USA v. Sereme et al
Florida Middle District Court, Case No. 2:11-cr-00097
docket://gov.uscourts.flmd.2-11-cr-00097 (What is this?)

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
The right information can save you thousands of dollars.
Access comprehensive profiles on judges, firms, lawyers, and more with PlainSite Pro and Pro Se.
No Logo Jude Sereme, Defendant (1)
  Entries (510) Calendar Events Related (0) Tools Right End
PDF 537 Filed: 5/6/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
OPINION AND ORDER as to Jude Sereme sustaining in part, overruling in part objections to the Presentence Report as set forth in the Opinion and Order. The Probation Office shall append a copy of these determinations to any copy of the Presentence Report made available to the Bureau of Prisons. The continued sentencing hearing is set for May 13, 2013 at 9:30 a.m. Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 5/6/2013. (AAA)
PACER 529 Filed: 4/22/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
OPINION AND ORDER as to Jude Sereme sustaining in part, overruling in part objections to the Presentence Report as set forth in the Opinion and Order. Any objections not resolved herein are taken under advisement pending sentencing. The Probation Office shall append a copy of these determinations to any copy of the Presentence Report made available to the Bureau of Prisons. Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 4/22/2013. (RKR) (Entered: 04/22/2013)
PACER 528 Filed: 4/19/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED CJA 20 as to Jophaney Hyppolite:Authorization to Pay John Mills - Voucher FTM2012-011-2.Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 3/4/13.Rtnd from Circuit 4/9/13. Paid 4/16/13.(jc) (Entered: 04/19/2013)
PACER 527 Filed: 4/19/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED CJA 24 as to Fritzco Desir:Authorization to Pay Jeffrey Thomas for TranscriptVoucher FTM2413-008.Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 4/3/13. Paid 4/16/13.(jc) (Entered: 04/19/2013)
PACER 526 Filed: 4/18/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED CJA 20 as to Jophaney Hyppolite:Authorization to Pay John Mills - Voucher FTM2012-011-F.Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 3/28/13. Paid 4/11/13.(jc) (Entered: 04/18/2013)
PACER 525 Filed: 4/18/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE OF APPEAL by Wilmane Jean re 523 Judgment Filing fee not paid. (Borras, Anthony) (Entered: 04/18/2013)
PACER 524 Filed: 4/18/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE OF APPEAL by Rick Jean re 522 Judgment Filing fee not paid. (Miller, Landon) (Entered: 04/18/2013)
PACER 523 Filed: 4/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
JUDGMENT as to Wilmane Jean (4), Counts 1, 1s, 4, 4s-5s, 5, Dismissed on motion of the United States; Counts 1ss, 5ss, Imprisonment: 120 Months as to each count, to be served concurrently; Supervised Release: 60 Months as to Count 1, 36 Months as to Count 5, to run concurrently; Special Assessment: $200.00; Count 4ss, Dismissed by the Court during Jury Trial. Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 4/15/2013. (BMA) (Entered: 04/15/2013)
PACER 522 Filed: 4/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
JUDGMENT as to Rick Jean (3), Counts 1, 1s, 4-8, 5s-8s, Dismissed on motion of the United States; Counts 1ss, 5ss, 8ss, Imprisonment: 240 Months as to each count, to be served concurrently; Supervised Release: 10 Years as to Count 1, 6 Years as to Count 5, 6 Years as to Count 8, to run concurrently; Special Assessment: $300.00; Counts 6ss-7ss, Dismissed by the Court during Jury Trial. Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 4/15/2013. (BMA) (Entered: 04/15/2013)
PACER 521 Filed: 4/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 485 defendant's Motion For Below Guideline Sentence as to Rick Jean (3). Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 4/15/2013. (BMA) (Entered: 04/15/2013)
PACER 520 Filed: 4/12/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John E. Steele: SENTENCING held on 4/12/2013 for Wilmane Jean (4), Counts 1s, 4, 4s-5s, 5, Dismissed on motion of the United States; Counts 1ss, 5ss, Imprisonment: 120 Months as to each count, to be served concurrently; Supervised Release: 60 Months as to Count 1, 36 Months as to Count 5, to run concurrently; Special Assessment: $200.00; Count 4ss, Dismissed by the Court during Jury Trial. Court Reporter: Jeffrey G. Thomas (BMA) (Entered: 04/12/2013)
PACER 519 Filed: 4/12/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John E. Steele: SENTENCING held on 4/12/2013 for Rick Jean (3), Counts 1, 1s, 4-8, 5s-8s, Dismissed on motion of the United States; Counts 1ss, 5ss, 8ss, Imprisonment: 240 Months as to each count, to be served concurrently; Supervised Release: 10 Years as to Count One, 6 Years as to Count Five, 6 Years as to Count Eight, to run concurrently; Special Assessment: $300.00. Court Reporter: Jeffrey G. Thomas (BMA) (Entered: 04/12/2013)
PACER 518 Filed: 4/11/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED CJA 20 as to Wilmane Jean:Authorization to Pay Anthony Borras - Voucher FTM2012-057-1.Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 2/4/13.Rtnd by Circuit 3/27/13. Paid 4/1/13.(jc) (Entered: 04/11/2013)
PACER 517 Filed: 4/11/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED CJA 20 as to Michael Dupin:Authorization to Pay Roy Foxall - Voucher FTM2013-005.Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 3/22/13. Paid 4/1/13.(jc) (Entered: 04/11/2013)
PACER 516 Filed: 4/11/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED CJA 24 as to Wilmane Jean:Authorization to Pay Jeffrey Thomas for TranscriptVoucher FTM2413-007.Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 3/15/13. Paid 4/1/13.(jc) (Entered: 04/11/2013)
PACER 515 Filed: 4/10/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING HEARING: The Sentencing hearing previously scheduled for 4/11/13 is rescheduled as to Jude Sereme. New hearing date and time:Sentencing reset for 4/26/2013 at 09:00 AM in Ft. Myers Courtroom 6 A before Judge John E. Steele. (BMA) (Entered: 04/10/2013)
PACER 514 Filed: 4/10/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 513 government's Unopposed Motion to Continue (Sentencing as to Jude Sereme (1). Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 4/10/2013. (BMA) (Entered: 04/10/2013)
PACER 513 Filed: 4/10/2013, Entered: None
MOTION to Continue Sentencing by USA as to Jude Sereme. (Casas, Jesus) (Entered: 04/10/2013)
PACER 512 Filed: 4/8/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING HEARING (AS TO TIME ONLY): The Sentencing hearing previously scheduled for 4/12/2013 is rescheduled as to Wilmane Jean. New hearing time:Sentencing reset for 4/12/2013 at 01:30 PM in Ft. Myers Courtroom 6 A before Judge John E. Steele. (BMA) (Entered: 04/08/2013)
PACER 511 Filed: 4/3/2013, Entered: None
NOTIFICATION that transcript has been filed by Jeffrey G. Thomas re: 452 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment as to Jophaney Hyppolite USCA number: 13-10471-FF (slp) (Entered: 04/08/2013)
PACER 510 Filed: 4/4/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE OF HEARING as to Wilmane Jean Sentencing set for 4/12/2013 at 09:00 AM in Ft. Myers Courtroom 6 A before Judge John E. Steele. (BMA) (Entered: 04/04/2013)
PACER 509 Filed: 4/1/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John E. Steele: Jesus Casas present on behalf of the government; Anthony Boras for the defendant. Sentencing hearing conducted but not completed. Continued to 4/12/2013 at 9:00 a.m.. Court Reporter: Jeffrey G. Thomas (BMA) (Entered: 04/04/2013)
PACER 508 Filed: 4/4/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE OF HEARING as to Jude Sereme Sentencing set for 4/11/2013 at 01:30 PM in Ft. Myers Courtroom 6 A before Judge John E. Steele. (BMA) (Entered: 04/04/2013)
PACER 507 Filed: 4/1/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John E. Steele: Jesus Casas present on behalf of the government; Russ Rosenthal for the defendant.Sentencing hearing conducted but not completed. Continued to 4/11/2013 at 1:30 p.m. Court Reporter: Jeffrey G. Thomas (BMA) (Entered: 04/04/2013)
PACER 506 Filed: 4/3/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED CJA 20 as to Rashid Francois:Authorization to Pay Jose Calvo - Voucher FTM2012-055.Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 1/8/13.Rtnd by Circuit 3/7/13. Paid 3/13/13.(jc) (Entered: 04/03/2013)
PACER 505 Filed: 4/3/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE to counsel of filing of OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Any party needing a copy of the transcript to review for redaction purposes may purchase a copy from the court reporter or view the document at the clerk's office public terminal as to Neheme Ductant. Court Reporter: Jeffrey G. Thomas (JGT) (Entered: 04/03/2013)
PACER 504 Filed: 4/3/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Sentencing as to Neheme Ductant held on 03/25/13 before Judge John E. Steele. Court Reporter/Transcriber Jeffrey G. Thomas, Telephone number (239) 461-2033. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter. Redaction Request due 4/24/2013, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/6/2013, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/2/2013. (JGT) (Entered: 04/03/2013)
PACER 503 Filed: 4/3/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE to counsel of filing of OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Any party needing a copy of the transcript to review for redaction purposes may purchase a copy from the court reporter or view the document at the clerk's office public terminal as to Jophaney Hyppolite, Eric Bonita. Court Reporter: Jeffrey G. Thomas (JGT) (Entered: 04/03/2013)
PACER 502 Filed: 4/3/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Sentencing as to Eric Bonita held on 01/22/13 before Judge John E. Steele. Court Reporter/Transcriber Jeffrey G. Thomas, Telephone number (239) 461-2033. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter. Redaction Request due 4/24/2013, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/6/2013, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/2/2013. (JGT) (Entered: 04/03/2013)
PACER 501 Filed: 4/3/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Sentencing as to Jophaney Hyppolite held on 01/22/13 before Judge John E. Steele. Court Reporter/Transcriber Jeffrey G. Thomas, Telephone number (239) 461-2033. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter. Redaction Request due 4/24/2013, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/6/2013, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/2/2013. (JGT) (Entered: 04/03/2013)
PACER 500 Filed: 4/2/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE to counsel of filing of OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Any party needing a copy of the transcript to review for redaction purposes may purchase a copy from the court reporter or view the document at the clerk's office public terminal as to Jude Sereme, Neheme Ductant, Rick Jean, Wilmane Jean, Jophaney Hyppolite, Eric Bonita. Court Reporter: Jeffrey G. Thomas (JGT) (Entered: 04/02/2013)
PACER 499 Filed: 4/2/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial, Day Eleven as to Jude Sereme, Neheme Ductant, Rick Jean, Wilmane Jean, Jophaney Hyppolite, Eric Bonita held on 10/05/12 before Judge John E. Steele. Court Reporter/Transcriber Jeffrey G. Thomas, Telephone number (239) 461-2033. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter. Redaction Request due 4/23/2013, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/3/2013, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/1/2013. (JGT) (Entered: 04/02/2013)
PACER 498 Filed: 4/2/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial, Day Ten as to Jude Sereme, Neheme Ductant, Rick Jean, Wilmane Jean, Jophaney Hyppolite, Eric Bonita held on 10/04/12 before Judge John E. Steele. Court Reporter/Transcriber Jeffrey G. Thomas, Telephone number (239) 461-2033. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter. Redaction Request due 4/23/2013, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/3/2013, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/1/2013. (JGT) (Entered: 04/02/2013)
PACER 497 Filed: 4/2/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial, Day Nine as to Jude Sereme, Neheme Ductant, Rick Jean, Wilmane Jean, Jophaney Hyppolite, Eric Bonita held on 10/03/12 before Judge John E. Steele. Court Reporter/Transcriber Jeffrey G. Thomas, Telephone number (239) 461-2033. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter. Redaction Request due 4/23/2013, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/3/2013, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/1/2013. (JGT) (Entered: 04/02/2013)
PACER 496 Filed: 4/2/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial, Day Eight as to Jude Sereme, Neheme Ductant, Rick Jean, Wilmane Jean, Jophaney Hyppolite, Eric Bonita held on 10/02/12 before Judge John E. Steele. Court Reporter/Transcriber Jeffrey G. Thomas, Telephone number (239) 461-2033. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter. Redaction Request due 4/23/2013, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/3/2013, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/1/2013. (JGT) (Entered: 04/02/2013)
PACER 495 Filed: 4/2/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial, Day Seven as to Jude Sereme, Neheme Ductant, Rick Jean, Wilmane Jean, Jophaney Hyppolite, Eric Bonita held on 09/28/12 before Judge John E. Steele. Court Reporter/Transcriber Jeffrey G. Thomas, Telephone number (239) 461-2033. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter. Redaction Request due 4/23/2013, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/3/2013, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/1/2013. (JGT) (Entered: 04/02/2013)
PACER 494 Filed: 4/2/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial, Day Six as to Jude Sereme, Neheme Ductant, Rick Jean, Wilmane Jean, Jophaney Hyppolite, Eric Bonita held on 09/27/12 before Judge John E. Steele. Court Reporter/Transcriber Jeffrey G. Thomas, Telephone number (239) 461-2033. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter. Redaction Request due 4/23/2013, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/3/2013, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/1/2013. (JGT) (Entered: 04/02/2013)
PACER 493 Filed: 4/2/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial, Day Five as to Jude Sereme, Neheme Ductant, Rick Jean, Wilmane Jean, Jophaney Hyppolite, Eric Bonita held on 09/25/12 before Judge John E. Steele. Court Reporter/Transcriber Jeffrey G. Thomas, Telephone number (239) 461-2033. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter. Redaction Request due 4/23/2013, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/3/2013, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/1/2013. (JGT) (Entered: 04/02/2013)
PACER 492 Filed: 4/2/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial, Day Four as to Jude Sereme, Neheme Ductant, Rick Jean, Wilmane Jean, Jophaney Hyppolite, Eric Bonita held on 09/21/12 before Judge John E. Steele. Court Reporter/Transcriber Jeffrey G. Thomas, Telephone number (239) 461-2033. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter. Redaction Request due 4/23/2013, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/3/2013, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/1/2013. (JGT) (Entered: 04/02/2013)
PACER 491 Filed: 4/2/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial, Day Three as to Jude Sereme, Neheme Ductant, Rick Jean, Wilmane Jean, Jophaney Hyppolite, Eric Bonita held on 09/21/12 before Judge John E. Steele. Court Reporter/Transcriber Jeffrey G. Thomas, Telephone number (239) 461-2033. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter. Redaction Request due 4/23/2013, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/3/2013, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/1/2013. (JGT) (Entered: 04/02/2013)
PACER 490 Filed: 4/2/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial, Day Two as to Jude Sereme, Neheme Ductant, Rick Jean, Wilmane Jean, Jophaney Hyppolite, Eric Bonita held on 09/19/12 before Judge John E. Steele. Court Reporter/Transcriber Jeffrey G. Thomas, Telephone number (239) 461-2033. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter. Redaction Request due 4/23/2013, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/3/2013, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/1/2013. (JGT) (Entered: 04/02/2013)
PACER 489 Filed: 4/2/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial, Day One as to Jude Sereme, Neheme Ductant, Rick Jean, Wilmane Jean, Jophaney Hyppolite, Eric Bonita held on 09/18/12 before Judge John E. Steele. Court Reporter/Transcriber Jeffrey G. Thomas, Telephone number (239) 461-2033. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter. Redaction Request due 4/23/2013, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/3/2013, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/1/2013. (JGT) (Entered: 04/02/2013)
PACER 488 Filed: 4/1/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE OF HEARING as to Rick Jean Sentencing set for 4/12/2013 at 09:00 AM in Ft. Myers Courtroom 6 A before Judge John E. Steele. (BMA) (Entered: 04/02/2013)
PACER 487 Filed: 4/1/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John E. Steele: Sentencing started, but not completed. Jesus Casas present on behalf of the government; Landon Miller for the defendant. For the reasons stated on the record, this sentencing hearing is continued to 4/12/2013 at 9:00 a.m. Court Reporter: Jeffrey G. Thomas (BMA) (Entered: 04/02/2013)
PACER 486 Filed: 3/31/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE OF APPEAL by Neheme Ductant re 483 Judgment Filing fee not paid. (Kaufman, Allen) (Entered: 03/31/2013)
PACER 485 Filed: 3/28/2013, Entered: None
MOTION for variance and memorandum by Rick Jean. (Miller, Landon) (Entered: 03/28/2013)
PACER 484 Filed: 3/27/2013, Entered: None
SENTENCING MEMORANDUM by Wilmane Jean (SPB) (Entered: 03/28/2013)
PACER 483 Filed: 3/27/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
JUDGMENT as to Neheme Ductant (2), Counts 1, 1s, 2, 2s, Dismissed on motion of the United States; Counts 1ss, 2ss, Imprisonment: 292 Months as to Count One, 240 Months as to Count Two, to be served concurrently with each other, and concurrent with pending Palm Beach County Case No. 07-MM-9156; Supervised Release: 60 Months as to Count One, 36 Months as to Count Two, to run concurrently; Special Assessment: $200.00. Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 3/27/2013. (BMA) (Entered: 03/27/2013)
PACER 482 Filed: 3/27/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 478 Motion for Downward Departure as to Neheme Ductant (2). Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 3/27/2013. (BMA) (Entered: 03/27/2013)
PACER 481 Filed: 3/27/2013, Entered: None
SENTENCING MEMORANDUM and OBJECTION to government's Notice of intent to use prior convictions to enhancement the penalty as to Courts One and Three of the second superseding indictment by Jude Sereme (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Transcript)(Rosenthal, Russell) Modified on 3/28/2013, to correct docket entry (SPB). (Entered: 03/27/2013)
PACER 480 Filed: 3/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John E. Steele: SENTENCING held on 3/25/2013 for Neheme Ductant (2), Counts 1, 1s, 2, 2s, Dismissed on motion of the United States; Counts 1ss, 2ss, Imprisonment: 292 Months as to Count One, 240 Months as to Count Two, to be served concurrently with each other, and concurrent with pending Palm Beach County Case No. 07-MM-9156; Supervised Release: 60 Months as to Count One, 36 Months as to Count Two, to run concurrently; Special Assessment: $200.00. Court Reporter: Jeffrey G. Thomas (BMA) (Entered: 03/25/2013)
PACER 479 Filed: 3/23/2013, Entered: None
SENTENCING MEMORANDUM by Neheme Ductant (Kaufman, Allen) (Entered: 03/23/2013)
PACER 478 Filed: 3/20/2013, Entered: None
First MOTION for downward departure by Neheme Ductant. (Kaufman, Allen) (Entered: 03/20/2013)
PACER 477 Filed: 3/18/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE to counsel of filing of OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Any party needing a copy of the transcript to review for redaction purposes may purchase a copy from the court reporter or view the document at the clerk's office public terminal as to Jude Sereme, Neheme Ductant, Rick Jean, Wilmane Jean, Rashid Francois, Jophaney Hyppolite, Eric Bonita. Court Reporter: Martina Reporting Services (SPB) (Entered: 03/18/2013)
PACER 476 Filed: 3/5/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Motion to Supress as to Jude Sereme, Neheme Ductant, Rick Jean, Wilmane Jean, Rashid Francois, Jophaney Hyppolite, Eric Bonita held on 3/7/12 before Judge Sheri Polster Chappell. Court Reporter/Transcriber Patsy L. Coleman, Telephone number 239/334-6545. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter. Redaction Request due 3/26/2013, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/5/2013, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/3/2013. (SPB) (Entered: 03/18/2013)
PACER 475 Filed: 3/5/2013, Entered: None
NOTIFICATION that transcript has been filed by Martina Reporting Services re: 454 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment as to Eric Bonita (kma) (Entered: 03/15/2013)
PACER 474 Filed: 3/13/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Government's Closing Arguments as to Jude Sereme, Neheme Ductant, Rick Jean, Wilmane Jean, Rashid Francois, Fritzco Desir, Michael Dupin, Jophaney Hyppolite, Jennifer Nicole Sander, Eric Bonita held on 10/03/12 before Judge John E. Steele. Court Reporter/Transcriber Jeffrey G. Thomas, Telephone number (239) 461-2033. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter. Redaction Request due 4/3/2013, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/15/2013, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/11/2013. (JGT) (Entered: 03/13/2013)
PACER 473 Filed: 3/13/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial Testimony of Beth Ann Torta as to Jude Sereme, Neheme Ductant, Rick Jean, Wilmane Jean, Rashid Francois, Fritzco Desir, Michael Dupin, Jophaney Hyppolite, Jennifer Nicole Sander, Eric Bonita held on 10/02/12 before Judge John E. Steele. Court Reporter/Transcriber Jeffrey G. Thomas, Telephone number (239) 461-2033. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter. Redaction Request due 4/3/2013, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/15/2013, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/11/2013. (JGT) (Entered: 03/13/2013)
PACER 472 Filed: 3/13/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial Testimony of Beth Ann Torta as to Jude Sereme, Neheme Ductant, Rick Jean, Wilmane Jean, Rashid Francois, Fritzco Desir, Michael Dupin, Jophaney Hyppolite, Jennifer Nicole Sander, Eric Bonita held on 09/28/12 before Judge John E. Steele. Court Reporter/Transcriber Jeffrey G. Thomas, Telephone number (239) 461-2033. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter. Redaction Request due 4/3/2013, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/15/2013, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/11/2013. (JGT) (Entered: 03/13/2013)
PACER 471 Filed: 3/13/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial Testimony of Nancy Blakely as to Jude Sereme, Neheme Ductant, Rick Jean, Wilmane Jean, Rashid Francois, Fritzco Desir, Michael Dupin, Jophaney Hyppolite, Jennifer Nicole Sander, Eric Bonita held on 09/28/12 before Judge John E. Steele. Court Reporter/Transcriber Jeffrey G. Thomas, Telephone number (239) 461-2033. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter. Redaction Request due 4/3/2013, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/15/2013, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/11/2013. (JGT) (Entered: 03/13/2013)
PACER 470 Filed: 3/13/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial Testimony of Nancy Blakely as to Jude Sereme, Neheme Ductant, Rick Jean, Wilmane Jean, Rashid Francois, Fritzco Desir, Michael Dupin, Jophaney Hyppolite, Jennifer Nicole Sander, Eric Bonita held on 09/27/12 before Judge John E. Steele. Court Reporter/Transcriber Jeffrey G. Thomas, Telephone number (239) 461-2033. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter. Redaction Request due 4/3/2013, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/15/2013, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/11/2013. (JGT) (Entered: 03/13/2013)
PACER 469 Filed: 3/13/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial Testimony of Jennifer Sander as to Jude Sereme, Neheme Ductant, Rick Jean, Wilmane Jean, Rashid Francois, Fritzco Desir, Michael Dupin, Jophaney Hyppolite, Jennifer Nicole Sander, Eric Bonita held on 09/20/12 before Judge John E. Steele. Court Reporter/Transcriber Jeffrey G. Thomas, Telephone number (239) 461-2033. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter. Redaction Request due 4/3/2013, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/15/2013, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/11/2013. (JGT) (Entered: 03/13/2013)
PACER 468 Filed: 3/13/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Government's Opening Statements as to Jude Sereme, Neheme Ductant, Rick Jean, Wilmane Jean, Rashid Francois, Fritzco Desir, Michael Dupin, Jophaney Hyppolite, Jennifer Nicole Sander, Eric Bonita held on 09/19/12 before Judge John E. Steele. Court Reporter/Transcriber Jeffrey G. Thomas, Telephone number (239) 461-2033. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter. Redaction Request due 4/3/2013, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/15/2013, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/11/2013. (JGT) (Entered: 03/13/2013)
PACER 467 Filed: 3/13/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial Testimony of Michael Hester as to Jude Sereme, Neheme Ductant, Rick Jean, Wilmane Jean, Rashid Francois, Fritzco Desir, Michael Dupin, Jophaney Hyppolite, Jennifer Nicole Sander, Eric Bonita held on 09/20/12 before Judge John E. Steele. Court Reporter/Transcriber Jeffrey G. Thomas, Telephone number (239) 461-2033. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter. Redaction Request due 4/3/2013, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/15/2013, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/11/2013. (JGT) (Entered: 03/13/2013)
PACER 466 Filed: 2/27/2013, Entered: None
MOTION for transcript of hearing on motion to suppess held on 3/7/12 by Jophaney Hyppolite. (Mills, John) (Entered: 02/27/2013)
PACER 465 Filed: 2/13/2013, Entered: None
COURT REPORTER ACKNOWLEDGMENT by Jeffrey Thomas re: 456 Notice of appeal. Estimated transcript filing date: 03/11/2013 (kma) (Entered: 02/19/2013)
PACER 464 Filed: 2/15/2013, Entered: None
OBJECTIONS to the Pre-Sentence Investigation Report by Neheme Ductant. (Kaufman, Allen) Modified on 2/19/2013 to terminate motion (RKR). (Entered: 02/15/2013)
PACER 463 Filed: 2/14/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 461 Motion to continue trial as to Fritzco Desir (6) Jury Trial set for trial term commencing 6/3/2013 in Ft. Myers Courtroom 6 A before Judge John E. Steele. Status Conference set for 5/13/2013 at 11:00 AM in Ft. Myers Courtroom 6 A before Judge John E. Steele. Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 2/14/2013. (BMA) (Entered: 02/14/2013)
PACER 462 Filed: 2/14/2013, Entered: None
COURT REPORTER ACKNOWLEDGEMENT by Jeffrey G. Thomas re 452 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment as to Jophaney Hyppolite Estimated transcript filing date: 03/13/13. USCA number: 13-10471-FF. (slp) (Entered: 02/14/2013)
PACER 461 Filed: 2/11/2013, Entered: None
ORAL MOTION to continue trial by Fritzco Desir. (BMA) (Entered: 02/13/2013)
PACER 460 Filed: 2/11/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John E. Steele: STATUS Conference as to Fritzco Desir held on 2/11/2013. Jesus Casas present on behalf of the government; Lee Hollander for the defendant. For the reasons stated on the record, this case is continued to the June 2013 trial term. Written order to follow. (11:00-11:15) Court Reporter: Jeffrey G. Thomas (BMA) (Entered: 02/13/2013)
PACER 459 Filed: 2/4/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT information form filed by Eric Bonita for proceedings held 3/8/12 before Judge Sheri Polster Chappell; 09/18 through 10/05/12 and 01/22/13 before Judge Steele re 456 Amended Notice of Appeal (kma) (Entered: 02/11/2013)
PACER 458 Filed: 2/4/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT information form filed by Eric Bonita for proceeding held on 03/08/12 before Judge Sheri Polster Chappell re 456 Amended Notice of Appeal (kma) Modified on 2/11/2013 to correct hearing date (kma). (Entered: 02/11/2013)
PACER 457 Filed: 2/4/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER denying without prejudice 444 Motion for Transport as to Rashid Francois (5). See Order for details. Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 2/4/2013. (SVC) (Entered: 02/04/2013)
PACER 456 Filed: 2/4/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appeal, Amended by Eric Bonita (Lakeman, Richard) (Entered: 02/04/2013)
PACER 455 Filed: 1/31/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT information form filed by Jophaney Hyppolite for proceedings held on 3/7/12, 9/18/12-10/5/12, 1/22/13 before Judge Steele re 452 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment. USCA number: u/k (Mills, John) (Entered: 01/31/2013)
PACER 454 Filed: 1/28/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appeal by Eric Bonita re 448 Judgment (Lakeman, Richard) (Entered: 01/28/2013)
PACER 453 Filed: 1/28/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 450 Motion for leave to seek partial payment as to Rick Jean (3). Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 1/28/2013. (RKR) (Entered: 01/28/2013)
PACER 452 Filed: 1/27/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE OF APPEAL by Jophaney Hyppolite re 449 Judgment Filing fee not paid. (Mills, John) (Entered: 01/27/2013)
PACER 451 Filed: 1/24/2013, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM in support by Rick Jean re 450 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief of claim in excess of statutory case limits (Miller, Landon) (Entered: 01/24/2013)
PACER 450 Filed: 1/24/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
MOTION Leave to seek Partial Payment of Court Appointed Counsel by Rick Jean. (Miller, Landon) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell. (Entered: 01/24/2013)
PACER 449 Filed: 1/23/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
JUDGMENT as to Jophaney Hyppolite (8), Count 1, 11s, 1s, 6, 6ss, Dismissed on motion of the United States; Count 11ss, 1ss, Imprisonment: LIFE as to Count One; 30 Years as to Count Eleven, said terms to be served concurrently; Supervised Release: 10 Years as to Count One; 6 Years as to Count Eleven, to run concurrently; Special Assessment: $200.00; Count 12, Dismissed. Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 1/23/2013. (BMA) (Entered: 01/23/2013)
PACER 448 Filed: 1/23/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
JUDGMENT as to Eric Bonita (10), Counts 1, 10s, 11, 12s, 1s, Dismissed on motion of the United States; Counts 10ss, 1ss, Imprisonment: LIFE as to Count 1; 30 Years as to Count 10, said terms to be served concurrently; Supervised Release: 10 Years as to Count One; 6 Years as to Count Ten, to run concurrently; Special Assessment: $200.00; Count 12ss, Dismissed by the Court. Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 1/23/2013. (BMA) (Entered: 01/23/2013)
PACER 447 Filed: 1/22/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John E. Steele: SENTENCING held on 1/22/2013 for Jophaney Hyppolite (8), Counts 1, 11s, 1s, 6, 6ss, Dismissed on motion of the United States; Counts 11ss, 1ss, Imprisonment: LIFE as to Count One; 30 Years as to Count Eleven, said terms to be served concurrently; Supervised Release: 10 Years as to Count One; 6 Years as to Count Eleven, to run concurrently; Special Assessment: $200.00; Count 12, Dismissed. Court Reporter: Jeffrey G. Thomas (BMA) (Entered: 01/23/2013)
PACER 446 Filed: 1/22/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John E. Steele: SENTENCING held on 1/22/2013 for Eric Bonita (10), Counts 1, 10s, 11, 12s, 1s, Dismissed on motion of the United States; Counts 10ss, 1ss, Imprisonment: LIFE as to Count 1; 30 Years as to Count 10, said terms to be served concurrently; Supervised Release: 10 Years as to Count One; 6 Years as to Count Ten, to run concurrently; Special Assessment: $200.00; Count 12ss, Dismissed by the Court. Court Reporter: Jeffrey G. Thomas (BMA) (Entered: 01/23/2013)
PACER 445 Filed: 1/18/2013, Entered: None
SENTENCING MEMORANDUM by Eric Bonita (Lakeman, Richard) (Entered: 01/18/2013)
PACER 444 Filed: 1/14/2013, Entered: None
MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically for transportation by Rashid Francois. (Attachments: # 1 Mailing Envelope)(SPB) (Entered: 01/16/2013)
PACER 443 Filed: 1/14/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING HEARING: The sentencing hearing previously scheduled for January 22, 2013 is rescheduled as to Wilmane Jean. New hearing date and time:Sentencing set for 4/1/2013 at 3:30PM in Ft. Myers Courtroom 6 A before Judge John E. Steele. (RKR) (Entered: 01/14/2013)
PACER 442 Filed: 1/14/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING HEARING: The sentencing hearing previously scheduled for January 22, 2013 is rescheduled as to Rick Jean. New hearing date and time:Sentencing set for 4/1/2013 at 2:30PM in Ft. Myers Courtroom 6 A before Judge John E. Steele. (RKR) (Entered: 01/14/2013)
PACER 441 Filed: 1/14/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING HEARING: The sentencing hearing previously scheduled for January 22, 2013 is rescheduled as to Jude Sereme. New hearing date and time:Sentencing set for 4/1/2013 at 1:30PM in Ft. Myers Courtroom 6 A before Judge John E. Steele. (RKR) (Entered: 01/14/2013)
PACER 440 Filed: 1/14/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 437 Motion to continue as to Jude Sereme (1) and sentencing will be reset under separate notice for approximately 60 days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 1/14/2013. (RKR) (Entered: 01/14/2013)
PACER 439 Filed: 1/14/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 438 Motion to continue as to Rick Jean (3), Wilmane Jean (4) and sentencing will be reset under separate notice approximately 60 days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 1/14/2013. (RKR) (Entered: 01/14/2013)
PACER 438 Filed: 1/11/2013, Entered: None
MOTION to continue Sentencing by USA as to Rick Jean, Wilmane Jean. (Casas, Jesus) (Entered: 01/11/2013)
PACER 437 Filed: 1/11/2013, Entered: None
Unopposed MOTION to continue Sentencing by Jude Sereme. (Rosenthal, Russell) (Entered: 01/11/2013)
PACER 436 Filed: 1/2/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 433 defendant's Motion to extend time for objections as to Presentence Report as to Neheme Ductant (2). Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 1/2/2013. (BMA) (Entered: 01/02/2013)
PACER 435 Filed: 1/2/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING HEARING: The Sentencing hearing previously scheduled for 1/22/13 is rescheduled as to Neheme Ductant. New hearing date and time:Sentencing set for 3/25/2013 at 02:30 PM in Ft. Myers Courtroom 6 A before Judge John E. Steele. (BMA) (Entered: 01/02/2013)
PACER 434 Filed: 1/2/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 432 defendants Unopposed Motion To Continue Sentencing Date as to Neheme Ductant (2). Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 1/2/2013. (BMA) (Entered: 01/02/2013)
PACER 433 Filed: 12/31/2012, Entered: None
Unopposed MOTION to extend time to TO FILE OBJECTONS TO PSI REPORT by Neheme Ductant. (Kaufman, Allen) (Entered: 12/31/2012)
PACER 432 Filed: 12/31/2012, Entered: None
Unopposed MOTION to continue Sentencing by Neheme Ductant. (Kaufman, Allen) (Entered: 12/31/2012)
PACER 431 Filed: 12/30/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED CJA 20 as to Jennifer Nicole Sander:authorization to pay Neil Barry Potter - Voucher FTM2012-050.Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 11/06/12.Rtnd by Circuit 12/20/12. Paid 12/26/12.(jc) (Entered: 12/30/2012)
PACER 430 Filed: 12/27/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED CJA 21 as to Neheme Ductant:authorization to pay RJ McMahon Associates for expert servicesVoucher 211097-02-MA01.Signed by Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 12/05/12. Paid 12/19/12.(jc) (Entered: 12/27/2012)
PACER 429 Filed: 12/4/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
JUDGMENT as to Michael Dupin (7), Counts 1, 9, Imprisonment: 46 Months as to each count to be served concurrently; Supervised Release: 36 Months as to each count, to run concurrently; Special Assessment: $200.00. Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 12/4/2012. (BMA) (Entered: 12/04/2012)
PACER 428 Filed: 12/3/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John E. Steele: SENTENCING held on 12/3/2012 for Michael Dupin (7), Counts 1, 9, Imprisonment: 46 Months as to each count to be served concurrently; Supervised Release: 36 Months as to each count, to run concurrently; Special Assessment: $200.00. Court Reporter: R. Joy Stancel (BMA) (Entered: 12/03/2012)
PACER 427 Filed: 11/28/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE OF HEARING as to Eric Bonita. Sentencing set for 1/22/2013 at 02:30 PM in Ft. Myers Courtroom 6 A before Judge John E. Steele. (BMA) (Entered: 11/28/2012)
PACER 426 Filed: 11/28/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE OF HEARING as to Jophaney Hyppolite. Sentencing set for 1/22/2013 at 02:00 PM in Ft. Myers Courtroom 6 A before Judge John E. Steele. (BMA) (Entered: 11/28/2012)
PACER 425 Filed: 11/28/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE OF HEARING as to Wilmane Jean. Sentencing set for 1/22/2013 at 01:30 PM in Ft. Myers Courtroom 6 A before Judge John E. Steele. (BMA) (Entered: 11/28/2012)
PACER 424 Filed: 11/28/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE OF HEARING as to Rick Jean. Sentencing set for 1/22/2013 at 11:00 AM in Ft. Myers Courtroom 6 A before Judge John E. Steele. (BMA) (Entered: 11/28/2012)
PACER 423 Filed: 11/28/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE OF HEARING as to Neheme Ductant. Sentencing set for 1/22/2013 at 10:30 AM in Ft. Myers Courtroom 6 A before Judge John E. Steele. (BMA) (Entered: 11/28/2012)
PACER 422 Filed: 11/28/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE OF HEARING as to Jude Sereme. Sentencing set for 1/22/2013 at 10:00 AM in Ft. Myers Courtroom 6 A before Judge John E. Steele. (BMA) (Entered: 11/28/2012)
PACER 421 Filed: 11/26/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 411 Motion for leave to seek partial CJA payment as to Wilmane Jean (4); granting 412 Motion for leave to seek partial CJA payment as to Jophaney Hyppolite (8). Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 11/26/2012. (RKR) (Entered: 11/26/2012)
PACER 420 Filed: 11/16/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 416 Motion to continue trial as to Fritzco Desir (6) Jury Trial set for trial term commencing 3/4/2013 before Judge John E. Steele, Status Conference set for 2/11/2013 at 11:00 AM in Ft. Myers Courtroom 6 A before Judge John E. Steele. Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 11/16/2012. (BMA) (Entered: 11/16/2012)
PACER 419 Filed: 11/15/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
JUDGMENT as to Rashid Francois (5), Count 1, Imprisonment: 240 Months, to be served concurrently, but not coterminously with the state sentence the defendant is currently serving imposed in Case No. 11-CF-14169, in the Lee County Circuit Court; Supervised Release: 96 Months; Special Assessment: $100.00. Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 11/15/2012. (BMA) Modified on 11/15/2012 (BMA). (Entered: 11/15/2012)
PACER 418 Filed: 11/15/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER denying 413 defendant's motion for downward departure as to Rashid Francois (5). Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 11/15/2012. (BMA) (Entered: 11/15/2012)
PACER 417 Filed: 11/13/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John E. Steele: SENTENCING held on 11/13/2012 for Rashid Francois (5), Count 1, Imprisonment: 240 Months; Supervised Release: 96 Months; Special Assessment: $100.00. Court Reporter: Jeffrey G. Thomas (BMA) (Entered: 11/15/2012)
PACER 416 Filed: 11/13/2012, Entered: None
ORAL MOTION to continue trial by Fritzco Desir. (LAF) (Entered: 11/15/2012)
PACER 415 Filed: 11/13/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John E. Steele: STATUS conference as to Fritzco Desir held on 11/13/2012. Jesus Casas present on behalf of the government; Lee Hollander for the defendant. For the reasons stated on the record, this case is continued to the March 2013 trial term. Written order to follow. (11:00-11:30) Court Reporter: Jeffrey G. Thomas (BMA) (Entered: 11/15/2012)
PACER 414 Filed: 11/13/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John E. Steele: STATUS conference as to Rashid Francois held on 11/13/2012. Jesus Casas present on behalf of the government; Lee Hollander for the defendant. For the reasons stated on the record, this case is continued to the March 2013 trial term. Written order to follow. Court Reporter: Jeffrey G. Thomas (BMA) Modified on 11/15/2012 (BMA). DISREGARD THIS ENTRY. DOCKETED UNDER THE WRONG DEFENDANT. (Entered: 11/15/2012)
PACER 413 Filed: 11/12/2012, Entered: None
MOTION for downward departure by Rashid Francois. (Calvo, Jose) (Entered: 11/12/2012)
PACER 412 Filed: 11/11/2012, Entered: None
MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Motion for partial payment of attorney fees by Jophaney Hyppolite. (Mills, John) (Entered: 11/11/2012)
PACER 411 Filed: 11/9/2012, Entered: None
MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Partial Payment of Court Appointed Counsel by Wilmane Jean. (Borras, Anthony) (Entered: 11/09/2012)
PACER 410 Filed: 11/8/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING HEARING (AS TO TIME ONLY): The Sentencing hearing previously scheduled for 11/13/12 is rescheduled as to Rashid Francois. New hearing time:Sentencing reset for 11/13/2012 at 03:30 PM in Ft. Myers Courtroom 6 A before Judge John E. Steele. (BMA) (Entered: 11/08/2012)
PACER 409 Filed: 10/31/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
OPINION AND ORDER denying 387 Motion for judgment of acquittal, notwithstanding the verdict, or for new trial as to Neheme Ductant (2); denying 393 Motion for judgment of acquittal, notwithstanding the verdict, or for new trial as to Rick Jean (3); denying 392 Motion for judgment of acquittal, notwithstanding the verdict, or for new trial as to Wilmane Jean (4); denying 399 Motion for judgment of acquittal, notwithstanding the verdict, or for new trial as to Eric Bonita (10). Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 10/31/2012. (RKR) (Entered: 10/31/2012)
PACER 408 Filed: 10/29/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED CJA 20 as to Rick Jean:authorization to pay Landon Miller - Voucher FTM2012-044-01.Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 9/18/12.Rtnd by Circuit 10/22/12. Paid 10/25/12.(jc) (Entered: 10/29/2012)
PACER 407 Filed: 10/23/2012, Entered: None
RESPONSE to motion by USA as to Neheme Ductant, Rick Jean, Wilmane Jean, Eric Bonita re 387 MOTION for new trial, 392 First MOTION for acquittal of Judgment Not Withstanding The Verdict or, In the Alternative, For New Trial, 399 MOTION for of acquittal judgment, 393 MOTION for Judgment not withstanding the verdict in the alternative, for a New Trial (Casas, Jesus) (Entered: 10/23/2012)
PACER 406 Filed: 10/22/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED CJA 21 as to Neheme Ductant:authorization to pay Tropical Investigations for expert servicesVoucher 211097-02-TR01.Signed by Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 10/10/12. Paid 10/18/12(jc) (Entered: 10/22/2012)
PACER 405 Filed: 10/18/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE of Discovery Response by USA as to Fritzco Desir (Attachments: # 1 Discovery Letter)(Casas, Jesus) (Entered: 10/18/2012)
PACER 404 Filed: 10/17/2012, Entered: None
Court's exhibit list as to Jude Sereme, Neheme Ductant, Rick Jean, Wilmane Jean, Jophaney Hyppolite, Eric Bonita (BMA) (Entered: 10/17/2012)
PACER 403 Filed: 10/16/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
JUDGMENT as to Jennifer Nicole Sander (9), Counts 1, 12, Imprisonment: 130 Months as to each count, each count to be served concurrently; Supervised Release: 72 Months as to each count, to run concurrently; Special Assessment: $200.00. Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 10/16/2012. (BMA) (Entered: 10/16/2012)
PACER 402 Filed: 10/16/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 395 motion for downward departure as to Jennifer Nicole Sander (9). Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 10/16/2012. (BMA) (Entered: 10/16/2012)
PACER 401 Filed: 10/16/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER OF DETENTION as to Fritzco Desir. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 10/16/2012. (LMF) (Entered: 10/16/2012)
PACER 400 Filed: 10/16/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
CJA 20 as to Fritzco Desir: Appointment of Attorney Lee Hollander Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas N. Frazier on 10/10/12. (BJH) (Entered: 10/16/2012)
PACER 399 Filed: 10/15/2012, Entered: None
MOTION for of acquittal judgment by Eric Bonita. (Lakeman, Richard) (Entered: 10/15/2012)
PACER 398 Filed: 10/15/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
SCHEDULING ORDER as to Fritzco Desir. Status Conference set for 11/13/2012 at 11:00 AM in Ft. Myers Courtroom 6 A before Judge John E. Steele, Jury Trial set for trial term beginning 12/3/2012 in Ft. Myers Courtroom 6 A before Judge John E. Steele. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 10/15/2012. (LMF) (Entered: 10/15/2012)
PACER 397 Filed: 10/15/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell:DETENTION Hearing as to Fritzco Desir held on 10/15/2012. ARRAIGNMENT as to Fritzco Desir (6) Count 1, 1s, 1ss, 9s, 9ss, 10 held on 10/15/2012. Lee Hollander, CJA Counsel, appeared on behalf of the Defendant. Jesus Casas, Assistant United States Attorney, appeared for the Government. Government summarized the charges and potential penalties. Defendant waives the issue of detention without prejudice. Defendant pled not guilty. Defendant set for status conference on November 13, 2012 at 11:00 A.M., before the Hon. John E. Steele, and set for trial term beginning December 3, 2012. Defendant remanded to the custody of the U.S. Marshals. (DIGITAL) (LMF) (Entered: 10/15/2012)
PACER 396 Filed: 10/15/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John E. Steele: SENTENCING held on 10/15/2012 for Jennifer Nicole Sander (9), Counts 1, 12, Imprisonment: 130 Months as to each count, to be served concurrently; Supervised Release: 72 Months as to each count, to run concurrently; Special Assessment: $200.00. Court Reporter: Jeffrey G. Thomas (BMA) (Entered: 10/15/2012)
PACER 395 Filed: 10/15/2012, Entered: None
MOTION for downward departure of Defendant's Sentence based upon Substantial Assistance by USA as to Jennifer Nicole Sander. (Casas, Jesus) (Entered: 10/15/2012)
PACER 394 Filed: 10/12/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING HEARING (AS TO TIME ONLY): The Detention Hearing and Arraignment hearing previously scheduled for 10/15/2012 is rescheduled as to Fritzco Desir. New hearing time: Arraignment set for 10/15/2012 at 03:00 PM in Ft. Myers Courtroom 5 D before Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell., Detention Hearing set for 10/15/2012 at 02:00 PM before Judge Unassigned Judge. (LMF) (Entered: 10/12/2012)
PACER 393 Filed: 10/12/2012, Entered: None
MOTION for Judgment not withstanding the verdict in the alternative, for a New Trial by Rick Jean. (Miller, Landon) (Entered: 10/12/2012)
PACER 392 Filed: 10/11/2012, Entered: None
First MOTION for acquittal of Judgment Not Withstanding The Verdict or, In the Alternative, For New Trial by Wilmane Jean. (Borras, Anthony) (Entered: 10/11/2012)
PACER 391 Filed: 10/10/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE of attorney appearance: Lee Hollander appearing for Fritzco Desir (Hollander, Lee) (Entered: 10/10/2012)
PACER 390 Filed: 10/10/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE OF HEARING as to Fritzco Desir. Arraignment set for 10/15/2012 at 01:30 PM in Ft. Myers Courtroom 5 D before Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell., Detention Hearing set for 10/15/2012 at 01:30 PM in Ft. Myers Courtroom 5 D before Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell. (BJH) (Entered: 10/10/2012)
PACER 389 Filed: 10/10/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Douglas N. Frazier: INITIAL appearance as to Fritzco Desir held on 10/10/2012. CJA counsel Lee Hollander appointed. Government summarized charges and penalties. Government moves for detention, relying on the presumption. Court will set a detention hearing and Arraignment for 10/15/12 at 1:30 p.m. before Judge Chappell. Court Reporter: Martina Reporting Services (BJH) (Entered: 10/10/2012)
PACER 388 Filed: 10/10/2012, Entered: None
***CJA 23 financial affidavit by Fritzco Desir (BJH) (Entered: 10/10/2012)
PACER 387 Filed: 10/10/2012, Entered: None
MOTION for new trial by Neheme Ductant. (Kaufman, Allen) (Entered: 10/10/2012)
PACER 386 Filed: 10/10/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE OF HEARING as to Fritzco Desir. Initial Appearance set for 10/10/2012 at 02:00 PM in Ft. Myers Courtroom 5 C before Magistrate Judge Douglas N. Frazier. (BJH) (Entered: 10/10/2012)
PACER 385 Filed: 10/5/2012, Entered: None
EXHIBIT LIST by Jude Sereme (BMA) (Entered: 10/05/2012)
PACER 384 Filed: 10/5/2012, Entered: None
EXHIBIT LIST by USA as to Jude Sereme, Neheme Ductant, Rick Jean, Wilmane Jean, Jophaney Hyppolite, Eric Bonita (BMA) (Entered: 10/05/2012)
PACER 383 Filed: 10/5/2012, Entered: None
JURY VERDICT as to Rick Jean (3) Guilty on Count 8ss and Wilmane Jean (4) Guilty on Count 5ss and Jophaney Hyppolite (8) Guilty on Count 11ss and Eric Bonita (10) Guilty on Count 10ss. (BMA) (Entered: 10/05/2012)
PACER 382 Filed: 10/5/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John E. Steele: JURY TRIAL DAY ELEVEN as to Jude Sereme, Neheme Ductant, Rick Jean, Wilmane Jean, Jophaney Hyppolite, Eric Bonita held on 10/5/2012. Court Reporter: Jeffrey G. Thomas (BMA) (Entered: 10/05/2012)
PACER 381 Filed: 10/4/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John E. Steele: JURY TRIAL DAY TEN as to Jude Sereme, Neheme Ductant, Rick Jean, Wilmane Jean, Jophaney Hyppolite, Eric Bonita held on 10/4/2012. Court Reporter: Jeffrey G. Thomas (BMA) (Entered: 10/05/2012)
PACER 380 Filed: 10/4/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING HEARING: The Sentencing hearing previously scheduled for 10/9/12 is rescheduled as to Rashid Francois. New hearing date and time:Sentencing reset for 11/13/2012 at 03:00 PM in Ft. Myers Courtroom 6 A before Judge John E. Steele. (BMA) (Entered: 10/04/2012)
PACER 379 Filed: 10/4/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 371 defendant's Motion to Continue Sentencing as to Rashid Francois (5). Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 10/4/2012. (BMA) (Entered: 10/04/2012)
PACER 378 Filed: 10/3/2012, Entered: None
COURT'S (FINAL) JURY INSTRUCTIONS as to Jude Sereme, Neheme Ductant, Rick Jean, Wilmane Jean, Rashid Francois, Michael Dupin, Jophaney Hyppolite, Jennifer Nicole Sander, Eric Bonita. (RKR) Modified on 10/10/2012 (BJH). (Entered: 10/03/2012)
PACER 377 Filed: 10/3/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John E. Steele: JURY TRIAL DAY NINE as to Jude Sereme, Neheme Ductant, Rick Jean, Wilmane Jean, Jophaney Hyppolite, Eric Bonita held on 10/3/2012. Court Reporter: Jeffrey G. Thomas (BMA) (Entered: 10/03/2012)
PACER 376 Filed: 10/2/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John E. Steele: JURY TRIAL DAY EIGHT as to Jude Sereme, Neheme Ductant, Rick Jean, Wilmane Jean, Jophaney Hyppolite, Eric Bonita held on 10/2/2012. Court Reporter: Jeffrey G. Thomas (BMA) (Entered: 10/03/2012)
PACER 375 Filed: 10/3/2012, Entered: None
COURT'S DRAFT verdict form filed as to Jude Sereme, Neheme Ductant, Rick Jean, Wilmane Jean, Jophaney Hyppolite, Eric Bonita (BMA) (Entered: 10/03/2012)
PACER 374 Filed: 10/2/2012, Entered: None
COURT'S DRAFT JURY INSTRUCTIONS as to Jude Sereme, Neheme Ductant, Rick Jean, Wilmane Jean, Jophaney Hyppolite, Eric Bonita. (BMA) (Entered: 10/03/2012)
PACER 373 Filed: 10/2/2012, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM in support by Jude Sereme re 372 Proposed jury instructions Supplemental Instruction (Rosenthal, Russell) (Entered: 10/02/2012)
PACER 372 Filed: 10/2/2012, Entered: None
PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS by Jude Sereme (Rosenthal, Russell) (Entered: 10/02/2012)
PACER 371 Filed: 10/2/2012, Entered: None
MOTION to continue Sentecing by Rashid Francois. (Calvo, Jose) (Entered: 10/02/2012)
PACER 367 Filed: 10/1/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John E. Steele, held on 9/12/12: as to Jude Sereme, Neheme Ductant, Rick Jean, Wilmane Jean, Jophaney Hyppolite, Eric Bonita. (Originally filed under seal on 9/12/12) Court Reporter: Jeffrey G. Thomas (SPB) (Entered: 10/02/2012)
PACER 366 Filed: 10/1/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John E. Steele on 9/10/12: as to Jude Sereme, Neheme Ductant, Rick Jean, Wilmane Jean, Jophaney Hyppolite, Eric Bonita. (Originally filed under seal on 9/10/12) Court Reporter: Jeffrey G. Thomas (SPB) (Entered: 10/02/2012)
PACER 365 Filed: 10/1/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 363 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 9/10/12. (Originally filed under seal on 9/11/12) (SPB) (Entered: 10/02/2012)
PACER 363 Filed: 10/1/2012, Entered: None
MOTION to seal by USA. (Originally filed under seal on 9/6/12) (SPB) (Entered: 10/02/2012)
PACER 362 Filed: 10/1/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER, unsealing documents [S-11] [S-12] [S-13] [S-14] [S-15] [S-20] [S-23][S-24], each document to be docketed in the public court file as to Jude Sereme, Neheme Ductant, Rick Jean, Wilmane Jean, Jophaney Hyppolite, Eric Bonita Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 10/1/2012. (SPB) (Entered: 10/02/2012)
PACER 361 Filed: 10/1/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER as to Eric Bonita vacating portion of 222 Order on Report and Recommendations that denied Bonita's Renewed Motion to adopt co-defendant's motion to suppress; granting 165 MOTION to adopt Doc 153 - Ductant's Supplemental Memo in Support of Motion to Suppress (Renewed) filed by Eric Bonita. As adopted, the motion to suppress is denied as to Eric Bonita. Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 10/1/2012. (RKR) (Entered: 10/01/2012)
PACER 360 Filed: 9/28/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John E. Steele: JURY TRIAL DAY SEVEN as to Jude Sereme, Neheme Ductant, Rick Jean, Wilmane Jean, Jophaney Hyppolite, Eric Bonita held on 9/28/2012. Court Reporter: Jeffrey G. Thomas (BMA) (Entered: 09/28/2012)
PACER 359 Filed: 9/27/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John E. Steele: JURY TRIAL DAY SIX as to Jude Sereme, Neheme Ductant, Rick Jean, Wilmane Jean, Jophaney Hyppolite, Eric Bonita held on 9/27/2012. Court Reporter: Jeffrey G. Thomas (BMA) (Entered: 09/27/2012)
PACER 358 Filed: 9/25/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John E. Steele: JURY TRIAL DAY FIVE as to Jude Sereme, Neheme Ductant, Rick Jean, Wilmane Jean, Jophaney Hyppolite, Eric Bonita held on 9/25/2012. Court Reporter: Jeffrey G. Thomas (BMA) (Entered: 09/27/2012)
PACER 357 Filed: 9/25/2012, Entered: None
ARREST WARRANT returned executed on 9/24/2012 as to Fritzco Desir. (SPB) (Entered: 09/26/2012)
PACER 356 Filed: 9/25/2012, Entered: None
ARREST WARRANT returned executed on 9/24/12 as to Fritzco Desir. (SPB) (Entered: 09/26/2012)
PACER 355 Filed: 9/25/2012, Entered: None
ARREST WARRANT returned executed on 9/24/12 as to Fritzco Desir. (SPB) (Entered: 09/26/2012)
PACER 354 Filed: 9/25/2012, Entered: None
EXHIBIT LIST by USA as to Jude Sereme, Neheme Ductant, Rick Jean, Wilmane Jean, Jophaney Hyppolite, Eric Bonita (Casas, Jesus) (Entered: 09/25/2012)
PACER 353 Filed: 9/21/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John E. Steele: JURY TRIAL DAY FOUR as to Jude Sereme, Neheme Ductant, Rick Jean, Wilmane Jean, Jophaney Hyppolite, Eric Bonita held on 9/21/2012. Court Reporter: Jeffrey G. Thomas (BMA) (Entered: 09/21/2012)
PACER 352 Filed: 9/21/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 350 Motion in Limine as to Jude Sereme (1), Neheme Ductant (2), Rick Jean (3), Wilmane Jean (4), Jophaney Hyppolite (8), Eric Bonita (10). Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 9/21/2012. (BMA) (Entered: 09/21/2012)
PACER 351 Filed: 9/21/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John E. Steele: JURY TRIAL DAY THREE as to Jude Sereme, Neheme Ductant, Rick Jean, Wilmane Jean, Jophaney Hyppolite, Eric Bonita held on 9/21/2012. Court Reporter: Jeffrey G. Thomas (BMA) (Entered: 09/21/2012)
PACER 350 Filed: 9/19/2012, Entered: None
First MOTION in limine by USA as to Jude Sereme, Neheme Ductant, Rick Jean, Wilmane Jean, Jophaney Hyppolite, Eric Bonita. (Casas, Jesus) (Entered: 09/19/2012)
PACER 349 Filed: 9/19/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John E. Steele: JURY TRIAL DAY TWO as to Jude Sereme, Neheme Ductant, Rick Jean, Wilmane Jean, Jophaney Hyppolite, Eric Bonita held on 9/19/2012. Court Reporter: Jeffrey G. Thomas (BMA) (Entered: 09/19/2012)
PACER 348 Filed: 9/18/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John E. Steele: JURY SELECTION & JURY TRIAL DAY ONE commenced as to Jude Sereme, Neheme Ductant, Rick Jean, Wilmane Jean, Jophaney Hyppolite, Eric Bonita held on 9/18/2012. Court Reporter: Jeffrey G. Thomas (BMA) (Entered: 09/18/2012)
PACER 347 Filed: 9/18/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 316 Motion in Limine as to Jude Sereme (1); granting 339 Motion to adopt motion in limine of other defendant as to Neheme Ductant (2); granting 330 Motion to adopt proposed jury instructions of other defendant as to Wilmane Jean (4); denying as moot 331 Motion in Limine as to Wilmane Jean (4) in light of amended filing; granting in part and denying in part 338 Motion in Limine as to Wilmane Jean (4). See Order for details. Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 9/18/2012. (RKR) (Entered: 09/18/2012)
PACER 346 Filed: 9/18/2012, Entered: None
EXHIBIT LIST by USA as to Jude Sereme, Neheme Ductant, Rick Jean, Wilmane Jean, Jophaney Hyppolite, Eric Bonita (Casas, Jesus) (Entered: 09/18/2012)
PACER 345 Filed: 9/18/2012, Entered: None
WITNESS LIST by USA as to Jude Sereme, Neheme Ductant, Rick Jean, Wilmane Jean, Jophaney Hyppolite, Eric Bonita (Casas, Jesus) (Entered: 09/18/2012)
PACER 344 Filed: 9/18/2012, Entered: None
EXHIBIT LIST by Jude Sereme (Rosenthal, Russell) (Entered: 09/18/2012)
PACER 343 Filed: 9/18/2012, Entered: None
WITNESS LIST by Jude Sereme (Rosenthal, Russell) (Entered: 09/18/2012)
PACER 342 Filed: 9/17/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE of United States' Response to Defendant Sereme's Motion in Limine by USA as to Jude Sereme, Neheme Ductant, Rick Jean, Wilmane Jean, Jophaney Hyppolite, Eric Bonita (Casas, Jesus) (Entered: 09/17/2012)
PACER 341 Filed: 9/17/2012, Entered: None
EXHIBIT LIST by Eric Bonita (Lakeman, Richard) (Entered: 09/17/2012)
PACER 340 Filed: 9/17/2012, Entered: None
WITNESS LIST by Eric Bonita (Lakeman, Richard) (Entered: 09/17/2012)
PACER 339 Filed: 9/14/2012, Entered: None
MOTION to adopt Motion in Limine 316 by Neheme Ductant. (Kaufman, Allen) Modified on 9/17/2012 to edit docket text (SLU). (Entered: 09/14/2012)
PACER 338 Filed: 9/14/2012, Entered: None
Amended MOTION in limine by Wilmane Jean. (Borras, Anthony) (Entered: 09/14/2012)
PACER 337 Filed: 9/12/2012, Entered: None
ARREST WARRANT returned executed on 10/18/11 as to Jophaney Hyppolite. (SPB) (Entered: 09/14/2012)
PACER 336 Filed: 9/12/2012, Entered: None
ARREST WARRANT returned executed on 10/20/11 as to Neheme Ductant. (SPB) (Entered: 09/14/2012)
PACER 335 Filed: 9/13/2012, Entered: None
ARREST WARRANT returned executed on 10/18/11 as to Eric Bonita. (SPB) (Entered: 09/14/2012)
PACER 334 Filed: 9/12/2012, Entered: None
ARREST WARRANT returned executed on 10/27/11 as to Rick Jean. (SPB) (Entered: 09/14/2012)
PACER 333 Filed: 9/12/2012, Entered: None
ARREST WARRANT returned executed on 10/20/11 as to Wilmane Jean. (SPB) (Entered: 09/14/2012)
PACER 332 Filed: 9/12/2012, Entered: None
ARREST WARRANT returned executed on 10/20/11 as to Jude Sereme. (SPB) (SPB). (Entered: 09/14/2012)
PACER 331 Filed: 9/14/2012, Entered: None Motion in Limine
MOTION in limine by Wilmane Jean. (Borras, Anthony) (Entered: 09/14/2012)
PACER 330 Filed: 9/14/2012, Entered: None
MOTION to adopt Co-Defendant Sereme's Proposed Jury Instructions by Wilmane Jean. (Borras, Anthony) (Entered: 09/14/2012)
PACER 329 Filed: 9/14/2012, Entered: None
PROPOSED VOIR DIRE questions by Wilmane Jean (Borras, Anthony) (Entered: 09/14/2012)
PACER 328 Filed: 9/14/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John E. Steele: STATUS conference as to Jude Sereme, Neheme Ductant, Rick Jean, Wilmane Jean, Jophaney Hyppolite, Eric Bonita held on 9/14/2012. Court Reporter: Jeffrey G. Thomas (BMA) (Entered: 09/14/2012)
PACER 327 Filed: 9/14/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER denying 321 Motion to adopt pre-trial motions and objections of other defendants as to Neheme Ductant (2) without prejudice to re-filing setting forth the docket numbers of motions and objections defendant wished to be adopted. Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 9/14/2012. (RKR) (Entered: 09/14/2012)
PACER 326 Filed: 9/14/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 319 Motion to adopt motion in limine of other defendant as to Jophaney Hyppolite (8). Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 9/14/2012. (RKR) (Entered: 09/14/2012)
PACER 325 Filed: 9/14/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE of Government's Intent to use Prior Convictions to Enhance the Penalty as to Counts One and Three of the Second Superseding Indictment by USA as to Jude Sereme (Lazarus, David) (Entered: 09/14/2012)
PACER 324 Filed: 9/14/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE of Government's Intention to use Prior Convictions to Enhance the Penalty as to Counts One, Six, and Eleven of the Second Superseding Indictment by USA as to Jophaney Hyppolite (Lazarus, David) (Entered: 09/14/2012)
PACER 323 Filed: 9/14/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE of Government's Intention to use Prior Convictions to Enhance the Penalty as to Count Ten and Tweleve of the Second Superseding Indictment by USA as to Eric Bonita (Lazarus, David) (Entered: 09/14/2012)
PACER 322 Filed: 9/14/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE of Government's Intent to Use Prior Convictions to Enhance the Penalty as to Counts One, Five, Six, Seven and Eight of the Second Superseding Indictment by USA as to Rick Jean (Lazarus, David) (Entered: 09/14/2012)
PACER 321 Filed: 9/13/2012, Entered: None
MOTION to adopt pre trial motions and trial objections by Neheme Ductant. (Kaufman, Allen) (Entered: 09/13/2012)
PACER 320 Filed: 9/13/2012, Entered: None
PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS by Eric Bonita (Lakeman, Richard) (Entered: 09/13/2012)
PACER 319 Filed: 9/13/2012, Entered: None
MOTION to adopt co-defendant Sereme'e motion in liminie by Jophaney Hyppolite. (Mills, John) (Entered: 09/13/2012)
PACER 318 Filed: 9/13/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 314 Motion to appear telephonically as to Neheme Ductant (2). Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 9/13/2012. (BMA) (Entered: 09/13/2012)
PACER 317 Filed: 9/13/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 311 Motion to adopt motion of other defendant as to Rick Jean (3). Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 9/13/2012. (BMA) (1) Main Document modified on 9/13/2012 to correct document(BMA). (Entered: 09/13/2012)
PACER 316 Filed: 9/13/2012, Entered: None Motion in Limine
MOTION in limine by Jude Sereme. (Rosenthal, Russell) (Entered: 09/13/2012)
PACER 315 Filed: 9/13/2012, Entered: None
PROPOSED VOIR DIRE questions by Eric Bonita (Lakeman, Richard) (Entered: 09/13/2012)
PACER 314 Filed: 9/12/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
MOTION to Appear Telephonically by Neheme Ductant. (Kaufman, Allen) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell. (Entered: 09/12/2012)
PACER 313 Filed: 9/12/2012, Entered: None
PROPOSED VOIR DIRE questions by USA as to Jude Sereme, Neheme Ductant, Rick Jean, Wilmane Jean, Jophaney Hyppolite, Eric Bonita (Casas, Jesus) (Entered: 09/12/2012)
PACER 312 Filed: 9/12/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING HEARING: The Status Conference hearing previously scheduled for 9/17/12 is rescheduled as to Jude Sereme, Neheme Ductant, Rick Jean, Wilmane Jean, Jophaney Hyppolite, Eric Bonita. New hearing date and time: Status Conference reset for 9/14/2012 at 11:00 AM (DEFENDANTS ARE REQUIRED TO BE PRESENT) in Ft. Myers Courtroom 6 A before Judge John E. Steele (BMA) (Entered: 09/12/2012)
PACER 311 Filed: 9/12/2012, Entered: None
MOTION to adopt co-defendant Sereme's proposed jury instructions docket #302 by Rick Jean. (Miller, Landon) (Entered: 09/12/2012)
PACER 310 Filed: 9/12/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 306 Motion to permit cellular telephone as to Neheme Ductant (2); granting 304 Motion to permit cellular telephone as to Rick Jean (3). Each counsel for each defendant is permitted to bring one cellular telephone into the building and the courtroom for trial in this case subject to security screening. Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 9/12/2012. (RKR) (Entered: 09/12/2012)
PACER 309 Filed: 9/12/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 305 Motion to adopt motion of other defendant as to Jophaney Hyppolite (8). Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 9/12/2012. (RKR) (Entered: 09/12/2012)
PACER 308 Filed: 9/12/2012, Entered: None
PROPOSED verdict form filed by USA as to Jude Sereme, Neheme Ductant, Rick Jean, Wilmane Jean, Jophaney Hyppolite, Eric Bonita (Casas, Jesus) (Entered: 09/12/2012)
PACER 307 Filed: 9/12/2012, Entered: None
PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS by USA as to Jude Sereme, Neheme Ductant, Rick Jean, Wilmane Jean, Jophaney Hyppolite, Eric Bonita (Casas, Jesus) (Entered: 09/12/2012)
PACER 306 Filed: 9/11/2012, Entered: None
MOTION to allow electronic equipment, specifically cell phone by Neheme Ductant. (Kaufman, Allen) (Entered: 09/11/2012)
PACER 305 Filed: 9/11/2012, Entered: None
MOTION to adopt co-defendant Sereme's proposed jury instructions by Jophaney Hyppolite. (Mills, John) (Entered: 09/11/2012)
PACER 304 Filed: 9/11/2012, Entered: None
MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to Permit Cellular Telephone/PDA (Blackberry) by Rick Jean. (Miller, Landon) (Entered: 09/11/2012)
PACER 303 Filed: 9/11/2012, Entered: None
PROPOSED VOIR DIRE questions by Jude Sereme (Rosenthal, Russell) (Entered: 09/11/2012)
PACER 302 Filed: 9/11/2012, Entered: None
PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS by Jude Sereme (Rosenthal, Russell) Modified on 9/12/2012, case number on pleading is incorrect. (SPB). (Entered: 09/11/2012)
PACER 301 Filed: 9/11/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER denying 298 Motion for permission to use real time court reporting as to Neheme Ductant (2). Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 9/11/2012. (RKR) (Entered: 09/11/2012)
PACER 300 Filed: 9/11/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 291 motion to allow electronic equipment as to Neheme Ductant (2) and counsel Allen S. Kaufman is permitted to bring 1 laptop into the building and courtroom for trial in this case subject to security screening. Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 9/11/2012. (RKR) (Entered: 09/11/2012)
PACER 299 Filed: 9/11/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER denying as moot 268 Motion to correct Scrivener's errors; denying as moot 278 Motion to dismiss as to Jude Sereme (1); denying as moot 279 Motion to adopt motion of other defendant as to Neheme Ductant (2); denying as moot 281 Motion to adopt motion of other defendant as to Wilmane Jean (4); denying as moot 280 Motion to adopt motion of other defendant as to Eric Bonita (10). Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 9/11/2012. (RKR) (Entered: 09/11/2012)
PACER 297 Filed: 9/10/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE of Government's Witness Summary by USA as to Jude Sereme, Neheme Ductant, Rick Jean, Wilmane Jean, Jophaney Hyppolite, Eric Bonita (Casas, Jesus) (Entered: 09/10/2012)
PACER 296 Filed: 9/10/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell: ARRAIGNMENT as to Jude Sereme (1) Count 1, 1s, 1ss, 3, 3s, 3ss and Neheme Ductant (2) Count 1, 1s, 1ss, 2, 2s, 2ss and Rick Jean (3) Count 1, 1s, 1ss, 4-8, 5s-8s, 5ss-8ss and Wilmane Jean (4) Count 1, 1s, 1ss, 4-5, 4s-5s, 4ss-5ss and Jophaney Hyppolite (8) Count 1, 1s, 1ss, 6, 6s, 6ss, 11s, 11ss, 12 and Eric Bonita (10) Count 1, 1s, 1ss, 10s, 10ss, 11, 12s, 12ss held on 9/10/2012. Government summarized the charges, potential penalties and changes in the Second Superceding Indictment. Defendant(s) pled not guilty. Court reconvened as to Defendant Eric Bonita to allow for Counsel Richard Lakeman to appear with Defendant. Government re-summarized charges and potential penalties for Defendant Bonita's benefit. Counsel enters not guilty plea for Defendant Bonita. Case remains on the September trial term as currently scheduled. Court Reporter: Martina Reporting Services/Janet North. (LMF) (Entered: 09/10/2012)
PACER 295 Filed: 9/7/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING HEARING (AS TO TIME ONLY): The Arraignment hearing previously scheduled for 9/10/2012 is rescheduled as to Jude Sereme, Neheme Ductant, Rick Jean, Wilmane Jean, Jophaney Hyppolite, Eric Bonita. New hearing time: Arraignment set for 9/10/2012 at 01:00 PM in Ft. Myers Courtroom 5 D before Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell. (LMF) (Entered: 09/07/2012)
PACER 294 Filed: 9/7/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE OF HEARING as to Jude Sereme, Neheme Ductant, Rick Jean, Wilmane Jean, Jophaney Hyppolite, Eric Bonita. Arraignment set for 9/10/2012 at 01:30 PM in Ft. Myers Courtroom 5 D before Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell. (LMF) (Entered: 09/07/2012)
PACER 293 Filed: 9/7/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 292 Motion to appear telephonically for status conference as to Rick Jean (3). Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 9/7/2012. (BMA) (Entered: 09/07/2012)
PACER 292 Filed: 9/6/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
Unopposed MOTION to Appear Telephonically by Rick Jean. (Miller, Landon) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell. (Entered: 09/06/2012)
PACER 291 Filed: 9/5/2012, Entered: None
MOTION to allow electronic equipment, specifically laptop computer by Neheme Ductant. (Kaufman, Allen) (Entered: 09/05/2012)
PACER 290 Filed: 9/5/2012, Entered: None
REQUEST FOR VOIR DIRE questions by Neheme Ductant. (Kaufman, Allen) Modified on 9/6/2012, to correct docket entry, Motion terminated per. LC/RR (SPB). (Entered: 09/05/2012)
PACER 282 Filed: 9/5/2012, Entered: None
SECOND SUPERSEDING INDICTMENT returned in open Court as to Jude Sereme (1) count(s) 1ss, 3ss, Neheme Ductant (2) count(s) 1ss, 2ss, Rick Jean (3) count(s) 1ss, 5ss-8ss, Wilmane Jean (4) count(s) 1ss, 4ss-5ss, Fritzco Desir (6) count(s) 1ss, 9ss, Jophaney Hyppolite (8) count(s) 1ss, 6ss, 11ss, Eric Bonita (10) count(s) 1ss, 10ss, 12ss. (SPB) (Entered: 09/05/2012)
PACER 281 Filed: 9/5/2012, Entered: None
MOTION to adopt by Wilmane Jean. (Borras, Anthony) (Entered: 09/05/2012)
PACER 280 Filed: 8/31/2012, Entered: None
MOTION to adopt Doc. 278 by Eric Bonita. (Lakeman, Richard) Modified on 9/4/2012, to add document relations(SPB). (Entered: 08/31/2012)
PACER 279 Filed: 8/29/2012, Entered: None
MOTION to adopt (DE 278) by Neheme Ductant. (Kaufman, Allen) (Entered: 08/29/2012)
PACER 278 Filed: 8/29/2012, Entered: None
OBJECTION to government's motion to correct scrivener's error and MOTION to dismiss Count One of superseding indictment by Jude Sereme re 268 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to Correct Scrivener's Errors (Rosenthal, Russell) Modified on 8/29/2012 to edit filing event (drn). (Entered: 08/29/2012)
PACER 277 Filed: 8/28/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting in part 270 Motion for additional peremptory challenges as to Jude Sereme (1). The Court will grant three peremptory challenges for each individual defendant who goes to trial, not to go below 10 for all regardless of who goes to trial, and a proportional increase for the government. Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 8/28/2012. (RKR) (Entered: 08/28/2012)
PDF 276 Filed: 8/29/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 246 The Motion for Leave to Seek Partial Payment of Court Appointed Counsel. Counsel shall submit the requisite information regarding his hours worked to the Court on the CJA 20 form in accordance with the guidelines and instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 8/26/2012. (LMF)
PDF 276 Filed: 8/28/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 246 The Motion for Leave to Seek Partial Payment of Court Appointed Counsel. Counsel shall submit the requisite information regarding his hours worked to the Court on the CJA 20 form in accordance with the guidelines and instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 8/26/2012. (LMF) (Entered: 08/28/2012)
PACER 275 Filed: 8/24/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE to counsel of filing of OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Change of Plea Hearing. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Any party needing a copy of the transcript to review for redaction purposes may purchase a copy from the court reporter or view the document at the clerk's office public terminal as to Michael Dupin. Court Reporter: R. Joy Stancel (JS) (Entered: 08/24/2012)
PACER 274 Filed: 8/24/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Change of Plea Hearing as to Michael Dupin held on August 20, 2012, before Judge Sheri Polster Chappell. Court Reporter/Transcriber R. Joy Stancel, Telephone number 239/461-2064. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter. Redaction Request due 9/14/2012, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/24/2012, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/23/2012. (JS) (Entered: 08/24/2012)
PACER 273 Filed: 8/22/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE OF HEARING as to Jude Sereme, Neheme Ductant, Rick Jean, Wilmane Jean, Jophaney Hyppolite, Eric Bonita. Final Status Conference set for 9/17/2012 at 04:00 PM in Ft. Myers Courtroom 6 A before Judge John E. Steele (BMA) (Entered: 08/22/2012)
PACER 272 Filed: 8/22/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 267 motion for protection as to Eric Bonita (10). Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 8/22/2012. (BMA) (Entered: 08/22/2012)
PACER 271 Filed: 8/22/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
TRIAL CALENDAR for trial term September 2012 as to Jude Sereme, Neheme Ductant, Rick Jean, Wilmane Jean, Jophaney Hyppolite, Eric Bonita Jury Trial set for 9/18/2012 at 09:00 AM (Date Certain) in Ft. Myers Courtroom 6 A before Judge John E. Steele. Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 8/22/2012. (BMA) (Entered: 08/22/2012)
PACER 270 Filed: 8/22/2012, Entered: None
Unopposed MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Additional Peremptory Challenges by Jude Sereme. (Rosenthal, Russell) (Entered: 08/22/2012)
PACER 269 Filed: 8/21/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ACCEPTANCE OF PLEA of guilty and adjudication of guilt re: Counts One & Nine of the Indictment as to Michael Dupin. Signed by Judge John E. Steele. (Sentencing set for 12/3/2012 at 01:30PM in Ft. Myers Courtroom 6 A before Judge John E. Steele.) (BMA) (Entered: 08/21/2012)
PACER 268 Filed: 8/21/2012, Entered: None
MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to Correct Scrivener's Errors by USA as to Jude Sereme, Neheme Ductant, Rick Jean, Wilmane Jean, Fritzco Desir, Jophaney Hyppolite, Eric Bonita (Attachments: # 1 Corrected Superseding Indictment)(Casas, Jesus) Modified on 8/22/2012, to correct event type. (SPB). (Entered: 08/21/2012)
PACER 267 Filed: 8/21/2012, Entered: None
MOTION for protection of dates by Eric Bonita. (Lakeman, Richard) (Entered: 08/21/2012)
PACER 266 Filed: 8/20/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell: ARRAIGNMENT as to Eric Bonita (10) Count 1, 1s, 10s, 11, 12s held on 8/20/2012. Richard Lakeman, CJA Counsel, appeared for the Defendant. Jesus Casas, Assistant United States Attorney, appeared for the Government. Court reconvened an arraignment to address additional questions the Defendant has regarding the superseding indictment. Government summarized the charges and potential penalties in the superseding indictment. Defendant pled not guilty. Defendant remains on the September trial term. Defendant remanded to the custody of the U.S. Marshals. Court Reporter: R. Joy Stancel (LMF) (Entered: 08/20/2012)
PACER 265 Filed: 8/20/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION concerning plea of guilty re: count(s) One and Nine of the Indictment as to Michael Dupin. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 8/20/2012. (LMF) (Entered: 08/20/2012)
PACER 264 Filed: 8/20/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell: CHANGE of plea hearing as to Michael Dupin held on 8/20/2012. Jesus Casas, Assistant United States Attorney, appeared for the Government. Roy Foxall, CJA Counsel, appeared on behalf of the Defendant. Defendant sworn. Factual basis established. Defendant entered guilty plea as to Counts 1 and 9 of the Indictment. Court will recommend the plea be accepted. PSR ordered. Sentencing to be set by further notice before the District Court. The Defendant is remanded to the custody of the U.S. Marshal. Court Reporter: R. Joy Stancel (LMF) (Entered: 08/20/2012)
PACER 263 Filed: 8/20/2012, Entered: None
CONSENT regarding entry of a plea of guilty as to Michael Dupin (LMF) (Entered: 08/20/2012)
PACER 262 Filed: 8/20/2012, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM in support by Rick Jean re 246 Motion for miscellaneous relief of Claim in excess of Statutory Case Limits (Miller, Landon) (Entered: 08/20/2012)
PACER 261 Filed: 8/20/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE OF HEARING as to Eric Bonita. Arraignment set for 8/20/2012 at 01:30 PM in Ft. Myers Courtroom 5 D before Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell. (LMF) (Entered: 08/20/2012)
PACER 260 Filed: 8/14/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE OF HEARING as to Jude Sereme, Neheme Ductant, Rick Jean, Wilmane Jean, Jophaney Hyppolite, Eric Bonita. Jury Trial set for 9/18/2012 at 09:00 AM (Date Certain) in Ft. Myers Courtroom 6 A before Judge John E. Steele. Final Status Conference set for 9/17/2012 at 04:00 PM in Ft. Myers Courtroom 6 A before Judge John E. Steele (BMA) (Entered: 08/14/2012)
PACER 259 Filed: 8/13/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John E. Steele: STATUS conference as to Jude Sereme, Neheme Ductant, Rick Jean, Wilmane Jean, Michael Dupin, Jophaney Hyppolite, Eric Bonita held on 8/13/2012. Superceding Indictment has been filed. This case remains on the September 2012 trial calendar, with a date certain of 9/18/2012. Michael Dupin scheduled for a change of plea on 8/20/2012. Court Reporter: Jeffrey G. Thomas (BMA) Modified on 8/14/2012 (BMA). (Entered: 08/14/2012)
PACER 258 Filed: 8/13/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell: ARRAIGNMENT on SUPERSEDING INDICTMENT as to Jude Sereme (1) Count 1, 1s, 3, 3s and Neheme Ductant (2) Count 1, 1s, 2, 2s and Rick Jean (3) Count 1, 1s, 4-8, 5s-8s and Wilmane Jean (4) Count 1, 1s, 4-5, 4s-5s and Jophaney Hyppolite (8) Count 1, 1s, 6, 6s, 11s, 12 and Eric Bonita (10) Count 1, 1s, 10s, 11, 12s held on 8/13/2012. Jesus Casas and David Lazarus, Assistant United States Attorneys, appeared for the Government. Russell Rosenthal, Federal Public Defender, appeared for Defendant Jude Sereme. Allen Kaufman, CJA Counsel, appeared for Defendant Neheme Ductant. Landon Miller, CJA Counsel, appeared for Defendant Rick Jean. Anthony Borras, CJA Counsel, appeared for Defendant Wilmane Jean. John Mills, CJA Counsel, appeared for Defendant Jophaney Hyppolite. Landon Miller, standing in for CJA Counsel Richard Lakeman, appeared for Defendant Eric Bonita. All Defendants present in Court. Government summarized charges, material changes to the Indictment and potential penalties. Defendant(s) pled not guilty. Case remains on the September 2012 trial term. Defendants remanded to the custody of the U.S. Marshal. Court Reporter: Martina Reporting Services/Patsy Coleman. (LMF) (Entered: 08/13/2012)
PACER 257 Filed: 8/13/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER denying 188 Motion to Sever Defendant as to Eric Bonita (10). Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 8/13/2012. (RKR) (Entered: 08/13/2012)
PACER 256 Filed: 8/10/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE OF HEARING as to Michael Dupin. Change of Plea Hearing set for 8/20/2012 at 02:00 PM in Ft. Myers Courtroom 5 D before Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell. (LMF) (Entered: 08/10/2012)
PACER 255 Filed: 8/10/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE OF HEARING as to Jude Sereme, Neheme Ductant, Rick Jean, Wilmane Jean, Jophaney Hyppolite, Eric Bonita. Arraignment on the Superceding Indictment set for 8/13/2012 at 01:30 PM in Ft. Myers Courtroom 5 D before Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell. (LMF) (Entered: 08/10/2012)
PACER 254 Filed: 8/10/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE of Government's Intent to use Prior Convictions to Enhance Penalties by USA as to Jude Sereme (Lazarus, David) (Entered: 08/10/2012)
PACER 253 Filed: 8/10/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE of Government's Intent to use Prior Convictions to Enhance Penalties by USA as to Rick Jean (Lazarus, David) (Entered: 08/10/2012)
PACER 252 Filed: 8/10/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE of Government's Intention to use Prior COnvictions to Enhance the Penalties by USA as to Jophaney Hyppolite (Lazarus, David) (Entered: 08/10/2012)
PACER 251 Filed: 8/10/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE of Government's Intention to use Prior Convictions to Enhance Penalties by USA as to Eric Bonita (Lazarus, David) (Entered: 08/10/2012)
PACER 249 Filed: 8/9/2012, Entered: None
SUPERSEDING INDICTMENT returned in open Court as to Jude Sereme (1) count(s) 1s, 3s, Neheme Ductant (2) count(s) 1s, 2s, Rick Jean (3) count(s) 1s, 5s-8s, Wilmane Jean (4) count(s) 1s, 4s-5s, Fritzco Desir (6) count(s) 1s, 9s, Jophaney Hyppolite (8) count(s) 1s, 6s, 11s, Eric Bonita (10) count(s) 1s, 10s, 12s. (SPB) (Entered: 08/09/2012)
PACER 248 Filed: 8/9/2012, Entered: None
WAIVER of Objection to Report and Recommendation by USA as to Michael Dupin. (Casas, Jesus) (Entered: 08/09/2012)
PACER 247 Filed: 8/9/2012, Entered: None
PLEA AGREEMENT re: count(s) One and Nine of the Indictment as to Michael Dupin. (Casas, Jesus) (Entered: 08/09/2012)
PACER 246 Filed: 8/9/2012, Entered: None
MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically FOR LEAVE TO SEEK PARTIAL PAYMENT FOR APPOINTED COUNSEL by Rick Jean. (Miller, Landon) (Entered: 08/09/2012)
PACER 245 Filed: 8/8/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 244 Motion to retain investigator as to Neheme Ductant (2). Signed by Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 8/8/2012. (LMF) (Entered: 08/08/2012)
PACER 244 Filed: 8/6/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
MOTION to retain investigator by Neheme Ductant. (Kaufman, Allen) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell. (Entered: 08/06/2012)
PACER 243 Filed: 8/6/2012, Entered: None
MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically leave to seek partial payment of Court Appointed Counsel by Rick Jean. (Miller, Landon) Modified on 8/7/2012, Entire document not scanned, counsel notified (SPB). (Entered: 08/06/2012)
PACER 242 Filed: 7/26/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE to counsel of filing of OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Change of Plea Hearing. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Any party needing a copy of the transcript to review for redaction purposes may purchase a copy from the court reporter or view the document at the clerk's office public terminal as to Rashid Francois. Court Reporter: R. Joy Stancel (JS) (Entered: 07/26/2012)
PACER 241 Filed: 7/26/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Change of Plea Hearing as to Rashid Francois held on July 10, 2012, before Judge Sheri Polster Chappell. Court Reporter/Transcriber R. Joy Stancel, Telephone number 239/461-2064. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter. Redaction Request due 8/16/2012, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/27/2012, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/24/2012. (JS) (Entered: 07/26/2012)
PACER 240 Filed: 7/24/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING HEARING: The Sentencing hearing previously scheduled for 7/30/2012 is rescheduled as to Jennifer Nicole Sander. New hearing date and time:Sentencing reset for 10/15/2012 at 11:00 AM in Ft. Myers Courtroom 6 A before Judge John E. Steele. (BMA) (Entered: 07/25/2012)
PACER 239 Filed: 7/24/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 238 defendant's Motion to continue sentencing as to Jennifer Nicole Sander (9). Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 7/24/2012. (BMA) (Entered: 07/25/2012)
PACER 238 Filed: 7/23/2012, Entered: None
MOTION to continue sentencing by Jennifer Nicole Sander. (kma) (Entered: 07/24/2012)
PACER 237 Filed: 7/24/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE of attorney appearance David Lazarus appearing for USA. (Lazarus, David) (Entered: 07/24/2012)
PACER 236 Filed: 7/19/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED CJA 24 as to Eric Bonita:authorization to pay Jeffrey Thomas for transcriptVoucher FTM2412-012.Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 7/11/12. Paid 7/18/12.(jc) (Entered: 07/19/2012)
PACER 235 Filed: 7/12/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 233 motion for protection as to Wilmane Jean (4). Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 7/12/2012. (BMA) (Entered: 07/12/2012)
PACER 234 Filed: 7/12/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ACCEPTANCE OF PLEA of guilty and adjudication of guilt re: Count One of the Indictment as to Rashid Francois. Signed by Judge John E. Steele. (Sentencing set for 10/9/2012 at 02:30 PM in Ft. Myers Courtroom 6 A before Judge John E. Steele.) (BMA) (Entered: 07/12/2012)
PACER 233 Filed: 7/11/2012, Entered: None
MOTION for protection of Attorney by Wilmane Jean. (Borras, Anthony) (Entered: 07/11/2012)
PACER 232 Filed: 7/10/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION concerning plea of guilty re: count(s) One of the Indictment as to Rashid Francois. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 7/10/2012. (LMH) (Entered: 07/10/2012)
PACER 231 Filed: 7/10/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell: CHANGE of plea hearing as to Rashid Francois held on 7/10/2012. Jose Calvo, Esq., CJA Counsel, appeared on behalf of the Defendant. Jesus Casas, Assistant United States Attorney, appeared for the Government. Defendant sworn. Factual basis established. Defendant entered guilty plea as to Count 1 of the Indictment. Court will recommend that the plea be accepted. PSR ordered. Sentencing to be set by further notice before the District Court. The Defendant is remanded to the custody of the U.S. Marshal. Court Reporter: R. Joy Stancel (LMH) (Entered: 07/10/2012)
PACER 230 Filed: 6/13/2012, Entered: None
WAIVER of Objection to Report and Recommendation by USA as to Rashid Francois. (Casas, Jesus) (Entered: 06/13/2012)
PACER 229 Filed: 6/13/2012, Entered: None
PLEA AGREEMENT re: count(s) One of the Indictment as to Rashid Francois. (Casas, Jesus) (Entered: 06/13/2012)
PACER 228 Filed: 6/11/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE to counsel of filing of OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Any party needing a copy of the transcript to review for redaction purposes may purchase a copy from the court reporter or view the document at the clerk's office public terminal as to Jennifer Nicole Sander. Court Reporter: Jeffrey G. Thomas (JGT) (Entered: 06/11/2012)
PACER 227 Filed: 6/11/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Change of Plea as to Jennifer Nicole Sander held on 04/24/12 before Judge Sheri Polster Chappell. Court Reporter/Transcriber Jeffrey G. Thomas, Telephone number (239) 461-2033. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter. Redaction Request due 7/2/2012, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/12/2012, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/10/2012. (JGT) (Entered: 06/11/2012)
PACER 226 Filed: 6/8/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE OF HEARING as to Rashid Francois. Change of Plea Hearing set for 7/10/2012 at 09:30 AM in Ft. Myers Courtroom 5 D before Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell. (LMH) (Entered: 06/08/2012)
PACER 225 Filed: 6/7/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE Regarding Entry of Guilty Plea, Consent, and Waiver of Objection to Report and Recommendation by Rashid Francois (Calvo, Jose) (Entered: 06/07/2012)
PACER 224 Filed: 5/18/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED CJA 24 as to Neheme Ductant:authorization to pay Martina Reporting for transcriptVoucher FTM2412-007.Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 5/3/12. Processed 5/17/12.(jc) (Entered: 05/18/2012)
PACER 221 Filed: 4/25/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ACCEPTANCE OF PLEA of guilty and adjudication of guilt re: Counts One & Twelve of the Indictment as to Jennifer Nicole Sander. Signed by Judge John E. Steele. (Sentencing set for 7/30/2012 at 01:30 PM in Ft. Myers Courtroom 6 A before Judge John E. Steele.) (BMA) (Entered: 04/25/2012)
PACER 220 Filed: 4/24/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION concerning plea of guilty re: count(s) One and Twelve of the Indictment as to Jennifer Nicole Sander. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 4/24/2012. (LMH) (Entered: 04/24/2012)
PACER 219 Filed: 4/24/2012, Entered: None
PLEA AGREEMENT RATIFIED IN OPEN COURT re: count(s) One and Twelve of the Indictment as to Jennifer Nicole Sander. (LMH) (Entered: 04/24/2012)
PACER 218 Filed: 4/24/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell: CHANGE of plea hearing as to Jennifer Nicole Sander held on 4/24/2012. Jesus Casas, Assistant United States Attorney, appeared on behalf of the Government. Neil Potter, CJA Counsel, appeared on behalf of the Defendant. Defendant sworn. Factual basis established. Defendant entered guilty plea as to Counts 1 and 12 of the Indictment. Court will recommend that the plea be accepted. PSR ordered. Sentencing to be set by further notice before the District Court. The Defendant is remanded to the custody of the U.S. Marshal. Court Reporter: Jeffrey G. Thomas (LMH) (Entered: 04/24/2012)
PACER 217 Filed: 4/18/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 213 Motion to adopt motion of other defendant as to Rick Jean (3); denying as moot 215 Motion to adopt motion of other defendant as to Rick Jean (3); granting 216 Motion to adopt motion of other defendant as to Wilmane Jean (4). Signed by Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 4/18/2012. (LMH) (Entered: 04/18/2012)
PACER 216 Filed: 4/12/2012, Entered: None
Second MOTION to adopt DE190 by Wilmane Jean. (Borras, Anthony) (Entered: 04/12/2012)
PACER 215 Filed: 4/12/2012, Entered: None
First MOTION to adopt DE 190 by Wilmane Jean as to Rick Jean. (Borras, Anthony) (Entered: 04/12/2012)
PACER 214 Filed: 4/12/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
CJA 20 as to Michael Dupin: Appointment of Attorney Roy Foxall, nunc pro tunc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 4/12/2012. (LMH) (Entered: 04/12/2012)
PACER 213 Filed: 4/12/2012, Entered: None
MOTION to adopt Co-Defendant Neheme Ductant's Objections to Magistrate's Findings and Recommendations by Rick Jean. (Miller, Landon) (Entered: 04/12/2012)
PACER 212 Filed: 4/11/2012, Entered: None
OBJECTION by Jude Sereme as to Jude Sereme re 189 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION as to Jude Sereme, Neheme Ductant, Rick Jean, Wilmane Jean, Rashid Francois, Fritzco Desir, Michael Dupin, Jophaney Hyppolite, Jennifer Nicole Sander, Eric Bonita. re 120 MOTION to suppress Evidence & Memo of Law.REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION as to Jude Sereme, Neheme Ductant, Rick Jean, Wilmane Jean, Rashid Francois, Fritzco Desir, Michael Dupin, Jophaney Hyppolite, Jennifer Nicole Sander, Eric Bonita. re 120 MOTION to suppress Evidence & Memo of Law.REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION as to Jude Sereme, Neheme Ductant, Rick Jean, Wilmane Jean, Rashid Francois, Fritzco Desir, Michael Dupin, Jophaney Hyppolite, Jennifer Nicole Sander, Eric Bonita. re 120 MOTION to suppress Evidence & Memo of Law. (Rosenthal, Russell) (Entered: 04/11/2012)
PACER 211 Filed: 4/11/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 209 Motion to continue trial as to Jude Sereme (1), Neheme Ductant (2), Rick Jean (3), Wilmane Jean (4), Michael Dupin (7), Jophaney Hyppolite (8), Jennifer Nicole Sander (9), Eric Bonita (10) Jury Trial set for trial term commencing 9/4/2012 before Judge John E. Steele, Status Conference set for 8/13/2012 at 11:00 AM in Ft. Myers Courtroom 6 A before Judge John E. Steele. Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 4/11/2012. (BMA) (Entered: 04/11/2012)
PACER 210 Filed: 4/11/2012, Entered: None
REPLY to response to motion by Eric Bonita re 188 MOTION to sever defendant (Lakeman, Richard) (Entered: 04/11/2012)
PACER 209 Filed: 4/9/2012, Entered: None
JOINT ORAL MOTION to continue trial as to Jude Sereme, Neheme Ductant, Wilmane Jean, Rashid Francois, Michael Dupin, Jennifer Nicole Sander, Eric Bonita. (BMA) (Entered: 04/10/2012)
PACER 208 Filed: 4/9/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John E. Steele: STATUS conference as to Jude Sereme, Neheme Ductant, Rick Jean, Wilmane Jean, Rashid Francois, Michael Dupin, Jophaney Hyppolite, Jennifer Nicole Sander, Eric Bonita held on 4/9/2012. For the reasons stated on the record, this case is continued to the September 2012 trial term. Written order to follow. Court Reporter: Jeffrey G. Thomas (11:00-11:30) (BMA) (Entered: 04/10/2012)
PACER 207 Filed: 4/10/2012, Entered: None
OBJECTION by Neheme Ductant as to Neheme Ductant re 190 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION as to Jude Sereme, Neheme Ductant, Rick Jean, Wilmane Jean, Rashid Francois, Jophaney Hyppolite, Eric Bonita. re 118 MOTION to suppress WIRETAP EVIDENCE, 165 MOTION to adopt Doc 153 - Ductant's SupplementalREPORT AND RECOMMENDATION as to Jude Sereme, Neheme Ductant, Rick Jean, Wilmane Jean, Rashid Francois, Jophaney Hyppolite, Eric Bonita. re 118 MOTION to suppress WIRETAP EVIDENCE, 165 MOTION to adopt Doc 153 - Ductant's SupplementalREPORT AND RECOMMENDATION as to Jude Sereme, Neheme Ductant, Rick Jean, Wilmane Jean, Rashid Francois, Jophaney Hyppolite, Eric Bonita. re 118 MOTION to suppress WIRETAP EVIDENCE, 165 MOTION to adopt Doc 153 - Ductant's SupplementalREPORT AND RECOMMENDATION as to Jude Sereme, Neheme Ductant, Rick Jean, Wilmane Jean, Rashid Francois, Jophaney Hyppolite, Eric Bonita. re 118 MOTION to suppress WIRETAP EVIDENCE, 165 MOTION to adopt Doc 153 - Ductant's Supplemental (Kaufman, Allen) (Entered: 04/10/2012)
PACER 206 Filed: 4/9/2012, Entered: None
RESPONSE to motion by USA as to Eric Bonita re 188 MOTION to sever defendant (Casas, Jesus) (Entered: 04/09/2012)
PACER 205 Filed: 4/5/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE regarding entry of guilty plea, consent, and waiver of objection to report and recommendation furnished to counsel by Jennifer Nicole Sander (SPB) (Entered: 04/09/2012)
PACER 204 Filed: 4/9/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE OF HEARING as to Jennifer Nicole Sander. Change of Plea Hearing set for 4/24/2012 at 09:30 AM in Ft. Myers Courtroom 5 D before Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell. (LMH) (Entered: 04/09/2012)
PACER 203 Filed: 4/5/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE of Government's Intention to Use Prior Convictions to Enhance the Penalty as to Count One of the Indictment by USA as to Rashid Francois (Casas, Jesus) (Entered: 04/05/2012)
PACER 202 Filed: 4/5/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE of Government's Intent to Use Prior Convictions to Enhance the Penalty as to Counts One and Three of the Indictment by USA as to Jude Sereme (Casas, Jesus) (Entered: 04/05/2012)
PACER 201 Filed: 4/5/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE of Government's Intention to Use Prior Convictions to Enhance the Penalty as to Counts One, Six and Twelve of the Indictment by USA as to Jophaney Hyppolite (Casas, Jesus) (Entered: 04/05/2012)
PACER 200 Filed: 4/5/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE of Government's Intent to Use Prior Convictions to Enhance the Penalty as to Counts One, Four, Five, Six, Seven and Eight of the Indictment by USA as to Rick Jean (Casas, Jesus) (Entered: 04/05/2012)
PACER 199 Filed: 4/5/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE of Government's Intention to Use Prior Convictions to Enhance the Penalty as to Counts One and Eleven of Indictment by USA as to Eric Bonita (Casas, Jesus) (Entered: 04/05/2012)
PACER 198 Filed: 4/5/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE of Government's Intent to Use Prior Convictions to Enhance the Penalty as to Counts One and Twelve of the Indictment by USA as to Jennifer Nicole Sander (Casas, Jesus) (Entered: 04/05/2012)
PACER 197 Filed: 4/5/2012, Entered: None
WAIVER of Objection to Report and Recommendation by USA as to Jennifer Nicole Sander. (Casas, Jesus) (Entered: 04/05/2012)
PACER 196 Filed: 4/5/2012, Entered: None
PLEA AGREEMENT re: count(s) One and Twelve of the Indictment as to Jennifer Nicole Sander. (Casas, Jesus) (Entered: 04/05/2012)
PACER 195 Filed: 4/3/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED CJA 21 as to Eric Bonita:authorization to pay John Valenza for expert servicesVoucher 211097-10-JV01.Signed by Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 3/26/12. Processed 4/2/12.(jc) (Entered: 04/03/2012)
PACER 194 Filed: 3/29/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED CJA 20 as to Jophaney Hyppolite:authorization to pay John D. Mills - Voucher FTM2012-011-1.Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 3/12/12. Processed 3/26/12.(jc) (Entered: 03/29/2012)
PACER 193 Filed: 3/28/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE to counsel of filing of OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Any party needing a copy of the transcript to review for redaction purposes may purchase a copy from the court reporter or view the document at the clerk's office public terminal as to Jude Sereme, Neheme Ductant, Rick Jean, Wilmane Jean, Jophaney Hyppolite, Eric Bonita. Court Reporter: Martina Reporting Services (SPB) (Entered: 03/28/2012)
PACER 192 Filed: 3/21/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Motion to Suppress as to Jude Sereme held on March 7 and 8, 2012 before Judge Sheri Polster Chappell. Court Reporter/Transcriber Patst L. Coleman / Martina Reporting Services, Telephone number 239-334-6545. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter. Redaction Request due 4/11/2012, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/23/2012, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/19/2012. (SPB) (Entered: 03/28/2012)
PACER 191 Filed: 3/21/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Motion to Suppress as to Jude Sereme, Neheme Ductant, Rick Jean, Wilmane Jean, Rashid Francois, Jophaney Hyppolite, Eric Bonita held on March 7, 2012 before Judge Sheri Polster Chappell. Court Reporter/Transcriber Patsy Coleman / Martina Report Services, Telephone number 239/344-6545. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter. Redaction Request due 4/11/2012, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/23/2012, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/19/2012. (SPB) (Entered: 03/28/2012)
PACER 190 Filed: 3/27/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION as to Jude Sereme, Neheme Ductant, Rick Jean, Wilmane Jean, Rashid Francois, Jophaney Hyppolite, Eric Bonita. re 118 MOTION to suppress WIRETAP EVIDENCE, 165 MOTION to adopt 153 - Ductant's Supplemental Memo in Support of Motion to Suppress (Renewed), 162 MOTION to adopt 153 - Durant's Supplemental Memo in Support of Motion to Suppress (Renewed). It is respectfully recommended that (1)Neheme Ductants Motion to Suppress Wiretap Evidence 118 be DENIED. (2) Rashid Francois' Renewed Motion to Adopt Co-Defendants Motion to Suppress Wiretap Evidence 162 be DENIED. (3) Eric Bonita's Renewed Motion to Adopt Co-Defendants Motion to Suppress Wiretap Evidence (Doc. #165) be DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 3/26/2012. (LMH) (Entered: 03/27/2012)
PACER 189 Filed: 3/27/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION as to Defendant Jude Sereme's Motion to Suppress Evidence and Memorandum of Law 120 and Jophaney Hyppolite's 127 Motion to Adopt Sereme's Motion to Suppress Evidence. It is respectfully recommended that the Defendant Jude Sereme's Motion to Suppress Evidence and Memorandum of Law 120 and Jophaney Hyppolite's 127 Motion to Adopt Sereme's Motion to Suppress Evidence should be DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 3/26/2012. (LMH) (Entered: 03/27/2012)
PACER 188 Filed: 3/26/2012, Entered: None
MOTION to sever defendant by Eric Bonita. (Lakeman, Richard) (Entered: 03/26/2012)
PDF 187 Filed: 3/26/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
AMENDED ORDER as to Jophaney Hyppolite re 126 denying as moot MOTION to adopt Ducant's Motion to Suppress, Doc. 118 filed by Jophaney Hyppolite and granting Jophaney' Hyppolite's Renewed Motion to Adopt Do-Defendant Ductant's Motion to Suppress Wiretap Evidence 166 . The Clerk of Court is directed to edit the docket sheet in CM/ECF so Doc. #127 shows as a pending motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 3/26/2012. (LMH) (Entered: 03/26/2012)
PACER 186 Filed: 3/22/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
Case as to Jude Sereme, Neheme Ductant, Rick Jean, Wilmane Jean, Rashid Francois, Michael Dupin, Jophaney Hyppolite, Jennifer Nicole Sander and Eric Bonita reassigned pursuant to 2:12-mc-13-FtM-29 to Judge John E. Steele. New case number: 2:11-cr-97-FtM-29SPC. Unassigned Judge no longer assigned to the case. (kma) (Entered: 03/26/2012)
PACER 185 Filed: 3/26/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 163 Wilmane Jean's Renewed Motion to Adopt Co-Defendant's Motion to Suppress Wiretap Evidence (4). Signed by Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 3/26/2012. (LMH) (Entered: 03/26/2012)
PACER 184 Filed: 3/26/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 161 Jude Sereme's Renewed Motion to Adopt Co-Defendant's Motion to Suppress Wiretap Evidence (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 3/26/2012. (LMH) (Entered: 03/26/2012)
PACER 183 Filed: 3/26/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 164 Rick Jean's Renewed Motion to Adopt Co-Defendant's Motion to Suppress Wiretap Evidence (3). Signed by Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 3/26/2012. (LMH) (Entered: 03/26/2012)
PACER 182 Filed: 3/26/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER denying as moot 127 Motion to adopt motion of other defendant as to Jophaney Hyppolite (8); granting 166 Motion to adopt motion of other defendant as to Jophaney Hyppolite (8). Signed by Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 3/26/2012. (LMH) (Entered: 03/26/2012)
PACER 181 Filed: 3/19/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED ORDER denying as moot 146 Wilmane Jean's Motion to Adopt Co-Defendant Neheme Ductant's Motion to Suppress Wiretap Evidence. Defendant W. Jean has filed a Renewed Motion (Doc. #163); therefore the instant Motion is due to be denied as moot. The Court will consider the Renewed Motion in due course. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 3/19/2012. (BLW) (Entered: 03/19/2012)
PACER 180 Filed: 3/19/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED ORDER denying as moot 136 Jude Sereme's Motion to Adopt Co-Defendant Neheme Ductant's Motion to Suppress Wiretap Evidence. Defendant Sereme has filed a Renewed Motion (Doc. #161); therefore the instant Motion is due to be denied as moot. The Court will consider the Renewed Motion in due course. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 3/19/2012. (BLW) (Entered: 03/19/2012)
PACER 179 Filed: 3/19/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED ORDER denying as moot 134 Rashid Francois' Motion to Adopt Co-Defendant Neheme Ductant's Motion to Suppress Wiretap Evidence. Defendant Francois has filed a Renewed Motion (Doc. #162); therefore the instant Motion is due to be denied as moot. The Court will consider the Renewed Motion in due course. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 3/19/2012. (BLW) (Entered: 03/19/2012)
PACER 178 Filed: 3/19/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED ORDER denying as moot 128 Rick Jean's Motion to Adopt co-Defendant Neheme Ductant's Motion to Suppress Wiretap Evidence. Defendant R. Jean has filed a Renewed Motion (Doc. #164), therefore the instant Motion is due to be denied as moot. The Court will consider the Renewed Motion in due course. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 3/19/2012. (BLW) (Entered: 03/19/2012)
PACER 177 Filed: 3/19/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED ORDER denying as moot 126 Jophaney Hyppolite's Motion to Adopt co-Defendant Neheme Ductant's Motion to Suppress Wiretap Evidence. Defendant Hyppolite has filed a Renewed Motion (Doc. #166), therefore the instant Motion is due to be denied as moot. The Court will consider the Renewed Motion in due course. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 3/19/2012. (BLW) (Entered: 03/19/2012)
PACER 176 Filed: 3/12/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE OF TRIAL CONFLICT by Neheme Ductant (Kaufman, Allen) (Entered: 03/12/2012)
PACER 175 Filed: 3/9/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER for production of transcript as to Jude Sereme, Neheme Ductant, Rick Jean, Wilmane Jean, Rashid Francois, Jophaney Hyppolite, Eric Bonita. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 3/9/2012. (LMH) (Entered: 03/09/2012)
PACER 174 Filed: 3/8/2012, Entered: None
EXHIBIT LIST by Neheme Ductant (Exhibits re 153 Memorandum in support submitted during hearing) (LMH) (Entered: 03/08/2012)
PACER 173 Filed: 3/8/2012, Entered: None
EXHIBIT LIST by Jude Sereme (LMH) (Entered: 03/08/2012)
PACER 172 Filed: 3/8/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell: MOTION hearing as to Jude Sereme re 120 MOTION to suppress Evidence & Memo of Law filed by Jude Sereme held on 3/8/2012. Court heard argument and remaining testimony on the motion. Counsel offered closing argument. See attached minutes for details. Report and recommendation to follow. Defendant remanded to custody of the US Marshal. Court Reporter: Martina Reporting Services/Patsy Coleman. (LMH) (Entered: 03/08/2012)
PACER 171 Filed: 3/8/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell: MOTION hearing as to Jude Sereme, Neheme Ductant, Rick Jean, Wilmane Jean, Rashid Francois, Jophaney Hyppolite, Eric Bonita re 118 MOTION to suppress WIRETAP EVIDENCE filed by Neheme Ductant, 120 MOTION to suppress Evidence & Memo of Law filed by Jude Sereme held on 3/7/2012. DAY ONE: Court heard argument from Counsel on Motion to Suppress as to Neheme Ductant and Motion to Suppress as to Jude Sereme. See attached minutes for details. Defendant's remanded to custody of US Marshals. Hearing continued to March 8, 2012. Court Reporter: Martina Reporting Services/Patsy Coleman. (LMH) (Entered: 03/08/2012)
PACER 170 Filed: 3/8/2012, Entered: None
EXHIBIT LIST by USA as to Jude Sereme. (LMH) (Entered: 03/08/2012)
PACER 169 Filed: 3/7/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE OF HEARING on motion in case as to Jude Sereme, 120 MOTION to suppress Evidence & Memo of Law : Hearing was continued from previous day, Motion Hearing set for 3/8/2012 at 10:15 AM in Ft. Myers Courtroom 6 A before Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell. (LMH) (Entered: 03/07/2012)
PACER 168 Filed: 3/7/2012, Entered: None
WITNESS LIST by USA as to Jude Sereme, Neheme Ductant (Casas, Jesus) (Entered: 03/07/2012)
PACER 167 Filed: 3/7/2012, Entered: None
EXHIBIT LIST by USA as to Jude Sereme, Neheme Ductant (Casas, Jesus) (Entered: 03/07/2012)
PACER 166 Filed: 3/6/2012, Entered: None
Supplemental MOTION to adopt co-Defendant Ducant's Motion to Suppress Wiretap Evidence by Jophaney Hyppolite. (Mills, John) (Entered: 03/06/2012)
PACER 165 Filed: 3/6/2012, Entered: None
MOTION to adopt Doc 153 - Ductant's Supplemental Memo in Support of Motion to Suppress (Renewed) by Eric Bonita. (Lakeman, Richard) (Entered: 03/06/2012)
PACER 164 Filed: 3/6/2012, Entered: None
MOTION to adopt Doc 153 - Durant's Supplemental Memo in Support of Motion to Suppress (Renewed) by Rick Jean. (Miller, Landon) (Entered: 03/06/2012)
PACER 163 Filed: 3/6/2012, Entered: None
MOTION to adopt Renewed Co-Defendant's Motion to Suppress Wire-Tap Evidence by Wilmane Jean. (Borras, Anthony) (Entered: 03/06/2012)
PACER 162 Filed: 3/6/2012, Entered: None
MOTION to adopt Doc 153 - Durant's Supplemental Memo in Support of Motion to Suppress (Renewed) by Rashid Francois. (Calvo, Jose) (Entered: 03/06/2012)
PACER 161 Filed: 3/6/2012, Entered: None
MOTION to adopt Doc 153 - Durant's Supplemental memo in Support of Motion to Suppress (Renewed) by Jude Sereme. (Rosenthal, Russell) (Entered: 03/06/2012)
PACER 160 Filed: 3/6/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED ORDER. In light of Defendant Neheme Ductant's Supplemental Memorandum in Support of His Motion to Suppress Wiretap Evidence (Doc. #153), which narrowed the grounds for suppression raised in his Motion, the Defendants who previously adopted the Motion shall file a Notice with the Court to renew their adoption if it is still their desire to do so. Counsel shall do so on or before March 7, 2012 at 9:00 am. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 3/6/2012. (BLW) (Entered: 03/06/2012)
PACER 159 Filed: 3/5/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER REGARDING PENDING MOTION TO SUPPRESS as to Jude Sereme, Neheme Ductant, Rick Jean, Wilmane Jean, Rashid Francois, Fritzco Desir, Michael Dupin, Jophaney Hyppolite, Jennifer Nicole Sander, Eric Bonita. All counsel that have filed motions to adopt shall be present during the hearing scheduled for March 7, 2012 at 9:30. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 3/5/2012. (BJH) (Entered: 03/05/2012)
PACER 158 Filed: 3/5/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER ON MOTION FOR COSTS as to Eric Bonita Signed by Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 3/5/2012. (BJH) (Entered: 03/05/2012)
PDF 157 Filed: 3/5/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER as to Eric Bonita re 145 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Cost filed by Eric Bonita. The Motion for Costs (Doc. #145) is GRANTED. The Court approves the acquisition of the following:1)One (1) internal SATA hard drive with at least 1.5 Terabyte(TB)2)One (1) internal SATA hard drive with at least 320 gigabytes (GB)3)An external USB hard drive enclosure to connect the hard drive directly to computer.The total expenditure shall not exceed $400.00. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 3/5/2012. (LMH) (Entered: 03/05/2012)
PACER 156 Filed: 3/5/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER OF DETENTION as to Eric Bonita. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 3/5/2012. (BJH) (Entered: 03/05/2012)
PACER 155 Filed: 3/5/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell: denying 121 Motion as to Eric Bonita (10); granting 145 Motion as to Eric Bonita (10); MOTION hearing as to Eric Bonita re 121 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically detention hearing and release of defendant filed by Eric Bonita, 145 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Cost filed by Eric Bonita held on 3/5/2012. Writen Orders to enter. Court Reporter: Martina Reporting Services (BJH) (Entered: 03/05/2012)
PACER 154 Filed: 3/5/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER denying 119 Motion to Sever Defendant as to Neheme Ductant (2). Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 3/5/2012. (SVC) (Entered: 03/05/2012)
PACER 153 Filed: 3/5/2012, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM in support by Neheme Ductant re 152 Order (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Kaufman, Allen) (NOTE: Exhibits to document submitted as listed on 174 Exhibit list) (kma). (Entered: 03/05/2012)
PACER 151 Filed: 2/29/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING HEARING: The Motion for Bond hearing previously scheduled for 3/1/2012 is rescheduled as to Eric Bonita. New hearing date and time: Motion Hearing set for 3/5/2012 at 11:15 AM in Ft. Myers Courtroom 5 D before Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell. (LMH) (Entered: 02/29/2012)
PACER 150 Filed: 2/29/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED ORDER denying as moot 135 Motion to adopt motion of other defendant as to Wilmane Jean (4). The Motion was withdraw by Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 2/29/2012. (LMH) (Entered: 02/29/2012)
PACER 149 Filed: 2/29/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED ORDER granting 147 Motion to Withdraw Document as to Wilmane Jean (4). Signed by Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 2/29/2012. (LMH) (Entered: 02/29/2012)
PACER 148 Filed: 2/28/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING HEARING: The Motion to Suppress hearing previously scheduled for 3/14/2012 is rescheduled as to Neheme Ductant. New hearing date and time: Motion Hearing set for 3/7/2012 at 09:30 AM in Ft. Myers Courtroom 5 D before Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell. (LMH) (Entered: 02/28/2012)
PACER 147 Filed: 2/28/2012, Entered: None
MOTION to withdraw document 135 MOTION to adopt Co-Defendant Jude Sereme's Motion to Suppress Evidence and Memorandum of Law by Wilmane Jean. (Borras, Anthony) (Entered: 02/28/2012)
PACER 146 Filed: 2/28/2012, Entered: None
MOTION to adopt Co-Defendant's Motion to Suppress Wire-Tap Evidence by Wilmane Jean. (Borras, Anthony) (Entered: 02/28/2012)
PACER 145 Filed: 2/23/2012, Entered: None, Terminated: 3/5/2012
MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Cost by Eric Bonita. (Lakeman, Richard) (Entered: 02/23/2012)
PACER 144 Filed: 2/23/2012, Entered: None
RESPONSE to motion by USA as to Jude Sereme re 120 MOTION to suppress Evidence & Memo of Law (Casas, Jesus) (Entered: 02/23/2012)
PACER 143 Filed: 2/21/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE OF HEARING on motion in case as to Eric Bonita 121 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically detention hearing and release of defendant : Motion Hearing set for 3/1/2012 at 01:30 PM in Ft. Myers Courtroom 5 D before Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell. (LMH) (Entered: 02/21/2012)
PDF 223 Filed: 5/16/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
OPINION AND ORDER denying 120 Motion to Suppress as to Jude Sereme (1); accepting, adopting and specifically incorporating 189 Report and Recommendations as to Jude Sereme (1), Jophaney Hyppolite (8); denying 127 Motion to adopt motion of other defendant as to Jophaney Hyppolite (8). Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 5/16/2012. (RKR)
PDF 222 Filed: 5/15/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
OPINION AND ORDER denying 118 Motion to Suppress as to Neheme Ductant (2); accepting and adopting 190 Report and Recommendations as to Neheme Ductant (2), Rashid Francois (5), Eric Bonita (10); denying 162 Motion to adopt motion of other defendant as to Rashid Francois (5); denying 165 Motion to adopt motion of other defendant as to Eric Bonita (10). Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 5/15/2012. (RKR)
PDF 187 Filed: 3/27/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
AMENDED ORDER as to Jophaney Hyppolite re 126 denying as moot MOTION to adopt Ducant's Motion to Suppress, Doc. 118 filed by Jophaney Hyppolite and granting Jophaney' Hyppolite's Renewed Motion to Adopt Do-Defendant Ductant's Motion to Suppress Wiretap Evidence 166 . The Clerk of Court is directed to edit the docket sheet in CM/ECF so Doc. #127 shows as a pending motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 3/26/2012. (LMH)
PDF 157 Filed: 3/6/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER as to Eric Bonita re 145 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Cost filed by Eric Bonita. The Motion for Costs (Doc. #145) is GRANTED. The Court approves the acquisition of the following:1)One (1) internal SATA hard drive with at le ast 1.5 Terabyte(TB)2)One (1) internal SATA hard drive with at least 320 gigabytes (GB)3)An external USB hard drive enclosure to connect the hard drive directly to computer.The total expenditure shall not exceed $400.00. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 3/5/2012. (LMH)
PDF 152 Filed: 3/1/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER as to Neheme Ductant. Counsel for Defendant Neheme Ductant shall have up to and including 12:00 p.m. on March 6, 2012, to supplement his Motion to Suppress Wiretap Evidence (Doc. #118) with argument, any supporting documents, and citations in support of all of his alleged grounds for relief listed on pp. 2-3 of his Motion. Failure to do so could result in the issue being resolved without the Court holding a hearing on the issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 3/1/2012. (LMH)
PACER 142 Filed: 2/18/2012, Entered: None
REPLY to response to motion by Neheme Ductant re 118 MOTION to suppress WIRETAP EVIDENCE (Kaufman, Allen) (Entered: 02/18/2012)
PACER 141 Filed: 2/17/2012, Entered: None
RESPONSE 118 MOTION to suppress WIRETAP EVIDENCE by USA as to Neheme Ductant (Casas, Jesus) (Entered: 02/17/2012)
PACER 140 Filed: 2/16/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE of Discovery Response by USA as to Rashid Francois (Attachments: # 1 Discovery Letter)(Casas, Jesus) (Entered: 02/16/2012)
PACER 139 Filed: 2/16/2012, Entered: None
RESPONSE to motion by USA as to Wilmane Jean re 135 MOTION to adopt Co-Defendant Jude Sereme's Motion to Suppress Evidence and Memorandum of Law (Casas, Jesus) (Entered: 02/16/2012)
PACER 138 Filed: 2/15/2012, Entered: None
RESPONSE to motion by USA as to Jophaney Hyppolite re 127 MOTION to adopt Sereme's Motion to Suppress, Doc. 120 (Casas, Jesus) (Entered: 02/15/2012)
PACER 137 Filed: 2/15/2012, Entered: None
RESPONSE to motion by USA as to Neheme Ductant re 119 MOTION to sever defendant (Casas, Jesus) (Entered: 02/15/2012)
PACER 136 Filed: 2/15/2012, Entered: None
MOTION to adopt Co-Defendant Ductant's Motion to Suppress Wire-Tap Evidence by Jude Sereme. (Rosenthal, Russell) (Entered: 02/15/2012)
PACER 135 Filed: 2/15/2012, Entered: None
MOTION to adopt Co-Defendant Jude Sereme's Motion to Suppress Evidence and Memorandum of Law by Wilmane Jean. (Borras, Anthony) (Entered: 02/15/2012)
PACER 134 Filed: 2/15/2012, Entered: None
MOTION to adopt Co-Defendant Neheme Ductant's Motion to Suppress Wiretap Evidence by Rashid Francois. (Calvo, Jose) (Entered: 02/15/2012)
PACER 133 Filed: 2/15/2012, Entered: None
RESPONSE to motion by USA as to Jophaney Hyppolite re 127 MOTION to adopt Sereme's Motion to Suppress, Doc. 120 (Amended) (Casas, Jesus) Modified on 2/16/2012, Document not scanned properly, Counsel corrected (SPB). (Entered: 02/15/2012)
PACER 132 Filed: 2/15/2012, Entered: None
RESPONSE to motion by USA as to Neheme Ductant re 119 MOTION to sever defendant (Amended) (Casas, Jesus)Modified on 2/16/2012, Document not scanned properly, Counsel corrected (SPB). (Entered: 02/15/2012)
PACER 131 Filed: 2/15/2012, Entered: None
RESPONSE to motion by USA as to Jophaney Hyppolite re 127 MOTION to adopt Sereme's Motion to Suppress, Doc. 120 (Casas, Jesus) Modified on 2/16/2012, Document not scanned properly, Counsel corrected (SPB). (Entered: 02/15/2012)
PACER 130 Filed: 2/15/2012, Entered: None
RESPONSE to motion by USA as to Neheme Ductant re 119 MOTION to sever defendant (Casas, Jesus) Modified on 2/16/2012, Document not scanned properly, Counsel corrected (SPB). (Entered: 02/15/2012)
PACER 129 Filed: 2/13/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE OF HEARING on motion in case as to Neheme Ductant 118 MOTION to suppress WIRETAP EVIDENCE : Motion Hearing set for 3/14/2012 at 09:30 AM in Ft. Myers Courtroom 5 D before Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell. (LMH) (Entered: 02/13/2012)
PACER 128 Filed: 2/13/2012, Entered: None
MOTION to adopt Co-Defendant Neheme Ductant's Motion to Suppress Wiretap Evidence by Rick Jean. (Miller, Landon) (Entered: 02/13/2012)
PACER 127 Filed: 2/13/2012, Entered: None
MOTION to adopt Sereme's Motion to Suppress, Doc. 120 by Jophaney Hyppolite. (Mills, John) (Entered: 02/13/2012)
PACER 126 Filed: 2/13/2012, Entered: None
MOTION to adopt Ducant's Motion to Suppress, Doc. 118 by Jophaney Hyppolite. (Mills, John) (Entered: 02/13/2012)
PACER 125 Filed: 2/13/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE OF HEARING on motion in case as to Jude Sereme 120 MOTION to suppress Evidence & Memo of Law : Motion Hearing set for 3/7/2012 at 09:30 AM in Ft. Myers Courtroom 5 D before Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell. (LMH) (Entered: 02/13/2012)
PACER 124 Filed: 2/13/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 114 The Unopposed Motion for Costs as to Wilmane Jean (4). The Court approves the acquisition of the following in the amounts contained within the motion: 1)One (1) internal SATA hard drive with at least 1.5 Terabyte(TB). 2)One (1) internal SATA hard drive with at least 320 gigabytes (GB). 3)An external USB hard drive enclosure to connect the hard drive directly to computer. The total expenditure shall not exceed $400.00. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 2/13/2012. (LMH) (Entered: 02/13/2012)
PACER 123 Filed: 2/13/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 115 The Motion for Reimbursement of Costs as to Jophaney Hyppolite (8). Counsel shall submit the requisite information regarding the computer equipment purchased in advance to the Court on the CJA 21 form.Counsel shall submit the requisite information regarding his hours worked to the Court on the CJA 20 form in accordance with the guidelines and instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 2/13/2012. (LMH) (Entered: 02/13/2012)
PACER 122 Filed: 2/13/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 116 The Unopposed Motion for Costs as to Rashid Francois (5). The Court approves the acquisition of the following in the amounts contained within the motion:1)One (1) internal SATA hard drive with at least 1.5 Terabytes (TB);2)One (1) internal SATA hard drive with at least 320 gigabytes (GB);3)An external USB hard drive enclosure to connect the hard drive directly to computer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 2/13/2012. (LMH) (Entered: 02/13/2012)
PACER 121 Filed: 2/10/2012, Entered: None
MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically detention hearing and release of defendant by Eric Bonita. (Lakeman, Richard) (Entered: 02/10/2012)
PACER 120 Filed: 2/9/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
MOTION to suppress Evidence & Memo of Law by Jude Sereme. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Exhibit A - 64 pgs, # 2 Affidavit Exhibit B - 75 pgs, # 3 Affidavit Exhibit C - 87 pgs, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit D - 5 pgs, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit E - 4 pgs)(Rosenthal, Russell) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell. (Entered: 02/09/2012)
PACER 119 Filed: 2/8/2012, Entered: None
MOTION to sever defendant by Neheme Ductant. (Kaufman, Allen) (Entered: 02/08/2012)
PACER 118 Filed: 2/8/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
MOTION to suppress WIRETAP EVIDENCE by Neheme Ductant. (Kaufman, Allen) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell. (Entered: 02/08/2012)
PACER 117 Filed: 2/3/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER Setting Hearing as to Wilmane Jean, Rashid Francois, Jophaney Hyppolite re: 116 Unopposed MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically for costs, 114 Unopposed MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically For Costs, 115 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Motion for partial payment of attorney fees. Motion Hearing set for 2/9/2012 at 09:45 AM in Ft. Myers Courtroom 5 D before Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 2/3/2012. (LMH) (Entered: 02/03/2012)
PACER 116 Filed: 2/2/2012, Entered: None
Unopposed MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically for costs by Rashid Francois. (Calvo, Jose) (Entered: 02/02/2012)
PACER 115 Filed: 2/1/2012, Entered: None
MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Motion for partial payment of attorney fees by Jophaney Hyppolite. (Mills, John) (Entered: 02/01/2012)
PACER 114 Filed: 1/30/2012, Entered: None
Unopposed MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically For Costs by Wilmane Jean. (Borras, Anthony) (Entered: 01/30/2012)
PACER 113 Filed: 1/30/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 110 The Motion for Court Authorization for Payment of Investigative Costs as to Rick Jean (3) is GRANTED to the extent that counsel may hire the private investigator but compensation shall not exceed $1,600.00, exclusive of reimbursement for expenses reasonably incurred. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 1/30/2012. (LMH) (Entered: 01/30/2012)
PACER 112 Filed: 1/30/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 106 Motion to Suppress as to Jophaney Hyppolite (8) to the extent that the post-Miranda interviews of defendant may not be presented during the government's case-in-chief or for impeachment purposes. Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 1/30/2012. (RKR) (Entered: 01/30/2012)
PACER 111 Filed: 1/30/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE canceling Evidentiary hearing on Motion to Suppress hearing scheduled for 2/8/2012 as to Jophaney Hyppolite. (LMH) (Entered: 01/30/2012)
PACER 110 Filed: 1/24/2012, Entered: None
MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Court Authorization for payment of Investigative Costs by Rick Jean. (Miller, Landon) (Entered: 01/24/2012)
PACER 109 Filed: 1/17/2012, Entered: None
RESPONSE to motion by USA as to Jophaney Hyppolite re 106 MOTION to suppress statement (Casas, Jesus) (Entered: 01/17/2012)
PACER 108 Filed: 12/28/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 99 Unopposed Motion to Cost as to Rick Jean (3). Signed by Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 12/28/2011. (LMH) (Entered: 12/28/2011)
PACER 107 Filed: 12/27/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE OF HEARING on motion in case as to Jophaney Hyppolite 106 MOTION to suppress statement : Motion Hearing set for 2/8/2012 at 09:30 AM in Ft. Myers Courtroom 5 D before Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell. (LMH) (Entered: 12/27/2011)
PACER 106 Filed: 12/27/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
MOTION to suppress statement by Jophaney Hyppolite. (Mills, John) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell. (Entered: 12/27/2011)
PACER 105 Filed: 12/22/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE of Discovery Response by USA as to Michael Dupin (Attachments: # 1 Discovery Letter)(Casas, Jesus) (Entered: 12/22/2011)
PACER 104 Filed: 12/22/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE of attorney appearance: John Dawson Mills appearing for Jophaney Hyppolite (Mills, John) (Entered: 12/22/2011)
PACER 103 Filed: 12/13/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 102 Motion to continue trial as to Jude Sereme (1), Neheme Ductant (2), Rick Jean (3), Wilmane Jean (4), Rashid Francois (5), Michael Dupin (7), Jophaney Hyppolite (8), Jennifer Nicole Sander (9), Eric Bonita (10). Jury Trial set for term commencing 5/1/2012 in Ft. Myers Courtroom 6 A before Judge John E. Steele. Status Conference set for 4/9/2012 at 11:00 AM in Ft. Myers Courtroom 6 A before Judge John E. Steele. Signed by Judge Charlene E. Honeywell on 12/13/2011. (LAF) (Entered: 12/13/2011)
PACER 102 Filed: 12/12/2011, Entered: None
ORAL MOTION to continue trial by Jude Sereme, Neheme Ductant, Rick Jean, Wilmane Jean, Rashid Francois, Michael Dupin, Jophaney Hyppolite, Jennifer Nicole Sander, Eric Bonita. (LAF) (Entered: 12/13/2011)
PACER 101 Filed: 12/12/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Charlene E. Honeywell: STATUS conference as to Jude Sereme, Neheme Ductant, Rick Jean, Wilmane Jean, Rashid Francois, Michael Dupin, Jophaney Hyppolite, Jennifer Nicole Sander, Eric Bonita held on 12/12/2011. This case is continued to the May 2012 trial term for the reasons stated on the record. Written order to follow. Court Reporter: R. Joy Stancel (LAF) (Entered: 12/13/2011)
PACER 100 Filed: 12/8/2011, Entered: None
Rule 5(c)(3) documents received from District of Southern District of Florida (Miami) as to Michael Dupin, documents include Criminal Docket Sheet, Court Minutes, Minute Order, Warrant for Removal, Indictment. (SPB) (Entered: 12/12/2011)
PACER 99 Filed: 12/12/2011, Entered: None
Unopposed MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically for Costs by Rick Jean. (Miller, Landon) (Entered: 12/12/2011)
PACER 98 Filed: 12/7/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 76 Defendant's Motion for Court Authorization for Payment of Investigative Costs as to Eric Bonita (10), to the extent that counsel may hire the private investigator but compensation shall not exceed $2,400.00, exclusive of reimbursement for expenses reasonably incurred. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 12/7/2011. (LMH) (Entered: 12/07/2011)
PACER 97 Filed: 12/6/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
SCHEDULING ORDER as to Michael Dupin. Status Conference set for 12/12/2011 at 01:30 PM in Ft. Myers Courtroom 6 B before Judge Charlene E. Honeywell, Jury Trial set for trial term beginning 1/3/2012 in Ft. Myers Courtroom 6 A before Judge John E. Steele. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 12/6/2011. (LMH) (Entered: 12/06/2011)
PACER 96 Filed: 12/6/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell: ARRAIGNMENT as to Michael Dupin (7) Count 1, 9 held on 12/6/2011. Roy Foxall, CJA Counsel, appeared on behalf of the Defendant. Douglas Molloy, Assistant United States Attorney, appeared on behalf of the Government. Government summarized the charges and potential penalties. Defendant(s) pled not guilty. Defendant set for a status conference on December 12, 2011, at 1:30 P.M., before the Hon. Charlene Edwards Honeywell, and will be placed on the January 3, 2012 trial term before the Honorable John E. Steele. Defendant remanded to custody for U.S. Marshal. (DIGITAL) (LMH) (Entered: 12/06/2011)
PACER 95 Filed: 12/6/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING HEARING (AS TO TIME ONLY): The Initial Appearance/Arraignment hearing previously scheduled for 12/6/2011 is rescheduled as to Michael Dupin. New hearing time: Arraignment set for 12/6/2011 at 11:00 AM in Ft. Myers Courtroom 5 D before Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell. (LMH) (Entered: 12/06/2011)
PACER 94 Filed: 12/5/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE OF HEARING as to Michael Dupin. Initial Appearance set for 12/6/2011 at 10:00 AM in Ft. Myers Courtroom 5 D before Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell. (LAF) (Entered: 12/05/2011)
PACER 93 Filed: 12/5/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
CJA 20 as to Rashid Francois: Appointment of Attorney Jose Calvo Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas N. Frazier on 11/23/11. (BJH) (Entered: 12/05/2011)
PACER 92 Filed: 12/1/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER OF DETENTION as to Rashid Francois. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 12/1/2011. (LMH) (Entered: 12/01/2011)
PACER 91 Filed: 11/30/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell: Detention Hearing as to Rashid Francois held on 11/30/2011. Jesus Casas, Assistant United States Attorney, appeared on behalf of the Government. Jose Calvo, CJA Counsel, appeared for the Defendant. Government seeks detention. Defense argues for bond. Court heard argument of Counsel. Court finds the Defendant did not overcome presumption. Written Order to follow. Defendant remanded to the custody of the US Marshal. Court Reporter: R. Joy Stancel (LMH) (Entered: 11/30/2011)
PACER 90 Filed: 11/25/2011, Entered: None
ARREST WARRANT returned executed on 11/23/2011 as to Rashid Francois. (kma) (Entered: 11/25/2011)
PACER 89 Filed: 11/25/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE OF HEARING as to Rashid Francois. Detention Hearing set for 11/30/2011 at 09:30 AM in Ft. Myers Courtroom 5 D before Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell. (LMH) (Entered: 11/25/2011)
PACER 88 Filed: 11/23/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
SCHEDULING ORDER as to Rashid Francois Status Conference set for 12/12/2011 at 01:30 PM in Ft. Myers Courtroom 6 B before Judge Charlene E. Honeywell, Jury Trial set for trial term 1/3/2012 in Ft. Myers Courtroom 6 A before Judge John E. Steele. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas N. Frazier on 11/23/2011. (BJH) (Entered: 11/23/2011)
PACER 87 Filed: 11/23/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Douglas N. Frazier: ARRAIGNMENT as to Rashid Francois (5) Count 1 held on 11/23/2011. Defendant(s) pled not guilty.. Court Reporter: R. Joy Stancel (BJH) (Entered: 11/23/2011)
PACER 86 Filed: 11/23/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Douglas N. Frazier: INITIAL appearance as to Rashid Francois held on 11/23/2011. Court will appoint Jose Calvo as CJA counsel for the defendant. Counsel must have the defendant fill out a financial affidavit. Government summarized charges and penalties. Government requests detention. Court will give Mr. Calvo the 5 days detention time to resolve the issues of bond in State Court. Detention hearing will be set for November 30, 2011 before Judge Chappell, at a time to be determined by that office. A separate notice will be issued by Judge Chappells office for the detention hearing. Court Reporter: R. Joy Stancel (BJH) (Entered: 11/23/2011)
PACER 85 Filed: 11/22/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE of Discovery by USA as to Neheme Ductant (Attachments: # 1 Letter of Discovery)(Casas, Jesus) (Entered: 11/22/2011)
PACER 84 Filed: 11/22/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE of Discovery by USA as to Wilmane Jean (Attachments: # 1 Discovery Letter)(Casas, Jesus) (Entered: 11/22/2011)
PACER 83 Filed: 11/21/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE OF HEARING as to Rashid Francois. Initial Appearance set for 11/23/2011 at 10:00 AM in Ft. Myers Courtroom 5 C before Magistrate Judge Douglas N. Frazier. (BJH) (Entered: 11/21/2011)
PACER 82 Filed: 11/17/2011, Entered: None
ARREST WARRANT returned executed on 11/16/11 as to Michael Dupin. (SPB) (Entered: 11/20/2011)
PACER 81 Filed: 11/18/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER OF DETENTION as to Wilmane Jean. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 11/18/2011. (LMH) (Entered: 11/18/2011)
PACER 80 Filed: 11/18/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER OF DETENTION as to Neheme Ductant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 11/18/2011. (LMH) (Entered: 11/18/2011)
PACER 79 Filed: 11/18/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell: Detention Hearing as to Wilmane Jean held on 11/18/2011. Jesus Casas, Assistant United States Attorney, appeared on behalf of the Government. Anthony Borras, CJA Counsel, appeared on behalf of the Defendant. Government seeks detention. Defense argues for conditions of release. Court denied bond. Defendant remanded to custody of US Marshals. Written Order to follow. Court Reporter: R. Joy Stancel (LMH) (Entered: 11/18/2011)
PACER 78 Filed: 11/18/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell: Detention Hearing as to Neheme Ductant held on 11/18/2011. Jesus Casas, Assistant United States Attorney, appeared on behalf of the Government. Allen Kaufman, CJA Counsel, appeared on behalf of the Defendant. Government seeks detention. Defense argues for conditions of release. Court denied bond. Defendant remanded to custody of US Marshals. Written Order to follow. Court Reporter: R. Joy Stancel (LMH) (Entered: 11/18/2011)
PACER 77 Filed: 11/18/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
WRIT of habeas corpus ad prosequendum issued as to Rashid Francois Signed by Judge Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell. (SPB) (Entered: 11/18/2011)
PACER 76 Filed: 11/16/2011, Entered: None
MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically payment of investigative costs by Eric Bonita. (Lakeman, Richard) (Entered: 11/16/2011)
PACER 75 Filed: 11/15/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
SCHEDULING ORDER as to Wilmane Jean Status Conference set for 12/12/2011 at 01:30 PM in Ft. Myers Courtroom 6 B before Judge Charlene E. Honeywell, Jury Trial set for trial term commencing 1/3/2012 in Ft. Myers Courtroom 6 A before Judge John E. Steele. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 11/15/2011. (LMH) (Entered: 11/15/2011)
PACER 74 Filed: 11/15/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
SCHEDULING ORDER as to Neheme Ductant Status Conference set for 12/12/2011 at 01:30 PM in Ft. Myers Courtroom 6 B before Judge Charlene E. Honeywell, Jury Trial set for trial term commencing 1/3/2012 in Ft. Myers Courtroom 6 A before Judge John E. Steele. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 11/15/2011. (LMH) (Entered: 11/15/2011)
PACER 73 Filed: 11/15/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE OF HEARING as to Neheme Ductant, Wilmane Jean. Detention Hearing set for 11/18/2011 at 01:30 PM in Ft. Myers Courtroom 5 D before Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell. (LMH) (Entered: 11/15/2011)
PACER 72 Filed: 11/15/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell: INITIAL appearance as to Wilmane Jean held on 11/15/2011. Court inquires as to financial status. Court appoints CJA Counsel, Anthony Borras, to represent Defendant. Government summarized charges and potential penalties. Government seeks detention. Detention hearing set for November 18, 2011, at 1:30 PM before the Hon. Sheri Polster Chappell. ARRAIGNMENT as to Wilmane Jean (4) Count 1, 4-5 held on 11/15/2011. Defendant pled not guilty. Defendant set for status conference December 12, 2011, at 1:30 P.M. before the Hon. Charlene Edwards Honeywell, and set for trial term commencing January 3, 2012 before the Hon. John E. Steele. Court Reporter: Martina Reporting Services/Patsy Coleman. (LMH) (Entered: 11/15/2011)
PACER 71 Filed: 11/15/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell: INITIAL appearance as to Neheme Ductant held on 11/15/2011. Court inquires as to financial status. Court appoints CJA Counsel, Alan Kaufmann, to represent Defendant. Government summarized charges and potential penalties. Government seeks detention. Detention hearing set for November 18, 2011, at 1:30 PM before the Hon. Sheri Polster Chappell. ARRAIGNMENT as to Neheme Ductant (2) Count 1, 2 held on 11/15/2011. Defendant pled not guilty. Defendant set for status conference December 12, 2011, at 1:30 P.M. before the Hon. Charlene Edwards Honeywell, and set for trial term commencing January 3, 2012 before the Hon. John E. Steele. Court Reporter: Martina Reporting Services/Patsy Coleman. (LMH) (Entered: 11/15/2011)
PACER 70 Filed: 11/10/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE OF HEARING as to Neheme Ductant, Wilmane Jean. Initial Appearance set for 11/15/2011 at 02:30 PM in Ft. Myers Courtroom 5 D before Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell. (LMH) (Entered: 11/10/2011)
PACER 69 Filed: 11/10/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
MOTION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum by USA as to Rashid Francois. (Casas, Jesus) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell. (Entered: 11/10/2011)
PACER 68 Filed: 11/9/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 67 Motion to continue trial as to Jude Sereme (1), Rick Jean (3), Jophaney Hyppolite (8), Jennifer Nicole Sander (9), Eric Bonita (10). Jury Trial set for term commencing 1/3/2012 in Ft. Myers Courtroom 6 A before Judge John E. Steele. Status Conference set for 12/12/2011 at 01:30 PM in Ft. Myers Courtroom 6 B before Judge Charlene E. Honeywell. Signed by Judge Charlene E. Honeywell on 11/9/2011. (LAF) (Entered: 11/09/2011)
PACER 67 Filed: 11/8/2011, Entered: None
ORAL MOTION to continue trial by Jude Sereme, Rick Jean, Jophaney Hyppolite, Jennifer Nicole Sander, Eric Bonita. (LAF) (Entered: 11/09/2011)
PACER 66 Filed: 11/8/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Charlene E. Honeywell: STATUS conference as to Jude Sereme, Rick Jean, Jophaney Hyppolite, Jennifer Nicole Sander, Eric Bonita held on 11/8/2011. This case is continued to the January 2012 trial term for the reasons stated on the record. Written order to follow. Court Reporter: R. Joy Stancel (LAF) (Entered: 11/09/2011)
PACER 65 Filed: 11/4/2011, Entered: None
ARREST WARRANT returned executed on 10/20/11 as to Wilmane Jean. (SPB) (Entered: 11/06/2011)
PACER 64 Filed: 11/4/2011, Entered: None
ARREST WARRANT returned executed on 10/20/11 as to Neheme Ductant. (SPB) (Entered: 11/06/2011)
PACER 63 Filed: 11/4/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE of Discovery Response by USA as to Eric Bonita (Attachments: # 1 Letter of Discovery)(Casas, Jesus) (Entered: 11/04/2011)
PACER 62 Filed: 11/4/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE of Discovery Response by USA as to Jennifer Nicole Sander (Attachments: # 1 Letter of Discovery)(Casas, Jesus) (Entered: 11/04/2011)
PACER 61 Filed: 11/4/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE of Discovery Response by USA as to Jophaney Hyppolite (Attachments: # 1 Letter of Discovery)(Casas, Jesus) (Entered: 11/04/2011)
PACER 60 Filed: 11/4/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE of Discovery Response by USA as to Rick Jean (Attachments: # 1 Letter of Discovery)(Casas, Jesus) (Entered: 11/04/2011)
PACER 59 Filed: 11/4/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE of Discovery Response by USA as to Jude Sereme (Attachments: # 1 Letter of Discovery)(Casas, Jesus) (Entered: 11/04/2011)
PACER 58 Filed: 11/2/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
CJA 20 as to Rick Jean: Appointment of Attorney Landon Miller Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas N. Frazier on 10/26/11. (BJH) (Entered: 11/02/2011)
PACER 57 Filed: 10/28/2011, Entered: None
ARREST WARRANT returned executed on 9/29/11 as to Rick Jean. (SPB) (Entered: 10/28/2011)
PACER 56 Filed: 10/28/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER OF DETENTION as to Rick Jean. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas N. Frazier on 10/28/2011. (BJH) (Entered: 10/28/2011)
PACER 55 Filed: 10/27/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
SCHEDULING ORDER as to Rick Jean Status Conference set for 11/8/2011 at 01:30 PM in Ft. Myers Courtroom 6 B before Judge Charlene E. Honeywell, Jury Trial set for trial term 12/5/2011 at 09:00 AM in Ft. Myers Courtroom 6 B before Judge Charlene E. Honeywell. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas N. Frazier on 10/27/2011. (BJH) (Entered: 10/27/2011)
PACER 54 Filed: 10/27/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Douglas N. Frazier: Court has appointed Landon Miller to represent the defendant.INITIAL appearance as to Rick Jean held on 10/27/2011, Detention Hearing as to Rick Jean held on 10/27/2011. Defendant waives issue of detention. ARRAIGNMENT as to Rick Jean (3) Count 1, 4-8 held on 10/27/2011. Defendant(s) pled not guilty. (DIGITAL) (BJH) (Entered: 10/27/2011)
PACER 53 Filed: 10/27/2011, Entered: None
***CJA 23 financial affidavit by Rick Jean (BJH) (Entered: 10/27/2011)
PACER 52 Filed: 10/26/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE OF HEARING as to Rick Jean. Initial Appearance set for 10/27/2011 at 01:30 PM in Ft. Myers Courtroom 5 C before Magistrate Judge Douglas N. Frazier. (BJH) (Entered: 10/26/2011)
PACER 51 Filed: 10/24/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER OF DETENTION as to Wilmane Jean. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Jones on 10/20/2011. (Rule 5(c)(2))(SPB) (Entered: 10/26/2011)
PACER 50 Filed: 10/24/2011, Entered: None
Rule 5(c)(3) documents received from District of Northern District of Florida (Gainesville) as to Wilmane Jean, documents include Criminal Minutes First Appearance, Indictment, Order appointing CJA Panel Attorney, Waiver of Rule 5 & 5.1 Hearings, Order of Detention, Commitment to Another District and Financial Affidavit. (SPB) (Entered: 10/26/2011)
PACER 49 Filed: 10/24/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER OF DETENTION as to Neheme Ductant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Jones on 10/20/2011. (Rule 5(c)(2))(SPB) (Entered: 10/26/2011)
PACER 48 Filed: 10/24/2011, Entered: None
Rule 5(c)(3) documents received from District of Northern District of Florida (Gainesville) as to Neheme Ductant, documents include Criminal Minutes First Appearance, Indictment, Order appointing Federal Public Defender, Waiver of Rule 5 & 5.1 Hearings, Order of Detention, Commitment to Another District and Financial Affidavit. (SPB) (Entered: 10/26/2011)
PACER 47 Filed: 10/25/2011, Entered: None
ARREST WARRANT returned executed on 9/29/11 as to Jennifer Nicole Sander. (SPB) (Entered: 10/25/2011)
PACER 46 Filed: 10/21/2011, Entered: None
ARREST WARRANT returned executed on 10/18/11 as to Jude Sereme. (SPB) (Entered: 10/25/2011)
PACER 45 Filed: 10/21/2011, Entered: None
ARREST WARRANT returned executed on 9/29/11 as to Jophaney Hyppolite. (SPB) (Entered: 10/25/2011)
PACER 44 Filed: 10/25/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER OF DETENTION as to Eric Bonita. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 10/24/2011. (LMH) (Entered: 10/25/2011)
PACER 43 Filed: 10/21/2011, Entered: None
ARREST WARRANT returned executed on 9/29/11 as to Eric Bonita. (SPB) (Entered: 10/25/2011)
PACER 42 Filed: 10/24/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE canceling Detention hearing hearing scheduled for 10/25/2011 as to Eric Bonita (LMH) (Entered: 10/24/2011)
PACER 41 Filed: 10/24/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE of waiver of scheduled bond hearing and request to cancel hearing by Eric Bonita (Lakeman, Richard) (Entered: 10/24/2011)
PACER 40 Filed: 10/21/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
SCHEDULING ORDER as to Jude Sereme Status Conference set for 11/8/2011 at 01:30 PM in Ft. Myers Courtroom 6 B before Judge Charlene E. Honeywell, Jury Trial set for trial term beginning 12/5/2011 in Ft. Myers Courtroom 6 B before Judge Charlene E. Honeywell. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 10/21/2011. (LMH) (Entered: 10/21/2011)
PACER 39 Filed: 10/21/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER OF DETENTION as to Jude Sereme. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 10/21/2011. (LMH) (Entered: 10/21/2011)
PACER 38 Filed: 10/21/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
SCHEDULING ORDER as to Jennifer Nicole Sander Status Conference set for 11/8/2011 at 01:30 PM in Ft. Myers Courtroom 6 B before Judge Charlene E. Honeywell, Jury Trial set for trial term beginning 12/5/2011 in Ft. Myers Courtroom 6 B before Judge Charlene E. Honeywell. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 10/21/2011. (LMH) (Entered: 10/21/2011)
PACER 37 Filed: 10/21/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER OF DETENTION as to Jennifer Nicole Sander. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 10/21/2011. (LMH) (Entered: 10/21/2011)
PACER 36 Filed: 10/21/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
SCHEDULING ORDER as to Jophaney Hyppolite Status Conference set for 11/8/2011 at 01:30 PM in Ft. Myers Courtroom 6 B before Judge Charlene E. Honeywell, Jury Trial set for trial term commencing 12/5/2011 in Ft. Myers Courtroom 6 B before Judge Charlene E. Honeywell. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 10/21/2011. (LMH) (Entered: 10/21/2011)
PACER 35 Filed: 10/21/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER OF DETENTION as to Jophaney Hyppolite. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 10/21/2011. (LMH) (Entered: 10/21/2011)
PACER 34 Filed: 10/21/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
SCHEDULING ORDER as to Eric Bonita Status Conference set for 11/8/2011 at 01:30 PM in Ft. Myers Courtroom 6 B before Judge Charlene E. Honeywell, Jury Trial set for trial term commencing 12/5/2011 in Ft. Myers Courtroom 6 B before Judge Charlene E. Honeywell. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 10/21/2011. (LMH) (Entered: 10/21/2011)
PACER 33 Filed: 10/21/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE of attorney appearance: Russell K. Rosenthal appearing for Jude Sereme (Rosenthal, Russell) (Entered: 10/21/2011)
PACER 32 Filed: 10/21/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE OF HEARING as to Eric Bonita. Detention Hearing set for 10/25/2011 at 09:30 AM in Ft. Myers Courtroom 5 D before Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell. (LMH) (Entered: 10/21/2011)
PACER 31 Filed: 10/21/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell: ARRAIGNMENT as to Eric Bonita (10) Count 1, 11 held on 10/21/2011. Jesus Casas, Assistant United States Attorney, appeared for the Government. Richard Lakeman, Esq., appeared for the Defendant. Government summarized charges and potential penalties. Defendant pled not guilty. DETENTION Hearing as to Eric Bonita held on 10/21/2011. Government seeks detention of the Defendant. Defense Counsel requests continance. Detention hearing continued to OCTOBER 25, 2011 at 9:30 AM before the Hon. Sheri Polster Chappell. Defendant remanded to custody of the U.S. Marshals. Court Reporter: R. Joy Stancel (LMH) (Entered: 10/21/2011)
PACER 30 Filed: 10/21/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell: ARRAIGNMENT as to Jude Sereme (1) Count 1, 3 and Jophaney Hyppolite (8) Count 1, 6, 12 and Jennifer Nicole Sander (9) Count 1, 12 held on 10/21/2011. Jesus Casas, Assistant United States Attorney, appeared on behalf of the Government. Federal public defender appeared for Jude Sereme, John Mills, Esq., CJA Counsel appeared for Jophaney Hyppolite, and Neil Potter, Esq., CJA Counsel appeared for Jennifer Nicole Sander. Government summarized charges and potential penalties. Defendant(s) pled not guilty., DETENTION Hearing as to Jude Sereme, Jophaney Hyppolite, Jennifer Nicole Sander held on 10/21/2011. Government seeks detention of Defendants. The Defendants, through Counsel, did not move for release at this time. Defendants remanded to custody of U.S. Marshal. Court Reporter: R. Joy Stancel (LMH) (Entered: 10/21/2011)
PACER 29 Filed: 10/21/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
MOTION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum by USA as to Rick Jean. (Casas, Jesus) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell. (Entered: 10/21/2011)
PACER 28 Filed: 10/21/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
CJA 20 as to Eric Bonita: Appointment of Attorney Richard D. Lakeman for Eric Bonita. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 10/21/2011. (LMH) (Entered: 10/21/2011)
PACER 27 Filed: 10/21/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
CJA 20 as to Jennifer Nicole Sander: Appointment of Attorney Neil Barry Potter for Jennifer Nicole Sander. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 10/21/2011. (LMH) (Entered: 10/21/2011)
PACER 26 Filed: 10/21/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
CJA 20 as to Jophaney Hyppolite: Appointment of Attorney John Dawson Mills for Jophaney Hyppolite. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 10/21/2011. (LMH) (Entered: 10/21/2011)
PACER 25 Filed: 10/20/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING HEARING: The detention and arraignment hearing previously scheduled for 10/21/2011 is rescheduled as to Eric Bonita. New hearing TIME ONLY: Arraignment set for 10/21/2011 at 01:30 PM in Ft. Myers Courtroom 6 A before Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell., Detention Hearing set for 10/21/2011 at 01:30 PM in Ft. Myers Courtroom 6 A before Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell. (LMH) (Entered: 10/20/2011)
PACER 24 Filed: 10/19/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER for IA ONLY as to Eric Bonita. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 10/19/2011. (LMH) (Entered: 10/19/2011)
PACER 23 Filed: 10/18/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER as to Jude Sereme. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 10/18/2011. (LMH) (Entered: 10/18/2011)
PACER 22 Filed: 10/18/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER for IA ONLY as to Jennifer Nicole Sander. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 10/18/2011. (LMH) (Entered: 10/18/2011)
PACER 21 Filed: 10/18/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER for IA ONLY as to Jophaney Hyppolite. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 10/18/2011. (LMH) (Entered: 10/18/2011)
PACER 20 Filed: 10/18/2011, Entered: None
***CJA 23 financial affidavit by Eric Bonita (LMH) (Entered: 10/18/2011)
PACER 19 Filed: 10/18/2011, Entered: None
***CJA 23 financial affidavit by Jennifer Nicole Sander (LMH) (Entered: 10/18/2011)
PACER 18 Filed: 10/18/2011, Entered: None
***CJA 23 financial affidavit by Jophaney Hyppolite (LMH) (Entered: 10/18/2011)
PACER 17 Filed: 10/18/2011, Entered: None
***CJA 23 financial affidavit by Jude Sereme (LMH) (Entered: 10/18/2011)
PACER 16 Filed: 10/18/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE OF HEARING as to Jude Sereme, Jophaney Hyppolite, Jennifer Nicole Sander, Eric Bonita. Arraignment set for 10/21/2011 at 10:00 AM in Ft. Myers Courtroom 6 A before Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell., Detention Hearing set for 10/21/2011 at 10:00 AM in Ft. Myers Courtroom 6 A before Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell. (LMH) (Entered: 10/18/2011)
PACER 15 Filed: 10/18/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell: INITIAL appearance as to Jude Sereme, Jophaney Hyppolite, Jennifer Nicole Sander, Eric Bonita held on 10/18/2011. Federal Public Defender appeared for the Defedants. Financial Affidavits submitted on behalf of Jude Sereme, Jophaney Hyppolite, Jennifer Nicole Sander, Eric Bonita. Federal Public Defender appointed for Jude Sereme. CJA Counsel appointed for Jophaney Hyppolite, Jennifer Nicole Sander, Eric Bonita. Government summarized charges and potential penalties. Government seeks detention and requests 3 days. Detention hearing set for October 21, 2011 at 10:00 AM, before the Hon. Sheri Polster Chappell. Defendants remanded to the custody of the U.S. Marshal. Court Reporter: Jeffrey G. Thomas (LMH) (Entered: 10/18/2011)
PACER 13 Filed: 10/18/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE OF HEARING as to Jude Sereme, Jophaney Hyppolite, Jennifer Nicole Sander, Eric Bonita. Initial Appearance set for 10/18/2011 at 03:00 PM in Ft. Myers Courtroom 6 A before Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell. (LMH) (Entered: 10/18/2011)
PACER 3 Filed: 9/28/2011, Entered: None
INDICTMENT returned in open Court as to Jude Sereme (1) count(s) 1 and 3; Neheme Ductant (2) count(s) 1 and 2; Rick Jean (3) count(s) 1 and 4-8; Wilmane Jean (4) count(s) 1 and 4-5; Rashid Francois (5) count 1; Fritzco Desir (6) count(s) 1 and 10; Michael Dupin (7) count(s) 1 and 9; Jophaney Hyppolite (8) count(s) 1, 6 and 12; Jennifer Nicole Sander (9) count(s) 1 and 12; Eric Bonita (10) count(s) 1 and 11. (kma) (Entered: 10/18/2011)
PACER 2 Filed: 9/28/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 1 Motion to Seal until any named defendant is taken into custody. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas N. Frazier on 09/28/2011. (kma) (Entered: 10/18/2011)
PACER 1 Filed: 9/28/2011, Entered: None
MOTION to seal by USA as to Jude Sereme, Neheme Ductant, Rick Jean, Wilmane Jean, Rashid Francois, Fritzco Desir, Michael Dupin, Jophaney Hyppolite, Jennifer Nicole Sander, Eric Bonita. (kma) (Entered: 10/18/2011)

Statistics

This case has been viewed 321 times.

No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Need Password Help?