Langone v. Kaiser
Illinois Northern District Court, Case No. 1:12-cv-02073
District Judge John A. Nordberg, presiding
docket://gov.uscourts.ilnd.1-12-cv-02073 (What is this?)

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
The right information can save you thousands of dollars.
Access comprehensive profiles on judges, firms, lawyers, and more with PlainSite Pro and Pro Se.
No Logo Christopher V Langone, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Lavery Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Mark T. Lavery +1 847 813 7771 mark@laverylawfirm.com
v.
No Logo Fanduel Inc., Defendant
No Logo Patrick Kaiser, Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 360 P.I.: Other
  Entries (29) Calendar Events Related (0) Tools Right End
PDF 59 Filed: 10/10/2013, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: Plaintiff's motion to amend/correct 36 is denied as moot. Defendants' motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim 12 is granted. This action is hereby dismissed with prejudice. Civil case terminated. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 10/9/2013:Mailed notice(srn, )
PACER 28 Filed: 5/13/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE by Mark T. Lavery of Change of Address (Lavery, Mark) (Entered: 05/13/2013)
PACER 27 Filed: 3/22/2013, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by Christopher V Langone (Lavery, Mark) (Entered: 03/22/2013)
PACER 26 Filed: 3/22/2013, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by Fan Duel Inc., Patrick Kaiser in Support of Jurisdiction (Huff, Robert) (Entered: 03/22/2013)
PACER 25 Filed: 3/11/2013, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:Hearing held on defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim 12 on 3/11/2013. Simultaneous briefs, limited to 5 pages in length, addressing the issue of jurisdictional question are to be filed on or before 3/22/13. Court will rule by mail. Mailed notice (srn, ) (Entered: 03/11/2013)
PACER 24 Filed: 2/15/2013, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:Status hearing held on 2/15/2013. Oral argument on the motion to dismiss is set for 3/11/2013 at 10:00 AM.Mailed notice (srn, ) (Entered: 02/15/2013)
PACER 23 Filed: 2/13/2013, Entered: None
STATUS Report by Fan Duel Inc., Patrick Kaiser, Christopher V Langone (Huff, Robert) (Entered: 02/13/2013)
PACER 22 Filed: 2/8/2013, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Status Report due by 2/13/2013. Status hearing set for 2/15/2013 at 10:30 AM.Mailed notice (srn, ) (Entered: 02/08/2013)
PACER 21 Filed: 1/14/2013, Entered: None
EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: It appearing that, pursuant to the Executive Committee Order entered on January 3, 2013, the civil cases on the attached list have been selected for reassignment to form the initial calendar of the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin, therefore IT IS HEREBY ORDERED That the attached list of 330 cases be reassigned to the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this order shall become effective on Tuesday, January 15, 2013. Case reassigned to the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin for all further proceedings. Signed by Executive Committee on 1/14/2013.(td, ) (Entered: 01/16/2013)
PACER 20 Filed: 9/14/2012, Entered: None
RESPONSE by Fan Duel Inc., Patrick Kaiserin Support of MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM 12 (Huff, Robert) (Entered: 09/14/2012)
PACER 19 Filed: 9/6/2012, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr:Motion for extension of time 15 is granted. Plaintiff is given until September 4, 2012 to file his response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Defendants' reply is due on or before September 14, 2012. The parties need not appear on Friday, September 7, 2012. Mailed notice (ewf, ) (Entered: 09/06/2012)
PACER 18 Filed: 9/4/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Mark T. Lavery for presentment of extension of time 15 , Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim 12 before Honorable Charles R. Norgle Sr. on 9/7/2012 at 09:30 AM. (Lavery, Mark) (Entered: 09/04/2012)
PACER 17 Filed: 9/4/2012, Entered: None
RESPONSE by Christopher V Langonein Opposition to MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM 12 , MOTION by Plaintiff Christopher V Langone for extension of time 15 (Lavery, Mark) (Entered: 09/04/2012)
PACER 16 Filed: 8/31/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Mark T. Lavery for presentment of extension of time 15 , Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim 12 before Honorable Charles R. Norgle Sr. on 8/10/2012 at 09:30 AM. (Lavery, Mark) (Entered: 08/31/2012)
PACER 15 Filed: 8/31/2012, Entered: None
MOTION by Plaintiff Christopher V Langone for extension of time (Lavery, Mark) (Entered: 08/31/2012)
PACER 14 Filed: 8/17/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Robert F. Huff, Jr for presentment of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim 12 before Honorable Charles R. Norgle Sr. on 9/14/2012 at 09:30 AM. (Huff, Robert) (Entered: 08/17/2012)
PACER 13 Filed: 8/17/2012, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by Fan Duel Inc., Patrick Kaiser in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim 12 (Huff, Robert) (Entered: 08/17/2012)
PACER 12 Filed: 8/17/2012, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Huff, Robert) (Entered: 08/17/2012)
PACER 11 Filed: 8/17/2012, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Fan Duel Inc. by Robert F. Huff, Jr (Huff, Robert) (Entered: 08/17/2012)
PDF 10 Filed: 7/24/2012, Entered: None
EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr pursuant to Local Rule 40.4 for all further proceedings. Signed by Executive Committee on 07/24/2012. (et, ) (Entered: 07/27/2012)
PDF 9 Filed: 7/23/2012, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr: Motion to dismiss is due on or before 8/17/2012. Response is due on or before 8/31/2012. Reply is due on or before 9/10/2012. Discovery is stayed pending ruling on motion to dismiss. Status hearing set for October 17, 2012 before the Honorable John A. Nordberg is stricken. Mailed notice (ewf, ) (Entered: 07/23/2012)
PDF 8 Filed: 7/17/2012, Entered: None
AMENDED complaint by Christopher V Langone against All Defendants (Lavery, Mark) (Entered: 07/17/2012)
PDF 7 Filed: 7/9/2012, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Patrick Kaiser by Robert F. Huff, Jr (Huff, Robert) (Entered: 07/09/2012)
PDF 6 Filed: 6/12/2012, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable John A. Nordberg: Status hearing set for 6/12/2012 is stricken and reset to 10/17/2012 at 2:30 PM.Mailed notice (tlp, ) (Entered: 06/12/2012)
PDF 5 Filed: 5/30/2012, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable John A. Nordberg: Status hearing held on 5/30/2012. Status hearing set for 6/13/2012 at 2:30 PM. Mailed notice (tlp, ) (Entered: 05/30/2012)
PDF 4 Filed: 4/23/2012, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable John A. Nordberg: Status hearing set for 5/30/2012 at 2:30 PM.Mailed notice (tlp, ) (Entered: 04/23/2012)
PDF 3 Filed: 3/21/2012, Entered: None
CIVIL Cover Sheet (Lavery, Mark) (Entered: 03/21/2012)
PDF 2 Filed: 3/21/2012, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Christopher V Langone by Mark T. Lavery (Lavery, Mark) (Entered: 03/21/2012)
PACER 1 Filed: 3/21/2012, Entered: None
COMPLAINT filed by Christopher V Langone; Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 0752-6968793. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Lavery, Mark) (Entered: 03/21/2012)

Statistics

This case has been viewed 856 times.

No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Need Password Help?