Henderson v. Holiday CVS, L.L.C. et al
Florida Southern District Court, Case No. 9:09-cv-80909
District Judge Kenneth A. Marra, presiding
docket://gov.uscourts.flsd.9-09-cv-80909 (What is this?)

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Judges don't know as much about themselves as we do.
Access comprehensive profiles on judges, firms, lawyers, and more with PlainSite Pro and Pro Se.
No Logo Joachim E. Traebecke, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Penthouse

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Martin Eric Leach +1 305 441 8818 +4418 441 441 8081 mel@flmlegal.com
No Logo Kristy Henderson, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Shavitz Law Group, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Hal B. Anderson +1 561 447 8888 +1 561 447 8831 hal.anderson@shavitzlaw.com
v.
No Logo CVS Caremark Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ashe Rafuse & Hill

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Sandra K. Park +1 404 253 6000 +1 404 253 6060 sandrapark@asherafuse.com
Nancy E. Rafuse +1 404 253 6000 nancyrafuse@asherafuse.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
David Michael DeMaio +1 305 374 0506 +1 305 374 0456 david.demaio@odnss.com
Christopher Patrick Hammon +1 305 455 3711 +1 305 374 0456 chris.hammon@ogletreedeakins.com
No Logo CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ashe Rafuse & Hill

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Sandra K. Park +1 404 253 6000 +1 404 253 6060 sandrapark@asherafuse.com
Nancy E. Rafuse +1 404 253 6000 nancyrafuse@asherafuse.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
David Michael DeMaio +1 305 374 0506 +1 305 374 0456 david.demaio@odnss.com
Christopher Patrick Hammon +1 305 455 3711 +1 305 374 0456 chris.hammon@ogletreedeakins.com
No Logo Holiday CVS, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ashe Rafuse & Hill

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Sandra K. Park +1 404 253 6000 +1 404 253 6060 sandrapark@asherafuse.com
Nancy E. Rafuse +1 404 253 6000 nancyrafuse@asherafuse.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
David Michael DeMaio +1 305 374 0506 +1 305 374 0456 david.demaio@odnss.com
Christopher Patrick Hammon +1 305 455 3711 +1 305 374 0456 chris.hammon@ogletreedeakins.com
Citation Section 29 U.S.C. § 0206
Nature of Suit 710 Labor: Fair Standards
  Entries (164) Calendar Events Related (0) Tools Right End
PACER 165 Filed: 11/15/2011, Entered: None
ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT. Case transferred from Florida Southern has been opened in District of Rhode Island as case 1:11-cv-00541, filed 11/14/2011. (bb) (Entered: 11/15/2011)
PDF 164 Filed: 11/14/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 163 Motion to Change Venue. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 11/14/2011. (lbc) (Entered: 11/14/2011)
PACER 163 Filed: 11/14/2011, Entered: None
Unopposed MOTION to Change Venue by Kristy Henderson. Responses due by 12/1/2011 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shavitz, Gregg) (Entered: 11/14/2011)
PACER 162 Filed: 10/14/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 161 Motion to Stay for a period of 30 days. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 10/14/2011. (ir) (Entered: 10/14/2011)
PACER 161 Filed: 10/14/2011, Entered: None
Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings (30 days) by CVS Caremark, Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Kristy Henderson, Holiday CVS, L.L.C.. Responses due by 10/31/2011 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Swartz, James) (Entered: 10/14/2011)
PACER 160 Filed: 7/14/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 159 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 7/14/2011. (ir) (Entered: 07/14/2011)
PACER 159 Filed: 7/13/2011, Entered: None
Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings by CVS Caremark, Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Kristy Henderson, Holiday CVS, L.L.C.. Responses due by 8/1/2011 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Swartz, James) (Entered: 07/13/2011)
PACER 158 Filed: 5/24/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by Gregg I. Shavitz on behalf of Percy Astete, Jeannine Kelly, Randy Flynn (Shavitz, Gregg) (Entered: 05/24/2011)
PACER 157 Filed: 3/31/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by Gregg I. Shavitz on behalf of Jacqueline Perez (Shavitz, Gregg) (Entered: 03/31/2011)
PACER 156 Filed: 3/4/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by Gregg I. Shavitz on behalf of Ryan D'Angelo (Shavitz, Gregg) (Entered: 03/04/2011)
PACER 155 Filed: 12/15/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER RESETTING TRIAL DATE & PRETRIAL DEADLINES re 154 SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f)/16.1 filed by CVS Caremark, Corporation, Kristy Henderson, Holiday CVS, L.L.C., CVS Pharmacy, Inc. Discovery due by 10/31/2011., Dispositive Motions due by 5/11/2012., Calendar Call set for 11/9/2012 10:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Kenneth A. Marra., Jury Trial set for 11/13/2012 09:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Kenneth A. Marra. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 12/15/2010. (ir) (Entered: 12/15/2010)
PACER 154 Filed: 12/15/2010, Entered: None
SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by CVS Caremark, Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Kristy Henderson, Holiday CVS, L.L.C. (Swartz, James) (Entered: 12/15/2010)
PACER 153 Filed: 11/18/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
Order Cancelling 12/3/10 calendar call. Parties to submit proposed amended scheduling order. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 11/18/2010. (ir) (Entered: 11/18/2010)
PACER 152 Filed: 11/15/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 142 Motion for an Order Requiring Defendants to Conduct Representative Discovery. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 11/15/2010. (ir) (Entered: 11/15/2010)
PACER 151 Filed: 10/29/2010, Entered: None
REPLY to Response to Motion re 142 Plaintiff's MOTION for Discovery requesting an Order requiring Defendants' to Conduct Representative Discovery filed by Kristy Henderson. (Shavitz, Gregg) (Entered: 10/29/2010)
PACER 150 Filed: 10/22/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED ORDER granting 149 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply re 142 Plaintiff's MOTION for Discovery requesting an Order requiring Defendants' to Conduct Representative Discovery. Replies due by 11/1/2010. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 10/22/2010. (ir) (Entered: 10/22/2010)
PACER 149 Filed: 10/21/2010, Entered: None
Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 142 Plaintiff's MOTION for Discovery requesting an Order requiring Defendants' to Conduct Representative Discovery by Kristy Henderson. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shavitz, Gregg) (Entered: 10/21/2010)
PACER 148 Filed: 10/12/2010, Entered: None
RESPONSE in Opposition re 142 Plaintiff's MOTION for Discovery requesting an Order requiring Defendants' to Conduct Representative Discovery filed by CVS Caremark, Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Holiday CVS, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Swartz, James) (Entered: 10/12/2010)
PACER 147 Filed: 10/7/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED ORDER granting 146 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re 142 Plaintiff's MOTION for Discovery requesting an Order requiring Defendants' to Conduct Representative Discovery. Responses due by 10/12/2010. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 10/6/2010. (ir) (Entered: 10/07/2010)
PACER 146 Filed: 10/6/2010, Entered: None
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 142 Plaintiff's MOTION for Discovery requesting an Order requiring Defendants' to Conduct Representative Discovery by Holiday CVS, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Swartz, James) (Entered: 10/06/2010)
PACER 145 Filed: 9/30/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by Gregg I. Shavitz on behalf of Janet Jackson, Perry Cannizzaro, Reginald Salomon, Jeffrey Cardace (Shavitz, Gregg) (Entered: 09/30/2010)
PACER 144 Filed: 9/24/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part 99 Motion to Overrule Claim of Privilege and to Compel Production of Documents. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linnea R. Johnson on 9/24/2010. (sa) (Entered: 09/24/2010)
PACER 143 Filed: 9/21/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER Denying as Moot Without Prejudice 98 Motion to Compel Plaintiff to Produce Privilege Log or Documents. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linnea R. Johnson on 9/21/2010. (sa) (Entered: 09/21/2010)
PACER 142 Filed: 9/20/2010, Entered: None
Plaintiff's MOTION for Discovery requesting an Order requiring Defendants' to Conduct Representative Discovery by Kristy Henderson. Responses due by 10/7/2010 (Shavitz, Gregg) (Entered: 09/20/2010)
PACER 141 Filed: 9/10/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE by Kristy Henderson of Submission of Proposed Pre-trial Scheduling Deadlines (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Shavitz, Gregg) (Entered: 09/10/2010)
PACER 140 Filed: 9/10/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE by CVS Caremark, Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Holiday CVS, L.L.C. of Filing Defendants' Proposal Regarding Discovery Schedule (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Swartz, James) (Entered: 09/10/2010)
PACER 139 Filed: 9/9/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by Gregg I. Shavitz on behalf of Craig Chiucchi, Hendrick Janssen, Ralph Antoine, George Chapell, Devon E. Christopher, Zakaria Khfissi, David M Franklin, Bren Rheaume, Dexter Carl Rouse, Marc Christopher Simpson, Karen L Soricelli, Eliezer Suliveras, John Charles Walrath, Luis A. Fernandez (Shavitz, Gregg) (Entered: 09/09/2010)
PACER 138 Filed: 8/31/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by Gregg I. Shavitz on behalf of Diane Lorna Bingle, Nichole Lenore Brown, Todd Nicholas Dial, Anthony Jerome Grace, Faith Elaine Hill, Scott Stephens Meyers, Nick Mngola, Lawrence Powell, James Zeller (Shavitz, Gregg) (Entered: 08/31/2010)
PACER 137 Filed: 8/27/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER Granting 135 Motion For Extension of Time to Produce Documents Pursuant to the Court's 8/9/10 and 8/11/10 Orders. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linnea R. Johnson on 8/27/2010. (sa) (Entered: 08/27/2010)
PACER 136 Filed: 8/24/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by Gregg I. Shavitz on behalf of Philip Black, Alberto Freire, Renita Garrett, Greg Garrison, Keisha Hamilton, Robert Hildebrandt, Stephen Madsen, Richard Mangan, Dennis Morris, Yvonne Parker, Philippe Baptiste, Cheryl Buczynski, Joanne Frederic, David Kanfer, Richard McNay, Vanessa Melanson, Jeffrey Metcalf, Edward Muniz, Virinderpal Sandro, Mark Wright (Shavitz, Gregg) (Entered: 08/24/2010)
PACER 135 Filed: 8/23/2010, Entered: None
MOTION to Produce Documents Pursuant to the Court's August 9, 2010 and August 11, 2010 Orders (Dkts. No. 130 and 131) by Holiday CVS, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Swartz, James) (Entered: 08/23/2010)
PACER 134 Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED ORDER granting Sandra K. Park 133 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 8/13/2010. (ir) (Entered: 08/16/2010)
PACER 133 Filed: 8/11/2010, Entered: None
MOTION for Limited Appearance, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filings for Sandra K. Park. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 5067. (ksa) (Entered: 08/13/2010)
PACER 132 Filed: 8/11/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by Gregg I. Shavitz on behalf of Steven Bailey, Michelle Colon, Angelique Dewert, Hugh Franklin, Dennis Hatton, Richard Motta (Shavitz, Gregg) (Entered: 08/11/2010)
PACER 131 Filed: 8/11/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part in accordance with the terms of the within Order 75 Motion to Compel Better Production of 7000+ pages of Discovery Produced by Defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linnea R. Johnson on 8/11/2010. (sa) (Entered: 08/11/2010)
PACER 130 Filed: 8/9/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part in accordance with the terms of this Order 59 Motion to Compel Better Responses to Plaintiffs' Fourth Request for Production. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linnea R. Johnson on 8/9/2010. (sa) (Entered: 08/09/2010)
PACER 129 Filed: 8/6/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by Gregg I. Shavitz on behalf of Robert Brill, Lundy Diaz, Gregory Kihlgren, Stanley Hogan, Stephan Lamonica, Michelle Prichard, Sue Roselli, Leighton Royster, Nathaniel Ryan (Shavitz, Gregg) (Entered: 08/06/2010)
PACER 128 Filed: 8/3/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER Granting 126 Unopposed Motion for Extension of time to Produce Supplemental Responses. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linnea R. Johnson on 8/3/2010. (sa) (Entered: 08/03/2010)
PACER 127 Filed: 7/29/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by Gregg I. Shavitz on behalf of Robert Andrews, Kathleen Beckman, Jeffrey Cary, Timothy Cavanaugh, Sharon Colvin, Joseph Dennett, Trudy Hernandez, Kerry Hubert, Mike Jupina, Deaundrey Kurns, Trent Law, Andranetta Nelson, Brandon Sieg, Henry Storino (Shavitz, Gregg) (Entered: 07/29/2010)
PACER 126 Filed: 7/28/2010, Entered: None
Unopposed MOTION to Produce Supplemental Responses Pursuant to the Court's July 13, 2010 Order (Dkt. No. 120) [CORRECTED] by Holiday CVS, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Swartz, James) (Entered: 07/28/2010)
PACER 125 Filed: 7/28/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE of Striking 124 Unopposed MOTION to Produce Supplemental Responses Pursuant to the Court's July 13, 2010 Order (Dkt. No. 120) filed by Holiday CVS, L.L.C. From the Docket by Holiday CVS, L.L.C. (Swartz, James) (Entered: 07/28/2010)
PACER 124 Filed: 7/28/2010, Entered: None
Unopposed MOTION to Produce Supplemental Responses Pursuant to the Court's July 13, 2010 Order (Dkt. No. 120) by Holiday CVS, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Swartz, James) (Entered: 07/28/2010)
PACER 123 Filed: 7/27/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER Granting 121 Unopposed Motion for Extension to Produce Documents. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linnea R. Johnson on 7/27/2010. (sa) (Entered: 07/27/2010)
PACER 122 Filed: 7/23/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by Gregg I. Shavitz on behalf of Alan Albury, Juan Araujo, Luis Babilonia, William Baxter, Marlen Baxter, Steven Benner, John Brennan, Melinda Brown, Neal Chicoine, Dan Conrad, Culbreth, Timothy Darby, Towana Dellera, Mario Derogatis, Robert Dittell, Terri Ehlen, Jude Etienne, Ariel Fernandez, Arkadiusz Fryc, Wade Gordon, Clark Gryglewicz, Tammy Gutierrez, Michelle Heuer, Kwok Ho, Robert Howard, Andres Jimenez, Stephen Kane, Erin Kazo, George Lopez, David Lyjak, Bonnie Maclauchlin, Lori Mann, Alberto Martinez, Regina Mills, Tina Nierenberg, Jennifer Parrilla-Martin, Anthony Patterson, Jarvin Perez, Joe Perez, Mary Roberts, Robert Rocco, Manuel Rodriguez, Michael Rupp, Joseph Russo, Mikhail Rybin, Rolex Saint-Preux, Michael Satterlee, William Small, George Stefanou, Darin Strong, Danny Surinach, Julius Teiszler, Kristina Thimm, Maritza Torres, Martin Traub, Donald Tubbs, Thom Urwin, Eddie Valentin, Kurt Waites, Jennifer West, Kim Wever, Rodney Whitt, Sarah Williams, Weng Wong, Nancy Zima (Shavitz, Gregg) (Entered: 07/23/2010)
PACER 121 Filed: 7/13/2010, Entered: None
Unopposed MOTION to Produce Documents Pursuant to the Court's June 29, 2010 Order (Dkt. No. 116) by Holiday CVS, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Swartz, James) (Entered: 07/13/2010)
PACER 120 Filed: 7/13/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part 42 Motion to Compel Better Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linnea R. Johnson on 7/13/2010. (sa) (Entered: 07/13/2010)
PACER 119 Filed: 7/8/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 118 Notice of Joint Proposal Regarding Discovery Schedule filed by CVS Caremark, Corporation, Kristy Henderson, Holiday CVS, L.L.C., CVS Pharmacy, Inc. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 7/7/2010. (ir) (Entered: 07/08/2010)
PACER 118 Filed: 7/1/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE by CVS Caremark, Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Kristy Henderson, Holiday CVS, L.L.C. of filing Joint Proposal Regarding Discovery Schedule (Attachments: # 1 Joint Proposed Schedule, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Shavitz, Gregg) (Entered: 07/01/2010)
PACER 117 Filed: 6/29/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE of Compliance by Kristy Henderson re 104 Order, (Shavitz, Gregg) (Entered: 06/29/2010)
PACER 116 Filed: 6/29/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part 39 Motion to Compel Better Responses. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linnea R. Johnson on 6/29/2010. (sa) (Entered: 06/29/2010)
PACER 115 Filed: 6/16/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER Granting 113 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply in Support of Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linnea R. Johnson on 6/16/2010. (sa) (Entered: 06/16/2010)
PACER 114 Filed: 6/7/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER APPROVING AMENDED JOINT NOTICE re 109 Amended Notice filed by CVS Caremark, Corporation, Kristy Henderson, Holiday CVS, L.L.C., CVS Pharmacy, Inc. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 6/4/2010. (ir) (Entered: 06/07/2010)
PACER 113 Filed: 6/4/2010, Entered: None
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 98 MOTION to Compel Plaintiff to Produce or Log Documents and Communications Responsive to Defendant's First Requests for Production by Holiday CVS, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Swartz, James) (Entered: 06/04/2010)
PACER 112 Filed: 6/2/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER Granting 106 Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendant's Motion to Compel Regarding Privilege Log. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linnea R. Johnson on 6/1/10. (sa) (Entered: 06/02/2010)
PACER 111 Filed: 6/2/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER Granting 103 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendant's Motion to Compel Regarding Privilege Log. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linnea R. Johnson on 6/1/2010. (sa) (Entered: 06/02/2010)
PACER 110 Filed: 6/1/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by Gregg I. Shavitz on behalf of Richard Feliciano (Attachments: # 1 Consent to Join of Richard Feliciano)(Shavitz, Gregg) (Entered: 06/01/2010)
PACER 109 Filed: 5/26/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE by CVS Caremark, Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Kristy Henderson, Holiday CVS, L.L.C. re 104 Order, Regarding Proposed Notice to Collective Class Members (Amended) (Attachments: # 1 Notice of opporturnity to join, # 2 Consent to join)(Shavitz, Gregg) (Entered: 05/26/2010)
PACER 108 Filed: 5/26/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE by CVS Caremark, Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Kristy Henderson, Holiday CVS, L.L.C. re 104 Order, Regarding Proposed Notice to Collective Class Members (Attachments: # 1 Notice of opportunity to join, # 2 Consent to join)(Shavitz, Gregg) (Entered: 05/26/2010)
PACER 107 Filed: 5/24/2010, Entered: None
RESPONSE in Opposition re 98 MOTION to Compel Plaintiff to Produce or Log Documents and Communications Responsive to Defendant's First Requests for Production filed by Kristy Henderson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Good Faith Conferral)(Shavitz, Gregg) (Entered: 05/25/2010)
PACER 106 Filed: 5/17/2010, Entered: None
Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 98 MOTION to Compel Plaintiff to Produce or Log Documents and Communications Responsive to Defendant's First Requests for Production by Kristy Henderson. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shavitz, Gregg) (Entered: 05/17/2010)
PACER 105 Filed: 5/12/2010, Entered: None
REPLY to Response to Motion re 99 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Production of Documents; and Alternative Motion to Compel Better PrivilegeLog; and Request for In Camera Review for Determination of Claimed Privilege filed by Kristy Henderson. (Shavitz, Gregg) (Entered: 05/12/2010)
PACER 104 Filed: 5/10/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER and Opinion Granting Supervised Notice. Granting 37 Plaintiff's MOTION to Authorize Notice to Potential Class Members filed by Kristy Henderson. Denied as moot 68 Motion for Oral Argument on filed by CVS Caremark, Corporation, Holiday CVS, L.L.C., CVS Pharmacy, Inc. All deadlines set in 90 Scheduling Order remain in effect. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 5/10/2010. (lbc) (Entered: 05/11/2010)
PACER 103 Filed: 5/6/2010, Entered: None
Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 98 MOTION to Compel Plaintiff to Produce or Log Documents and Communications Responsive to Defendant's First Requests for Production by Kristy Henderson. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shavitz, Gregg) (Entered: 05/06/2010)
PACER 102 Filed: 5/4/2010, Entered: None
RESPONSE in Opposition re 99 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Production of Documents; and Alternative Motion to Compel Better PrivilegeLog; and Request for In Camera Review for Determination of Claimed Privilege filed by CVS Caremark, Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Holiday CVS, L.L.C.. (Swartz, James) (Entered: 05/04/2010)
PACER 101 Filed: 5/3/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by Gregg I. Shavitz on behalf of Amy Daitz (Attachments: # 1 Consent to Join of Amy Daitz)(Shavitz, Gregg) (Entered: 05/03/2010)
PACER 100 Filed: 4/30/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by Gregg I. Shavitz on behalf of Michael Rennick (Attachments: # 1 Consent to Join of Michael Rennick)(Shavitz, Gregg) (Entered: 04/30/2010)
PACER 99 Filed: 4/20/2010, Entered: None
Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Production of Documents; and Alternative Motion to Compel Better PrivilegeLog; and Request for In Camera Review for Determination of Claimed Privilege by Kristy Henderson. Responses due by 5/7/2010 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Shavitz, Gregg) (Entered: 04/20/2010)
PACER 98 Filed: 4/19/2010, Entered: None Motion to Compel
MOTION to Compel Plaintiff to Produce or Log Documents and Communications Responsive to Defendant's First Requests for Production by Holiday CVS, L.L.C.. Responses due by 5/6/2010 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Swartz, James) (Entered: 04/19/2010)
PACER 96 Filed: 4/15/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
AMENDED NOTICE TO PARTIES. (Amended to reflect correct signature date). Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 4/14/2010. (ir) (Entered: 04/15/2010)
PACER 95 Filed: 4/14/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE TO PARTIES. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 4/14/2010. (ir) (Entered: 04/14/2010)
PACER 94 Filed: 4/12/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by Gregg I. Shavitz on behalf of Michelle Sanon (Attachments: # 1 Consent to Join of Michelle Sanon)(Shavitz, Gregg) (Entered: 04/12/2010)
PACER 93 Filed: 4/6/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER Granting 91 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion to Compel Better Responses to First set of Requests for Production to Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linnea R. Johnson on 4/6/2010. (sa) (Entered: 04/06/2010)
PACER 92 Filed: 4/1/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by Gregg I. Shavitz on behalf of Raul Mendiz (Attachments: # 1 Consent to Join of Raul Mendiz)(Shavitz, Gregg) (Entered: 04/01/2010)
PACER 91 Filed: 3/30/2010, Entered: None
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion to Compel Better Responses to First Set of Requests for Production to Plaintiff (Unopposed) by Holiday CVS, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Swartz, James) (Entered: 03/30/2010)
PACER 90 Filed: 3/1/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER RESETTING TRIAL DATE & DISCOVERY DEADLINES re 89 Notice Regarding Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 7/2/2010., Dispositive Motions due by 7/23/2010., Calendar Call set for 12/3/2010 10:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Kenneth A. Marra., Jury Trial set for 12/6/2010 09:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Kenneth A. Marra. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 3/1/2010. (ir) (Entered: 03/01/2010)
PACER 89 Filed: 2/26/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE by Francis Alyn, John Barrett, Larry Brinkley, CVS Caremark, Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., James Cappello, James Carrillo, Muhammad Chaudhry, David Durham, Michael Edwards, Karen Evans, Wesley Gorman, Kristy Henderson, Holiday CVS, L.L.C., Abiola Idowu, Patrick Lamontagne, Ingrid Love, Alberto Martinez, Jani Pankaj, Kenton Parker, Glenn Pierre, Michael Rodriguez, Joachim E. Traebecke, Debora Williams Joint Notice Regarding Scheduling Order (Swartz, James) (Entered: 02/26/2010)
PACER 88 Filed: 2/16/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER denying 66 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 2/16/2010. (ir) (Entered: 02/16/2010)
PACER 87 Filed: 2/16/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE TO PARTIES re 26 Scheduling Order, Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge, Order Referring Case to Mediation. Response due 2/26/10. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 2/16/2010. (ir) (Entered: 02/16/2010)
PACER 86 Filed: 2/16/2010, Entered: None
ORDER DENYING TRANSFER (Dated 2/12/2010) pursuant to 28 USC 1407, (Signed by John G. Heyburn II, Chairman of the Panel). Re: MDL Case No. 2134 CVS Caremark Corp. Wage and Hour Employment Practices Litigation. (gp) (Entered: 02/16/2010)
PACER 85 Filed: 2/3/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Martin Eric Leach on behalf of Joachim E. Traebecke (Leach, Martin) (Entered: 02/03/2010)
PACER 84 Filed: 1/28/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by Gregg I. Shavitz on behalf of David Durham (Attachments: # 1 Consent to Join of David Durham)(Shavitz, Gregg) (Entered: 01/28/2010)
PDF 83 Filed: 1/22/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by Gregg I. Shavitz on behalf of Joachim E. Traebecke (Attachments: # 1 Consent to Join of Joachim Traebecke)(Shavitz, Gregg) (Entered: 01/22/2010)
PACER 82 Filed: 1/15/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by Gregg I. Shavitz on behalf of Patrick Lamontagne (Attachments: # 1 Consent to Join of Patrick Lamontagne)(Shavitz, Gregg) (Entered: 01/15/2010)
PACER 81 Filed: 1/13/2010, Entered: None
REPLY to Response to Motion re 75 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Better Production of 7,000 + pages of Documents produced by Defendants In Response to Plaintiff's First, Second, Third and Fourth Request For Production filed by Kristy Henderson. (Shavitz, Gregg) Modified text on 1/14/2010 (tp). (Entered: 01/13/2010)
PACER 80 Filed: 1/4/2010, Entered: None
RESPONSE in Opposition re 75 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Better Production of 7,000 + pages of Documents produced by Defendants In Response to Plaintiff's First, Second, Third and Fourth Request For ProductionPlaintiff's MOTION to Compel Better Production of 7,000 + pages of Documents produced by Defendants In Response to Plaintiff's First, Second, Third and Fourth Request For Production Cumulative Method of Production Under Fed.R.Civ.P. 34 filed by CVS Caremark, Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Holiday CVS, L.L.C.. (Swartz, James) (Entered: 01/04/2010)
PACER 79 Filed: 12/24/2009, Entered: None
REPLY to Response to Motion re 66 MOTION for Protective Order and for Relief from Plaintiff's Pending Discovery Requests and Motions filed by CVS Caremark, Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Holiday CVS, L.L.C.. (Swartz, James) (Entered: 12/24/2009)
PACER 78 Filed: 12/23/2009, Entered: None
NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by Gregg I. Shavitz on behalf of Michael Rodriguez (Attachments: # 1 Consent to Join of Michael Rodriguez)(Shavitz, Gregg) (Entered: 12/23/2009)
PACER 77 Filed: 12/18/2009, Entered: None
RESPONSE/REPLY to 73 Notice of Supplemental Authority by CVS Caremark, Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Holiday CVS, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Swartz, James) (Entered: 12/18/2009)
PDF 76 Filed: 12/17/2009, Entered: None
REPLY to Response to Motion re 59 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Better Responses to Plaintiff's Fourth Request For Production filed by Kristy Henderson. (Shavitz, Gregg) (Entered: 12/17/2009)
PACER 75 Filed: 12/16/2009, Entered: None
Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Better Production of 7,000 + pages of Documents produced by Defendants In Response to Plaintiff's First, Second, Third and Fourth Request For Production by Kristy Henderson. Responses due by 1/4/2010 (Shavitz, Gregg) (Entered: 12/16/2009)
PACER 74 Filed: 12/14/2009, Entered: None
RESPONSE in Opposition re 59 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Better Responses to Plaintiff's Fourth Request For Production filed by CVS Caremark, Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Holiday CVS, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Swartz, James) (Entered: 12/14/2009)
  • Attachment 1: Exhibit A
  • Attachment 2: Exhibit B
PACER 73 Filed: 12/14/2009, Entered: None
Notice of Supplemental Authority re 37 Plaintiff's MOTION to Authorize Notice to Potential Class Members by Kristy Henderson (Attachments: # 1 Attachment)(Shavitz, Gregg) (Entered: 12/14/2009)
PACER 72 Filed: 12/14/2009, Entered: None
RESPONSE in Opposition re 66 MOTION for Protective Order and for Relief from Plaintiff's Pending Discovery Requests and Motions filed by Kristy Henderson. (Shavitz, Gregg) (Entered: 12/14/2009)
PACER 71 Filed: 12/14/2009, Entered: None
NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by Gregg I. Shavitz on behalf of James Carrillo (Attachments: # 1 Consent to Join of Carrillo)(Shavitz, Gregg) (Entered: 12/14/2009)
PACER 70 Filed: 12/11/2009, Entered: None
RESPONSE in Opposition re 68 Motion for Oral Argument on filed by Kristy Henderson. (Shavitz, Gregg) (Entered: 12/11/2009)
PACER 69 Filed: 12/11/2009, Entered: None
Clerks Notice to Filer re 68 Motion for Oral Argument on. Filer Selected the Wrong Motion Relief(s); ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong motion relief(s) when docketing the motion. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document but future motions filed must include applicable reliefs. (tp) (Entered: 12/11/2009)
PACER 68 Filed: 12/10/2009, Entered: None
Defendant's MOTION Oral Argument on 37 Plaintiff's MOTION to Authorize Notice to Potential Class Members by CVS Caremark, Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Holiday CVS, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Swartz, James) Modified relief and text on 12/11/2009 (tp). (Entered: 12/10/2009)
PACER 67 Filed: 12/10/2009, Entered: None
NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by Gregg I. Shavitz on behalf of Glenn Pierre (Attachments: # 1 Consent to Join Form)(Shavitz, Gregg) (Entered: 12/10/2009)
PACER 66 Filed: 12/8/2009, Entered: None
MOTION for Protective Order and for Relief from Plaintiff's Pending Discovery Requests and Motions by CVS Caremark, Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Holiday CVS, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Ex. 1 to Motion - Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Brief in Support, # 3 Ex. A to Brief in Support, # 4 Ex. B to Brief in Support, # 5 Ex. C to Brief in Support, # 6 Ex. D to Brief in Support, # 7 Ex. E to Brief in Support, # 8 Ex. F to Brief in Support, # 9 Ex. G to Brief in Support)(Swartz, James) (Entered: 12/08/2009)
PACER 65 Filed: 12/8/2009, Entered: None
NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by Gregg I. Shavitz on behalf of Abiola Idowu (Attachments: # 1 Consent to Join of Abiola Idowu)(Shavitz, Gregg) (Entered: 12/08/2009)
PACER 64 Filed: 12/4/2009, Entered: None
REPLY to Response to Motion re 37 Plaintiff's MOTION to Authorize Notice to Potential Class Members filed by Kristy Henderson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Shavitz, Gregg) (Entered: 12/04/2009)
PACER 63 Filed: 12/2/2009, Entered: None
NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by Gregg I. Shavitz on behalf of Kenton Parker (Attachments: # 1 Consent to Join of Kenton Parker)(Shavitz, Gregg) (Entered: 12/02/2009)
PACER 62 Filed: 12/1/2009, Entered: None
NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY by Kristy Henderson for dates of December 25, 2009 to December 30, 2009 (Shavitz, Gregg) (Entered: 12/01/2009)
PACER 61 Filed: 11/30/2009, Entered: None
NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by Gregg I. Shavitz on behalf of James Cappello (Attachments: # 1 Consent to Join of James Cappello)(Shavitz, Gregg) (Entered: 11/30/2009)
PACER 60 Filed: 11/25/2009, Entered: None
NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by Gregg I. Shavitz on behalf of Ingrid Love (Attachments: # 1 Consent to Join of Ingrid Love)(Shavitz, Gregg) (Entered: 11/25/2009)
PDF 59 Filed: 11/24/2009, Entered: None
Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Better Responses to Plaintiff's Fourth Request For Production by Kristy Henderson. Responses due by 12/14/2009 (Shavitz, Gregg) (Entered: 11/24/2009)
PACER 58 Filed: 11/24/2009, Entered: None
REPLY to Response to Motion re 42 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Better Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories filed by Kristy Henderson. (Shavitz, Gregg) (Entered: 11/24/2009)
PDF 57 Filed: 11/20/2009, Entered: None
RESPONSE in Opposition re 37 Plaintiff's MOTION to Authorize Notice to Potential Class Members filed by CVS Caremark, Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Holiday CVS, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Swartz, James) (Entered: 11/20/2009)
  • Attachment 1: Exhibit A
  • Attachment 2: Exhibit B
  • Attachment 3: Exhibit C
  • Attachment 4: Exhibit D
  • Attachment 5: Exhibit E
  • Attachment 6: Exhibit F
  • Attachment 7: Exhibit G
PACER 56 Filed: 11/19/2009, Entered: None
NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by Gregg I. Shavitz on behalf of Jani Pankaj (Attachments: # 1 Consent to Join of Pankaj Jani)(Shavitz, Gregg) (Entered: 11/19/2009)
PACER 55 Filed: 11/19/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED ORDER denying 51 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 11/19/2009. (ir) (Entered: 11/19/2009)
PACER 54 Filed: 11/19/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER GRANTING IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TERMS HEREIN 36 MOTION for Protective Order filed by CVS Caremark, Corporation, Holiday CVS, L.L.C., CVS Pharmacy, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linnea R. Johnson on 11/19/2009. (sa) (Entered: 11/19/2009)
PACER 53 Filed: 11/19/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEMENT AND ORDER GOVERNING THE EXCHANGE AND PROTECTION OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION re 36 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linnea R. Johnson on 11/19/2009. (sa) (Entered: 11/19/2009)
PACER 52 Filed: 11/18/2009, Entered: None
RESPONSE in Opposition re 51 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Their Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Authorize Notice to Potential Class Members [Dkt. No. 37] and Request for Expedited Determination MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Their Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Authorize Notice to Potential Class Members [Dkt. No. 37] and Request for Expedited Determination filed by Kristy Henderson. (Shavitz, Gregg) (Entered: 11/18/2009)
PACER 51 Filed: 11/18/2009, Entered: None
MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Their Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Authorize Notice to Potential Class Members [Dkt. No. 37] and Request for Expedited Determination by CVS Caremark, Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Holiday CVS, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Swartz, James) (Entered: 11/18/2009)
PACER 50 Filed: 11/18/2009, Entered: None
NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by Gregg I. Shavitz on behalf of Michael Edwards (Attachments: # 1 Consent Form of Michael Edwards)(Shavitz, Gregg) (Entered: 11/18/2009)
PACER 49 Filed: 11/17/2009, Entered: None
REPLY to Response to Motion re 39 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Better Responses to Plaintiff's First Request for Production filed by Kristy Henderson. (Shavitz, Gregg) (Entered: 11/17/2009)
PACER 48 Filed: 11/16/2009, Entered: None
RESPONSE in Opposition re 42 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Better Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories filed by CVS Caremark, Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Holiday CVS, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Swartz, James) (Entered: 11/16/2009)
PACER 47 Filed: 11/12/2009, Entered: None
RESPONSE in Opposition re 39 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Better Responses to Plaintiff's First Request for Production filed by CVS Caremark, Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Holiday CVS, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Swartz, James) (Entered: 11/12/2009)
PACER 46 Filed: 11/12/2009, Entered: None
NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by Gregg I. Shavitz on behalf of Francis Alyn (Attachments: # 1 Consent to Join of Francis Alyn)(Shavitz, Gregg) (Entered: 11/12/2009)
PACER 45 Filed: 11/5/2009, Entered: None
NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by Gregg I. Shavitz on behalf of John Barrett (Attachments: # 1 Consent Form of John Barrett)(Shavitz, Gregg) (Entered: 11/05/2009)
PACER 44 Filed: 11/2/2009, Entered: None
REPLY to Response to Motion re 36 MOTION for Protective Order filed by CVS Caremark, Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Holiday CVS, L.L.C.. (Swartz, James) (Entered: 11/02/2009)
PACER 43 Filed: 10/30/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED ORDER granting 40 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond re 37 Plaintiff's MOTION to Authorize Notice to Potential Class Members. Responses due by 11/20/2009. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 10/30/2009. (ir) (Entered: 10/30/2009)
PACER 42 Filed: 10/28/2009, Entered: None
Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Better Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories by Kristy Henderson. Responses due by 11/16/2009 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Supplement)(Shavitz, Gregg) (Entered: 10/28/2009)
PACER 41 Filed: 10/27/2009, Entered: None
RESPONSE to Motion re 40 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to 37 Plaintiff's MOTION to Authorize Notice to Potential Class Members MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to 37 Plaintiff's MOTION to Authorize Notice to Potential Class Members filed by Kristy Henderson. Replies due by 11/6/2009. (Shavitz, Gregg) (Entered: 10/27/2009)
PACER 40 Filed: 10/26/2009, Entered: None
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to 37 Plaintiff's MOTION to Authorize Notice to Potential Class Members by CVS Caremark, Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Holiday CVS, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Swartz, James) (Entered: 10/26/2009)
PACER 39 Filed: 10/26/2009, Entered: None
Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Better Responses to Plaintiff's First Request for Production by Kristy Henderson. Responses due by 11/12/2009 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shavitz, Gregg) (Entered: 10/26/2009)
PACER 38 Filed: 10/22/2009, Entered: None
RESPONSE to Motion re 36 MOTION for Protective Order For an Entry of an Order Governing The Exchange and Protection of Documents filed by Kristy Henderson. Replies due by 11/2/2009. (Shavitz, Gregg) (Entered: 10/22/2009)
PACER 37 Filed: 10/19/2009, Entered: None
Plaintiff's MOTION to Authorize Notice to Potential Class Members by Kristy Henderson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Notice, # 2 Exhibit B - Proposed Consent, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Shavitz, Gregg) (Entered: 10/19/2009)
PACER 36 Filed: 10/15/2009, Entered: None
MOTION for Protective Order by CVS Caremark, Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Holiday CVS, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Motion for Protective Order, # 2 Memorandum Brief in Support, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Brief in Support)(Swartz, James) (Entered: 10/15/2009)
PACER 35 Filed: 10/15/2009, Entered: None
NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by Gregg I. Shavitz on behalf of Larry Brinkley (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Consent to Join of Larry Brinkley)(Shavitz, Gregg) (Entered: 10/15/2009)
PACER 34 Filed: 10/15/2009, Entered: None
NOTICE by Kristy Henderson of Filing Preliminary Evidence (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9)(Shavitz, Gregg) (Entered: 10/15/2009)
PACER 33 Filed: 10/15/2009, Entered: None
NOTICE by Kristy Henderson of Filing Deposition Transcripts (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit Comp 3)(Shavitz, Gregg) (Entered: 10/15/2009)
PACER 32 Filed: 10/15/2009, Entered: None
NOTICE by Kristy Henderson Of Filing Declarations (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(Shavitz, Gregg) (Entered: 10/15/2009)
PACER 31 Filed: 10/13/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER Granting 29 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion To Compel Better Responses to First Set of Interrogatories and First Request for Production. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linnea R. Johnson on 10/13/2009. (sa) (Entered: 10/13/2009)
PACER 30 Filed: 10/8/2009, Entered: None
NOTICE of Mediator Selection: Karen Evans, Esq. selected.(Shavitz, Gregg) (Entered: 10/08/2009)
PACER 29 Filed: 10/8/2009, Entered: None
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion to Compel Better Responses To First Set of Interrogatories and First Request for Production by Kristy Henderson. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shavitz, Gregg) (Entered: 10/08/2009)
PACER 28 Filed: 8/21/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 27 Motion to Withdraw. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 8/21/2009. (tb) (Entered: 08/24/2009)
PACER 27 Filed: 8/20/2009, Entered: None
Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw Document 15 Notice of Consent to Join Of Opt-In Plaintiff Alberto Martinez Without Prejudice by Kristy Henderson. Responses due by 9/8/2009 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shavitz, Gregg) (Entered: 08/20/2009)
PACER 26 Filed: 8/10/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 7/19/2010 09:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Kenneth A. Marra., Calendar Call set for 7/16/2010 10:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Kenneth A. Marra., Amended Pleadings due by 10/30/2009., Discovery due by 3/1/2010., Joinder of Parties due by 10/30/2009., Dispositive Motions due by 3/22/2010. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Linnea R. Johnson for Discovery Proceedings, ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 8/10/2009. (ir) (Entered: 08/10/2009)
PACER 25 Filed: 8/7/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting Nancy E. Rafuse 23 Motion for Limited Appearance, Consent to Designation and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filings. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 8/7/2009. (ir) (Entered: 08/07/2009)
PACER 24 Filed: 8/6/2009, Entered: None
SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Wesley Gorman, Kristy Henderson, Debora Williams, Alberto Martinez, Holiday CVS, L.L.C., CVS Caremark, Corporation, Muhammad Chaudhry, CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Swartz, James) (Entered: 08/06/2009)
PACER 23 Filed: 8/3/2009, Entered: None
MOTION for Limited Appearance, Consent to Designation and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filings for Nancy E. Rafuse. Filing Fee $75. Receipt # 1005836. (cw) (Entered: 08/06/2009)
PACER 22 Filed: 7/24/2009, Entered: None
NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by Gregg I. Shavitz on behalf of Muhammad Chaudhry (Shavitz, Gregg) (Entered: 07/24/2009)
PACER 21 Filed: 7/24/2009, Entered: None
NOTICE by Holiday CVS, L.L.C., CVS Caremark, Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc. of Withdrawal Without Prejudice of Their Nineteenth Affirmative Defense (Swartz, James) (Entered: 07/24/2009)
PACER 20 Filed: 7/23/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Kenneth A. Marra: Settlement Conference held on 7/23/2009. Court Reporter: Pauline Stipes, Phone: 561-803-3458 (ir) (Entered: 07/24/2009)
PDF 19 Filed: 7/23/2009, Entered: None
SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by Wesley Gorman, Kristy Henderson, Debora Williams, Alberto Martinez, Holiday CVS, L.L.C., CVS Caremark, Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. (Swartz, James) (Entered: 07/23/2009)
PACER 18 Filed: 7/23/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
FINAL JUDGMENT in favor of Opt-in Plaintiff Wesley Gorman against the Defendants Holiday CVS,LLC, CVS Caremark Corporation and CVS Pharmacy, Inc. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 7/23/2009. (ir) (Entered: 07/23/2009)
PACER 17 Filed: 7/16/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER Setting Hearing: Settlement Conference set for 7/23/2009 01:45 PM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Kenneth A. Marra. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 7/16/2009. (ir) (Entered: 07/16/2009)
PACER 16 Filed: 7/15/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED ORDER granting 13 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff has until 7/24/09 to file a motion to strike the nineteenth and twenty-third affirmative defenses. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 7/15/2009. (ir) (Entered: 07/15/2009)
PACER 15 Filed: 7/15/2009, Entered: None
NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by Gregg I. Shavitz on behalf of Alberto Martinez (Shavitz, Gregg) (Entered: 07/15/2009)
PACER 14 Filed: 7/14/2009, Entered: None
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by Kristy Henderson. CVS Caremark, Corporation served on 6/29/2009, answer due 7/20/2009. (Shavitz, Gregg) (Entered: 07/14/2009)
PACER 13 Filed: 7/13/2009, Entered: None
Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion to Strike Affirmative Defenses by Kristy Henderson. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shavitz, Gregg) (Entered: 07/13/2009)
PACER 12 Filed: 7/9/2009, Entered: None
NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by Wesley Gorman (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A- Offer of Judgment, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Shavitz, Gregg) (Entered: 07/09/2009)
PACER 11 Filed: 7/1/2009, Entered: None
NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by Gregg I. Shavitz on behalf of Debora Williams (Shavitz, Gregg) (Entered: 07/01/2009)
PACER 10 Filed: 6/30/2009, Entered: None
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by Kristy Henderson. Holiday CVS, L.L.C. served on 6/25/2009, answer due 7/15/2009. (Shavitz, Gregg) (Entered: 06/30/2009)
PACER 9 Filed: 6/30/2009, Entered: None
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by Kristy Henderson. CVS Pharmacy, Inc. served on 6/25/2009, answer due 7/15/2009. (Shavitz, Gregg) (Entered: 06/30/2009)
PACER 8 Filed: 6/29/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
Order Requiring Counsel to Confer and File Joint Scheduling Report. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 6/29/2009. (ir) (Entered: 06/29/2009)
PACER 7 Filed: 6/24/2009, Entered: None
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Holiday CVS, L.L.C., CVS Caremark, Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. (Swartz, James) (Entered: 06/24/2009)
PACER 6 Filed: 6/24/2009, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kristy Henderson re 4 Notice of Consent to Join (Shavitz, Gregg) (Entered: 06/24/2009)
PACER 5 Filed: 6/23/2009, Entered: None
ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Holiday CVS, L.L.C., CVS Caremark, Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc..(Swartz, James) (Entered: 06/23/2009)
PACER 4 Filed: 6/19/2009, Entered: None
NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by Gregg I. Shavitz on behalf of Wesley Gorman (Shavitz, Gregg) (Entered: 06/19/2009)
PDF 3 Filed: 6/19/2009, Entered: None Summons Issued
Summons Issued as to Holiday CVS, L.L.C., CVS Caremark, Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. (lh) (Entered: 06/19/2009)
PACER 2 Filed: 6/19/2009, Entered: None
NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by Hal B. Anderson on behalf of Kristy Henderson (lh) (Entered: 06/19/2009)
PDF 1 Filed: 6/19/2009, Entered: None
COMPLAINT against Holiday CVS, L.L.C., CVS Caremark, Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. Filing fee $ 350.00; Receipt#: 546599, filed by Kristy Henderson.(lh) (Entered: 06/19/2009)

Statistics

This case has been viewed 136 times.

No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Need Password Help?