USA v. Wahdan
North Carolina Eastern District Court, Case No. 5:10-cr-00216
District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan, presiding
docket://gov.uscourts.nced.5-10-cr-00216 (What is this?)

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
The right information can save you thousands of dollars.
Access comprehensive profiles on judges, firms, lawyers, and more with PlainSite Pro and Pro Se.
No Logo Majdi Wahdan, Defendant (1)

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Entity AG

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Michael J. Denning +1 919 856 9494 +1 919 856 9499
Melissa Lynn Pulliam +1 919 856 9494 +1 919 856 9499
  Entries (16) Calendar Events Related (0) Tools Right End
PACER 22 Filed: 2/14/2011, Entered: None
Judgment Returned Executed as to Majdi Wahdan on 1/10/2011. (Grady, B.) (Entered: 02/14/2011)
PACER 20 Filed: 12/13/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
JUDGMENT as to Majdi Wahdan (1) - Count 1 - Bureau of Prisons - 12 months and 1 day - Supervised Release - 3 years - Special Conditions Imposed - Special Assessment $100 (due immediately) - Restitution $98,355.00 (due immediately) - Defendant ordered to surrender at direction of U.S. Marshal Service not earlier than 01/05/2011. Signed by Chief Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 12/03/2010. Copies served electronically. (Baker, C.) (Entered: 12/13/2010)
PACER 19 Filed: 12/3/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
Order to Surrender as to Majdi Wahdan -Defendant shall surrender as directed by the U.S. Marshal's Service not earlier than 1/5/2011. Signed by Chief Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 12/03/2010. Copies served electronically. (Baker, C.) (Entered: 12/03/2010)
PACER 18 Filed: 12/3/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Louise Wood Flanagan in New Bern, NC: Sentencing held on 12/3/2010 for Majdi Wahdan (1) - Count 1 - Bureau of Prisons - 12 months and 1 day - Supervised Release - 3 years - Special Conditions Imposed - Special Assessment $100 (due immediately) - Restitution $98,355.00 (due immediately) - Defendant advised of appellate rights and ordered to surrender at direction of U.S. Marshal Service not earlier than 01/05/2011 - Order to Surrender executed. (Court Reporter Harry Hagopian.) (Baker, C.) (Entered: 12/03/2010)
PACER 15 Filed: 11/24/2010, Entered: None
SENTENCING MEMORANDUM by Majdi Wahdan (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Letter of Acceptance of Resonsibility, # 2 Supplement Measuring Recidivism, # 3 Supplement United States v. Renya, # 4 Supplement United States v. Taylor) (Pulliam, Melissa) (Entered: 11/24/2010)
PACER 14 Filed: 9/24/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE regarding passport. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 09/24/2010)
PACER 13 Filed: 9/13/2010, Entered: None
Unsecured Appearance Bond Entered as to Majdi Wahdan in amount of $100,000.00. (Lee, L.) (Entered: 09/13/2010)
PACER 12 Filed: 9/13/2010, Entered: None
ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Majdi Wahdan (1) $100,000.00 Unsecured Appearance Bond. Signed by USMJ David W. Daniel on 9/13/10. (Lee, L.) (Entered: 09/13/2010)
PACER 11 Filed: 9/13/2010, Entered: None
PLEA AGREEMENT as to Majdi Wahdan. (Lee, L.) (Entered: 09/13/2010)
PACER 10 Filed: 9/13/2010, Entered: None
WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by Majdi Wahdan. (Lee, L.) (Entered: 09/13/2010)
PACER 9 Filed: 9/13/2010, Entered: None
CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE FOR FELONY ARRAIGNMENT by defendant Majdi Wahdan. (Lee, L.) (Entered: 09/13/2010)
PACER 8 Filed: 9/13/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before USMJ David W. Daniel in Greenville: Arraignment as to Majdi Wahdan (1) Count 1 held on 9/13/2010 - Plea entered by Majdi Wahdan (1) Count 1: Guilty Count 1 - Sentencing set for 12/6/2010 sentencing term in New Bern Courtroom before Chief Judge Louise Wood Flanagan - This was the Defendants first appearance - Government does not oppose release - Defendant released on special conditions and $100,000.00 Unsecured appearance bond. (Court Reporter Miriam Dutton) (Lee, L.) (Entered: 09/13/2010)
PACER 7 Filed: 9/10/2010, Entered: None
Pretrial Services Report filed by Bonnie Craig as to Majdi Wahdan. (Bethea, A.) (Entered: 09/10/2010)
PACER 6 Filed: 7/27/2010, Entered: None
Notice of Substitution of Counsel Felice Corpening appearing for USA. (Corpening, Felice) (Entered: 07/27/2010)
PACER 5 Filed: 7/21/2010, Entered: None
Notice of Substitution of Counsel Felice Corpening appearing for USA. (Corpening, Felice) (Entered: 07/21/2010)
PACER 1 Filed: 6/30/2010, Entered: None
INFORMATION as to Majdi Wahdan (1) count(s) 1. (Crews, K) (Entered: 07/01/2010)

Statistics

This case has been viewed 85 times.

No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Need Password Help?