Stonecrafters Inc v. Foxfire Printing and Packaging Inc
Illinois Northern District Court, Case No. 3:08-cv-06992
District Judge P. Michael Mahoney, presiding
docket://gov.uscourts.ilnd.3-08-cv-06992 (What is this?)

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
This docket can only tell you so much. Get the rest.
Access comprehensive profiles on judges, firms, lawyers, and more with PlainSite Pro and Pro Se.
No Logo Americana Art China Co., Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Anderson & Wanca

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
David Max Oppenheim +1 847 368 1500 +1 847 368 1501 doppenheim@andersonwanca.com
No Logo Stone Crafters, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Anderson & Wanca

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Jonathan Earl Irwin +1 847 368 1500 jirwin@andersonwanca.com
Brian John Wanca +1 847 368 1500 +1 847 368 1501 bwanca@andersonwanca.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Bock and Hatch LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Tod Allen Lewis +1 312 658 5500 +1 312 658 5555 tod@bockhatchllc.com
Louis Carey Ludwig +1 312 609 0908 louis@bockhatchllc.com
James Michael Smith +1 312 658 5500 +1 312 658 5555 jim@bockhatchllc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by cicerofrance.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Andrew T Smith +1 815 226 7700 ats@cicerofrance.com
No Logo Foxfire Printing And Packaging, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Coleman Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Jerry Scott Menge +1 312 444 1000 jmenge@colemanlawfirm.com
Eugene J. Schiltz +1 312 444 1000 +4441 444 444 1028 eschiltz@colemanlawfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Litchfield Cavo

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ALAN I. BECKER +1 312 781 6622 becker@litchfieldcavo.com
Laura Milnichuk +1 312 781 6672 milnichuk@litchfieldcavo.com
Lauren Marie Penn +1 312 781 6609 penn@litchfieldcavo.com
Erin Anne Potempa +1 312 781 6570 potempa@litchfieldcavo.com
Stephanie Wing Tipton +1 312 781 6636 +1 312 781 6630 tipton@litchfieldcavo.com
No Logo Continental Casualty Company, Intervenor Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Katherine Streicher Arnold +1 312 627 4000

Toggle Switch Represented by Carroll McNulty & Kull LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Heather Elizabeth Simpson +1 908 848 6300 hsimpson@cmk.com

Toggle Switch Represented by CNA Insurance

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Barrett Arnold Breitung +1 312 822 5047 barrett.breitung@cna.com
David Eugene Trainor +1 312 822 6045 +1 312 817 2486 David.Trainor@cna.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1441
Nature of Suit 890 Other Statutory Actions
  Entries (179) Calendar Events Related (0) Tools Right End
PACER 181 Filed: 2/21/2012, Entered: None
DECLARATION of Brian J. Wanca re Notice Requirement of the Class Action Fairness Act (Wanca, Brian) (Entered: 02/21/2012)
PACER 180 Filed: 2/14/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTE entry before Honorable P. Michael Mahoney: The Magistrate Judge is disqualified from ruling on Continental Casualty Company's motion to intervene and to stay 163 . The motion is referred to the District Court.[For further details see text below.]Notice mailed by Judicial Staff (pg, ) (Entered: 02/14/2012)
PACER 179 Filed: 2/8/2012, Entered: None
RESPONSE by Intervenor Defendant Continental Casualty Company to order on motion for order, in court hearing, terminate hearings, set/reset hearings 178 regarding Potential Conflict (Simpson, Heather) (Entered: 02/08/2012)
PACER 178 Filed: 2/1/2012, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable P. Michael Mahoney: Fairness hearing held on 2/1/2012. Potential intervenor given to 2/8/12 to submit material regarding potential conflict. Fairness hearing set for 3/27/2012 at 01:30 PM. (glg, ) (Entered: 02/01/2012)
PACER 177 Filed: 2/1/2012, Entered: None
notice regarding 4 exclusion requests and 0 objections by Americana Art China Co., Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - copies of exclusion requests)(Bock, Phillip) (Entered: 02/01/2012)
PACER 176 Filed: 1/31/2012, Entered: None
DECLARATION of Ross Good Re: Mailing of Class Notice (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Class Notice, # 2 Exhibit B - List of addresses)(Wanca, Brian) (Entered: 01/31/2012)
PACER 175 Filed: 1/31/2012, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM text entry,, 171 by Continental Casualty Company regarding Magistrate Jurisdiction (Simpson, Heather) (Entered: 01/31/2012)
PACER 174 Filed: 1/31/2012, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Intervenor Defendant Continental Casualty Company by Heather Elizabeth Simpson (Simpson, Heather) (Entered: 01/31/2012)
PACER 173 Filed: 1/31/2012, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Intervenor Defendant Continental Casualty Company by Christopher Robert Carroll (Carroll, Christopher) (Entered: 01/31/2012)
PACER 172 Filed: 1/30/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
Joint Memorandum in Support of Jurisdiction by the Magistrate Judge by Americana Art China Co., Inc., Foxfire Printing and Packaging Inc (Oppenheim, David) (Entered: 01/30/2012)
PACER 171 Filed: 1/24/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTE entry before Honorable P. Michael Mahoney: On October 4, 2011, this case was transferred to the Magistrate Judge pursuant to the joint consent of the parties. The transfer occurred to allow the Magistrate Judge to conduct settlement proceedings pursuant to a proposed class settlement. The parties and the potential intervenor are given to 2/1/2012 to file any authority indicating whether the consent to proceeding before the Magistrate Judge remains valid in light of the potential intervenor's motion to intervene and to stay the settlement proceedings.Notice mailed by Judicial Staff (pg, ) (Entered: 01/24/2012)
PACER 170 Filed: 1/17/2012, Entered: None
REPLY by Intervenor Defendant Continental Casualty Company to motion to intervene 163 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Trainor, David) (Entered: 01/17/2012)
PACER 169 Filed: 1/6/2012, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Americana Art China Co., Inc. by David Max Oppenheim (Oppenheim, David) (Entered: 01/06/2012)
PACER 168 Filed: 1/6/2012, Entered: None
RESPONSE by Americana Art China Co., Inc., Foxfire Printing and Packaging Incin Opposition to MOTION by Intervenor Defendant Continental Casualty Company to intervene 163 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Oppenheim, David) (Entered: 01/06/2012)
PACER 167 Filed: 12/20/2011, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable P. Michael Mahoney: Continental's Motion to intervene 163 is taken under advisement. Set deadlines as to motion to intervene 163 : Responses due by 1/6/2012 Replies due by 1/17/2012. If a party is not going to file a brief in response or reply, it is the obligation of that party, within the time frame established by this order, to so notify the court in writing. Mailed notice (glg, ) (Entered: 12/20/2011)
PACER 166 Filed: 12/14/2011, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Intervenor Defendant Continental Casualty Company by Katherine Streicher Arnold (Arnold, Katherine) (Entered: 12/14/2011)
PACER 165 Filed: 12/14/2011, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by Continental Casualty Company in support of motion to intervene 163 (Trainor, David) (Entered: 12/14/2011)
PACER 164 Filed: 12/14/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by David Eugene Trainor for presentment of motion to intervene 163 before Honorable P. Michael Mahoney on 12/23/2011 at 01:30 PM. (Trainor, David) (Entered: 12/14/2011)
PACER 163 Filed: 12/14/2011, Entered: None
MOTION by Intervenor Defendant Continental Casualty Company to intervene (Trainor, David) Modified on 12/15/2011 (jat, ). [and TO STAY] (Entered: 12/14/2011)
PACER 162 Filed: 12/14/2011, Entered: None
NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Continental Casualty Company (Trainor, David) (Entered: 12/14/2011)
PACER 161 Filed: 12/14/2011, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Intervenor Defendant Continental Casualty Company by David Eugene Trainor (Trainor, David) (Entered: 12/14/2011)
PACER 160 Filed: 12/14/2011, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Intervenor Defendant Continental Casualty Company by Barrett Arnold Breitung (Breitung, Barrett) (Entered: 12/14/2011)
PACER 159 Filed: 12/12/2011, Entered: None
Notice of wish to be excluded from the class action by Gazebo Works Too, Inc. (jat, ) (Entered: 12/12/2011)
PACER 158 Filed: 11/21/2011, Entered: None
Opt Out Of Class Action Settlement by Leroy Allgyer (pg, ) (Entered: 11/21/2011)
PACER 156 Filed: 11/2/2011, Entered: None
Notice of Correction by Americana Art China Co., Inc. (Oppenheim, David) (Entered: 11/02/2011)
PACER 155 Filed: 11/2/2011, Entered: None
DECLARATION of Andrew Barnett (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Class Notice Document)(Kelly, Ryan) (Entered: 11/02/2011)
PACER 154 Filed: 10/26/2011, Entered: None
ORDER PRELIMINARILY APPROVING THE CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT AND APPROVING TOE CLASS NOTICE Signed by the Honorable P. Michael Mahoney on 10/24/2011:(pg, ) (Entered: 10/26/2011)
PACER 153 Filed: 10/26/2011, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable P. Michael Mahoney: Enter order preliminarily approving the class action settlement and approving the class notice. Fairness hearing set for 2/1/2012 at 10:00 AM. Mailed notice (glg, ) (Entered: 10/26/2011)
PACER 152 Filed: 10/19/2011, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable P. Michael Mahoney: Plaintiff's motion to substitute Americana Art China Co., Inc., as a new class representative and for voluntary dismissal of Stonecrafters, Inc., as a party plaintiff 148 is granted. Preliminary Settlement hearing held. The court finds the settlement appears to be fair, just and reasonable. Class notice to be sent by October 27, 2011. Objections, motions and briefs in support to intervene and op out notices due December 14, 2011. Counsel to submit draft order for court's approval.Electronic notice (jat, ) (Entered: 10/19/2011)
PACER 151 Filed: 10/14/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Brian J Wanca for presentment of motion for order 150 before Honorable P. Michael Mahoney on 10/19/2011 at 10:00 AM. (Wanca, Brian) (Entered: 10/14/2011)
PACER 150 Filed: 10/14/2011, Entered: None
MOTION by Plaintiff Stonecrafters Inc for order Preliminarily Approving Class Action Settlement (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Settlement Agreement, # 2 Exhibit B - Ferretti Affidavit)(Wanca, Brian) (Entered: 10/14/2011)
PACER 149 Filed: 10/14/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Brian J Wanca for presentment of motion to intervene 148 before Honorable P. Michael Mahoney on 10/19/2011 at 10:00 AM. (Wanca, Brian) (Entered: 10/14/2011)
PACER 148 Filed: 10/14/2011, Entered: None
MOTION by Plaintiff Stonecrafters Inc to intervene / Substitute New Class Representative (Wanca, Brian) (Entered: 10/14/2011)
PACER 147 Filed: 10/4/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTE entry before Honorable Frederick J. Kapala: Parties consent to exercise of jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge. This case is transferred to Magistrate P. Michael Mahoney.Notices mailed. (jat, ) (Entered: 10/05/2011)
PACER 146 Filed: 10/5/2011, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable P. Michael Mahoney: Telephonic Discovery hearing held on 10/5/2011. Hearing on Preliminary Approval of Class Settlement set for 10/19/2011 at 10:00 AM. Telephoned notice (glg, ) (Entered: 10/05/2011)
PACER 145 Filed: 10/3/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
JOINT CONSENT to Exercise of Jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge (Wanca, Brian) (Entered: 10/03/2011)
PACER 144 Filed: 9/26/2011, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Foxfire Printing and Packaging Inc by Jerry Scott Menge (Menge, Jerry) (Entered: 09/26/2011)
PACER 143 Filed: 9/26/2011, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Foxfire Printing and Packaging Inc by Eugene J. Schiltz (Schiltz, Eugene) (Entered: 09/26/2011)
PACER 142 Filed: 9/23/2011, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable P. Michael Mahoney: Defendant's motion for leave to substitute counsel of record 140 is granted. E. Schiltz and J. Menge given leave to file their appearances and counsel from Litchfield Cavo given leave to withdraw.Electronic notice (jat, ) (Entered: 09/26/2011)
PACER 141 Filed: 9/9/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Stephanie Wing Tipton for presentment of motion to substitute attorney 140 before Honorable P. Michael Mahoney on 9/23/2011 at 01:30 PM. (Tipton, Stephanie) (Entered: 09/09/2011)
PACER 140 Filed: 9/9/2011, Entered: None
MOTION by Defendant Foxfire Printing and Packaging Inc to substitute attorney (Tipton, Stephanie) (Entered: 09/09/2011)
PACER 139 Filed: 9/1/2011, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable P. Michael Mahoney: Due to the court's schedule, Telephonic Discovery Hearing reset for 10/5/2011 at 09:45 AM. Mailed notice (glg, ) (Entered: 09/01/2011)
PACER 138 Filed: 7/21/2011, Entered: None
REPLY by Plaintiff Stonecrafters Inc to Response 137 In Support of 3d Motion for Class Certification (Lewis, Tod) (Entered: 07/21/2011)
PACER 137 Filed: 6/30/2011, Entered: None
RESPONSE by Defendant Foxfire Printing and Packaging Inc to Plaintiff's THIRD MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A Thru D, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit E Thru I)(Tipton, Stephanie) (Entered: 06/30/2011)
PACER 136 Filed: 6/30/2011, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable P. Michael Mahoney: Telephonic Discovery hearing held on 6/30/2011. Telephonic Discovery Hearing set for 10/3/2011 at 09:45 AM. Telephoned notice (glg, ) (Entered: 06/30/2011)
PACER 135 Filed: 5/10/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTE entry before Honorable P. Michael Mahoney: Attorney Jonathan E. Irwin's Motion to Withdraw 129 , 133 is granted. Notice of Motion for presentment of motion to withdraw before Magistrate Judge Mahoney on 5/20/11 is stricken.Notices mailed by Judicial staff. (jat, ) (Entered: 05/10/2011)
PACER 134 Filed: 5/9/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Jonathan Earl Irwin for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney 133 before Honorable P. Michael Mahoney on 5/20/2011 at 01:30 PM. (Irwin, Jonathan) (Entered: 05/09/2011)
PACER 133 Filed: 5/9/2011, Entered: None
MOTION by counsel for Plaintiff Stonecrafters Inc to withdraw as attorney (Irwin, Jonathan) (Entered: 05/09/2011)
PACER 132 Filed: 5/6/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTE entry before Honorable Frederick J. Kapala: Notices of motion [130 & 131] filed by Jonathan Irwin are stricken as his motion to withdraw should be presented to Magistrate Mahoney. Case removed from Judge Kapala's May 13, 2011 motion call. Attorney Irwin is directed to file an amended motion of motion setting his motion to withdraw 129 for presentment to Magistrate Mahoney instead.Telephonic notice (pg, ) (Entered: 05/06/2011)
PACER 131 Filed: 5/5/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Jonathan Earl Irwin for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney 129 before Honorable Frederick J. Kapala on 5/13/2011 at 09:00 AM. (Irwin, Jonathan) (Entered: 05/05/2011)
PACER 130 Filed: 5/4/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Jonathan Earl Irwin for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney 129 before Honorable Frederick J. Kapala on 5/13/2011 at 09:00 AM. (Irwin, Jonathan) (Entered: 05/04/2011)
PACER 129 Filed: 5/4/2011, Entered: None
MOTION by counsel for Plaintiff Stonecrafters Inc to withdraw as attorney (Irwin, Jonathan) (Entered: 05/04/2011)
PACER 128 Filed: 4/29/2011, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable P. Michael Mahoney: Plaintiff's Motion for leave to file brief in support of motion to certify class 123 is granted. Responses due by 6/30/2011 Replies due by 7/21/2011. Defendant's Motion to strike 125 is granted in part. Defendant may take 30 minute deposition of Biggersten by 5/31/11. Telephonic Discovery Hearing reset for 6/30/2011 at 09:45 AM. Mailed notice (glg, ) (Entered: 04/29/2011)
PACER 127 Filed: 4/28/2011, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Foxfire Printing and Packaging Inc by Lauren Marie Penn (Penn, Lauren) (Entered: 04/28/2011)
PACER 126 Filed: 4/27/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Stephanie Wing Tipton for presentment of motion to strike 125 before Honorable P. Michael Mahoney on 4/29/2011 at 01:30 PM. (Tipton, Stephanie) (Entered: 04/27/2011)
PACER 125 Filed: 4/27/2011, Entered: None
MOTION by Defendant Foxfire Printing and Packaging Inc to strike Plaintiff's Expert's Second Expert Report (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Tipton, Stephanie) (Entered: 04/27/2011)
PACER 124 Filed: 4/26/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Tod Allen Lewis for presentment of motion for leave to file,,, 123 before Honorable P. Michael Mahoney on 4/29/2011 at 01:30 PM. (Lewis, Tod) (Entered: 04/26/2011)
PACER 123 Filed: 4/26/2011, Entered: None
MOTION by Plaintiff Stonecrafters Inc for leave to file 3rd Class Cert Brief Instanter (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Law, # 2 Exhibit Ferretti Depo, # 3 Exhibit Spencer Depo, # 4 Exhibit Light Depo, # 5 Exhibit McDaniel Depo, # 6 Exhibit Nooney Depo, # 7 Exhibit Stein Depo, # 8 Exhibit Clark depo, # 9 Exhibit Hammerl Depo, # 10 Exhibit Redacted Biggerstaff Report, # 11 Exhibit Interrogatory Responses, # 12 Exhibit Doc Responses, # 13 Exhibit RTA Answers, # 14 Exhibit GM v Finish, # 15 Exhibit Green v Servicemaster, # 16 Exhibit Sadowski v Med1, # 17 Exhibit Holtzman v Turza, # 18 Exhibit GM v Group C, # 19 Exhibit October 22 fax - Fox0377, # 20 Exhibit Fox0830-31, # 21 Exhibit Fox0852-53, # 22 Exhibit Second Biggerstaff Report)(Lewis, Tod) (Entered: 04/26/2011)
PACER 122 Filed: 4/8/2011, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable P. Michael Mahoney: Discovery hearing held on 4/8/2011. Plaintiff's Motion to certify class 119 is taken under advisement. Set deadlines as to motion to certify class 119 : Responses due by 4/29/2011 Replies due by 5/6/2011. If a party is not going to file a brief in response or reply, it is the obligation of that party, within the time frame established by this order, to so notify the court in writing. Parties to hold Rule 26 Meeting. Case management order due by 5/10/2011. Initial Pretrial Conference set for 5/11/2011 at 01:30 PM. Mailed notice (glg, ) (Entered: 04/08/2011)
PACER 121 Filed: 4/5/2011, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable P. Michael Mahoney: Settlement conference held on 4/5/2011. Plaintiff's Motion to certify class 119 is entered and continued to Discovery Hearing set for 4/8/2011 at 01:30 PM. (glg, ) (Entered: 04/05/2011)
PACER 120 Filed: 4/4/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Tod Allen Lewis for presentment of motion to certify class 119 before Honorable P. Michael Mahoney on 4/15/2011 at 01:30 PM. (Lewis, Tod) (Entered: 04/04/2011)
PACER 119 Filed: 4/4/2011, Entered: None
MOTION by Plaintiff Stonecrafters Inc to certify class -- Third Motion (Lewis, Tod) (Entered: 04/04/2011)
PACER 118 Filed: 2/23/2011, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable P. Michael Mahoney: Pursuant to request of counsel, Settlement Conference reset for 4/5/2011 at 01:30 PM. Mailed notice (glg, ) (Entered: 02/23/2011)
PACER 117 Filed: 2/16/2011, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable P. Michael Mahoney: Telephonic Discovery hearing held on 2/16/2011. Stipulation for extension of time continued to Settlement Conference set for 3/22/2011 at 01:30 PM. Real parties in interest to be present. Counsel to submit 5 page settlement document to chambers by 3/21/11. Telephoned notice (glg, ) (Entered: 02/16/2011)
PACER 116 Filed: 2/1/2011, Entered: None
STIPULATION and Joint Motion For an Extension of Time to File an Amended Motion For Class Certification (Kelly, Ryan) (Entered: 02/01/2011)
PACER 115 Filed: 1/6/2011, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable P. Michael Mahoney: Telephonic Discovery hearing held on 1/6/2011. Class Motions due by 2/3/2011. Discovery Hearing set for 2/16/2011 at 01:30 PM. Telephoned notice (glg, ) (Entered: 01/06/2011)
PACER 114 Filed: 12/23/2010, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Frederick J. Kapala:Plaintiff's motion to certify class 105 is denied without prejudice. [For further details see order.] Electronic notice (jat, ) (Entered: 12/23/2010)
PACER 113 Filed: 11/17/2010, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable P. Michael Mahoney: Telephonic Discovery hearing held on 11/17/2010. Telephonic Discovery Hearing set for 1/6/2011 at 09:30 AM. Telephoned notice (glg, ) (Entered: 11/17/2010)
PACER 112 Filed: 10/4/2010, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable P. Michael Mahoney: Telephonic Discovery hearing held on 10/4/2010. Telephonic Discovery Hearing set for 11/17/2010 at 09:30 AM. Telephoned notice (glg, ) (Entered: 10/04/2010)
PACER 111 Filed: 9/8/2010, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Stonecrafters Inc by Tod Allen Lewis (Lewis, Tod) (Entered: 09/08/2010)
PACER 110 Filed: 8/3/2010, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable P. Michael Mahoney: Telephonic Discovery hearing held on 8/3/2010. Telephonic Discovery Hearing set for 10/4/2010 at 09:30 AM. Telephoned notice (glg, ) (Entered: 08/03/2010)
PACER 109 Filed: 7/2/2010, Entered: None
REPLY by Plaintiff Stonecrafters Inc to motion to certify class 105 (Smith, James) (Entered: 07/02/2010)
PACER 108 Filed: 6/11/2010, Entered: None
RESPONSE by Foxfire Printing and Packaging Inc to MOTION by Plaintiff Stonecrafters Inc to certify class 105 Plaintiff's Second Motion for Class Certification (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A through E to Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Second Motion For Class Certification)(Tipton, Stephanie) (Entered: 06/11/2010)
PACER 107 Filed: 5/26/2010, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable P. Michael Mahoney: Plaintiff's Motion for reconsideration 103 is denied. Plaintiff's counsel does not appear. (glg, ) (Entered: 05/26/2010)
PACER 106 Filed: 5/14/2010, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by Stonecrafters Inc in support of motion to certify class 105 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit T, # 21 Exhibit U, # 22 Exhibit V)(Smith, James) (Entered: 05/14/2010)
PACER 105 Filed: 5/14/2010, Entered: None
MOTION by Plaintiff Stonecrafters Inc to certify class (Smith, James) (Entered: 05/14/2010)
PACER 104 Filed: 5/13/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Ryan M. Kelly for presentment of motion for reconsideration, motion for relief, 103 before Honorable P. Michael Mahoney on 5/26/2010 at 01:30 PM. (Kelly, Ryan) (Entered: 05/13/2010)
PACER 103 Filed: 5/13/2010, Entered: None
MOTION by Plaintiff Stonecrafters Inc for reconsideration regarding order on motion for reconsideration,, terminate motions, 101 (Kelly, Ryan) Modified on 5/14/2010 (jat, ). [attached document has incorrect case number] (Entered: 05/13/2010)
PACER 102 Filed: 5/5/2010, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable P. Michael Mahoney: Telephonic Discovery hearing held on 5/5/2010. Motion for class certification due 5/14/10. Set deadlines as to motion for class certification. Responses due by 6/11/2010 Replies due by 7/2/2010. If a party is not going to file a brief in response or reply, it is the obligation of that party, within the time frame established by this order, to so notify the court in writing. Telephonic Discovery Hearing set for 8/3/2010 at 09:30 AM.Mailed notice (glg, ) (Entered: 05/05/2010)
PACER 101 Filed: 4/29/2010, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable P. Michael Mahoney: The court grants Defendant's motion 83 to reconsider. Plaintiff's attorney must pay Defendant $3,434.89 within a reasonable period of time.[For further details see text below.]Notice mailed by Judicial Staff (pg, ) (Entered: 04/29/2010)
PACER 100 Filed: 4/21/2010, Entered: None
MOTION by Defendant Foxfire Printing and Packaging Inc to supplement Its Motion To Reconsider Its Motion for Fees (Tipton, Stephanie) (Entered: 04/21/2010)
PACER 99 Filed: 4/21/2010, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable P. Michael Mahoney: Defendant's Motion for leave to file supplement to motion to reconsider 95 is granted. (glg, ) (Entered: 04/21/2010)
PACER 98 Filed: 4/19/2010, Entered: None
AMENDED NOTICE of Motion by Stephanie Wing Tipton for presentment of motion for leave to file 95 before Honorable P. Michael Mahoney on 4/21/2010 at 01:30 PM. (Tipton, Stephanie) (Entered: 04/19/2010)
PACER 97 Filed: 4/16/2010, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Frederick J. Kapala:Plaintiff's motion to certify class 81 is denied without prejudice. [For further details see minute order.] Electronic notice (jat, ) (Entered: 04/16/2010)
PACER 96 Filed: 4/16/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Stephanie Wing Tipton for presentment of motion for leave to file 95 before Honorable P. Michael Mahoney on 4/21/2010 at 01:30 PM. (Tipton, Stephanie)[refile with correct date.] Modified on 4/19/2010 (pg, ). (Entered: 04/16/2010)
PACER 95 Filed: 4/16/2010, Entered: None
MOTION by Defendant Foxfire Printing and Packaging Inc for leave to file Out of Time (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Motion to Supplement Motion to Reconsider Defendant's Motion for Fees Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 30(g))(Tipton, Stephanie) (Entered: 04/16/2010)
PACER 94 Filed: 3/31/2010, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable P. Michael Mahoney: Defendant's motion 83 for fees does not include an itemized billing sheet. Instead, Defendant attached Attorney Potempa's affidavit. The affidavit is insufficient for the court to determine reasonable costs and fees incurred under Hensely v. Eckerhart, 461 U.S. 424 (1983). By April 7, 2010, Defendant is to supplement its motion with an itemized billing sheet breaking down the fees and costs incurred and is to indicate whether it has paid those fees. Defendant should also attach any appropriate receipts.Notice mailed by Judicial Staff (pg, ) (Entered: 03/31/2010)
PACER 93 Filed: 3/17/2010, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable P. Michael Mahoney: Telephonic Discovery hearing held on 3/17/2010. Telephonic Discovery Hearing set for 5/5/2010 at 09:30 AM. Telephoned notice (glg, ) (Entered: 03/17/2010)
PACER 92 Filed: 2/16/2010, Entered: None
REPLY by Stonecrafters Inc to response to motion 91 (Bock, Phillip) (Entered: 02/16/2010)
PACER 91 Filed: 1/29/2010, Entered: None
RESPONSE by Foxfire Printing and Packaging Inc to MOTION by Plaintiff Stonecrafters Inc to certify class 81 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A through E to Foxfire's Response to Plaintiff's Motion For Class Certification)(Tipton, Stephanie) (Entered: 01/29/2010)
PACER 90 Filed: 1/13/2010, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Stonecrafters Inc by Louis Carey Ludwig (Ludwig, Louis) (Entered: 01/13/2010)
PACER 89 Filed: 1/13/2010, Entered: None
REPLY by Foxfire Printing and Packaging Inc to MOTION by Defendant Foxfire Printing and Packaging Inc for reconsideration of Its Motion for Fees Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 30(g)MOTION by Defendant Foxfire Printing and Packaging Inc for reconsideration of Its Motion for Fees Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 30(g) 83 , response to motion,, 88 In Support of Its Motion for Reconsideration (Tipton, Stephanie) (Entered: 01/13/2010)
PACER 88 Filed: 1/6/2010, Entered: None
RESPONSE by Stonecrafters Inc to MOTION by Defendant Foxfire Printing and Packaging Inc for reconsideration of Its Motion for Fees Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 30(g)MOTION by Defendant Foxfire Printing and Packaging Inc for reconsideration of Its Motion for Fees Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 30(g) 83 Plaintiff's Response To Defendant's Motion To Reconsider (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A: Defendant's Motion To Reconsider (12/14/09), # 2 Exhibit B: Defendant's Motion For Fees Pursuant To F.R.C.P. 30(g) (09/29/09), # 3 Exhibit C: Memorandum Opinion and Order (11/23/09))(Ludwig, Louis) (Entered: 01/06/2010)
PACER 87 Filed: 12/18/2009, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable P. Michael Mahoney:Minute entry # 86 is amended as follows: Response to motion to certify class 81 due by 1/29/2010.Mailed notice (glg, ) (Entered: 12/18/2009)
PACER 86 Filed: 12/16/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTE entry before Honorable P. Michael Mahoney: Discovery hearing held on 12/16/2009. Plaintiff's Motion to certify class 81 is taken under advisement; Set deadlines as to motion to certify class. Responses due 1/19/10. Replies due 2/16/10. Defendant's Motion for reconsideration 83 is taken under advisement. ;Set deadlines as to motion for reconsideration, 83 : Responses due by 1/6/2010 Replies due by 1/13/2010. Magistrate Judge will rule on motion for reconsideration. If a party is not going to file a brief in response or reply, it is the obligation of that party, within the time frame established by this order, to so notify the court in writing. Telephonic Discovery Hearing set for 3/17/2010 at 09:30 AM.Mailed notice (glg, ) (Entered: 12/16/2009)
PACER 85 Filed: 12/14/2009, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Stephanie Wing Tipton for presentment of motion for reconsideration, 83 before Honorable P. Michael Mahoney on 12/16/2009 at 01:30 PM. (Tipton, Stephanie) (Entered: 12/14/2009)
PACER 84 Filed: 12/14/2009, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Stephanie Wing Tipton for presentment of motion for reconsideration, 83 before Honorable P. Michael Mahoney on 12/16/2009 at 01:30 PM. (Tipton, Stephanie)[Not a Notice see 85] Modified on 12/15/2009 (pg, ). (Entered: 12/14/2009)
PACER 83 Filed: 12/14/2009, Entered: None
MOTION by Defendant Foxfire Printing and Packaging Inc for reconsideration of Its Motion for Fees Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 30(g) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Email from Ryan Kelly, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Affidavit of Erin Potempa)(Tipton, Stephanie) (Entered: 12/14/2009)
PACER 82 Filed: 12/2/2009, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by Stonecrafters Inc in support of motion to certify class 81 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Ferretti depo with exhibits, # 2 Exhibit B - Spencer depo, # 3 Exhibit C - Light depo with exhibits, # 4 Exhibit D - McDaniel depo with exhibits, # 5 Exhibit E - Nooney depo with exhibits, # 6 Exhibit F - Stein depo, # 7 Exhibit G - Clark depo with exhibits, # 8 Exhibit H - Hammerl depo with exhibit, # 9 Exhibit I - Biggerstaff report and exhibits, # 10 Exhibit J - Defendant's answers to interrogatories, # 11 Exhibit K - Defendant's responses to document requests, # 12 Exhibit L - Defendant's answers to request for admissions, # 13 Exhibit M - CE v. Cy's Crabhouse opinion, # 14 Exhibit N - GM v. Finish Thompson opinion, # 15 Exhibit O - Green v Service Master opinion, # 16 Exhibit P - Sadowski Med1 opinion, # 17 Exhibit Q - GM Franklin Bank opinion, # 18 Exhibit R - Holtzman v Turza opinion, # 19 Exhibit S - ESI Ergonomic opinion, # 20 Exhibit T - American Home opinion, # 21 Exhibit U - Travel 100 Empire Cooler opinion, # 22 Exhibit V - Ellis v Mario opinion, # 23 Exhibit W - Bock firm resume, # 24 Exhibit X - Wanca firm resume)(Bock, Phillip) (Entered: 12/02/2009)
PACER 81 Filed: 12/2/2009, Entered: None
MOTION by Plaintiff Stonecrafters Inc to certify class (Bock, Phillip) (Entered: 12/02/2009)
PACER 80 Filed: 11/23/2009, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable P. Michael Mahoney on 11/23/2009:(pg, ) (Entered: 11/24/2009)
PACER 79 Filed: 11/23/2009, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before the Honorable P. Michael Mahoney: The court denies Defendant's first motion 63 for costs and attorneys' fees. The court grants Defendant's second motion 68 for costs and fees as follows: $1200.42 for travel costs, $2584 for fees associated with travel time, and $152 for the time spent waiting at the place in which the second attempt was scheduled to occur. The court awards a grand total of $3936.42 to be paid within a reasonable time.[For further detail see separate order(s).]Notice mailed by Judicial Staff (pg, ) (Entered: 11/24/2009)
PACER 78 Filed: 11/13/2009, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before the Honorable P. Michael Mahoney: Plaintiff's Motion for extension of time 74 is granted. Class Discovery ordered closed by 12/2/2009. Class Motions due by 12/2/2009. Discovery Hearing reset for 12/16/2009 at 01:30 PM. (glg, ) (Entered: 11/13/2009)
PACER 77 Filed: 11/12/2009, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Stonecrafters Inc by James Michael Smith (Smith, James) (Entered: 11/12/2009)
PACER 76 Filed: 11/10/2009, Entered: None
REPLY by Foxfire Printing and Packaging Inc to MOTION by Defendant Foxfire Printing and Packaging Inc for attorney fees Relating to Plaintiff's Failure to Attend the FAXTS Deposition 68 , response in opposition to motion 73 (Tipton, Stephanie) (Entered: 11/10/2009)
PACER 75 Filed: 11/5/2009, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Ryan M. Kelly for presentment of extension of time 74 before Honorable P. Michael Mahoney on 11/13/2009 at 01:30 PM. (Kelly, Ryan) (Entered: 11/05/2009)
PACER 74 Filed: 11/5/2009, Entered: None
MOTION by Plaintiff Stonecrafters Inc for extension of time to Take Deposition and File Brief (Kelly, Ryan) (Entered: 11/05/2009)
PACER 73 Filed: 11/5/2009, Entered: None
RESPONSE by Stonecrafters Incin Opposition to MOTION by Defendant Foxfire Printing and Packaging Inc for attorney fees Relating to Plaintiff's Failure to Attend the FAXTS Deposition 68 (Kelly, Ryan) (Entered: 11/05/2009)
PACER 72 Filed: 10/23/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTE entry before the Honorable P. Michael Mahoney: Defendant's Motion for attorney fees 68 is taken under advisement; Set deadlines as to motion for attorney fees, 68 : Responses due by 11/6/2009, Replies due by 11/13/2009. Magistrate Judge will rule. If a party is not going to file a brief in response or reply, it is the obligation of that party, within the time frame established by this order, to so notify the court in writing. Mailed notice (glg, ) (Entered: 10/23/2009)
PACER 71 Filed: 10/22/2009, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Stonecrafters Inc by Jonathan Earl Irwin (Irwin, Jonathan) (Entered: 10/22/2009)
PACER 70 Filed: 10/21/2009, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE of Service for serving the Re-Notice of Deposition of David Hammerl by Stephanie Wing Tipton on behalf of Foxfire Printing and Packaging Inc (Tipton, Stephanie) (Entered: 10/21/2009)
PACER 69 Filed: 10/21/2009, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Stephanie Wing Tipton for presentment of motion for attorney fees, 68 before Honorable P. Michael Mahoney on 10/23/2009 at 01:30 PM. (Tipton, Stephanie) (Entered: 10/21/2009)
PACER 68 Filed: 10/21/2009, Entered: None
MOTION by Defendant Foxfire Printing and Packaging Inc for attorney fees Relating to Plaintiff's Failure to Attend the FAXTS Deposition (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Email to SWT from Ryan Kelly, # 2 Exhibit B Affidavit of Laura Milnichuk)(Tipton, Stephanie) (Entered: 10/21/2009)
PACER 67 Filed: 10/16/2009, Entered: None
REPLY by Defendant Foxfire Printing and Packaging Inc In Support of Its Motion For Fees Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 30(g) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A & B to Reply Brief In Support of Its Motion For Fees Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 30(g))(Tipton, Stephanie) (Entered: 10/16/2009)
PACER 66 Filed: 10/12/2009, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE of Service for serving Second Notice of Deposition for David Hammerl by Stephanie Wing Tipton on behalf of Foxfire Printing and Packaging Inc (Tipton, Stephanie) (Entered: 10/12/2009)
PACER 65 Filed: 10/2/2009, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before the Honorable P. Michael Mahoney: Defendant's Motion for attorney fees 63 is taken under advisement; Set deadlines as to motion for attorney fees 63 : Responses due by 10/9/2009, Replies due by 10/16/2009. If a party is not going to file a brief in response or reply, it is the obligation of that party, within the time frame established by this order, to so notify the court in writing. Fact Discovery as to class ordered closed by 11/16/2009. Class Motions due by 11/16/2009. Discovery Hearing reset for 11/20/2009 at 01:30 PM. Mailed notice (glg, ) (Entered: 10/02/2009)
PACER 64 Filed: 9/29/2009, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Stephanie Wing Tipton for presentment of motion for attorney fees 63 before Honorable P. Michael Mahoney on 10/2/2009 at 01:30 PM. (Tipton, Stephanie) (Entered: 09/29/2009)
PACER 63 Filed: 9/29/2009, Entered: None
MOTION by Defendant Foxfire Printing and Packaging Inc for attorney fees Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 30(g) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Tipton, Stephanie) (Entered: 09/29/2009)
PACER 62 Filed: 9/29/2009, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE of Service for Amended Notice of Deposition of David Hammerl by Stephanie Wing Tipton on behalf of Foxfire Printing and Packaging Inc (Tipton, Stephanie) (Entered: 09/29/2009)
PACER 61 Filed: 9/28/2009, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Foxfire Printing and Packaging Inc by Laura Milnichuk (Milnichuk, Laura) (Entered: 09/28/2009)
PACER 60 Filed: 9/24/2009, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE of Service for Serving Notice of Deposition for David Hammerl by Stephanie Wing Tipton on behalf of Foxfire Printing and Packaging Inc (Tipton, Stephanie) (Entered: 09/24/2009)
PACER 59 Filed: 9/23/2009, Entered: None
PROTECTIVE Order (Agreed) signed by the Honorable P. Michael Mahoney on 9/23/2009 (jmm-r, ) (Entered: 09/23/2009)
PACER 58 Filed: 9/23/2009, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before the Honorable P. Michael Mahoney: Defendant's Motion for protective order 53 is granted. Enter protective order. (glg, ) (Entered: 09/23/2009)
PACER 57 Filed: 9/17/2009, Entered: None
AMENDED NOTICE of Motion by Stephanie Wing Tipton for presentment of motion for protective order 53 before Honorable P. Michael Mahoney on 9/23/2009 at 01:30 PM. (Tipton, Stephanie) (Entered: 09/17/2009)
PACER 56 Filed: 9/17/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Frederick J. Kapala: Case taken off this court's September 18, 2009 motion call. Defendant, Foxfire Printing & Packaging, to reset motion for protective order 53 before Magistrate Mahoney, to notify all parties that the case is not before Judge Kapala on September 18, 2009, and to provide Magistrate Mahoney with a paper courtesy copy of the motion for protective order and the amended notice within 24 hours.Electronic notice (pg, ) (Entered: 09/17/2009)
PACER 55 Filed: 9/15/2009, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before the Honorable P. Michael Mahoney: Pursuant to request of counsel, Motion to compel 49 is withdrawn and the hearing date of 9/17/09 is stricken. Telephoned notice (glg, ) (Entered: 09/15/2009)
PACER 54 Filed: 9/11/2009, Entered: None
Agreed NOTICE of Motion by Stephanie Wing Tipton for presentment of motion for protective order 53 before Honorable Frederick J. Kapala on 9/18/2009 at 09:00 AM. (Tipton, Stephanie) (Entered: 09/11/2009)
PACER 53 Filed: 9/11/2009, Entered: None
MOTION by Defendant Foxfire Printing and Packaging Inc for protective order Agreed (Tipton, Stephanie) (Entered: 09/11/2009)
PACER 52 Filed: 9/4/2009, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before the Honorable P. Michael Mahoney: Plaintiff's Motion to compel 46 is moot. Plaintiff's Motion to compel 49 is taken under advisement; Set deadlines/hearing as to motion to compel 49 : Responses due by 9/16/2009, Motion Hearing set for 9/17/2009 at 10:00 AM. As stated in open court defendant to bring material to hearing. Mailed notice (glg, ) (Entered: 09/04/2009)
PACER 51 Filed: 9/1/2009, Entered: None
AMENDED NOTICE of Motion by Ryan M. Kelly for presentment of motion to compel 49 before Honorable P. Michael Mahoney on 9/4/2009 at 01:30 PM. (Kelly, Ryan) (Entered: 09/01/2009)
PACER 50 Filed: 8/31/2009, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Ryan M. Kelly for presentment of motion to compel 49 before Honorable Richard R. Mahoney on 9/4/2009 at 01:30 PM. (Kelly, Ryan) (Entered: 08/31/2009)
PACER 49 Filed: 8/31/2009, Entered: None
MOTION by Plaintiff Stonecrafters Inc to compel [First Amended] (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-C)(Kelly, Ryan) (Entered: 08/31/2009)
PACER 48 Filed: 8/26/2009, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before the Honorable P. Michael Mahoney:Discovery hearing held on 8/26/2009. Class Motion due by and Fact Discovery ordered closed by 10/7/2009. Parties to hold 37.2 conference by 9/9/09. Discovery Hearing set for 10/7/2009 at 01:30 PM. Motion hearing date of 9/2/09 stricken. (glg, ) (Entered: 08/26/2009)
PACER 47 Filed: 8/25/2009, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Ryan M. Kelly for presentment of motion to compel 46 before Honorable P. Michael Mahoney on 9/2/2009 at 01:30 PM. (Kelly, Ryan) (Entered: 08/25/2009)
PACER 46 Filed: 8/25/2009, Entered: None
MOTION by Plaintiff Stonecrafters Inc to compel (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A, B, C)(Kelly, Ryan) (Entered: 08/25/2009)
PACER 45 Filed: 7/8/2009, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Frederick J. Kapala on 7/8/2009:(pg, ) (Entered: 07/09/2009)
PACER 44 Filed: 7/8/2009, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Frederick J. Kapala: Pursuant to the Memorandum Opinion and Order dated July 8, 2009, defendant's motion to dismiss 27 is granted. Counts II and III are dismissed.Docketing mailed notice (pg, ) (Entered: 07/09/2009)
PACER 43 Filed: 7/8/2009, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before the Honorable P. Michael Mahoney:Discovery hearing held on 7/8/2009. Discovery Hearing set for 8/26/2009 at 01:30 PM. (glg, ) (Entered: 07/08/2009)
PACER 42 Filed: 5/5/2009, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE of Service for serving Answers to Interrogatories and Documents Requests by Stephanie Wing Tipton on behalf of Foxfire Printing and Packaging Inc (Tipton, Stephanie) (Entered: 05/05/2009)
PACER 41 Filed: 4/8/2009, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE of Service For Serving Request for Production and Interrogatories on Plaintiff by Stephanie Wing Tipton on behalf of Foxfire Printing and Packaging Inc (Tipton, Stephanie) (Entered: 04/08/2009)
PACER 40 Filed: 3/27/2009, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before the Honorable P. Michael Mahoney:Initial Pretrial conference held on 3/27/2009. Case management order approved as stated. Scheduling as to Rule 23 motions only. FRCP 26(a)(1) due 3/27/09. FRCP 26(a)(2) reserved. Depositions limited to 5 hours. Amended Pleadings due by 10/2/2009. Fact Discovery ordered closed by 10/2/2009. Class Motions due by 10/2/2009. Discovery Hearing set for 7/8/2009 at 01:30 PM. (glg, ) (Entered: 03/27/2009)
PACER 39 Filed: 3/27/2009, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Stonecrafters Inc by Andrew T Smith (Smith, Andrew) (Entered: 03/27/2009)
PACER 38 Filed: 3/25/2009, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE of Service for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures by Stephanie Wing Tipton on behalf of Foxfire Printing and Packaging Inc (Tipton, Stephanie) (Entered: 03/25/2009)
PACER 37 Filed: 3/24/2009, Entered: None
Proposed Case Management Order by Foxfire Printing and Packaging Inc (Tipton, Stephanie) (Entered: 03/24/2009)
PACER 36 Filed: 3/6/2009, Entered: None
NOTICE by Foxfire Printing and Packaging Inc for Reply Brief in Support of Its Motion To Dismiss Counts II and III of Plaintiff's Complaint (Tipton, Stephanie) (Entered: 03/06/2009)
PACER 35 Filed: 3/6/2009, Entered: None
REPLY by Foxfire Printing and Packaging Inc to MOTION by Defendant Foxfire Printing and Packaging Inc to dismiss Counts II and III of Plaintiff's Complaint 27 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit)(Tipton, Stephanie) (Entered: 03/06/2009)
PACER 34 Filed: 2/18/2009, Entered: None
Exhibits to Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by Stonecrafters Inc (Wanca, Brian) (Entered: 02/18/2009)
PACER 33 Filed: 2/18/2009, Entered: None
RESPONSE by Stonecrafters Incin Opposition to MOTION by Defendant Foxfire Printing and Packaging Inc to dismiss Counts II and III of Plaintiff's Complaint 27 (Kelly, Ryan) (Entered: 02/18/2009)
PACER 32 Filed: 1/30/2009, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before the Honorable P. Michael Mahoney: Defendant's Motion for leave to file out of time 23 is granted. Defendant's Motion to dismiss 27 is taken under advisement; Set deadlines as to motion to dismiss 27 : Responses due by 2/20/2009, Replies due by 3/6/2009. If a party is not going to file a brief in response or reply, it is that partys obligation, within the time frame established by this order, to so notify the court in writing. Parties to hold Rule 26 Meeting. Case management order due by 3/26/2009. Initial Pretrial Conference set for 3/27/2009 at 01:30 PM. Status hearing of 3/4/09 stricken. Mailed notice (glg, ) (Entered: 01/30/2009)
PACER 31 Filed: 1/26/2009, Entered: None
Amended NOTICE of Motion by Stephanie Wing Tipton for presentment of motion to dismiss 27 before Honorable P. Michael Mahoney on 1/30/2009 at 01:30 PM. (Tipton, Stephanie) (Entered: 01/26/2009)
PACER 30 Filed: 1/26/2009, Entered: None
Amended NOTICE of Motion by Stephanie Wing Tipton for presentment of motion for leave to file 23 before Honorable P. Michael Mahoney on 1/30/2009 at 01:30 PM. (Tipton, Stephanie) (Entered: 01/26/2009)
PACER 29 Filed: 1/22/2009, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Stephanie Wing Tipton for presentment of motion to dismiss 27 before Honorable Frederick J. Kapala on 1/30/2009 at 09:00 AM. (Tipton, Stephanie) (Entered: 01/22/2009)
PACER 28 Filed: 1/22/2009, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM In support of Motion to Dismiss Counts II and III of Plaintiff's Complaint (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Thru D, # 2 Exhibit E Thru G)(Tipton, Stephanie) (Entered: 01/22/2009)
PACER 27 Filed: 1/22/2009, Entered: None
MOTION by Defendant Foxfire Printing and Packaging Inc to dismiss Counts II and III of Plaintiff's Complaint (Tipton, Stephanie) (Entered: 01/22/2009)
PACER 26 Filed: 1/22/2009, Entered: None
NOTICE by Foxfire Printing and Packaging Inc and COS for Answer to Complaint (Tipton, Stephanie) (Entered: 01/22/2009)
PACER 25 Filed: 1/22/2009, Entered: None
ANSWER to Complaint by Foxfire Printing and Packaging Inc(Tipton, Stephanie) (Entered: 01/22/2009)
PACER 24 Filed: 1/22/2009, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Stephanie Wing Tipton for presentment of motion for leave to file 23 before Honorable Frederick J. Kapala on 1/30/2009 at 09:00 AM. (Tipton, Stephanie) (Entered: 01/22/2009)
PACER 23 Filed: 1/22/2009, Entered: None
MOTION by Defendant Foxfire Printing and Packaging Inc for leave to file Out of Time (Tipton, Stephanie) (Entered: 01/22/2009)
PACER 22 Filed: 1/21/2009, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before the Honorable P. Michael Mahoney:Foxfire's motion for an extension of time to answer is granted. Response to complaint due by 1/9/2009. Status hearing set for 3/4/2009 at 01:30 PM.Mailed notice (glg, ) (Entered: 01/21/2009)
PACER 21 Filed: 1/16/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
INTRA district transfer from the Eastern Division. Case assigned to Judge Frederick J. Kapala and referred to Magistrate P. Michael Mahoney for all further proceedings.[Western Division received transfer letter.] (pg, ) (Entered: 01/20/2009)
PACER 20 Filed: 1/14/2009, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before the Honorable John W. Darrah: Defendant's motion to transfer case is granted 15 . The clerk is directed to transfer this case forthwith to the U.S.D.C. for the Northern District of Illinois, Western Division, forthwith. Status hearing set for 01/20/09 is vacated. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (ar, ) (Entered: 01/15/2009)
PACER 19 Filed: 1/6/2009, Entered: None
NOTICE by Foxfire Printing and Packaging Inc of Filing and Certificate of Service for Defendant's Local Rule 3.2 Statement (Tipton, Stephanie) (Entered: 01/06/2009)
PACER 18 Filed: 1/6/2009, Entered: None
NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Foxfire Printing and Packaging Inc (Tipton, Stephanie) (Entered: 01/06/2009)
PACER 17 Filed: 12/15/2008, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before the Honorable John W. Darrah: Status hearing set for 1/20/09 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notices (gcy, ) (Entered: 12/16/2008)
PACER 16 Filed: 12/11/2008, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Stephanie Wing Tipton for presentment of motion to transfer case 15 before Honorable John W. Darrah on 1/20/2009 at 09:00 AM. (Tipton, Stephanie) (Entered: 12/11/2008)
PACER 15 Filed: 12/11/2008, Entered: None
MOTION by Defendant Foxfire Printing and Packaging Inc to transfer case (Tipton, Stephanie) (Entered: 12/11/2008)
PACER 14 Filed: 12/10/2008, Entered: None
NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Stonecrafters Inc (Wanca, Brian) (Entered: 12/10/2008)
PACER 13 Filed: 12/10/2008, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Stonecrafters Inc by Phillip A. Bock (Bock, Phillip) (Entered: 12/10/2008)
PACER 12 Filed: 12/10/2008, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Stonecrafters Inc by Ryan M. Kelly (Kelly, Ryan) (Entered: 12/10/2008)
PACER 11 Filed: 12/10/2008, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Stonecrafters Inc by Brian J Wanca (Wanca, Brian) (Entered: 12/10/2008)
PACER 10 Filed: 12/9/2008, Entered: None
NOTICE by Foxfire Printing and Packaging Inc for filing an Appearance for Alan Becker (Becker, Alan) (Entered: 12/09/2008)
PACER 9 Filed: 12/9/2008, Entered: None
NOTICE by Foxfire Printing and Packaging Inc for Filing an Appearance for Erin Potempa (Potempa, Erin) (Entered: 12/09/2008)
PACER 8 Filed: 12/9/2008, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Foxfire Printing and Packaging Inc by Erin Anne Potempa (Potempa, Erin) (Entered: 12/09/2008)
PACER 7 Filed: 12/9/2008, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Foxfire Printing and Packaging Inc by Alan I. Becker (Becker, Alan) (Entered: 12/09/2008)
PACER 6 Filed: 12/9/2008, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Stephanie Wing Tipton for presentment of extension of time 5 before Honorable John W. Darrah on 1/20/2009 at 09:00 AM. (Tipton, Stephanie) (Entered: 12/09/2008)
PACER 5 Filed: 12/9/2008, Entered: None
MOTION by Defendant Foxfire Printing and Packaging Inc for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead (Tipton, Stephanie) (Entered: 12/09/2008)
PACER 3 Filed: 12/8/2008, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Foxfire Printing and Packaging Inc by Stephanie Wing Tipton. (gcy, ) (Entered: 12/08/2008)
PACER 2 Filed: 12/8/2008, Entered: None
CIVIL Cover Sheet. (gcy, ) (Entered: 12/08/2008)
PDF 1 Filed: 12/8/2008, Entered: None
NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of the 22nd Judicial Circuit McHenry County, case number (08CH2018) filed by Foxfire Printing and Packaging Inc Filing fee $ 350. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(gcy, ) (Entered: 12/08/2008)

Statistics

This case has been viewed 164 times.

No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Need Password Help?