USA v. Kaley et al
Florida Southern District Court, Case No. 9:07-cr-80021
District Judge Kenneth A. Marra, presiding
docket://gov.uscourts.flsd.9-07-cr-80021 (What is this?)

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
The right information can save you thousands of dollars.
Access comprehensive profiles on judges, firms, lawyers, and more with PlainSite Pro and Pro Se.
No Logo Kerri L. Kaley, Defendant (1)

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Susan Wright Van Dusen +1 305 854 6449 +2855 285 285 5124 svandusenlaw@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Black Srebnick Kornspan & Stumpf

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Howard Milton Srebnick +1 305 371 6421 +3582 358 358 2006 HSrebnick@RoyBlack.com
  Entries (179) Calendar Events Related (0) Tools Right End
PACER 248 Filed: 1/18/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
Endorsed ORDER denying as moot 243 Motion to Modify Conditions of Release as to Kerri L. Kaley (1), Brian P. Kaley (2). Signed by Magistrate Judge James M. Hopkins on 1/18/2012. (JMH) (Entered: 01/18/2012)
PACER 247 Filed: 1/18/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
Endorsed ORDER granting 244 Motion to Modify Conditions of Release as to Kerri L. Kaley (1), Brian P. Kaley (2). The Defendants Kerri L. Kaley and Brian P. Kaley need not report in person and need report once a month by phone unless Pretrial Services deems other reporting necessary. Signed by Magistrate Judge James M. Hopkins on 1/18/2012. (JMH) (Entered: 01/18/2012)
PACER 246 Filed: 1/13/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James M. Hopkins: Motion Hearing as to Kerri L. Kaley, Brian P. Kaley held on 1/13/2012 re 244 Corrected MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release filed by Brian P. Kaley, Kerri L. Kaley. The Court will Grant the motion. (Digital 10:02:02) (tmn) (Entered: 01/13/2012)
PACER 245 Filed: 1/9/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION in case as to Kerri L. Kaley, Brian P. Kaley 244 Corrected MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release : Telephonic Hearing set for 1/13/2012 10:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Magistrate Judge James M. Hopkins. (tmn) (Entered: 01/09/2012)
PACER 244 Filed: 12/12/2011, Entered: None
Corrected MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release by Kerri L. Kaley, Brian P. Kaley. Responses due by 12/30/2011 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Van Dusen, Susan) (Entered: 12/12/2011)
PACER 243 Filed: 12/12/2011, Entered: None
MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release by Kerri L. Kaley, Brian P. Kaley as to Kerri L. Kaley, Brian P. Kaley, Jennifer L. Gruenstrass. Responses due by 12/30/2011 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Van Dusen, Susan) (Entered: 12/12/2011)
PACER 242 Filed: 3/14/2011, Entered: None
Acknowledgment of Receipt of COR/ROA from USCA as to Kerri L. Kaley, Brian P. Kaley re 225 Notice of Appeal - Other Order, date received by USCA: 2/17/2011. USCA Case Number: 10-15048-II. (mc) (Entered: 03/14/2011)
PACER 241 Filed: 3/3/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE of Inability to Produce Transcript as to Kerri L. Kaley, Brian P. Kaley, Jennifer L. Gruenstrass (asl) (Entered: 03/03/2011)
PACER 240 Filed: 2/11/2011, Entered: None
Certified and Transmitted Record on Appeal as to Kerri L. Kaley, Brian P. Kaley to US Court of Appeals (Atlanta Office) consisting of (3)Volumes of Pleadings, (6)Volumes of Transcripts, (1)Accordion folder containing DE# 196, 218, 220 and (1)Sealed envelope containing DE# 20, 75-77, 101-103, 119, 120 re 225 Notice of Appeal - Other Order. USCA# 10-15048-II (mc) (Entered: 02/11/2011)
PACER 239 Filed: 2/11/2011, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE of Readiness transmitted to USCA as to Kerri L. Kaley, Brian P. Kaley re 225 Notice of Appeal - Other Order. USCA# 10-15048-II (mc) (Entered: 02/11/2011)
PACER 238 Filed: 1/24/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE of Filing Appellee's Response Brief by USA as to Kerri L. Kaley, Brian P. Kaley, Jennifer L. Gruenstrass re 224 Notice (Other) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Copy Dec 15, 2010 Eleventh Circuit Order, # 2 Exhibit Brief Upload Result Page)(Lehr, Alison) (Entered: 01/24/2011)
PACER 237 Filed: 12/2/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 236 Motion to Travel as to Kerri L. Kaley (1). Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 12/2/2010. (ir) (Entered: 12/02/2010)
PACER 236 Filed: 11/29/2010, Entered: None
Defendant's MOTION to Travel to Puerto Rico by Kerri L. Kaley. (Srebnick, Howard) (Entered: 11/29/2010)
PACER 235 Filed: 11/19/2010, Entered: None
TRANSCRIPT NOTIFICATION as to Kerri L. Kaley, Brian P. Kaley - Transcript(s) ordered on: Status Conference 11/24/2009, 5/12/2010 and Evidentiary Hearing 7/29/2010 has/have been filed by Court Reporter: Stephen Franklin, 561-514-3768 / Stephen_Franklin@flsd.uscourts.gov re 229 Transcript Information Form, 124 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal. (mc) (Entered: 11/19/2010)
PACER 234 Filed: 11/16/2010, Entered: None
Acknowledgment of Receipt of NOA from USCA as to Kerri L. Kaley, Brian P. Kaley re 225 Notice of Appeal - Other Order, date received by USCA: 11/1/2010. USCA Case Number: 10-15048-I. (mc) (Entered: 11/16/2010)
PACER 233 Filed: 11/15/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Evidentiary Hearing as to Kerri L. Kaley, Brian P. Kaley held on 07/29/2010 before Judge Kenneth A. Marra, 1-56 pages, re: 225 Notice of Appeal - Other Order, Court Reporter: Stephen Franklin, 561-514-3768 / Stephen_Franklin@flsd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/9/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/20/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/16/2011. (sf) (Entered: 11/15/2010)
PACER 232 Filed: 11/15/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Status Conference as to Kerri L. Kaley, Brian P. Kaley held on 05/12/2010 before Judge Kenneth A. Marra, 1-19 pages, re: 225 Notice of Appeal - Other Order, Court Reporter: Stephen Franklin, 561-514-3768 / Stephen_Franklin@flsd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/9/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/20/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/16/2011. (sf) (Entered: 11/15/2010)
PACER 231 Filed: 11/15/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Status Conference as to Kerri L. Kaley, Brian P. Kaley held on 11/24/2009 before Judge Kenneth A. Marra, 1-11 pages, re: 225 Notice of Appeal - Other Order, Court Reporter: Stephen Franklin, 561-514-3768 / Stephen_Franklin@flsd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/9/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/20/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/16/2011. (sf) (Entered: 11/15/2010)
PACER 230 Filed: 11/5/2010, Entered: None
COURT REPORTER ACKNOWLEDGMENT as to Kerri L. Kaley, Brian P. Kaley re 229 Transcript Information Form, 124 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal. Court Reporter: Stephen Franklin, 561-514-3768 / Stephen_Franklin@flsd.uscourts.gov. Estimated filing date of transcript 12/1/2010. (mc) (Entered: 11/05/2010)
PACER 229 Filed: 10/28/2010, Entered: None
TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM as to Kerri L. Kaley, Brian P. Kaley re 225 Notice of Appeal - Other Order, filed by Brian P. Kaley, Kerri L. Kaley. Hearings transcript(s) ordered. Order placed by G. Richard Strafer. Email sent to Court Reporter Coordinator. (Strafer, Guy) (Entered: 10/28/2010)
PACER 227 Filed: 10/27/2010, Entered: None
USCA Appeal Fees received $ 455.00, receipt number FLS100008821 as to Kerri L. Kaley re 225 Notice of Appeal - Other Order, : (cqs) (Entered: 10/27/2010)
PACER 226 Filed: 10/27/2010, Entered: None
Clerks Notice to Filer re 224 Notice (Other). Wrong Event Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong event. The document was re-docketed by the Clerk, see [de#225]. It is not necessary to refile this document. (cqs) (Entered: 10/27/2010)
PACER 225 Filed: 10/27/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE OF APPEAL(interlocutory) (for image see DE#224) re 223 Order, Filing fee $ 455.00..filed by Kerri Kaley and Brian Kaley. Within fourteen days of the filing date of a Notice of Appeal, the appellant must complete the Eleventh Circuit Transcript Order Form regardless of whether transcripts are being ordered [Pursuant to FRAP 10(b)]. For information go to our FLSD website under Transcript Information. (Fee- Not Paid) (cqs)Text Modified on 10/27/2010 (cqs). (Entered: 10/27/2010)
PACER 224 Filed: 10/27/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE Of Appeal by Kerri L. Kaley, Brian P. Kaley re 223 Order, (Strafer, Guy) Text Modified on 10/27/2010 (cqs). (Entered: 10/27/2010)
PACER 223 Filed: 10/25/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER DENYING as to Kerri L. Kaley, Brian P. Kaley re 17 Defendant's MOTION to Vacate , In Whole or In Part, the Protective Order And For a Hearing Concerning the Scope and Legality of the Protective Order Under the Fifth and Sixth Amendments filed by Brian P. Kaley, Kerri L. Kaley. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 10/24/2010. (ir) (Entered: 10/25/2010)
PACER 222 Filed: 7/29/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Kenneth A. Marra: Evidentiary Hearing as to Kerri L. Kaley, Brian P. Kaley held on 7/29/2010. Court Reporter: Stephen Franklin, 561-514-3768 / Stephen_Franklin@flsd.uscourts.gov (ir) (Entered: 07/29/2010)
PACER 221 Filed: 7/29/2010, Entered: None
SUPPLEMENT to 196 Memorandum in Support, filed by Brian P. Kaley, Kerri L. Kaley by Kerri L. Kaley, Brian P. Kaley And Summary Of Issues and Evidence for July 29, 2010 Hearing (Srebnick, Howard) (Entered: 07/29/2010)
PACER 220 Filed: 7/28/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE (Corrected) of Filing Hearing Exhibits by Kerri L. Kaley, Brian P. Kaley re 196 Memorandum in Support, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Part 1), # 2 Exhibit A (Part 2), # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D)(Srebnick, Howard) (Entered: 07/28/2010)
PACER 219 Filed: 7/27/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER denying 197 Motion for Disclosure as to Kerri L. Kaley (1), Brian P. Kaley (2); denying 198 Motion for Disclosure as to Kerri L. Kaley (1), Brian P. Kaley (2). Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 7/27/2010. (ir) (Entered: 07/27/2010)
PACER 218 Filed: 7/21/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE of Filing: Hearing Exhibits by Kerri L. Kaley, Brian P. Kaley re 196 Memorandum in Support, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(Srebnick, Howard) (Entered: 07/21/2010)
PACER 217 Filed: 7/2/2010, Entered: None
REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by Kerri L. Kaley, Brian P. Kaley re 197 MOTION for Disclosure of Grand Jury Transcripts (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Srebnick, Howard) (Entered: 07/02/2010)
PACER 216 Filed: 6/22/2010, Entered: None
RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to Kerri L. Kaley, Brian P. Kaley re 197 MOTION for Disclosure of Grand Jury Transcripts (Watts-Fitzgerald, Thomas) (Entered: 06/22/2010)
PACER 215 Filed: 6/21/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE of Default by Kerri L. Kaley, Brian P. Kaley re 197 MOTION for Disclosure of Grand Jury Transcripts (Srebnick, Howard) (Entered: 06/21/2010)
PACER 214 Filed: 6/18/2010, Entered: None
REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by Kerri L. Kaley, Brian P. Kaley re 198 MOTION for Disclosure of Agent's Affidavit (Srebnick, Howard) (Entered: 06/18/2010)
PACER 213 Filed: 6/3/2010, Entered: None
UNSEALED MOTION for an Order Directing Clerk of the Court to Provide Copies of Sealed Documents to the United States Attorney's Office by USA as to Kerri L. Kaley, Brian P. Kaley, Jennifer L. Gruenstrass. Responses due by 6/21/2010 (previously filed as 209 sealed document)(ra) (Entered: 06/08/2010)
PACER 212 Filed: 6/3/2010, Entered: None
UNSEALED MOTION to Seal by USA as to Kerri L. Kaley, Brian P. Kaley, Jennifer L. Gruenstrass. Responses due by 6/21/2010 (previously filed as 208 sealed document)(ra) (Entered: 06/08/2010)
PACER 211 Filed: 6/7/2010, Entered: None
RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to Kerri L. Kaley, Brian P. Kaley re 198 MOTION for Disclosure of Agent's Affidavit (Watts-Fitzgerald, Thomas) (Entered: 06/07/2010)
PACER 210 Filed: 6/4/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER denying motion to seal and granting motion to provide copies to AUSA of sealed docket entries as to Kerri L. Kaley, Brian P. Kaley re 209 Sealed Document, 208 Sealed Document. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 6/4/2010. (ir) Modified on 6/4/2010 (ir). (Entered: 06/04/2010)
PACER 209 Filed: 6/3/2010, Entered: None, Terminated: 6/4/2010
Sealed Document (rb) UNSEALED see DE 213 . Modified Text on 6/8/2010 (ra). (Entered: 06/03/2010)
PACER 208 Filed: 6/3/2010, Entered: None
Sealed Document (rb) UNSEALED see DE 212 . Modified Text on 6/8/2010 (ra). (Entered: 06/03/2010)
PACER 207 Filed: 6/2/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Telephonic Hearing as to Kerri L. Kaley, Brian P. Kaley held on 05/26/2010 before Judge Kenneth A. Marra, 1-28 pages, Court Reporter: Stephen Franklin, 561-514-3768 / Stephen_Franklin@flsd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/28/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/6/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/3/2010. (sf) (Entered: 06/02/2010)
PACER 206 Filed: 5/27/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED ORDER granting 202 Motion for Appearance Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filings as to Kerri L. Kaley (1), Brian P. Kaley (2); granting 203 Motion for Appearance Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filings as to Kerri L. Kaley (1), Brian P. Kaley (2). Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 5/27/2010. (ir) (Entered: 05/27/2010)
PACER 205 Filed: 5/27/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to Kerri L. Kaley, Brian P. Kaley Time excluded from 5/26/10 until 7/29/10. Evidentiary Hearing reset for 7/29/2010 01:30 PM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Kenneth A. Marra. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 5/26/2010. (ir) (Entered: 05/27/2010)
PACER 204 Filed: 5/26/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Kenneth A. Marra: Motion Hearing as to Kerri L. Kaley, Brian P. Kaley held on 5/26/2010 re 200 MOTION to Quash Subpoenas filed by Johnson & Johnson, Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon Endo-Surgery, Inc. Court Reporter: Stephen Franklin, 561-514-3768 / Stephen_Franklin@flsd.uscourts.gov (ir) (Entered: 05/26/2010)
PACER 203 Filed: 5/25/2010, Entered: None
MOTION for Appearance Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filings for Lathrop B. Nelson. Filing Fee $75.00. Receipt # 1-198. Responses due by 6/11/2010 (yc) (Entered: 05/25/2010)
PACER 202 Filed: 5/25/2010, Entered: None
MOTION for Appearance Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filings for Paul H. Zoubek. Filing Fee $75.00. Receipt # 1-196. Responses due by 6/11/2010 (yc) (Entered: 05/25/2010)
PACER 201 Filed: 5/25/2010, Entered: None
MOTION for Hearing re 200 MOTION to Quash Subpoenas by Johnson & Johnson, Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon Endo-Surgery, Inc. as to Kerri L. Kaley, Brian P. Kaley, Jennifer L. Gruenstrass. Responses due by 6/11/2010 (Beguiristain, Maria) (Entered: 05/25/2010)
PACER 200 Filed: 5/25/2010, Entered: None
MOTION to Quash Subpoenas by Johnson & Johnson, Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon Endo-Surgery, Inc. as to Kerri L. Kaley, Brian P. Kaley, Jennifer L. Gruenstrass. Responses due by 6/11/2010 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Subpoenas)(Beguiristain, Maria) (Entered: 05/25/2010)
PACER 199 Filed: 5/25/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Maria Beguiristain on behalf of Ethicon Endo-Surgery, Inc., Ethicon, Inc. and Johnson & Johnson (Beguiristain, Maria) Modified docket text on 5/25/2010 (vjk). (Entered: 05/25/2010)
PACER 198 Filed: 5/24/2010, Entered: None
MOTION for Disclosure of Agent's Affidavit by Kerri L. Kaley, Brian P. Kaley. Responses due by 6/10/2010 (Srebnick, Howard) (Entered: 05/24/2010)
PACER 197 Filed: 5/20/2010, Entered: None
MOTION for Disclosure of Grand Jury Transcripts by Kerri L. Kaley, Brian P. Kaley. Responses due by 6/7/2010 (Srebnick, Howard) (Entered: 05/20/2010)
PACER 196 Filed: 5/20/2010, Entered: None
Memorandum in Support by Kerri L. Kaley, Brian P. Kaley re 52 Defendant's MOTION To Bar Pretrial Restraints Based On A "Facilitation" Theory and Incorporated Memorandul of Law (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(Srebnick, Howard) (Entered: 05/20/2010)
PACER 195 Filed: 5/12/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Kenneth A. Marra: Status Conference as to Kerri L. Kaley, Brian P. Kaley held on 5/12/2010. Court Reporter: Stephen Franklin, 561-514-3768 / Stephen_Franklin@flsd.uscourts.gov (ir) (Entered: 05/12/2010)
PACER 194 Filed: 4/7/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER as to Kerri L. Kaley, Brian P. Kaley re 193 Order granting Defendant's request for Post Restraint Due Process Hearing. Hearing set for 5/27/2010 10:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Kenneth A. Marra. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 4/6/2010. (ir) (Entered: 04/07/2010)
PACER 193 Filed: 3/29/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR A POST RESTRAINT DUE PROCESS HEARING as to Kerri L. Kaley, Brian P. Kaley. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 3/29/2010. (ir) (Entered: 03/29/2010)
PACER 192 Filed: 3/17/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER EXCLUDING TIME NUNC PRO TUNC granting 191 Motion for Hearing as to Kerri L. Kaley (1), Brian P. Kaley (2). Hearing will be set by separate order. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 3/17/2010. (ir) (Entered: 03/17/2010)
PACER 191 Filed: 3/16/2010, Entered: None
MOTION for Hearing Re: Status And To Exclude Time by USA as to Kerri L. Kaley, Brian P. Kaley. Responses due by 4/2/2010 (Watts-Fitzgerald, Thomas) (Entered: 03/16/2010)
PACER 190 Filed: 11/24/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Kenneth A. Marra: Telephonic Status Conference as to Kerri L. Kaley, Brian P. Kaley held on 11/24/2009. Tom Watts-Fitzgerald and Alison Lehr for plaintiff and Howard Srebnick and Susan Van Dusen for defendants. Court Reporter: Stephen Franklin, Phone: 561-514-3768 (ir) (Entered: 11/24/2009)
PACER 189 Filed: 11/20/2009, Entered: None
Appeal Record Returned consisting of (2)Volumes of Pleadings and (1)Volume of Transcripts as to Kerri L. Kaley, Brian P. Kaley; re 124 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal. USCA# 07-13010-HH (mc) (Entered: 11/20/2009)
PACER 188 Filed: 11/17/2009, Entered: None
MANDATE of USCA (certified copy) REVERSING the district court's decision and REMANDING the case to determine the defendant's entitlement to a post-indictment evidentiary hearing with court's opinion as to Kerri L. Kaley, Brian P. Kaley; re 124 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal ; Date Issued: 11/13/2009 ; USCA Case Number: 07-13010-HH (mc) (Entered: 11/18/2009)
PACER 169 Filed: 10/31/2007, Entered: None
Proposed Jury Instructions by USA as to Kerri L. Kaley, Brian P. Kaley, Jennifer L. Gruenstrass (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Draft Instructions)(Watts-Fitzgerald, Thomas) (Entered: 10/31/2007)
PACER 154 Filed: 9/25/2007, Entered: None
RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to Kerri L. Kaley, Brian P. Kaley, Jennifer L. Gruenstrass re 153 Defendant's MOTION to Compel Compliance with Court Order dated August 24, 2007 Replies due by 10/2/2007. (Watts-Fitzgerald, Thomas) (Entered: 09/25/2007)
PACER 152 Filed: 9/5/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Hearing filed as to Kerri L. Kaley, Brian P. Kaley for dates of 7/16/2007 before Judge Kenneth A. Marra, re 124 Notice of Appeal - Interlocutory Court Reporter: Stephen Franklin- phone number 561-514-3768 1-15 pages. USCA Case Number: 07-13010-HH. (cqs) (Entered: 09/05/2007)
PACER 151 Filed: 9/4/2007, Entered: None
RESPONSE by USA as to Kerri L. Kaley, Brian P. Kaley, Jennifer L. Gruenstrass to 149 Order on Motion for Bill of Particulars, (Watts-Fitzgerald, Thomas) (Entered: 09/04/2007)
PACER 150 Filed: 9/4/2007, Entered: None
RESPONSE to Standing Discovery Order by USA as to Kerri L. Kaley, Brian P. Kaley, Jennifer L. Gruenstrass (Watts-Fitzgerald, Thomas) (Entered: 09/04/2007)
PACER 148 Filed: 8/7/2007, Entered: None
ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT FROM USCA re 124 Notice of Appeal - Interlocutory receipt of: certificate of readiness date received by USCA 8/1/2007 USCA number 07-13010-HH (tb) (Entered: 08/07/2007)
PACER 146 Filed: 7/26/2007, Entered: None
Certified and Transmitted Record on Appeal as to Kerri L. Kaley, Brian P. Kaley to US Court of Appeals consisiting of (2) Volumes of Pleadings, (1) Volume of Transcripts and (3) Sealed Envelopes containing sealed pleadings DE# 75,76,77,101,102,103,119,120 re 124 Notice of Appeal - Interlocutory (hh) (Entered: 07/26/2007)
PACER 145 Filed: 7/26/2007, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE of Readiness transmitted to USCA as to Kerri L. Kaley, Brian P. Kaley re 124 Notice of Appeal - Interlocutory USCA #: 07-13010-HH (hh) (Entered: 07/26/2007)
PACER 144 Filed: 7/24/2007, Entered: None
ORDER of USCA (certified copy) pursuant to appellant's "Unopposed Motion to Expedite this Appeal", The motion to set the briefing schedule without extension is GRANTED IN PART. The motion to direct the expedited preparation and transmission of the record on appeal is GRANTED as to Kerri L. Kaley, Brian P. Kaley re 124 appeal (hh) (Entered: 07/26/2007)
PACER 143 Filed: 7/26/2007, Entered: None
RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to Kerri L. Kaley, Brian P. Kaley, Jennifer L. Gruenstrass re 132 Defendant's MOTION for Bill of Particulars and Incorporated Memorandum of Law Replies due by 8/2/2007. (Watts-Fitzgerald, Thomas) (Entered: 07/26/2007)
PACER 140 Filed: 7/18/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
ORAL ORDER granting as to Kerri L. Kaley, Brian P. Kaley re 133 MOTION to Stay filed by Brian P. Kaley,, 125 MOTION to Stay filed by Brian P. Kaley. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 7/16/2007. (mt) (Entered: 07/18/2007)
PACER 139 Filed: 7/16/2007, Entered: None
TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM as to Kerri L. Kaley, Brian P. Kaley re 124 Notice of Appeal - Interlocutory filed by Kerri L. Kaley,. No Transcript Requested. (hh) (Entered: 07/18/2007)
PACER 138 Filed: 7/18/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Kenneth A. Marra :Motion Hearing as to Kerri L. Kaley, Brian P. Kaley held on 7/18/2007 re 133 MOTION to Stay filed by Brian P. Kaley,, 125 MOTION to Stay filed by Brian P. Kaley, Court Reporter: Stephen Franklin (mt) (Entered: 07/18/2007)
PACER 137 Filed: 7/16/2007, Entered: None
DESIGNATION OF RECORD ON APPEAL by Kerri L. Kaley, Brian P. Kaley re 124 Notice of Appeal - Interlocutory (hh) (Entered: 07/18/2007)
PACER 136 Filed: 7/16/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Kenneth A. Marra :Motion Hearing as to Kerri L. Kaley, Brian P. Kaley held on 7/16/2007 re 133 MOTION to Stay filed by Brian P. Kaley,, 125 MOTION to Stay filed by Brian P. Kaley, Court Reporter: Stephen Franklin (mt) (Entered: 07/16/2007)
PACER 134 Filed: 7/9/2007, Entered: None
ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT FROM USCA re 124 Interlocutory Notice of Appeal. Date received by USCA 7/2/07. USCA number 07-13010-H (vp) (Entered: 07/13/2007)
PACER 133 Filed: 7/13/2007, Entered: None
Supplemental MOTION to Stay The Arraignment And Trial Pending Appeal Of The PreTrial Protective Order by Kerri L. Kaley, Brian P. Kaley. Responses due by 7/27/2007 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Van Dusen, Susan) (Entered: 07/13/2007)
PACER 131 Filed: 7/10/2007, Entered: None
Defendant's MOTION to Continue Trial by Jennifer L. Gruenstrass as to Kerri L. Kaley, Brian P. Kaley, Jennifer L. Gruenstrass. Responses due by 7/24/2007 (Romano, John) (Entered: 07/10/2007)
PACER 130 Filed: 7/9/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER re: Arraignment being set following ruling by the District Court as to Kerri L. Kaley, Brian P. Kaley Signed by Magistrate Judge Linnea R. Johnson on 7/9/07. (eg1) (Entered: 07/09/2007)
PACER 129 Filed: 7/9/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER VACATING ORDER (DE #127) as to Kerri L. Kaley, Brian P. Kaley Signed by Magistrate Judge Linnea R. Johnson on 7/9/07. (eg1) (Entered: 07/09/2007)
PACER 128 Filed: 7/9/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE OF HEARING as to Kerri L. Kaley, Brian P. KaleyHearing reset for 7/16/2007 08:30 AM in U.S. District Court 300 N.E. 1 Ave. Miami, Florida Central Courtroom before Judge Kenneth A. Marra. (mt) (Entered: 07/09/2007)
PACER 127 Filed: 7/6/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER POSTPONING REPORT RE: COUNSEL AND ARRAIGNMENT PENDING RULING ON THE PRETRIAL PROTECTIVE ORDER as to Kerri L. Kaley, Brian P. Kaley Signed by Magistrate Judge Linnea R. Johnson on 7/6/07. (eg1) (Entered: 07/06/2007)
PACER 126 Filed: 7/6/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION in case as to Kerri L. Kaley, Brian P. Kaley, 125 Defendant's MOTION to Stay The Arraignment and Trial Pending Appeal of the Pretrial Protective Order: Motion Hearing set for 7/12/2007 01:30 PM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Kenneth A. Marra. Defendants may appear by telephone.(mt) (Entered: 07/06/2007)
PACER 125 Filed: 7/2/2007, Entered: None
Defendant's MOTION to Stay The Arraignment and Trial Pending Appeal of the Pretrial Protective Order by Kerri L. Kaley, Brian P. Kaley. Responses due by 7/17/2007 (Srebnick, Howard) (Entered: 07/02/2007)
PACER 124 Filed: 6/27/2007, Entered: None
NOTICE OF APPEAL (Interlocutory) by Kerri L. Kaley, Brian P. Kaley re 123 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations,.Receipt Number: 962396 Filing fee $ 455. (hh) (Entered: 06/28/2007)
PACER 123 Filed: 6/25/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
OPINION AND ORDER AFFIRMING IN PART AND REVERSING IN PART ORDER OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE overruling in part and sustaining in part objections to order denying defendants' motion to vacate protective order as to Kerri L. Kaley, Brian P. Kaley, Jennifer L. Gruenstrass (see order for further details) Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 6/25/2007. (mt) (Entered: 06/25/2007)
PACER 122 Filed: 6/20/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
Endorsed ORDER granting 121 Motion to Continue as to Kerri L. Kaley (1), Brian P. Kaley (2) until July 6, 2007, in front of the West Palm Beach duty Magistrate JudgeSigned by Magistrate Judge James M. Hopkins on 6/20/07. (JMH) (Entered: 06/20/2007)
PACER 121 Filed: 6/19/2007, Entered: None
Unopposed MOTION to Continue The June 22, 2007 Report Re: Counsel/Arraignment by Kerri L. Kaley, Brian P. Kaley. Responses due by 7/3/2007 (Van Dusen, Susan) (Entered: 06/19/2007)
PACER 120 Filed: 6/13/2007, Entered: None
Sealed Document (rb) (Entered: 06/13/2007)
PACER 119 Filed: 6/13/2007, Entered: None
Sealed Document (rb) (Entered: 06/13/2007)
PACER 118 Filed: 6/8/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
*Endorsed Order as to Kerri L. Kaley, Brian P. Kaley Order setting aside arrest warrant as to Kerri L. Kaley and Brian P. Kaley issued June 8, 2007, for their failure to appear for status re counsel and arraignment. Arraignment previously rescheduled as to both Defendants for June 22, 2007 before duty Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann E. Vitunac on June 8, 2007. (lc1) (Entered: 06/08/2007)
PACER 116 Filed: 6/8/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ann E. Vitunac:Report Re: Counsel Hearing as to Kerri L. Kaley NOT held on 6/8/2007. Defendant not present in court. Arrest Warrant issued, setting no bond. (Tape #AEV 07-0-470) (sa) (Entered: 06/08/2007)
PACER 115 Filed: 6/7/2007, Entered: None
Notice of Docket Correction re 105 Notice; Correction: added description to attachment ; NOTICE of Instruction to Filer add proper description to attachments sent to Kerri L. Kaley, Brian P. Kaley (bs) (Entered: 06/07/2007)
PACER 114 Filed: 6/7/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
Endorsed ORDER granting 113 Motion to Continue as to Kerri L. Kaley (1), Brian P. Kaley (2) until 6/22/07 10 a.m. in front of the Duty Magistrate Judge in West Palm BeachSigned by Magistrate Judge James M. Hopkins on 6/7/07. (JMH) (Entered: 06/07/2007)
PACER 113 Filed: 6/7/2007, Entered: None
Defendant's MOTION to Continue To Continue the June 8, 2007 Arraignment and Report Re Counsel by Kerri L. Kaley, Brian P. Kaley. Responses due by 6/21/2007 (Srebnick, Howard) (Entered: 06/07/2007)
PACER 112 Filed: 6/6/2007, Entered: None
APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court by Kerri L. Kaley, Brian P. Kaley re 109 Response (Other) (Van Dusen, Susan) (Entered: 06/06/2007)
PACER 111 Filed: 5/30/2007, Entered: None
Notice of Docket Correction re Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings sent to Kerri L. Kaley, Brian P. Kaley; ERROR: Incorrect date set for Hearing re: Report re counsel; Corrected by Court (bb) (Entered: 05/30/2007)
PACER 110 Filed: 5/30/2007, Entered: None
NOTICE of Filing Frank Tarsia's Plea Transcript in Support of Their Objections (DE 88) to the Magistrates Order by Kerri L. Kaley, Brian P. Kaley (Srebnick, Howard) (Entered: 05/30/2007)
PACER 109 Filed: 5/25/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
RESPONSE by USA as to Kerri L. Kaley, Brian P. Kaley to 88 Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court (Lehr, Alison) (Entered: 05/25/2007)
PACER 107 Filed: 5/25/2007, Entered: None
NOTICE of Instruction to Filer re 104 Response in Support filed by Brian P. Kaley, sent to Kerri L. Kaley, Brian P. Kaley. ERROR: 1) Incorrect "Response in Support" event used; Correct event to use, for FUTURE reference is "Reply to Response" found under Responses and Replies (linking it to Motion). 2) Attachments to Document did not have a description; FUTURE documents containing attachments need to be described.- Corrected by Court. (gp) (Entered: 05/25/2007)
PACER 106 Filed: 5/25/2007, Entered: None
Unopposed MOTION to Continue The May 30, 2007 Report Re: Counsel/Arraignment by Brian P. Kaley as to Kerri L. Kaley, Brian P. Kaley. Responses due by 6/11/2007 (Van Dusen, Susan) (Entered: 05/25/2007)
PACER 105 Filed: 5/25/2007, Entered: None
NOTICE of Filing Frank Tarsia's Sentencing Transcript from Case No. 05-Cr-80192\Ryskamp In Support of Their Objections to Magistrate's Order (DE 88) by Kerri L. Kaley, Brian P. Kaley (Attachments: # 1 Sentencing Transcript)(Srebnick, Howard) Modified on 6/7/2007 (bs) Added description to attachment. (Entered: 05/25/2007)
PACER 104 Filed: 5/24/2007, Entered: None
RESPONSE in Support by Kerri L. Kaley, Brian P. Kaley re 87 MOTION for Release of Funds - Motion to Permit Them to Use untainted assets to repay a loan and to retain appeallate counsel (Attachments: # 1)(Srebnick, Howard) (Entered: 05/24/2007)
PACER 103 Filed: 5/23/2007, Entered: None
Sealed Document (rb) (Entered: 05/23/2007)
PACER 102 Filed: 5/23/2007, Entered: None
Sealed Document (rb) (Entered: 05/23/2007)
PACER 101 Filed: 5/23/2007, Entered: None
Sealed Document (rb) (Entered: 05/23/2007)
PACER 100 Filed: 5/21/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 96 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response as to Kerri L. Kaley (1), Brian P. Kaley (2) Responses due by 5/25/2007Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 5/21/07. (hd) (Entered: 05/22/2007)
PACER 99 Filed: 5/18/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Kerri L. Kaley, Brian P. Kaley held on 4/27/07 before Judge James M. Hopkin. Court Reporter: Victoria Aiello 1-151 pages. (hh) (Entered: 05/22/2007)
PACER 98 Filed: 5/21/2007, Entered: None
RESPONSE by USA as to Kerri L. Kaley, Brian P. Kaley to 87 MOTION for Release of Funds (Lehr, Alison) (Entered: 05/21/2007)
PACER 97 Filed: 5/17/2007, Entered: None
ARREST Warrant Returned Executed on 02/08/2007 in case as to Kerri L. Kaley (bs) (Entered: 05/21/2007)
PACER 96 Filed: 5/20/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to 88 Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court by USA as to Kerri L. Kaley, Brian P. Kaley. Responses due by 6/4/2007 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lehr, Alison) (Entered: 05/20/2007)
PACER 95 Filed: 5/16/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 93 Motion to Continue Trial as to Kerri L. Kaley (1), Brian P. Kaley (2), Jennifer L. Gruenstrass (3)Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 05/15/2007. (bs) (Entered: 05/16/2007)
PACER 94 Filed: 5/16/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 91 Motion to Continue the Report Re Counsel & Arraignment Hearing until 5/30/07 as to Kerri L. Kaley (1), Brian P. Kaley (2)Signed by Magistrate Judge James M. Hopkins on 5/15/07. (ck) (Entered: 05/16/2007)
PACER 93 Filed: 5/11/2007, Entered: None
Unopposed MOTION to Continue Trial by Jennifer L. Gruenstrass as to Kerri L. Kaley, Brian P. Kaley, Jennifer L. Gruenstrass. Responses due by 5/25/2007 (Romano, John) (Entered: 05/11/2007)
PACER 92 Filed: 5/11/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE OF RESETTING HEARING as to Kerri L. Kaley, Brian P. Kaley Arraignment reset for 5/30/2007 10:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Magistrate Judge Linnea R. Johnson. Report Re: Counsel Hearing reset for 5/30/2007 10:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Magistrate Judge Linnea R. Johnson. (ck) (Entered: 05/11/2007)
PACER 91 Filed: 5/10/2007, Entered: None
Unopposed MOTION to Continue The May 14, 2007 Report RE Counsel/Arraignment by Kerri L. Kaley, Brian P. Kaley. Responses due by 5/24/2007 (Srebnick, Howard) (Entered: 05/10/2007)
PACER 90 Filed: 5/9/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
SUPPLEMENT to 88 Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court filed by Kerri L. Kaley, by Kerri L. Kaley, Brian P. Kaley Supplemental Authority in Support of Appeal of Magistrate Judge's Orders (Srebnick, Howard) (Entered: 05/09/2007)
PACER 89 Filed: 5/7/2007, Entered: None
MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Kerri L. Kaley, Brian P. Kaley. Responses due by 5/21/2007 (Srebnick, Howard) (Entered: 05/07/2007)
PACER 88 Filed: 5/7/2007, Entered: None
APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court by Kerri L. Kaley, Brian P. Kaley re 82 Order on Motion to Vacate, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,, (Srebnick, Howard) (Entered: 05/07/2007)
PACER 87 Filed: 5/7/2007, Entered: None
MOTION for Release of Funds and to Retain Appellate Counsel by Kerri L. Kaley, Brian P. Kaley. Responses due by 5/21/2007 (Srebnick, Howard) (Entered: 05/07/2007)
PACER 86 Filed: 5/7/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 85 Motion to Continue as to Kerri L. Kaley (1), Brian P. Kaley (2)Signed by Magistrate Judge James M. Hopkins on 5/6/07. (eg1) (Entered: 05/07/2007)
PACER 85 Filed: 5/3/2007, Entered: None
Amended MOTION to Continue The May 7, 2007 Report Re: Counsel / Arraignment by Kerri L. Kaley, Brian P. Kaley. Responses due by 5/17/2007 (Srebnick, Howard) (Entered: 05/03/2007)
PACER 84 Filed: 5/3/2007, Entered: None
MOTION to Continue The April 7, 2007 Report RE: Counsel/Arraignment by Kerri L. Kaley, Brian P. Kaley. Responses due by 5/17/2007 (Srebnick, Howard) (Entered: 05/03/2007)
PACER 83 Filed: 5/2/2007, Entered: None
First RESPONSE to Standing Discovery Order by USA as to Kerri L. Kaley, Brian P. Kaley, Jennifer L. Gruenstrass (Watts-Fitzgerald, Thomas) (Entered: 05/02/2007)
PACER 82 Filed: 5/2/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER DENYING 17 Motion to Vacate Protective Order as to Kerri L. Kaley (1), Brian P. Kaley (2); and DENYING 52 Motion to Bar Pretrial Restraints as to Kerri L. Kaley (1), Brian P. Kaley (2)Signed by Magistrate Judge James M. Hopkins on 5/1/07. (ck) (Entered: 05/02/2007)
PACER 81 Filed: 5/2/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
AMENDED PROTECTIVE ORDER as to Kerri L. Kaley, Brian P. Kaley Signed by Magistrate Judge James M. Hopkins on 5/1/07. (ck) (Entered: 05/02/2007)
PACER 80 Filed: 5/2/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER finding probable cause to seize/freeze or otherwise restrain defendants' principal residence & certificate of deposit as to Kerri L. Kaley, Brian P. Kaley Signed by Magistrate Judge James M. Hopkins on 5/1/07. (ck) (Entered: 05/02/2007)
PACER 79 Filed: 5/2/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER as to Kerri L. Kaley, Brian P. Kaley sealed documents 75 , 76 , & 77 Signed by Magistrate Judge James M. Hopkins on 5/1/07. (ck) (Entered: 05/02/2007)
PACER 78 Filed: 5/1/2007, Entered: None
NOTICE of Filing an Order in United States v. Anders Case No. 04-Cr-20250\Jordan (DE 474) by Kerri L. Kaley, Brian P. Kaley (Attachments: # 1)(Srebnick, Howard) (Entered: 05/01/2007)
PACER 77 Filed: 5/1/2007, Entered: None
Sealed Document (rb) (Entered: 05/01/2007)
PACER 76 Filed: 5/1/2007, Entered: None
Sealed Document (rb) (Entered: 05/01/2007)
PACER 75 Filed: 5/1/2007, Entered: None
Sealed Document (rb) (Entered: 05/01/2007)
PACER 74 Filed: 4/30/2007, Entered: None
EXHIBIT LIST of 4/27/07 hearing by Kerri L. Kaley, Brian P. Kaleym, with attached exhibits (ck) (Entered: 04/30/2007)
PACER 72 Filed: 4/30/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James M. Hopkins:Motion Hearing as to Kerri L. Kaley held on 4/27/2007 re 17 Defendant's MOTION to Vacate, In Whole or In Part, the Protective Order And For a Hearing Concerning the Scope and Legality of the Protective Order Under the Fifth and Sixth Amendments, filed by Kerri L. Kaley,, 52 Defendant's MOTION To Bar Pretrial Restraints Based On A "Facilitation" Theory and Incorporated Memorandul of Law filed by Kerri L. Kaley, Witness Kerri Kaley & Brian Kaley testified Court Reporter: Victoria Miller (ck) (Entered: 04/30/2007)
PACER 71 Filed: 4/27/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge James M. Hopkins as to Kerri L. Kaley, Brian P. Kaley, Jennifer L. Gruenstrassfor for all PRETRIAL matters. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 4/26/07. (lk) (Entered: 04/27/2007)
PACER 70 Filed: 4/27/2007, Entered: None
NOTICE Of Filing the Sentencing Transcript of Alan T. Schmidt Case No. 06-Cr-60172\Zloch by Kerri L. Kaley, Brian P. Kaley re 17 Defendant's MOTION to Vacate , In Whole or In Part, the Protective Order And For a Hearing Concerning the Scope and Legality of the Protective Order Under the Fifth and Sixth Amendments (Attachments: # 1)(Srebnick, Howard) (Entered: 04/27/2007)
PACER 69 Filed: 4/26/2007, Entered: None
REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by Kerri L. Kaley, Brian P. Kaley re 17 Defendant's MOTION to Vacate , In Whole or In Part, the Protective Order And For a Hearing Concerning the Scope and Legality of the Protective Order Under the Fifth and Sixth Amendments (Srebnick, Howard) (Entered: 04/26/2007)
PACER 68 Filed: 4/24/2007, Entered: None
RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to Kerri L. Kaley, Brian P. Kaley re 52 Defendant's MOTION To Bar Pretrial Restraints Based On A "Facilitation" Theory and Incorporated Memorandul of Law (Lehr, Alison) (Entered: 04/24/2007)
PACER 67 Filed: 4/24/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
SCHEDULING ORDER as to Kerri L. Kaley, Brian P. Kaley, Jennifer L. Gruenstrass Calendar Call set for 6/8/2007 09:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Kenneth A. Marra. Jury Trial set for 6/11/2007 09:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Kenneth A. Marra. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 4/24/2007. (mt) (Entered: 04/24/2007)
PACER 66 Filed: 4/24/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum DENIED as to Alan Schmidt for 4/27/07 in case as to Kerri L. Kaley, Brian P. Kaley Signed by Magistrate Judge James M. Hopkins on 4/24/07. (JMH) (Entered: 04/24/2007)
PACER 65 Filed: 4/23/2007, Entered: None
Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum As To Alan T. Schmidt by Kerri L. Kaley, Brian P. Kaley (Srebnick, Howard) (Entered: 04/23/2007)
PACER 60 Filed: 4/20/2007, Entered: None
Notice of Docket Correction re 53 MOTION filed by Brian P. Kaley & Kerri L. Kaley. Error: Document filed as a motion rather than a supplement to the 17 Motion to vacate protective order: Document terminated as a motion (ck) (Entered: 04/20/2007)
PACER 57 Filed: 4/19/2007, Entered: None
RESPONSE by USA as to Kerri L. Kaley, Brian P. Kaley Outstanding Issues (Lehr, Alison) (Entered: 04/19/2007)
PACER 56 Filed: 4/19/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 54 Motion to Continue as to Kerri L. Kaley (1), Brian P. Kaley (2); granting 55 Motion to Continue as to Kerri L. Kaley (1), Brian P. Kaley (2). The Report Re Counsel, Arraignment, & Motion hearings are reset for Friday, April 27, 2007 @ 2:00 PM, Courtroom 6.Signed by Magistrate Judge James M. Hopkins on 4/18/07. (ck) (Entered: 04/19/2007)
PACER 55 Filed: 4/18/2007, Entered: None
Corrected MOTION to Continue April 25, 2007 Report Re. Counsel/Arraignment/Hearing by Kerri L. Kaley, Brian P. Kaley. Responses due by 5/2/2007 (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Proposed Order)(Van Dusen, Susan) (Entered: 04/18/2007)
PACER 54 Filed: 4/18/2007, Entered: None
Unopposed MOTION to Continue The April 25, 2007 Report Re. Counsel/Arraignment/Hearing by Kerri L. Kaley, Brian P. Kaley. Responses due by 5/2/2007 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Van Dusen, Susan) (Entered: 04/18/2007)
PACER 53 Filed: 4/17/2007, Entered: None
MOTION Defendant's Kerri and Brian Kaley's Outline of the Remaining Issues Concerning The Scope and Legality of the Protective Order by Kerri L. Kaley, Brian P. Kaley. Responses due by 5/1/2007 (Srebnick, Howard) (Entered: 04/17/2007)
PACER 52 Filed: 4/17/2007, Entered: None
Defendant's MOTION To Bar Pretrial Restraints Based On A "Facilitation" Theory and Incorporated Memorandul of Law by Kerri L. Kaley, Brian P. Kaley. Responses due by 5/1/2007 (Srebnick, Howard) (Entered: 04/17/2007)
PACER 51 Filed: 4/17/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting in part 48 Motion to cancel the hearing set for 4/16/07, or in the alternative, to reschedule the hearing as to Kerri L. Kaley (1), Brian P. Kaley (2). Defendants shall file their memorandum outlining issues which remain for resolution and the relevant case lasw, by 6:00 PM on 4/17/07. The United States shall file a response thereto by 8:30 PM on 4/19/07. Granting 49 Motion to Continue the report re counsel & arraignment hearing as to Kerri L. Kaley (1), Brian P. Kaley (2) until 4/25/07 @ 10:15 AM.Signed by Magistrate Judge James M. Hopkins on 4/16/07. (ck) (Entered: 04/17/2007)
PACER 50 Filed: 4/13/2007, Entered: None
Notice of Docket Correction re 49 Unopposed MOTION to Continue: Added attachment description, Notice of Instruction to Filer: In the future, add proper description to attachments. (hd) (Entered: 04/16/2007)
PACER 49 Filed: 4/13/2007, Entered: None
Unopposed MOTION to Continue The April 16, 2007 Report Re: Counsel/Arraignment by Kerri L. Kaley, Brian P. Kaley. Responses due by 4/27/2007 (Attachments: # 1)(Van Dusen, Susan) (Entered: 04/13/2007)
PACER 48 Filed: 4/12/2007, Entered: None
MOTION Cancel Hearing, or, in the Alternative, to Reschedule Hearing by USA as to Kerri L. Kaley, Brian P. Kaley. Responses due by 4/26/2007 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting OR Order Granting In Part)(Lehr, Alison) (Entered: 04/12/2007)
PACER 45 Filed: 4/10/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
Summons Issued in case as to Kerri L. Kaley. Deft to appear 4/23/07 @ 10:00 AM before the Duty Magistrate Judge in WPB. (ck) (Entered: 04/11/2007)
PACER 44 Filed: 4/10/2007, Entered: None
INDICTMENT as to Kerri L. Kaley (1) count(s) 1s, 2s-6s, 7s, 8s, Brian P. Kaley (2) count(s) 1s, 2s-6s, 7s, 8s, Jennifer L. Gruenstrass (3) count(s) 1s, 2s-6s, 7s, 8s. (ck) Additional attachment(s) added on 4/11/2007 (ck). (Entered: 04/11/2007)
PACER 42 Filed: 4/6/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James M. Hopkins :Telephone Conference as to Kerri L. Kaley held on 4/6/2007 (Tape #JMH-07-23-1.) (ck) (Entered: 04/06/2007)
PACER 41 Filed: 4/6/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
Endorsed ORDER granting 40 Motion to Continue until 4/16/07 12:30 p.m. as to Kerri L. Kaley (1), Brian P. Kaley (2)Signed by Magistrate Judge James M. Hopkins on 4/6/07. (JMH) (Entered: 04/06/2007)
PACER 40 Filed: 4/5/2007, Entered: None
Unopposed MOTION to Continue The April 9, 2007 Report RE: Counsel / Arraignment by Kerri L. Kaley, Brian P. Kaley. Responses due by 4/19/2007 (Srebnick, Howard) (Entered: 04/05/2007)
PACER 39 Filed: 4/3/2007, Entered: None
Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions by Jennifer L. Gruenstrass as to Kerri L. Kaley, Brian P. Kaley, Jennifer L. Gruenstrass. Responses due by 4/17/2007 (Romano, John) (Entered: 04/03/2007)
PACER 38 Filed: 4/2/2007, Entered: None
NOTICE of Filing Defendants Kerri and Brian Kaley's Reply In Support of Their Motion To Vacate Protective Order by Kerri L. Kaley, Brian P. Kaley re 6 Order on Motion for Protective Order (Attachments: # 1)(Srebnick, Howard) (Entered: 04/02/2007)
PACER 36 Filed: 3/26/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER on Hearing to Report Re: Counsel as to Kerri L. Kaley held on 3/26/2007. Arraignment set for 4/9/2007 10:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Duty Magistrate. Report Re: Counsel Hearing set for 4/9/2007 10:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Duty Magistrate. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ted E. Bandstra on 3/26/07. Tape #07E-25-622 (lk) (Entered: 03/27/2007)
PACER 35 Filed: 3/26/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
Endorsed ORDER granting 34 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to Kerri L. Kaley (1), Brian P. Kaley (2) Replies due by 4/2/2007.Signed by Magistrate Judge James M. Hopkins on 3/26/07. (JMH) (Entered: 03/26/2007)
PACER 34 Filed: 3/26/2007, Entered: None
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Memorandum by Kerri L. Kaley, Brian P. Kaley. Responses due by 4/9/2007 (Srebnick, Howard) (Entered: 03/26/2007)
PACER 31 Filed: 3/21/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 29 Motion to Continue the arraignment and report re counsel hearing to 4/9/07 at 10:00am for Kerri L. Kaley (1), Brian P. Kaley (2)Signed by Magistrate Judge Barry L. Garber on 3/21/07. (lk) (Entered: 03/21/2007)
PACER 29 Filed: 3/21/2007, Entered: None
Unopposed MOTION to Continue THE MARCH 26, 2007 REPORT RE COUNSEL / ARRAIGNMENT by Kerri L. Kaley, Brian P. Kaley. Responses due by 4/4/2007 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Srebnick, Howard) (Entered: 03/21/2007)
PACER 28 Filed: 3/20/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER REFERRING MOTION to Magistrate Judge James M. Hopkins as to Kerri L. Kaley, Brian P. Kaley 17 Defendant's MOTION to Vacate , In Whole or In Part, the Protective Order And For a Hearing Concerning the Scope and Legality of the Protective Order Under the Fifth and Sixth Amendments filed by Brian P. Kaley, Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 3/19/2007. (mt) (Entered: 03/20/2007)
PACER 27 Filed: 3/19/2007, Entered: None
RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to Kerri L. Kaley, Brian P. Kaley re 17 Defendant's MOTION to Vacate , In Whole or In Part, the Protective Order And For a Hearing Concerning the Scope and Legality of the Protective Order Under the Fifth and Sixth Amendments (Lehr, Alison) (Entered: 03/19/2007)
PACER 26 Filed: 3/14/2007, Entered: None
Unopposed MOTION to Continue The March 19, 2007 Report Re Counsel and Arraignment by Kerri L. Kaley, Brian P. Kaley. Responses due by 3/28/2007 (Srebnick, Howard) (Entered: 03/14/2007)
PACER 23 Filed: 3/8/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 19 Motion to Continue as to Kerri L. Kaley (1), Brian P. Kaley (2). Signed by Judge Ted E. Bandstra on 3/8/07. (nt) (Entered: 03/08/2007)
PACER 20 Filed: 3/6/2007, Entered: None
Sealed Document (vjk) (Entered: 03/06/2007)
PACER 19 Filed: 3/6/2007, Entered: None
MOTION to Continue The March 12, 2007 Report Re Counsel by Kerri L. Kaley, Brian P. Kaley. Responses due by 3/20/2007 (Srebnick, Howard) (Entered: 03/06/2007)
PACER 17 Filed: 3/5/2007, Entered: None, Terminated: 10/25/2010
Defendant's MOTION to Vacate , In Whole or In Part, the Protective Order And For a Hearing Concerning the Scope and Legality of the Protective Order Under the Fifth and Sixth Amendments by Kerri L. Kaley, Brian P. Kaley. (Attachments: # 1 # 2)(Srebnick, Howard) Modified on 3/6/2007 (hd). ERROR: missing attachment description (Entered: 03/05/2007)
PACER 16 Filed: 3/5/2007, Entered: None
MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Kerri L. Kaley, Brian P. Kaley. Responses due by 3/19/2007 (Srebnick, Howard) (Terminated (Entered: 03/05/2007)
PACER 14 Filed: 2/28/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
PERSONAL SURETY Bond Entered as to Kerri L. Kaley Bond amount $100,000.00 Approved by Judge William C. Turnoff (ls) Modified on 3/1/2007 (ls). (Entered: 03/01/2007)
PACER 13 Filed: 2/28/2007, Entered: None
NOTICE OF TEMPORARY ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Howard Milton Srebnick appearing for Kerri L. Kaley, Brian P. Kaley (ls) Modified on 3/1/2007 (ls). (Entered: 03/01/2007)
PACER 10 Filed: 2/26/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
Order on Initial Appearance as to Kerri L. Kaley for proceeding held on 2/26/2007 Attorney Howard Milton Srebnick for Kerri L. Kaley added for the defendant.. Tape #07G-16-989 Arraignment set for 3/19/2007 10:00 AM in Miami Division before Magistrate Judge William C. Turnoff. Report Re: Counsel Hearing set for 3/12/2007 10:00 AM in Miami Division before Magistrate Judge William C. Turnoff. Signed by Judge William C. Turnoff on 2/26/2007. (ls) (Entered: 03/01/2007)
PACER 7 Filed: 2/28/2007, Entered: None
Rule 5(c)(3)/ Rule 40 Documents received from Eastern District of New York by Kerri L. Kaley (pa) (Entered: 02/28/2007)
PACER 6 Filed: 2/8/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 5 Motion for Protective Order as to Kerri L. Kaley (1), Brian P. Kaley (2), Jennifer L. Gruenstrass (3). (See order for details.)Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 2/7/2007. (mt) (Entered: 02/08/2007)
PACER 5 Filed: 2/7/2007, Entered: None
Ex Parte MOTION for Protective Order as to property sought for forfeiture by USA as to Kerri L. Kaley, Brian P. Kaley, Jennifer L. Gruenstrass. Responses due by 2/22/2007 (Attachments: # 1)(Lehr, Alison) (Entered: 02/07/2007)
PACER 1 Filed: 2/6/2007, Entered: None
INDICTMENT as to Kerri L. Kaley (1) count(s) 1, 2-6, 7, Brian P. Kaley (2) count(s) 1, 2-6, 7, Jennifer L. Gruenstrass (3) count(s) 1, 2-6, 7 and forfeiture. (cg1) (Entered: 02/06/2007)

Statistics

This case has been viewed 125 times.

No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Need Password Help?