: 6/27/2011, Entered: 6/27/2011 Response
PACER 238 Filed: 6/27/2011, Entered: 6/27/2011 Order on Motion for Leave to File
PACER 237 Filed: 6/24/2011, Entered: 6/24/2011 Motion for Conference
PACER 236 Filed: 6/24/2011, Entered: 6/24/2011 Motion for Leave to File
PACER 235 Filed: 6/24/2011, Entered: 6/24/2011 Reply to Response to Motion
PACER 234 Filed: 6/23/2011, Entered: 6/23/2011 Reply to Response to Motion
PDF 233 Filed: 6/23/2011, Entered: 6/23/2011 Order on Motion for Protective Order
PACER 232 Filed: 6/21/2011, Entered: 6/21/2011 Order on Motion to QuashCourt Filing
RULING: denying without prejudice as moot regarding the subpoenas served on SURS, Ruggles and FSBA; granting in part and denying in part regarding subpoenas served on Townsend Group, Hewitt EnnisKnupp, and Dohrmann 204 Motion to Quash Six Third-Party Subpoenas; granting 227 Motion to Seal Exhibit A. Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 6/21/2011. (Rodko, B.) (Entered: 06/21/2011)
PACER 231 Filed: 6/21/2011, Entered: 6/21/2011 Reply to Response to Motion
REPLY to Response to 210 MOTION for Protective Order filed by UBS AG, UBS Rlty Investor LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, Transcript References from the Deposition of Mario Cueni, # 2 Exhibit B, Deposition Exhibit 14 from Deposition of Mario Cueni)(Ritter, David) (Entered: 06/21/2011)
PACER 230 Filed: 6/17/2011, Entered: 6/17/2011 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Memorandum in Opposition re 220 Emergency MOTION for In Camera review filed by UBS AG, UBS Rlty Investor LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Ritter, David) (Entered: 06/17/2011)
PACER 229 Filed: 6/13/2011, Entered: 6/14/2011 Sealed Document
Sealed Document: Unredacted Version of Exhibit A by UBS AG, UBS Rlty Investor LLC re 226 Exhibit, 227 MOTION to Seal Exhibit A, November 18, 2008 Letter. (Kelsey, N.) (Entered: 06/14/2011)
PACER 228 Filed: 6/13/2011, Entered: 6/13/2011 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Memorandum in Opposition re 224 MOTION to Quash Deposition Subpoena Directed to Karl Koch of IPERS filed by Richard Trusz. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1. O'Shea Deposition Excerpt)(Steigman, Todd) (Entered: 06/13/2011)
PACER 227 Filed: 6/13/2011, Entered: 6/13/2011 Motion to Seal
MOTION to Seal Exhibit A, November 18, 2008 Letter by UBS AG, UBS Rlty Investor LLC. Motions referred to Joan G. Margolis(Alkhas, Nineveh) (Entered: 06/13/2011)
PACER 226 Filed: 6/13/2011, Entered: 6/13/2011 Exhibit
EXHIBIT A, Notice of Manual Filing of Exhibit Under Seal by UBS AG, UBS Rlty Investor LLC re 225 Reply to Response to Motion. (Alkhas, Nineveh) (Entered: 06/13/2011)
PACER 225 Filed: 6/13/2011, Entered: 6/13/2011 Reply to Response to Motion
REPLY to Response to 204 MOTION to Quash Plaintiff's Six Third-Party Subpoenas filed by UBS AG, UBS Rlty Investor LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, November 18, 2008 Letter)(Alkhas, Nineveh) (Entered: 06/13/2011)
PACER 224 Filed: 6/10/2011, Entered: 6/10/2011 Motion to Quash
MOTION to Quash Deposition Subpoena Directed to Karl Koch of IPERS by UBS AG, UBS Rlty Investor LLC.Responses due by 7/1/2011 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, Reinhardt Deposition Excerpts and Exhibits)Motions referred to Joan G. Margolis(Ritter, David) (Entered: 06/10/2011)
PACER 223 Filed: 6/7/2011, Entered: 6/7/2011 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Memorandum in Opposition re 210 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Richard Trusz. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A., # 2 Exhibit B., # 3 Exhibit C., # 4 Exhibit D.)(Steigman, Todd) (Entered: 06/07/2011)
PACER 222 Filed: 6/2/2011, Entered: 6/6/2011 Sealed Document
Sealed Document: Exhibits B, C, D, G by Richard Trusz re 212 Memorandum in Opposition to 204 MOTION to Quash Plaintiff's Six Third-Party Subpoenas, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit C, # 2 Exhibit D, # 3 Errata G)(Malone, P.) (Entered: 06/06/2011)
PACER 221 Filed: 6/3/2011, Entered: 6/3/2011 OrderCourt Filing
EXPEDITED SCHEDULING ORDER RE: Dkt. #220. Defendants' brief in opposition shall be filed on or before June 13, 2011, and plaintiff's reply brief, if any, shall be filed on or before June 17, 2011. SEE ATTACHED ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 6/3/11. (Watson, M.) (Entered: 06/03/2011)
PACER 220 Filed: 6/2/2011, Entered: 6/2/2011 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Emergency MOTION for In Camera review by Richard Trusz.Responses due by 6/23/2011 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M, # 15 Exhibit N)Motions referred to Joan G. Margolis(Steigman, Todd) (Entered: 06/02/2011)
PACER 219 Filed: 6/2/2011, Entered: 6/2/2011 Order on Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
ORDER: granting in large part 215 Motion for Extension of Time. SEE attached. Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 6/2/2011. (Rodko, B.) (Entered: 06/02/2011)
PACER 218 Filed: 6/1/2011, Entered: 6/1/2011 Reply to Response to Motion
REPLY to Response to 215 MOTION for Extension of Time until May 31, 2011 regarding Rebuttal Expert Disclosure Deadline and Dispositive Motion Deadline filed by UBS AG, UBS Rlty Investor LLC. (Alkhas, Nineveh) (Entered: 06/01/2011)
PACER 217 Filed: 6/1/2011, Entered: 6/1/2011 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Memorandum in Opposition re 215 MOTION for Extension of Time until May 31, 2011 regarding Rebuttal Expert Disclosure Deadline filed by Richard Trusz. (Steigman, Todd) (Entered: 06/01/2011)
PACER 216 Filed: 6/1/2011, Entered: 6/1/2011 Order on Motion to SealCourt Filing
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 213 Motion to Seal. THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL WILL RECEIVE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 6/1/11. (Margolis, Joan) (Entered: 06/01/2011)
PACER 215 Filed: 5/31/2011, Entered: 5/31/2011 Motion for Extension of Time
MOTION for Extension of Time until May 31, 2011 regarding Rebuttal Expert Disclosure Deadline by UBS AG, UBS Rlty Investor LLC. Motions referred to Joan G. Margolis(Alkhas, Nineveh) (Entered: 05/31/2011)
PACER 214 Filed: 5/31/2011, Entered: 5/31/2011 ResponseCourt Filing
RESPONSE re 209 Objection -- Defendants' Response in Opposition to Plaintiff's Partial Objection to Ruling by Magistrate Judge on Plaintiff's Third Motion to Compel -- filed by UBS AG, UBS Rlty Investor LLC. (Ritter, David) (Entered: 05/31/2011)
PACER 213 Filed: 5/31/2011, Entered: 5/31/2011 Motion to Seal
MOTION to Seal Exhibits B, C, D & G to Doc. 212 (Opposition to Motion to Quash) by Richard Trusz. Motions referred to Joan G. Margolis(Steigman, Todd) (Entered: 05/31/2011)
PACER 212 Filed: 5/31/2011, Entered: 5/31/2011 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Memorandum in Opposition re 204 MOTION to Quash Plaintiff's Six Third-Party Subpoenas filed by Richard Trusz. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, E and F)(Steigman, Todd) (Entered: 05/31/2011)
PACER 211 Filed: 5/17/2011, Entered: 5/17/2011 Memorandum in Support of Motion
Memorandum in Support re 210 MOTION for Protective Order filed by UBS AG, UBS Rlty Investor LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, Deposition Transcript References, # 2 Exhibit B, Declaration of M. Cueni)(Ritter, David) (Entered: 05/17/2011)
PACER 210 Filed: 5/17/2011, Entered: 5/17/2011 Motion for Protective Order
MOTION for Protective Order by UBS AG, UBS Rlty Investor LLC.Responses due by 6/7/2011 Motions referred to Joan G. Margolis(Ritter, David) (Entered: 05/17/2011)
PACER 209 Filed: 5/16/2011, Entered: 5/16/2011 Objection
OBJECTION re 203 Order on Motion to Compel filed by Richard Trusz. (Steigman, Todd) (Entered: 05/16/2011)
PACER 208 Filed: 5/13/2011, Entered: 5/13/2011 Notice (Other)
NOTICE by Richard Trusz re 184 Objection (Steigman, Todd) (Entered: 05/13/2011)
PACER 207 Filed: 5/13/2011, Entered: 5/13/2011 Order on Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 206 Motion for Extension of Time until 5/16/11, absent objection. THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL WILL RECEIVE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 5/13/11. (Margolis, Joan) (Entered: 05/13/2011)
PACER 206 Filed: 5/12/2011, Entered: 5/12/2011 Motion for Extension of Time
First MOTION for Extension of Time until May 16, 2011 ON CONSENT To Object to Ruling on Plaintiff's 193 Third Motion to Compel by Richard Trusz. Motions referred to Joan G. Margolis (Steigman, Todd) Modified on 5/16/2011 (Blue, A.). (Entered: 05/12/2011)
PACER 205 Filed: 5/10/2011, Entered: 5/10/2011 Memorandum in Support of Motion
Memorandum in Support re 204 MOTION to Quash Plaintiff's Six Third-Party Subpoenas filed by UBS AG, UBS Rlty Investor LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J)(Ritter, David) (Entered: 05/10/2011)
PACER 204 Filed: 5/10/2011, Entered: 5/10/2011 Motion to Quash
MOTION to Quash Plaintiff's Six Third-Party Subpoenas by UBS AG, UBS Rlty Investor LLC.Responses due by 5/31/2011 Motions referred to Joan G. Margolis(Ritter, David) (Entered: 05/10/2011)
PDF 203 Filed: 4/27/2011, Entered: 4/28/2011 Order on Motion to CompelCourt Filing
RULING ON PLAINTIFF'S THIRD MOTION TO COMPEL: granting in part and denying in part 193 Motion to Compel. See attached ruling for details. Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 4/27/2011. (Rodko, B.) (Entered: 04/28/2011)
PACER 202 Filed: 4/25/2011, Entered: 4/25/2011 Response
RESPONSE re 199 Reply to Response to Motion -- Defendants' Sur-Reply in Further Opposition to Plaintiff's Third Motion to Compel -- filed by UBS AG, UBS Rlty Investor LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Ritter, David) (Entered: 04/25/2011)
PACER 201 Filed: 4/25/2011, Entered: 4/25/2011 Order on Motion for Leave to FileCourt Filing
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 200 Motion for Leave to File Sur-reply Brief. See Von Spee v. Von Spee, 514 F. Supp. 2d 302, 306 n.9 (D. Conn. 2007)(citations omitted); Burford v. McDonald's Corp., 321 F. Supp. 2d 358, 360 n.1 (D. Conn. 2004). The sur-reply brief may now be docketed. THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL WILL RECEIVE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 4/25/11. (Margolis, Joan) (Entered: 04/25/2011)
PACER 200 Filed: 4/20/2011, Entered: 4/20/2011 Motion for Leave to File
MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply by UBS AG, UBS Rlty Investor LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A)Motions referred to Joan G. Margolis(Alkhas, Nineveh) (Entered: 04/20/2011)
PACER 199 Filed: 4/13/2011, Entered: 4/13/2011 Reply to Response to Motion
REPLY to Response to 193 Third MOTION to Compel filed by Richard Trusz. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Steigman, Todd) (Entered: 04/13/2011)
PACER 198 Filed: 4/7/2011, Entered: 4/7/2011 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Memorandum in Opposition re 193 Third MOTION to Compel filed by UBS AG, UBS Rlty Investor LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits A-J)(Ritter, David) (Entered: 04/07/2011)
PACER 197 Filed: 3/30/2011, Entered: 3/30/2011 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to MotionCourt Filing
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 196 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply until 4/7/11, absent objection. THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL WILL RECEIVE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 3/30/11.(Margolis, Joan) (Entered: 03/30/2011)
PACER 196 Filed: 3/30/2011, Entered: 3/30/2011 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply -- Unopposed -- as to 193 Third MOTION to Compel until Thursday, April 7, 2011 by UBS AG, UBS Rlty Investor LLC. Motions referred to Joan G. Margolis(Alkhas, Nineveh) (Entered: 03/30/2011)
PACER 195 Filed: 3/14/2011, Entered: 3/21/2011 Sealed Document
Sealed Document: Exhibits 26-30, 38-53, 55, 56 by Richard Trusz re 193 Third MOTION to Compel. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 27, # 2 Exhibit 28, # 3 Exhibit 29, # 4 Exhibit 30, # 5 Exhibit 38, # 6 Exhibit 39, # 7 Exhibit 40, # 8 Exhibit 41, # 9 Exhibit 42, # 10 Exhibit 43, # 11 Exhibit 44, # 12 Exhibit 45, # 13 Exhibit 46, # 14 Exhibit 47, # 15 Exhibit 48, # 16 Exhibit 49, # 17 Exhibit 50, # 18 Exhibit 51, # 19 Exhibit 52, # 20 Exhibit 53, # 21 Exhibit 55, # 22 Exhibit 56)(Garguilo, B) (Entered: 03/21/2011)
PACER 194 Filed: 3/11/2011, Entered: 3/11/2011 Exhibit
EXHIBIT Notice of Manual Filing of Certain Exhibits by Richard Trusz re 193 Third MOTION to Compel. (Steigman, Todd) . (Entered: 03/11/2011)
PACER 193 Filed: 3/11/2011, Entered: 3/11/2011 Motion to Compel
Third MOTION to Compel by Richard Trusz.Responses due by 4/1/2011 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Appendix Indexd of Exhibits, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit 6, # 9 Exhibit 7, # 10 Exhibit 8, # 11 Exhibit 9, # 12 Exhibit 10, # 13 Exhibit 11, # 14 Exhibit 12, # 15 Exhibit 13, # 16 Exhibit 14, # 17 Exhibit 15, # 18 Exhibit 16, # 19 Exhibit 17, # 20 Exhibit 18, # 21 Exhibit 19, # 22 Exhibit 20, # 23 Exhibit 21, # 24 Exhibit 22, # 25 Exhibit 23, # 26 Exhibit 24, # 27 Exhibit 25, # 28 Exhibit 26-30 Cover Pages Only, # 29 Exhibit 31, # 30 Exhibit 32, # 31 Exhibit 33, # 32 Exhibit 34, # 33 Exhibit 35, # 34 Exhibit 36, # 35 Exhibit 37, # 36 Exhibit 38-53 Cover Pages Only, # 37 Exhibit 54, # 38 Exhibit 55-56 Cover Pages Only, # 39 Exhibit 57, # 40 Exhibit 58, # 41 Exhibit 59, # 42 Exhibit 60, # 43 Exhibit 61, # 44 Exhibit 62, # 45 Exhibit 63, # 46 Exhibit 64, # 47 Exhibit 65, # 48 Exhibit 66, # 49 Exhibit 67, # 50 Exhibit 68, # 51 Exhibit 69)Motions referred to Joan G. Margolis(Steigman, Todd) (Entered: 03/11/2011)
PACER 192 Filed: 3/8/2011, Entered: 3/8/2011 ResponseCourt Filing
RESPONSE re 184 Objection of Plaintiff to Ruling by Magistrate Judge Granting Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration filed by UBS AG, UBS Rlty Investor LLC. (Ritter, David) . (Entered: 03/08/2011)
PACER 191 Filed: 3/8/2011, Entered: 3/8/2011 ResponseCourt Filing
RESPONSE re 185 Objection of Plaintiff to Ruling by Magistrate Judge Regarding Depositions of Employees Who Reside and Are Employed in Europe filed by UBS AG, UBS Rlty Investor LLC. (Ritter, David) . (Entered: 03/08/2011)
PACER 190 Filed: 3/7/2011, Entered: 3/7/2011 Order on Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 188 Motion for Extension of Time until 3/31/11. THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL WILL RECEIVE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 3/7/11. (Margolis, Joan) (Entered: 03/07/2011)
PACER 189 Filed: 3/3/2011, Entered: 3/3/2011 Notice of Appearance
NOTICE of Appearance by Chad W Moeller on behalf of UBS AG, UBS Rlty Investor LLC (Moeller, Chad) (Entered: 03/03/2011)
PACER 188 Filed: 2/28/2011, Entered: 2/28/2011 Motion for Extension of Time
MOTION for Extension of Time until March 31, 2011 To Object And/Or Respond to Requests for Production Relating to Expert Witnesses by Richard Trusz. Motions referred to Joan G. Margolis(Steigman, Todd) (Entered: 02/28/2011)
PACER 187 Filed: 2/25/2011, Entered: 2/25/2011 Order on Motion to AppearCourt Filing
ORDER granting 177 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Chad Moeller. Signed by Judge Dominic J. Squatrito on 2/25/11. (Pike, C.) (Entered: 02/25/2011)
PACER 186 Filed: 2/25/2011, Entered: 2/25/2011 Order on Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 183 Motion for Extension of Time as follows:(1) plaintiff shall disclose his expert witnesses, and defendants shall disclose their expert witnesses on any affirmative defenses or issues on which defendants have the burden of proof on or before 3/31/11;(2) defendants shall disclose any expert witnesses in response to plaintiff's expert witnesses, or on any issue for which defendants do not have the burden of proof, and plaintiff shall dlsclose rebuttal expert witnesses on or before 5/31/11; (3) All discovery shall be completed on or before 6/30/11; and (4) all dispositive motions shall be filed on or before 7/29/11. THERE SHALL BE NO FURTHER EXTENSIONS REGARDING THE COMPLETION OF DISCOVERY, ABSENT UNEXPECTED AND EXTRAORDINARY CIRCUMSTANCES. THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL WILL RECEIVE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 2/25/11. (Margolis, Joan) (Entered: 02/25/2011)
PACER 185 Filed: 2/22/2011, Entered: 2/22/2011 ObjectionCourt Filing
OBJECTION re 179 Order by Magistrate Judge Regarding Depositions of Employees of UBS Who Reside and are Employed in Europe filed by Richard Trusz. (Steigman, Todd) . (Entered: 02/22/2011)
PACER 184 Filed: 2/22/2011, Entered: 2/22/2011 Objection
OBJECTION re 167 Order on Motion for Reconsideration filed by Richard Trusz. (Steigman, Todd) (Entered: 02/22/2011)
PACER 183 Filed: 2/22/2011, Entered: 2/22/2011 Motion for Extension of Time
MOTION for Extension of Time Relating to Scheduling Order Deadlines by Richard Trusz. Motions referred to Joan G. Margolis(Steigman, Todd) (Entered: 02/22/2011)
PACER 182 Filed: 2/22/2011, Entered: 2/22/2011 Order on Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 181 Motion for Extension of Time until 2/22/11, absent objection. THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL WILL RECEIVE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 2/22/11. (Margolis, Joan) (Entered: 02/22/2011)
PACER 181 Filed: 2/18/2011, Entered: 2/18/2011 Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
MOTION for Extension of Time until February 22, 2011 to File Objection to Ruling by Magistrate Judge by Richard Trusz. Motions referred to Joan G. Margolis(Steigman, Todd) (Entered: 02/18/2011)
PACER 180 Filed: 2/14/2011, Entered: 2/14/2011 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
RULING: granting 163 Motion for Independent Mental Examination. Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 2/14/2011. (Rodko, B.) (Entered: 02/14/2011)
PACER 179 Filed: 2/8/2011, Entered: 2/8/2011 OrderCourt Filing
RULING Regarding Plaintiff's Desire to Depose Several Employees who Reside and are Employed in Europe. Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 2/8/2011. (Rodko, B.) (Main Document 179 replaced on 2/15/2011) (Gutierrez, Y.). (Entered: 02/08/2011)
PACER 178 Filed: 2/7/2011, Entered: 2/7/2011 Response
RESPONSE re 163 MOTION for Independent Mental Examination, 164 Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by UBS AG, UBS Rlty Investor LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits A and B)(Ritter, David) (Entered: 02/07/2011)
PACER 177 Filed: 2/3/2011, Entered: 2/3/2011 Motion to Appear
MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice Attorney Chad W. Moeller. Filing Fee $25.00 Receipt Number CTXH00000437., by UBS AG, UBS Rlty Investor LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit) Motions referred to Joan G. Margolis(Blue, A.) (Entered: 02/03/2011)
PACER 176 Filed: 1/31/2011, Entered: 1/31/2011 Calendar EntryCourt Filing
***AMENDED*** NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. February 4, 2011 Telephonic Discovery Conference at 3:30pm before Judge Joan G. Margolis is CANCELED. (Rodko, B.) (Entered: 01/31/2011)
PACER 175 Filed: 1/28/2011, Entered: 1/28/2011 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Memorandum in Opposition re 163 MOTION for Independent Mental Examination filed by Richard Trusz. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(Steigman, Todd) (Entered: 01/28/2011)
PACER 174 Filed: 1/28/2011, Entered: 1/28/2011 Order on Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 173 Motion for Extension of Time, until 2/18/11, over objection. THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL WILL RECEIVE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 1/28/11. (Margolis, Joan) (Entered: 01/28/2011)
PACER 173 Filed: 1/27/2011, Entered: 1/27/2011 Motion for Extension of Time
First MOTION for Extension of Time until 02/27/2011 to file objection to ruling dated 01/13/2011 168 Order on Motion for Reconsideration, 167 Order on Motion for Reconsideration by Richard Trusz. Motions referred to Joan G. Margolis(Steigman, Todd) (Entered: 01/27/2011)
PACER 172 Filed: 1/26/2011, Entered: 1/26/2011 Calendar EntryCourt Filing
NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. A Telephonic Discovery Conference is set for 2/4/2011 at 3:30 PM before Judge Joan G. Margolis. Attorney Steigman will initiate the conference call. Chambers: 203-773-2350. (Rodko, B.) (Entered: 01/26/2011)
PACER 171 Filed: 1/20/2011, Entered: 1/20/2011 Notice of Appearance
NOTICE of Appearance by Alison Jacobs Wice on behalf of UBS Rlty Investor LLC (Wice, Alison) (Entered: 01/20/2011)
PACER 170 Filed: 1/14/2011, Entered: 1/14/2011 Order on Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 169 Motion for Extension of Time, until 2/28/11, absent objection. THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL WILL RECEIVE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 1/14/11. (Margolis, Joan) (Entered: 01/14/2011)
PACER 169 Filed: 1/14/2011, Entered: 1/14/2011 Motion for Extension of Time
MOTION for Extension of Time until February 28, 2011 To Object and/or Respond to Defendants' Second Set of Requests for Production by Richard Trusz. Motions referred to Joan G. Margolis(Steigman, Todd) (Entered: 01/14/2011)
PACER 168 Filed: 1/13/2011, Entered: 1/13/2011 Order on Motion for ReconsiderationCourt Filing
RULING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION: granting in part 127 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 1/13/2011. (Rodko, B.) (Entered: 01/13/2011)
PACER 167 Filed: 1/13/2011, Entered: 1/13/2011 Order on Motion for ReconsiderationCourt Filing
RULING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION: granting 128 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 1/13/2011. (Rodko, B.) (Entered: 01/13/2011)
PACER 166 Filed: 1/13/2011, Entered: 1/13/2011 Order on Motion for ConferenceCourt Filing
RULING granting 150 Motion for Telephonic Discovery Conference. Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 1/13/2011. (Rodko, B.) (Entered: 01/13/2011)
PACER 165 Filed: 1/11/2011, Entered: 1/11/2011 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Joan G. Margolis: Telephonic Discovery Conference held on 1/11/2011. Time: 10 minutes (Rodko, B.) (Entered: 01/11/2011)
PACER 164 Filed: 1/7/2011, Entered: 1/7/2011 Memorandum in Support of Motion
Memorandum in Support re 163 MOTION for Independent Mental Examination filed by UBS AG, UBS Rlty Investor LLC. (Ritter, David) (Entered: 01/07/2011)
PACER 163 Filed: 1/7/2011, Entered: 1/7/2011 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
MOTION for Independent Mental Examination by UBS AG, UBS Rlty Investor LLC.Responses due by 1/28/2011 Motions referred to Joan G. Margolis(Ritter, David) (Entered: 01/07/2011)
PACER 162 Filed: 1/7/2011, Entered: 1/7/2011 Calendar EntryCourt Filing
NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. A Telephonic Discovery Conference is set for 1/11/2011 at 10:00 AM before Judge Joan G. Margolis. Attorney Steigman shall initiate the conference call. Chambers: 203-773-2350. (Rodko, B.) (Entered: 01/07/2011)
PACER 161 Filed: 1/3/2011, Entered: 1/3/2011 Order on Motion to Withdraw as AttorneyCourt Filing
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 159 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Stacy Smith Walsh terminated. Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 1/3/11. (Margolis, Joan) (Entered: 01/03/2011)
PACER 160 Filed: 1/3/2011, Entered: 1/3/2011 Order on Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 156 Motion for Extension of Time, by consent, as follows:(1) plaintiff shall disclose his expert witnesses, and defendants shall disclose their expert witnesses on any affirmative defenses or issues on which defendants have the burden of proof on or before 2/28/11;(2) defendants shall disclose any expert witnesses in response to plaintiff's expert witnesses, or on any issue for which defendants do not have the burden of proof, and plaintiff shall dlsclose rebuttal expert witnesses on or before 4/29/11; (3) All discovery shall be completed on or before 5/31/11; and(4) All dispositive motions shall be filed on or before 6/30/11.THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL WILL RECEIVE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 1/3/11. (Margolis, Joan) (Entered: 01/03/2011)
PACER 159 Filed: 12/30/2010, Entered: 12/30/2010 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
MOTION for Stacy Smith Walsh to Withdraw as Attorney by UBS AG, UBS Rlty Investor LLC. Motions referred to Joan G. Margolis(Walsh, Stacy) (Entered: 12/30/2010)
PACER 158 Filed: 12/23/2010, Entered: 12/23/2010 Response
RESPONSE to Plaintiff's 150 Motion for Telephonic Discovery Conference filed by UBS AG, UBS Rlty Investor LLC. (Alkhas, Nineveh) Modified on 12/28/2010 to create link (Pesta, J.). (Entered: 12/23/2010)
PACER 157 Filed: 12/23/2010, Entered: 12/23/2010 Sealed Document
Sealed Document: Exhibits by UBS AG, UBS Rlty Investor LLC re 153 Reply to Response to Motion, re 84 MEMORANDUM re Argument Against Depositions of Europe-based Employees. (Blue, A.) (Entered: 12/23/2010)
PACER 156 Filed: 12/22/2010, Entered: 12/22/2010 Motion for Extension of Time
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time Extension of Discovery Deadlines by Richard Trusz. Motions referred to Joan G. Margolis(Steigman, Todd) (Entered: 12/22/2010)
PACER 155 Filed: 12/21/2010, Entered: 12/21/2010 Order on Motion to SealCourt Filing
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 152 Motion to Seal, to the extent permitted by Local Rule 5(e). THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL WILL RECEIVE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 12/21/10. (Margolis, Joan) (Entered: 12/21/2010)
PACER 154 Filed: 12/21/2010, Entered: 12/21/2010 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess PagesCourt Filing
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 151 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL WILL RECEIVE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 12/21/10. (Margolis, Joan) (Entered: 12/21/2010)
PACER 153 Filed: 12/20/2010, Entered: 12/20/2010 Reply to Response to Motion
REPLY 84 MEMORANDUM re Argument Against Depositions of Europe-based Employees, Exhibit 2 to Exhibit C; and Exhibits G, H and I --/I Exhibits filed by UBS AG, UBS Rlty Investor LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C with Placeholder, # 4 Exhibit Notice of Manual Filing of Exhibit 2 to Exhibit C Filed Under Seal, # 5 Exhibit Exhibits D-F, # 6 Exhibit Placeholders for Exhibits G-I, # 7 Exhibit Notice of Manual Filing for Exhibit G Filed Under Seal, # 8 Exhibit Notice of Manual Filing of Exhibit H Filed Under Seal, # 9 Exhibit Notice of Manual Filing of Exhibit I Filed Under Seal, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit J Part 1, # 11 Exhibit Exhibit J Part 2, # 12 Exhibit Exhibit J Part 3, # 13 Exhibit Exhibit J Part 4, # 14 Exhibit Exhibit J Part 5, # 15 Exhibit Exhibit J Part 6, # 16 Exhibit Exhibit J Part 7, # 17 Exhibit Exhibit J Part 8, # 18 Exhibit Exhibit J Part 9)(Ritter, David). (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/21/2010: # 19 Exhibit G, # 20 Exhibit H, # 21 Exhibit I, # 22 Exhibit 2 to Exhibit C) (Grady, B.). (Entered: 12/20/2010)
PACER 152 Filed: 12/20/2010, Entered: 12/20/2010 Motion to Seal
MOTION to Seal Exhibit 2 to Exhibit C; and Exhibits G, H and I -- Exhibits by UBS AG, UBS Rlty Investor LLC. Motions referred to Joan G. Margolis(Ritter, David) . (Entered: 12/20/2010)
PACER 151 Filed: 12/20/2010, Entered: 12/20/2010 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by UBS AG, UBS Rlty Investor LLC. Motions referred to Joan G. Margolis(Ritter, David) (Entered: 12/20/2010)
PACER 150 Filed: 12/16/2010, Entered: 12/16/2010 Motion for Conference
MOTION for Telephonic Discovery Conference by Richard Trusz. Motions referred to Joan G. Margolis(Steigman, Todd) (Entered: 12/16/2010)
PACER 149 Filed: 12/6/2010, Entered: 12/6/2010 Order on Motion to SealCourt Filing
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 148 Motion to Seal. THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL WILL RECEIVE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 12/6/10.(Margolis, Joan) (Entered: 12/06/2010)
PACER 148 Filed: 12/3/2010, Entered: 12/3/2010 Motion to Seal
MOTION to Seal Tab B of Document No. 53 of Defendants' Memorandum of Law in Support of Their Motion to Quash Seven of Plaintiff's Subpoenas Duces Tecum by UBS AG, UBS Rlty Investor LLC. Motions referred to Joan G. Margolis(Alkhas, Nineveh) (Entered: 12/03/2010)
PACER 147 Filed: 11/24/2010, Entered: 11/24/2010 Order on Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
ORDER: granting 146 Motion for Extension of Time until 12/20/2010 to File Their Reply Brief Concerning Plaintiff's Desire to Depose Several Employees Who Reside and Are Employed in Europe. Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 11/24/2010. (Rodko, B.) (Entered: 11/24/2010)
PACER 146 Filed: 11/23/2010, Entered: 11/23/2010 Motion for Extension of Time
MOTION for Extension of Time until 12/20/2010 to File Their Reply Brief Concerning Plaintiff's Desire to Depose Several Employees Who Reside and Are Employed in Europe -- Unopposed -- 84 Trial Memo, by UBS AG, UBS Rlty Investor LLC. Motions referred to Joan G. Margolis(Ritter, David) (Entered: 11/23/2010)
PACER 145 Filed: 11/17/2010, Entered: 11/17/2010 Order on Motion to SealCourt Filing
ORDER denying 140 Motion to Seal,without prejudice as moot. (See Dkts. ##142, 144). THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL WILL RECEIVE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 11/17/10. (Margolis, Joan) (Entered: 11/17/2010)
PACER 144 Filed: 11/17/2010, Entered: 11/17/2010 Order on Motion to SealCourt Filing
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 142 Motion to Seal, subject to all the requirements set forth in Local Rule 5(e). THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL WILL RECEIVE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 11/17/10. (Margolis, Joan) (Entered: 11/17/2010)
PACER 143 Filed: 11/16/2010, Entered: 11/16/2010 Sealed Document
Sealed Document: Sealed portions of Memorandum of Law by Richard Trusz re 142 MOTION to Seal Redacted Portions of Reply Brief. (Attachments: # 1 Exh. AA, # 2 Exh. BB, # 3 Exh. EE, # 4 Exh. G, # 5 Exh. OO, # 6 Exh. U, # 7 Exh. V, # 8 Exh. W, # 9 Notice of Manual Filing)(Blue, A.) (Entered: 11/16/2010)
PACER 142 Filed: 11/16/2010, Entered: 11/16/2010 Motion to Seal
MOTION to Seal Redacted Portions of Reply Brief and Exhibits G, U, V, W, AA, BB, EE and OO by Richard Trusz. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Redacted Brief, # 2 Exhibit G, # 3 Exhibit U, # 4 Exhibit V, # 5 Exhibit W, # 6 Exhibit AA, # 7 Exhibit BB, # 8 Exhibit EE, # 9 Exhibit OO) Motions referred to Joan G. Margolis (Steigman, Todd). (Entered: 11/16/2010)
PACER 141 Filed: 11/16/2010, Entered: 11/16/2010 Order on Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 138 Motion for Extension of Time until 1/14/11, absent objection. THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL WILL RECEIVE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 11/16/10. (Margolis, Joan) (Entered: 11/16/2010)
PACER 140 Filed: 11/15/2010, Entered: 11/15/2010 Motion to Seal
"DOCKETED IN ERROR" MOTION to Seal Portions of Brief and Exhibits G, U, V, W, AA, BB, EE, OO by Richard Trusz. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit G, # 2 Exhibit U, # 3 Exhibit V, # 4 Exhibit W, # 5 Exhibit AA, # 6 Exhibit BB, # 7 Exhibit EE, # 8 Exhibit OO)Motions referred to Joan G. Margolis (Steigman, Todd) Modified on 11/16/2010 (Blue, A.). (Entered: 11/15/2010)
PACER 139 Filed: 11/15/2010, Entered: 11/15/2010 Response
RESPONSE re 84 Trial Memo, REDACTED filed by Richard Trusz. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit T, # 21 Exhibit U, # 22 Exhibit V, # 23 Exhibit W, # 24 Exhibit X, # 25 Exhibit Y, # 26 Exhibit Z, # 27 Exhibit AA, # 28 Exhibit BB, # 29 Exhibit CC, # 30 Exhibit DD, # 31 Exhibit EE, # 32 Exhibit FF, # 33 Exhibit GG, # 34 Exhibit HH, # 35 Exhibit II, # 36 Exhibit JJ, # 37 Exhibit KK, # 38 Exhibit LL, # 39 Exhibit MM, # 40 Exhibit NN, # 41 Exhibit OO, # 42 Exhibit PP, # 43 Exhibit QQ)(Steigman, Todd) (Entered: 11/15/2010)
PACER 138 Filed: 11/15/2010, Entered: 11/15/2010 Motion for Extension of Time
Third MOTION for Extension of Time until January 14, 2011 To Respond to Defendants' Second Set of Discovery Requests by Richard Trusz. Motions referred to Joan G. Margolis(Steigman, Todd) (Entered: 11/15/2010)
PACER 137 Filed: 11/5/2010, Entered: 11/5/2010 Reply to Response to Motion
REPLY to Response to 128 MOTION for Reconsideration re 124 Order on Motion to Compel, Order on Motion for Sanctions MOTION for Reconsideration re 124 Order on Motion to Compel, Order on Motion for Sanctions filed by Richard Trusz. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Steigman, Todd) (Entered: 11/05/2010)
PACER 136 Filed: 11/1/2010, Entered: 11/1/2010 Order on Motion for Leave to FileCourt Filing
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 135 Motion for Leave to File. Plaintiff shall file his sur-reply brief by 11/5/10. These filings unfortunately reflect the inexplicable difficulty counsel have in their communications with one another. THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL WILL RECEIVE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 11/1/10. (Margolis, Joan) (Entered: 11/01/2010)
PACER 135 Filed: 10/29/2010, Entered: 10/29/2010 Motion for Leave to File
MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply in Opposition to Defendants' Objection to Discovery Ruling by Richard Trusz. Motions referred to Joan G. Margolis (Steigman, Todd) . (Entered: 10/29/2010)
PACER 134 Filed: 10/28/2010, Entered: 10/28/2010 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess PagesCourt Filing
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 133 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL WILL RECEIVE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 10/28/10. (Margolis, Joan) (Entered: 10/28/2010)
PACER 133 Filed: 10/26/2010, Entered: 10/26/2010 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by UBS AG, UBS Rlty Investor LLC. Motions referred to Joan G. Margolis(Ritter, David) (Entered: 10/26/2010)
PACER 132 Filed: 10/26/2010, Entered: 10/26/2010 Reply to Response to Motion
REPLY to Response to 128 MOTION for Reconsideration re 124 Order on Motion to Compel, Order on Motion for Sanctions MOTION for Reconsideration re 124 Order on Motion to Compel, Order on Motion for Sanctions filed by UBS AG, UBS Rlty Investor LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits A, B and C)(Ritter, David) (Entered: 10/26/2010)
PACER 131 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: 10/15/2010 Memorandum of ConferenceCourt Filing
MEMORANDUM of Settlement Conference. Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 10/15/2010. (Rodko, B.) (Entered: 10/15/2010)
PACER 130 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: 10/15/2010 Settlement ConferenceCourt Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Joan G. Margolis: Settlement Conference held on 10/15/2010. Total Time: 2 hours and 30 minutes (Rodko, B.) (Entered: 10/15/2010)
PACER 129 Filed: 10/12/2010, Entered: 10/12/2010 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Memorandum in Opposition re 128 MOTION for Reconsideration re 124 Order on Motion to Compel, Order on Motion for Sanctions MOTION for Reconsideration re 124 Order on Motion to Compel, Order on Motion for Sanctions filed by Richard Trusz. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Steigman, Todd) (Entered: 10/12/2010)
PACER 128 Filed: 9/21/2010, Entered: 9/21/2010 Motion for Reconsideration
MOTION for Reconsideration re 124 Order on Motion to Compel, Order on Motion for Sanctions by UBS AG, UBS Rlty Investor LLC.Responses due by 10/12/2010 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)Motions referred to Joan G. Margolis(Ritter, David) (Entered: 09/21/2010)
PACER 127 Filed: 9/21/2010, Entered: 9/21/2010 Motion for Reconsideration
First MOTION for Reconsideration re 124 Order on Motion to Compel, Order on Motion for Sanctions (portions of the Order) by Richard Trusz.Responses due by 10/12/2010 Motions referred to Joan G. Margolis(Steigman, Todd) (Entered: 09/21/2010)
PACER 126 Filed: 9/17/2010, Entered: 9/17/2010 Order of TransferCourt Filing
ORDER OF TRANSFER. Case reassigned to Judge Dominic J. Squatrito for all further proceedings. Signed by Clerk on 9/17/10. (Johnson, D.) (Entered: 09/17/2010)
PACER 125 Filed: 9/10/2010, Entered: 9/10/2010 Calendar EntryCourt Filing
NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. A Settlement Conference is set for 10/15/2010 at 9:30 AM in Chambers Room 303, 141 Church St., New Haven, CT before Judge Joan G. Margolis. ALL PARTIES MUST ATTEND THE CONFERENCE. (Rodko, B.) (Entered: 09/10/2010)
PACER 124 Filed: 9/7/2010, Entered: 9/7/2010 Order on Motion to CompelCourt Filing
RULING: granting in part to the extent set forth in ruling 104 Motion to Compel; denying 104 Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 9/7/2010. (Rodko, B.) (Entered: 09/07/2010)
PACER 123 Filed: 9/7/2010, Entered: 9/7/2010 Order on Motion to SealCourt Filing
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 105 Motion to Seal and granting 115 Motion to Seal. THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL WILL RECEIVE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 9/7/10. (Margolis, Joan) (Entered: 09/07/2010)
PACER 122 Filed: 8/24/2010, Entered: 8/24/2010 Order on Motion for ConferenceCourt Filing
ORDER granting in part 117 Motion for Conference. SEE ATTACHED ELECTRONIC ORDER FOR DETAILS. THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE THE COURT WILL ISSUE. Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 8/24/2010.(Watson, M.) (Entered: 08/24/2010)
PACER 121 Filed: 8/23/2010, Entered: 8/24/2010 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Joan G. Margolis: Telephonic Discovery Conference held on 8/23/2010. Time: 15 minutes (Rodko, B.) (Entered: 08/24/2010)
PACER 120 Filed: 8/20/2010, Entered: 8/20/2010 Response
RESPONSE re 117 MOTION for Telephonic Discovery Conference filed by UBS AG, UBS Rlty Investor LLC. (Ritter, David) (Entered: 08/20/2010)
PACER 119 Filed: 8/19/2010, Entered: 8/19/2010 Calendar EntryCourt Filing
NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. A Telephonic Discovery Conference is set for 8/23/2010 at 2:15 PM before Judge Joan G. Margolis. Attorney Steigman will initiate the conference call. (Rodko, B.) (Entered: 08/19/2010)
PACER 118 Filed: 8/18/2010, Entered: 8/18/2010 Notice of Appearance
NOTICE of Appearance by Stacy Smith Walsh on behalf of UBS Rlty Investor LLC (Walsh, Stacy) (Entered: 08/18/2010)
PACER 117 Filed: 8/17/2010, Entered: 8/17/2010 Motion for Conference
MOTION for Telephonic Discovery Conference by Richard Trusz. Motions referred to Joan G. Margolis(Steigman, Todd) (Entered: 08/17/2010)
PACER 116 Filed: 7/23/2010, Entered: 7/27/2010 Sealed Document
Sealed Document: Unredacted Portions of Reply Brief and Unredacted Exhibit 2 and Exhibit 5 by Richard Trusz re 115 MOTION to Seal portions of Reply Brief and Exhibits 2 & 5 to Reply Brief, 104 Second MOTION to Compel MOTION for Sanctions. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 2, # 2 Exhibit 5)(Kelsey, N.) (Entered: 07/27/2010)
PDF 115 Filed: 7/22/2010, Entered: 7/22/2010 Motion to Seal
MOTION to Seal portions of Reply Brief and Exhibits 2 & 5 to Reply Brief by Richard Trusz. Motions referred to Joan G. Margolis(Steigman, Todd) (Entered: 07/22/2010)
PACER 114 Filed: 7/22/2010, Entered: 7/22/2010 Reply to Response to Motion
REPLY to Response to 104 Second MOTION to Compel MOTION for Sanctions filed by Richard Trusz. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1., # 2 Exhibit 2. filed under seal, # 3 Exhibit 3. USPAP, # 4 Exhibit 4., # 5 Exhibit 5. filed under seal, # 6 Exhibit 6. Bloomberg Article)(Steigman, Todd) (Entered: 07/22/2010)
PACER 113 Filed: 7/14/2010, Entered: 7/14/2010 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to MotionCourt Filing
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 112 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply until 7/22/10, absent objection. THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL WILL RECEIVE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 7/14/10.(Margolis, Joan) (Entered: 07/14/2010)
PACER 112 Filed: 7/13/2010, Entered: 7/13/2010 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 104 Second MOTION to Compel MOTION for Sanctions until July 22, 2010 by Richard Trusz. Motions referred to Joan G. Margolis(Steigman, Todd) (Entered: 07/13/2010)
PACER 111 Filed: 7/1/2010, Entered: 7/1/2010 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Memorandum in Opposition re 104 Second MOTION to Compel MOTION for Sanctions filed by UBS AG, UBS Rlty Investor LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Ritter, David) (Entered: 07/01/2010)
PACER 110 Filed: 6/18/2010, Entered: 6/18/2010 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to MotionCourt Filing
ORDER granting 109 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Second Motion to Compel and Motion for Sanctions. Defendants' response is due July 1, 2010. THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE THE COURT WILL ISSUE. Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 6/18/2010 (Watson, M.) (Entered: 06/18/2010)
PACER 109 Filed: 6/17/2010, Entered: 6/17/2010 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 104 Second MOTION to Compel MOTION for Sanctions until July 1, 2010 by UBS AG, UBS Rlty Investor LLC. Motions referred to Joan G. Margolis(Alkhas, Nineveh) (Entered: 06/17/2010)
PACER 108 Filed: 6/15/2010, Entered: 6/15/2010 Answer to Amended Complaint
Defendants' ANSWER to 33 Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses. -- Answer to Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint by UBS AG, UBS Rlty Investor LLC.(Ritter, David) (Entered: 06/15/2010)
PACER 107 Filed: 6/10/2010, Entered: 6/10/2010 Sealed Document
Sealed Document: CDs numbered 7, 8 and 21 through 32 re 105 First MOTION to Seal Disks of Defendants' Production marked Confidential by Richard Trusz. (Kelsey, N.) (Entered: 06/10/2010)
PACER 106 Filed: 6/8/2010, Entered: 6/8/2010 Order Referring Case to Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Joan G. Margolis for pending discovery motions. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 6/7/2010. Motions referred to Joan G. Margolis(Kelsey, N.) (Entered: 06/08/2010)
PDF 105 Filed: 6/4/2010, Entered: 6/4/2010 Motion to Seal
First MOTION to Seal Disks of Defendants' Production marked Confidential by Richard Trusz. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 7. Filed Under Seal, # 2 Exhibit 8. Filed Under Seal, # 3 Exhibit 21-32. Filed Under Seal)(Steigman, Todd) (Entered: 06/04/2010)
PACER 104 Filed: 6/3/2010, Entered: 6/3/2010 Motion to Compel
Second MOTION to Compel, MOTION for Sanctions by Richard Trusz.Responses due by 6/24/2010 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Affidavit of Good Faith, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit 6, # 9 Exhibit 7, # 10 Exhibit 8, # 11 Exhibit 9)(Steigman, Todd) (Entered: 06/03/2010)
PACER 103 Filed: 6/3/2010, Entered: 6/3/2010 Order on Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 102 Motion for Extension of Time until 11/22/10, nunc pro tunc, absent objection. THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL WILL RECEIVE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 6/3/10. (Margolis, Joan) (Entered: 06/03/2010)
PACER 102 Filed: 6/2/2010, Entered: 6/2/2010 Motion for Extension of Time
Second MOTION for Extension of Time until 11/22/2010 to respond and/or object to 2nd set of Requests for Production by Richard Trusz. (Steigman, Todd) (Entered: 06/02/2010)
PACER 101 Filed: 5/12/2010, Entered: 5/12/2010 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Joan G. Margolis: A Telephonic Conference Re: Disclosure held on 5/12/2010. Time: 2 minutes (Rodko, B.) (Entered: 05/12/2010)
PACER 100 Filed: 5/10/2010, Entered: 5/10/2010 OrderCourt Filing
ELECTRONIC ORDER -- The case is trial ready as of 10/1/2011. THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL WILL RECEIVE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 5/10/10. (Margolis, Joan) (Entered: 05/10/2010)
PACER 99 Filed: 5/7/2010, Entered: 5/7/2010 Calendar EntryCourt Filing
NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. A Telephonic Conference Re: Disclosure is set for 5/12/2010 at 2:00 PM before Judge Joan G. Margolis (Rodko, B.) (Entered: 05/07/2010)
PACER 98 Filed: 5/5/2010, Entered: 5/5/2010 Order on Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 93 Motion for Extension of Time, absent objection, so that all fact discovery will be completed by 11/15/10, plaintiff will disclose his expert witnesses by 11/22/10 and such experts will be deposed by 12/30/10, defendants will disclose their expert witnesses by 2/1/11 and such experts will be deposed by 3/1/11, and dispositive motions, if any, will be filed by 4/1/11, after a pre-filing conference has been held with Judge Arterton. THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL WILL RECEIVE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 5/5/10. (Margolis, Joan) (Entered: 05/05/2010)
PACER 97 Filed: 3/30/2010, Entered: 3/30/2010 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
ORDER: Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint 23 is granted as to Count Five and denied as to Counts One, Two, Three, and Four. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 03/30/2010. (Kretman, J.) (Entered: 03/30/2010)
PACER 96 Filed: 2/12/2010, Entered: 2/12/2010 Order on Motion to Withdraw as AttorneyCourt Filing
ORDER granting 95 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Jeffrey Allan Fritz terminated. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 2/12/10. (Tooker, A.) (Entered: 02/12/2010)
PACER 95 Filed: 2/11/2010, Entered: 2/11/2010 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
MOTION for Jeffrey A. Fritz to Withdraw as Attorney by UBS Rlty Investor LLC, UBS AG. (Fritz, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/11/2010)
PACER 94 Filed: 2/11/2010, Entered: 2/11/2010 Motions ReferredCourt Filing
93 MOTION for Extension of Time To Complete Discovery is referred to Magistrate Judge Margolis. (Tooker, A.) (Entered: 02/11/2010)
PACER 93 Filed: 2/10/2010, Entered: 2/10/2010 Motion for Extension of Time
MOTION for Extension of Time To Complete Discovery Set Deadlines/Hearings by Richard Trusz. (Steigman, Todd) (Entered: 02/10/2010)
PACER 92 Filed: 2/5/2010, Entered: 2/5/2010 Order on Motion for ConferenceCourt Filing
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 59 Motion for Conference, to the extent that these issues were addressed in a telephonic discovery conference held with this Court. THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL WILL RECEIVE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 2/5/10. (Margolis, Joan) (Entered: 02/05/2010)
PACER 91 Filed: 2/5/2010, Entered: 2/5/2010 Order on Motion for Protective OrderCourt Filing
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 60 Motion for Protective Order, to the extent previously agreed to by counsel. THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL WILL RECEIVE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 2/5/10. (Margolis, Joan) (Entered: 02/05/2010)
PACER 90 Filed: 2/5/2010, Entered: 2/5/2010 Order on Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 89 Motion for Extension of Time, by agreement, so that plaintiff's brief regarding the three European deponents will be filed within fifteen days of receipt of the transcripts of the depositions of Matt Lynch and Thomas O'Shea. THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL WILL RECEIVE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 2/5/10. (Margolis, Joan) (Entered: 02/05/2010)
PACER 89 Filed: 2/4/2010, Entered: 2/4/2010 Motion for Extension of Time
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Brief Regarding Depositions of Individuals Who Reside and Work in Europe 84 Trial Memo, by Richard Trusz. (Steigman, Todd) (Entered: 02/04/2010)
PACER 88 Filed: 1/25/2010, Entered: 1/25/2010 Exhibit
Amended EXHIBIT E, to Trial Memo by UBS Rlty Investor LLC, UBS AG re 84 Trial Memo,. (Ritter, David) (Entered: 01/25/2010)
PACER 87 Filed: 1/22/2010, Entered: 1/22/2010 Exhibit
Amended EXHIBIT D by UBS Rlty Investor LLC, UBS AG re 84 Trial Memo,. (Ritter, David) (Entered: 01/22/2010)
PACER 86 Filed: 1/22/2010, Entered: 1/22/2010 Exhibit
Amended EXHIBIT C by UBS Rlty Investor LLC, UBS AG re 84 Trial Memo,. (Ritter, David) (Entered: 01/22/2010)
PACER 85 Filed: 1/22/2010, Entered: 1/22/2010 OrderCourt Filing
RULING Regarding Potential In Camera Review of European Personnel Records: defendants need not produce the personnel files of John Fraser, Mario Cueni, and Paul Marcuse at this time, without prejudice to the plaintiff. Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 1/22/10. (Rodko, B.) (Entered: 01/22/2010)
PACER 84 Filed: 1/20/2010, Entered: 1/20/2010 Trial Memo
MEMORANDUM re Argument Against Depositions of Europe-based Employees by UBS Rlty Investor LLC, UBS AG. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, 01/15/10 email, # 2 Exhibit B, Organizational Chart, # 3 Exhibit C, Cueni declaration, # 4 Exhibit D, Fraser Declaration, # 5 Exhibit E, Marcuse Declaration, # 6 Exhibit F, Notice of 30B6 deposition)(Ritter, David) . (Entered: 01/20/2010)
PACER 83 Filed: 1/15/2010, Entered: 1/19/2010 Trial Memo
Supplemental TRIAL Brief in Further Support of Argument Against Production of Swiss and English Personnel Files by UBS Rlty Investor LLC, UBS AG. (Brown, S.) (Entered: 01/19/2010)
PACER 82 Filed: 1/15/2010, Entered: 1/15/2010 Response
ENTERED IN ERROR: RESPONSE -- Defendants' Reply Brief in Further Support of Their Argument Against the Production of Swiss and English Personnel Files filed by UBS Rlty Investor LLC, UBS AG. (Ritter, David) Modified on 1/19/2010 (Brown, S.). (Entered: 01/15/2010)
PACER 81 Filed: 1/11/2010, Entered: 1/14/2010 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Joan G. Margolis: Telephonic Discovery Conference held on 1/11/2010. Time: 30 minutes (Rodko, B.) (Entered: 01/14/2010)
PACER 80 Filed: 1/13/2010, Entered: 1/13/2010 Response
RESPONSE re Docket Annotation, 78 MOTION -- Defendants' Memorandum of Law Addressing Swiss and English Legal Issues as They Relate to Production of Personnel Files filed by Richard Trusz. (Steigman, Todd) (Entered: 01/13/2010)
PACER 79 Filed: 1/12/2010, Entered: 1/12/2010 Memorandum of ConferenceCourt Filing
MEMORANDUM of Discovery Conference. Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 1/12/10. (Torday, B.) (Entered: 01/12/2010)
PACER 78 Filed: 1/8/2010, Entered: 1/8/2010 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Defendants' Memorandum of Law Addressing Swiss and English Legal Issues as They Relate to Production of Personnel Files by UBS Rlty Investor LLC, UBS AG. (Ritter, David) Modified on 1/11/2010 (Bauer, J.). (Entered: 01/08/2010)
PACER 77 Filed: 1/4/2010, Entered: 1/5/2010 Order on Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
ORDER granting 74 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 1/4/10. (Torday, B.) (Entered: 01/05/2010)
PACER 76 Filed: 12/28/2009, Entered: 1/5/2010 Notice of Additional Authority
NOTICE OF ADDITIONAL AUTHORITY by Richard Trusz re 23 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint filed by Richard Trusz; correcting event in doc. #73. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Inferrera, L.) (Entered: 01/05/2010)
PACER 75 Filed: 1/4/2010, Entered: 1/4/2010 Calendar EntryCourt Filing
NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. A Telephonic Discovery Conference is set for 1/11/2010 at 03:00 PM before Judge Joan G. Margolis. Plaintiff's counsel shall initiate the conference call (203)773-2350. (Watson, M.) (Entered: 01/04/2010)
PACER 74 Filed: 12/30/2009, Entered: 12/30/2009 Motion for Extension of Time
MOTION for Extension of Time To File Brief Addressing European Law 71 Order,, by Richard Trusz. (Steigman, Todd) (Entered: 12/30/2009)
PACER 73 Filed: 12/28/2009, Entered: 12/28/2009 Notice (Other)
ENTERED IN ERROR: NOTICE by Richard Trusz re 23 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint Notice Re: Legal Issues Raised by Motion to Dismiss (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A., # 2 Exhibit B.)(Steigman, Todd) Modified on 1/5/2010 (Inferrera, L.). (Entered: 12/28/2009)
PACER 72 Filed: 12/21/2009, Entered: 12/22/2009 OrderCourt Filing
Ruling Following partial In Camera Review: The only relevant document in Mr. Taylor's personnel file is the five-page Feedback Report 2008. The only relevant documents in Mr. Gould's file are an email, dated April 30, 2002 and the five page Feedback Report 2008. Defendants shall produce copies of these three documents to plaintiff's counsel on or before January 5, 2010 subject to the same safeguards agreed upon by counsel.... Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 12/21/09. (Brown, S.) (Entered: 12/22/2009)
PACER 71 Filed: 12/21/2009, Entered: 12/21/2009 OrderCourt Filing
ELECTRONIC ORDER -- In accordance with the request of defense counsel in his letter, dated 12/18/09, with respect to the personnel files of John Fraser, Mario Cueni, and Paul Marcuse, counsel have until 1/8/10 to attempt to resolve the issue regarding production thereof, or, in the absence of any agreement, to file simultaneous briefs (not to exceed ten pages) on whether production would violate English or Swiss privacy law. THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL WILL RECEIVE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 12/21/09. (Margolis, Joan) (Entered: 12/21/2009)
PACER 70 Filed: 12/18/2009, Entered: 12/18/2009 Response
RESPONSE re 59 MOTION for Discovery Telephone Conference filed by UBS Rlty Investor LLC, UBS AG. (Ritter, David) (Entered: 12/18/2009)
PACER 69 Filed: 12/17/2009, Entered: 12/17/2009 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to MotionCourt Filing
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 68 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply until 1/15/10, absent objection. THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL WILL RECEIVE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 12/17/09.(Margolis, Joan) (Entered: 12/17/2009)
PACER 68 Filed: 12/16/2009, Entered: 12/16/2009 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 60 MOTION for Protective Order until 01/15/2010 by Richard Trusz. (Steigman, Todd) (Entered: 12/16/2009)
PACER 67 Filed: 12/16/2009, Entered: 12/16/2009 Order on Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 66 Motion for Extension of Time until 2/15/10. Counsel are to confer with each other and submit a proposed Amended Scheduling Order. (See Ruling on Plaintiff's Motion to Compel, filed 12/1/09 (Dkt. #61), at 25). THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL WILL RECEIVE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 12/16/09. (Margolis, Joan) (Entered: 12/16/2009)
PACER 66 Filed: 12/15/2009, Entered: 12/15/2009 Motion for Extension of Time
First MOTION for Extension of Time until 02/15/2010 to respond and/or object to 2nd Set of Reqs for Production by Richard Trusz. (Steigman, Todd) (Entered: 12/15/2009)
PACER 65 Filed: 12/10/2009, Entered: 12/10/2009 Order on Motion to QuashCourt Filing
ORDER granting 52 Motion to Quash. Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 12/10/09. (Brown, S.) (Entered: 12/10/2009)
PACER 64 Filed: 12/9/2009, Entered: 12/9/2009 Reply to Response to Motion
REPLY to Response to 52 MOTION to Quash Seven of Plaintiff's Subpoenas Duces Tecum filed by UBS Rlty Investor LLC, UBS AG. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Fritz, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/09/2009)
PACER 63 Filed: 12/4/2009, Entered: 12/4/2009 Order Referring Case to Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Joan G. Margolis for Rulings on including 60 MOTION for Protective Order, 59 MOTION for Discovery Telephone Conference and the 52 MOTION to Quash Seven of Plaintiff's Subpoenas Duces Tecum was previously referred. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 12/4/09. Motions referred to Joan G. Margolis(Pesta, J.) (Entered: 12/04/2009)
PACER 62 Filed: 12/2/2009, Entered: 12/2/2009 Docket Annotation
Docket Entry Correction re 61 Ruling on Motion to Compel. Added corrected PDF document. (Rodko, B.) (Entered: 12/02/2009)
PACER 61 Filed: 12/1/2009, Entered: 12/1/2009 Order on Motion to CompelCourt Filing
RULING: granted by agreement with respect to Request for Production 40 Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 12/1/09. (Rodko, B.) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/2/2009: # 1 Main Document) (Rodko, B.). (Entered: 12/01/2009)
PACER 60 Filed: 11/25/2009, Entered: 11/25/2009 Motion for Protective Order
MOTION for Protective Order by UBS Rlty Investor LLC, UBS AG.Responses due by 12/16/2009 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A thru D)(Ritter, David) (Entered: 11/25/2009)
PACER 59 Filed: 11/25/2009, Entered: 11/25/2009 Motion for Conference
MOTION for Discovery Telephone Conference by Richard Trusz. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Steigman, Todd) (Entered: 11/25/2009)
PACER 58 Filed: 11/24/2009, Entered: 11/24/2009 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Memorandum in Opposition re 52 MOTION to Quash Seven of Plaintiff's Subpoenas Duces Tecum filed by Richard Trusz. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-3, # 2 Exhibit 4, # 3 Exhibit 5)(Steigman, Todd) (Entered: 11/24/2009)
PACER 57 Filed: 11/20/2009, Entered: 11/20/2009 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to MotionCourt Filing
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 56 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply until 11/24/09, absent objection. THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL WILL RECEIVE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 11/20/09.(Margolis, Joan) (Entered: 11/20/2009)
PACER 56 Filed: 11/20/2009, Entered: 11/20/2009 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 52 MOTION to Quash Seven of Plaintiff's Subpoenas Duces Tecum until November 24, 2009 by Richard Trusz. (Steigman, Todd) (Entered: 11/20/2009)
PACER 55 Filed: 11/3/2009, Entered: 11/4/2009 Order Referring Case to Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Joan G. Margolis for ruling on 40 First MOTION to Compel, 52 MOTION to Quash Seven of Plaintiff's Subpoenas Duces Tecum. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 11/3/09. Motions referred to Joan G. Margolis(Spielberg, N.) (Entered: 11/04/2009)
PACER 54 Filed: 11/2/2009, Entered: 11/2/2009 Order on Motion for Leave to FileCourt Filing
ORDER: For the reasons set forth on the record on November 2, 2009, Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Sur-reply 34 is denied. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 11/2/2009. (Kretman, J.) (Entered: 11/02/2009)
PACER 53 Filed: 10/30/2009, Entered: 10/30/2009 Memorandum in Support of Motion
Memorandum in Support re 52 MOTION to Quash Seven of Plaintiff's Subpoenas Duces Tecum filed by UBS Rlty Investor LLC, UBS AG. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Part I, # 2 Exhibit Part II, # 3 Exhibit Part III, # 4 Exhibit Part IV)(Ritter, David) (Attachment 2 replaced on 1/3/2011) (Gutierrez, Y.). (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/3/2011: # 5 Exhibit 2 - Sealed Tab B) (Gutierrez, Y.). (Entered: 10/30/2009)
PACER 52 Filed: 10/30/2009, Entered: 10/30/2009 Motion to Quash
MOTION to Quash Seven of Plaintiff's Subpoenas Duces Tecum by UBS Rlty Investor LLC, UBS AG.Responses due by 11/20/2009 (Ritter, David) (Entered: 10/30/2009)
PACER 51 Filed: 10/29/2009, Entered: 10/29/2009 Reply to Response to Motion
REPLY to Response to 40 First MOTION to Compel filed by Richard Trusz. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-3, # 2 Exhibit 4)(Steigman, Todd) (Entered: 10/29/2009)
PACER 50 Filed: 10/27/2009, Entered: 10/27/2009 Status Report
STATUS REPORT Plaintiff's Status Report by Richard Trusz. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-3)(Steigman, Todd) (Entered: 10/27/2009)
PACER 49 Filed: 10/26/2009, Entered: 10/26/2009 Status Report
STATUS REPORT -- Defendants' Status Update by UBS Rlty Investor LLC, UBS AG. (Ritter, David) (Entered: 10/26/2009)
PACER 48 Filed: 10/20/2009, Entered: 10/20/2009 Response
RESPONSE re 40 First MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by UBS Rlty Investor LLC, UBS AG. (Ritter, David) (Entered: 10/20/2009)
PACER 47 Filed: 10/19/2009, Entered: 10/19/2009 Order on Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
ORDER granting 45 Motion for Extension of Time to Disclose Expert Witnesses, with consent, to and including 30 days following ruling on motion to compel; granting 46 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Motion to Compel, with consent, to and including 10/20/09. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 10/16/09. (Tooker, A.) (Entered: 10/19/2009)
PACER 46 Filed: 10/16/2009, Entered: 10/16/2009 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 40 First MOTION to Compel until October 20, 2009 by UBS Rlty Investor LLC, UBS AG. (Ritter, David) (Entered: 10/16/2009)
PACER 45 Filed: 10/15/2009, Entered: 10/15/2009 Motion for Extension of Time
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time To Disclose Expert Witnesses by Richard Trusz. (Steigman, Todd) (Entered: 10/15/2009)
PACER 44 Filed: 10/9/2009, Entered: 10/9/2009 Protective OrderCourt Filing
PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 10/7/09. (Spielberg, N.) (Entered: 10/09/2009)
PACER 43 Filed: 10/8/2009, Entered: 10/8/2009 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to MotionCourt Filing
ORDER granting 41 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Motion to Compel, with consent to and including 10/16/09; granting 42 Motion for Extension of Time, with consent, to and including 10/12/09. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 10/8/09. (Tooker, A.) (Entered: 10/08/2009)
PACER 42 Filed: 10/5/2009, Entered: 10/5/2009 Motion for Extension of Time
Second MOTION for Extension of Time until 10/12/2009 (consented to) to respond to discovery 39 Order on Motion for Extension of Time by Richard Trusz. (Steigman, Todd) (Entered: 10/05/2009)
PACER 41 Filed: 10/5/2009, Entered: 10/5/2009 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 40 First MOTION to Compel until October 16, 2009 by UBS Rlty Investor LLC, UBS AG. (Ritter, David) (Entered: 10/05/2009)
PACER 40 Filed: 9/15/2009, Entered: 9/15/2009 Motion to Compel
First MOTION to Compel by Richard Trusz.Responses due by 10/6/2009 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support Memo in Support of Motion to Compel, # 2 Exhibit A., # 3 Exhibit B., # 4 Exhibit C., # 5 Exhibit D., # 6 Exhibit E., # 7 Exhibit F., # 8 Exhibit G., # 9 Exhibit H., # 10 Exhibit I., # 11 Exhibit J., # 12 Exhibit K., # 13 Exhibit L., # 14 Exhibit M., # 15 Exhibit N.)(Steigman, Todd) (Entered: 09/15/2009)
PACER 39 Filed: 9/1/2009, Entered: 9/1/2009 Order on Motion for Extension of Time
ORDER granting 38 Motion for Extension of Time 10/05/2009 to respond to discovery. Signed by Clerk on 9/1/09. (Bauer, J.) (Entered: 09/01/2009)
PACER 38 Filed: 8/31/2009, Entered: 8/31/2009 Motion for Extension of Time
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until 10/05/2009 to respond and/or object to discovery by Richard Trusz. (Steigman, Todd) (Entered: 08/31/2009)
PACER 37 Filed: 8/28/2009, Entered: 8/28/2009 Proposed Order
PROPOSED ORDER Proposed Stipulated Protective Order by Richard Trusz, UBS Rlty Investor LLC, UBS AG. (Steigman, Todd) (Entered: 08/28/2009)
PACER 36 Filed: 5/29/2009, Entered: 5/29/2009 Reply to Response to Motion
REPLY to Response to 34 MOTION for Leave to File Attached Sur-Reply in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by Richard Trusz. (Steigman, Todd) (Entered: 05/29/2009)
PACER 35 Filed: 5/29/2009, Entered: 5/29/2009 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Memorandum in Opposition re 34 MOTION for Leave to File Attached Sur-Reply in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by UBS Rlty Investor LLC, UBS AG. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply and Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Sur-Reply)(Ritter, David) (Entered: 05/29/2009)
PACER 34 Filed: 5/27/2009, Entered: 5/27/2009 Motion for Leave to File
MOTION for Leave to File Attached Sur-Reply in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by Richard Trusz. (Attachments: # 1 Sur-Reply in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss)(Steigman, Todd) (Entered: 05/27/2009)
PACER 33 Filed: 5/22/2009, Entered: 5/22/2009 Amended Complaint
AMENDED COMPLAINT Request for Leave to Amend with Amended Complaint attached against UBS Rlty Investor LLC, UBS AG, filed by Richard Trusz. (Attachments: # 1 Third Amended Complaint)(Steigman, Todd) (Entered: 05/22/2009)
PACER 32 Filed: 5/21/2009, Entered: 5/21/2009 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess PagesCourt Filing
ORDER granting in part 30 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages, not to exceed 20 pages total. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 5/21/09. (Tooker, A.) (Entered: 05/21/2009)
PACER 31 Filed: 5/18/2009, Entered: 5/18/2009 Reply to Response to Motion
REPLY to Response to 23 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint filed by UBS Rlty Investor LLC, UBS AG. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Unreported Cases)(Alkhas, Nineveh) (Entered: 05/18/2009)
PACER 30 Filed: 5/18/2009, Entered: 5/18/2009 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by UBS Rlty Investor LLC, UBS AG. (Alkhas, Nineveh) (Entered: 05/18/2009)
PACER 29 Filed: 5/8/2009, Entered: 5/8/2009 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Memorandum in Opposition re 23 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint filed by Richard Trusz. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A. Unreported Cases, # 2 Exhibit B. OSHA-SOX Complaint, # 3 Exhibit C. State Court Complaint, # 4 Exhibit D. Bloomberg Article)(Steigman, Todd) (Entered: 05/08/2009)
PACER 28 Filed: 4/30/2009, Entered: 4/30/2009 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
SCHEDULING ORDER:Telephonic Status Conference set for 11/2/2009 03:30 PM before Judge Janet Bond Arterton. Amended Pleadings due by 6/30/2009. Discovery due by 2/15/2010. Dispositive Motions due by 3/15/2010. Trial Ready Date 9/1/2010. Trial Brief due by 4/1/2010. Parties status reports shall be filed five days prior to the status conference. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 4/29/2009. (Falcone, K.) (Entered: 04/30/2009)
PACER 27 Filed: 4/29/2009, Entered: 4/29/2009 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Steigman, Todd) (Entered: 04/29/2009)
PACER 26 Filed: 4/21/2009, Entered: 4/21/2009 Corporate Disclosure Statement
Corporate Disclosure Statement by UBS AG. (Ritter, David) (Entered: 04/21/2009)
PACER 25 Filed: 4/21/2009, Entered: 4/21/2009 Corporate Disclosure Statement
Corporate Disclosure Statement by UBS Rlty Investor LLC. (Ritter, David) (Entered: 04/21/2009)
PACER 24 Filed: 4/17/2009, Entered: 4/17/2009 Memorandum in Support of Motion
Memorandum in Support re 23 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint filed by UBS Rlty Investor LLC, UBS AG. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits A-C, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit D-E)(Ritter, David) (Entered: 04/17/2009)
PACER 23 Filed: 4/17/2009, Entered: 4/17/2009 Motion to Dismiss
MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint by UBS Rlty Investor LLC, UBS AG.Responses due by 5/8/2009 (Ritter, David) (Entered: 04/17/2009)
PACER 22 Filed: 4/3/2009, Entered: 4/3/2009 Amended Complaint
AMENDED COMPLAINT Second Amended Complaint against all defendants, filed by Richard Trusz.(Steigman, Todd) (Entered: 04/03/2009)
PACER 21 Filed: 4/2/2009, Entered: 4/2/2009 Order on Motion to StayCourt Filing
Scheduling/Endorsement ORDER denying 18 Motion to Stay without prejudice to renew by 4/17/2009. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 3/30/2009. (Falcone, K.) (Entered: 04/02/2009)
PACER 20 Filed: 3/24/2009, Entered: 3/24/2009 Notice of Appearance
NOTICE of Appearance by David B. Ritter on behalf of UBS Rlty Investor LLC, UBS AG (Ritter, David) (Entered: 03/24/2009)
PACER 19 Filed: 3/24/2009, Entered: 3/24/2009 Notice of Appearance
NOTICE of Appearance by Nineveh Alkhas on behalf of UBS Rlty Investor LLC, UBS AG (Alkhas, Nineveh) (Entered: 03/24/2009)
PACER 18 Filed: 3/12/2009, Entered: 3/17/2009 Motion to Stay
MOTION to Stay by UBS Rlty Investor LLC, UBS AG.Responses due by 4/2/2009 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Exhibit, # 13 Exhibit, # 14 Exhibit, # 15 Exhibit, # 16 Exhibit, # 17 Exhibit, # 18 Exhibit, # 19 Exhibit)(Falcone, K.) (Entered: 03/17/2009)
PACER 17 Filed: 3/16/2009, Entered: 3/16/2009 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
ORDER denying 10 Motion to Dismiss, without prejudice to renew, for failure to comply with pre-filing conference requirement. Granting 15 Motion for Pre-Filing Conference. A telephonic pre-filing conference will be held March 30, 2009 at 1:00 p.m. Defense counsel shall initiate the conference call. Chambers: 203-773-2456. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 3/16/2009. (Tooker, A.) (Entered: 03/16/2009)
PACER 16 Filed: 3/16/2009, Entered: 3/16/2009 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Memorandum in Opposition re 15 MOTION to Waive Pre-Filing Conference or, in the Alternative, for Pre-Filing Conference filed by Richard Trusz. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Steigman, Todd) (Entered: 03/16/2009)
PACER 15 Filed: 3/13/2009, Entered: 3/13/2009 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
MOTION to Waive Pre-Filing Conference or, in the Alternative, for Pre-Filing Conference by UBS Rlty Investor LLC, UBS AG.Responses due by 4/3/2009 (Fritz, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/13/2009)
PACER 14 Filed: 3/13/2009, Entered: 3/13/2009 Order on Motion to Appear
ORDER granting 12 Motion for David Ritter and Nineveh to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Clerk on 3/13/2009. (Falcone, K.) (Entered: 03/13/2009)
PACER 13 Filed: 3/13/2009, Entered: 3/13/2009 Docket Annotation
Docket Entry Correction to add the Motions to the Affidavits previously docketed re 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney David Ritter. Filing Fee $25.00. Receipt Number NO26991. (Attachments: # 1 Motion) (Falcone, K.) (Entered: 03/13/2009)
PACER 12 Filed: 3/13/2009, Entered: 3/13/2009 Motion to Appear
MOTION for Leave for David Ritter and Nineveh Alkhas to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee $50.00 by UBS Rlty Investor LLC, UBS AG.. Receipt Numbers NO26991 and NO26990. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit David Ritter)(Falcone, K.) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/13/2009: # 2 Motion, # 3 Motion) (Falcone, K.). (Entered: 03/13/2009)
PACER 11 Filed: 3/12/2009, Entered: 3/12/2009 Memorandum in Support of Motion
Memorandum in Support re 10 MOTION to Dismiss and/or Stay Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by UBS Rlty Investor LLC, UBS AG. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R)(Fritz, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/12/2009)
PACER 10 Filed: 3/12/2009, Entered: 3/12/2009 Motion to Dismiss
MOTION to Dismiss and/or Stay Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by UBS Rlty Investor LLC, UBS AG.Responses due by 4/2/2009 (Fritz, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/12/2009)
PACER 9 Filed: 3/9/2009, Entered: 3/9/2009 Summons Returned Executed
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Richard Trusz. UBS Rlty Investor LLC served on 2/18/2009, answer due 3/10/2009. (Steigman, Todd) (Entered: 03/09/2009)
PACER 8 Filed: 3/9/2009, Entered: 3/9/2009 Summons Returned Executed
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Richard Trusz. UBS AG served on 2/18/2009, answer due 3/10/2009. (Steigman, Todd) (Entered: 03/09/2009)
PACER 7 Filed: 3/5/2009, Entered: 3/5/2009 Notice of Appearance
NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Allan Fritz on behalf of UBS Rlty Investor LLC, UBS AG (Fritz, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/05/2009)
PACER 6 Filed: 3/5/2009, Entered: 3/5/2009 Notice of Appearance
NOTICE of Appearance by Victoria Woodin Chavey on behalf of UBS Rlty Investor LLC, UBS AG (Chavey, Victoria) (Entered: 03/05/2009)
PACER 5 Filed: 2/27/2009, Entered: 2/27/2009 Notice of Appearance
NOTICE of Appearance by William G. Madsen on behalf of Richard Trusz (Madsen, William) (Entered: 02/27/2009)
PACER 4 Filed: 2/27/2009, Entered: 2/27/2009 Amended Complaint
AMENDED COMPLAINT against all defendants, filed by Richard Trusz.(Steigman, Todd) (Entered: 02/27/2009)
PACER 3 Filed: 2/13/2009, Entered: 2/17/2009 Electronic Filing OrderCourt Filing
ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER: Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 02/13/09. (Grady, B.) (Entered: 02/17/2009)
PACER 2 Filed: 2/13/2009, Entered: 2/17/2009 Order on Pretrial Deadlines
Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Motions to Dismiss due on 05/13/09. Amended Pleadings due by 4/14/2009; Discovery due by 8/15/2009; Dispositive Motions due by 9/14/2009. Signed by Clerk on 02/13/09. (Grady, B.) (Entered: 02/17/2009)
PACER 1 Filed: 2/13/2009, Entered: 2/17/2009 Complaint
COMPLAINT against UBS Rlty Investors LLC, UBS AG ( Filing fee $350 receipt number H027578) filed by Richard Trusz.(Grady, B.) Modified on 2/18/2009 to correct the parties name (Grady, B.). (Entered: 02/17/2009)

Statistics

This case has been viewed 106 times.

No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Need Password Help?